Gowder v. City Of Chicago et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-01304
District Judge Samuel Der-Yeghiayan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 1:27 PM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Shawn Gowder, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by brennerlawfirm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen A. Kolodziej +1 312 781 1970 skolodziej@brennerlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ed Fox & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Meghan A Gonnissen +1 312 345 8877 mgonnissen@efox-law.com
v.
City of Chicago City of Chicago, Defendant
Officially listed as "City of Chicago Department of Police"

Represented by City of Chicago

No Logo Jody P. Weis, Defendant

Represented by City of Chicago

No Logo Scott V. Bruner, Defendant

Represented by City of Chicago

No Logo Illinois State Rifle Assoc. and Mary Shepard, Amicus Curiae

Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Stone & Johnson, Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian D. Ambler +1 312 332 5656 cambler@stonejohnsonlaw.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (74) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 75 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM Opinion Signed by the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 9/26/2012: Mailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
    LREF
    Blank 74 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None
    MINUTE entry before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: For the reasons stated in the Court's memorandum opinion dated 09/26/12, Plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees 72 is granted, without objection, in the total amount of $125,000.00. Noticed motion date of 09/27/12 is stricken. Mailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
      LREF
      Blank 73 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Motion by Stephen A. Kolodziej for presentment of motion for attorney fees 72 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 9/27/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Kolodziej, Stephen) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
        LREF
        Blank 72 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
        MOTION by Plaintiff Shawn Gowder for attorney fees Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Attorney's Fees (Kolodziej, Stephen) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
          MINUTE entry before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Plaintiff's agreed motion to set schedule relating to motion for attorneys fees 68 is granted. The parties are to meet and confer in an attempt to reach an agreement as to the prevailing party's attorney's fees. In the event no agreement is reached, Plaintiff shall file his motion for attorney's fees by 11/21/12. Defendants' response shall be filed by 12/05/12 and Plaintiff's reply shall be filed by 12/12/12. The Court will issue its ruling by mail. Noticed motion date of 07/24/12 is stricken. Mailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Motion by Stephen A. Kolodziej for presentment of motion for attorney fees 68 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 7/24/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Kolodziej, Stephen) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Motion by Stephen A. Kolodziej for presentment of motion for attorney fees 68 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 7/11/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Kolodziej, Stephen) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 68 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
                MOTION by Plaintiff Shawn Gowder for attorney fees Agreed Motion to Set LR 54.3 Schedule Relating to Motion for Attorney's Fees (Kolodziej, Stephen) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: 6/19/2012 entered judgment
                  ENTERED JUDGMENT(mr, ) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 66 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: 6/19/2012 Memorandum, Opinion & Order
                    MEMORANDUM Opinion Signed by the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 6/19/2012.(mr, ) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: 6/19/2012 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: For the reasons stated in the Court's memorandum opinion dated 06/19/12, Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 40 is granted and the court finds that Section (b)(3)(iii) of the Chicago Firearm Ordinance is unconstitutionally void for vagueness and is unconstitutional for violating Plaintiff's Second Amendment constitutional right to keep and bear arms. As to Plaintiff's request for injunctive relief, the City of Chicago is barred from denying Plaintiff's application for a Chicago Firearm Permit based upon his misdemeanor conviction that is the subject of this action. In light of this court's holding that Section (b)(3)(iii) of the Chicago Firearm Ordinance is unconstitutional under the Second Amendment of the United States Constitution, Plaintiff's claims in Counts I and III are stricken as moot. All pending dates and motions are stricken as moot. Civil case terminated. [For further detail see separate order.] Mailed notice. (mr, ) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: 5/25/2012 Transcript
                        TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on October 18, 2011, before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura LaCien, 312-408-5032, laura_lacien@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/15/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/25/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/23/2012. (Lacien, Laura) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: 5/25/2012 Transcript
                          TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on June 28, 2011, before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura LaCien, 312-408-5032, laura_lacien@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/15/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/25/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/23/2012. (Lacien, Laura) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: 5/21/2012 Response
                            RESPONSE by Plaintiff Shawn Gowder to Rule 56 statement 56 Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' LR 56.1 Statement of Additional Facts (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Kolodziej, Stephen) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: 5/21/2012 Reply to Response to Motion
