Howard v. Inland SBA Management Corp.

Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-07905
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 4:47 AM EST (6.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Crystal G. Howard, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Offices of Everett O. Martindale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Waite P. Stuhl +1 314 726 1182 +1 314 863 1904 wstuhl@sbcglobal.net
v.
No Logo Inland SBA Management Corp., Defendant

Represented by Baum Sigman Auerbach & Neuman, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Catherine Marie Chapman +1 312 236 4316 cchapman@baumsigman.com
Space Jennifer L. Dunitz-Geiringer +1 312 236 4316 jdunitz.geiringer@baumsigman.com
No Logo Somercor 504, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Galvin & Mlawski

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Navdeep Kaur Gill +1 312 209 7982 navdeep_gill@hotmail.com

Represented by Korey Cotter Heather & Richardson, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan D Gibson +1 312 372 7075 rgibson@kchrlaw.com
Space Carter A. Korey +1 312 372 7075 +1 312 372 7076 ckorey@kchrlaw.com
Space Elliot S. Richardson +1 312 372 7075 +1 312 372 7076 erichardson@kchrlaw.com

Represented by koreyrichardsonlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Britney Zilz +1 312 372 7075 +1 312 372 7076 bzilz@koreyrichardsonlaw.com
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Timeline
  Entries (120) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation to Dismiss (Korey, Carter) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held on 11/4/2014. Joint status report to be filed by 11/12/2014. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Telephone conference held with counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant Somercor on 10/29/14 concerning an issue that has arisen in connection with documentation of their settlement. The parties currently are set for status before the District Judge on 11/4/14. If this case needs to be re-referred to the Magistrate Judge for settlement follow-up, the parties should so inform the District Judge. The parties also are free to arrange another telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge even without a formal settlement referral, as they did to set up today's call, if they feel that would be helpful or productive. Mailed notice (ber, ) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing set for 11/4/2014 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert:Settlement conference held on 10/10/14. The parties resolved the case. All matters for which this case was referred having been addressed, the referral is terminated and the case returned to the assigned District Judge. Referral terminated. Judge Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert no longer referred to the case.Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Telephone conference held with counsel for all parties on 9/29/14. The parties have confirmed a settlement conference for 10/10/14 commencing at 9:30 a.m. By 10/3/14, Defendants shall produce to Plaintiff's counsel any insurance policy under which "an insurance business may be liable to satisfy all or part of a possible judgment," within the meaning of FRCP 26(a)(1)(iv), including, for these purposes, any insurance policy issued by an insurance business that has as of this time has denied any claim submitted by the insured. Mailed notice (lp, ) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Plaintiff's counsel encountered travel difficulties and is unable to appear in person for the settlement conference scheduled for today, 9/23/14, at 1:30 p.m. Accordingly, the settlement conference is stricken and will be rescheduled. The Court held a telephone conference with counsel for all parties and suggested re-scheduling the settlement conference to 10/10/14 at 9:30 a.m. Counsel will confer with their clients and any insurance representatives that must be present in person at the settlement conference per the Court's Standing Order for Settlement Conference, and call chambers by the close of business on 9/26/14 or, if that date does not work because of the intervening holiday, then by the close of business on 9/29/14, to confirm the changed date and time for the settlement conference. If that date does not work for all concerned, the Court will reconvene a telephone conference to choose another date. Mailed notice (ber, ) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Britney Zilz for presentment of extension of time 110 before Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert on 9/16/2014 at 09:15 AM. (Zilz, Britney) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None extension of time
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: The parties confirmed a settlement conference for 9/23/14 at 1:30 p.m. Plaintiff's settlement letter shall be delivered to Defendants, with a copy delivered to the Court, in chambers, on or before 9/9/14. Defendants' settlement letter shall be delivered to Plaintiff, with a copy delivered to the Court, in chambers, on or before 9/16/14. Settlement letters are not to be filed on the CM-ECF system. Mailed notice (ber, ) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Status hearing held on 7/15/14. Counsel will schedule a date for a settlement conference. Once that date is confirmed, the Court will enter an order setting the dates for the exchange of settlement letters. Mailed notice (ber, ) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Gilbert to conduct a settlement conference. Status hearing scheduled for 7/15/14 at 10:00 a.m. Prior to the status hearing, the parties shall familiarize themselves with the subjects referenced in Magistrate Judge Gilbert's Standing Order for Settlement Conference posted on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges as applicable to referral cases. If the parties would like to schedule a date for a settlement conference prior to the status hearing, they shall contact the Court's chambers at 312-435-5672, to obtain dates the Court has available to conduct a settlement conference. The status hearing will proceed regardless of whether a date has been reserved for a settlement conference. Mailed notice (ber, ) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: Settlement Conference.