PIGFORD, et al v. VENEMAN, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:97-cv-01978
District Judge Paul L. Friedman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 3, 2020 at 6:21 PM ST (1.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ABRAHAM CARPENTER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Stinson Morrison Hecker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Phillip L. Fraas +1 202 572 9904 +1 202 572 9946 phillip.fraas@stinsonleonard.com
No Logo ALL PLAINTIFFS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Conlon, Frantz, Phelan & Knapp, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Joseph Frantz +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 331 9306 dfrantz@conlonfrantz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JAMES W MYART, JR. PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James W. Myart, Jr. +1 210 533 9461 +1 210 533 4815 jwmyartlaw@satx.rr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Rose M. Sanders

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rose M. Sanders +1 334 875 9264 +1 334 875 9853

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anurag Varma +1 202 457 6490 +1 202 457 6315 AVarma@PattonBoggs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Peter J. Grilli, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Othello C. Cross +1 870 536 4056 othellocross@aol.com
Space Jesse L. Kearney +1 870 536 4056 +1 870 536 0216 cklawoffices@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stein, Mitchell & Mezines, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David U. Fierst +1 202 737 7777 +1 202 296 8312 dfierst@steinmitchell.com
No Logo BEN HILLMAN, JR.,, Plaintiff
No Logo BERNICE C. ATCHINSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BERNICE C. ATCHINSON

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space BERNICE C. ATCHINSON +1 205 688 2715
No Logo CECIL BREWINGTON, Plaintiff
No Logo CLIFFORD LOVETT, Plaintiff
No Logo DONALD A. MCDONALD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box 666

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DONALD A. MCDONALD +1 478 472 6109
No Logo EDDIE SLAUGHTER, Plaintiff
No Logo George Hall, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Caroline Lewis Wolverton +1 202 965 6570 +1 202 616 8202 caroline.lewis-wolverton@usdoj.gov
No Logo GREGORY ERVES, Plaintiff
No Logo GRIFFIN TOOD, SR., Plaintiff
No Logo HERBERT L. SKINNER, JR., Plaintiff
No Logo J. B. BLACK, Plaintiff
No Logo JOHN A. WRIGHT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by JOHN A. WRIGHT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN A. WRIGHT
No Logo LEO JACKSON, Plaintiff
No Logo LEONARD COOPER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Land Loss Prevention Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marcus B. Jimison +1 919 682 5969

Toggle Switch Represented by Lenovo (Beijing) Company, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephon J. Bowens +1 919 755 3993 +1 919 755 3994 sbowens@bmlslaw.com
No Logo LEONARD HUNTER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by President and Fellows of Harvard College

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles J. Ogletree, Jr. +1 617 496 2054 +1 617 496 3936 cogletree@ecbalaw.com
No Logo LLOYD SHAFER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by CLIFFORD & GARDE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John M. Clifford +1 202 280 6115 +1 202 289 8992 jclifford@cliffordgarde.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF MONA LYONS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mona Lyons +1 202 387 7000 +1 202 387 7116 mlyons@monalyons.com
No Logo LUCIOUS ABRAMS, JR., Plaintiff
No Logo lYWANDA LOONEY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by lYWANDA LOONEY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space lYWANDA LOONEY
No Logo MCARTHUR NESBIT, Plaintiff
No Logo MELVIN MELTON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by MELVIN MELTON

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MELVIN MELTON
No Logo OBIE L. BEAL, Plaintiff
No Logo THELMA JOURNEY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THELMA JOURNEY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THELMA JOURNEY
No Logo TIMOTHY C. PIGFORD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Chestnut Sanders Sanders Pettaway Campbell & Albright LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. L. Chestnut, Jr. +1 334 875 9264 +1 334 875 9375 bhayes@csspca.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Herman +1 202 662 5280 +1 202 778 5280 aherman@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by King Horsley & Lyons LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Jerome Ware +1 410 720 6129 +1 410 730 7603 charlesjeromeware@msn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Branch +1 202 785 2805 +1 202 785 0289 dablaw@erols.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF RICHARD T. SEYMOUR, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Talbot Seymour +1 202 862 4320 +1 800 805 1065 rick@rickseymourlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Peter J. Grilli, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 333 1134 +1 202 338 3635 farmerslawyer@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stein, Mitchell & Mezines, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob A. Stein +1 202 737 7777 jstein@steinmitchell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara Kim Kagan +1 202 429 6258 +1 202 261 0540 bkagan@steptoe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Adrian Doan +1 202 305 0874 +1 202 305 0506 joshua.doan@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Vincent Restauri Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Faya R. Toure +1 334 875 9264 +1 334 875 9853 fayarose@gmail.com
No Logo ZELMA J. HILLMAN, Plaintiff
No Logo BOBBI NEWTON, Petitioner
No Logo HOUSTON BLAKENEY, Petitioner
No Logo ILENTHE PORTER, Petitioner
No Logo James Davis, Petitioner
No Logo LEROY ROBINSON, Petitioner
No Logo NAOMI KNOCKETT, Petitioner
No Logo PEARLIE PETERSON, Petitioner
No Logo REATHA BLAKENEY, Petitioner
v.
No Logo ANN M. VENEMAN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marsha Stelson Edney +1 202 514 4520 +1 202 318 1287 marsha.edney@usdoj.gov
Space Herbert E. Forrest +1 202 514 2809 herbert.forrest@usdoj.gov
Space Elizabeth Goitein +1 202 514 4470 +1 202 616 8470 elizabeth.goitein@usdoj.gov
Space Elbert Lin +1 202 353 0533 elbert.lin@usdoj.gov
Space Joel Lunsford McElvain +1 202 514 2988 +1 202 616 8202 joel.mcelvain@usdoj.gov
Space Andrea Iris Newmark +1 202 514 4267 +1 202 616 8470 andrea.newmark@usdoj.gov
No Logo DAN GLICKMAN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Trade Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amanda Quester +1 202 326 2719

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Edward Bensing +1 202 305 0693 +1 202 616 8460 daniel.bensing@usdoj.gov
Space Joshua Edward Gardner +1 202 305 7583 +1 202 307 0972 joshua.e.gardner@usdoj.gov
Space Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
Space Matthew Allan Josephson +1 912 652 4422 +1 912 652 4991 matthew.josephson@usdoj.gov
Space Susan Hall Lennon +1 202 514 5838
Space Michael Sitcov +1 202 514 1944 +1 202 616 8187 michael.sitcov@usdoj.gov
Space Julie Straus +1 202 514 7857 +1 202 616 8460 julie.straus@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Weiner Brodsky Kider PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David M. Souders +1 202 628 2000 +1 202 628 2011 souders@wbsk.com
No Logo ADAM J. ALLEN, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by ADAM J. ALLEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ADAM J. ALLEN
No Logo ANGELA DOZIER-CARTER, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box 581

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ANGELA DOZIER-CARTER +1 919 494 2773
No Logo AVA L. BATES, Interested Party
No Logo BRAD E. BATES, Interested Party
No Logo Butler Snow O'Mara Stevens & Cannada, PLLC, Interested Party
Officially listed as "BUTLER, SNOW, O'MARA, STEVENS & CANNADA"
No Logo CASSANDRA WILSON, Interested Party
No Logo CONNIE CHANEY, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by CONNIE CHANEY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CONNIE CHANEY
No Logo DAVID NUNN, Interested Party
No Logo DEKINGON ATCHISON BALDWIN, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by DEKINGON ATCHISON BALDWIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DEKINGON ATCHISON BALDWIN
No Logo DOROTHY F. FORD, Interested Party
No Logo EARNEST HAROLD LONG, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by EARNEST HAROLD LONG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EARNEST HAROLD LONG
No Logo ERNEST BANKS, Interested Party
No Logo GEORGE ROBERTS, Interested Party
No Logo GRENETHA ATCHISON BALDWIN, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by GRENETHA ATCHISON BALDWIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GRENETHA ATCHISON BALDWIN
No Logo JAY ATCHISON, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by JAY ATCHISON

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JAY ATCHISON
No Logo JEROLD RAY CHANEY, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by JEROLD RAY CHANEY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JEROLD RAY CHANEY
No Logo JESSE FORD, Interested Party
No Logo JOHN WILL ALLEN, JR., Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by JOHN WILL ALLEN, JR.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN WILL ALLEN, JR.
No Logo JOSHLYNN ALLEN, Interested Party
No Logo KARLA K. BATES-ADAMS, Interested Party
No Logo LATONYA ATCHISON, Interested Party
No Logo MERDITH NUNN, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by MERDITH NUNN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MERDITH NUNN
No Logo MILDRED A. LONG, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by MILDRED A. LONG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MILDRED A. LONG
No Logo PHILLIP L. FRAAS, Interested Party
No Logo Ruth Banks, Interested Party
No Logo SAMUEL BALDWIN, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by SAMUEL BALDWIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SAMUEL BALDWIN
No Logo Sheila Johnson, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Elijah Jordan, III +1 202 429 6290 +1 202 261 7541 rjordan@steptoe.com
No Logo TERRIE L. BATES-BEST, Interested Party
No Logo THEODORE B. BATES, Jr., Interested Party
No Logo THEODORE F.B. BATES, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by THEODORE F.B. BATES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THEODORE F.B. BATES +1 785 421 6242
No Logo ANTONIO SANTOS, Movant
No Logo Banks Law Firm, PLLC, Movant
Officially listed as "BANKS LAW FIRM"

Toggle Switch Represented by Wyndell Oliver Banks

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyndell Oliver Banks +1 202 682 4761 +1 202 371 1990
No Logo BARBARA J. HARDY, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hardy, Barbara J.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space BARBARA J. HARDY
No Logo BETTY GARRETT, Movant
No Logo BLACK FARMERS & AGRICULTURALISTS ASSOCIATION, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jr., Dedrick Brittenum

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dedrick Brittenum, Jr. +1 901 751 7932 db@brittenumbruce.com
No Logo CAROLYN SMITH, Movant
No Logo CARRIE MCNAIR, Movant
No Logo CLARENCE HARDY, Movant
No Logo CLINTON R. MARTIN, Movant
No Logo COLIE DIXON, SR., Movant
No Logo Conlon, Frantz, Phelan & Knapp, LLP, Movant
Officially listed as "CONLON FRANTZ PHELAN & PIRES"
No Logo CURTIS DIXON, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by CURTIS DIXON

