Round Rock Research LLC v. Sandisk Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00569
District Judge Sue L. Robinson, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 26, 2017 at 6:35 AM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Round Rock Research, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Farnan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph James Farnan, III +1 302 777 0300 +1 302 777 0301 jjfarnan@farnanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Farnan +1 302 655 4200 bef@pgslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Saul Ewing LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Farnan +1 302 421 6895 +1 302 421 5870 mfarnan@saul.com
v.
SanDisk Corporation SanDisk Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (394) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: 11/10/2015 Acknowledgment of Receipt
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of PTX 003 and PTX 004. (fms)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner
    Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s): See report for patent numbers. (Attachments: # (1) Stipulation)(fms)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: 3/27/2015 Stipulation of Dismissal
      STIPULATION of Dismissal by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: 3/23/2015 Notice to Take Deposition
        NOTICE to Take Deposition of SanDisk Corporation on 4/16/2015 filed by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: 3/9/2015 Letter
          Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding SanDisk's Proposal for Remaining Issues in the Case. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: 3/9/2015 Letter
            Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Brian E. Farnan regarding Scheduling Proposal. (Farnan, Brian)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: 3/9/2015 Notice Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel
              NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Efren Garcia as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer associated with Vinson & Elkins LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: 3/6/2015 Declaration
                REDACTED VERSION OF DECLARATION re [384] Declaration, of Elizabeth Kimmel by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits 1-10)(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 3/6/2015 (fms).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: 3/6/2015 Redacted Document
                  REDACTED VERSION of [383] Opening Brief in Support, by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: 3/2/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER, Rescheduling Hearings( The In-Person Status Conference is rescheduled for 3/11/2015 at 05:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/2/2015. (nmfn)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: 2/26/2015 Declaration
                      [SEALED] DECLARATION re [383] Opening Brief in Support, of Elizabeth Kimmel by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Part 1 of 2, # (4) Exhibit 3 - Part 2 of 2, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Exhibit 10, # (12) Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: 2/26/2015 Opening Brief in Support
                        [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re [382] MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and for a New Trial filed by Round Rock Research LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/16/2015. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: 2/26/2015 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law
                          MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and for a New Trial - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Brian)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: 2/26/2015 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law
                            MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law [Defendant SanDisk Corporation's Rule 50(b) Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law] - filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None
                              STIPULATION regarding Post-Trial Briefing by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None
                                REDACTED VERSION of 367 Proposed Pretrial Order, by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting 280 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 283 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 285 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/4/2015. (nmfn) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/4/2015. (nmfn) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None
                                      REDACTED VERSION of 354 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding materials requested during cross-examination. (with Exhibits A - C) by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 of 4, # 2 Part 3 of 4, # 3 Part 4 of 4)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None
                                        REDACTED VERSION of 336 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding response to Round Rock's December 29, 2014 Letter by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None
                                          VERDICT SHEET by Round Rock Research LLC (Trial 2). (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None
                                            Proposed Jury Instructions by Round Rock Research LLC (Final - Trial 2). (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None
                                              Proposed Voir Dire by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                Proposed Jury Instructions by Round Rock Research LLC (Preliminary Instructions - Trial 2). (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                  REDACTED VERSION of 353 Letter to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding response to Round Rock's January 14, 2015 letter by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael Murray (AMENDED) on February 9, 2015 filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      JUDGMENT FOLLOWING A JURY VERDICT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 58(b) IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment be and is hereby entered in favor of defendant SanDisk Corporation and against plaintiff Round Rock Research, LLC as the jury found the asserted claims of the '798 patent and the '041 patent invalid. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/30/2015. (nmfn) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                        [SEALED] Proposed Pretrial Order for Second Trial by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                          Exhibit List for the Jury Trial held on 1/16/2015, 1/20-1/23/2015, 1/26-1/28/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Defendant's Exhibit List, # 2 Joint Index of Admitted Exhibits, # 3 To be sealed from public inspection)(fms) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                            [SEALED] Jury Notes. (fms) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                              [SEALED] Jury List. (fms) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 362 Jury Verdict. (fms) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  [SEALED] JURY VERDICT. (fms) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael Murray on February 3, 2015 filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Final Jury Instructions (Read in open court by Judge Robinson on 1/27/2015). (fms) (Entered: 01/27/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law - filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/27/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Notice Under 35 U.S.C. § 282 filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of 346 Statement, -- (1) Detailed Proffer for Sandisk Trial Witness Camelia Shamshoum, (2) Bases for Introducing Evidence Regarding the MMC Standard in Rseponse to Court's Direction at Pre-Trial Conference -- by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-7)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of 349 Letter, by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-2)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 348 Letter, by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding materials requested during cross-examination. