Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC v. ABP Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-01638
District Judge James F. Holderman, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 12:45 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ABP Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Kevin J O'Shea +1 312 558 5600 +1 312 558 5700 koshea@winston.com
No Logo Accor North America, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert David Donoghue +1 312 368 3972 +1 312 251 2188 david.donoghue@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Long Farris +1 312 704 3125 dfarris@hinshawlaw.com
No Logo Caribou Coffee Company, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Caribou Coffee Co., Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by cmfblaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matias Ferrario +1 202 478 5300 mferrario@cmfblaw.com

Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Represented by Rockey, Depke and Lyons, LLC

No Logo Cbc Restaurant Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "CBC Restaurant Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/10/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Kevin J O'Shea +1 312 558 5600 +1 312 558 5700 koshea@winston.com
No Logo Cosi Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven C. Cherny +1 212 596 9000

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amanda Jean Hollis +1 312 876 7700 amanda.hollis@lw.com

Represented by Verrill & Dana, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin J O'Shea +1 312 558 5600 +1 312 558 5700 koshea@winston.com
No Logo Dominick's Supermarkets, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven C. Cherny +1 212 596 9000

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon Renae Albrecht +1 312 368 2106 shari.albrecht@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amanda Jean Hollis +1 312 876 7700 amanda.hollis@lw.com

Represented by Mandell Menkes LLC

No Logo LQ Management LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Owen, Wickersham & Erickson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/10/2011 Joel David Bertocchi +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 701 7711 jbertocchi@mayerbrownrowe.com
Meijer, Inc. Meijer, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven C. Cherny +1 212 596 9000

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert David Donoghue +1 312 368 3972 +1 312 251 2188 david.donoghue@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Long Farris +1 312 704 3125 dfarris@hinshawlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amanda Jean Hollis +1 312 876 7700 amanda.hollis@lw.com
No Logo Panera Bread Company, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by cmfblaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matias Ferrario +1 202 478 5300 mferrario@cmfblaw.com

Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin J O'Shea +1 312 558 5600 +1 312 558 5700 koshea@winston.com
No Logo Kimpton Hotel & Restaurant Group, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Jonathan R Spivey +1 312 832 4500 +1 312 832 4700 jspivey@foley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keck, Mahin & Cate

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2011 Sharon R. Barner +1 312 634 7700
No Logo Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Niro, Scavone, Haller & Niro, Ltd.

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (193) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (Attachments: # 1 Order Dated: 6/9/2014)(ea, ) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
    ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. On this day, Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC, Innovatio Management, LLC and Noel B. Whitley (collectively, "Innovatio") and Cosi, Inc. and Dominicks, Inc. (collectively, "Defendants") announced to the Court that they have settled their respective claims for relief asserted in the above-captioned actions. The Court, having considered this request, is of the opinion that their request for dismissal should be GRANTED. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that all claims and counterclaims by Innovatio against Defendants and by Defendants against Innovatio in the above-captioned actions, including Case Nos. 1:11-cv-09308 (consolidated) and 1:11-cv-01638, are dismissed, with prejudice to the re-filing of same. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all attorneys fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by the party incurring the same.This is a final judgment as to the parties herein. Because there are no remaining claims in Case No. 11-cv-01638, the Court closes this case in its entirety. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 6/9/2014:Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
      ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to the order entered on 2/19/14 in lead case number, 11 C 9308, docket entry 1056 , Defendants Caribou Coffee Co., Inc. ("Caribou") and Panera Bread Company ("Panera") are dismissed with prejudice.Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 6/9/2014. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
        ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. On this day, Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC, Innovatio Management, LLC and Noel B. Whitley (collectively, "Innovatio") and Meijer, Inc. ("Meijer") announced to the Court that they have settled their respective claims for relief asserted in the above-captioned actions. The Court, having considered this request, is of the opinion that their request for dismissal should be GRANTED. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that all claims and counterclaims by Innovatio against Meijer and by Meijer against Innovatio in the above-captioned actions, including Case Nos. 1:11-cv-09308 (consolidated) and 1:11-cv-01638, are dismissed, with prejudice to the re-filing of same.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all attorneys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by the party incurring the same. This is a final judgment as to the parties herein. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 5/15/2014.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
          ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. On this day, Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC, Innovatio Management, LLC and Noel B. Whitley (collectively, "Innovatio") and G6 Hospitality LLC (formerly known as Accor North America, Inc., as noted in Dkt. No. 693 in 11-cv-9308), its Affiliates, and G6 Hospitality Real Estate LLC (collectively, "G6 Hospitality") announced to the Court that they have settled their respective claims for relief asserted in the above-captioned actions. The Court, having considered this request, is of the opinion that their request for dismissal should be GRANTED. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that all claims and counterclaims by Innovatio against G6 Hospitality and by G6 Hospitality against Innovatio in the above-captioned actions, including Case Nos. 1:11-cv-09308 (consolidated) and 1:11-cv-01638, are dismissed, with prejudice to the re-filing of same. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all attorneys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by the party incurring the same. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 5/15/2014. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
            ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimant Accor North America, Defendant Accor North America by Steven Eric Jedlinski (Jedlinski, Steven) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 187 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
              MINUTE entry before Honorable James F. Holderman: This case is consolidated with 11 C 9308, as the lead case number in MDL 2303. All further filings should be made in 11 C 9308 as the established lead case for MDL 2303; the individual case number should also be displayed on the documents filed, if the document only pertains to the individual case number. Mailed notice. (kj, ) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                MINUTE entry before Honorable James F. Holderman: Attorney Megan M. Chung's application to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Panera Bread Co. & Caribou Coffee Company, Inc. 184 is granted.Mailed notice (am) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                  MINUTE entry before Honorable James F. Holderman: The defendants' "Amended Motion to Stay this Matter Pending Resolution of Cisco Systems, Inc. and Motorola Solutions, Inc. v. Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC, Case No. 1:11-cv-00425 (D. Del.)" 137 is mooted. The Delaware case and this case have been consolidated (11 C 9308). Accordingly, the defendants concerns about addressing the invalidity of the patents, which was at issue in the Delaware case, before addressing their liability, can be addressed in the context of this action. Mailed notice (am) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6820703. (Chung, Megan) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
                      TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 01/10/12 before the Honorable James F. Holderman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colleen Conway @ 312.435.5594 or colleen_conway@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/14/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/24/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/23/2012. (Conway, Colleen) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None
                        MINUTE entry before Honorable James F. Holderman: Plaintiff's joint motion to modify discovery pretrial schedule 173 is entered and continued for 2/14/2012 at 9:30 AM. Status hearing held on 1/10/2012 and is continued for 2/14/2012 at 9:30 AM. Parties are to meet and prepare Form 52 for filing by 2/10/2012. Mailed notice (am) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None
                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: The status hearing with the magistrate judge set for 1/17/12 is stricken, and will be reset as part of the MDL proceeding docketed as 11 C 9308. Mailed notice. (jj, ) (Entered: 01/11/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: None
                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: The status hearing set with the magistrate judge for 1/4/2012 is RESET to 01/17/2012 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (kj, ) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
                              EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable James F. Holderman, in accordance with the provisions of Rule 13 of the Internal Operating Procedures of this Court, who acknowledged the reasons and conditions of this reassignment; I agree that case number 11C1638 should be reassigned to my calendar as specifically set forth: I agree to conduct the trial in the case. Subject to Executive Committee approval, pursuant to 13(d) FOP, I will get a skip. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/22/11. (ph, ) (Entered: 12/27/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                MINUTE entry before Honorable James F. Holderman: Status hearing set for 1/10/2012 at 9:00 AM before Judge James F. Holderman. Mailed notice (am) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing reset to 1/10/2012 at 09:30 AM. on request of parties. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Motion by Matthew G. McAndrews for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 173 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 1/10/2012 at 09:30 AM. (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None
                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing reset to 12/20/2011 at 09:30 AM. on request of parties. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Motion by Matthew G. McAndrews for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 173 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 12/20/2011 at 09:30 AM. (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                          MOTION by Plaintiff Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC TO MODIFY DISCOVERY/PRETRIAL SCHEDULE (JOINT MOTION OF PARTIES) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None
