Shepard et al v. Madigan et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Southern District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-00405
District Judge William D. Stiehl, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2017 at 3:04 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Illinois State Rifle Association, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William N. Howard +1 312 360 6415 +1 312 360 6996

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com
Space David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freeborn & Peters LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/08/2011 Jeffery Moore Cross +1 312 360 6000 +7508 750 750 8600 jcross@freebornpeters.com
Space Jeffery Moore Cross +1 312 360 6000 +7508 750 750 8600 jcross@freebornpeters.com
No Logo Mary Shepard, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William N. Howard +1 312 360 6415 +1 312 360 6996

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com
Space David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freeborn & Peters LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/08/2011 Jeffery Moore Cross +1 312 360 6000 +7508 750 750 8600 jcross@freebornpeters.com
Space Jeffery Moore Cross +1 312 360 6000 +7508 750 750 8600 jcross@freebornpeters.com
v.
No Logo Governor Patrick J Quinn, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by 12th Floor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
solely in his official capacity as Governor of the State of Illinois David Andrew Simpson +1 312 814 3419 +1 312 814 5166 dasimpson@atg.state.il.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Illinois Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
solely in his official capacity as Governor of the State of Illinois Karen L McNaught +1 217 782 1841 +1 217 524 5091 kmcnaught@atg.state.il.us

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Illinois

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
solely in his official capacity as Governor of the State of Illinois Terence J Corrigan +1 217 782 5819 +1 217 524 5091 tcorrigan@atg.state.il.us
solely in his official capacity as Governor of the State of Illinois Karl R Triebel +1 312 814 2391 +1 312 814 2253 ktriebel@atg.state.il.us
No Logo Lisa M Madigan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by 12th Floor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
solely in her official capacity as Attorney General of Illinois David Andrew Simpson +1 312 814 3419 +1 312 814 5166 dasimpson@atg.state.il.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Illinois Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
solely in her official capacity as Attorney General of Illinois Karen L McNaught +1 217 782 1841 +1 217 524 5091 kmcnaught@atg.state.il.us

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Illinois

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
solely in her official capacity as Attorney General of Illinois Terence J Corrigan +1 217 782 5819 +1 217 524 5091 tcorrigan@atg.state.il.us
solely in her official capacity as Attorney General of Illinois Karl R Triebel +1 312 814 2391 +1 312 814 2253 ktriebel@atg.state.il.us
No Logo Sheriff David Livesay, Defendant

Represented by Bleyer & Bleyer

No Logo Tyler R Edmonds, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by 12th Floor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
solely in his official capacity as the State's Attorney of Union County, Illinois David Andrew Simpson +1 312 814 3419 +1 312 814 5166 dasimpson@atg.state.il.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Illinois Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
solely in his official capacity as the State's Attorney of Union County, Illinois Karen L McNaught +1 217 782 1841 +1 217 524 5091 kmcnaught@atg.state.il.us

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Illinois

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
solely in his official capacity as the State's Attorney of Union County, Illinois Terence J Corrigan +1 217 782 5819 +1 217 524 5091 tcorrigan@atg.state.il.us
solely in his official capacity as the State's Attorney of Union County, Illinois Karl R Triebel +1 312 814 2391 +1 312 814 2253 ktriebel@atg.state.il.us
No Logo Brady Center To Prevent Gun Violence, Amicus Curiae

Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

No Logo National Rifle Association of America, Amicus Curiae
Officially listed as "National Rifle Association of America, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (135) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER. In September 2014, Plaintiffs in this Second Amendment challenge were declared prevailing parties by the undersigned and awarded over $530,000 in attorneys' fees, expenses, and taxable costs. Defendants appealed that order, and Plaintiffs contemporaneously filed a supplemental fee petition (i.e., to collect the fees they incurred in seeking their fees). Now Plaintiffs, indicating Defendants have agreed to dismiss their appeal with prejudice as part of a settlement, have moved to withdraw their supplemental petition. The new motion indicates that the parties' settlement requires appropriations from Illinois' FY 2016 budget, and that Defendants have agreed not to oppose (on timeliness grounds) the re-filing of the supplemental fee petition in this Court should those appropriations fall through. This order obviously has no effect on proceedings at the Court of Appeals, and should a supplemental fee petition be re-filed here, the undersigned will deal with potential jurisdictional implications at that time. But for now, Plaintiffs' motion to withdraw (Doc. 134 ) is GRANTED, and their supplemental fee petition (Doc. 125 ) is WITHDRAWN. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 7/7/2015. (jls)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 07/07/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 134 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
    MOTION to Withdraw 125 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees by Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER. Defendants have appealed the undersigned's September 29 Order, in which $533,603.80 was awarded to Plaintiffs (who successfully challenged the constitutionality of three Illinois gun law provisions). Plaintiffs' supplemental motion for fees (in which they seek recompense for efforts to recover the $533,603.80) was filed on October 17, 2014, and is set to ripen on November 10. District courts generally retain jurisdiction to address fee awards despite the filing of an appeal. U.S. v. Brown, 732 F.3d 781, 787 (7th Cir. 2013). But because (1) the fee award itself is central to the appeal rather than an "ancillary issue," and (2) the ultimate success of Plaintiffs' fee litigation will bear directly on the supplemental fee award, see Richardson v. City of Chi., 740 F.3d 1099, 1103 (7th Cir. 2014), the undersigned concludes that postponing resolution of the supplemental fee issue would essentially "avoid the confusion of placing the same matter before two courts at the same time," Brown, 732 F.3d at 787. Briefing on Plaintiffs' supplemental motion for attorney's fees is accordingly STAYED. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 10/30/2014. (jls)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 10/30/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None
        USCA Case Number 14-3403 for 129 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tyler R Edmonds, Patrick J Quinn, Lisa M Madigan. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Docketing)(anm) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 131 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None
          Rule 10 Letter. Appeal Record due to be prepared by 11/13/2014. (anm) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
            LREF
            Blank 130 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None
            Transmission of Short Record to US Court of Appeals re 129 Notice of Appeal. (anm) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
              LREF
              Blank 129 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 124 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion for Bill of Costs, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,, by Tyler R Edmonds, Lisa M Madigan, Patrick J Quinn. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0754-2434913. (Corrigan, Terence) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER granting 126 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' unopposed motion to respond to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Motion for Fees is GRANTED. Response due by 11/3/2014; reply due by 11/10/2014. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 10/29/2014. (jls)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 10/29/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 127 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None
                  RESPONSE to Motion re 126 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 125 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
                    LREF
                    Blank 126 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 125 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees by Tyler R Edmonds, Lisa M Madigan, Patrick J Quinn. (Corrigan, Terence) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None
                      Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees by Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Supplemental Declaration of David H. Thompson, # 2 Exhibit Supplemental Declaration of William N. Howard)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 10/17/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 124 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        MEMORANDUM & ORDER. For the reasons explained in the attached Memorandum & Order, (1) Plaintiffs are held to be prevailing parties; (2) Plaintiffs' Motion to Cite Supplemental Authority (Doc. 121 ) is GRANTED; and (3) Plaintiffs' Motion Seeking Fees, Expenses, and Costs (Doc. 106 ) is GRANTED IN PART. Defendants shall compensate Plaintiffs in the amount of $533,603.80, as detailed herein. Briefing regarding fees for work on the fee petition shall commence according to the schedule and page limitations found on page 23. See attached for details. Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 9/29/2014. (jls) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                          LREF
                          Blank 123 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None
                          RESPONSE to Motion re 121 MOTION To Cite Supplemental Authority filed by Tyler R Edmonds, Lisa M Madigan, Patrick J Quinn. (Corrigan, Terence) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER. In a brief not to exceed three pages, Defendants may respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Cite Supplemental Authority on or before 7/23/2014. Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 7/17/2014. (jls)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 121 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                              MOTION To Cite Supplemental Authority by Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                LREF
