In re: Rothstein Rosenfeldt Adler, P.A. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 0:11-cv-61338
District Judge James I. Cohn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 9, 2016 at 3:15 PM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Herbert Stettin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger Singerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jordi Guso +1 305 755 9500 +1 305 714 4340 jguso@bergersingerman.com
v.
No Logo Aran Development, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather Lena Ries +1 561 835 9600 +1 561 835 9602 hries@foxrothschild.com
No Logo Ballamor Capital Management, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Jon Norris +1 305 960 2200 +1 305 960 2201 tjnorris@duanemorris.com
No Logo Ballamor Capital Management, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Jon Norris +1 305 960 2200 +1 305 960 2201 tjnorris@duanemorris.com
No Logo Barry R. Bekkedam, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Jon Norris +1 305 960 2200 +1 305 960 2201 tjnorris@duanemorris.com
No Logo BWS Investments, USA,LLC., Defendant
No Logo Caro Group LLC, Defendant
No Logo Carol A. Morse, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Tripp Scott

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew H. Scott +1 954 760 4911 mhs@trippscott.com
No Logo Concorde Capital Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Conrad and Scherer, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James David Silver +1 954 462 5500 +1 954 463 9244 jsilver@conradscherer.com
No Logo Drake Ventures, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Edward J. Morse, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Edward Morse, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Tripp Scott

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew H. Scott +1 954 760 4911 mhs@trippscott.com
No Logo Exito, Defendant
No Logo FDS Investments, LLC, Defendant
No Logo GGTW Investments USA, Defendant
No Logo Gibraltar Private Bank & Trust Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LEHTINEN RIEDI BROOKS MONCAZ, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claudio Riedi +1 305 279 1166 criedi@lehtinenlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tew Cardenas LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph A. DeMaria +1 305 539 2440 +5361 536 536 1116 jad@tewlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C. Thomas Tew, Jr. +1 305 536 1112 +5361 536 536 1116 tt@tewlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Thomas West +1 305 536 1112 +5361 536 536 1116 btw@tewlaw.com
No Logo H&N ASSOCIATES, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Conrad and Scherer, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James David Silver +1 954 462 5500 +1 954 463 9244 jsilver@conradscherer.com
No Logo Harvey Wolinetz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Conrad and Scherer, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James David Silver +1 954 462 5500 +1 954 463 9244 jsilver@conradscherer.com
No Logo Jacob Mussry, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Conrad and Scherer, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James David Silver +1 954 462 5500 +1 954 463 9244 jsilver@conradscherer.com
No Logo Marmarser, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Morse Operations, Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Tripp Scott

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew H. Scott +1 954 760 4911 mhs@trippscott.com
No Logo Nassim Mussry, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Conrad and Scherer, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James David Silver +1 954 462 5500 +1 954 463 9244 jsilver@conradscherer.com
No Logo Network Resources, LLC, Defendant
No Logo new miami, Defendant
No Logo Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Defendant
No Logo OPMonies 2, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Pirulin, LLC, Defendant
No Logo PREVE & ASSOCIATES, LLC,, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rasco Klock Reininger Perez Esquenazi Vigil & Nieto

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Daniel Eaton +1 305 476 7100 +1 305 476 7102 jeaton@rascoklock.com
Stone, Roger J. Stone, Roger J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Roger J Stone, Jr."
