Round Rock Research LLC. v. HTC Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-00840
District Judge Sue L. Robinson, presiding

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Round Rock Research, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Desmarais LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Berrebi jberrebi@desmaraisllp.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan S. Kellman +1 212 351 3400 +1 212 351 3401 akellman@desmaraisllp.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karim Z. Oussayef koussayef@desmaraisllp.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Berrebi jberrebi@desmaraisllp.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan S. Kellman +1 212 351 3400 +1 212 351 3401 akellman@desmaraisllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Farnan +1 302 655 4200 bef@pgslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Farnan +1 302 655 4200 bef@pgslaw.com
v.
High Tech Computer Corporation High Tech Computer Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "HTC America Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shaw, John W. +1 302 571 6689

Represented by Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard G. Gervase, Jr. rgervase@mintz.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Edward Giust +1 858 320 3072 +1 858 320 3000 JohnGiust@WHGCLaw.com

Represented by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

No Logo HTC Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shaw, John W. +1 302 571 6689

Represented by Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard G. Gervase, Jr. rgervase@mintz.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Edward Giust +1 858 320 3072 +1 858 320 3000 JohnGiust@WHGCLaw.com

Represented by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,255,109; 6,002,613; 6,625,444; 7,021,520 B2; 7,101,727 B2. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation of Dismissal D.I. 22)(fms) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by Round Rock Research LLC.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None
      DECLARATION re 20 Reply Brief (Christa M. Anderson) by HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None
        REPLY BRIEF re 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(6) filed by HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Karim Z. Oussayef - filed by Round Rock Research LLC.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
            DECLARATION re 17 Answering Brief in Opposition of Karim Z. Oussayef by Round Rock Research LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
              ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Round Rock Research LLC..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/24/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                OPENING BRIEF in Support re 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/14/2011. (Pascale, Karen) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                  MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pascale, Karen) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss Due to Mootness by HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation re 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Pascale, Karen) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                      RESPONSE to Motion re 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Round Rock Research LLC.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Round Rock Research LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert A. Van Nest, Brian L. Ferrall, Christa M. Anderson, Richard Gervase, and John Giust - filed by HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Rule 83.5 Certifications)(Squire, Monte) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                            Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation identifying Corporate Parent HTC Corporation for HTC America Inc... (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                              OPENING BRIEF in Support re 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/7/2011. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Squire, Monte) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None
                                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to January 20, 2011 - filed by Round Rock Research LLC.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/11/2010, Entered: None
                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Round Rock Research LLC.. HTC America Inc. served on 10/1/2010, answer due 10/22/2010. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/11/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael P. Stadnick, Alan S. Kellman, and Jason Berrebi - filed by Round Rock Research LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Michael P. Stadnick, # 2 Certification of Alan S. Kellman, # 3 Certification of Jason Berrebi)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                        Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Round Rock Research LLC.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                          Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,255,109; 6,002,613; 6,625,444 B1; 7,021,520 B2; 7,101,727 B2; (dlk) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dlk) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                              COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-790710.) - filed by Round Rock Research LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(dlk) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 282 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?