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CURTIS DIXON +1 601 355 8753
No Logo DARYL BRENTR, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by DARYL BRENTR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DARYL BRENTR +1 601 847 2690 +A REA CODE601
No Logo EDITH LOMAX-BARNES, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by EDITH LOMAX-BARNES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EDITH LOMAX-BARNES +1 601 846 2814 +A REA CODE601
No Logo ELMORE HICKS, Movant
No Logo EVELYN M. COLEMAN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by EVELYN M. COLEMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EVELYN M. COLEMAN +1 601 364 2666 +A REA CODE601
No Logo EZRA MCNAIR, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by EZRA MCNAIR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EZRA MCNAIR +1 601 892 1490 +A REA CODE601
No Logo FERNANDO BURKETTE, Movant
No Logo FLORIA A. VAUGHN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by FLORIA A. VAUGHN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space FLORIA A. VAUGHN +A REA CODE601
No Logo GARY GRANT, Movant
No Logo GERALDSTINE MILLER, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by GERALDSTINE MILLER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GERALDSTINE MILLER +1 601 858 2497 +A REA CODE601
No Logo GROVER MILLER, Movant
No Logo HAROLD B. DIXON, Movant
No Logo HENRY A. VAUGHN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by HENRY A. VAUGHN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space HENRY A. VAUGHN +1 601 894 3378 +A REA CODE601
No Logo HENRY BURRIS, Movant
No Logo J.L. CHESTNUT, Movant
No Logo JAMES TANNER, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ford C Ladd +1 703 836 4880 +1 703 683 5983 fordladd@erols.com
No Logo JAMES WALKER, Movant
No Logo L. D. MAYMON, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by L. D. MAYMON

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space L. D. MAYMON
No Logo LARRY D. BARNES, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by LARRY D. BARNES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LARRY D. BARNES
No Logo LARRY GARRETT, Movant
No Logo LAW OFFICE OF DAVID A. BRANCH, Movant
No Logo LEOLA LOGAN, Movant
No Logo LINDA CATCHING, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by LINDA CATCHING

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LINDA CATCHING
No Logo LOIS S. CLARK, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by LOIS S. CLARK

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LOIS S. CLARK +1 601 894 5016 +A REA CODE601
No Logo LUDEAN HICKS, Movant
No Logo MARILYNN STEWART, Movant
No Logo MUHAMMAD ROBBALAA, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by MUHAMMAD ROBBALAA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MUHAMMAD ROBBALAA
No Logo OTHELLO C. CROSS, Movant
No Logo ROBERT E. COLLINS, Movant
No Logo ROSE M. SANDERS, Movant
No Logo SALLIE WALKER, Movant
No Logo SARAH DAVIS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by LANSTON, FRAZER, SWEET & FREESE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dennis Charles Sweet +1 601 969 1356
No Logo Shutts & Bowen, LLP, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emily Johnson Henn +1 650 632 4700 ehenn@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dawn V. Martin +1 202 408 7040 +1 703 642 0208 dvmartinlaw@yahoo.com
No Logo THEODIE LOGAN, Movant
No Logo VELMA J. COLLINS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. BOX 266

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space VELMA J. COLLINS +1 601 894 2240 +A REA CODE601
No Logo WILLIAM H. MILLER, Movant
No Logo WILLIE S. MAYMON, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by WILLIE S. MAYMON

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIE S. MAYMON
No Logo BEN HILLSMAN, JR., Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Speiser, Krause, Nolan & Granito