No Logo Dallas Uptown Hospitality LLC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Scott Morgan"

Toggle Switch Represented by Conrad and Scherer, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James David Silver +1 954 462 5500 +1 954 463 9244 jsilver@conradscherer.com
No Logo Scott W. Rothstein, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Marc S. Nurik

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc S. Nurik +1 954 745 5849 +1 954 745 3556 marc@nuriklaw.com
No Logo Viceroy Global Investments, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Conrad and Scherer, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James David Silver +1 954 462 5500 +1 954 463 9244 jsilver@conradscherer.com
No Logo Brian Levy, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Waldman Trigoboff Hildebrandt Marx & Calnan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Edward Calnan +1 954 467 8600 +1 954 467 6222 wcalnan@waldmanlawfirm.com
No Logo Rothstein Rosenfeldt Adler, P.A., In Re:
Citation Transmission of Bankruptcy Reference
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (163) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 175 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 172 Motion to Authorize Trustee to Disclose Information in Adversary Proceeding. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 3/27/2013. (sry)
    LREF
    Blank 168 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 149 Motion to Extend Second Deposition to Three Weeks; granting 153 Motion to Adopt/Join; granting 154 Motion to Adopt/Join; granting 155 Motion to Adopt/Join; granting 158 Motion to Adopt/Join; granting 160 Motion ; granting 164 Motion to Adopt/Join; granting 165 Motion to Adopt/Join; granting 166 Motion to Adopt/Join. Order Closing Case. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 4/19/2012. (prd) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert C. Furr re 152 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum,,,,, Order Granting the Motions of the Insurance Companies and Banyon Trustee to Issue a Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum (Harris, Amy) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None
        MOTION to Adopt/Join 149 MOTION to Extend Second Scott Rothstein Deposition to Three Weeks re 129 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum, Order on Motion to Take Deposition,,,, by Concorde Capital, Inc, H&N Associates, Scott Morgan, Jacob Mussry, Nassim Mussry, Viceroy Global Investments, Inc, Harvey Wolinetz. (Silver, James) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None
          MOTION to Adopt/Join 149 MOTION to Extend Second Scott Rothstein Deposition to Three Weeks re 129 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum, Order on Motion to Take Deposition,,,, by Casa Casuarina, LLC, Loftin Family, LLC, Loftin Hospitality, LLC, Luxury Resorts, LLC, Peter Loftin. (Zinkler, George) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None
            MOTION to Adopt/Join 149 MOTION to Extend Second Scott Rothstein Deposition to Three Weeks re 129 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum, Order on Motion to Take Deposition,,,, by FEP Victims Group. (Aaronson, Geoffrey) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None
              REPLY to Response to Motion re 149 MOTION to Extend Second Scott Rothstein Deposition to Three Weeks re 129 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum, Order on Motion to Take Deposition,,,, Extend Second Deposition of Scott Rothstein filed by Herbert Stettin. (Lichtman, Charles) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None
                NOTICE by Caro Group LLC, new miami, Pirulin, LLC, Network Resources, LLC, Marmarser, LLC, Exito, OPMonies 2, LLC, BWS Investments, USA,LLC., GGTW Investments USA, FDS Investments, LLC re 149 MOTION to Extend Second Scott Rothstein Deposition to Three Weeks re 129 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum, Order on Motion to Take Deposition,,,, of Joinder in Trustee's Motion to Extend Second Scott Rothstein Deposition to Three Weeks (Traband, Rhett) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None
                  RESPONSE in Support re 149 MOTION to Extend Second Scott Rothstein Deposition to Three Weeks re 129 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum, Order on Motion to Take Deposition,,,, (Joinder in Trustee's Motion to Extend Second Scott Rothstein Deposition) filed by PREVE & ASSOCIATES, LLC,, Frank Preve, SFS Capital Funding, LLC. (Eaton, John) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None
                    MOTION Joinder in Trustees Motion to Extend Second Scott Rothstein Deposition to Three Weeks re 149 MOTION to Extend Second Scott Rothstein Deposition to Three Weeks re 129 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum, Order on Motion to Take Deposition,,,, by Columbia Casualty Company, Federal Insurance Company, RLI Insurance Company, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company. (Reich, Ivan) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None
                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 149 MOTION to Extend Second Scott Rothstein Deposition to Three Weeks re 129 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum, Order on Motion to Take Deposition,,,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Transcripts February 10, 2012 Hearing)(LaVecchio, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None
                        MOTION to Adopt/Join 149 MOTION to Extend Second Scott Rothstein Deposition to Three Weeks re 129 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum, Order on Motion to Take Deposition,,,, by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Goldberg, Michael) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None
                          RESPONSE in Support re 149 MOTION to Extend Second Scott Rothstein Deposition to Three Weeks re 129 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum, Order on Motion to Take Deposition,,,, filed by Michael Kent. (Neiwirth, Arthur) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None
                            NOTICE by Shimon Levy re 149 MOTION to Extend Second Scott Rothstein Deposition to Three Weeks re 129 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum, Order on Motion to Take Deposition,,,, Notice of Joinder in Motion (Salim, William) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
                              MOTION to Adopt/Join 149 MOTION to Extend Second Scott Rothstein Deposition to Three Weeks re 129 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum, Order on Motion to Take Deposition,,,, by Aran Development, Inc.. (Ries, Heather) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