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - C)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding response to Round Rock's January 14, 2015 letter - re 348 Letter,. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      Preliminary Jury Instructions (Read in open court by Judge Robinson on 1/20/2015). (fms) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                        Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Brian E. Farnan regarding Reduction of Claims. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          Voir Dire to the Jury Panel (Read in open court by Judge Robinson on 1/16/2015). (fms) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Brian E. Farnan regarding Response to SanDisk's Submission Concerning Camelia Shamshoum and MMC specifications - re 346 Statement,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Brian E. Farnan regarding Supplemental Submission in Support of Round Rock's Motion for Summary Judgment on the '531 Patent. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Brian E. Farnan regarding Claims Round Rock is proceeding with for Trial. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  [SEALED] STATEMENT -- (1) Detailed Proffer for Sandisk Trial Witness Camelia Shamshoum, (2) Bases for Introducing Evidence Regarding the MMC Standard in Rseponse to Court's Direction at Pre-Trial Conference -- by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-3, # 2 Exhibit 4, # 3 Exhibit 5, # 4 Exhibits 6-8)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 1/13/2015 (fms). (Entered: 01/13/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 339 Letter, by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-4)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 300 Letter by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of 314 Appendix re 312 Reply Brief, 313 Reply Brief [Appendix of Exhibits in Support of SanDisk's Reply Briefs in Support of its Motions for Summary Judgment] by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/06/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of 313 Reply Brief re 285 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,336,531 and 8,060,719 by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/06/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of 312 Reply Brief, re 283 MOTION to Stay or Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,336,531; and for Partial Summary judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,060,719 by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/06/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding response to Round Rock's January 5, 2015 letter - re 339 Letter,. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 01/06/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Brian E. Farnan regarding '719 Patent. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Part 1 of 3, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Part 2 of 3, # 6 Exhibit 4 - Part 3 of 3, # 7 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of 335 Letter by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lauren M. Nowierski - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding response to Round Rock's December 29, 2014 Letter - re 335 Letter. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 12/30/2014 (fms). (Entered: 12/30/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Brian E. Farnan regarding '531 Patent. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of 311 Declaration of Robert Zeidman by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of 310 Declaration of Tamir Packin by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 98-100)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of 309 Reply Brief by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Proposed Pretrial Order UPDATED by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Farnan, Brian) (Attachment 6 replaced on 12/22/2014) (nmfn, ). (Attachment 7 replaced on 12/22/2014) (nmfn, ). (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Proposed Voir Dire by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    VERDICT SHEET by Round Rock Research LLC . (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Proposed Jury Instructions by Round Rock Research LLC Proposed Final Jury Instructions. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Proposed Jury Instructions by Round Rock Research LLC Proposed Preliminary Jury Instructions. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) SanDisk's List Of Rebuttal Witnesses It May Call At Trial; and (2) Defendant's Notice Under 35 U.S.C. § 282 filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 213 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 215 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting in part and denying in part 217 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/17/2014. (nmfn) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/17/2014. (nmfn) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 308 Declaration, of Robert Zeidman by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-5)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of 307 Declaration,,,,,, of Tamir Packin by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 31-97, 1104, 1294, 1426, 1429, 1432, 1450, 1451, and 1452)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 306 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 303 Declaration of Michael Murray by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of 302 Declaration, of Tamir Packin by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 18-30)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of 301 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of 305 Appendix re 304 Answering Brief in Opposition, to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-F, # 2 Exhibits G-S)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of 304 Answering Brief in Opposition, re 280 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation, 217 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Infringement and Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Pretrial Order by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] APPENDIX re 312 Reply Brief, 313 Reply Brief [Appendix of Exhibits in Support of SanDisk's Reply Briefs in Support of its Motions for Summary Judgment] by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 285 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,336,531 and 8,060,719 filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 283 MOTION to Stay or Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,336,531; and for Partial Summary judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,060,719 filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] DECLARATION re 309 Reply Brief of Robert Zeidman by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] DECLARATION re 309 Reply Brief of Tamir Packin by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 98, # 2 Exhibit 99, # 3 Exhibit 100, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 280 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              [SEALED] DECLARATION re 306 Answering Brief in Opposition, 301 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Robert Zeidman by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] DECLARATION re 306 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Tamir Packin by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 31, # 2 Exhibit 32, # 3 Exhibit 33, # 4 Exhibit 34, # 5 Exhibit 35, # 6 Exhibit 36, # 7 Exhibit 37, # 8 Exhibit 38, # 9 Exhibit 39, # 