                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: The status hearing with the magistrate judge set for 12/07/11 is RESET to 1/04/12 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, ) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: It is hereby ordered that the minute entry dated 11/21/11 [doc. 170] is vacated as entered in error. Status hearing set for 12/19/2011 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (cjg, ) Modified on 11/30/2011 (cjg, ). (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman:It is hereby ordered that the Clerk of Court is directed to make arrangements to transfer this case to the Patent Case Pilot Program. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                  TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 07-21-11 before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Court Reporter Contact Information: Pamela S. Warren, pswcsr@aol.com, 312-294-8907. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 12/6/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/16/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/13/2012. (Warren, Pamela) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                    EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/7/2011.(kj, ) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The assigned district judge recuses himself from the case because of his spouse's ownership of shares in Motorola, Inc. (now Motorola Mobility and Motorola Solutions), where his spouse previously worked as a software engineer. The status hearing of 11/03/11 is vacated. [For further details see attached minute order.]Mailed notice (Attachments: # 1 Minute Order) (slb, ) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: The status hearing before the magistrate judge set for 10/27/11 is RESET to 12/07/11 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, ) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The amended motion to stay is still under advisement. The status hearing of 10/24/11 is reset to 11/03/11 at 10 a.m. (if that date is inconvenient, the parties may call the courtroom deputy to reschedule by agreement). Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Application by Steven Cherny to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Cosi, Inc., Dominick's Supermarkets, Inc., and Meijer, Inc. 158 is granted. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: By agreement of the parties, the status hearing of 10/19/2011 is reset for 10/24/2011 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: In light of the status hearing reset by the district judge 161 , the status hearing set before the magistrate judge on 10/12/11 is RESET to 10/27/11 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, ) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: By agreement of the parties, the status hearing of 10/05/2011 is reset for 10/19/2011 at 9:00a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: In light of the pendency before the district judge of an amended motion to stay 137 and the status hearing reset by the district judge 159 , the status hearing set before the magistrate judge on 9/22/11 is RESET to 10/12/11 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, ) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The amended motion to stay 137 is still under advisement. Status hearing of 09/15/11 is reset to 10/05/11 at 8:30a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6325202. (Cherny, Steven) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: In light of the pendency before the district judge of an amended motion to stay 137 and the status hearing reset by the district judge 156 , the status hearing set before the magistrate judge on 8/30/11 is RESET to 9/22/11 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, ) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The amended motion to stay is still under advisement. Status hearing of 08/25/11 is reset to 09/15/11 at 8:30a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Pursuant to Rules 41(a)(2) and 41(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Innovatio IP Ventures LLC ("Innovatio") and Defendant LQ Management L.L.C. ("LQM") hereby stipulate to and move for the dismissal with prejudice of all of Innovatio's claims in this action as to LQM and for the dismissal with prejudice of all of LQM's counterclaims in this action as to Innovatio. The case continues as to all other defendants. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Pursuant to Rules 41(a)(2) and 41(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC ("Innovatio") hereby dismisses with prejudice all of its claims in this action as to Defendant CBC Restaurant Corp. ("CBC") and CBC hereby dismisses with prejudice all of its counterclaims in this action as to Innovatio. The case continues as to all other defendants. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION by Plaintiff Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC to dismiss Joint Motion of Plaintiff and Defendant LQ Management, L.L.C. (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The Court has the amended motion to stay under advisement. Status hearing of 08/11/11 is reset to 08/25/11 at 10 a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      SUR-REPLY by Plaintiff Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC in support of its opposition to Defendants' amended motion to stay this matter pending resolution 145 . (Exhibits) (kj, ) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Plaintiff's motion to file a sur-reply 149 is granted. Status and motion hearing on the stay motion of 08/03/11 is reset to 08/11/11 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION by Plaintiff Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC for leave to file Surreply in Support of its Opposition to Defendants' Amended Motion to Stay (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Declaration McAndrews Decl., # 3 Exhibit 1 to McAndrews Decl., # 4 Exhibit 2 to McAndrews Decl., # 5 Exhibit 3 to McAndrews Decl., # 6 Exhibit 4 to McAndrews Decl., # 7 Exhibit 5 to McAndrews Decl.)(McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE by Sharon Renae Albrecht of Change of Address (Albrecht, Sharon) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              REPLY by Defendants Cosi, Inc., Dominick's Supermarkets, Inc., Meijer, Inc. (Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants Amended Motion to Stay this Matter Pending Resolution of Cisco Systems, Inc. and Motorola Solutions, Inc. v. Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC, Case No. 1:11-cv-00425 (D. Del.)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 15 - Complaint for Patent Infringement in Case No. 1:11-cv-4668 (N.D. Ill.), # 2 Exhibit 16 - Representative Example of Pls. LPR 2.2 Contentions, # 3 Exhibit 17 - La Quinta Hotel List)(Hollis, Amanda) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                DECLARATION of Matthew G. McAndrews in support of Plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to Defendants' amended motion to stay this matter pending resolution of Cisco Systems, Inc. and Motorola solutions, Inc. V. Innovatio IP Vetures, LLC. Case no. 1:11-cv-00425(D.DEL) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(McAndrews, Matthew) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office.) Modified on 7/21/2011 (kj, ). (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Defendants' Amended Motion to Stay this Matter (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    ORDER Modifying Case Schedule Signed by the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 7/13/2011. Mailed notice.(jj, ) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Status and motion hearings held. The parties' joint motion to modify case schedule 135 is granted. The Court adopts the case schedule as proposed. Enter attached order. (For further detail see separate order(s)). Mailed notice. (jj, ) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MOTION by Plaintiff Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC to dismiss with Prejudice as to Defendant CBC Restaurant Corp. (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: With regard to Defendants' motion to stay 137 , Plaintiff shall respond on or before 07/20/11. Defendants may reply on or before 07/26/11. Motion hearing is continued to coincide with the previously set status hearing of 08/03/11, but the time is reset to 9 a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER:Case referred to the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier for all discovery motions, discovery supervision, discovery conference under Rule 26(f), and motion to modify discovery. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/5/2011.(kj, ) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: The parties' stipulated motion to modify case schedule 135 is set for hearing and ruling before the magistrate judge on 7/12/11 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, ) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by Amanda Jean Hollis for presentment of before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 7/11/2011 at 08:30 AM. (Hollis, Amanda) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION by Defendants Cosi, Inc., Dominick's Supermarkets, Inc., Meijer, Inc. to stay (Defendants Amended Motion to Stay this Matter Pending Resolution of Cisco Systems, Inc. and Motorola Solutions, Inc. v. Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC, Case No. 1:11-cv-00425 (D. Del.)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint for Declaratory Judgment in Case No. 1:11-cv-00425 (D. Del.), # 2 Exhibit 2 - Apr. 27 2011 Letter from M. McAndrews to L. Perkins, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Osbeck Declaration (Meijer), # 4 Exhibit 4 - Enright Declaration (Cosi), # 5 Exhibit 5 - Sandquist Declaration (Dominiks), # 6 Exhibit 6 - Breyer Declaration (Panera), # 7 Exhibit 7 - Pitchai Declaration (LQM), # 8 Exhibit 8 - Gilbertson Declaration (Caribou), # 9 Exhibit 9 - Burgess Declaration (Accor), # 10 Exhibit 10 - Highlighted 802.11 Working Group Membership List, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Infonetics Research Report, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Complaint for Patent Infringement in Case No. 3:11-cv-00343 (D. Nev.), # 13 Exhibit 13 - Complaint for Patent Infringement in Case No. 6:11-cv-00930 (M.D. Fla.), # 14 Exhibit 14 - Complaint for Patent Infringement in Case No. 8:11-cv-01325 (M.D. Fla.))(Hollis, Amanda) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Joint motion to alter pre-trial schedule and discovery 135 is referred to the magistrate judge. The referral to the magistrate shall include the authority to set all pre-trial schedule and discovery dates. Defendants mention in a footnote that they intend to refile the motion to stay. That should occur promptly (and noticed for presentment for decision again by this Court), so that the parties, the Court, and the magistrate judge may determine how to advance the litigation and settlement discussions. Status hearing of 07/06/11 is reset to 08/03/11 at 8:30a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION by Plaintiff Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC to Modify Discovery/Pretrial Schedule (Joint Motion of Parties) (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        ANSWER to counterclaim PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DOMINICK'S SUPERMARKETS, INC.'S COUNTERCLAIMS by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC(Opatken, Gabriel) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          ANSWER to counterclaim PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO PANERA BREAD COMPANY'S COUNTERCLAIMS by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC(Opatken, Gabriel) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            ANSWER to counterclaim PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO CARIBOU COFFEE CO., INC.'S COUNTERCLAIMS by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC(Opatken, Gabriel) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Defendants' motion to file 127 under seal and motion to stay 125 are denied without prejudice. [For further details see attached minute order.] Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Plaintiff's motion to dismiss is granted. Pursuant to Rules 41(a)(2) and 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff hereby dismisses with prejudice all of its claims in the action as to Defendant ABP Corporation, and ABP dismisses with prejudice all of its counterclaims in this action as to Innovatio. The case continues as to all other defendants. Mailed notice. (kj, ) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: The parties report that settlement has been reached between plaintiff and ABP Corp. and between plaintiff and CBC Restaurant Corp. Accordingly, the settlement conference schedule with the magistrate judge of 6/17/11 is stricken. Mailed notice. (jj, ) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by Amanda Jean Hollis for presentment of motion to seal document, motion for relief,, 127 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 6/20/2011 at 08:30 AM. (Hollis, Amanda) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Defendants Cosi, Inc., Dominick's Supermarkets, Inc., Meijer, Inc. to seal document (Defendants' Joint Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Motion to Stay 125 and Exhibits 2 and 5 Thereto) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - License Agreement re Exhibit 5 to Defendants Motion to Stay)(Hollis, Amanda) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion by Amanda Jean Hollis for presentment of before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 6/22/2011 at 08:30 AM. (Hollis, Amanda) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Defendants Cosi, Inc., Dominick's Supermarkets, Inc., Meijer, Inc. to stay (Defendants Joint Motion to Stay this Matter Pending Resolution of Cisco Systems, Inc. and Motorola Solutions, Inc. v. Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC, Case No. 1:11-cv-00425 (D. Del.)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint for Declaratory Judgment in Case No. 1:11-cv-00425 (D. Del.), # 2 Exhibit 2 - Restricted Document Pursuant to L.R. 26.2, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Compilation of Defendants About Us Web Pages, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Highlighted 802.11 Working Group Membership List, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Restricted Document Pursuant to L.R. 26.2, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Complaint for Patent Infringement in Case No. 3:11-cv-00343 (D. Nev.), # 7 Exhibit 7 - Complaint for Patent Infringement in Case No. 6:2011-cv-00930 (M.D. Fla.))(Hollis, Amanda) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Motion by Adam R. Alper to appear pro hac vice on behalf of defendants, Cosi, Inc., Dominick's Supermarkets, Inc., and Meijer, Inc. is granted. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Status hearing held. The parties report on the progress of settlement. Defendant's counsel reports that they will be filing a motion to stay. The matter is set for a status hearing before the magistrate judge on 8/30/11 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, ) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Plaintiff Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC to dismiss with Prejudice as to Defendant ABP Corporation (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Telephone status hearing with plaintiff and ABP and CBC held and continued to 6/16/11 at 1:30 p.m. Mailed notice. (jj, ) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6097136. (Alper, Adam) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Cosi, Inc., Dominick's Supermarkets, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Counter Claimants Cosi, Inc., Dominick's Supermarkets, Inc., Meijer, Inc. by Amanda Jean Hollis (Hollis, Amanda) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Telephone status conference held with counsel for plaintiff and defendant Cosi. By agreement of those parties, the settlement conference set for 6/17/11 will not include Cosi. Absent further court order, the settlement conference set for 6/17/11 will proceed as between plaintiff and defendants CBC Corporation and ABP Corporation. Mailed notice. (jj, ) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: In light of the settlement conference schedule, the status hearing of 06/15/11 is reset to 7/6/2011 at 8:30a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Disclosures by Panera Bread Company (Ludlam, Taylor) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Disclosures by Caribou Coffee Co., Inc. (Ludlam, Taylor) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Panera Bread Company, Counter Claimant Panera Bread Company by Taylor Higgins Ludlam (Ludlam, Taylor) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Panera Bread Company, Counter Claimant Panera Bread Company by Matias Ferrario (Ferrario, Matias) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Panera Bread Company, Counter Claimant Panera Bread Company by Vaibhav P. Kadaba (Kadaba, Vaibhav) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimant Caribou Coffee Co., Inc., Defendant Caribou Coffee Co., Inc. by Matthew James Straub (Straub, Matthew) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimant Caribou Coffee Co., Inc., Defendant Caribou Coffee Co., Inc. by Taylor Higgins Ludlam (Ludlam, Taylor) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimant Caribou Coffee Co., Inc., Defendant Caribou Coffee Co., Inc. by Matias Ferrario (Ferrario, Matias) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimant Caribou Coffee Co., Inc., Defendant Caribou Coffee Co., Inc. by Vaibhav P. Kadaba (Kadaba, Vaibhav) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimant Caribou Coffee Co., Inc., Defendant Caribou Coffee Co., Inc. by Jennifer L Colvin (Colvin, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Defendant Carribou Coffee's motion for leave to withdraw the appearances of Keith V. Rockey, Avani C. Macaluso and Matthew L. DePete is granted. Mailed notice. (kj, ) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Motion by Matias Ferrario, Vaibhav P. Kadaba, and Taylor H. Ludlam to appear pro hac vice on behalf of defendants Panera Bread Co. & Caribou Coffee is granted. Motion by Enrique D. Duarte to appear pro hac vice on behalf of defendant LQ Management LLC is granted.Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's ANSWER to counterclaim of Meijer, Inc. by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC(McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's ANSWER to counterclaim of LQ Management, LLC by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC(McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's ANSWER to counterclaim of Cosi, Inc. by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC(McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's ANSWER to counterclaim of CBC Restaurant Corp. by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC(McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's ANSWER to counterclaim of Accor North America, Inc. by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC(McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's ANSWER to counterclaim of ABP Corporation by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC(McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Dominick's Supermarkets, Inc's ANSWER to amended complaint , affirmative defenses, and COUNTERCLAIM filed by Dominick's Supermarkets, Inc. against Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC. by Dominick's Supermarkets, Inc.(Mandell, Steven) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Caribou Coffee Co., Inc. (Canales, Daniel) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to amended complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and COUNTERCLAIM filed by Caribou Coffee Co., Inc. against Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC. by Caribou Coffee Co., Inc.(Canales, Daniel) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Caribou Coffee Co., Inc. by Daniel Oscar Canales (Canales, Daniel) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Panera Bread Company (O'Shea, Kevin) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to amended complaint, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Panera Bread Company against Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC. by Panera Bread Company(O'Shea, Kevin) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Panera Bread Company by Kevin John O'Shea (O'Shea, Kevin) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Keith V. Rockey for presentment of motion to withdraw 90 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 6/2/2011 at 08:30 AM. (Rockey, Keith) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Defendant Caribou Coffee Co., Inc. to withdraw appearances (Rockey, Keith) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Correction regarding docket entry 83. (kj, ) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORRECTED MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6037923. (Duarte, Enrique)(Docket text modified by Clerk's Office.) Modified on 5/26/2011 (kj, ). (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Settlement conference is set for 06/17/11 at 1:30 p.m. and will be held in chambers, Rm. 1756. The defendant parties participating in the settlement conference are: ABP Corporation, cac Restaurant Corporation and Cosi, Inc. The schedule for exchange of settlement letters required by the Standing Order remains the same. Mailed notice. (kj, ) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6038277. (Ludlam, Taylor) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6038265. (Kadaba, Vaibhav) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6038237. (Ferrario, Matias) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Document entered in error. (Duarte, Enrique) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office.) Modified on 5/26/2011 (kj, ). (Entered: 05/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 05-10-2011 before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Court Reporter Contact Information: KRISTA BURGESON, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/15/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/27/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/23/2011. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Settlement conference is set for 06/17/11 at 1:30 p.m. The settlement conference will be held 10 chambers, Rat. 1756. The settlement conference will be conducted in accordance with the Court's Standing Order on Instructions for Settlement Conference,which is enclosed and which can also be accessed from the Court's webpage at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/JUDGEI SCHENKIER/sispage.htm. The schedule for exchange of settlement letters required by the Standing Order is as follows: plaintiff's counsel shall serve a settlement letter on defense counsel by 06/01111, and defendant's counsel shall serve a settlement letter on plaintiff's counsel by 06/10/11. The parties may not change these dates for exchange without either written agreement of the parties or court order. The plaintiff's counsel shall deliver copies of the settlement letters to chambers by noon on 06/13/11. The parties may not change this date absent court order. Parties with "full and complete settlement authority," as defined in the Standing Order, must personally attend the conference. The parties who attend the conference shall read all settlement letters prior to the commencement of the conference. Failure to comply with the Standing Order or with the schedule set in this order may result in sanctions. Mailed notice. [For further detail see attachments](kj, ) Modified on 5/24/2011 (kj, ). (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Dominick's Supermarkets, Inc. (Mandell, Steven) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by LQ Management LLC (Bertocchi, Joel) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status hearing set for 6/15/2011 at 9:00a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Panera Bread Company by Matthew James Straub (Straub, Matthew) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Panera Bread Company by Jennifer L Colvin (Colvin, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 05-10-2011 before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. COURT REPORTER CONTACT INFORMATION: Krista Burgeson, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/2/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/13/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2011. (Burgeson, Krista) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DISCOVERY/PRETRIAL SCHEDULE Signed by the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 5/10/2011. Mailed notice.