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerard Robert Lear +1 703 522 7500 +1 703 522 7905 grl@speiserkrause.com
No Logo Edward L. Scott, Jr., Claimant
No Logo ESTATE OF CHARLIE KNOTT, Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David N. Fagan +1 202 662 5291 dfagan@cov.com
No Logo EVANS M. FOLINS, Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by EVANS M. FOLINS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EVANS M. FOLINS
No Logo GEORGE BARR GRIFFIN, Claimant
No Logo LEON MATHEWS, Claimant
No Logo MAURICE MCGINNIS, Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John M. Shoreman +1 202 638 2100 +1 202 638 6783 mstlaw@erols.com
No Logo ROBERT HOLMES, SR., Claimant
No Logo SANDY MCKINNON, Claimant
No Logo THOMAS BURRELL, Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Peter J. Grilli, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Wesley Davis +1 202 403 2276 +1 202 403 3495 jwdalaw@gmail.com
No Logo ZELMA J. HILLSMAN, Claimant
No Logo RANDI ILYSE ROTH, Special Master
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1343
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (2003) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2085 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2084 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2083 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2081 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2071 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2067 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Reconsideration
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2066 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2065 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2064 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2059 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Sealed Document
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2058 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Sealed Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2057 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2056 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2053 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Mail Returned
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2051 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2048 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2037 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Declaratory Judgment
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2036 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2032 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2031 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2027 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Surreply
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2025 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Memorandum
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2020 Filed: 1/18/2016, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2018 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Civil Statement
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2017 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2015 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2013 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2006 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2005 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2004 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2003 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2002 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Compel
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1995 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1993 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1983 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1982 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1975 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1971 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1967 Filed: 1/1/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1966 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1965 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (1961 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees by THOMAS J. VILSACK (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Moore, Tamra) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1964 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ENTERED IN ERROR.....ORDER approving the Ombudsman's invoice for the period of October 2014. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 18, 2014. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) Modified on 12/19/2014 (zmm, ). (Entered: 12/18/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1963 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 1930 defendant's motion to dismiss Boone Law Firm's motion for award of attorney fees and costs; and denying 1927 Boone Law Firm's motion for award of attorney fees and costs. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 17, 2014. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1962 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re (1949 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) First MOTION for Relief from Judgment Specifically, Arbitration Order Denying Plaintiff's Track B Claim Under Pigford Case filed by THOMAS J. VILSACK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Crowley, Megan) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1961 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION for Attorney Fees by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Fierst, David) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1960 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying motions and objections filed by Mr. Bates [1956, 1957, 1959] in Civil Action No. 97-1978. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 8, 2014. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1959 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1959 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                Motion by BERNARD BATES ; ("Let this be filed" by Judge Paul L. Friedman) (td, ) Modified on 12/8/2014 (td, ). (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1958 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1957 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1956 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1955 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Notice of Settlement
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1954 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1953 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re (1179 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Fierst, David) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1952 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re (1943 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1190 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF) MOTION to Set Aside Judgment Pursuant to Rule 60(b)(4-6), (1948 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) Amended MOTION for Relief from Judgment to Set Aside and to Vacate Arbitration Order in Track B Claim in Pigford Case . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed Order))Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Crowley, Megan) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1951 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Crowley, Megan) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1950 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Cross-Motion to Refer to Arbitrator Michael Lewis by PHILLIP L. FRAAS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1949 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Relief from Judgment
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1948 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Relief from Judgment
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1948 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Amended MOTION for Relief from Judgment to Set Aside and to Vacate Arbitration Order in Track B Claim in Pigford Case by LUCIOUS ABRAMS, JR (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Dowdy, William) (Entered: 10/20/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1947 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1946 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE re (1183 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF) MOTION for Mediationand To Stay Proceedings Pending the Outcome Thereof - Defendant's Opposition to Petitioner's Cross-Motion to Refer to Arbitrator Michael Lewis. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1945 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (1931 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees by Cross & Kearney PLLC Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Fierst, David) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1944 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1943 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Set Aside Judgment Pursuant to Rule 60(b)(4-6) by LUCIOUS ABRAMS, JR (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Dowdy, William) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1942 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion of Cross & Kearney PLLC for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by THOMAS J. VILSACK (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Moore, Tamra) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1941 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re (1178 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF, 1178 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF) MOTION to Dismiss , and to Bifurcate Consideration of, the Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs of Boone Law Firm, P.A. MOTION to Bifurcate filed by TOM VILSACK. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1940 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Clarifythe Court's July 25, 2014 Order by DAN GLICKMAN, ANN M. VENEMAN, TOM VILSACK (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1939 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE re ( 1930 in 97-cv-1978- PLF, 1178 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF, 1178 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF) MOTION to Dismiss , and to Bifurcate Consideration of, the Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs of Boone Law Firm, P.A. MOTION to Bifurcate filed by LAW OFFICE OF DAVID A. BRANCH. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Branch, David) Modified to add additional linkage on 7/28/2014 (td, ). (Entered: 07/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1938 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER granting (1935) defendant's motion for appointment of a mediator through the Circuit Executive's Mediation Program and a stay of proceedings with respect to Mr. Fraas' petition for fees and expenses. This matter is referred to mediation for a one-day session and shall conclude on or before August 31, 2014, unless terminated earlier or extended at the request of the parties. Mr. Fraas' motion for an award of attorney's fees 1917 is stayed during the pendency of the referral to the Circuit Executive's Mediation Program. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 25, 2014. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1937 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1936 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion of Cross & Kearney for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by ANN M. VENEMAN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Moore, Tamra) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1935 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Mediationand To Stay Proceedings Pending the Outcome Thereof by TOM VILSACK (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1934 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to re (1174 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees by Phillip Fraas (1918 in 1:97-cv-01978) filed by TOM VILSACK. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit Index, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1933 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      SHOW CAUSE ORDER. On or before July 25, 2014, Boone Law Firm shall show cause in writing why the defendant's motion to dismiss its fee petition should not be granted, and if Boone does not respond in the time permitted, the petition will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 11, 2014. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1932 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part and holding in abeyance in part [#1930] defendant's motion to dismiss and to bifurcate consideration of the fee petition filed by the Boone Law Firm, P.A. Consideration of the Boone fee petition is bifurcated from consideration of the Fraas fee petition. The defendant's motion is held in abeyance with respect to its request to dismiss the Boone petition. The July 15, 2014 deadline for defendant's response to the Boone petition is vacated. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 11, 2014. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF. (MA) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1931 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Attorney Fees by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Jesse Kearney, # 3 Exhibit Declaration of David Fierst, # 4 Exhibit Time records, # 5 Exhibit Laffey Matrix, # 6 Exhibit Time Records for Seeking fees, # 7 Exhibit Expenses)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Fierst, David) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1930 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss , and to Bifurcate Consideration of, the Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs of Boone Law Firm, P.A. by DAN GLICKMAN, ANN M. VENEMAN (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Elliott, Stephen). Added MOTION to Bifurcate on 6/24/2014 (jf, ). (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1929 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen McCoy Elliott on behalf of All Defendants Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1928 Filed: 5/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Fee Petitions of Phillip Fraas and Levi Boone by TOM VILSACK (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 05/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1927 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs of Boone Law Firm, P.A. by LAW OFFICE OF DAVID A. BRANCH (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit List of Exhibits)(Branch, David) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1926 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION Settlement Agreement Regarding Attorney's Fees and Expenses by PHILLIP L. FRAAS. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1925 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Attorney Fees by PHILLIP L. FRAAS (Attachments: # 1 Order, # 2 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1924 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION on Attorney's Fees by PHILLIP L. FRAAS. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1923 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Levi Boone, III, Esq., :Firm- Boone Law Firm, P.A., :Address- 401 West Sunflower Road, P.O. Box 1772, Cleveland, MS 38732. Phone No. - 662-843-7946. Fax No. - 662-843-7950 by LAW OFFICE OF DAVID A. BRANCH Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Branch, David) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1922 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Tamra Tyree Moore on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Michael Sitcov (Moore, Tamra) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1921 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change in Firm Status by PHILLIP L. FRAAS Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1920 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sean W. Colligan, :Firm- Stinson Leonard Street LLP, :Address- 1201 Walnut, Suite 2900. Phone No. - 816-842-8600. Fax No. - 816-412-1079 by EDWARD L. SCOTT, JR (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1919 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION Staying Proceedings on Fee Petition of Phillip Fraas by PHILLIP L. FRAAS. (Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1918 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM re 1917 MOTION for Attorney Fees Claimant's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees filed by Edward L. Scott, Jr. by Edward L. Scott, Jr.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit A-3, # 5 Exhibit A-4, # 6 Exhibit A-5, # 7 Exhibit A-6)(Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1917 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Attorney Fees Claimant's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees by Edward L. Scott, Jr. (Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1916 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION Regarding Arbitrator's Findings and Recommendations (#1912), and Settling 1Q2011 and 2Q2011 Fee Petitions (#s1722, 1738) by CONLON FRANTZ PHELAN & PIRES. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1915 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Attorney Fees for Phillip Fraas 4Q 2013 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Documentation of Hours 4Q 2013)(Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1914 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER that any party wishing to file objections to the Arbitrator's Findings and Recommendations filed on December 16, 2013 [Dkt. 1912 in Civil Action No. 97-1978; Dkt. 1167 in Civil Action No. 98-1693] shall do so on or before January 17, 2014. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 23, 2013. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1913 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MONITOR'S FINAL EXPENSE REPORT, Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Roth, Randi) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1912 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Arbitrator's Findings and Recommendations regarding Class Counsel fees for the review of Track A non-credit benefit claims. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 16, 2013. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(MA) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1911 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 1840 Notice of Appeal, filed by MUHAMMAD ROBBALAA ; ORDERED that the motion for appointment of counsel be denied; FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for sumary affirmance be granted; FURTHER ORDERED that the motions to vacate and to stay be dismissed as moot. USCA Case Number 12-5302. (md, ) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1910 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals docketing fee was not paid because the fee was an Appeal by the Government re 1909 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (td, ) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1909 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to 1907 Order on Motion to Enforce, 1908 Memorandum & Opinion, by ANN M. VENEMAN, DAN GLICKMAN. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Josephson, Matthew) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1908 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPINION granting Mr. McGinnis' motion to enforce the Consent Decree. An order consistent with this opinion will issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 8, 2013. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1907 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting (1853) the motion to enforce the Consent Decree filed by claimant Maurice G. McGinnis. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 8, 2013. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1906 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Settlement of 2Q 2013 Fee Petition of P. Fraas by PHILLIP L. FRAAS. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1905 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Attorney Fees , and Costs and Expenses Incurred by Phillip L. Fraas for Implementation Work During the Period April 1, 2013, to June 30, 2013 by PHILLIP L. FRAAS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1904 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION re (1903 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees for Second Quarter, 2013 Settling Attorney Fees of Conlon Frantz & Phelan by ANN VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1903 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Attorney Fees for Second Quarter, 2013 by CONLON FRANTZ PHELAN & PIRES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1902 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION re (1894 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees , and Costs and Expenses, Incurred by Phillip L. Fraas for Implementation Work During the Period January 1, 2013, to March 31, 2013 by ANN VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1901 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Class Counsel Phillip Fraas's Submission in Response to the Court Order of May 7, 2013 by PHILLIP L. FRAAS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1900 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re (1157 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF) Memorandum & Opinion,, filed by CONLON FRANTZ PHELAN & PIRES. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1899 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that on or before May 31, 2013, Phillip L. Fraas and David J. Frantz are directed to file with the Court affidavits or declarations that describe what representations were made to the Facilitator or Monitor regarding Mr. McGinnis' choice between Track A adjudication and Track B arbitration before the issuance of the Monitor's decision, who made those representations, and on what basis those representations were made. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 7, 2013. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1898 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE re 1897 Civil Statement filed by DAN GLICKMAN, ANN M. VENEMAN. (Josephson, Matthew) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1897 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Civil Statement (Objections to the two notices of electronic filings) from Theodore F. Bates, Theodore B. Bates, Jr., Ava L. Bates, Karla K. Bates (Adams), Brad E. Bates, Terrie L. Bates (Best).. (td, ) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1896 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Claimant's Prentiss Guyton and Ellen Guyton by DAN GLICKMAN, ANN M. VENEMAN (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Hinton Declaration)(Josephson, Matthew) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1895 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall transfer whatever monies remain in the Court Registry to the US Department of Agriculture. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 16, 2013. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1894 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Attorney Fees , and Costs and Expenses, Incurred by Phillip L. Fraas for Implementation Work During the Period January 1, 2013, to March 31, 2013 by PHILLIP L. FRAAS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1893 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER that the United States Department of Agriculture shall, within 20 days of the entry of this order, refund the sum of $254,981.14 to claimants Prentiss Guyton and Ellen Guyton. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 10, 2013. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1892 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Settlement Agreement Regarding Attorney's Fees and Expenses by CONLON FRANTZ PHELAN & PIRES re (1890 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees for First Quarter, 2013 Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1891 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPINION granting (1806) Prentiss and Ellen Guyton's Motion to Enforce the Consent Decree in case 1:97-cv-01978-PLF. An order consistent with this opinion will issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 10, 2013. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1890 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Attorney Fees for First Quarter, 2013 by CONLON FRANTZ PHELAN & PIRES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1889 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY re 1882 Reply to Document filed by AVA L. BATES, BRAD E, BATES, THEODORE B. BATES, Jr, THEODORE F.B. BATES, KARLA K. BATES-ADAMS, TERRIE L. BATES-BEST; (See docket entry no. 1888 to view document) (td, ) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1888 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re 1879 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by AVA L. BATES, BRAD E, BATES, THEODORE B. BATES, Jr, THEODORE F.B. BATES, KARLA K. BATES-ADAMS, TERRIE L. BATES-BEST. (td, ) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1887 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 1884 Joint MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Frantz, David) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1886 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 1884 Joint MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment filed by DAN GLICKMAN, ANN M. VENEMAN. (Josephson, Matthew) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1885 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re (1149 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF) Joint MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment filed by MAURICE MCGINNIS. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Shoreman, John) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1884 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment by ANN VENEMAN (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Stipulation)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Bensing, Daniel) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1883 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying (1879) Theodore Bates' motion to reconsider this Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order of January 29, 2013. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 13, 2013. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1882 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Plaintiffs' Objection 1881 to the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order filed by DAN GLICKMAN, ANN M. VENEMAN. (Josephson, Matthew) Modified on 3/11/2013 (td, ). (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1881 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 1872 Order on Motion for Relief from Judgment, 1873 Order on Motion for Order, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,, filed by THEODORE F.B. BATES. (td, ) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1880 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re 1879 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by DAN GLICKMAN, ANN M. VENEMAN. (Josephson, Matthew) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1879 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Reconsideration of Memorandum Opinion and Order on the merits under the Constitution by AVA L. BATES, BRAD E, BATES, THEODORE B. BATES, Jr, THEODORE F.B. BATES, KARLA K. BATES-ADAMS, TERRIE L. BATES-BEST (td, ) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1878 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENTERED IN ERROR.....ORDER approving the Ombudsman's invoice for the period July 2012. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 25, 2013. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) Modified on 2/25/2013 (zmm, ). (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1877 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION of Settlement Regarding Attorney's Fees and Expenses by CONLON FRANTZ PHELAN & PIRES. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1876 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Settlement 4Q 2012 Fee Petition of P. Fraas by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1875 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 1862 Order, Recommendations Regarding Disposition of Accrued Interest Earned on Funds in the Court Registry filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Frantz, David) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1874 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 1862 Order, filed by DAN GLICKMAN, ANN M. VENEMAN. (Josephson, Matthew) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1873 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying (1845) Motion for Order; denying (1863) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (1867) Motion for Order; denying (1870) Motion for Order in case 1:97-cv-01978-PLF. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 29, 2013. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(MA) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1872 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting (1792) defendant's motion for relief from John W. Tyler, Jr., Track A claim; John W. Tyler, Jr.'s Track A claim is vacated; he shall receive no benefit as a result of his claim application (claim No. 12519). Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 22, 2013. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1871 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 1870 MOTION for Order, 1867 MOTION for Order, 1863 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 1845 MOTION for Order filed by DAN GLICKMAN, ANN M. VENEMAN. (Josephson, Matthew) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1870 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Order asking/requesting the Honorable presiding court Judge Paul L. Friedman to RUle on the Status of the Consent Decree by THEODORE F.B. BATES (td, ) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1869 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Attorney Fees for Phillip L. Fraas for 4Q-2012 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Phillip L. Fraas Exhibit 4Q-2012)(Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1868 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ERRATA by THEODORE F.B. BATES 1867 MOTION for Order filed by THEODORE F.B. BATES. (td, ) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1867 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Order to strike Mathew A. Josephson pleadings and proposed order by THEODORE F.B. BATES Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(td, ) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1866 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Attorney Fees for Fourth Quarter, 2012 by CONLON FRANTZ PHELAN & PIRES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1865 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER approving the Monitor's invoice for work completed pursuant to the court's order dated 8/2/12. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 8, 2013. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1864 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re 1863 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DAN GLICKMAN, ANN M. VENEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Josephson, Matthew) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1863 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment by THEODORE F.B. BATES; ("Let this be filed" by Judge Paul L. Friedman) (td, ) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1862 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER that the parties shall submit on or before January 30, 2013 either separate or joint filings addressing the interest that has accrued on the principal amount in the court registry. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 20, 2012. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1861 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re surplus registry funds as of December 17, 2012. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 20, 2012. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1860 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monitor's Report on Surplus Registry Funds as of December 17, 2012, Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1859 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE (Objections) filed by AVA L. BATES, BRAD E, BATES, THEODORE F.B. BATES, THEODORE B. BATES, Jr, KARLA K. BATES-ADAMS, TERRIE L. BATES-BEST; ("Let This Be Filed" by Judge Paul L. Friedman) (td, ) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1858 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 1857 Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis, 1848 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis ;USCA Case Number 12-5302. (td, ) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1857 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 1848 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 11/15/2012. (zmm, ) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1856 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re (1136 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF) MOTION to Enforce Consent Order filed by DAN GLICKMAN, ANN M. VENEMAN, DAN GLICKMAN, ANN VENEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Adjudication Decision, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Adjudication Reexamination Decision)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Josephson, Matthew) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1855 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 1854 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis, 1840 Notice of Appeal, ;USCA Case Number 12-5302. (td, ) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1854 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by MUHAMMAD ROBBALAA (td, ) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1853 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Enforce Consent Order by Maurice McGinnis (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Shoreman, John) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1852 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Shoreman on behalf of Maurice McGinnis Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Shoreman, John) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1851 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re (1132 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF) re 1845 MOTION for the presiding Court Judge to redress Bate's grievance on the merits pursuant to the constitution , filed by DAN GLICKMAN, ANN M. VENEMAN, DAN GLICKMAN, ANN VENEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration James F. Radintz)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Josephson, Matthew) Modified on 11/2/2012 to edit relationship (dr). (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1850 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION re (1844 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs for Third Quarter, 2012 by CONLON FRANTZ PHELAN & PIRES. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1849 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER of USCA as to 1840 Notice of Appeal, filed by MUHAMMAD ROBBALAA ; ODERED that the motion to appeal in forma pauperis be referred to the district court for resolution in the first instance; FURTHER ORDERED that this case be held in abeyance pending further order of the court. USCA Case Number 12-5302. (mmh) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1848 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by MUHAMMAD ROBBALAA (mmh) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1847 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Theodore F.B. Bates's Motion (Dkt. 1845) by DAN GLICKMAN, ANN M. VENEMAN, DAN GLICKMAN, ANN VENEMAN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Josephson, Matthew) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1846 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION of settlement 3Q 2012 fee petition of P. Fraas by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1845 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for the presiding Court Judge to redress Bate's grievance on the merits pursuant to the constitution by THEODORE F.B. BATES' "Let this be filed" by Judge Paul L. Friedman (td, ) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1844 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs for Third Quarter, 2012 by CONLON FRANTZ PHELAN & PIRES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1843 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Attorney Fees for Phillip L. Fraas for 3Q-2012 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Phillip L. Fraas Exhibit 3Q-2012)(Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 10/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1842 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER of USCA as to 1840 Notice of Appeal, filed by MUHAMMAD ROBBALAA ; USCA Case Number 12-5302. ORDERED, on the court's own motion, that by October 31, 2012, appellant either pay the $455 appellate docketing and filing fees to the Clerk of the District Court, see Fed. R. App. P. 3(e); 28 U.S.C. § 1917, or file a motion in district court for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis, see Fed. R. App. P. 24(a). (kb) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1841 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court re 1840 Notice of Appeal. (rdj) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1840 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 1824 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Default Judgment by MUHAMMAD ROBBALAA. Filing fee $ 0.00. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified.*original notice filed 7/18/12 was sent to US Court of Appeals for the 10th Circuit per appellants request* (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(rdj) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1839 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mail Returned as undeliverable sent to Curtis Dixon. Type of Document Returned: Court's Minute Order dated 8/21/2012. No forwarding information provided. (cdw) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1838 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION re (1829 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees Cost and Expenses incurred 2d Quarter 2012. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1837 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION re (1831 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees for Phillip L. Fraas for 2Q-2012 . Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1836 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION re (1781 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees incurred by Faya Rose Toure' for Implementation Work During the Period from October 1, 2011 - December 30, 2011 . Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1835 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION re (1830 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs for Second Quarter, 2012 by CONLON FRANTZ PHELAN & PIRES. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1834 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER: Randi Ilyse Roth shall be appointed as Monitor pursuant to paragraph 12 of the Consent Decree and pursuant to the April 4, 2000 Order of Reference for the sole purpose of reviewing the record and preparing and issuing a Monitor decision in claim number 19985. Ms. Roth may invoice funds currently in the Court Registry to pay for this work. Invoicing procedures will be the same as those specified in the Order of Reference. The due date of the Monitor's last unspent funds report shall be extended until 15 days after the issuance of the Monitor decision referenced above. If the Monitor is not able to issue the decision on or before August 30, the Monitor shall report to the Court as to the date on which the decision will issue. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 8/1/2012. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(zmm, ) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1833 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION and Order by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1832 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of appeal of the District Court Decision dated May 22, 2012 which is being taken to the United States Court of Appeals in the 10th Circuit located in Denver, Colorado by HENRY BURRIS, MUHAMMAD ROBBALAA (td, ) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1831 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Attorney Fees for Phillip L. Fraas for 2Q-2012 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Phillip L. Fraas Exhibit 2Q-2012)(Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1830 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs for Second Quarter, 2012 by CONLON FRANTZ PHELAN & PIRES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1829 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Attorney Fees Cost and Expenses incurred by ROSE M. SANDERS Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Toure, Faya) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1828 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monitor's Request for an Extension of Time to Report on Surplus Registry Funds as of March 31, 2012, Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1827 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE re (1120 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF, 1826 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Second Quarter Billing 2012 . Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1826 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Second Quarter Billing 2012 by ROSE M. SANDERS Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Toure, Faya) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1825 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Monitor's Request for an Extension of Time to Report on Surplus Registry Funds as of March 31, 2012, Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Roth, Randi) (Entered: 06/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1824 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 1743 motion to hear movants' motion to vacate the arbitration award in the claims of William Burris, Muhammad Robbalaa, and Henry Burris; and denying 1766 motion for default judgment. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 17, 2012. (lcplf2) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1823 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION re (1811 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees Cost & Expenses Incurred by Chestnut Sanders. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1822 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION re (1814 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs for First Quarter, 2012 of Conlon Frantz. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1821 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION re (1816 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees for Phillip L. Fraas for 1Q-2012. