Benson et al v. The City of Chicago et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-04184
District Judge Edmond E. Chang, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 28, 2017 at 11:02 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Brett Benson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by brennerlawfirm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen A. Kolodziej +1 312 781 1970 skolodziej@brennerlawfirm.com

Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

No Logo Dr. Kathryn Tyler, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by brennerlawfirm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen A. Kolodziej +1 312 781 1970 skolodziej@brennerlawfirm.com

Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

No Logo Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by brennerlawfirm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen A. Kolodziej +1 312 781 1970 skolodziej@brennerlawfirm.com

Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

No Logo Kathryn Tyler, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by brennerlawfirm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen A. Kolodziej +1 312 781 1970 skolodziej@brennerlawfirm.com

Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

No Logo Kenneth Pacholski, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by brennerlawfirm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen A. Kolodziej +1 312 781 1970 skolodziej@brennerlawfirm.com

Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

No Logo Michael Hall, Plaintiff

Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

No Logo Mr. Michael Hall, Plaintiff

Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

No Logo Raymond Sledge, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by brennerlawfirm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen A. Kolodziej +1 312 781 1970 skolodziej@brennerlawfirm.com

Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

No Logo Rick Pere, Plaintiff

Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

v.
No Logo Richard M Daley, Defendant

Represented by City of Chicago

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Craig Medow +1 312 701 7060 +1 312 706 8657 jmedow@mayerbrown.com
No Logo THE CITY OF CHICAGO, Defendant