                                Blank 120 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 106 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                  OBJECTION to 106 Motion for Attorney Fees, Motion for Bill of Costs,, by Tyler R Edmonds, Lisa M Madigan, Patrick J Quinn . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 through 14)(Corrigan, Terence) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER. On the day their response to Plaintiffs' Bill of Costs and Attorneys' Fees was due, Defendants moved for leave to file a response brief in excess of 20 pages. Yesterday, Plaintiffs (indicating they have no objection to Defendants' motion) asked for leave to reply in a brief up to 20 pages long (and for 30 days in which to reply once Defendants file their brief). Both unopposed motions (Doc. 116 and Doc. 117 ) are GRANTED, since the factual examination required for assessing such a large bill of costs and fees (over $640,000 total) is extensive. Defendants' response brief shall be due by close of business today(April 24, 2014), and Plaintiffs' reply brief shall be due on or before close of business on May 27, 2014. Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 4/24/2014. (jls)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                      MOTION for Extension of Time and Expansion of Page Limits by Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 116 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Twenty Pages by Tyler R Edmonds, Lisa M Madigan, Patrick J Quinn. (Corrigan, Terence) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting 114 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Response due by 4/18/2014. Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 4/16/2014. (jls)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 114 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 106 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Bill of Costs , 107 Memorandum in Support of Motion Agreed Motion for Extension of Time by Lisa M Madigan, Patrick J Quinn. (McNaught, Karen) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER. Defendants (who indicate the parties are working to settle Plaintiffs' pending Bill of Costs) have moved for an extension of time in which to reply to that Bill of Costs. Defendants' motions (Doc. 111 , Doc. 112 ) are GRANTED. Their responses to Plaintiffs' Bill of Costs shall be due on or before April 15, 2014. (Defentants' responses due by 4/15/2014; replies due by 4/29/2014.). Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 3/17/2014. (jls)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 112 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs Fee Petition by David Livesay. (Bleyer, Joseph) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 111 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Fee Petition [106, 107] by Tyler R Edmonds, Lisa M Madigan, Patrick J Quinn. (McNaught, Karen) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 110 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER GRANTING 108 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to motion for attorneys' fees. Defense response is due on or before 3/17/2014. Court grants LIMITED discovery, see order for specifics.Signed by Judge William D. Stiehl on 1/17/2014. (jaf) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 109 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 108 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Fee Petition and Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery filed by Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 108 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Fee Petition and Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery by Tyler R Edmonds, Lisa M Madigan, Patrick J Quinn. (McNaught, Karen) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 107 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 106 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 106 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION for Attorney Fees , MOTION for Bill of Costs by Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David H. Thompson, # 2 Declaration of William N. Howard, # 3 Declaration of Stephen P. Halbrook)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 105 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                              BILL OF COSTS by Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard. (Attachments: # 1 A - Itemization for Fees, # 2 Supporting Invoices)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 104 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                MANDATE of USCA as to 91 Notice of Appeal filed by Mary Shepard, Illinois State Rifle Association, affirming the judgment of the District Court. (anm) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 103 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  Amended Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 91 Notice of Appeal (trb) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    Acknowledgment of receipt of Record on Appeal by USCA 7 re 91 Notice of Appeal (1 vol. of pleadings) (cekf) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 91 Notice of Appeal (trb) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        Request from USCA to transmit Record on Appeal re 91 Notice of Appeal (cjo) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 99 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting 98 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties SHALL file briefs as to the issue of the award of costs and fees within thirty (30)days of the issuance of the mandate resolving plaintiffs appeal to the Seventh Circuit. Responses SHALL be filed within ten (10) days thereafter. Signed by Judge William D. Stiehl on 08/07/2013. (jst) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 98 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time for Filing a Request for Costs and Attorneys' Fees by Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard. (Howard, William) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION SHEET by Attorney/Pro Se Party (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 96 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: 7/30/2013 USCA Case Number
                                                                                USCA Case Number 13-2661 for 91 Notice of Appeal filed by Mary Shepard, Illinois State Rifle Association. (drb) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: 7/30/2013 USCA Appeal Fees
                                                                                  USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number 44625001996 re 91 Notice of Appeal filed by Mary Shepard, Illinois State Rifle Association. (jdh) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 94 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: 7/30/2013 Rule 10 Letter
                                                                                    Circuit Rule 10 Letter. Appeal Record due to be prepared by 8/13/2013. (jlrr ) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 93 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: 7/30/2013 Transmission of Short Record to USCA
                                                                                      Transmission of Short Record to US Court of Appeals re 91 Notice of Appeal (jlrr) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: 7/30/2013 Notice Striking Electronically Filed Documents
