Rhodes v. MacDonald et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Middle District Court, Case No. 4:09-cv-00106
District Judge Clay D. Land, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 4, 2016 at 10:49 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Connie Rhodes, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Connie Rhodes

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/28/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
v.
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Defendant
Officially listed as "Barack Hussein Obama"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Army

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rebecca Elaine Ausprung +1 703 696 1614 +1 703 696 8126 rebecca.ausprung@us.army.mil

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheetul Sheth Wall +1 202 598 2668 +1 706 649 7667 Sheetul.S.Wall2@usdoj.gov
No Logo George Steuber, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Army

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rebecca Elaine Ausprung +1 703 696 1614 +1 703 696 8126 rebecca.ausprung@us.army.mil

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sheetul Sheth Wall +1 202 598 2668 +1 706 649 7667 Sheetul.S.Wall2@usdoj.gov
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "Robert M. Gates"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Army

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rebecca Elaine Ausprung +1 703 696 1614 +1 703 696 8126 rebecca.ausprung@us.army.mil

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sheetul Sheth Wall +1 202 598 2668 +1 706 649 7667 Sheetul.S.Wall2@usdoj.gov
No Logo Thomas D MacDonald, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Army

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rebecca Elaine Ausprung +1 703 696 1614 +1 703 696 8126 rebecca.ausprung@us.army.mil

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sheetul Sheth Wall +1 202 598 2668 +1 706 649 7667 Sheetul.S.Wall2@usdoj.gov
No Logo ORLY TAITZ, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo VICTOR M. SERBY, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by 255 Hewlett Neck Road