10 Exhibit 40, # 11 Exhibit 41, # 12 Exhibit 42, # 13 Exhibit 43, # 14 Exhibit 44, # 15 Exhibit 45, # 16 Exhibit 46, # 17 Exhibit 47, # 18 Exhibit 48, # 19 Exhibit 49, # 20 Exhibit 50, # 21 Exhibit 51, # 22 Exhibit 52, # 23 Exhibit 53, # 24 Exhibit 54, # 25 Exhibit 55, # 26 Exhibit 56, # 27 Exhibit 57, # 28 Exhibit 58, # 29 Exhibit 59, # 30 Exhibit 60, # 31 Exhibit 61, # 32 Exhibit 62, # 33 Exhibit 63, # 34 Exhibit 64, # 35 Exhibit 65, # 36 Exhibit 66, # 37 Exhibit 67, # 38 Exhibit 68, # 39 Exhibit 69, # 40 Exhibit 70, # 41 Exhibit 71, # 42 Exhibit 72, # 43 Exhibit 73, # 44 Exhibit 74, # 45 Exhibit 75, # 46 Exhibit 76, # 47 Exhibit 77, # 48 Exhibit 78, # 49 Exhibit 79, # 50 Exhibit 80, # 51 Exhibit 81, # 52 Exhibit 82, # 53 Exhibit 83, # 54 Exhibit 84, # 55 Exhibit 85, # 56 Exhibit 86, # 57 Exhibit 87, # 58 Exhibit 88, # 59 Exhibit 89, # 60 Exhibit 90, # 61 Exhibit 91, # 62 Exhibit 92, # 63 Exhibit 93, # 64 Exhibit 94, # 65 Exhibit 95, # 66 Exhibit 96, # 67 Exhibit 97, # 68 Exhibit 1104, # 69 Exhibit 1294, # 70 Exhibit 1426, # 71 Exhibit 1429, # 72 Exhibit 1432, # 73 Exhibit 1450, # 74 Exhibit 1451, # 75 Exhibit 1452, # 76 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 283 MOTION to Stay or Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,336,531; and for Partial Summary judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,060,719 filed by Round Rock Research LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/18/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Cetificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] APPENDIX re 304 Answering Brief in Opposition, to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-F, # 2 Exhibits G-P, # 3 Exhibits Q-S)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 280 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation, 217 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Infringement and Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation filed by Sandisk Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/18/2014. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] DECLARATION re 301 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Michael Murray by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] DECLARATION re 301 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Tamir Packin by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 18, # 2 Exhibit 19, # 3 Exhibit 20, # 4 Exhibit 21, # 5 Exhibit 22, # 6 Exhibit 23, # 7 Exhibit 24, # 8 Exhibit 25, # 9 Exhibit 26, # 10 Exhibit 27, # 11 Exhibit 28, # 12 Exhibit 29, # 13 Exhibit 30, # 14 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 285 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,336,531 and 8,060,719 filed by Round Rock Research LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/18/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Round Rock's November 26, 2014 Letter. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 12/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 297 Letter, by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-15)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey Seddon - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Brian E. Farnan regarding Response to Defendant's November 19, 2014 Letter - re 279 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of SanDisk's List of Potential Fact Witnesses for Trial filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of 287 Appendix of Exhibits in Support of SanDisk's Summary Judgment Briefs by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of 286 Opening Brief in Support, re 285 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,336,531 and 8,060,719 by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of 284 Opening Brief in Support, re 283 MOTION to Stay or Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,336,531; and for Partial Summary judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,060,719 by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of 279 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding request to strike Leffert Declaration and associated documents as untimely by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-K)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 282 Declaration, of Tamir Packin by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-17)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of 281 Opening Brief in Support, by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 280 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert Harrits - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] APPENDIX re 286 Opening Brief in Support, 284 Opening Brief in Support, by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 1-4, # 2 5-6, # 3 7, # 4 8-19, # 5 20-27, # 6 28-31, # 7 32-37)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 285 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,336,531 and 8,060,719 filed by Sandisk Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/8/2014. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,336,531 and 8,060,719 - filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 283 MOTION to Stay or Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,336,531; and for Partial Summary judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,060,719 filed by Sandisk Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/8/2014. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Stay or Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,336,531; and for Partial Summary judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,060,719 - filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] DECLARATION re 281 Opening Brief in Support, of Tamir Packin by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 280 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation filed by Round Rock Research LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/8/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding request to strike Leffert Declaration and associated documents as untimely. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-K)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of SanDisk's List of Rebuttal Witnesses It May Call at Trial filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding proposed agenda for November 14, 2014 hearing. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 11/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of 267 Declaration of Robert Zeidman by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 266 Declaration of Richard Cowell by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 113-115)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of 270 Appendix by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 50-56)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 269 Reply Brief re MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 5,615,159, 6,728,798 and 6,948,041 by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 268 Reply Brief re MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent Nos. 5,615,159 and 6,948,041 and Partial Summary Judgment on Priority Dates by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Round Rock Research, LLC's Supplemental Responses to SanDisk Corporation's Interrogatory (Nos. 3, 7) and (ii) Round Rock Research, LLC's Fourth Supplemental Privilege Log filed by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] APPENDIX re 269 Reply Brief, 268 Reply Brief by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 50-54, # 2 Exhibits 55-56)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 215 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 5,615,159, 6,728,798 and 6,948,041 filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 213 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent Nos. 5,615,159 and 6,948,041 and Partial Summary Judgment on Priority Dates filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] DECLARATION re 265 Reply Brief of Robert Zeidman by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] DECLARATION re 265 Reply Brief of Richard Cowell