(tbk, )Mailed notice. (Entered: 06/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held on 6/18/2014. Case being referred to Magistrate Judge Gilbert for settlement. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing date of 5/30/2014 is stricken and Status hearing reset for 6/18/2014 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Somercor 504, Inc. by Britney Zilz (Zilz, Britney) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held on 4/23/2014. Further Status hearing set for 5/30/2014 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing date of 4/15/2014 is stricken and Status hearing reset for 4/23/2014 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
ENTER MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: the Court grants Defendants' motions for summary judgment [62, 73] with respect to Counts I, III, and IV and denies Defendants' motions with respect to Count II. Status hearing set for 4/15/2014 at 09:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 3/26/2014: Mailed notice(tbk, ) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Somercor 504, Inc. in support of motion for summary judgment 62 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Korey, Carter) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
REPLY by Somercor 504, Inc. to Response 86 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Korey, Carter) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
REPLY by Defendant Inland SBA Management Corp. in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Chapman, Catherine) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: MOTION by Defendant Somercor 504, Inc. for leave to file 94 excess pages Instanter is granted. Notice of Motion date of 10/24/2013 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Carter A. Korey for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 94 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 10/24/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Korey, Carter) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Somercor 504, Inc. for leave to file excess pages Instanter (Korey, Carter) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Defendants' Joint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time 91 to File Their Reply brief in support of motions for summary judgment, to and including 10/23/2013, is granted. Notice of Motion date of 10/2/2013 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Carter A. Korey for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply,, motion for relief,,,,, 91 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 10/2/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Korey, Carter) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Somercor 504, Inc. for extension of time to file response/reply as to Response 86 , Response 85 , memorandum in opposition to motion 84 Defendants' Joint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Their Reply (Korey, Carter) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry MOTION by Plaintiff Crystal G. Howard for leave to file 89 documents at Docket Entry Nos. 84 through 88 is granted. Defendants are given an extension of time until 10/2/2013 in which to file reply briefs. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Crystal G. Howard for leave to file documents at Docket Entry Nos. 84 through 88. Plaintiff's request for leave to file the documents is CONENTED-TO by the defendants. (Stuhl, Waite) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE by Crystal G. Howard re memorandum in opposition to motion 84 Plaintiff's Exhibits 5 through 9 to her memorandum in opposition to defendants' motions for summary judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 5, # 2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 7, # 4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhbit 8, # 5 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 9)(Stuhl, Waite) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE by Crystal G. Howard re memorandum in opposition to motion 84 Filing Plaintiff's Exhibits to her memorandum in opposition to defendants' motions for summary judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 4)(Stuhl, Waite) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Plaintiff Crystal G. Howard to statement,, 63 to SomerCor 504 Rule 56.1 Statement of Undisputed Facts (Stuhl, Waite) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Plaintiff Crystal G. Howard to Rule 56 statement 75 of Inland SBA Management Corp. (Stuhl, Waite) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Crystal G. Howard in Opposition to motion for summary judgment 73 , motion for summary judgment 62 (Stuhl, Waite) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: MOTION by Plaintiff Crystal G. Howard for extension of time 28 to file response, in excess of fifteen pages, as to motion for summary judgment 73 , is granted to and including 9/6/2013. Defendants are given until 9/27/2013 to file reply brief. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Crystal G. Howard for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for summary judgment 73 , motion for summary judgment 62 (CONSENTED-TO BY DEFENDANTS) Motion includes request for leave (consented-to) to file response in excess of fifteen pages. (Stuhl, Waite) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Unopposed MOTION by Plaintiff Crystal G. Howard for extension of time 79 to file response as to motion for summary judgment, to and including 8/30/2013, is granted. Defendants are given to and including 9/20/2013 to file reply brief. Notice of Motion date of 8/7/2013 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Waite P. Stuhl for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief, 79 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 8/7/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Stuhl, Waite) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Crystal G. Howard for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for summary judgment 73 , motion for summary judgment 62 Request additional time to August 30, 2013 (Stuhl, Waite) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: MOTION by Defendant Inland SBA Management Corp.to Substitute Affidavit 76 is granted. Notice of Motion date of 7/2/2013 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Catherine Marie Chapman for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 76 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 7/2/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Chapman, Catherine) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Inland SBA Management Corp.to Substitute Affidavit (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Chapman, Catherine) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
RULE 56.1 Statement by Inland SBA Management Corp. regarding motion for summary judgment 73 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-5, # 2 Exhibit 6.1, # 3 Exhibit 6.2, # 4 Exhibit 6.3, # 5 Exhibit 7-13)(Chapman, Catherine) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Inland SBA Management Corp. in support of motion for summary judgment 73 (Chapman, Catherine) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Inland SBA Management Corp. for summary judgment (Chapman, Catherine) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Somercor 504, Inc. in support of motion for summary judgment 62 (Korey, Carter) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
EXHIBIT by Defendant Somercor 504, Inc. Deposition Transcript of Terry Boston regarding statement,, 63 (Korey, Carter) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
EXHIBIT by Defendant Somercor 504, Inc. Deposition Transcript of Nicole Harraway regarding statement,, 63 (Korey, Carter) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
EXHIBIT by Defendant Somercor 504, Inc. Deposition Transcript of Myra Smith regarding statement,, 63 (Korey, Carter) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
EXHIBIT by Defendant Somercor 504, Inc. Deposition Transcript of Nora O'Connor regarding statement,, 63 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Korey, Carter) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
EXHIBIT by Defendant Somercor 504, Inc. Deposition Transcript of Mickey Maslic regarding statement,, 63 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Korey, Carter) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
EXHIBIT by Defendant Somercor 504, Inc. Deposition Transcript of Crystal Howard regarding statement,, 63 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-16)(Korey, Carter) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
EXHIBIT by Defendant Somercor 504, Inc. Deposition Transcript of David Frank regarding statement,, 63 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Korey, Carter) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
EXHIBIT by Defendant Somercor 504, Inc. Deposition Transcript of Howard Jaffee regarding statement,, 63 (Korey, Carter) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
Undisputed Material Facts Pursuant to Local Rule 56.1 STATEMENT by Somercor 504, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z)(Korey, Carter) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Somercor 504, Inc. for summary judgment (Korey, Carter) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: MOTION by Defendant Somercor 504, Inc. for leave to file 59 Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment in Excess of Fifteen Pages, Instanter, is granted. Notice of Motion date of 6/20/2013 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Carter A. Korey for presentment of motion for leave to file 59 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 6/20/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Korey, Carter) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Somercor 504, Inc. for leave to file Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment in Excess of Fifteen Pages, Instanter (Korey, Carter) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held on 5/8/2013. Schedule for filing of defendants dispositive motions is extended to 6/22/2013; plaintiff's response due by 8/1/2013; defendants replies due by 8/22/2013; ruling will be by mail. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: MOTION by Defendants Inland SBA Management Corp., Somercor 504, Inc. to compel the Deposition of Terry Boston or in the Alternative Motion to Bar the Testimony of Terry Boston 53 is denied without prejudice as moot in light of the agreement of the parties as follows: The deposition of Terry Boston is to go forward on 5/7/2013 at 4:00 p.m. at the offices of counsel for Defendant Somercor 504, Inc. The Court appreciates the cooperation of the parties, the witness, and the witness's employer in arranging for this deposition to go forward so that discovery may be complete and the case may move forward toward disposition. The deadline for the filing of dispositive motions is extended to 6/15/2013. Status hearing date of 5/8/2013 at 9:00a.m. to stand. The Court anticipates setting a briefing schedule on the dispositive motions at the next status hearing. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