                              REPLY by Shawn Gowder to response in opposition to motion, 60 , MOTION by Plaintiff Shawn Gowder for summary judgment 40 Plaintiff's Reply In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Kolodziej, Stephen) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: 5/3/2012 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                RESPONSE by Scott V. Bruner, City Of Chicago, City of Chicago Department of Administrative Hearings, City of Chicago Department of Police, Jody P. Weisin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Shawn Gowder for summary judgment 40 (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: 5/2/2012 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Defendants' motion for for leave to file brief in excess of 15 pages 54 is granted equally. Noticed motion date of 05/03/12 is stricken. Mailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: 4/30/2012 Appendix
                                    APPENDIX Exhibits 9 through 15 to Defendants' Rule 56.1(b)(3)(c) Statement of Additional Facts (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: 4/30/2012 Appendix
                                      APPENDIX Exhibits 1 through 8 to Defendants' Local Rule 56.1(b)(3)(c) Statement of Additional Facts (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: 4/30/2012 Rule 56 statement
                                        RULE 56 56.1(b)(3) Response Statement to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Facts and Rule 56.1(b)(3)(c) Statement of Additional Facts (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: 4/30/2012 Notice of Motion
                                          NOTICE of Motion by Rebecca Alfert Hirsch for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages, 54 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 5/3/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: 4/30/2012 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                            MOTION by Defendants Scott V. Bruner, City Of Chicago, City of Chicago Department of Administrative Hearings, City of Chicago Department of Police, Jody P. Weis, Amicus Illinois State Rifle Assoc. and Mary Shepard for leave to file excess pages (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: 4/2/2012 other
                                              Brief of Amici Curiae by Illinois State Rifle Assoc. and Mary Shepard (Ambler, Christian) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: 3/29/2012 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Amicus Illinois State Rifle Assoc. and Mary Shepard's motion for leave to file amicus brief 44 is granted. Defendant's motion for extension of time 50 is granted. Defendants' response to the motion for summary judgment due 4/30/12. Plaintiff's reply in support of the motion for summary judgment due 5/21/12. Presentment date of 4/3/12 on said motions are stricken. Status hearing of 6/21/12 is stricken and reset for 7/31/12 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (yp, ) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: 3/28/2012 Notice of Motion
                                                  NOTICE of Motion by Rebecca Alfert Hirsch for presentment of extension of time 50 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 4/3/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: 3/28/2012 extension of time
                                                    MOTION by Defendants Scott V. Bruner, City Of Chicago, City of Chicago Department of Administrative Hearings, City of Chicago Department of Police, Jody P. Weis for extension of time (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: 3/19/2012 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6958370. (Patterson, Peter) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: 3/19/2012 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6958349. (Koukoutchos, Brian) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: 3/19/2012 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6958332. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: 3/19/2012 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6958264. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: 3/19/2012 Notice of Motion
                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Christian D. Ambler for presentment of motion for leave to file, 44 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 4/3/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Ambler, Christian) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: 3/19/2012 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                MOTION by Amicus Illinois State Rifle Assoc. and Mary Shepard for leave to file Brief of Amici Curiae Mary Shepard and Illinois State Rifle Association (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amicus Brief, # 2 Exhibit Rule 3.2 Notice of Affiliates)(Ambler, Christian) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: 3/19/2012 Attorney Appearance
                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Amicus Illinois State Rifle Assoc. and Mary Shepard by Christian D. Ambler (Ambler, Christian) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: 3/19/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Shawn Gowder in support of motion for summary judgment 40 (Kolodziej, Stephen) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: 3/19/2012 Statement
                                                                      Local Rule 56.1(a)(3) Statement of Material Facts As To Which There Is No Genuine Issue STATEMENT by Shawn Gowder (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defendants' Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Stephen A. Kolodziej)(Kolodziej, Stephen) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: 3/19/2012 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                        MOTION by Plaintiff Shawn Gowder for summary judgment (Kolodziej, Stephen) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: 2/22/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Plaintiff's agreed motion to modify summary judgment briefing schedule 37 is granted as follows: Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment shall be filed by 03/19/12. Defendants' response shall be filed by 04/09/12 and Plaintiff's reply shall be filed by 04/23/12. Status hearing reset to 06/21/12 at 9:00 a.m. Noticed motion date of 02/23/12 and status hearing date of 04/18/12 are stricken. Mailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: 2/16/2012 Notice of Motion