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1820 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER that, in accordance with the Monitor's Final Report on Good Faith Implementation of the Consent Decree filed on March 31, 2012, a status conference in this case is scheduled for Wednesday, May 23, 2012 at 2:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 26, 2012. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1819 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of March 2012. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 24, 2012. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1818 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re (1105 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF) MOTION to Enforce Consent Decree. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1817 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER approving the Monitor's invoice for the period of February 2012. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 6, 2012. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (lcplf2) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1816 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Attorney Fees for Phillip L. Fraas for 1Q-2012 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Phillip L. Fraas Exhibit 1Q-2012)(Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1815 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 1806 MOTION to Enforce Consent Decree and to 1809 Monitor's response to motion to enforce consent decree filed by ANN M. VENEMAN. (Sitcov, Michael) Modified on to add linkage 4/6/2012 (td, ). (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1814 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs for First Quarter, 2012 by CONLON FRANTZ PHELAN & PIRES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1813 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED EXHIBITS to 1809 Document filed by RANDI ILYSE ROTH. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zmm, ) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1812 Filed: 4/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monitor's Final Report on Good Faith Implementation of the Consent Decree and Recommendation for Status Conference, Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/2/2012) (zmm, ). (Entered: 04/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1811 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Attorney Fees Cost & Expenses Incurred by ROSE M. SANDERS Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Toure, Faya) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1810 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Filing Under Seal Exhibits to the Monitor's Response to Motion to Enforce Consent Decree, Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1809 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Monitor's Response to Motion to Enforce Consent Decree, Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1808 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Exhibit 4, # 3 Exhibit 5, # 4 Exhibit 6, # 5 Exhibit 7, # 6 Exhibit 8)(ztd, ) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1807 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Materials Under Seal by ALL PLAINTIFFS re (1806 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION to Enforce Consent Decree Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1806 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Enforce Consent Decree by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1805 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits 2 - 8 to Motion of Prentiss and Ellen Guyton to Enforce the Consent Decree by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1804 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of January 2012. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 9, 2012. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (lcplf2) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1803 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Monitor's Thirteenth Report on Debt Relief Implementation, Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1802 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION re (1788 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs for Fourth Quarter, 2011. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1801 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mail Returned as undeliverable. Sent to Curtis Dixon; Type of Document Returned: 1768 Order in 1:97-cv-1978-PLF and 1071 Order in 1:98-cv-1693-PLF; No new address on file. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(zmm, ) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1800 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mail Returned as undeliverable. Sent to Curtis Dixon; Type of Document Returned: 1764 Order and 11/9/2011 Minute Order in 1:97-cv-1978-PLF and 1068 Order and 11/9/2011 Minute Order in 1:98-cv-1693-PLF; No new address on file. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(zmm, ) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1799 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION re (1783 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees for Phillip L. Fraas for 4Q-2011. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1798 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Monitor's Request for an Extension of Time to Report on Debt Relief Implementation, Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1797 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of December 2011. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 10, 2012. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1796 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: On or before February 17, 2012, the Monitor shall report to the Court regarding the status of the debt relief review, implementation, and verification process, and, in particular, the status of any unresolved questions regarding the appropriate debt relief that individual claimants are entitled to receive. See Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 2/7/2012. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(zmm, ) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1795 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Monitor's Twelfth Report on Debt Relief Implementation, Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1794 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM re (1792 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1091 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF) MOTION for Relief from Judgment as to John Tyler's Track A Claim filed by ANN M. VENEMAN by ANN M. VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(td, ) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1793 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .MOTION for Relief from Judgment as to John Tyler's Track A Claim by ANN M. VENEMAN (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Adjudicator Decision, # 2 Exhibit Confession and Claim Sheet)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Josephson, Matthew) Modified on 2/3/2012 (td, ). (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1792 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Relief from Judgment as to John Tyler's Track A Claim by ANN M. VENEMAN Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Josephson, Matthew) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1791 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Josephson on behalf of ANN M. VENEMAN Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Josephson, Matthew) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1790 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: Upon consideration of the Monitor's Eleventh Report on Debt Relief Implementation (filed January 12, 2012), and for the reasons stated therein, it is ordered that on or before February 3, 2012, the Monitor shall report to the Court regarding 1. The progress that has been made in resolving any remaining questions regarding the debt relief claimants are entitled to receive and implementing the appropriate debt relief in the cases identified in the Monitor's Eleventh Report; and 2. Any additional steps that should be taken prior to March 31, 2012, to complete the debt relief review, implementation, and verification process for all prevailing claimants who may be entitled to Pigford debt relief. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 1/31/2012. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(zmm, ) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1789 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re 1780 MOTION for Attorney Fees Cost & Expenses Incurred October 1, 2011 through December 30, 2011 filed by ROSE M. SANDERS. (Toure, Faya) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1788 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs for Fourth Quarter, 2011 by CONLON FRANTZ PHELAN & PIRES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1787 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Monitor's Eleventh Report on Debt Relief Implementation, Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1786 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re (1781 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1082 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF) Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees incurred by Faya Rose Toure' for Implementation Work During the Period from October 1, 2011 - December 30, 2011, (1780 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees Cost & Expenses Incurred. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1785 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mail Returned as undeliverable. Sent to Curtis Dixon, 374 Broadview Drive, Jackson, MS 39209; Type of Document Returned: 12/2/2011 Minute Order. No new address on file. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(zmm, ) Modified on 1/10/2012 (zmm, ). (Entered: 01/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1784 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING MONITOR DUTIES: It is stipulated and ordered that 1. Paragraph 1 of the September 21, 2011 Stipulation and Order is amended to permit the Monitor to complete the substantive responsibilities set forth in paragraph 12 of the Consent Decree no later than March 31, 2012. All other provisions of the Stipulation and Order shall remain in effect. 2. The funds to support the Monitor's work through March 31, 2012, shall be drawn from the total budget amount approved by the Court's Order filed on July 5, 2011. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 1/10/2012. (zmm, ) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1783 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Attorney Fees for Phillip L. Fraas for 4Q-2011 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Phillip L. Fraas Exhibit 4Q-2011)(Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1782 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION and Order Regarding Monitor's Duties by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1781 Filed: 1/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees incurred by Faya Rose Toure' for Implementation Work During the Period from October 1, 2011 - December 30, 2011 by ROSE M. SANDERS Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Toure, Faya) (Entered: 01/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1780 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Attorney Fees Cost & Expenses Incurred by ROSE M. SANDERS (Toure, Faya) (Entered: 12/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1779 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mail Returned as undeliverable. Sent to Curtis Dixon; Type of Document Returned: Order [1771 in 97-cv-1978] and (1074) in 98-cv-1693. No new address on file. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(zmm, ) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1778 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: On or before January 12, 2012, the Monitor shall report to the Court regading 1. The tasks remaining to complete Pigford debt relief review, implementation, and verification process for all prevailing claimants who may be entitled to Pigford debt relief; and 2. The timeframe for completing these tasks, including a recommendation on whether the Monitor's appointment should be extended beyond 1/31/2012, to permit the Monitor to continue to participate in the debt relief review, implementation, and verification process. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 12/19/2011. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(zmm, ) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1777 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Monitor's Tenth Report on Debt Relief Implementation, Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1776 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of November 2011. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 13, 2011. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1775 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mail Returned as undeliverable. Sent to Curtis Dixon, 374 Broadview Drive, Jackson, MS 39209; Type of Document Returned: 1762 Order in 1:97-cv-1978 and 1066 Order in 1:98-cv-1693; No new address on file. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(zmm, ) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1774 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mail Returned as undeliverable. Sent to Curtis Dixon, 374 Broadview Drive, Jackson, MS 39209; Type of Document Returned: 8/30/11 Minute Order; No new address on file. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(zmm, ) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1773 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mail Returned as undeliverable. Sent to Curtis Dixon, 374 Broadview Drive, Jackson, MS 39209; Type of Document Returned: 1750 and 1751 Orders in 1:97-cv-1978 and 1053 and 1054 Orders in 1:98-cv-1693; No new address on file. (zmm, ) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1772 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re Monitor's Ninth Report on Debt Relief Implemendation. The Monitor shall file a report with the Court on or before December 15, 2011. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 8, 2011. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 12/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1771 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period October 2011. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 6, 2011. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1770 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Monitor's Ninth Report on Debt Relief Implementation, Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1769 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION re (1759 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs for Third Quarter, 2011. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1768 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER approving stipulation and order of settlement and dismissal that resolves Chestnut Sanders Sanders & Pettaway LLC's motions for attorney's fees and expenses 1573 , 1603 , 1620 , 1646 , 1664 , 1668 , 1683 , 1700 , 1721 , and their fees, expenses and costs for the Track B claim of New Communities Inc. 1675 , 1697 . Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 28, 2011. associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) Modified on 12/2/2011 (jeb, ). (Main Document 1768 replaced on 12/2/2011) (zmm, ). (Main Document 1768 replaced on 12/2/2011) (zmm, ). (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1767 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION re (1603 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees, (1664 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees, (1574 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees, (1646 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees, (1721 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) Quarterly MOTION for Attorney Fees Expenses and Cost, (1683 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees, (1682 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees, (1675 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees, (1573 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees, (1620 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees, (1700 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees and Cost and Expenses -- Settling and Dismissing Same. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1766 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Default Judgment as to all respondents by HENRY BURRIS, MUHAMMAD ROBBALAA; ("Let this be filed" by Judge Paul L. Friedman) (td, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1765 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION re (1603 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees, (1664 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees, (1646 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees, (1721 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) Quarterly MOTION for Attorney Fees Expenses and Cost, (1683 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees, (1675 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees, (1573 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees, (1620 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees, (1700 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees and Cost and Expenses -- Settling and Dismissing Same. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1764 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of September 2011. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 8, 2011. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1763 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION re (1757 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees Of Chestnut Sanders for 3Q2011. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1762 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER approving 1761 Settlement Agreement Regarding Attorney's Fees and Expenses regarding 1760 Phillip L. Fraas' Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs for the Quarter July 1-September 30, 2011. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/28/2011. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(zmm, ) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1761 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION re (1760 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees for Phillip L. Fraas for 3Q-2011. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1760 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Attorney Fees for Phillip L. Fraas for 3Q-2011 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Phillip L. Fraas Exhibit 3Q-2011)(Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1759 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs for Third Quarter, 2011 by CONLON FRANTZ PHELAN & PIRES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1758 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of August 2011. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 11, 2011. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1757 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Attorney Fees (for July 1, 2011-September 30, 2011) by ALL PLAINTIFFS Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(znmw, ) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1756 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER approving 1060 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF Stipulation of Dismissal of Claims fpr Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses. In re: The Track B Arbitration of Alvin Steppes Claim No. 17906, Arbitration No. 069. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/3/2011. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(zmm, ) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1755 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER approving 1754 Stipulation Regarding Termination of Monitor's Paragraph 12 Duties. See Order for specifics. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 9/21/2011. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(zmm, ) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1754 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and Order Regarding Termination of Monitor's Paragraph 12 Duties by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1753 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . . DUPLICATE OF DOCKET ENTRY NO. 1754 IN 97-1978. . . . .STIPULATION. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Bensing, Daniel) Modified on 9/19/2011 (td, ). (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1752 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER approving settlement agreement regarding 1738 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs for Conlon, Frantz, & Phelan LLP for Second Quarter 2011 in case 1:97-cv-01978-PLF Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 9/14/2011. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(zalg, ) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1751 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER approving settlement agreement regarding attorneys' fees and expenses Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 9/12/2011. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(zmm, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1750 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of July 2011. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 13, 2011. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1749 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION re (1738 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs for 2nd Quarter 2011. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1748 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION Settling Attorney's Fees for the Track B Claim of Lymon Wilson. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1747 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER that, on or before September 16, 2011, any party who wishes to do so shall file any objections to the Arbitrator's September 2, 2011 findings and recommendations as to Cross & Kearney's motion for attorneys' fees and costs. Any responses to the objections shall be filed on or before September 23, 2011. Cross & Kearney's motions for a status conference (Docket Nos. 1726 and 1744 in Civil Action No. 97-1978) are DENIED. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 2, 2011. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF. (lcplf2) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1746 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ARBITRATOR'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Fees of Cross & Kearney PLLC in the Track B Arbitration of Alvin Steppes. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF. (lcplf2) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1745 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION Settling 2Q2011 Fee Petition of Phillip Fraas. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1744 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Second MOTION for Hearing on Fee Request by Cross & Kearney PLLC by ALL PLAINTIFFS Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Fierst, David) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1743 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to hear movants' motion to vacate the arbitration award in the claims of William Burris, Muhammad Robbalaa and Henry Burris by HENRY BURRIS, MUHAMMAD ROBBALAA; ("Let this be filed" by Judge Paul L. Friedman signed 8/8/11) (td, ) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1742 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Monitor's Report on Surplus Registry Funds as of June 30, 2011, Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1741 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of June 2011. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 8, 2011. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1740 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Attorney Fees for Phillip L. Fraas for 2Q-2011 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Phillip L. Fraas Exhibit 2Q-2011)(Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1739 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION re (1735 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees Cost & Expenses from April 1, 2011 to June 30, 2011 of Chestnut Sanders Sanders & Pettaway LLC by ANN VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1738 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs for 2nd Quarter 2011 by CONLON FRANTZ PHELAN & PIRES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1737 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER approving the Monitor's invoice for the period of May 2011. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan for Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 12, 2011. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF. (lcplf2) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1736 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER approving the Monitor's request for a total budget amount of $1,500,979.00 for the period of July 1, 2011 through January 31, 2012. In accordance with paragraph 17 of the Order of Reference, the United States Department of Agriculture shall deposit with the Clerk of the Court, United States District Court for the District of Columbia, a sum equal to a pro-rata month's portion of the approved budget within the first fifteen (15) days of each month. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 7/5/2011. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(zmm, ) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1735 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Attorney Fees Cost & Expenses from April 1, 2011 to June 30, 2011 by ROSE M. SANDERS Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Toure, Faya) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1734 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Monitor's Eighth Report on Debt Relief Implementation, Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1733 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of April 2011. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 3, 2011. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1732 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monitor's Report Regarding Implementation of the Consent Decree for the Period of January 1, 2010, Through December 31, 2010 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1, # 2 Appendix 2, # 3 Appendix 3, # 4 Appendix 4, # 5 Appendix 5, # 6 Appendix 6, # 7 Appendix 7, # 8 Appendix 8), Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1731 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re (1026 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF) Quarterly MOTION for Attorney Fees Expenses and Cost and Expenses Incurred By Chestnut, Sanders, Sanders & Pettaway From January-March 2011 filed by ROSE M. SANDERS. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Toure, Faya) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1730 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND ORDER regarding Attorney's Fees and Expenses signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 5/25//11. (ad) Modified on 5/25/2011 (ad). (Entered: 05/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1729 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION re (1724 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs for First Quarter 2011 Settling Attorney's Fees and Expenses by CONLON FRANTZ PHELAN & PIRES. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1728 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Monitor's Report on Surplus Registry Funds as of March 31, 2011, Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1727 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION re (1720 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees for Phillip L. Fraas for 1Q-2011 Settling Same by ANN VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1726 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Hearing re (1494 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees on behalf of Cross & Kearney PLLC by ALL PLAINTIFFS Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Fierst, David) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1725 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER approving the Monitor's invoice for the period of March 2011. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 28, 2011. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF. (lcplf2) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1724 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs for First Quarter 2011 by CONLON FRANTZ PHELAN & PIRES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1723 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re (1026 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF, 1721 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) Quarterly MOTION for Attorney Fees Expenses and Cost of Chestnut Sanders filed by ANN VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1722 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Attorney Fees FOR FIRST QUARTER, 2011 by CONLON FRANTZ PHELAN & PIRES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1721 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Quarterly MOTION for Attorney Fees Expenses and Cost by ROSE M. SANDERS Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Toure, Faya) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1720 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Attorney Fees for Phillip L. Fraas for 1Q-2011 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Phillip L. Fraas Exhibit 1Q-2011)(Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1719 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER that the monitor's request for a total budget amount of $712,071.00 for the period of April 1, 2011 through June 30, 2011 is approved. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 25, 2011. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1718 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION re (1706 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees for Philllip L. Fraas for 4Q 2010 by ANN VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1717 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of February 2011. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 22, 2011. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1716 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENTERED IN ERROR.....PER CHAMBERS.....MOTION for Leave to File a $1.25 Billion Personal Injury Claim Against the United States Department of Agriculture and Federal Crop Insurance by ANGELA DOZIER-CARTER (td, ) Modified on 3/3/2011 (td, ). (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1715 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION re (1702 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees for 4th Quarter, 2010 of Conlon Frantz by ANN VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1714 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of January 2011. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 23, 2011. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1713 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re (1008 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF) Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees and Cost and Expenses Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Response to Chestnut, Sanders Motion to Award Fees filed by ROSE M. SANDERS. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Toure, Faya) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1712 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER setting forth responsibilities of Independent Monitor. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 2/17/11. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(lin, ) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1711 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re Monitor's Seventh Report on Debt Relief Implementation filed February 15, 2011. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 17, 2011. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1710 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Monitor's Seventh Report on Debt Relief Implementation, Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1709 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re (985 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF, 1675 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Chestnut Sanders re Track B Claim of New Communities, Inc. filed by ANN VENEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Sample Tinubu bill)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1708 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monitor's Report on Surplus Registry Funds as of December 31, 2010, Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1707 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1706 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Attorney Fees for Philllip L. Fraas for 4Q 2010 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Itemized Time Entries and Fees)(Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1705 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of December 2010. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on Febriaru 2, 2011. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1704 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re (1008 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF, 1700 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees and Cost and Expenses re Chestnut Sanders' 4Q2010 Fee Petition filed by ANN VENEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 12/30/10 Sanders letter)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1703 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Monitor's Request for Extension of Time to Report, Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1702 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Attorney Fees for 4th Quarter, 2010 by CONLON FRANTZ PHELAN & PIRES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1701 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER that the monitor's request for a total budget amount for the period of January 1, 2011 through March 31, 2011 is approved. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 7, 2011. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1700 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees and Cost and Expenses by J.L. CHESTNUT Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Toure, Faya) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1699 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re (1697 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by TIMOTHY C. PIGFORD. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Toure, Faya) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1698 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE re (1697 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1005 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF) Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees Seeking to Award Fees For Lack of Timely Objection filed by ANN M. VENEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1697 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees by ROSE M. SANDERS Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Toure, Faya) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1696 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of November 2010. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts for Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 16, 2010. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(lcplf2) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1695 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION Settling 3Q2010 Fee Petition of Phillip Fraas by ANN M. VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1694 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION Settling Beasley Track A Attorney's Fees by ANN M. VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1693 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of October 2010. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 30, 2010. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 11/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1692 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re (1683 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 993 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees for 3Q2010 by Chestnut Sanders and re Document 1690 filed by ANN M. VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1691 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of insurance claim by ANGELA DOZIER-CARTER (td, ) Modified on 12/1/2010 (td, ). (DOCUMENT HAS BEEN REMOVED PENDING DECISION FROM CHAMBERS ON WHETHER OR NOT IT SHOULD BE ENTERED ON THE DOCKET.) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1690 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re (993 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees Chestnut, Sanders, Sanders & Pettaway L.L.C filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Toure, Faya) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1689 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION Settling 3rd Quarter 2010 Fee Petition of Conlon Frantz by ANN M. VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1688 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re (1683 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 993 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees for 3Q 2010 (Chestnut Sanders) filed by ANN M. VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1687 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of September 2010. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 2, 2010. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1686 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, filed by ROSE M. SANDERS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(dr) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1685 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Attorney Fees for Third Quarter, 2010 by CONLON FRANTZ PHELAN & PIRES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1684 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Attorney Fees Phillip L. Fraas for 3Q 2010 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Phillip L. Fraas Itemization of Hours and Expenses)(Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1683 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Attorney Fees and expenses incurred by Chestnut,Sanders,Sanders & Pettaway, LLC for implementation work during the period from July 1, 2010 through September 30, 2010 by ALL PLAINTIFFS Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(td, ) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1682 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Attorney Fees, Costs and Expenses during the period from 7/1/2010 through 9/30/2010 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (znmw, ) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1681 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER approving monitor's invoice for the period of August 2010. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/1/10. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1680 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER that, upon consideration of the monitor's sixth report on debt relief implementation filed 9/14/10, the monitor shall file a report on or before January 28, 2011 (see order for specifics). Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 30,2010. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1679 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION Settling Attorney Fee Claims of Michael W. Beasley by ANN VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1678 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION to (663 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 356 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 383 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) Report and Recommendations filed by TIMOTHY C. PIGFORD. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Toure, Faya) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1677 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (1675 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees of Rose Sanders re Track B Claim of New Communities, Inc. by ANN VENEMAN (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9/8/2010 Letter to Sanders from Defendant's Attorney, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1676 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monitor's Sixth Report on Debt Relief Implementation, Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1675 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Fees, expenses and fee enhancement by ALL PLAINTIFFS Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(td, ) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1674 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of July 2010. Signed by Judge Roberts for Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 3, 2010.Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(MA) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1673 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION re (1665 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees for Second Quarter, 2010 Settling Conlon Frantz's Fee Petition by ANN VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1672 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to opposition to re ( 1664 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(jf, ) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1671 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re (1664 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees for 2d Quarter 2010 by Chestnut Sanders filed by ANN VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1670 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Monitor's Report on Surplus Registry Funds as of June 30, 2010, Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1669 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION Settling 2Q2010 Fee Petition of Phillip Fraas (#1668) by ANN VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1668 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Attorney Fees by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1667 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER that, upon consideration of the Monitor's fifth report on debt relief implementation (filed July 1, 2010), the Monitor shall report to the court on or before September 15, 2010, regarding the progress of the substantive review of USDA's implementation of Pigford debt relief, and USDA's implementation of the IRS guidance for issuing IRS Forms 1099-C to claimants who have received debt relief. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 28, 2010. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF. (lcplf2) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1666 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of June 2010. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 26, 2010. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF. (lcplf2) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1665 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Attorney Fees for Second Quarter, 2010 by CONLON FRANTZ PHELAN & PIRES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1664 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Attorney Fees for implementation work during the period from April 1, 2010 to June 21, 2010 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (td, ) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1663 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Monitor's Fifth Report on Debt Relief Implementation, Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1662 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of May 2010. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 29, 2010. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1661 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER approving the monitor's budget for the period of July 1, 2010 through December 31, 2010. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 25, 2010. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(MA) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1660 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss 1659 defendant's opposition to motion for attorney fees, costs and expenses incurred by Chestnut, Sanders, Sanders & Pettaway from April 1, 2009 through June 30, 2009 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (td, ) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1659 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re (896 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF, 1573 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees and in Opposition to Chestnut Sanders Motion to Dismiss Defendant's 5/24/10 Opposition Brief filed by ANN VENEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1658 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Monitor's Report Regarding Implementation of the Consent Decree for the Period of January 1, 2009, Through December 31, 2009 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1, # 2 Appendix 2, # 3 Appendix 3, # 4 Appendix 4, # 5 Appendix 5, # 6 Appendix 6, # 7 Appendix 7, # 8 Appendix 8, # 9 Appendix 9, # 10 Appendix 10)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1657 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re 1653 MOTION to Intervene filed by DAN GLICKMAN. (Sitcov, Michael) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1656 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re (1646 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees by Chestnut Sanders for 1Q2010 filed by ANN VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1655 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of April 2010. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 4, 2010. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(MA) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1654 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to re (966 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF) MOTION to Intervene filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1653 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Intervene by BLACK FARMERS & AGRICULTURALISTS ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED (td, ) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1652 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re (897 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF, 1574 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees of Chesnut Sanders for 2d Quarter 2009 filed by ANN VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1651 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WITHDRAWN PER ORDER FILED 5/14/2010.....MOTION to Withdraw Memorandum in Opposition to Objection to Fees (1647 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) filed by Chestnut Firm Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(zmm, ) Modified on 5/17/2010 (td, ). (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1650 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of March 2010. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 5, 2010. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF. (lcplf2) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1649 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION Settling 1st Quarter 2010 Fee Petition of Conlon Frantz by ANN VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1648 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION Settling 1st Quarter 2009 Fee Petition of Phillip Fraas by ANN VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1647 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WITHDRAWN PER MINUTE ORDER FILED 5/14/2010.....MOTION to File Fee Petition Response to Defendants Objections to Attorney Fees out of time by ALL PLAINTIFFS. "Let this be Filed," Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 4/19/2010. (dr) Modified on 5/14/2010 (zmm, ). (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1646 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Attorney Fees by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(rdj) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1645 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Attorney Fees for 1st Quarter, 2010 by CONLON FRANTZ PHELAN & PIRES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1644 Filed: 4/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to file First Quarter Billing 2010 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (td, ) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1643 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Attorney Fees for Phillip L. Fraas for 1Q 2010 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Phillip L. Fraas - Itemization of Hours and Expenses)(Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1642 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER authorizing the Monitor to disclose a representative sample of certain documents to the Archivist of the National Archives or a designee of the Archivist. See Order for specifics. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 3/29/2010. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(zmm, ) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1641 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of February 2010. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 25, 2010. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1640 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and Order by ALL PLAINTIFFS, DAN GLICKMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1639 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of January 2010. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 15, 2010. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF. (lcplf2) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1638 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to expedite funds by ANGELA DOZIER-CARTER; ("Let this be filed" by Judge Paul L. Friedman) (td, ) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1637 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER closing the following motions upon consideration of (1) the stipulation filed by the defendant and class counsel Chestnut Sanders Sanders Pettaway & Campbell on March 4, 2010, and (2) the arbitrator's findings and recommendations regarding Chestnut Sanders' fees: (1083) Motion for Attorney Fees; (1118) Motion for Attorney Fees; (1149) Motion for Attorney Fees; (1205) Motion for Attorney Fees; (1208) Motion for Attorney Fees; (1239) Motion for Attorney Fees; (1266) Motion for Attorney Fees; (1300) Motion for Attorney Fees; (1304) Motion for Attorney Fees; (1339) Motion for Attorney Fees; (1364) Motion for Attorney Fees; (1390) Motion for Attorney Fees; (1411) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:97-cv-01978-PLF. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 3/5/2010. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(zmm, ) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1636 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER: In consideration of defendant's payment of $452,993.56, and Chestnut Sanders Sanders & Pettaway LLC's acceptance of that amount, in full and final satisfaction of the firm's fee petitions for work performed between October 1, 2004 and June 30, 2007 in this case, defendant and the firm (jointly "the parties") hereby stipulate and agree to the following: 1. In order to put an end to their longstanding fee disputes, and to avoid such disputes in the future, the parties agree to accept and abide by the Findings and Recommendations issued by Arbitrator Michael Lewis on February 4, 2010. See Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 3/5/2010. (zmm, ) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1635 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER ADOPTING ARBITRATOR'S RECOMMENDATIONS [#1628] REGARDING CHESTNUT SANDERS' PENDING AND FUTURE FEE PETITIONS by ANN VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1634 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION Settling 4Q2009 Fee Petition of Conlon Frantz (#1624) by ANN VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1633 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION re (1625 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees for Phillip L. Fraas for 4Q 2009 by ANN VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1632 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Monitor's Report on Surplus Registry Funds as of December 31, 2009, Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1631 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of December 2009. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 12, 2010. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(lcplf2) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1630 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED ORDER that on or before March 2, 2010, the parties shall file any objections to the Arbitrator's February 4, 2010 findings and recommendations regarding Chestnut Sanders' motions for attorneys' fees for the period of October 1, 2004, through May 30, 2007. Any responses to the objections shall be filed on or before March 16, 2010. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 9, 2010. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (lcplf2) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1629 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER that on or before March 2, 2010, the parties shall file any objections to the Arbitrator's February 4, 2010 findings and recommendations regarding Chestnut Sanders' motions for attorneys' fees for the period of October 1, 2004, through May 30, 2007. Any responses to the objections shall be filed on or before March 16, 2010. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 9, 2010. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (lcplf2) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1628 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ARBITRATOR'S FINDINGS & RECOMMENDATIONS on Fees of Class Counsel Chestnut, Sanders, Pettaway & Campbell by MICHAEL K. LEWIS; Appendix A (to be filed at later date) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix B)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(jeb, ) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1627 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re (1620 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees for 4th Quarter 2009 by Chestnut, Sanders, Sanders & Pettaway LLC filed by ANN VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1626 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER that, upon consideration of the Monitor's fourth report on debt relief implementation (filed 1/15/10), the monitor shall report to the court on or before 7/1/10 re the substantive review of USDA's implementation of Pigford debt relief, and USDA's implementation of the IRS guidance for issuing IRS forms 1099-C to claimants who have received debt relief. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 25, 2010. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1625 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Attorney Fees for Phillip L. Fraas for 4Q 2009 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Itemized Time Entries and Fees)(Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1624 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs for Fourth Quarter, 2009 by CONLON FRANTZ PHELAN & PIRES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1623 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Monitor's Fourth Report on Debt Relief Implementation, Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1622 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER approving 1621 Stipulation. Ordered that the Monitor shall remain in existence until her duties under the Consent Decree are completed, or until 6/15/2011, whichever occurs first. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 1/13/2010. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(zmm, ) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1621 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION and Order by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1620 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Attorney Fees and costs and expenses incurred by Chestnut, Sanders, Sanders and Pettaway, LLC for implementation work during the period from October 1, 2009, to December 23, 2009 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (td, ) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1619 Filed: 12/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION Settling 3d Quarter 2009 Fee Petition of Phillip Fraas by ANN VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 12/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1618 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of November 2009. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 18, 2009. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1617 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER approving monitor's request for a total budget amount for the period January 1, 2010 through June 30, 2010. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 11, 2009. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(MA) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1616 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of October 2009. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 1, 2009.Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(MA) (Entered: 12/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1615 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION Settling 3Q2009 Attorney's Fees for Conlon Frantz by ANN VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1614 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of September 2009. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 13, 2009. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(MA) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1613 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re the monitor's third report on debt relief implementation filed August 27, 2009. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 30, 2009. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(MA) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1612 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re (1603 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees for 3Q 2009 by Chestnut Sanders filed by ANN M. VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1611 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Attorney Fees for Third Quarter 2009 by CONLON FRANTZ PHELAN & PIRES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1610 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER approving 930 Settlement Agreement Regarding Attorneys' Fees and Expenses with respect to fees requested by Covington & Burling for the Estate of Charlie Knott Track B Claim 1573 . Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/13/2009. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(mm) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1609 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER approving 1606 Settlement Agreement Regarding Attorney's Fees and Expensees regarding the law firm of Shutts & Bowen, L.L.P. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/8/2009. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(mm) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1608 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of August 2009. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 8, 2009.Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(MA) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1607 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SURREPLY to Motion of Cross & Kearney PLLC for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by ANN M. VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Forrest, Herbert) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1606 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION Settlement Agreement Regarding Attorney's Fees and Expenses by ANN M. VENEMAN, ANN VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Straus, Julie) (Entered: 10/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1605 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Attorney Fees for Phil Fraas by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Itemization of Phil Fraas Hours and Expenses 3Q 2009)(Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 10/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1604 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by SHUTTS & BOWEN LLP. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Henn, Emily) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1603 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Attorney Fees and costs and expenses incurred by Chestnut, Saunders, Sanders & Pettaway, LLC for implementation work during the period from July 1, 2009 to September 30, 2009 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (td, ) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1602 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by SHUTTS & BOWEN LLP. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Henn, Emily) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1601 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting (1600) Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Surreply Regarding Motion of Cross & Kearney PLLC for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Ordered that Defendant may file its surreply, not to exceed 15 pages, on or before 10/7/2009. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 9/21/2009. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(zmm, ) (Entered: 09/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1600 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Regarding Motion of Cross & Kearney PLLC for Attorneys' Fees and Costs, and Order by ANN M. VENEMAN Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Forrest, Herbert) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1599 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by SHUTTS & BOWEN LLP. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Henn, Emily) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1598 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re (1494 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 825 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees on behalf of Cross & Kearney PLLC filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Kearney Supplemental Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Ruling of Monitor, # 3 Exhibit Fierst Supplemental Declaration)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Fierst, David) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1597 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint stipulation regarding extension of time 1596 , the time for defendant to respond to petitioners motion for an award of attorneys fees for work on the Estate of Knott Track B claim is hereby extended to October 9, 2009. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 11, 2009. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (lcplf2) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1596 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COVINGTON & BURLING'S FEE PETITION RE KNOTT ESTATE by ANN M. VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1595 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SURREPLY to OMNIBUS REPLY BRIEF OF CHESTNUT SANDERS SANDERS AND PETTAWAY filed by ANN M. VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 09/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1594 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of July 2009. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 8, 2009.Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(MA) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1593 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION Settling Attorney's Fees for Patterson Track B Claim by ANN M. VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1592 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Monitor's Third Report on Debt Relief Implementation, (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1, # 2 Appendix 2) Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1591 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to REGARDING APPLICATION OF COURT RULING TO MOBLEY TRACK B FEE PETITION filed by ANN M. VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1590 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by SHUTTS & BOWEN LLP. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Henn, Emily) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1589 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Monitor's Report on Surplus Registry Funds as of June 30, 2009 Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1588 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION re Extension of Time to Respond to Covington & Burling Fee Petition re Knott Estate by ANN M. VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1587 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION Settling 2d Quarter 2009 Fee Petition of Conlon Frantz & Phelan by ANN M. VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1586 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Attorney's Fees by ALL PLAINTIFFS Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Fierst, David) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1585 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION Joint Motion to Bifurcate Chestnut Sanders' 2nd Quarter 2009 Fee Petition by ANN M. VENEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1584 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of June 2009. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 4, 2009. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(MA) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1583 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Attorney Fees by ESTATE OF CHARLIE KNOTT (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of David Fagan, # 3 Exhibit 1 Part A, # 4 Exhibit 1 Part B, # 5 Exhibit 1 Part C, # 6 Exhibit 1 Part D, # 7 Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit 3, # 9 Exhibit 4, # 10 Exhibit 5, # 11 Exhibit 6, # 12 Exhibit 7, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(nmw, ) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1582 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing by ESTATE OF CHARLIE KNOTT (nmw, ) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1581 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION Settling 2d Quarter 2009 Fee Petition of Phillip Fraas by ANN M. VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 07/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1580 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for May 2009. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 7/22/2009. (lcplf2) (Entered: 07/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1579 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER that the monitor shall continue to perform her role in the debt relief review process. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 16, 2009. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(MA) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1578 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by SHUTTS & BOWEN LLP. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Henn, Emily) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1577 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting (1576) Consent motion for extension of time of 30 days, to and including 8/14/09 to reply to defendant's opposition to petitioner's motion (#1494) for attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 7/13/09. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(gdf) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1576 Filed: 7/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (1494 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees on behalf of Cross & Kearney PLLC by ALL PLAINTIFFS Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Fierst, David) (Entered: 07/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1575 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs for Second Quarter 2009 by CONLON FRANTZ PHELAN & PIRES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1574 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Expenses incurred by Chestnut, Sanders, Sanders & Pettaway, LLC for impelementation work during the period from March 31, 2009 to June 30, 2009 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(cp, ) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1573 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Attorney Fees by ALL PLAINTIFFS, ALL PLAINTIFFS Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(td, ) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1572 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of April 2009. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 1, 2009. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(MA) (Entered: 07/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1571 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Attorney Fees for Phillip Fraas for 2Q 2009 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1570 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Monitor's Second Report on Debt Relief Implementation, Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1569 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER approving the monitor's request for a total budget for the period of July 1, 2009 through December 31, 2009. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 24, 2009. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(MA) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1568 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION Settling Covington & Burling's Fee Petition re Holmes Arbitration (#1459) by ANN M. VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 06/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1567 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Monitor's Report Regarding Implementation of the Consent Decree for the Period of January 1, 2008, Through December 31, 2008 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1, # 2 Appendix 2, # 3 Appendix 3, # 4 Appendix 4, # 5 Appendix 5, # 6 Appendix 6, # 7 Appendix 7, # 8 Appendix 8, # 9 Appendix 9, # 10 Appendix 10)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Entered: 06/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1566 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Straus on behalf of all defendants Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Straus, Julie) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1565 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by SHUTTS & BOWEN LLP, ANN M. VENEMAN, ANN VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Straus, Julie) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1564 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Straus on behalf of all defendants Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Straus, Julie) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1563 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (1494 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees on behalf of Cross & Kearney PLLC by ALL PLAINTIFFS Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Fierst, David) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1562 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT Joint Report by ROBERT HOLMES, SR. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Henn, Emily) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1561 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION Settling 1stQ 2009 Attorney's Fees Petition of Conlon, Frantz & Phelan by ANN M. VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1560 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPINION AND ORDER denying (1290) Motion for Attorney Fees; granting (1309) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:97-cv-01978-PLF. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 15, 2009. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(MA) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1559 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1494 MOTION for Attorney Fees on behalf of Cross & Kearney PLLC by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Fierst, David) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1558 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPINION AND ORDER that the parties shall attempt to settle Covington & Burling's motion for an award of attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 12, 2009. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(MA) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1557 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying (1314) Ms. Johnson's "motion for clarification" in case 1:97-cv-01978-PLF. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 12, 2009. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(MA) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1556 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying (1394) Motion to Enforce in case 1:97-cv-01978-PLF. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 12, 2009. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(MA) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1555 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re (825 in 1:98-cv-01693-PLF) MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendant Tom Vilsack's Response to Motion of Cross & Kearney for Attorneys' Fees and Costs in re Track B Arbitration of Alvin Steppes filed by ANN M. VENEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Forrest, Herbert) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1554 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER: The Claims Facilitator will promptly send a Claim Sheet and Election Form to the Claimants identified by Tracking Number in Exhibit A to this Stipulation and Order. The process for review of petitions under section 5(g) of the Consent Decree is complete and no additional Claim Sheet and Election Forms will be sent to other late-claim petitioners. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 5/6/2009. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(mm) (Entered: 05/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1553 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION SETTLING ATTORNEY'S FEES AND EXPENSES (#857) by ANN M. VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1552 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and Order by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 05/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1551 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of March 2009. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 1, 2009. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(MA) (Entered: 05/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1550 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Cross & Kearney PLLC's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by ANN M. VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Forrest, Herbert) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1549 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re Monitor's Report on Debt Relief Implementation. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 20, 2009. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(MA) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1548 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER on motion for attorneys' fees, costs and expenses by Finkel Law Firm, LLc, counsel for Track B claimants Lee Van Crawford and Donald Stokes. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 17, 2009. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(MA) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1547 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of February 2009. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 17, 2009. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(MA) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1546 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT REGARDING SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS RE ATTORNEYS FEES FOR STOKES AND CRAWFORD TRACK B CLAIMS by ANN M. VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1545 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER approving (#1544 in 97-1978) Stipulation Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Cross & Kearney PLLC's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Petitioner Cross & Kearney PLLC and Defendant, shall have an additional 14-day extension of time, that is, through 4/24/2009, to respond to Petitioner's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs re the Alvin Steppes arbitration (#1494). Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 4/9/2009. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(mm) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1544 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Cross & Kearney PLLC's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by ANN M. VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Forrest, Herbert) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1543 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs for First Quarter 2009 by CONLON FRANTZ PHELAN & PIRES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1542 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION Settling 1st Quarter Fee Petition of Phillip Fraas by ANN VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 04/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1541 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER that, with respect to the motion for attorneys' fees and expenses by Finkel Law Firm, LLC, counsel for Track B claimants Lee Van Crawford and Donald Stokes, the parties shall enter into settlement negotiations to begin immediately. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 2, 2009. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(MA) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1540 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Attorney Fees for Phillip Fraas 1Q 2009 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit itemization of hours and calculation of fees)(Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1539 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Monitor's Report on Debt Relief Implementation, Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1538 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION Settling Attorney's Fee Claims of Butler Snow by ANN M. VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1537 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for January 2009. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 16, 2009. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(MA) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1536 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Ordered that defendant may have an additional 30-day extension of time, through 4/10/2009, to respond to petitioner's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs re the Alvin Steppes arbitration. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 3/9/2009. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(mm) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1535 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Cross& Kearney PLLC's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs by ANN M. VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Forrest, Herbert) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1534 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Monitor's Report on Surplus Registry Funds as of December 31, 2008, Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1533 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION Settlling Attorney's Fee Request of Conlon Frantz for 4th Quarter 2008 by ANN VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1532 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION Settling 4th Quarter Attorney's Fees for Philip Fraas by ANN VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1531 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for December 2008. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 3, 2009. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(MA) (Entered: 02/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1530 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Cross & Kearney PLLC's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs by ANN M. VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Forrest, Herbert) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1529 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Revised Limited Notice of Appearance by ANN M. VENEMAN Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Forrest, Herbert) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1528 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Herbert E. Forrest on behalf of ANN M. VENEMAN Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Forrest, Herbert) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1527 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Attorney Fees by CONLON FRANTZ PHELAN & PIRES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Frantz, David) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1526 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mail Returned as undeliverable. Sent to Curtis Dixon; Type of Document Returned: 12/12/2008 Minute Order. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(mm) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1525 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Pursuant to the Court's 12/22/08 Minute Order by ANN M. VENEMAN, ANN VENEMAN (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through E)(Dean, Paul) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1524 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of filing Joint Report of Shutts & Bowen LLP and the USDA by SHUTTS & BOWEN LLP re (1513 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) Memorandum & Opinion, (Attachments: # 1 December 2001 Settlement Agreement)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Doan, Joshua) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1523 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CROSS & KEARNEY PLLCS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS by ANN VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1522 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Report by ANN M. VENEMAN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1521 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appoint Counsel for Class by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1520 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Attorney Fees for Phillip Fraas for 4Q 2008 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Itemization of hours and expenses)(Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 12/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1519 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Monitor's Report Regarding Implementation of the Consent Decree for the Period of January 1, 2007, Through December 31, 2007 (Attachments: #(1) Appendix 1, #(2) Appendix 2, #(3) Appendix 3, #(4) Appendix 4, #(5) Appendix 5, #(6) Appendix 6, #(7) Appendix 7, #(8) Appendix 8, #(9) Appendix 9, #(10) Appendix 10)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (Roth, Randi) (Entered: 12/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1518 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION Settling 3d Quarter 2008 Fee Petition of Conlon Frantz by ANN M. VENEMAN. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 12/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1517 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: The Monitor's request for a total budget amount of $1,575,088.00 for the period of January 1, 2009 through June 30, 2009 is approved. Further ordered that in accordance with paragraph 17 of the Order of Reference entered in this case on April 4, 2000, the United States Department of Agriculture shall deposit with the Clerk of the Court, United States District Court for the District of Columbia, a sum equal to a pro-rata month's portion of the approved budget within the first fifteen (15) days of each month. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 12/30/2008. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(mm) (Entered: 12/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1516 Filed: 12/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing [per 1513] by ANN M. VENEMAN (Attachments: # 1 12/8/08 letter, # 2 12/15/08 letter)Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Newmark, Andrea) (Entered: 12/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1515 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of filing letter to Court by SHUTTS & BOWEN LLP re (1513 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) Memorandum & Opinion, Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Herman, Anthony) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1514 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of filing letter to Court by SHUTTS & BOWEN LLP re (1513 in 1:97-cv-01978-PLF) Memorandum & Opinion, Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Herman, Anthony) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1513 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re defendant's motion to dismiss Shutts & Bowen's petition for implementation fees and its request for an 80% enhancement of its fee for representing Teddy Miller. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 19, 2008. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(MA) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1512 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER approving the monitor's invoice for the period of November 2008. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 16, 2008. (MA) (Entered: 12/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1511 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Monitor's Request for an Extension of Time to Report to the Court Regarding Debt Relief Implementation Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(Roth, Randi) Modified on 12/11/2008 correcting the event from Notice to Motion(td, ). (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1510 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing