HC Liquidation, Inc.
Bankruptcy Case Hawaii Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 12-00314
District Judge Robert J. Faris, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 30, 2017 at 1:04 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo HC Liquidation, Inc., a Hawaii corporation, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Wagner Choi & Verbrugge

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allison A. Ito +1 808 533 1877 +1 808 566 6900 aito@hibklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by wcelaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chuck C. Choi +5331 533 533 1877 cchoi@wcelaw.com
Space Neil J. Verbrugge +5331 533 533 1877 nverbrugge@wcelaw.com
Space James A. Wagner +5331 533 533 1877
No Logo Heide & Cook, Ltd., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Wagner Choi & Verbrugge

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allison A. Ito +1 808 533 1877 +1 808 566 6900 aito@hibklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by wcelaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chuck C. Choi +5331 533 533 1877 cchoi@wcelaw.com
Space Neil J. Verbrugge +5331 533 533 1877 nverbrugge@wcelaw.com
Space James A. Wagner +5331 533 533 1877
No Logo Unsecured Creditors Committee, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenberg & McKay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C Farmer +1 808 222 3133 +1 866 559 2922 farmerd001@hawaii.rr.com
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
[The entire order in this matter is set forth in this docket entry. No document is attached.]Order Granting Application to Employ Professional under 11 U.S.C. sec. 327(a) (related document: 51). It appearing that The Hallstrom Group, Inc. is disinterested and does not hold or represent an interest adverse to the estate, The Hallstrom Group, Inc. is authorized to act as the real estate valuation consultant for the Debtor in this case effective 02/14/2012. Compensation and reimbursement for expenses are subject to further court approval under 11 U.S.C. sec. 330 and applicable local rules and guidelines. Debtor is authorized to provide The Hallstrom Group, Inc. with a retainer of $6,250.SO ORDERED. /s/ Robert J. Faris, United States Bankruptcy Judge. (Entered: 03/12/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    [The entire order in this matter is set forth in this docket entry. No document is attached.]Order Granting Application to Employ Professional under 11 U.S.C. sec. 1103 (related document: 69). David C. Farmer, Esq. is authorized to act as attorney for the Committee of Unsecured Creditors in this case effective 03/02/2012. Compensation and reimbursement for expenses are subject to further court approval under 11 U.S.C. sec. 330 and applicable local rules and guidelines.SO ORDERED. /s/ Robert J. Faris, United States Bankruptcy Judge. (Entered: 03/09/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
      Minutes of Further Hearing held on: 3/7/2012.(RF). Disposition: 1)Application/Employ General Counsel Wagner Choi Verbrugge, 2)M/Authorize Use of Cash Collateral, 3)M/Approve Insurance Premium Financing are all granted and approved on a final bases. 4)M/Establishing Interim Fee Application Procedures is granted. 5)M/Obtain Post-Petition Financing is granted and approved on a final bases as clarified. 6)M/Honor Pre-Petition Customer Deposits and Refunds is granted. Mr. Wagner will submit all orders. 7)M/Authorizing Debtor to Honor Existing Merchant Service Agreement and Continued Use of Existing Cash Management System and Bank Accounts is continued for further hearing to 4/16/12 to allow the debtor time to work out an arrangment with First Hawaiian Bank. Appearances: James Wagner/Allison Ito (debtor); Earle Matsuda-president of debtor; Ann Takamori-CFO; David Farmer (creditors committee); James Duca (Acutron); Stephen Jones (Chugauch Commercial Holdings); Jonathan Lai (FHB); Terri Didion (USTR). Further Hearing scheduled for 4/16/2012 at 09:30 AM at USBC Courtroom, 1132 Bishop Street, Suite 250, Honolulu, HI 96813 on the existing bank accounts held by the debtor.(related document(s):7 First Day Motion, 8 First Day Motion, 11 First Day Motion, 12 First Day Motion, 13 First Day Motion, 15 Application to Employ) (OV) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
        Notice of Appearance of Jonathan W.Y. Lai as Counsel representing First Hawaiian Bank, Creditor. Counsel consents to service of notices, pleadings, and papers by court transmission facilities. This entry for record purposes only. (Lai, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
          Notice of Appearance of Nicholas C. Dreher as Counsel representing Signe Kirsten Emmerich, Trustee. Counsel consents to service of notices, pleadings, and papers by court transmission facilities. This entry for record purposes only. (Dreher, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
            Notice of Appearance of Nicholas C. Dreher as Counsel representing Ralph Kimball Heide. Counsel consents to service of notices, pleadings, and papers by court transmission facilities. This entry for record purposes only. (Dreher, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
              Notice of Appearance of Nicholas C. Dreher as Counsel representing Harold John Heide. Counsel consents to service of notices, pleadings, and papers by court transmission facilities. This entry for record purposes only. (Dreher, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