                                                                                        NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking 90 Notice (Other) filed by Mary Shepard, Illinois State Rifle Association. Efiler chose the incorrect event when filing the Notice of Appeal. Clerk's office has refiled the Notice of Appeal using the correct event. Efiler is instructed to call the Clerk's office to pay the $455 filing fee for the Notice of Appeal. (jlrr )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 91 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: 7/30/2013 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 89 Order Dismissing Case by Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard. (jlrr ) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 90 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: 7/29/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                            STRICKEN-NOTICE by Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard NOTICE OF APPEAL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Howard, William) Modified on 7/30/2013 (jlrr ). (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 89 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: 7/26/2013 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER DISMISSING CASE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. MOTION for Declaration of Unconstitutionality and Preliminary and/or Permanent Injunction 75 filed by Mary Shepard, Illinois State Rifle Association is DISMISSED; MOTION to Expedite Briefing 76 filed by Mary Shepard, Illinois State Rifle Association is DENIED as moot; MOTION to Dismiss 78 filed by David Livesay, AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 73 filed by Tyler R Edmonds, Patrick J Quinn, Lisa M Madigan are GRANTED. ACTION DUE by 8/9/2013--parties to brief issue of award of costs and fees. Signed by Judge William D. Stiehl on 7/26/2013. (jaf ) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 88 Filed: 7/20/2013, Entered: 7/20/2013 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 78 MOTION to Dismiss as Moot pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) filed by David Livesay. (Bleyer, Joseph) (Entered: 07/20/2013)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 87 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: 7/18/2013 Supplement
                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENT by Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard. Supplement to 79 Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (Howard, William) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 86 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: 7/18/2013 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 73 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (moot) filed by Tyler R Edmonds, Lisa M Madigan, Patrick J Quinn. (Triebel, Karl) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 85 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: 7/16/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Thompson on behalf of Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard (Thompson, David) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: 7/16/2013 Order
                                                                                                        ORDER (NJR/dka) granting 83 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David H. Thompson on behalf of Mary Shepard, Illinois State Rifle Association.(dka, ) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 83 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: 7/16/2013 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                          MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AttorneyDavid H. Thompson $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2019985 by on behalf of Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 82 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: 7/16/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Charles J Cooper on behalf of Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 81 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: 7/12/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING leave to file additional briefs ( Action due by 7/18/2013.). Signed by Judge William D. Stiehl on 7/12/2013. (jaf) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 80 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: 7/12/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by K. Rockne Bleyer on behalf of David Livesay (Bleyer, K.) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 79 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: 7/12/2013 Response
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 78 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant, Sheriff David Livesay, filed by Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard. (Howard, William) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 78 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: 7/12/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss as Moot pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) by David Livesay. Responses due by 8/15/2013 (Bleyer, Joseph) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 77 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: 7/11/2013 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 76 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Plaintiffs' re 75 MOTION for Declaration of Unconstitutionality and Preliminary and/or Permanent Injunction filed by Tyler R Edmonds, Lisa M Madigan, Patrick J Quinn. (Corrigan, Terence) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 76 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: 7/10/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Plaintiffs' re 75 MOTION for Declaration of Unconstitutionality and Preliminary and/or Permanent Injunction by Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard. (Howard, William) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 75 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: 7/10/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Declaration of Unconstitutionality and Preliminary and/or Permanent Injunction by Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard. (Howard, William) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 74 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: 7/10/2013 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 73 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (moot) filed by Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard. (Howard, William) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 73 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: 7/9/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (moot) by Tyler R Edmonds, Lisa M Madigan, Patrick J Quinn. Responses due by 8/12/2013 (Triebel, Karl) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: 7/9/2013 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                MANDATE of USCA as to 58 Notice of Appeal filed by Mary Shepard, Illinois State Rifle Association (Attachments: # 1 Opinion, # 2 Final Judgment, # 3 Rehearing Order, # 4 Bill of Costs (1), # 5 Bill of Costs (2))(drb) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: 7/9/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Karl Triebel on behalf of Tyler R Edmonds, Lisa M Madigan, Patrick J Quinn (Triebel, Karl) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: 6/4/2013 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                    ORDER of USCA as to 58 Notice of Appeal filed by Mary Shepard, Illinois State Rifle Association (jlrr ) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: 3/14/2013 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by William N Howard (Howard, William) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                        ORDER of USCA as to 58 Notice of Appeal filed by Mary Shepard, Illinois State Rifle Association (cekf) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Acknowledgment of receipt of Record on Appeal by USCA 7 re 58 Notice of Appeal. Contents of Records: 2 vol. of pleadings.