by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 113, # 2 Exhibit 114, # 3 Exhibit 115, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY BRIEF re 217 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Infringement and Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 249 Appendix, re 248 Answering Brief in Opposition, to Round Rock's Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement and Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of 248 Answering Brief in Opposition, re 217 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Infringement and Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of 252 Declaration, of Robert Zeidman by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 4-8)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of 251 Declaration,,,, of Tamir Packin by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 75-104, # 2 Exhibits 105-112, 1071, 1094, and 1294)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of 250 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 247 Declaration of Frankie Roohparvar by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of 246 Declaration of Darrell Rinerson by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 245 Declaration of Robert Zeidman by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 244 Declaration, of Tamir Packin by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 67-74)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of 243 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sandisk's Objections and Responses to Round Rock Research, LLC's Amended Third Notice of Deposition of Sandisk Corporation filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of SanDisk's List of Potential Fact Witnesses for Trial filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [SEALED] DECLARATION re 250 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Robert Zeidman by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4, # 2 Exhibit 5, # 3 Exhibit 6, # 4 Exhibit 7, # 5 Exhibit 8, # 6 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] DECLARATION re 250 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Tamir Packin by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 75, # 2 Exhibit 76, # 3 Exhibit 77, # 4 Exhibit 78, # 5 Exhibit 79, # 6 Exhibit 80, # 7 Exhibit 81, # 8 Exhibit 82, # 9 Exhibit 83, # 10 Exhibit 84, # 11 Exhibit 85, # 12 Exhibit 86, # 13 Exhibit 87, # 14 Exhibit 88, # 15 Exhibit 89, # 16 Exhibit 90, # 17 Exhibit 91, # 18 Exhibit 92, # 19 Exhibit 93, # 20 Exhibit 94, # 21 Exhibit 95, # 22 Exhibit 96, # 23 Exhibit 97, # 24 Exhibit 98, # 25 Exhibit 99, # 26 Exhibit 100, # 27 Exhibit 101, # 28 Exhibit 102, # 29 Exhibit 103, # 30 Exhibit 104, # 31 Exhibit 105, # 32 Exhibit 106, # 33 Exhibit 107, # 34 Exhibit 108, # 35 Exhibit 109, # 36 Exhibit 110, # 37 Exhibit 111, # 38 Exhibit 112, # 39 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Main Document 251 replaced on 10/30/2014) (nmfn, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/30/2014: # 40 Exhibits 1071, 1094 and 1294) (nmfn, ). (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 215 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 5,615,159, 6,728,798 and 6,948,041 filed by Round Rock Research LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/7/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] APPENDIX re 248 Answering Brief in Opposition, to Round Rock's Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement and Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits Part 1 of 2, # 2 Exhibits Part 2 of 2)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 217 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Infringement and Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation filed by Sandisk Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/7/2014. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] DECLARATION re 243 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Frankie Roohparvar by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] DECLARATION re 243 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Darrell Rinerson by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] DECLARATION re 243 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Robert Zeidman by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [SEALED] DECLARATION re 243 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Tamir Packin by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 67, # 2 Exhibit 68, # 3 Exhibit 69, # 4 Exhibit 70, # 5 Exhibit 71, # 6 Exhibit 72, # 7 Exhibit 73, # 8 Exhibit 74, # 9 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 213 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent Nos. 5,615,159 and 6,948,041 and Partial Summary Judgment on Priority Dates filed by Round Rock Research LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/7/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ken Bell on 11/5/2014 filed by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE to Take Deposition of SanDisk Corporation on 11/5/2014 filed by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jacob Baker on 11/4/2014 filed by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding response to the Court's October 14, 2014 Order (D.I. 212) - re 212 Order,,,. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robert Zeidman on October 30, 2014 filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Round Rock Research, LLC's First Supplemental Initial Disclosure Statement filed by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ken Bell on 11/5/2014 filed by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of SanDisk Corporation on 11/5/2014 filed by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Expert Report of R. Jacob Baker, Ph.D., P.E. filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 220 Declaration,,,,,, of Tamir Packin by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-6, # 2 Exhibits 7-66, # 3 Exhibits 1059, 1069, 1215, and 1447-1453)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 219 Declaration of Robert Zeidman by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-2)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of 218 Opening Brief in Support, by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of 217 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Infringement and Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of 223 Appendix, -- Volume 3 of 3 (Exhibits 22-49) -- by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of 222 Appendix, -- Volume 2 of 3 (Exhibits 19-21) -- by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 221 Appendix -- Volume 1 of 3 (Exhibits 1-18) -- by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of 216 Opening Brief in Support, of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 5,615,159, 6,728,798 and 6,948,041 by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 214 Opening Brief in Support, of Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent Nos. 5,615,159 and 6,948,041 and Partial Summary Judgment on Priority Dates by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rebuttal Expert Report of R. Jacob Baker, Ph.D., P.E. filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] APPENDIX re 214 Opening Brief in Support, 216 Opening Brief in Support, (Volume 3 of 3) by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 22-27, # 2 Exhibit 28, # 3 Exhibits 29-35, # 4 Exhibits 36-45, # 5 Exhibit 46, # 6 Exhibits 47-49)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] APPENDIX re 214 Opening Brief in Support, 216 Opening Brief in Support, (Volume 2 of 3) by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 19, Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 19, Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 19, Part 3, # 4 Exhibit 19, Part 4, # 5 Exhibit 19, Part 5, # 6 Exhibit 19, Part 6, # 7 Exhibit 19, Part 7, # 8 Exhibits 20-21)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] APPENDIX re 214 Opening Brief in Support, 216 Opening Brief in Support, (Volume 1 of 