                Notice of Appearance of Nicholas C. Dreher as Counsel representing Signe Kirsten Emmerich, Creditor. Counsel consents to service of notices, pleadings, and papers by court transmission facilities. This entry for record purposes only. (Dreher, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                  Notice of Appearance of Susan Tius as Counsel representing Michael Robinson, as Trustee of Nancy Robinson; Michael Robinson, as Trustee; David Robinson, Trustee; Wendy Johnson, Trustee; Rex Brandt, Trustee; and Susan Brandt, Trustee, Creditors. Counsel consents to service of notices, pleadings, and papers by court transmission facilities. This entry for record purposes only. (Tius, Susan) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                    Notice of Appearance of Stephen A. Jones as Associated Counsel representing Chugach Commercial Holdings, Creditor. Counsel consents to service of notices, pleadings, and papers by court transmission facilities. This entry for record purposes only. (Jones, Stephen) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
                      Minutes of Hearing held on: 2/14/2012. (RF). Disposition: 1)M/Prohibiting Utilities from Altering and Disconnecting Services and Establishing Procdures, 2)M/Authorize Payment of Pre-Petition Wages, Costs, Expenses and Benefits, 3)M/Authorize Payment of Certain Pre-Petition Claims and Honor Certain Contracts w/Materialmen and Subcontractors, 4)M/Estalbishing Notice Procedures, and 5)M/Authorize Debtor to Continue Insurance Premium Financing Agreements are all granted as stated. 6)Application/Employ General Counsel Wagner Choi Verbrugge, 7)M/Authorize Use of Cash Collateral, 8)M/Authorize Debtor to Obtain Post-Petition Financing on a Secured and Superpriority Basis, 9)M/Authorizing Debtor to Honor Pre-Petition Customer Deposits and Refunds, and 10)M/Authorizing Debtor to Honor Existing Merchant Service Agreement and Continued Use of Existing Cash Management System and Bank Accounts are all granted on an interim bases. A final hearing will be held on 3/7/2012. 11)M/Establishing Interim Fee Application Procedures is continued for further hearing to the same date of 3/7/2012. Mr. Wagner will submit all Orders and provide the proper notices for final hearing. Appearances: James Wagner/Allison Ito (debtor); Earle Matsuda-CEO of debtor; Ann Takamori - financial officer of debtor; Stephen Jones (creditor); Curtis Ching/Terri Didion (USTR). Further Hearing scheduled for 3/7/2012 at 02:00 PM at USBC Courtroom, 1132 Bishop Street, Suite 250, Honolulu, HI 96813.(related document(s):5 First Day Motion, 6 First Day Motion, 7 First Day Motion, 8 First Day Motion, 9 First Day Motion, 10 First Day Motion, 11 First Day Motion, 12 First Day Motion, 13 First Day Motion, 14 First Day Motion, 15 Application to Employ) (OV) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
                        Notice of Appearance of Chuck C. Choi as Counsel representing Debtor. Counsel consents to service of notices, pleadings, and papers by court transmission facilities. This entry for record purposes only. (Choi, Chuck) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: 2/14/2012
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: 2/14/2012 Notice of Hearing.
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: 2/14/2012 Order Granting Motion to Shorten TimeCourt Filing
                              [The entire order in this matter is set forth in this docket entry. No document is attached.]Order Granting Motion to Shorten Time (related document(s): 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15, 17). The court will hear the Chapter 11 First Day Motions on an expedited basis at the United States Bankruptcy Court, 1132 Bishop Street, Suite 250L, Honolulu, Hawaii on 2/14/2012 at 3:00 p.m.. Responsive memoranda due: up to hearing. Reply memoranda due: No Reply. Movant shall immediately give notice of the hearing and the briefing deadlines to all parties in interest entitled to notice and not receiving electronic notice.SO ORDERED. /s/Robert J. Faris, United States Bankruptcy Judge. (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: 2/14/2012 Notice of Appearance by Counsel
                                Notice of Appearance of Allison A. Ito as Counsel representing Debtor. Counsel consents to service of notices, pleadings, and papers by court transmission facilities. This entry for record purposes only. (Ito, Allison) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: 2/14/2012 Motion to Shorten Time
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: 2/14/2012 Declaration
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: 2/14/2012 Application to Employ
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: 2/14/2012 First Day Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: 2/14/2012 First Day Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: 2/14/2012 First Day Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: 2/14/2012 First Day Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: 2/14/2012 First Day Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: 2/14/2012 First Day Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: 2/14/2012 First Day Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: 2/14/2012 First Day Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: 2/14/2012 First Day Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: 2/14/2012 First Day Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: 2/14/2012 Corporate Ownership Statement
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: 2/14/2012 Corporate Resolution
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: 2/14/2012 Designation of Responsible Individual
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: 2/14/2012 Voluntary Petition-Chapter 11
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 890 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?