(jlrr ) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 58 Notice of Appeal (tkm ) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Request from USCA to transmit Record on Appeal re 58 Notice of Appeal (cekf) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 64 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                ORDER of USCA as to 58 Notice of Appeal filed by Mary Shepard, Illinois State Rifle Association (drb) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION SHEET by Attorney/Pro Se Party (Howard, William) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard re 58 Notice of Appeal (Howard, William) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      USCA Case Number 12-1788 for 58 Notice of Appeal filed by Mary Shepard, Illinois State Rifle Association. (slj) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Circuit Rule 10 Letter (trb) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Transmission of Short Record to US Court of Appeals re 58 Notice of Appeal Appeal Record due to be prepared by 4/16/2012. (trb) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 57 Order Dismissing Case, Terminate Motions,, by Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0754-1661552. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Howard, William) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: 3/30/2012 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER DISMISSING CASE, the Court GRANTS defendants motions 24 and 26 pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) for failure to state a claim, and plaintiffs complaint is DISMISSED. The Court GRANTS defendants motion to cite supplemental authority 55 . All remaining motions 20 38 47 49 are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge William D. Stiehl on 3/30/2012. (jaf) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: 2/8/2012 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 55 MOTION to Cite Supplemental Authority re 26 MOTION to Dismiss, 28 Response filed by Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard. (Howard, William) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: 2/6/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Cite Supplemental Authority re 26 MOTION to Dismiss, 28 Response by Tyler R Edmonds, Lisa M Madigan, Patrick J Quinn. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Authority)(Simpson, David) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: 11/17/2011 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 44 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by National Rifle Association of America, Inc.. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: 11/16/2011 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER DENYING 22 Motion for Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction as moot; DENYING 25 Motion for Extension of Time filed by defendant Livesay as moot, defendant's brief having been filed; GRANTING 44 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief by National Rifle Association, and brief shall be filed instanter; GRANTING 50 Motion for leave to file supplemental authority. Signed by Judge William D. Stiehl on 11/16/2011. (jaf) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: 9/26/2011 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 50 MOTION to Cite Supplemental Authority re 26 MOTION to Dismiss, 28 Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard. (Howard, William) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: 9/16/2011 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 47 MOTION to Defer Ruling re 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard. (Howard, William) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: 9/12/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Cite Supplemental Authority re 26 MOTION to Dismiss, 28 Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Tyler R Edmonds, Lisa M Madigan, Patrick J Quinn. (Attachments: # 1 Kachalsky Opinion)(Corrigan, Terence) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: 9/2/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Defer Ruling on Summary Judgment by David Livesay. (Bleyer, Joseph) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: 9/2/2011 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBIT by Tyler R Edmonds, Lisa M Madigan, Patrick J Quinn. Exhibit to 47 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Corrigan, Terence) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: 9/2/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Defer Ruling re 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Tyler R Edmonds, Lisa M Madigan, Patrick J Quinn. (Corrigan, Terence) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: 8/29/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tyler R Edmonds, Lisa M Madigan, Patrick J Quinn. (Simpson, David) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: 8/29/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER (NJR/dka) granting 42 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles J Cooper for National Rifle Association of America, Inc. (dka, )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: 8/29/2011 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by National Rifle Association of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amicus Brief)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: 8/29/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Charles J Cooper on behalf of National Rifle Association of America, Inc. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: 8/29/2011 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AttorneyCharles J Cooper $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-1491695 by on behalf of National Rifle Association of America, Inc.. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: 8/23/2011 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 24 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) AND 12(b)(6) filed by Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard. (Howard, William) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: 8/15/2011 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Illinois State Rifle Association. (Howard, William) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: 8/8/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Mary Shepard, # 2 Affidavit Donald Moran)(Howard, William) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: 8/8/2011 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment by Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard. Responses due by 9/12/2011 (Howard, William) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: 8/2/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. (Diesenhaus, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: 7/29/2011 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 33 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Brady Center To Prevent Gun Violence (brief is support of defendants). Brady Center is HEREBY directed to file its Amicus Curiae Brief as a separate document, instanter. Signed by Judge William D. Stiehl on 7/29/2011. (jaf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: 7/27/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Simpson on behalf of Tyler R Edmonds, Lisa M Madigan, Patrick J Quinn (Simpson, David) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: 7/26/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER (NJR/dka) granting 31 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jonathan Lee Diesenhaus on behalf of Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. (dka, )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: 7/25/2011 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amicus Brief)(Diesenhaus, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: 7/25/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Lee Diesenhaus on behalf of Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence (Diesenhaus, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: 