REPLY by Somercor 504, Inc. to Response 55 to Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony of Terry Boston (Gill, Navdeep) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Plaintiff Crystal G. Howard to Defendant's Joint Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony of Terry Boston (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Stuhl, Waite) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Carter A. Korey for presentment of motion to compel, 53 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 4/24/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Korey, Carter) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendants Inland SBA Management Corp., Somercor 504, Inc. to compel the Deposition of Terry Boston or in the Alternative Motion to Bar the Testimony of Terry Boston (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Korey, Carter) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held on 3/6/2013. Status hearing set for 5/8/2013 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
AGREED ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 2/15/2013. (mgh, ) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: ENTER AGREED ORDER: The parties agree to strike pending motions [39, 41 and 45] as moot. Mailed notice [For further details see separate order(s).] (mgh,) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
Proposed Agreed Order by Somercor 504, Inc. Inland SBA Management Corporation & Crystal G. Howard (Korey, Carter) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Based on the representations of counsel that all parties have been working together cooperatively in an attempt to present an agreed order, the MOTION by Defendant Somercor 504, Inc. to compel the Disclosure of Documents 39 , MOTION by Defendant Inland SBA Management Corp. for extension of time 41 to complete discovery or to deem response to discovery as incomplete, and MOTION by Plaintiff Crystal G. Howard for extension of time 45 to complete discovery are taken under advisement. By agreement, the parties are to submit a proposed order by 2/13/2013, at which time the Court anticipates striking all three motions [39, 41, 45] as moot. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 02/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/3/2013, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Crystal G. Howard to MOTION by Defendant Inland SBA Management Corp. for extension of time to complete discovery or to deem response to discovery as incomplete 41 , MOTION by Defendant Somercor 504, Inc. to compel the Disclosure of Documents 39 (Stuhl, Waite) (Entered: 02/03/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Waite P. Stuhl for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery 45 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 2/6/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Stuhl, Waite) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Crystal G. Howard for extension of time to complete discovery (noticed depositions cancelled due to illness of counsel) (Stuhl, Waite) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Catherine Marie Chapman for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery, 41 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 2/6/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Chapman, Catherine) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Carter A. Korey for presentment of motion to compel 39 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 2/6/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Korey, Carter) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Catherine Marie Chapman for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery, 41 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 1/31/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Chapman, Catherine) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Inland SBA Management Corp. for extension of time to complete discovery or to deem response to discovery as incomplete (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, # 2 Exhibit Defendant's 1st Req. for Docs., # 3 Exhibit plaintiff's rule 26 disclosures, # 4 Exhibit Plaintiff's supp.resp.to req. for docs., # 5 Exhibit deposition transcript excerpts)(Chapman, Catherine) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Carter A. Korey for presentment of motion to compel 39 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 1/31/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Korey, Carter) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Somercor 504, Inc. to compel the Disclosure of Documents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Korey, Carter) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: MOTION by Plaintiff Crystal G. Howard for extension of time 37 to complete discovery, to and including 2/1/2013, is granted. Status hearing date of 3/6/2013 at 9:00a.m. to stand. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Crystal G. Howard for extension of time to complete discovery (JOINTLY REQUESTED BY ALL PARTIES) (Stuhl, Waite) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held on 10/2/2012. By agreement, fact discovery cutoff is extended to 12/31/2012. Status hearing set for 3/6/2013 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Somercor 504, Inc. by Ryan D Gibson (Gibson, Ryan) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing date of 9/18/2012 is stricken and Status hearing reset for 10/2/2012 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Somercor 504, Inc. by Navdeep Kaur Gill (Gill, Navdeep) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None
Defendant SomerCor 504, Inc.'s ANSWER to amended complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Somercor 504, Inc.(Korey, Carter) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 31 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 6/11/2012: Before the Court is Defendant's motion to dismiss 15 pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). For the reasons below, Defendant'smotion 15 is denied. The stay of discovery [see 30] is lifted and the case remains set for status on 9/18/2012 at 9:00 a.m. [see 25]. Mailed notice(tbk, ) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: MOTION by Defendant Somercor 504, Inc. to stay 28 all discovery, including the requirement to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by 6/4/2012, pending this court's ruling on SomerCor's Motion to Dismiss, is granted without objection from Plaintiff. Notice of Motion date of 5/30/2012 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Carter A. Korey for presentment of motion to stay 28 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 5/30/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Korey, Carter) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Somercor 504, Inc. to stay (Korey, Carter) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None