Represented by City of Chicago

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Craig Medow +1 312 701 7060 +1 312 706 8657 jmedow@mayerbrown.com
No Logo Donald Norton, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stone & Johnson, Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/02/2011 Christian D. Ambler +1 312 332 5656 cambler@stonejohnsonlaw.com
No Logo Tony Kole/Ghost Industries, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stone & Johnson, Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/02/2011 Christian D. Ambler +1 312 332 5656 cambler@stonejohnsonlaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (263) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 260 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
ORDER signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. As stated in the Order, Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for attorney's fees and costs [R. 256, 257] is granted, in the total amount of $940,000. Mailed notice(slb, ) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Motion by Charles J. Cooper for presentment of motion for attorney fees 257 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 7/10/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
      Joint STATEMENT by Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 257 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
        MOTION by Plaintiffs Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler for attorney fees and Expenses (Unopposed) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Brief in Support)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Motion by Charles J. Cooper for presentment of before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 7/10/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Defendants' agreed extension motion on Local Rule 54.3 procedure is granted: the joint statement is due by 06/27/2014 and Plaintiffs motion for attorneys fees is due by 08/08/2014. The Court notes that the motion due-date is after the expiration of the stay on the permanent injunction; the stay expires on 07/14/2014. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Motion by William Macy Aguiar for presentment of extension of time 253 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 6/9/2014 at 08:30 AM. (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
                MOTION by Defendant The City of Chicago for extension of time to comply with Local Rule 54.3 (Agreed) (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Defendant's agreed extension motion 250 is granted: the joint statement on fees and costs is now due by 06/09/2014, and Plaintiffs' motion for fees is due by 07/25/2014. (If the parties intended June 25, rather than July 25, they may call the courtroom deputy to jointly ask for an adjustment to this entry.) Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Motion by William Macy Aguiar for presentment of extension of time 250 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 5/6/2014 at 08:30 AM. (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                      MOTION by Defendant The City of Chicago for extension of time for Compliance with Local Rule 54.3 (Agreed) (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Defendants' agreed motion 247 to extend Local Rule 54.3 schedule is granted. As requested, Defendants information pursuant to Local 54.3(d)(5) tobe due by April 4, 2014; Defendants objections are to be made by April 25, 2014; the parties are to file their joint statement by May 6, 2014; and Plaintiffs motion for attorneys fees is due by May 27, 2014. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Motion by William Macy Aguiar for presentment of extension of time 247 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 3/20/2014 at 08:30 AM. (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                            MOTION by Defendant The City of Chicago for extension of time to comply with Local Rule 54.3(D) (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The agreed extension motion 244 on Local Rule 54.3 scheduling is granted. Defendants are to comply with Local Rule 54.3(d)(5) by 03/21/2014; objections are due by 04/04/2014; the parties' joint statement is due by 04/15/2014; and Plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees is due by 05/06/2014. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Motion by Mary Eileen Cunniff Wells for presentment of extension of time 244 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 2/25/2014 at 08:30 AM. (Wells, Mary) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                  MOTION by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago for extension of time (Wells, Mary) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: 2/18/2014 Attorney Appearance
                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago by Mary Eileen Cunniff Wells (Wells, Mary) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 242 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: 1/14/2014 Order on Motion to Stay
                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Motion hearing held on Defendants' motion to stay 240 . For the reasons stated during the hearing, the stay motion is granted up to 180 days, specifically, until and including July 14, 2014. The effectiveness of the judgment and the permanent injunction are stayed until and including July 14, 2014. On the verbal request of Plaintiffs, the Local Rule 54.3 process may begin as of today's date and the time to file the bill of costs due date is extended. Specifically, the bill may be included in the fee petition when due under Local Rule 54.3. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 241 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: 1/14/2014 Permanent Injunction
                                        PERMANENT INJUNCTION signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. As previously explained in the January 6, 2014 opinion, which is attached and incorporated into this Permanent Injunction, Defendants City of Chicago and the Mayor of the City of Chicago in his official capacity are permanently enjoined from enforcing the following sections of the Municipal Code of Chicago: Municipal Code § 8-20-100(a) and Municipal Code § 17-16-0201, to the extent that it prohibits the construction and operation of firearms sales businesses. The effective date of the injunction is stayed until and including July 14, 2014. Mailed notice(slb, ) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 240 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: 1/13/2014 Motion to Stay
                                          MOTION by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago to stay (Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                            ENTERED JUDGMENT on 1/6/2014:Mailed notice(slb, ) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 238 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                              MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. For the reasons stated in the Opinion, Plaintiffs' summary judgment motion on Counts II and VI [R. 174] is granted, and Defendants' summary judgment motion on the same counts [R. 157] is denied. By prior agreement of the parties, Counts I, III, IV, and V are dismissed as moot. The judgment is stayed until after the filing of a full motion to stay pending appeal, the filing of a response, and the Court's decision on the stay motion. The sales-and-transfer ban remains in effect until, at least, the decision on the stay motion. The City's stay motion is due by January 13, 2014. A status hearing is set for January 14, 2014, at 11:30 a.m. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice(slb, ) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:The status hearing of 12/17/2013 is vacated. The parties will receive the opinion when posted on the electronic docket, which should be over the next couple of weeks.Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The status hearing of 12/4/2013 is reset to 12/17/2013 at 11 a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang:The Court appreciates the status reports filed by the parties. The status hearing of 11/18/2013 is reset to 12/04/2013 at 8:30 a.m., although the ruling may issue before that date and render the status hearing unnecessary. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 234 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                      STATUS Report by Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago (Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 233 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                        STATUS Report by Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - SO2013-6015)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status hearing of 10/29/2013 is reset to 11/18/2013 at 9:00 a.m., in light of the pending cross-motions. If there are any other legislative updates the parties wish to provide, they must do so in writing as soon as practicable. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The cross-motions and the supplemental filings remain under advisement. Status hearing of 10/09/2013 is reset to 10/29/2013 at 8:30 a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: By agreement of the parties, the status hearing of 10/03/2013 is reset to 10/09/2013 at 10:15 a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status hearing of 09/23/2013 is reset to 10/03/2013 at 10:15 a.m. The motions are pending and an opinion will issue in due course. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The cross-motions and the recent supplemental filings are under advisement. Status hearing of 09/05/2013 is reset to 09/23/2013 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 227 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE by The City of Chicago re reply 226 in Support of Their Supplemental Memorandum Addressing Public Act 98-0063 (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 226 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    REPLY by Defendant The City of Chicago in Support of Their Supplemental Memorandum Addressing Public Act 98-0063 (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 225 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler to memorandum 224 (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 224 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        MEMORANDUM by The City of Chicago Supplemental Memorandum Addressing Public Act 98-0063 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Both parties' counsel called on a conference call to jointly request a change to the briefing structure and schedule, see R. 222, concerning the impact of the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. The Court will enter their request: Chicago shall file an opening brief on or before 08/02/2013. Plaintiffs shall respond on or before 08/09/2013. Chicago shall reply on or before 08/16/2013. Status hearing of 08/05/2013 is reset to 09/05/2013 at 11 a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: In light of the enactment of the Firearm Concealed Carry Act (effective July 9, 2013, based on section 999 of HB0183), the parties shall file supplements to their respective motions addressing the effect, or non-effect, of the Act on this case. The cross-supplements are due on or before 07/19/2013. Cross-responses to the supplements may be filed on or before 07/26/2013. If either party wishes to accelerate or extend the briefing schedule, the parties should confer with one another. If the schedule is agreed, they may call the courtroom deputy to propose the agreed schedule; if the schedule is disputed, the party proposing a change may file an appropriate motion. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The cross motions are still pending. Status hearing of 07/01/2013 is reset to 08/05/2013 at 1:00 p.m. If events, such as the pending state legislation, occur that are relevant to the merits or to the mootness of certain claims (certain claims do not appear to be impacted no matter what), the parties should feel free to file supplements to their motions/responses (the Court might affirmatively call for briefs as well). Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The cross motions for summary judgment remain pending. Status hearing of 06/11/13 is reset to 07/01/13 at 9:45 a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: By agreement of the parties, the status hearing of June 12, 2013 is reset to June 11, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The cross-motions for summary judgment remain pending. Status hearing of 05/23/13 is reset to 06/12/13 at 10 a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Defendant Chicago's motion to reassign case 211 is denied. This case, Firearms Retailers v. Chicago, has advanced too far for the newly-filed case, Hall v. Chicago, 13 C 0441, to catch up so as to avoid delaying resolution of Firearms Retailers. Yes, there is overlap between the legal issues in the two cases, but the cases are too far apart procedurally in order for there to be a substantial savings in judicial effort, Local Rule 40.4(b)(2). The cross-motions for summary judgment in Firearms Retailers are still pending, so the status hearing of 04/04/13 is reset to 5/23/2013 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (Chang, Edmond) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      RESPONSE by Michael Hall, Kathryn Tylerin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago to reassign case 211 (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        SUPPLEMENT to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A (Cook Dep.) 1 of 3, # 2 Exhibit Ex. A (Cook Dep.) 2 of 3, # 3 Exhibit Ex. A (Cook Dep.) 3 of 3, # 4 Exhibit Ex. B (Gorman Dep.), # 5 Exhibit Ex. C (Johnson Dep.) 1 of 2, # 6 Exhibit Ex. C (Johnson Dep.) 2 of 2, # 7 Exhibit Ex. D (Vince Dep.) 1 of 2, # 8 Exhibit Ex. D (Vince Dep.) 2 of 2, # 9 Exhibit Ex. E (Webster Dep.) 1 of 3, # 10 Exhibit Ex. E (Webster Dep.) 2 of 3, # 11 Errata Ex. E (Webster Dep.) 3 of 3, # 12 Exhibit Ex. F (Williams Dep.))(Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 214 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          SUPPLEMENT to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 214
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On Defendant's motion to reassign case 211 , Plaintiffs in 13 C 0441 shall file a response on or before 02/14/13. This entry shall be e-mailed to Plaintiffs' counsel in that case, namely, Nicole J. Moss, email: moss@cooperkirk.com and Stephen A. Kolodziej, email: skolodziej@fordbritton.com. The motion hearing is vacated; the Court will rule without the need for an appearance. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by Andrew W Worseck for presentment of motion to reassign case 211 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 2/14/2013 at 08:30 AM. (Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago to reassign case (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Hall Complaint)(Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang:The cross-motions for summary judgment are under advisement, along with the recently filed supplemental briefs. Status hearing of 02/07/13 is reset to 04/04/13 at 9:00 a.m. To aid the Court in its evaluation of the motions, each side shall electronically file a copy of the entire deposition transcript of the following deponents (whichever side relies on the particular deponent (mostly the City) shall be responsible for filing the transcript): Philip Cook; Gary Kleck; Joseph Gorman; Eugene Williams; Kevin Johnson; Joseph Vince; and Daniel Webster. The parties shall file the transcripts as exhibits to supplements in support of their summary judgment motion, and the transcripts are due on or before 02/14/13. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler to memorandum 207 (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            RESPONSE by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago to memorandum, 206 (Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 207 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago (Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 206 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM text entry, 205 by Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler Supplemental Memorandum Addressing Moore v. Madigan, USCA Nos. 12-1269, 12-1788 (7th Cir. Dec. 11, 2012) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Moore v. Madigan Slip Op.)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 205 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On or before 01/04/13, the parties may each file a supplemental memorandum addressing Moore v. Madigan, USCA Nos. 12-1269, 12-1788 (7th Cir. Dec. 11, 2012). The parties may file cross-responses on or before 01/15/13. (Assume, just for purposes of analysis, that rehearing en banc will not be granted.) Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler to order on motion for miscellaneous relief, set/reset hearings,, 203 (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 12/10/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Defendant's motion to cite 201 additional authority is granted. Plaintiffs may, if they choose, file a concise response to the two additional cases. No reply is needed. Status hearing of 12/05/12 is reset to 02/07/13 at 9:00 a.m., as the summary judgment motions are still under consideration. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Andrew W Worseck for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 201 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 12/5/2012 at 09:45 AM. (Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 201 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION by Defendant The City of ChicagoTo Cite Additional Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 200 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: 10/25/2012 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: At the request of the parties, the status hearing of 12/03/12 is reset to 12/05/12 at 9:45 a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 199 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: 9/25/2012 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The motions for summary judgment are fully briefed. Status hearing of 09/26/12 is reset to 12/03/12 at 8:30 a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 09/25/2012)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 198 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Exhibit
                                                                                                                            EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler Corrected Exhibit 63 in Support of Plaintiffs Rule 56.1 Statement (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 197 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                              REPLY by Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler to response to motion, 186 and in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 196 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: 7/30/2012 Response
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago to statement 176 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: 7/16/2012 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Plaintiffs' unopposed motion 191 to file reply is granted to 08/03/12, limited to 7,000 words. Status hearing of 07/17/12 is reset to 09/26/12 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: 7/16/2012 Order on Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Defendant's motion to strike 188 is denied. The Court understands Defendant's concern that it might be difficult to understand the relevance of fact statements contained only in the 56.1 Statement and not further explained in a brief. But Local Rule 56.1 does not require that facts in the 56.1 Statement make an appearance in the brief. Sojka v. Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., -- F.3d --, slip op. at 7-8, USCA No. 11-2747 (7th Cir. July 10, 2012). To be sure, a party that does not explain such facts in the brief runs the risk of the Court not understanding where they fit in, but there is no basis to strike the facts. Defendant shall respond to the facts on or before 07/30/12. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 193 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: 7/16/2012 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tylerin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant The City of Chicago to strike Plaintiffs' Local Rule 56.1(a)(3) Statement of Material Facts 188 (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: 7/12/2012 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Charles J. Cooper for presentment of motion for leave to file 191 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 7/17/2012 at 10:45 AM. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 191 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: 7/12/2012 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Plaintiffs Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler for leave to file A Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: 7/5/2012 Terminate Hearings