                                MOTION to Adopt/Join 149 MOTION to Extend Second Scott Rothstein Deposition to Three Weeks re 129 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum, Order on Motion to Take Deposition,,,, by Brian Levy. (Calnan, William) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
                                  MOTION to Adopt/Join 149 MOTION to Extend Second Scott Rothstein Deposition to Three Weeks re 129 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum, Order on Motion to Take Deposition,,,, by Banyon Trustee by Robert C. Furr. (Harris, Amy) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 152 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting 144 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum; granting 145 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum; granting 146 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 4/17/2012. (prd) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company re 144 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum , 146 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum , 148 Notice (Other), 147 Notice (Other) Joining in Motions for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Requests for Hearing filed by Insurance Companies (Mekler, Kevin) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        PAPERLESS ORDER Directing Expedited Response from United States to 149 MOTION to Extend Second Scott Rothstein Deposition to Three Weeks. Response due by 2pm on Wednesday, April 18, 2012. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 4/17/2012. (prd) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                          MOTION to Extend Second Scott Rothstein Deposition to Three Weeks re 129 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum, Order on Motion to Take Deposition,,,, by Herbert Stettin. (Lichtman, Charles) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE by Columbia Casualty Company, Federal Insurance Company, Ironshore Indemnity Inc., RLI Insurance Company, Westchester Fire Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company re 144 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum Request for Hearing (Reich, Ivan) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE by Federal Insurance Company re 146 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum Request for Hearing (Hofrichter, Alex) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum by Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Hofrichter, Alex) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum by Robert C. Furr. (Harris, Amy) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum by Columbia Casualty Company, Federal Insurance Company, Ironshore Indemnity Inc., RLI Insurance Company, Westchester Fire Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Reich, Ivan) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 143 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER denying 136 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum; denying 137 Motion to Amend Order; denying 137 Motion for Clarification. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 3/20/2012. (prd) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                        RESPONSE/REPLY to 139 Response in Opposition to Motion, 141 Response in Opposition to Motion, 140 Response in Opposition to Motion by Razorback Funding, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Silver, James) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 137 MOTION to Amend/Correct 129 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum, Order on Motion to Take Deposition,,,, MOTION for clarification 129 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum, Order on Motion to Take Deposition,,,, filed by Morse Operations, Inc. (Scott, Matthew) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 136 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum filed by Morse Operations, Inc. (Scott, Matthew) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 136 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum , 137 MOTION to Amend/Correct 129 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum, Order on Motion to Take Deposition,,,, MOTION for clarification 129 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum, Order on Motion to Take Deposition,,,, filed by Edward J. Morse, Jr.. (Safra, Steven) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 136 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum filed by Herbert Stettin. Replies due by 3/23/2012. (Lichtman, Charles) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                  MOTION to Amend/Correct 129 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum, Order on Motion to Take Deposition,,,, , MOTION for clarification 129 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum, Order on Motion to Take Deposition,,,, by Razorback Funding, LLC. Responses due by 3/29/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Silver, James) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum by Razorback Funding, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A-Part 2)(Silver, James) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Scott W. Rothstein for 6/4/12. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 3/1/2012. (jcy) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        WITHDRAWAL of Motion re 131 MOTION for clarification 129 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum,, Order on Motion to Take Deposition,,, filed by Michael Kent (Neiwirth, Arthur) (Entered: 02/27/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 131 MOTION for clarification 129 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum,, Order on Motion to Take Deposition,,, filed by Herbert Stettin. Replies due by 3/5/2012. (Lichtman, Charles) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Geoffrey Stuart Aaronson (Aaronson, Geoffrey) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for clarification 129 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum,, Order on Motion to Take Deposition,,, by Michael Kent. Responses due by 3/12/2012 (Neiwirth, Arthur) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James I. Cohn: Motion Hearing held on 2/10/2012 re 104 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for Second Deposition of Scott Rothstein filed by Herbert Stettin and 120 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum filed by Jeffrey Epstein. Court Reporter: Pauline Stipes, 954-769-5496 / Pauline_Stipes@flsd.uscourts.gov (prd) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 129 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting 104 