(jj, ) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Status hearing held. The Court adopts the proposed discovery schedule that was submitted in the parties' joint status report with the exception of the modification as stated in open Court. (See order attached). The matter is set for a status hearing before the magistrate judge on 6/15/11 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, ) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status hearing held. Defendants Panera Bread and Caribou Coffee Company's unopposed motions for extension of time until May 27, 2011 in which to answer or otherwise plead to the Amended Complaint are granted. The court notes that in the parties status report[#48] the parties indicated that settlement conferences with Magistrate Judge Schenkier would enhance settlement prospects. By agreement of the parties the court will refer the case to Magistrate Judge Schenkier for the purpose of conducting the settlement conferences. The court will also refer the case for discovery supervision. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier for discovery supervision. (slb, )Mailed notice. (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier for the purpose of holding a setttlement conference. (slb, )Mailed notice. (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Cosi, Inc. (O'Shea, Kevin) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by ABP Corporation (O'Shea, Kevin) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by CBC Restaurant Corp. (O'Shea, Kevin) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                (AGREED) NOTICE of Motion by Keith V. Rockey for presentment of extension of time 65 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 5/12/2011 at 08:30 AM. (Rockey, Keith) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Defendant Caribou Coffee Co., Inc. for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead (AGREED) (Rockey, Keith) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Meijer, Inc. (Donoghue, Robert) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to amended complaint, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Meijer, Inc. against Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC. by Meijer, Inc.(Donoghue, Robert) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Accor North America (Donoghue, Robert) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to amended complaint, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Accor North America against Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC. by Accor North America(Donoghue, Robert) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            (UNOPPOSED) NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Oscar Canales for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief 59 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 5/12/2011 at 08:30 AM. (Canales, Daniel) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Defendant Panera Bread Company for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint,, 31 Or Otherwise Plead (Canales, Daniel) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Panera Bread Company by Daniel Oscar Canales (Canales, Daniel) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to amended complaint, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Cosi, Inc. against Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC. by Cosi, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Answer Part 2)(O'Shea, Kevin) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to amended complaint, COUNTERCLAIM filed by CBC Restaurant Corp. against Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC. by CBC Restaurant Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Answer Part 2)(O'Shea, Kevin) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to amended complaint, COUNTERCLAIM filed by ABP Corporation against Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC. by ABP Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Answer Part 2)(O'Shea, Kevin) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to amended complaint (ECF Doc. # 31) of Defendant LQ Management, LLC, and COUNTERCLAIM filed by LQ Management LLC against Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC. by LQ Management LLC(Bertocchi, Joel) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The status hearing scheduled for 5/10/2011 at 8:30a.m. is reset to 5/10/2011 at 9:30a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cosi, Inc. by Kevin John O'Shea (O'Shea, Kevin) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CBC Restaurant Corp. by Kevin John O'Shea (O'Shea, Kevin) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant ABP Corporation by Kevin John O'Shea (O'Shea, Kevin) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Defendant Dominick's Supermarkets, Inc.'s unopposed motion for enlargement of time until 5/27/2011 in which to respond to the amended complaint is granted. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS Report , JOINT INITIAL by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Steven P. Mandell for presentment of extension of time 46 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 5/9/2011 at 08:30 AM. (Mandell, Steven) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Defendant Dominick's Supermarkets, Inc. for extension of time to respond to amended complaint-unopposed (Mandell, Steven) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Dominick's Supermarkets, Inc. by Steven P. Mandell (Mandell, Steven) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Dominick's Supermarkets, Inc. by Sharon Renae Albrecht (Albrecht, Sharon) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Dominick's Supermarkets, Inc. by Steven L. Baron (Baron, Steven) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC as to DEFENDANT KIMPTON HOTEL & RESTAURANT GROUP, LLC (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Motion by Neil J. McNabnay to appear pro hac vice on behalf of defendant, LQ Management is granted. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-5925391. on behalf of LQ Management (Mcnabnay, Neil) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Motion by James G. Goggin to appear pro hac vice on behalf of defendant, Cosi, Inc. is granted. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-5900633. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Courts Admitted to Practice)(Goggin, James) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Accor North America, Meijer, Inc. by Daniel Long Farris (Farris, Daniel) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Accor North America, Meijer, Inc. by Robert David Donoghue (Donoghue, Robert) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Caribou Coffee Co., Inc. by Matthew L. DePreter (DePreter, Matthew) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Caribou Coffee Co., Inc. by Keith V. Rockey (Rockey, Keith) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Caribou Coffee Co., Inc. by Avani C Macaluso (Macaluso, Avani) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang:The Court has placed this case into the Seventh Circuit Electronic Discovery Pilot Program. The Court therefore will apply the standing order relating to the discovery of electronically stored information ("ESI") (See Attachment #1). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the standing order and with the principles relating to the discovery of electronically stored information that underlies the standing order, and shall use the standing order and those principles in addressing any discovery disputes that may arise in this case concerning ESI. Mailed notice (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order Relating to the Discovery of Electronically Stored Information) (slb, ) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First Amended and Supplemental Complaint for Patent Infringement AMENDED complaint by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q Part 1, # 18 Exhibit Q Part 2)(McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kimpton Hotel & Restaurant Group, LLC by Sharon R. Barner (Barner, Sharon) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Plaintiff's motion to file the first amended complaint 27 is granted. Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint which was attached to the motion on or before 4/8/2011. Defendants to answer or otherwise plead on or before 5/6/2011. The new date for the answer moots Defendant Caribou Coffee's request for an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead. The status hearing scheduled for 4/19/2011 is reset to 5/10/2011 at 8:30a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Matthew G. McAndrews for presentment of motion to supplement 27 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 4/11/2011 at 08:30 AM. (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Plaintiff Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC to supplement AND AMEND COMPLAINT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by LQ Management LLC(Bertocchi, Joel) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by Matthew G. McAndrews for presentment of extension of time 24 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 4/7/2011 at 08:30 AM. (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Plaintiff Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC for extension of time FOR DEFENDANT CARIBOU COFFEE CO., INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION by the Plaintiff and Kimpton Hotel & Restaurant Group, subject to the approval of the Court, that defendant Kimpton Hotel & Restaurant Group's time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint be extended to Monday, May 2, 2011 (Spivey, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kimpton Hotel & Restaurant Group, LLC by Jonathan R Spivey (Spivey, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC as to Meijer, Inc. on 3/18/2011, answer due 4/8/2011. (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC as to Panera Bread Company on 3/14/2011, answer due 4/4/2011. (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant LQ Management LLC by Joel David Bertocchi (Bertocchi, Joel) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC as to Caribou Coffee Co., Inc. on 3/11/2011, answer due 4/1/2011. (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC as to Kimpton Hotel & Restaurant Group, LLC on 3/11/2011, answer due 4/1/2011. (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC as to ABP Corporation on 3/11/2011, answer due 4/1/2011. (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC as to CBC Restaurant Corp. on 3/11/2011, answer due 4/1/2011. (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC as to LQ Management LLC on 3/11/2011, answer due 4/1/2011. (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status hearing set for April 19, 2011 at 8:30a.m. At least 4 business days before the initial status in this case, please file a joint initial status report (with a courtesy copy to the Courtroom Deputy), containing the following information: 1) The nature of the case, including the legal and factual issues; 2) Pending Motions and Case Plan; 3) Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge; and 4) Status of Settlement Discussions. Please refer to the accompanying minute order when preparing the joint initial status report. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC as to Accor North America on 3/11/2011, answer due 4/1/2011. (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC as to Dominick's Supermarkets, Inc. on 3/10/2011, answer due 3/31/2011. (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC as to Cosi, Inc. on 3/10/2011, answer due 3/31/2011. (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants ABP Corporation, Accor North America, CBC Restaurant Corp., Caribou Coffee Co., Inc., Cosi, Inc., Dominick's Supermarkets, Inc., Kimpton Hotel & Restaurant Group, LLC, LQ Management LLC, Meijer, Inc., Panera Bread Company. (kj, ) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC by Gabriel I Opatken (Opatken, Gabriel) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC by Brian Erik Haan (Haan, Brian) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC by Raymond Pardo Niro, Jr (Niro, Raymond) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Local Rule 3.4 Notice of Claims Involving Patents by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC by Matthew G. McAndrews (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CIVIL Cover Sheet (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT filed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-5777603. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N)(McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 315 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?