                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: By agreement of the parties, the status and motion hearing of 07/10/12 is reset to 07/17/12 at 10:45 a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Rebecca Alfert Hirsch for presentment of motion to strike 188 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 7/10/2012 at 08:30 AM. (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Defendant The City of Chicago to strike Plaintiffs' Local Rule 56.1(a)(3) Statement of Material Facts (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                REPLY TO RULE 56 (a) Statement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index, # 2 Ex. 91, # 3 Ex. 92-96, # 4 Ex. 91-102 part 1, # 5 Ex. 102 part 2, # 6 Ex. 103-110)(Worseck, Andrew) Docket text modified by the Clerk's Office on 7/2/2012 (psm, ). (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 186 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago to MOTION by Plaintiffs Michael Hall, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers for summary judgment 174 , and Reply in support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 185 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's counsel David Thompson appeared by telephone. For the reasons stated in open court, Defendant's motion to stay briefing or, alternatively, to extend reply deadline 182 is denied in part and granted in part. The stay is denied because there is not a complete overlap in issues between this suit and the appeals, and also there is a likely substantial time period, on the order of several months, before a decision will issue in the appeals. And any supplemental briefing that would become necessary due to the issuance of an appellate opinion would likely not be fact-intensive and not be overly burdensome. But the City's reply deadline is extended to June 29, 2012. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler to MOTION by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago to stay MOTION by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago for extension of time to file response/reply 182 (Thompson, David) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion by Andrew W Worseck for presentment of motion to stay,, motion for extension of time to file response/reply, 182 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 5/24/2012 at 08:30 AM. (Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 182 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago to stay , MOTION by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago for extension of time to file response/reply (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - C, # 2 Exhibit D - H)(Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBIT 59 In Support of Plaintiffs' LR 56.1 Statement; Notice. (psm, ) # 1 Notice of Filing) (psm, ). (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            APPENDIX statement 176 Index of Exhibits to Plaintiffs' Rule 56.1(a)(3) Statement of Material Facts and to Plaintiffs' Rule 56.1(b)(3) Response to Defendants' Statement of Material Facts (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 61, # 2 Exhibits 62 - 66, # 3 Exhibit 67 (part 1 of 2), # 4 Exhibit 67 (part 2 of 2), Exhibit 68, # 5 Exhibits 69 - 73, # 6 Exhibits 74 - 75, # 7 Exhibits 76 - 81)(Thompson, David) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              APPENDIX statement 176 Index of Exhibits to Plaintiffs' Rule 56.1(a)(3) Statement of Material Facts and to Plaintiffs' Rule 56.1(b)(3) Response to Defendants' Statement of Material Facts (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 - 9, # 2 Exhibits 10 - 25, # 3 Exhibit 26, # 4 Exhibits 27 - 34, # 5 Exhibit 35, # 6 Exhibits 36 - 54, # 7 Exhibits 55 - 60)(Thompson, David) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler of Filing (Thompson, David) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler to Defendants' Local Rule 56.1(a)(3) Statement of Material Facts (Thompson, David) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs' Local Rule 56.1(a)(3) Statement of Material Facts STATEMENT by Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler (Thompson, David) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 175 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler (Thompson, David) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 174 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Plaintiffs Michael Hall, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers for summary judgment (Thompson, David) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for extension 171 to respond to Defendant's summary-judgment motion is granted to 04/27/12. Defendant's reply is due 05/28/12. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Charles J. Cooper for presentment of extension of time 171 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 4/11/2012 at 08:30 AM. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Plaintiffs Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler for extension of time for the Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                APPENDIX Rule 56 statement 164 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 83, 84, 85, # 2 Exhibits 86, 87, # 3 Exhibits 88, 89, 90)(Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  APPENDIX Rule 56 statement 164 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 51, 52, 53, 54, 55, # 2 Exhibits 56, 57, 58 part 1, # 3 Exhibits 58 part 2, 59 part 1, # 4 Exhibits 59 part 2, 60, 61, # 5 Exhibits 62, 63, # 6 Exhibits 64, 65, # 7 Exhibits 66, 67, 68, 69, # 8 Exhibits 70, 71, 72, 73, 74, # 9 Exhibits 75, 76, 77, 78, 79, # 10 Exhibits 80, 81, 82)(Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    APPENDIX Rule 56 statement 164 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 41 part 1, # 2 Exhibit 41 part 2, # 3 Exhibits 41 part 3, 42, # 4 Exhibits 43, 44 part 1, # 5 Exhibits 44 part 2, 45 part 1, # 6 Exhibit 45 part 2, # 7 Exhibits 45 part 3, 46, 47, 48, 49 part 1, # 8 Exhibits 49 part 2, 50 part 1, # 9 Exhibit 50 part 2, # 10 Exhibit 50 part 3)(Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      APPENDIX Rule 56 statement 164 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 39, 40)(Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        APPENDIX Rule 56 statement 164 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 26, 27, 28, 29, 30, # 2 Exhibit 31 part 1, # 3 Exhibit 31 part 2, # 4 Exhibit 31 part 3, # 5 Exhibit 31 part 4, # 6 Exhibits 32, 33, 34, 35, 36, 37 part 1, # 7 Exhibits 37 part 2, 38 part 1, # 8 Exhibit 38 part 2, # 9 Exhibit 38 part 3)(Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          APPENDIX Rule 56 statement 164 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1, 2, # 2 Exhibits 3, 4, 5, 6, # 3 Exhibits 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13 part 1, # 4 Exhibits 13 part 2, 14, 15, # 5 Exhibits 16, 17, 18, 19, # 6 Exhibits 20, 21 part 1, # 7 Exhibits 21 part 2, 22, 23, 24, 25)(Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            DEFENDANTS' LOCAL RULE 56.1(a)(3) Statement of Material Facts. (ao,) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Defendants' motion to file 159 oversized 56.1 statement is granted. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the box of original exhibits that were filed on 03/06/12. The parties will be filing the exhibits electronically. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 161 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The Clerk's Office informed the Court that Defendant filed only a paper version of its summary judgment filings, including the exhibits, and did not file electronically. Although the Court understands the potential time and expense of electronically scanning the box-full of exhibits, Defendant (like every other litigant) must electronically file all of its filings (even sealed or partially-sealed documents are filed electronically). And feeding the pages into a scanner can be accomplished without extraordinary effort. The electronic filing shall be completed on or before 03/14/12. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by Andrew W Worseck for presentment of motion for leave to file 159 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 3/12/2012 at 08:30 AM. (Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Defendant The City of Chicago for leave to file (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Statement of Facts)(Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 158 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by The City of Chicago in support of motion for summary judgment 157 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Vol. 1, # 2 Appendix Vol. 2, # 3 Appendix Vol. 3, # 4 Appendix Vol. 4)(Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Defendant The City of Chicago for summary judgment (Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 2/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11-3-11 before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Court Reporter Contact Information: KRISTA BURGESON, CSR, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 3/12/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/20/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2012. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 02/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 2/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 10-12-11 before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Court Reporter Contact Information: KRISTA BURGESON, CSR, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 3/12/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/20/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2012. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 02/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 154 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Defendant's unopposed motion to adjust briefing schedule 152 is granted, based on the unforeseen additional work explained in the motion. Defendant's summary judgment motion is due on 03/02/12. Plaintiffs' response is due on 04/13/12. Defendant's reply is due on 05/14/12. Status hearing of 06/14/12 is reset to 07/10/12 at 9:00 a.m. The word limits set forth in R. 150 still apply. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by William Macy Aguiar for presentment of extension of time 152 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 2/15/2012 at 08:30 AM. (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago for extension of time to file motion for summary judgment (unopposed) (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 151 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint Statement on Count VI STATEMENT by Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 150 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status hearing held. Plaintiff's counsel Charles J. Cooper appeared by telephone. Defendants' oral request to extend the filing date for the motion for summary judgment is granted. Defendants' motion for summary judgment due 2/22/12. Response due 3/23/12. Reply due 4/24/12. Each brief not to exceed 14,000 words. Status hearing set for 6/14/12 at 8:30 a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 149 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Defendants motion 83 to dismiss count 5 is denied for the reasons stated in the Statement. [For further details see attached minute order.]Mailed notice (Attachments: # 1 Minute Order) (slb, ) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Stephen A. Kolodziej of Change of Address (Kolodziej, Stephen) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 147 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint Statement on Dismissal of Firing Range Ban STATEMENT by Brett Benson, Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Rick Pere, Raymond Sledge, Kathryn Tyler (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 146 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Status hearing held. Discussion held on how the motion for summary judgment will be briefed. The Court will allow the City to file it's motion for summary first. Defendants' motion for summary judgment due 02/01/12. Response due 03/02/12. Reply due 04/03/12. Counsel request for leave to file the briefs in excess of 15 pages is granted. Each brief not to exceed 14,000 words. Status hearing set for 01/19/12 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 145 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The status hearing of 10/17/2011 is reset for 11/03/2011 at 9:15 a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 144 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago to response in opposition to motion, 143 (Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 143 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tylerin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago for extension of time to depose Plaintiffs' rebuttal expert 141 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 142 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by Andrew W Worseck for presentment of extension of time 141 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 10/12/2011 at 08:30 AM. (Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 141 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago for Leave to Depose Plaintiff's Rebuttal expert after the close of expert discovery, and for leave to conduct the Deposition in Excess of seven hours (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Worseck, Andrew) (Docket text Modified by clerk's office on 10/7/2011 (ca, ). (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 140 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Joint motion to modify 138 the expert discovery schedule is granted: Plaintiffs shall disclose their rebuttal expert on September 30, 2011, and expert discovery will close on October 10, 2011. Status hearing of 10/06/11 is reset to 10/17/11 at 10 a.m. (rather than the 10/13/11 date sought in the motion). Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 139 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Charles J. Cooper for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery, 138 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 9/19/2011 at 08:30 AM. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 138 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Plaintiffs Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler for extension of time to complete discovery Agreed Joint Motion to Extend and Amend the Expert Discovery Schedule and Set a New Status Date (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 137 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 08-04-2011 before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Court Reporter Contact Information: KRISTA BURGESON, krista_burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/29/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/11/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/7/2011. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 136 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Motion hearing held. As discussed in open court, Defendants' motion for extension 132 of expert disclosure deadline is granted in part and denied in part. With regard to Mr. Phil Cook, in light of the unforeseen personal matter that arose, the disclosure deadline is extended to 08/26/11. Plaintiffs' disclosure on the same subject matter (public carriage and sales) is extended to that same date. Rebuttal disclosures on those subject matters is extended to 09/26/11, and discovery on those subjects is extended to [11 days after 09/30/11]. The motion is denied as to the other experts because (a) the already-extended expert disclosure deadline was the one sought by Defendants; and (b) no reasonably unforeseen circumstances arose after the time of the previously-granted extension. Status hearing of 10/06/11 at 9:00a.m. remains as scheduled. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Leave of court is given to Christian D. Ambler to withdraw his appearance on behalf of Tony Kole/Ghost Industries. Mailed notice. (psm, ) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 134 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler to extension of time 132 Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Extend the Expert Disclosure Deadline (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 133 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by Ranjit James Hakim for presentment of extension of time 132 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 8/4/2011 at 09:00 AM. (Hakim, Ranjit) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 132 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago for extension of time - expert disclosure deadline (Hakim, Ranjit) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Movants Donald Norton, Tony Kole/Ghost Industries to withdraw appearance (Ambler, Christian) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Plaintiffs' motion to reconsider 122 the Court's prior order 121 on Defendants' motion to compel 119 is denied as moot. As stated in open court, the parties have conferred and Plaintiffs agreed to provide answers to Mayor Daley's First Set of Interrogatories [119-1] on June 6, 2011. Depending on the scope and substance of Plaintiffs' answers, Defendants may seek further relief from the Court. Plaintiffs also preserve their objection to the interrogatories based on relevance. With regard to Defendants' motion to extend expert discovery deadlines 126 this motion is granted for the following reasons. Defendants indicated in open court that their potential experts are academics and thus required time to clear conflicts of interest with their institutions and with funding sources. Also, the Seventh Circuit still has under advisement the appeal in Ezell v. City of Chicago, which may provide further guidance on the issues in this case. The expert discovery deadlines are extended for 60 days: expert disclosures are due on August 15, 2011; rebuttal expert disclosures are due on September 15, 2011; and expert discovery will close on September 30, 2011. There will be no further extensions for Defendants. However, because Plaintiffs have not occasioned any delays in discovery thus far, the Court will consider Plaintiffs' requests for additional time in the event they need relief from the above deadlines. Defendants' motion to dismiss Count V 83 remains under advisement. Status hearing set for October 6, 2011 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 129 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tylerin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago for extension of time to complete discovery 126 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - March 17, 2011 Transcript of Hearing)(Cooper, Charles) Docket text modified by the Clerk's Office. (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Defendant's motion to extend discovery 126 is entered and continued until 06/06/11 at 9 a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Ranjit James Hakim for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery 126 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 6/2/2011 at 09:00 AM. (Hakim, Ranjit) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 126 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago for extension of time to complete discovery (Motion to Extend Expert Discovery Deadlines) (Hakim, Ranjit) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: With regard to Plaintiffs' motion to reconsider 122 , the Court's prior order on the Defendant's motion to compel should have been more precise in explaining that the Court was ruling only on the untimeliness objection. In any event, in light of Defendant's response filed today, the parties are ordered to confer on Plaintiffs' objections. The motion to reconsider is entered and continued to June 6, 2011 at 9 a.m., which is the previously-scheduled status hearing date. If the parties arrive at an agreement as to the scope, if any, of responses that Plaintiffs are willing to provide, then fact discovery will be extended for the purpose of receiving those responses. If the parties are unable to agree, then the Court will address the motion at the June 6 hearing. If the parties narrow the dispute, then Defendant (as the issuer of the discovery requests) must file, before June 6, a supplemental response describing the narrowed scope of the dispute.Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 124 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago to MOTION by Plaintiffs Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler for reconsideration regarding order on motion to compel,,,, terminate hearings,,, 121 122 (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by Charles J. Cooper for presentment of motion for reconsideration, motion for relief, 122 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 5/26/2011 at 08:30 AM. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 122 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Plaintiffs Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler for reconsideration regarding order on motion to compel,,,, terminate hearings,,, 121 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Defendant's motion to compel 119 is granted. Rather than shorten the time to respond to the discovery close-date of June 1, 2011, as the Court could under Rule 33(b)(2), instead fact discovery will be extended for the limited purpose of requiring Plaintiffs' response to the interrogatories by June 6, 2011. It is difficult to conceive of any unfair prejudice to Plaintiffs from such a limited extension, whereas Defendant could be potentially seriously hampered in litigating Count V (particularly where the Court still has the motion to dismiss Count V under advisement). The Court is ruling on this discovery motion in advance of the notice-of-motion date in order to maximize the time Plaintiffs have to draft the responses, but Plaintiffs may file a motion to reconsider if they feel it is necessary.Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion by William Macy Aguiar for presentment of motion to compel 119 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 5/26/2011 at 08:30 AM. (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 119 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago to compel Plaintiffs to Answer Daley's First Set of Interrogatories (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Aguiar, William) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 118 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 03-17-2011 before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Court Reporter Contact Information: KRISTA BURGESON, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/9/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/19/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/18/2011. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 117 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Regarding Discovery of Witnesses Disclosed Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(A)(2)(A) Signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 4/15/2011:Mailed notice(slb, ) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 116 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: With regard to the stipulation 115 and proposed order, in light of potential privilege and work product issues, the Court finds good cause for the proposed order's entry. The parties should e-mail the proposed order in Wordperfect format as required by Judge Chang's website (see the link on proposed orders). Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 115 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Discovery of Witnesses Disclosed Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(A)(2)(A) (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 114 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Count V (Supplemental) (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago of Filing Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Count V of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 112 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL Brief by Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago in Support of their Motion to Dismiss Count V of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Hirsch, Rebecca) Modified on 3/25/2011 (ca, ). (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The City's motion to dismiss 83 is taken under advisement, with a follow-up supplemental memorandum to be filed by the City on the question of whether a prosecution under the applicable provisions of the Illinois Criminal Code or the Illinois Wildlife Code would preclude, as a matter of law, a prosecution under the Ordinance. The City's supplemental memorandum is due on March 24, 2011. Plaintiffs may respond, if they choose, on March 29, 2011. Status hearing set for June 6, 2011 at 9:00a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The motion to quash the subpoena issued by the City to Mr. Tony Kole and his business, Ghost Industries, is granted as follows: the subpoena for deposition is quashed. In light of the representations of Mr. Kole's counsel and Plaintiff's counsel, namely, that Plaintiffs no longer intend to call Mr. Kole as a witness, and that Mr. Kole is no longer a member of Plaintiff Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers and has only held a federal firearms license since January 2011, a deposition would be unduly burdensome on this non-party. Mr. Kole should, however, produce documents concerning the firearms sales he has made so as to verify the representations that he has had only an extremely limited involvement in firearms sales (which is one of the assumptions underlying the ruling that his deposition testimony is of little value in this litigation).Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The City's motion to extend discovery 95 is granted in part. Both sides assert substantial interests in this case: the City asserts that the Ordinance protects public safety and Plaintiffs assert that the Ordinance violates their fundamental right under the Second Amendment. In support of a 4-month extension of fact discovery, the City argues that discovery is extensive (particularly if Plaintiffs' motion to compel were to have been granted in its entirety) and that there has been a change in Chicago Police Department leadership. But the Court has barred what would have been the burdensome discovery on internal legislative process, and the change in CPD leadership is an unpersuasive reason to delay discovery, especially where there is no reason to believe that the Superintendent (past, present, or future) would necessarily choose the deponents or otherwise direct the litigation's strategy. It is true, however, that discovery is extensive, and the City has recently hired outside counsel to assist, which shows a good-faith effort to move promptly on discovery. In addition, an extension of fact discovery need not overly prolong the close of all discovery because there will be substantial overlap between fact discovery and expert discovery. Accordingly, in balancing the need for a speedy but accurate resolution, the Court will extend fact discovery until June 1, 2011. Initial expert disclosures are due on June 15, 2011; rebuttal expert disclosures are due on July 15, 2011; and expert discovery will close on August 1, 2011. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 108 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: With regard to Plaintiffs' motion to compel [ 65] and the mirror-image motion of the City for a protective order 63 , the parties have narrowed their disputes to the issues below. For the reasons stated in open court, and summarized here, the Court grants in part and denies in part both motions. [See attached Minute Order]. Mailed notice. (slb) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago by Ranjit James Hakim (ca, ). (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago by Craig A. Woods (ca, ). (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Plaintiffs' motion to withdraw the appearance of Jesse Panuccio 86 is granted. Defendants' petition for leave to file additional appearances 97 is granted. Leave of Court is given to Craig Woods and Ranjit Hakim to file their appearances on behalf of the defendants. Mailed notice (ca, ). (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Motion by Donald Norton to join motion to quash (100) is withdrawn as the motion should have been filed in the Southern District where the subpoena was issued. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 103 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by Defendant The City of Chicago and Mayor Daley in Support of Motion to Dismiss Count V of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 102 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tylerin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago for extension of time to complete discovery 95 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index, # 2 Exhibit 1 through 13)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 101 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion by Christian D. Ambler for presentment of motion to join 100 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 3/17/2011 at 09:00 AM. (Ambler, Christian) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Movant Donald Norton to join motion to quash (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Ambler, Christian) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant Donald Norton by Christian D. Ambler (Ambler, Christian) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Ranjit James Hakim for presentment of motion for leave to file 97 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 3/17/2011 at 09:00 AM. (Hakim, Ranjit) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 97 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago for leave to file Additional Appearances (Hakim, Ranjit) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 96 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by William Macy Aguiar for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery 95 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 3/17/2011 at 09:00 AM. (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 95 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago for extension of time to complete discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4)(Aguiar, William) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by Christian D. Ambler for presentment of motion to quash 93 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 3/17/2011 at 09:00 AM. (Ambler, Christian) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 93 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Movant Tony Kole/Ghost Industries to quash Subpoenas served on Tony Kole and Ghost Industries (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Ambler, Christian) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant Tony Kole/Ghost Industries by Christian D. Ambler (Ambler, Christian) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 91 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler in Opposition to motion to dismiss 83 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - City's Responsible Gun Ownership Ordinance, # 2 Exhibit B - 720 ILCS Section 5/24-1)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to file their reply in support of the motion to dismiss Count V of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint is granted. Reply to be filed on or before 3/16/2011. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 89 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 01-27-2011 before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Court Reporter Contact Information: KRISTA BURGESON, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 3/22/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/1/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/31/2011. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Rebecca Alfert Hirsch for presentment of extension of time 87 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 3/2/2011 at 08:30 AM. (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago for extension of time to file reply brief (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by counsel for Plaintiffs Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler to withdraw as attorney (Panuccio, Jesse) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago of Filing Motion to Dismiss Count V of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 84 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in support of motion to dismiss Count v of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 83 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Defendants The City of Chicago, Richard M Daley to dismiss Count V of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 82 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tylerin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago for protective order 63 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 81 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by Richard M Daley, The City of Chicagoin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Brett Benson, Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Rick Pere, Kathryn Tyler to compel discovery or in the alternative establish a briefing schedule 65 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 80 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Second AMENDED complaint by Kenneth Pacholski, Michael Hall, Kathryn Tyler, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers against Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ordinance)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status hearing held. Plaintiffs' unopposed motion 74 for leave to file a Second Amended Complaint is granted. Plaintiffs Brett Benson and Rick Pere motion 72 to withdraw as party plaintiffs is granted. Motion 63 for protective order is granted solely as to the three officials. Response due 2/10/2011 to the balance of the motion. The motion to compel 65 is granted solely for the production of the data. Production of data to be produced by 2/7/2011. Response due 2/10/2011 to the balance of the motion. Defendants' partial motion for summary judgment due 2/17/2011. Response due 3/3/2011. Reply due 3/9/2011. Status hearing set for 3/17/2011 at 9:00a.m.Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The status hearing scheduled for 1/27/2011 is reset to 1/27/2011 at 10:00a.m. Hearing reset to 1/27/2011 at 10:00a.m. on Plaintiff Bret Benson's and Rick Pere's motion[72[ to withdraw as party-plaintiffs. Hearing reset to 1/27/2011 at 10:00a.m. on Plaintiffs' unopposed motion 74 to file a second amended complaint. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: 1/12/2011 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status hearing set for 1/27/2011 at 8:30a.m.Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: 1/12/2011 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Charles J. Cooper for presentment of motion to amend/correct 74 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 1/27/2011 at 08:30 AM. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: 1/12/2011 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by Andrew W Worseck for presentment of motion for protective order 63 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 1/27/2011 at 08:30 AM. (Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 74 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: 1/12/2011 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Plaintiffs Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler to amend/correct the Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: 1/12/2011 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by Charles J. Cooper for presentment of (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 72 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: 1/12/2011 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Plaintiffs Brett Benson, Rick Pere to withdraw as party-plaintiffs (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: 1/12/2011 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended NOTICE of Motion by Charles J. Cooper for presentment of motion to compel, 65 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 1/27/2011 at 08:30 AM. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: 1/11/2011 Terminate HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing and motion hearing set before Judge Guzman on 1/18/11 and 4/6/11 are stricken. Case has been reassigned to Judge Chang. Motions to be re-noticed before Judge Chang. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/10/2011 assigning/reassigning Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that, pursuant to the Executive Committee Order entered on December 23, 2010, the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Edmond E. Chang, therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED That the attached list of 281 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this order shall become effective on Monday, January 10, 2011. Case reassigned to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/7/2011.(td, ) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: 1/10/2011 Terminate Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Notices of motions set for 1/11/11 are stricken. Reset hearing as to motion by Plaintiffs Brett Benson, Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Rick Pere, Kathryn Tyler to compel discovery or in the alternative establish a briefing schedule 65 and motion by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago for protective order 63 : Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2011 at 09:30 AM. on Court's own motion. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Charles J. Cooper for presentment of motion to compel, 65 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 1/11/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago in support of motion for protective order 63 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - D, # 2 Exhibit E - K)(Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 65 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Plaintiffs Brett Benson, Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Rick Pere, Kathryn Tyler to compel discovery or in the alternative establish a briefing schedule (Attachments: # 1 Local Rule 37.2 Statement, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Index of Exhibits, # 4 Exhbits A-A1, # 5 Exhibits B-B1, # 6 Exhibits C-C1, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibits E-F, # 9 Exhibits G-M, # 10 Exhibit N, # 11 Exhibit O)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 64 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by Andrew W Worseck for presentment of motion for protective order 63 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 1/11/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 63 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago for protective order (Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: 12/16/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Motion hearing held on 12/16/2010. Motion by Plaintiffs for extension of time to complete discovery 56 is granted. Fact discovery ordered closed by 3/31/2011. 5/2/11 is the date for expert disclosures. 6/15/11 is the date for disclosure of expert rebuttal reports. 6/30/11 is the date when expert discovery closes. NO EXTENSIONS. Status hearing reset to 4/6/2011 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: 12/15/2010 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Brett Benson, Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Rick Pere, Kathryn Tyler by Peter A Patterson (Patterson, Peter) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: 12/15/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Applicationfor Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-5500734. (Patterson, Peter) 59 is granted. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: 12/9/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-5500734. (Patterson, Peter) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: 12/8/2010 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED NOTICE of Motion by Charles J. Cooper for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery 56 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 12/16/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: 12/3/2010 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Charles J. Cooper for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery 56 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 12/9/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: 12/3/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Plaintiffs Brett Benson, Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Rick Pere, Kathryn Tyler for extension of time to complete discovery (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: 12/3/2010 Order on Motion to Reassign Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: For the reasons set forth in this Order, plaintiffs' motions to reassign [doc. nos. 26 & 47] are denied. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: 11/29/2010 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago re reply to response to motion 53 to reassign case as related (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: 11/29/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago to response in opposition to motion 52 to reassign case as related (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: 11/12/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by Brett Benson, Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Rick Pere, Kathryn Tylerin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant The City of Chicago to reassign case as related 47 (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: 10/22/2010 Order on Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Notice of motion set for 10/26/10 is stricken. Motion by Plaintiff Raymond Sledge to withdraw as party plaintiff. 45 is granted. It is hereby ordered that Raymond Sledge is dismissed as a party plaintiff to this civil action, with the case to continue as to all other Plaintiffs. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: 10/22/2010 Terminate Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Notice of motion set for 10/26/10 is stricken. Set deadlines as to motion by Defendant The City of Chicago to reassign case as related 47 : Responses due by 11/12/2010. Replies due by 11/29/2010. Ruling to be by mail. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Rebecca Alfert Hirsch for presentment of motion to reassign case 47 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 10/26/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Reassign Case as Related (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B-E)(Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 47 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010 Motion to Reassign Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Defendant The City of Chicago to reassign case as related (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: 10/19/2010 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by Charles J. Cooper for presentment of motion to withdraw 45 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 10/26/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: 10/19/2010 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Plaintiff Raymond Sledge to withdraw as party plaintiff. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing set for 1/10/2011 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 10/12/2010 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago re answer to amended complaint 42 (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 10/12/2010 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendants' ANSWER to amended complaint by Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago(Aguiar, William) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: 9/15/2010 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. re response in opposition to motion, 40 (Sigale, David) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: 9/15/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM of Point and Authorities by Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. in opposition to defendants' Local Rule 40.4 motion to reassign case as related 26 (Sigale, David) Modified on 9/16/2010 (cdy, ). (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: 9/15/2010 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by Brett Benson, Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Rick Pere, Raymond Sledge, Kathryn Tyler in Opposition to motion to reassign case 26 (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: 9/2/2010 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Notice of motion set for 9/7/10 is stricken. Motion by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago for leave to file /cite additional authority 36 is granted. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: 9/2/2010 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Forti for presentment of motion for leave to file 36 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 9/7/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Forti, Michael) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: 9/2/2010 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago for leave to file /cite additional authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6)(Forti, Michael) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago re memorandum in support of motion 34 to reassign case as related (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago in support of motion to reassign case 26 as related (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(Aguiar, William) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing held on 9/1/2010. Motion by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago for leave to file Memorandum in Support of Their Local Rule 40.4 Motion is granted and denied as to expediting the Briefing Schedule 29 . Defendants' oral motion to extend time to answer or otherwise plead is granted to and including 10/12/10. Fact discovery ordered closed by 1/7/2011. Experts to be disclosed by 2/7/11. Expert discovery closes 3/9/11. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: 8/30/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by Rhonda Ezell, Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Illinois State Rifle Association, William Hespenin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago for leave to file Memorandum in Support of Their Local Rule 40.4 Motion and to Expedite Briefing Schedule 29 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alan Gura, # 2 Declaration of David Sigale)(Gura, Alan) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: 8/27/2010 Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: 8/27/2010 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by William Macy Aguiar for presentment of motion for leave to file 29 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 9/1/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: 8/27/2010 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago for leave to file Memorandum in Support of Their Local Rule 40.4 Motion and to Expedite Briefing Schedule (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2)(Aguiar, William) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: 8/25/2010 Terminate Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Notice of motion set for 8/26/10 is stricken. Set deadlines as to motion by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago to reassign case as Related 26 : Response due by 9/15/2010. No. Reply. Ruling to be by mail. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: 8/20/2010 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by William Macy Aguiar for presentment of motion to reassign case 26 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 8/26/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: 8/20/2010 Motion to Reassign Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago to reassign case as Related (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Aguiar, William) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: 8/16/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Service for First Amended Complaint by Charles J. Cooper on behalf of Brett Benson, Michael Hall, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Rick Pere, Raymond Sledge, Kathryn Tyler regarding amended complaint, 24 (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: 8/13/2010 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FIRST AMENDED complaint by Kathryn Tyler, Brett Benson, Kenneth Pacholski, Raymond Sledge, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Michael Hall, Rick Pere against Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ordinance)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago by Mardell Nereim (Nereim, Mardell) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago by Michael A. Forti (Forti, Michael) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: 7/27/2010 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago by William Macy Aguiar (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: 7/26/2010 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago by Rebecca Alfert Hirsch (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing reset to 9/1/2010 at 09:30 AM. on request of parties. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/21/2010 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing reset to 8/2/2010 at 09:30 AM. on Court's own motion. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: 7/15/2010 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Richard M Daley, The City of Chicago by Andrew W Worseck (Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: 7/8/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathryn Tyler, Brett Benson, Kenneth Pacholski, Raymond Sledge, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers as to Richard M Daley on 7/7/2010, answer due 7/28/2010. (Kolodziej, Stephen) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: 7/8/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathryn Tyler, Brett Benson, Kenneth Pacholski, Raymond Sledge, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers as to The City of Chicago on 7/7/2010, answer due 7/28/2010. (Kolodziej, Stephen) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: 7/8/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Brett Benson, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Raymond Sledge, Kathryn Tyler regarding complaint, 1 (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: 7/7/2010 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Brett Benson, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Raymond Sledge, Kathryn Tyler by Brian S. Koukoutchos (Koukoutchos, Brian) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: 7/7/2010 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Brett Benson, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Raymond Sledge, Kathryn Tyler by Jesse Michael Panuccio (Panuccio, Jesse) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: 7/7/2010 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Brett Benson, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Raymond Sledge, Kathryn Tyler by David Henry Thompson (Thompson, David) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: 7/7/2010 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Brett Benson, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Raymond Sledge, Kathryn Tyler by Charles J. Cooper (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: 7/7/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-4985788. (Cooper, Charles) 4 is granted. Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-4985800. (Thompson, David) 5 is granted. Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-4985814. (Panuccio, Jesse) 6 is granted. Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-4985829. (Koukoutchos, Brian) 7 is granted. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: 7/7/2010 Set/Reset HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court orders the parties to appear for an initial status hearing. All parties shall refer to and comply with Judge Guzman's requirements for the initial appearance as outlined in Judge Guzman's case management procedures, which can be found at: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Status hearing set for 9/10/2010 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: 7/7/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-4985829. (Koukoutchos, Brian) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: 7/7/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-4985814. (Panuccio, Jesse) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: 7/7/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-4985800. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: 7/7/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-4985788. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: 7/6/2010 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Brett Benson, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers, Kenneth Pacholski, Raymond Sledge, Kathryn Tyler by Stephen A. Kolodziej (Kolodziej, Stephen) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: 7/6/2010 civil cover sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kolodziej, Stephen) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: 7/6/2010 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief filed by Kathryn Tyler, Brett Benson, Kenneth Pacholski, Raymond Sledge, Illinois Association of Firearms Retailers; Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-4984802.(Kolodziej, Stephen) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 336 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?