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Victor M. Serby +1 516 374 2455 +1 267 841 0009 serbyv@bellatlantic.net
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 5
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 43 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re 37 Judgment entered In favor of United States of America Against Orly Taitz by United States of America (Aderhold, Hugh) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
    LREF
    Blank 42 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Abstract of Judgment
    ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (tlf). (Entered: 08/09/2010)
      LREF
      Blank 41 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: 5/26/2010 USCA Appellate Judgment
      USCA Appellate JUDGMENT affirming district court's sanctions judgment as to 29 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: # 1 Opinion)(tls) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: 5/26/2010 Appeal Record Returned
        Appeal Record Returned. (tls) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 39 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: 1/13/2010 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
          Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 29 Notice of Appeal (nop) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
            LREF
            Blank 38 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: 1/13/2010 Certificate of Readiness
            Certificate of Readiness of Record on Appeal forwarded to USCA re 29 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: # 1 Appeal Docket Sheet)(nop) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
              LREF
              Blank 37 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: 11/13/2009 Judgment*
              JUDGMENT against Orly Taitz. (tls) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
                LREF
                Blank 36 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: 11/13/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER for final judgment against Orly Taitz. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 11/13/09. (tls) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
                  LREF
                  Blank 35 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: 11/10/2009 Brief
                  BRIEF by Defendant in Response to the Court's Order dated October 13, 2009 filed by Thomas D MacDonald, George Steuber, Robert M. Gates, Barack Hussein Obama re 28 Order on Motion for Recusal, Order on Motion for Extension of Time (Misc) (Wall, Sheetul) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
                    LREF
                    Blank 34 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: 10/29/2009 USCA Case Number
                    USCA Case Number re 29 Notice of Appeal (tlf). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2010: # 1 USCA Letter to Orly Taitz - 10/27/09) (tls). (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                      LREF
                      Blank 33 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: 10/23/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                      MOTION for Leave to File an amicus curiae brief filed by Victor M Serby (Attachments: # 1 Amicus Brief, # 2 Envelope)(tlf). (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                        LREF
                        Blank 32 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: 10/23/2009 Letter of Transmittal - Other
                        Letter to Dr. Orly Taitz regarding transcript order form as to 29 Notice of Appeal. (tls) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                          LREF
                          Blank 31 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: 10/23/2009 Letter of Transmittal - Notice of Appeal
                          Letter of Transmittal re 29 Notice of Appeal,. Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Docket Sheet, Order appealed from. NOTICE: A Civil Appeal Statement must be filed with the Court of Appeals. A copy of this form may be obtained from the District Clerk's Office or the district court internet site (www.gamd.uscourts.gov). (tls) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: 10/21/2009 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Clay D. Land, Columbus, GA: Motion Hearing held on 9/11/2009 re 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Connie Rhodes. [Hearing continued] (tls) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: 10/20/2009 Notice of Appeal
                              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 21 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, 13 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion to Dismiss, 14 Judgment, 17 Order, 28 Order on Motion for Recusal, Order on Motion for Extension of Time (Misc) by Connie Rhodes. Filing fee $ 455, Receipt No.: 113G0000000000831915. (Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 28 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: 10/13/2009 Order on Motion for RecusalCourt Filing
                                ORDER denying 24 Motion for Recusal; denying 25 Motion for Extension of Time. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 10/13/2009. (lra) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: 10/7/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/11/2009, before Judge Clay D. Land. Court Reporter/Transcriber Betsy Peterson. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: In order to remove personal identifier data from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Transcript Redaction Request with the Clerk's Office within 21 calendar days of this date. The Policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.gamd.uscourts.gov. Read this policy carefully. If no Transcript Redaction Request is filed within 21 calendar days of this date, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available via PACER 90 days from today's date. (Peterson, Betsy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/8/2009: # 1 Corrected signature page) (esl). (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 26 Filed: 10/4/2009, Entered: 10/4/2009 Exhibit
                                    EXHIBIT(S) by Connie Rhodes re 24 MOTION for Recusal (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Robert Douglas, # 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Robert Douglas 2)(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 10/04/2009)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 25 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: 10/2/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File response. by Connie Rhodes filed by Orly Taitz.(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 24 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: 10/2/2009 Motion for Recusal
                                        MOTION for Recusal by Connie Rhodes filed by Orly Taitz.(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 23 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: 10/2/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/14/2009, before Judge Clay D. Land. Court Reporter/Transcriber Betsy Peterson. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: In order to remove personal identifier data from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Transcript Redaction Request with the Clerk's Office within 21 calendar days of this date. The Policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.gamd.uscourts.gov. Read this policy carefully. If no Transcript Redaction Request is filed within 21 calendar days of this date, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available via PACER 90 days from today's date. (Peterson, Betsy) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 22 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: 9/29/2009 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Connie Rhodes filed by Orly Taitz.(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 21 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: 9/28/2009 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting 20 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney with conditions (see order for explanation). Attorney Orly Taitz terminated. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 09/28/2009 (esl) (Entered: 09/28/2009)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 20 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: 9/28/2009 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Connie Rhodes filed by Orly Taitz.(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 09/28/2009)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 9/26/2009, Entered: 9/26/2009 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Connie Rhodes filed by Orly Taitz.(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 09/26/2009)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: 9/18/2009 Letter
                                                    Letter from plaintiff regarding withdrawal of motion to stay (tlf). (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: 9/18/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER denying 15 Motion for Stay of Deployment filed by Connie Rhodes. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 09/18/2009. (CGC) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: 9/18/2009 Notice of Error in Filing
                                                        Notice of Error in Filing (related document(s): 15 Brief filed by Connie Rhodes) (tlf). (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: 9/17/2009 Brief
                                                          BRIEF Request for stay of deployment pending motion for reconsideration of judgment filed by Connie Rhodes re 13 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion to Dismiss, 14 Judgment (Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: 9/16/2009 Judgment*
                                                            JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants. (esl) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: 9/16/2009 Order on Motion for TROCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER denying 3 Motion for TRO; granting 8 Motion to Dismiss. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 09/16/2009. (CGC) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Clay D. Land: Motion Hearing held on 9/14/2009. Written Order to follow (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits) (tlf). (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: 9/14/2009 Exhibit
                                                                  EXHIBIT(S) A Deployment Orders (redacted) by Thomas D MacDonald, George Steuber, Robert M. Gates, Barack Hussein Obama re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages, Declaratory Judgment, and Injunctive Relief and Application for TRO (Wall, Sheetul) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                    Request for judicial notice by Connie Rhodes (tlf). (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 Jury Demand
                                                                      DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Connie Rhodes (tlf). (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages, Declaratory Judgment, and Injunctive Relief and Application for TRO by Thomas D MacDonald, George Steuber, Robert M. Gates, Barack Hussein Obama filed by Sheetul S. Wall. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Deployment Orders)(Wall, Sheetul) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: 9/10/2009 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Connie Rhodes as to Thomas D MacDonald; George Steuber; Robert M. Gates; Barack Hussein Obama; and G.F. Peterson III (U.S. Atorney) on 9/9/2009. (esl) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: 9/9/2009 Summons Issued as to USA
                                                                            Summons Issued as to Thomas D MacDonald on 9/9/2009; George Steuber on 9/9/2009; Robert M. Gates on 9/9/2009; Barack Hussein Obama on 9/9/2009, U.S. Attorney (G.F. Peterson, III) Summons Issued 9/9/2009. (esl) (Entered: 09/09/2009)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: 9/8/2009 Notice of Error in Filing
                                                                              Notice of Error in Filing (related document(s): 3 Motion for TRO, filed by Connie Rhodes, 4 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Connie Rhodes) (tlf). (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: 9/4/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                MOTION request for emergency hearing September 9-10 due to scheduled deployment September 12 by Connie Rhodes filed by Orly Taitz.(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: 9/4/2009 Motion for TRO
                                                                                  MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Connie Rhodes filed by Orly Taitz. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement, # 2 Affidavit Affidavit of a Licensed investigator re 39 social security numbers and 140 addresses for Barack Obama, # 3 Exhibit list of 140 addresses and 39 social security numbers for Barack Obama)(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: 9/4/2009 Notice of Error in Filing
                                                                                    Notice of Error in Filing (related document(s): 1 Complaint filed by Connie Rhodes) (tlf). (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: 9/4/2009 Complaint
                                                                                      COMPLAINT filed by Connie Rhodes against all defendants; Filing Fee $ 350, Receipt Number 812572 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(tlf). (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 206 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?