Round Rock Research LLC v. Amazon.com Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-01279
District Judge Richard G. Andrews, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 5, 2016 at 3:30 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Round Rock Research, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Desmarais LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Berrebi jberrebi@desmaraisllp.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene Chiu +1 212 351 3400 echiu@desmaraisllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon Todd Hohenthaner +1 212 446 4832 +1 212 446 4900 jhohenthaner@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Farnan +1 302 655 4200 bef@pgslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C Spaccarotella +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 jspaccarotella@quinnemanuel.com
v.
Amazon.com, Inc. Amazon.com, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Drugstore.com, Inc.
Unknown Role, Audible, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabriel M. Ramsey +1 650 614 7400 gramsey@orrick.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Davin M. Stockwell +1 949 567 6700 dstockwell@orrick.com

Represented by Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Sallah & Cox LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey L. Cox +1 561 989 9080 +1 561 989 9020 jlc@sallahlaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (48) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,500,650; 5,627,544; 5,974,078; US 6,459,726 B1; US RE41,531 E; US 6,975,556 B2; US 7,106,646 B2; US 7,221,020 B2; US 7,389,369 B2; 5,801,985; 5,880,996; 5,266,925; 5,583,850; 5,986,570; US 7,265,674 B2; US RE 41,562 E. (Attachments: # 1 Order)(nms) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    SO ORDERED Granting 46 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice, filed by Round Rock Research LLC (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/16/2014. (nms) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None
      STIPULATION of Dismissal by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER: On or before January 6, 2015, each party or each party group shall email to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, with a copy to her Judicial Administrator, Cathleen Kennedy, the information requested in this Order. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/16/14. (cak) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORAL ORDER: If parties anticipate a problem with selected scheduling dates, they should jointly contact the Court with their concerns. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/16/2014. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01240-RGA, 1:11-cv-01244-RGA, 1:11-cv-01279-RGA(nms) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 6/29/2015. Amended Pleadings due by 6/29/2015. Fact Discovery due by 12/18/2015. A Trial Scheduling Conference is set for 2/12/2016, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews Dispositive Motions due by 4/29/2016. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 10/16/2015. A Markman Hearing is set for 11/18/2015, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A Pretrial Conference is set for 9/2/2016, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. The first five day Jury Trial is set for 9/19/2016, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/16/2014. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01240-RGA, 1:11-cv-01244-RGA, 1:11-cv-01279-RGA(nms) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
              PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(Farnan, Michael) Modified on 12/16/2014 (nms). (Entered: 12/15/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORAL ORDER: The Stay is continued until December 8, 2014,. Any unsettled cases are reopened as of December 8, 2014. Parties shall submit a joint proposed schedule no later than December 15, 2014. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/25/2014. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01240-RGA, 1:11-cv-01241-RGA, 1:11-cv-01244-RGA, 1:11-cv-01279-RGA, 1:12-cv-00362-RGA(nms) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
                  Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORAL ORDER: The Stay is Continued until 11/21/2014. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/7/2014. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01239-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None
                      Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORAL ORDER: The parties are to submit a Joint Status Report in 30 days. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/7/2014. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01237-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None
                          Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC, Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            SO ORDERED Granting 34 Stipulation and Proposed Order Dismissing Certain Claims, filed by Round Rock Research LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/15/2014. (nms) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
                              STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Dismissing Certain Claims by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/5/2014, Entered: None
                                STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
                                  Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Eugene Chiu as co-counsel.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
                                      Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