REPLY by Somercor 504, Inc. to MOTION by Defendant Somercor 504, Inc. to dismiss 15 (Korey, Carter) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None
ANSWER to amended complaint by Inland SBA Management Corp.(Chapman, Catherine) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing set for 9/18/2012 at 09:00 AM. The Court adopts the following discovery plan: 1. Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1), parties to disclose by 6/4/2012; 2. All motions to join other parties and to amend the pleadings shall be filed by 6/22/2012; 3. All fact discovery to be completed by 10/1/2012; 4. Plaintiff to identify any expert witnesses and provide reports by 11/1/2012; 5. Plaintiff's experts, if any, shall be deposed by 12/1/2012; 6. Defendants shall identify any expert witnesses and provide reports by 1/1/2013; 7. Defendants' experts, if any, to be deposed by 2/1/2013; 8. All expert discovery to be completed by 2/1/2013; and 9. Dispositive motions, if any, shall be filed by 3/15/2013. If there are no experts, then such motions to be filed by 1/1/2013. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Stuhl, Waite) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: MOTION by Defendant Somercor 504, Inc. to dismiss 15 is taken under advisement; response filed 22 ; reply due by 5/22/2012; ruling will be by mail. Notice of Motion date of 5/8/2012 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Crystal G. Howardin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Somercor 504, Inc. to dismiss 15 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Stuhl, Waite) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 21 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
AMENDED complaint by Crystal G. Howard against All Defendants (Stuhl, Waite) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
AMENDED complaint by Crystal G. Howard against Crystal G. Howard (Stuhl, Waite) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Inland SBA Management Corp., Somercor 504, Inc. by Catherine Marie Chapman (Chapman, Catherine) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Inland SBA Management Corp., Somercor 504, Inc. by Jennifer L. Dunitz-Geiringer (Dunitz-Geiringer, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Carter A. Korey for presentment of motion to dismiss 15 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 5/8/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Korey, Carter) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Somercor 504, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss 15 (Korey, Carter) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Somercor 504, Inc. to dismiss (Korey, Carter) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Somercor 504, Inc. by Carter A. Korey (Korey, Carter) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Somercor 504, Inc. by Elliot S. Richardson (Richardson, Elliot) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held on 4/18/2012. MOTION by Plaintiff Crystal G. Howard for order waiving the local counsel requirement 11 is granted. Plaintiff to file an amended complaint by 4/27/2012. A joint discovery plan to be filed by 5/4/2012. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Crystal G. Howard for order waiving the local counsel requirement (Stuhl, Waite) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/14/2012, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Crystal G. Howard regarding summons and complaint served on SomerCor 504, Inc. on 04/13/2012 (Stuhl, Waite) (Entered: 04/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
STATUS Report (Jointly Submitted) by Crystal G. Howard (Stuhl, Waite) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing date of 3/15/2012 is stricken and initial status hearing reset for 4/18/2012 at 09:00 AM. Parties to prepare and submit a joint status report on or before 4/13/2012. (See Judges web page for status report. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crystal G. Howard on 2/14/12. (Stuhl, Waite) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 3/9/2012 (smm). (Entered: 03/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing set for 3/15/2012 at 09:00 AM. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Parties to prepare and submit a joint status report on or before 3/12/2012. (See Judges web page for status report Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr:Motion of Waite P. Stuhl for leave to appear pro hac vice 4 on behalf of Plaintiff Crystal G. Howard is granted. Mailed notice (smm) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6572415. (Stuhl, Waite) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
PAYMENT regarding 1 of Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-6550210. (Stuhl, Waite) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
CIVIL Cover Sheet. (smm) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Crystal G. Howard (Exhibits). (smm) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 31 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 6/11/2012: Before the Court is Defendant's motion to dismiss 15 pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). For the reasons below, Defendant'smotion 15 is denied. The stay of discovery [see 30] is lifted and the case remains set for status on 9/18/2012 at 9:00 a.m. [see 25]. Mailed notice(tbk, )
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 184 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?