Trustee's Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum; denying without prejudice 107 Brian Levy's Motion to Take Deposition from Scott Rothstein; granting 120 Jeffrey Epstein's Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 2/13/2012. (prd) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    Clerks Notice to Filer re 126 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#127]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward J. Peterson, III on behalf of Robert C. Furr (ls)(See Image at DE # 126 ) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE by Robert C. Furr Notice of Appearance by Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, P.A., for Robert C. Furr, Chapter 7 Trustee for Banyon 1030-32, LLC, and Request to Receive Documents and to be Added to Mailing Matrix (Peterson, Edward) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 104 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for Second Deposition of Scott Rothstein filed by Herbert Stettin. (Lichtman, Charles) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            RESPONSE/REPLY to 114 Response to Motion, 112 Response to Motion, 109 Response to Motion, 111 Response to Motion, 113 Response to Motion, 116 Response to Motion, by United States of America. (LaVecchio, Lawrence) (Entered: 02/07/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Arthur Charles Neiwirth on behalf of Michael Kent (Neiwirth, Arthur) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Daniel Eaton on behalf of Frank Preve, SFS Capital Funding, LLC, PREVE & ASSOCIATES, LLC, (Eaton, John) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy Jon Norris on behalf of Ballamor Capital Management, Inc., Ballamor Capital Management, LLC, Barry R. Bekkedam (Norris, Timothy) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum by Jeffrey Epstein. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- State Court Corrected Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2- State Court Agreed Order on Renewed Motion to Take Deposition of Scott Rothstein, # 3 Exhibit 3- Excerpt from Deposition of Scott Rothstein December 12, 2011)(Graham, John) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 104 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for Second Deposition of Scott Rothstein filed by Razorback Funding, LLC. Replies due by 2/13/2012. (Silver, James) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 104 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for Second Deposition of Scott Rothstein filed by H&N Associates, Jacob Mussry, Nassim Mussry, Scott Morgan, Harvey Wolinetz, Viceroy Global Investments, Inc, Concorde Capital, Inc. Replies due by 2/13/2012. (Silver, James) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Spencer Graham on behalf of Jeffrey Epstein (Graham, John) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 104 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for Second Deposition of Scott Rothstein filed by David Bodner, Naomi Bodner, Bodner Family Foundation, Laura Huberfeld, Murray Huberfeld, Dahlia Kalter, Mark Nordlicht, Regent Capital Partners, LLC. Replies due by 2/13/2012. (Koroglu, Harris) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 104 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for Second Deposition of Scott Rothstein filed by Michael Kent. Replies due by 2/13/2012. (Neiwirth, Arthur) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 104 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for Second Deposition of Scott Rothstein filed by SPD Group, Inc.. Replies due by 2/13/2012. (Scott, Patrick) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 104 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for Second Deposition of Scott Rothstein, 105 MOTION for Hearing re 104 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for Second Deposition of Scott Rothstein filed by Frank Preve, SFS Capital Funding, LLC. Replies due by 2/13/2012. (Eaton, John) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 104 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for Second Deposition of Scott Rothstein filed by National Union Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. Replies due by 2/13/2012. (Thompson, Patricia) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 104 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for Second Deposition of Scott Rothstein filed by Ballamor Capital Management, Inc., Ballamor Capital Management, LLC, Barry R. Bekkedam. Replies due by 2/13/2012. (Norris, Timothy) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 104 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for Second Deposition of Scott Rothstein filed by EMESS Capital, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" - Order Granting Leave to Depose Rothstein, # 2 Exhibit "B" - Email correspondence)(Cusick, Casey) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 104 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for Second Deposition of Scott Rothstein filed by Columbia Casualty Company, Federal Insurance Company, Ironshore Indemnity Inc., RLI Insurance Company, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Westchester Fire Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company. Replies due by 2/13/2012. (Reich, Ivan) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 104 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for Second Deposition of Scott Rothstein, 105 MOTION for Hearing re 104 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for Second Deposition of Scott Rothstein filed by Gerald A. Brauser, Bernice Brauser, Leon Brauser, Leona Brauser, Brauser Enterprises, Inc., Renee Zonenshine. Replies due by 2/10/2012. (Joseph, Allan) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION to Take Deposition from Scott Rothstein by Brian Levy. (Attachments: # 1 deposition excerpts)(Calnan, William) (Entered: 01/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 106 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER Granting 105 MOTION for Hearing on 104 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for Second Deposition of Scott Rothstein. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2012 at 10:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge James I. Cohn. ORDER Directing Expedited Responses to 104 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum. Responses due by 2/1/12; replies due by 12 noon on 2/8/12. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 1/19/2011. (prd) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Hearing re 104 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for Second Deposition of Scott Rothstein by Herbert Stettin. (Lichtman, Charles) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for Second Deposition of Scott Rothstein by Herbert Stettin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "1" Agreed Order, # 2 Exhibit "2" Amended Protocol Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order "Proposed Order)(Lichtman, Charles) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Compliance by Herbert Stettin re 100 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Discovery, Order on Motion for Sanctions (Lichtman, Charles) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Compliance by Herbert Stettin re 100 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Discovery, Order on Motion for Sanctions (Lichtman, Charles) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Compliance by Herbert Stettin re 100 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Discovery, Order on Motion for Sanctions (Lichtman, Charles) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 79 TD Bank's Cross-Motion for Remedial Relief Related to Unauthorized Disclosure of Information; denying 81 Platinum Partners' Cross- Motion for Discovery and Sanctions. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 12/22/2011. (prd) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENT to 93 Response to Motion,,,,, by Herbert Stettin (Lichtman, Charles) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE/REPLY to 93 Response to Motion,,,,, - Defendant TD Bank, N.A.'s Reply in Support of its Cross-Motion for Remedial Relief Relating to Unauthorized Disclosure of Information by TD Bank, N.A.. (Bloom, Mark) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE/REPLY to 81 MOTION for Discovery MOTION for Sanctions Regarding RRA Trustee's Violation of Court Order by Platinum Partners Value Arbitrage Fund LP. (Trench, Susan) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    PAPERLESS ORDER granting 95 Motion for Leave to File Reply in support of Cross-Motion for Sanctions. A reply in support of a cross-motion can be filed as of right. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 12/12/2011. (prd) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File A Reply To Trustee and His Counsels' Response to Cross-Motions of TD Bank and Platinum Partners' Value Arbitrage Fund LP Regarding Dissemination of Information from Scott Rothstein Interview by TD Bank, N.A.. (Bloom, Mark) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        PAPERLESS ORDER granting 92 Motion for Leave to File Response in Excess of Twenty Pages. The Trustee seeks an additional three pages for his response to the pending cross-motions. Even if the relief sought were opposed, the Court grants the motion as it only seeks an additional three pages in a combined response to both motions. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 12/12/2011. (prd) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 81 MOTION for Discovery MOTION for Sanctions, 79 MOTION for Remedial Relief Relating to Unauthorized Disclosure of Information filed by Herbert Stettin. Replies due by 12/19/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" Trial Transcript dated November 10, 2011 (Part 1 of 4), # 2 Exhibit "A" Trial Transcript dated November 10, 2011 (Part 2 of 4), # 3 Exhibit "A" Trial Transcript dated November 10, 2011 (Part 3 of 4), # 4 Exhibit "A" Trial Transcript dated November 10, 2011 (Part 4 of 4), # 5 Exhibit "B" Motion for Mistrial, # 6 Exhibit "C" 2004 Examination of Frank Spinosa, # 7 Exhibit "D" Excerpt of Frank Spinosa Deposition, # 8 Exhibit "E" Razorback Funding Third Amended Complaint Cover Page, # 9 Exhibit "F" Frank Spinosa's Motion to Strike, # 10 Exhibit "G" Order Denying Frank Spinosa's Motion to Strike, # 11 Exhibit "H" Coquina Trial Transcript dated November 8, 2007, # 12 Exhibit "I" Deposition of Herbert Stettin dated November 9, 2011 (Part 1 of 3), # 13 Exhibit "I" Deposition of Herbert Stettin dated November 9, 2011 (Part 2 of 3), # 14 Exhibit "I" Deposition of Herbert Stettin dated November 9, 2011 (Part 3 of 3))(Lichtman, Charles) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Herbert Stettin. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lichtman, Charles) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 91 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED ORDER re 90 Order on Motion to Bring in Electronic Equipment. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 12/9/2011. (prd) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 90 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 89 Unopposed Motion to Bring in Electronic Equipment into Courthouse. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 12/8/2011. (prd) (Entered: 12/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Authorization for Counsel Participating in the Deposition of Scott W. Rothstein to Bring Electronic Equipment into the James L. King Federal Justice Building by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Goldberg, Michael) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Gibraltar Private Bank & Trust Company re 59 Response to Motion, (Withdrawal of Responses 59 and 83 ) (Moorefield, Harold) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harold Defore Moorefield, Jr on behalf of Gibraltar Private Bank & Trust Company (Moorefield, Harold) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bart Alan Houston on behalf of Levinson & Company, Inc., Roger J Stone, Jr, Drake Ventures, LLC, RL Pearson And Associates, Inc., Roger Stone, Watch-U-Want, Inc. (Houston, Bart) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 85 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 53 Motion to Amend Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum; denying 83 Motion to Compel Government regarding conditions of deposition; Order deferring ruling on relief of bifurcation; Order directing response to remaining cross-motions. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 11/28/2011. (prd) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Clerks Notice to Filer re 59 Response to Trustees 53 Expedited Motion to Amend Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum. Two or More Document Events Filed as One; ERROR - Only one event was selected by the Filer but more than one event was applicable to the document filed. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but in the future, the Filer must select all applicable events. See 83 MOTION to Compel the Government to produce Scott Rothstein for deposition under circumstances that are fair to all of the parties. (sk) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel the Government to produce Scott Rothstein for deposition under circumstances that are fair to all of the parties by Gibraltar Private Bank & Trust Company. Responses due by 12/5/2011 (sk) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Clerks Notice to Filer re 74 Response/Reply (Other). Two or More Document Events Filed as One; ERROR - Only one event was selected by the Filer but more than one event was applicable to the document filed. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk, see DE#81. It is not necessary to refile this document but in the future, the Filer must select all applicable events. (dgj) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  CROSS-MOTION for Discovery and Sanctions Regarding RRA Trustee's Violation of Court Order by Platinum Partners Value Arbitrage Fund LP. ( Responses due by 12/9/2011) (see image at DE# 74 ) (dgj) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Clerks Notice to Filer re 65 Response to Motion,. Two or More Document Events Filed as One; ERROR - Only one event was selected by the Filer but more than one event was applicable to the document filed. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk, see DE#79. It is not necessary to refile this document but in the future, the Filer must select all applicable events. (dgj) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      CROSS-MOTION for Remedial Relief Relating to Unauthorized Disclosure of Information by TD Bank, N.A.. (see image at DE# 65 ) (dgj) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct 52 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued (Expedited) *Amended Response to Motion DE 53 filed by Columbia Casualty Company, RLI Insurance Company, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Westchester Fire Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Ironshore Indemnity Inc.. Replies due by 12/5/2011. (Reich, Ivan) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          NON-SEALED ORDER granting 68 Sealed Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 11/23/2011. (ra) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct 52 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued (Expedited) filed by David Bodner, Naomi Bodner, Bodner Family Foundation, Laura Huberfeld, Murray Huberfeld, Dahlia Kalter, Mark Nordlicht, Regent Capital Partners, LLC. Replies due by 12/2/2011. (Koroglu, Harris) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harris Jacob Koroglu on behalf of Regent Capital Partners, LLC, Laura Huberfeld, Murray Huberfeld, Naomi Bodner, David Bodner, Bodner Family Foundation, Dahlia Kalter, Mark Nordlicht (Koroglu, Harris) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE/REPLY to 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct 52 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued (Expedited) by Platinum Partners Value Arbitrage Fund LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Trien, Stacey) Modified on 11/28/2011, see DE#81 (dgj). (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct 52 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued (Expedited) filed by Westchester Fire Insurance Company, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, RLI Insurance Company, Columbia Casualty Company, Zurich American Insurance Company. Replies due by 12/2/2011. (Reich, Ivan) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE/REPLY to 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct 52 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued (Expedited) by SPD Group, Inc.. (Scott, Patrick) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Support re 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct 52 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued (Expedited) filed by Brian Levy. (Calnan, William) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct 52 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued (Expedited) filed by EMESS Capital, LLC.. Replies due by 12/2/2011. (Berman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct 52 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued (Expedited) filed by United States of America. Replies due by 12/2/2011. (LaVecchio, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct 52 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued (Expedited) filed by Federal Insurance Company. Replies due by 12/2/2011. (Hofrichter, Alex) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct 52 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued (Expedited) and Cross-Motion for Remedial Relief Relating to Unauthorized Disclosure of Information (Expedited Consideration Requested) filed by TD Bank, N.A.. Replies due by 12/2/2011. (Bloom, Mark) Modified on 11/28/2011, see DE#79 (dgj). (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct 52 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued (Expedited) filed by Scott W. Rothstein. Replies due by 12/1/2011. (Nurik, Marc) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct 52 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued (Expedited) filed by Razorback Funding, LLC. Replies due by 12/1/2011. (Silver, James) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENT to 57 Response in Support of Motion by Trustee to Amend/Correct Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum (Expedited) [D.E. #53] by Carol A. Morse, Edward Morse, Morse Operations, Inc (Scott, Matthew) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct 52 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued (Expedited) filed by Frank Preve, SFS Capital Funding, LLC. Replies due by 12/1/2011. (Eaton, John) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE/REPLY to 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct 52 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued (Expedited) by Levinson & Company, Inc.. (Houston, Bart) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct 52 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued (Expedited) filed by Gibraltar Private Bank & Trust Company. Replies due by 11/28/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(DeMaria, Joseph) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Directing Expedited Responses to 53 MOTION to Amend 52 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum filed by Herbert Stettin. See Order for details. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 11/14/2011. (prd) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Support re 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct 52 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued (Expedited) filed by Carol A. Morse, Edward Morse, Morse Operations, Inc. (Scott, Matthew) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew H. Scott on behalf of Carol A. Morse (Scott, Matthew) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew H. Scott on behalf of Morse Operations, Inc (Scott, Matthew) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew H. Scott on behalf of Edward Morse (Scott, Matthew) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct 52 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued (Expedited) by Herbert Stettin. Responses due by 11/28/2011 (Lichtman, Charles) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Scott W. Rothstein for December 12, 2011. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 9/12/2011. (jcy) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Herbert Stettin re 50 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Sealed Motion, Order on Motion for Hearing, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,, of Filing Writ of Habeas Corpus As Testificandum (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" "Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum")(Lichtman, Charles) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 36 Motion to Revise the Order of Judge Ray; granting 37 Motion to Seal; denying 42 Motion for Hearing; denying 45 Motion for Access to Government's Ex Parte Submission. See Order for details. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 9/6/2011. (prd) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 45 MOTION re 36 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief, Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Bankruptcy Moti MOTION re 36 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief, Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Bankruptcy Moti MOTION re 36 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief, Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Bankruptcy Moti filed by United States of America. (LaVecchio, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 42 MOTION for Hearing re 41 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Revise the Order of Judge Ray Setting the Protocol for Deposition of Scott W. Rothstein filed by United States of America. (LaVecchio, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Support re 45 MOTION re 36 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief, Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Bankruptcy Moti MOTION re 36 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief, Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Bankruptcy Moti MOTION re 36 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief, Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Bankruptcy Moti (Limited Joinder in TD Bank's Motion and Supporting Memorandum of Law for Access to the Government's Sealed Filing re Scott Rothstein Deposition Protocol [D.E. 45]) filed by Razorback Funding, LLC. (Silver, James) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE/REPLY to 36 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief, Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief, Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief by TD Bank, N.A.. (Schnapp, Mark) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION re 36 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief, Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief, Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief Motion and Supporting Memorandum of Law for Access to the Government's Memorandum in Support of Its Motion Filed Under Seal to Revise the Order of Judge Ray Setting The Protocol for the Deposition of Scott W. Rothstein by TD Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schnapp, Mark) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 36 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief, Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief, Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief (Limited Joinder in Gibraltar Opposition [D.E. 41] to Government's Motion to Revise the Order of Judge Ray Setting the Protocol for Deposition of Scott W. Rothstein) filed by Razorback Funding, LLC. (Silver, James) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 36 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief, Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief, Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief filed by TD Bank, N.A.. (Schnapp, Mark) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Hearing re 41 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Revise the Order of Judge Ray Setting the Protocol for Deposition of Scott W. Rothstein by Gibraltar Private Bank & Trust Company. (DeMaria, Joseph) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 36 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief, Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief, Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief filed by Gibraltar Private Bank & Trust Company. (DeMaria, Joseph) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 36 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief, Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief, Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief filed by Platinum Partners Value Arbitrage Fund LP. (Trench, Susan) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by TD Bank, N.A. of Objections which Were Not Included in the Local Rule 7.1(a)(3) Certification in Government's Motion to Revise the Order of Judge Ray Setting the Protocol for Deposition of Scott W. Rothstein (Schnapp, Mark) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief, Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief by United States of America. Responses due by 8/29/2011 (LaVecchio, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PAPERLESS ORDER granting 34 Motion for Extension of Time to file Objections. Objections due 8/12/11. For future motions, the Government is directed to comply with Local Rule 7.1.A.3, which requires counsel to confer with the opposing side to check whether the requested relief is opposed and include a certification of such conference. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 8/5/2011. (prd) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to file Objections to Order setting the protocol for the deposition of Scott W. Rothstein by United States of America. Responses due by 8/22/2011 (LaVecchio, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Motion hearing held on 7.1.11 before Judge James I. Cohn, 1-29 pages, Court Reporter: Pauline Stipes, 954/769/5496 / Pauline_Stipes@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/1/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/11/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/7/2011. (ps) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 12 Motion to Stay Deposition. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 7/1/2011. (prd) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James I. Cohn: Motion Hearing held on 7/1/2011 re 12 MOTION to Stay re 1 Bankruptcy Order. Court Reporter: Pauline Stipes, 561-803-3458 / Pauline_Stipes@flsd.uscourts.gov (prd) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James David Silver on behalf of Razorback Funding, LLC (Silver, James) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE/REPLY to 19 Response in Opposition to Motion,, by United States of America. (LaVecchio, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Susan Eileen Trench on behalf of Platinum Partners Value Arbitrage Fund LP (Trench, Susan) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 25 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 6/27/11. (mg) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 12 MOTION to Stay re 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief, Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief MOTION to Stay re 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief, Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief filed by Platinum Partners Value Arbitrage Fund LP. Replies due by 7/5/2011. (Trench, Susan) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 12 MOTION to Stay re 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief, Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief MOTION to Stay re 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief, Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief filed by Razorback Funding, LLC. Replies due by 7/5/2011. (Silver, James) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE/REPLY to 12 MOTION to Stay re 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief, Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief MOTION to Stay re 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief, Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief by TD Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Schnapp, Mark) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Paul Schnapp on behalf of TD Bank, N.A. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Schnapp, Mark) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by United States of America re 14 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, Set/Reset Deadlines, Notice of Filing Ex Parte Submission (LaVecchio, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 12 MOTION to Stay re 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief, Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief MOTION to Stay re 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief, Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief filed by Gibraltar Private Bank & Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(DeMaria, Joseph) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE/REPLY to 12 MOTION to Stay re 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief, Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief MOTION to Stay re 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief, Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief by Herbert Stettin. (Lichtman, Charles) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Clerks Notice to Filer re 16 Notice (Other). Attorney Did Not Associate Themselves; ERROR - Filing attorney neglected to associate themselves to the case. The Clerk has added the attorney to the case. It is not necessary to refile this document future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures and Local Rules by filing a Notice of Attorney Appearance and linking themselves to the case. (jcy) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Herbert Stettin re 14 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, Set/Reset Deadlines, Notice of Filing Bankruptcy Court Hearing Transcripts of April 25, 2011 and May 18, 2011 (Marcushamer, Isaac) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc S. Nurik on behalf of Scott W. Rothstein (Nurik, Marc) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Setting Hearing on 12 Objections to 1 Order and 12 Motion to Stay re 1 Bankruptcy Order: Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2011 at 9:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge James I. Cohn. Responses to Objections and Motion to Stay due by 6/24/2011. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 6/17/2011. (prd) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Paperless Order directing the Clerk of Court to re-designate this matter as a contested civil case for statistical purposes. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 6/17/2011. (prd) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Stay re 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief, Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Stay and Other Intermediate Requests for Relief by United States of America. Responses due by 7/5/2011 (LaVecchio, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence D. LaVecchio on behalf of United States of America (LaVecchio, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryan Thomas West on behalf of Gibraltar Private Bank & Trust Company (West, Bryan) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C. Thomas Tew, Jr on behalf of Gibraltar Private Bank & Trust Company (Tew, C.) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph A. DeMaria on behalf of Gibraltar Private Bank & Trust Company (DeMaria, Joseph) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claudio Riedi on behalf of Gibraltar Private Bank & Trust Company (Riedi, Claudio) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 6/15/2011. (mb) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge James I. Cohn for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 06/15/2011. Judge K. Michael Moore no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 06/15/2011. (mb) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Bankruptcy Transmittal of Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) Referring Matter to U.S. District Court for Issuance of A Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to District Court (jc) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Assignment to Judge K. Michael Moore (jc) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Bankruptcy Transmittal of re 1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint)Referring Matter to U.S. District Court for Issuance of A Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum filed by Herbert Stettin (Attachments: # 1 Docket Sheet)(arz) Modified text on 6/14/2011 (jc). (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BANKRUPTCY MOTION (COMPLAINT) Referring Matter to U.S. District Court for Issuance of A Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum Bankruptcy Court case number 09-34791-BKC-RBR., filed by TD Bank, N.A., Razorback Funding LLC, Gibraltar Private Bank & Trust Company, Herbert Stettin, Official Committee of Creditors.(arz) Modified text on 6/14/2011 (jc). (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 265 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?