                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Stephen A. Kolodziej for presentment of extension of time 37 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 2/23/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Kolodziej, Stephen) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: 2/16/2012 extension of time
                                                                              MOTION by Plaintiff Shawn Gowder for extension of time Plaintiff's Agreed Motion to Modify Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule (Kolodziej, Stephen) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: 1/4/2012 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                NOTICE by Meghan A Gonnissen of Change of Address (Gonnissen, Meghan) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: 1/3/2012 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                  NOTICE by Stephen A. Kolodziej of Change of Address (Kolodziej, Stephen) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: 11/17/2011 Memorandum
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Shawn Gowder Joint Memorandum Regarding Plaintiff's Conviction Status (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits to Joint Memorandum)(Kolodziej, Stephen) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: 10/19/2011 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Status hearing held and continued to 04/18/12 at 9:00 a.m. As stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for judgment on the pleadings 26 is denied to the extent that Plaintiff seeks administrative review of the decision by DOAH and the Court will state its reasons when ruling on dispositive motions. As to the constitutionality of the ordinance and as to the application to Plaintiff, the motion is stricken without prejudice in order to give the parties and opportunity to complete discovery. Discovery on constitutionality issues shall be completed by 01/20/12. The parties are to submit within the next 30 days, a joint memorandum as to Plaintiff's conviction at issue. Dispositive motions are to be filed by 02/17/12. Answers to dispositive motions are to be filed by 03/02/12 and replies are to be filed by 03/09/12. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: 9/22/2011 Terminate Hearings
                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Status hearing reset to 10/18/11 at 9:00 a.m. Status hearing set for 09/22/11 is stricken. Mailed and telephoned notice (mw, ) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: 8/15/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                          REPLY by Shawn Gowder to Response 30 , memorandum in support of motion 27 , MOTION by Plaintiff Shawn Gowder for judgment on the pleadings 26 Plaintiff's Reply In Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Kolodziej, Stephen) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: 8/2/2011 Response
                                                                                            RESPONSE by Defendants Scott V. Bruner, City Of Chicago, City of Chicago Department of Administrative Hearings, City of Chicago Department of Police, Jody P. Weis to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: 6/28/2011 Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: As stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for protective order to stay discovery 24 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for judgment on the pleadings 26 is entered and continued. Defendants' response shall be filed by 08/02/11 and Plaintiff's reply shall be filed by 08/16/11. Mailed notice (mw,) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: 6/21/2011 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by Stephen A. Kolodziej for presentment of motion for judgment on the pleadings 26 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 6/28/2011 at 09:00 AM. (Kolodziej, Stephen) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: 6/21/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Shawn Gowder in support of motion for judgment on the pleadings 26 (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Addendum)(Kolodziej, Stephen) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: 6/21/2011 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
                                                                                                    MOTION by Plaintiff Shawn Gowder for judgment on the pleadings (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Kolodziej, Stephen) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: 6/21/2011 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Stephen A. Kolodziej for presentment of motion for protective order 24 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 6/28/2011 at 09:00 AM. (Kolodziej, Stephen) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: 6/21/2011 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                        RULE 26(c) MOTION by Plaintiff Shawn Gowder for protective order Barring or Staying Discovery, or Alternatively, Barring Plaintiff's Deposition (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Kolodziej, Stephen) (Docket text Modified by clerk's office on 6/22/2011 (ca, ). (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: 5/23/2011 Transcript
                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on April 14, 2011, before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura LaCien, 312-408-5032, laura_lacien@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/13/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2011. (Lacien, Laura) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: 4/14/2011 status hearing
                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Status hearing held and continued to 09/22/11 at 9:00 a.m. All fact discovery shall be completed by 07/15/11. All expert discovery shall be noticed in time to be completed by 09/16/11. Dispositive motions are to be filed by 10/14/11. Responses to the dispositive motions, if any, are to be filed by 11/04/11 and replies, if any, are to be filed by 11/18/11. Mailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: 4/13/2011 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Scott V. Bruner, City Of Chicago, City of Chicago Department of Administrative Hearings, City of Chicago Department of Police, Jody P. Weis by Mardell Nereim (Nereim, Mardell) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: 4/8/2011 Status Report