3) by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-6, # 2 Exhibits 7-10, # 3 Exhibits 11-18)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [SEALED] DECLARATION re 218 Opening Brief in Support, of Tamir Packin by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit 46, # 47 Exhibit 47, # 48 Exhibit 48, # 49 Exhibit 49, # 50 Exhibit 50, # 51 Exhibit 51, # 52 Exhibit 52, # 53 Exhibit 53, # 54 Exhibit 54, # 55 Exhibit 55, # 56 Exhibit 56, # 57 Exhibit 57, # 58 Exhibit 58, # 59 Exhibit 59, # 60 Exhibit 60, # 61 Exhibit 61, # 62 Exhibit 62, # 63 Exhibit 63, # 64 Exhibit 64, # 65 Exhibit 65, # 66 Exhibit 66, # 67 Exhibit 1059, # 68 Exhibit 1069, # 69 Exhibit 1215, # 70 Exhibit 1447, # 71 Exhibit 1448, # 72 Exhibit 1449, # 73 Exhibit 1450, # 74 Exhibit 1451, # 75 Exhibit 1452, # 76 Exhibit 1453, # 77 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] DECLARATION re 218 Opening Brief in Support, of Robert Zeidman by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 217 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Infringement and Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation filed by Round Rock Research LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/31/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] MOTION for Summary Judgment of Infringement and Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 215 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 5,615,159, 6,728,798 and 6,948,041 filed by Sandisk Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/31/2014. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 5,615,159, 6,728,798 and 6,948,041 - filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 213 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent Nos. 5,615,159 and 6,948,041 and Partial Summary Judgment on Priority Dates filed by Sandisk Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/31/2014. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent Nos. 5,615,159 and 6,948,041 and Partial Summary Judgment on Priority Dates - filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, having reviewed the letters and declarations submitted by the parties in connection with Round Rock's allegation that it has been prejudiced by SanDisk's disclosure of a "brand-new, late-breaking [non-infringement] theory" (D.I. 206 at 3); IT IS ORDERED that, absent a consensual resolution to this dispute, the experts shall appear in my courtroom to explain their respective positions to me in person (with allowance for cross-examination), as it remains unclear to me how the accused functionality is so complicated that SanDisk was not able to identify its non-infringement theory earlier, which theory appears to be inconsistent with the record created through fact discovery. The parties shall coordinate - through my chambers staff - their schedules with mine to establish a date for the hearing. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/14/2014. (nmfn) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 207 Declaration by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of 206 Letter by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 204 Declaration by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 203 Letter by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] DECLARATION re 206 Letter by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Michael J. Farnan regarding the Court's September 24, 2014 Order - re 203 Letter. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Erin E. Meyer - filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [SEALED] DECLARATION re 203 Letter -- Declaration of Brian Berg -- by Sandisk Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding discovery dispute. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 181 MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO SUBMIT A SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT. ORDER, SanDisk may file an affidavit and accompanying letter brief of no longer than three pages, to be submitted and served no later than Friday, September 26, 2014 at 4:30 p.m. Round Rock may respond no later than Tuesday, September 30, 2014 at 4:30 p.m. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/24/2014. (nmfn) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 195 Declaration of Leo L. Lam by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-6)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 194 Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Permission to Submit a Supplemental Expert Report by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of Brian Berg on September 30, 2014 filed by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of William Gervasi on October 7, 2014 filed by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, Rescheduling Hearings( The Oral Argument is rescheduled for 11/14/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/23/2014. (nmfn) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of the Supplemental Expert Report of Brian A. Berg Regarding U.S. Patent Nos. 5,615,159, 6,728,798 and 6,948,041 filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] DECLARATION re 194 Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Permit Supplemental Invalidity Report -- Declaration of Leo L. Lam -- by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-6)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 181 MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO SUBMIT A SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 186 Declaration, of Tamir Packin by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-8)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 185 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robert Zeidman on October 7, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of Desi Rhoden on September 24, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of SanDisk Corporation's Fifth Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed Stipulated Scheduling Order] re SO ORDERED, Scheduling Order,,,,,,,, 17 Scheduling Order,,, SO ORDERED, Scheduling Order,,,,,, Telephone Conference by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Main Document 188 replaced on 9/18/2014) (fms). (Entered: 09/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) the Rebuttal Expert Report of Brian A. Berg and (2) SanDisk Corporation's Supplemental Responses to Round Rock Research's Interrogatories (Nos. 2-4, 6, 8-17) filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] DECLARATION re 185 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Tamir Packin by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 181 MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO SUBMIT A SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT filed by Round Rock Research LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/22/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 182 Declaration of Christopher V. Ryan by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of 181 MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO SUBMIT A SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 7.1.1 Certification, # 2 Exhibit A)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] DECLARATION re 181 MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO SUBMIT A SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT [DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER V. RYAN] by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO SUBMIT A SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT - filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 7.1.1 Certification, # 2 Exhibit A)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Cory A. Johanningmeier - filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 177 Letter by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 & 2)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Expert Report of Brian A. Berg Regarding Invalidity of U.S. Patent Nos. 5,615,159, 6,728,798 and 6,948,041 filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding two items that Sandisk would like to discuss during the August 20, 2014 4:00 p.m. teleconference. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 & 2)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Expert Report of Brian A. Berg; (2) Expert Report of Bill Gervasi; and (3) Expert Report of R. Jacob Baker, Ph.D., P.E. filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Round Rock Research, LLC's Supplemental Response to SanDisk Corporation's Interrogatories (No. 10) filed by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of SanDisk Corporation's Supplemental Responses to Round Rock Research's Interrogatories (Nos. 1-25) filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of SanDisk Corporation's Fourth Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM ORDER re: claim construction. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/21/2014. (nmfn) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul A. Bondor - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant SanDisk Corporation's Sixth Amended Preliminary Invalidity Contentions filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, Setting Hearings( An In-Person Status Conference is set for 7/28/2014 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/26/2014. (nmfn) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SURREPLY BRIEF filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Main Document 168 replaced on 6/17/2014) (fms). (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Giorgos Stamatopoulos - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLAIM CONSTRUCTION REPLY BRIEF re 163 Claim Construction Answering Brief filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, Re-Setting Hearings( The Markman Hearing is rescheduled for 6/20/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/3/2014. (nmfn) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re 163 Claim Construction Answering Brief -- Declaration of Ajay Krishnan -- by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF re 159 Claim Construction Opening Brief filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove David Tobin as co-counsel.. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 160 Declaration of R. Cowell by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] DECLARATION re 159 Claim Construction Opening Brief of Richard M. Cowell by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint APPENDIX of Patents at Issue and File Wrappers - Part 2 of 2 by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E, # 2 Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit G, # 4 Exhibit H)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint APPENDIX of Patents at Issue and File Wrappers - Part 1 of 2 by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D - Part 1 of 9, # 5 Exhibit D - Part 2 of 9, # 6 Exhibit D - Part 3 of 9, # 7 Exhibit D - Part 4 of 9, # 8 Exhibit D - Part 5 of 9, # 9 Exhibit D - Part 6 of 9, # 10 Exhibit D - Part 7 of 9, # 11 Exhibit D - Part 8 of 9, # 12 Exhibit D - Part 9 of 9)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Charles Ossola as co-counsel.. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Chuck P. Ebertin, Justin Y. Chen, and Andrew X. Ng as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer affiliated with Vinson & Elkins LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLAIM Construction Chart by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of SanDisk Corporation's Supplemental Responses to Round Rock Research's Interrogatories (Nos. 1-25) filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Round Rock Research, LLC's Supplemental Response to SanDisk Corporation's Interrogatory No. 3 filed by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Round Rock Research, LLC's Objections, Responses and Supplemental Responses to SanDisk Corporation's Interrogatories (Nos. 3 and 7-15) filed by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Round Rock Research, LLC's April 10, 2014 Amended Preliminary Infringement Contentions filed by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding parties' proposed revised case schedules. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding April 3, 2014 teleconference. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Michael J. Farnan regarding April 3, 2014 Status Conference. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of SanDisk Corporation's Responses to Round Rock Research's Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 8-25) filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Michael J. Farnan regarding Patents for the January 2015 Trial. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert A. Van Nest; Leo L. Lam; Ajay S. Krishnan; and Ryan Wong - filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amended Infringement Contentions filed by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant SanDisk Corporation's Fourth Supplemental Preliminary Invalidity Contentions filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant SanDisk Corporation's Third Supplemental Preliminary Invalidity Contentions filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 122 Letter, by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of Nagdi Tafish on 3/18/2014 filed by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Elizabeth Kimmel - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mark Murin on 3/6/2014 filed by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mike Moser on 3/13/2014 filed by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mark Marin on 3/6/2014 filed by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant SanDisk Corporation's Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Round Rock Research (Nos. 7-15) filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Seth Lindner of VINSON & ELKINS LLP - filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of Frankie F. Roohparvar on March 5, 2014 filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jeremy A. Tigan on behalf of the parties regarding resolution of source code issue. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of SanDisk's Objections to Round Rock's Second Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David J. Tobin of VINSON & ELKINS LLP - filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of 119 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Table of Deposition Topics and Prior Testimony by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Round Rock Research, LLC's Second Set of Interrogatories to SanDisk Corporation (Nos. 8-25) filed by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of Thomas Kinsley on February 27, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of 114 Notice to Take Deposition by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Subpoena of Victor Tsai by Sandisk Corporation (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Michael J. Farnan regarding Response to SanDisk's February 10, 2014 Letter - re 119 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric J. Stieglitz - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bob Selinger on February 21, 2014 filed by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Table of Deposition Topics and Prior Haen Testimony. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, Setting Hearings( A Discovery Conference is set for 2/20/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.) If the parties have been unable to resolve the discovery dispute involving source code, each party shall bring to this conference a knowledgeable fact witness to testify about its respective discovery position. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/7/2014. (nmfn) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of Round Rock Research LLC on to be agreed upon by the parties filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Michael J. Farnan regarding February 6, 2014 Discovery Conference. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding issues to raise during the February 6, 2014 3:30 p.m. teleconference. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 114 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED NOTICE to Take Deposition of SanDisk Corporation on 2/27/2014 filed by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 2/6/2014 (nmfn). (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 40 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/30/2014. (nmfn) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant SanDisk Corporation's Second Supplemental Preliminary Invalidity Contentions filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of Oded Karni on January 28, 2014 filed by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of SanDisk Corporation's Second Supplemental Responses to Round Rock Research's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Michael J. Farnan regarding January 23, 2014 Discovery Conference. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Agenda. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of SUBPOENA (as to Victor Tsai) by SanDisk Corporation (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 1/23/2014 (nmfn). (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of SanDisk Corporation's Third Supplemental 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) SanDisk Corporation's First Amended Electronic Discovery Related Disclosures; and (2) SanDisk Corporation's Second Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of Frankie F. Roohparvar on January 29, 2014 filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: subpoenas and document production. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/9/2014. (nmfn) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Subpoena of Thomas H. Kinsley by Sandisk Corporation (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of 96 Letter by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of SUBPOENA (as to William H. Radke) by Sandisk Corporation (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of SUBPOENA (as to Christophe Chevallier) by Sandisk Corporation (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of SanDisk Corporation's Objections And Responses To Round Rock Research, LLC's December 19, 2013 Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Official Transcript of discovery conference held on December 18, 2013 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number (302) 573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/7/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/7/2014. (vjg) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Discovery in Support of Waiver and Estoppel. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Brian E. Farnan regarding Discovery Dispute. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of SanDisk Corporation's Supplemental Responses To Round Rock Research's First Set Of Interrogatories (Nos. 17) filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Brian E. Farnan regarding Documents for In Camera Review. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of SanDisk Corporation's First Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures filed by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of SanDisk Corporation on 1/7/2014 filed by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of Shahar Bar-Or on 12/30/2013 filed by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Joint Submission of Discovery Issues. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Subpoena re: Bryan D. Richardson by Sandisk Corporation (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Subpoena on Robert Kramer by Sandisk Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Subpoenas by Sandisk Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 through 4)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Eric Whitaker's Objections To Round Rock Research's Subpoena by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena to Eric Whitaker by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Subpoena to Intellectual Ventures, LLC by Sandisk Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Subpoena to Stonehill Capital Management, LLC by Sandisk Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of SUBPOENA (as to Ropes & Gray LLP) by Sandisk Corporation (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Subpoenas on Brent Capital LLC and Topel Forman LLC by Sandisk Corporation (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Janice Ta of Vinson & Elkins LLP - filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of SUBPOENA (as to JEDEC Solid State Technology Association) by Sandisk Corporation (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of SUBPOENA (as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.) by Sandisk Corporation (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Subpoena to SD Card Association by Round Rock Research LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew X. Ng and Charles Ossola - filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of SUBPOENA (as to Altitude Capital Partners, L.P.) by Sandisk Corporation (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED SCHEDULING ORDER re Telephone Conference by Round Rock Research LLC, Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew G. Hamill - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of SUBPOENA by Sandisk Corporation (as to Ropes & Gray LLP) (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of 69 Notice (Other) Notice of Subpoena (as to General Atlantic LLC) by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] NOTICE of SUBPOENA by Sandisk Corporation (as to General Atlantic LLC) (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of SUBPOENA (as to David J. Kaplan) by Sandisk Corporation (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of SUBPOENA (as to John F. Paschke) by Sandisk Corporation (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of SUBPOENA (as to Altitude Capital Partners) by Sandisk Corporation (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of SUBPOENA (as to Flash Memory Summit) by Sandisk Corporation (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of SUBPOENA (as to Credit Suisse Management LLC) by Sandisk Corporation (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of SUBPOENA (as to Courthouse Services Company, LLC) by Sandisk Corporation (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of SUBPOENA (as to Coller Capital, Inc.) by Sandisk Corporation (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of Atmel Corporation on September 20, 2013 by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Spansion Inc. on September 13, 2013 by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A Part 2)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Subpoena (directed to Frankie F. Roohparvar) by Sandisk Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of Renesas Electronics America, Inc. on August 23, 2013 by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding list of discovery issues for discussion at August 7 discovery conference. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Subpoena to Micron Technology, Inc. by Sandisk Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew G. Heinz - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sarah M. Ray of LATHAM & WATKINS LLP - filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tamir Packin and Edward Terchunian - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of 50 Reply Brief (Sandisk Corporation's Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Amend its Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims) by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Sandisk Corporation's Supplemental Preliminary Invalidity Contentions by Sandisk Corporation.(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 40 MOTION to Amend/Correct 8 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant SanDisk Corporation's List of Claim Terms and Proposed Constructions by Sandisk Corporation.