7/25/2011 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AttorneyJonathan Lee Diesenhaus $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-1465551 by on behalf of Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. (Diesenhaus, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: 7/22/2011 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and/or Permanent Injunction filed by David Livesay. (Bleyer, Joseph) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: 7/22/2011 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION to 20 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Tyler R Edmonds, Lisa M Madigan, Patrick J Quinn. (Corrigan, Terence) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: 7/22/2011 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 20 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Tyler R Edmonds, Lisa M Madigan, Patrick J Quinn. (Corrigan, Terence) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: 7/22/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tyler R Edmonds, Lisa M Madigan, Patrick J Quinn. (Corrigan, Terence) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: 7/22/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss by Tyler R Edmonds, Lisa M Madigan, Patrick J Quinn. Responses due by 8/25/2011 (Corrigan, Terence) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: 7/22/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to (Doc 20) by David Livesay. (Bleyer, Joseph) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: 7/22/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) AND 12(b)(6) by David Livesay. Responses due by 8/25/2011 (Bleyer, Joseph) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: 7/11/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The movants have adequately demonstrated good cause for an extension of time to answer the complaint. Defendants Tyler R Edmonds, Lisa M Madigan, Patrick J Quinn, David Livesay answer due 7/22/2011. No further extensions of time will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier on 7/11/11. (ajt) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: 7/8/2011 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Hearing re 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and/or Permanent Injunction by Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard. (Howard, William) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: 7/8/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and/or Permanent Injunction filed by Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Howard, William) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: 7/8/2011 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and/or Permanent Injunction by Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard. (Howard, William) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: 7/8/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by David Livesay. (Bleyer, Joseph) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: 7/8/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Tyler R Edmonds, Lisa M Madigan, Patrick J Quinn. (Corrigan, Terence) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: 6/21/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The movant has demonstrated good cause for a thirty (30) day extension of time to file an answer. Defendant David Livesay answer due 7/8/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier on 6/21/11. (ajt) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: 6/20/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by David Livesay. (Bleyer, Joseph) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: 6/20/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Bleyer on behalf of David Livesay (Bleyer, Joseph) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: 6/15/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Karen L. McNaught on behalf of Tyler R Edmonds, Lisa M Madigan, Patrick J Quinn (McNaught, Karen) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: 6/8/2011 Order on Motion to WithdrawCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 11 Motion to Withdraw as follows: attorney Jeffery M. Cross permitted to withdraw as counsel for plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier on 6/8/11. (ajt) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: 6/7/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The movants have adequately demonstrated good cause for an extension of time to file an answer to the complaint. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b)(1). Defendants Tyler R Edmonds, Lisa M Madigan, Patrick J Quinn answer due 7/8/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier on 6/7/11. (ajt) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: 6/7/2011 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Withdraw of Jeffery M. Cross by Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard. (Cross, Jeffery) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: 6/6/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Complaint, by Tyler R Edmonds, Lisa M Madigan, Patrick J Quinn. (Corrigan, Terence) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: 5/24/2011 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Shepard, Illinois State Rifle Association. David Livesay served on 5/18/2011, answer due 6/8/2011. (Howard, William) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: 5/24/2011 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Shepard, Illinois State Rifle Association. Tyler R Edmonds served on 5/18/2011, answer due 6/8/2011. (Howard, William) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: 5/24/2011 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Shepard, Illinois State Rifle Association. Patrick J Quinn served on 5/19/2011, answer due 6/9/2011. (Howard, William) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: 5/24/2011 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Shepard, Illinois State Rifle Association. Lisa M Madigan served on 5/19/2011, answer due 6/9/2011. (Howard, William) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: 5/17/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER (NJR/dka) granting 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William N Howard filed by Mary Shepard, Illinois State Rifle Association.(dka, )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 05/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: 5/16/2011 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AttorneyWilliam N Howard $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-1410821 by on behalf of Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary Shepard. (Howard, William) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: 5/13/2011 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to Tyler R Edmonds, David Livesay, Lisa M Madigan, Patrick J Quinn. (bkl) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: 5/13/2011 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Tyler R Edmonds, David Livesay, Lisa M Madigan, Patrick J Quinn ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0754-1410003.), filed by Mary Shepard, Illinois State Rifle Association. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Cross, Jeffery) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: 5/13/2011 Case OpenedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Case Opened. Documents may now be electronically filed. Case number 11-405-WDS/PMF must be placed on all documents prior to filing them electronically. (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(bkl) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 198 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?