                                                                                                                JOINT Jurisdictional Status Report by Shawn Gowder (Kolodziej, Stephen) (Docket text Modified by clerk's office on 4/11/2011 (ca, ). (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: 4/8/2011 Status Report
                                                                                                                  INITIAL Status Report by Shawn Gowder (Kolodziej, Stephen) (Docket text Modified by clerk's office on 4/11/2011 (ca, ). (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: 4/7/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                    ANSWER to complaint for Administrative Review by City of Chicago Department of Administrative Hearings (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Administrative Record)(Hirsch, Rebecca) (Docket text Modified by clerk's office on 4/8/2011 (ca, ). (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: 4/7/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                      ANSWER and Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint for Administrative Review, Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive relief by Scott V. Bruner, City Of Chicago, City of Chicago Department of Police, Jody P. Weis(Hirsch, Rebecca) (Docket text Modified by clerk's office on 4/8/2011 (ca, ). (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: 3/9/2011 Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Plaintiff's unopposed motion for protective order 14 is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove plaintiff's Chicago Firearms Permit Application, pages 48-50 of Document 1 and pages 26-28 of Document #13-2, and/or prohibiting any non-party from having remote electronic access to those pages on the Court's docket. Noticed motion date of 03/10/11 is stricken. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: 3/4/2011 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion by Stephen A. Kolodziej for presentment of motion for protective order 14 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 3/10/2011 at 09:00 AM. (Kolodziej, Stephen) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: 3/4/2011 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                            UNOPPOSED MOTION by Plaintiff Shawn Gowder for Rule 5.2(e) Protective order (Kolodziej, Stephen) Modified on 3/7/2011 (ca, ). (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: 3/2/2011 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                              AMENDED complaint by Shawn Gowder against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List of Exhibits to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint)(Kolodziej, Stephen) . Modified on 3/9/2011 (ca, ). (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint 6 is granted to and including 04/07/11. Plaintiff's unopposed motion to strike page from the docket and for leave to re-file redacted complaint 10 is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove the exhibit A, Page 47 to Document Number 1 in this action. Initial status hearing set for 04/14/11 at 9:00 a.m. At least four working days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall conduct a FRCP 26(f) conference and file a joint written Initial Status Report, not to exceed five pages in length, and file the Court's Joint Jurisdictional Status Report and deliver courtesy copies to this Court's Courtroom Deputy in room 1906. The Court's standing orders on the Initial Status Report and Joint Jurisdictional Status Report maybe obtained from Judge Der-Yeghiayan's web page or from this Court's Courtroom Deputy. Noticed motion date of 03/02/11 is stricken. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: 2/25/2011 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by Stephen A. Kolodziej for presentment of motion to strike 10 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 3/2/2011 at 09:00 AM. (Kolodziej, Stephen) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: 2/25/2011 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                    UNOPPOSED MOTION by Plaintiff Shawn Gowder to strike page from the docket and for leave to re-file redacted complaint (Kolodziej, Stephen) Modified on 2/28/2011 (ca, ). (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: 2/25/2011 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Shawn Gowder by Meghan A Gonnissen (Gonnissen, Meghan) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: 2/25/2011 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Shawn Gowder by Stephen A. Kolodziej (Kolodziej, Stephen) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: 2/25/2011 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion by Rebecca Alfert Hirsch for presentment of extension of time 6 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 3/2/2011 at 09:00 AM. (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: 2/25/2011 extension of time
                                                                                                                                            UNOPPOSED MOTION by Defendants Scott V. Bruner, City Of Chicago, City of Chicago Department of Administrative Hearings, City of Chicago Department of Police, Jody P. Weis for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead (Hirsch, Rebecca) Modified on 2/28/2011 (ca, ). (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: 2/24/2011 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants City Of Chicago, City of Chicago Department of Administrative Hearings, City of Chicago Department of Police, Jody P. Weis by Andrew W Worseck (Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: 2/24/2011 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Scott V. Bruner, City Of Chicago, City of Chicago Department of Administrative Hearings, City of Chicago Department of Police, Jody P. Weis by Rebecca Alfert Hirsch (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: 2/24/2011 civil cover sheet
                                                                                                                                                  CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: 2/24/2011 Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Removal filed by City of Chicago Department of Police, Jody P. Weis, with copy of complaint and summons, case No. 2011CH01361 (Hirsch, Rebecca) Modified on 2/25/2011 . Modified on 3/1/2011 . Modified on 3/9/2011 (ca, ). (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 274 times.

                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?