(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 47 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 40 MOTION to Amend/Correct 8 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, filed by Round Rock Research LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/22/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of 43 Declaration, of Jeremy A. Tigan in support of SanDisk's Motion to Amend Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-9)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of 42 Opening Brief in Support, of SanDisk's Motion to Amend Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of 41 Exhibit to a Document, Exhibits A and B to Defendant Sandisk Corporation's Motion for Leave to Amend Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] DECLARATION re 40 MOTION to Amend/Correct 8 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, -- Declaration of Jeremy A. Tigan in Support of Defendant Sandisk Corporation's Motion to Amend Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims -- by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-5, # 2 Exhibits 6-9)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 40 MOTION to Amend/Correct 8 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, filed by Sandisk Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/11/2013. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] EXHIBIT re 40 MOTION to Amend/Correct 8 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, -- Exhibits A and B to Defendant Sandisk Corporation's Motion for Leave to Amend Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims -- by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct 8 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, - filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Round Rock Research, LLC's First Supplemental Response to SanDisk Corporation's Interrogatory No. 3 by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Round Rock Research, LLC's Objections and Responses to SanDisk Corporation's Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 48-66) by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher S. Yates, Hanno F. Kaiser and Alan Devlin - filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant SanDisk Corporation's Second Set Of Requests For Production Of Documents And Things To Plaintiff Round Rock Research, LLC [Nos. 48-66] by Sandisk Corporation.(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Subpoena to Micron Technology, Inc. by Sandisk Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of SanDisk Corporation's Response to Round Rock's Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents (Nos. 46-52) by Sandisk Corporation.(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Round Rock Research LLC's Objections and Responses to SanDisk Corporation's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-6) and Round Rock Research, LLC's Objections and Responses to SanDisk Corporation's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-47) by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Efren Garcia - filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Subpoena of JEDEC Solid State Technology Association by Sandisk Corporation (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Subpoena (directed to Micron Technology, Inc.) by Sandisk Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) SanDisk Corporation's Response to Round Rock's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents (Nos. 1-45); and 2) SanDisk Corporation's Responses to Round Rock Research's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) by Sandisk Corporation.(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant SanDisk Corporation's Preliminary Invalidity Contentions by Sandisk Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Round Rock Research LLC's Second Set of Document Requests to SanDisk Corporation (Nos. 46-52) by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Subpoenas (directed to Atmel Corporation and Intel Corporation) by Sandisk Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant SanDisk Corporation's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Round Rock Research (Nos. 1-6) and (2) Defendant SanDisk Corporation's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Plaintiff Round Rock Research LLC (Nos. 1-48) by Sandisk Corporation.(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Subpoena (directed to Spansion Inc.) by Sandisk Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Part 3, # 4 Exhibit 1 - Part 4)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Round Rock Research LLC's First Set of Interrogatories to SanDisk Corporation (Nos. 1-7) and (ii) Round Rock Research LLC's First Set of Document Requests to SanDisk Corporation (Nos. 1-45) by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of SanDisk Corporation's Initial Electronic Discovery Related Disclosures by Sandisk Corporation.(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff SanDisk Corporation's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Sandisk Corporation.(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Round Rock Research, LLC's Initial Disclosure Statement by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 10/9/2012 at 03:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/28/2012. (lih) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Discovery due by 2/14/2014. A Discovery Conference is set for 6/4/2013 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Dispositive Motions due by 4/25/2014. An Oral Argument is set for 6/20/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 2/21/2014. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 3/14/2014. Claim Construction Reply Brief due by 3/28/2014. Claim Construction Surreply Brief due by 4/11/2014. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 9/15/2014 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. A Jury Trial is set for 9/29/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/16/2012. (nmfn) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION and Order To Dismiss Causes of Action with Regard to Patent No. 6,845,053 by Round Rock Research LLC, Sandisk Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 8 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 8/16/2012 at 03:00 PM before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/14/2012. (nmfn) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher V. Ryan; Chuck P. Ebertin and Justin Y. Chen - filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jon T. Hohenthaner, John C. Spaccarotella, Ameet A. Modi, and Richard Cowell - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand -- SanDisk Corporation's Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims in Response to Plaintiff Round Rock Research, LLC's Amended Complaint --, COUNTERCLAIM against Round Rock Research LLC by Sandisk Corporation.(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to July 9, 2012 - filed by Round Rock Research LLC, Sandisk Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,615,159; 6,034,440; US 6,654,847 B1; US 6,728,798 B1; US 6,845,053 B2; US 6,948,041 B2; US 7,336,531 B2; US 7,692,984 B2; US 7,742,344 B2; US 8,023,344 B2; US 8,060,719 B2 . (Farnan, Brian) Modified on 5/15/2012 (fms). (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sandisk Corporation- filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Round Rock Research LLC. Sandisk Corporation served on 5/4/2012, answer due 5/25/2012. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,615,159; 6,034,440; US 6,654,847 B1; US 6,728,798 B1; US 6,845,053 B2; US 6,948,041 B2; US 7,336,531 B2, US 7,692,984 B2, US 7,742,334 B2, US 8,023,344 B2, US 8,060,719 B2. (rwc) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Sandisk Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 0311-1068590.) - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/4/2012: # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Civil Cover Sheet) (rwc). (Attachment 9 replaced on 5/8/2012) (dab). Modified on 5/8/2012 (dab). Modified on 5/8/2012 (dab). Modified on 5/9/2012 (dab). (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 731 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?