                                        Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 28 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Order Vacating Stay Issued by the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware by Round Rock Research LLC re 25 Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                                            Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,500,650; 5,627,544; 5,974,078; US 6,459,726 B1; US RE41,531 E; US 6,975,556 B2; US 7,106,646 B2; US 7,221,020 B2; US 7,389,369 B2; 5,801,985; 5,880,996; 5,266,925; 5,583,850; 5,986,570; US 7,265,674 B2; US RE 41,562 E . (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                              Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amazon.com Inc.- filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE Of Order Granting Provisional Relief in the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware by Amazon.com Inc.. (Moore, David) Modified on 4/25/2012 (nms). (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER Administratively Closing Cases. The parties shall submit a status report to the Court no later than October 5, 2012, and every six months thereafter. It is further Ordered that the parties shall promptly notify the Court when the reexaminations are complete and the stays should be lifted so that the cases may be reopened and other appropriate action may be taken. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/23/2012. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01237-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER Granting (19 in 1:11-cv-01244-RGA, 27 in 1:11-cv-01242-RGA, 21 in 1:11-cv-01238-RGA, 16 in 1:11-cv-01245-RGA, 22 in 1:11-cv-01279-RGA, 22 in 1:11-cv-01237-RGA, 20 in 1:11-cv-01240-RGA, 26 in 1:11-cv-01243-RGA, 27 in 1:11-cv-01241-RGA, 29 in 1:11-cv-01239-RGA, 12 in 1:12-cv-00309-RGA) Stipulation and Proposed Order to Amend Pleadings and to Stay Cases Pending Reexamination of Patents-In-Suit. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/23/2012. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01237-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                      Joint STIPULATION To Amend Pleadings and To Stay Cases Pending Reexamination of Patents-In-Suit by Amazon.com Inc., V F Corporation, Gap Inc., Round Rock Research LLC, Motorola Solutions Inc., American Apparel Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation Inc., Fruit of the Loom Inc., Dole Food Company Inc., PepsiCo, Inc., Macy's Retail Holdings Inc., Hanesbrands Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER Postponing Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/27/2012. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01237-RGA et al.(nms) (Main Document 21 replaced on 3/27/2012) (nms). (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                          PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                            Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Brian E. Farnan regarding March 28 Scheduling Conference. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                              Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from John W. Shaw regarding Request for Continuance of the Scheduling Conference Set for Wednesday, March 28, 2012 at 1:00 p.m.. (Shaw, John) Modified on 3/27/2012 (nms). (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Scheduling Conference on March 28, 2012. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  REPLY BRIEF re 12 MOTION to Dismiss, To Strike, or in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement, filed by Amazon.com Inc.. (Moore, David) Modified on 3/23/2012 (nms). (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 12 MOTION to Dismiss, or To Strike, or in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement, filed by Round Rock Research LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/22/2012. (Farnan, Brian) Modified on 3/13/2012 (nms). (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Amazon.com Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        OPENING BRIEF in Support re 12 MOTION to Dismiss To Strike, or in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement, filed by Amazon.com Inc.. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/12/2012. (Horwitz, Richard) Modified on 2/27/2012 (nms). (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss, To Strike, or in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement - filed by Amazon.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Horwitz, Richard) Modified on 2/27/2012 (nms). (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney I. Neel Chatterjee, Gabriel M. Ramsey, Richard S. Swope, Brooks G. Parfitt, Jeffrey L. Cox, and Davin Stockwell of Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP - filed by Amazon.com Inc.. (Moore, David) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 3/28/2012 at 1:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/21/2012. (nms) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,500,650; 5,627,544; 5,974,078; US 6,459,726 B1; US RE41,531 E; US 6,975,556 B2; US 7,106,646 B2; US 7,221,020 B2; US 7,389,369 B2; 5,801,985; 5,880,996. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/07/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amazon.com Inc.- filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/07/2012)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jon T. Hohenthaner, Jason Berrebi, Eugene Chiu, and John Spaccarotella of Desmarais LLP - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to February 13, 2012 - filed by Amazon.com Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Round Rock Research LLC. Amazon.com Inc. served on 12/23/2011, answer due 1/13/2012. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,500,650; 5,627,544; 5,974,078; US 6,459,726 B1; US RE41,531 E; US 6,975,556 B2; US 7,106,646 B2; US 7,221,020 B2; US 7,389,369 B2. (dmp, ) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dmp, ) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Amazon.com Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 311-996867.) - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmp, ) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 842 times.

                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                   
                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                  Need Password Help?