De Giovanni v. Jani-King International, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10066

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 29, 2017 at 10:38 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Diamantino Fernandes, Plaintiff
No Logo Manuel Fernandes, Plaintiff
No Logo Maria Pinto, Plaintiff
No Logo Mariett Barros, Plaintiff
No Logo Vincent De Giovanni, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Claret M. Vargas +1 617 994 5800 cvargas@llrlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fair Work, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen S. Churchill +1 617 607 3260 steve@fairworklaw.com
Space Hillary A. Schwab +1 617 607 3260 hillary@fairworklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander M. Sugerman-Brozan +1 617 742 0208 abrozan@segalroitman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sara E. Smolik +1 617 565 3207 +1 617 565 3196 sara.smolik@eeoc.gov
v.
No Logo Jani-king International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kerry L. Bundy +1 612 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 Kerry.Bundy@faegreBD.com
Space Eileen M. Hunter +1 612 766 6907 +1 612 766 1600 eileen.hunter@faegrebd.com
Space Aaron Daniel Van Oort +1 612 766 8138 +1 612 766 1600 aaron.vanoort@faegrebd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goulston & Storrs, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew P. Horvitz +1 617 574 4053 +1 617 574 4112 mhorvitz@goulstonstorrs.com
Space Barbara L. Moore +1 617 574 4135 bmoore@goulstonstorrs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Manion Gaynor & Manning LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas D. Stellakis +1 617 670 8534 +1 617 737 1191 nstellakis@cmjlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher May Mason +1 212 940 3000 +1 866 947 2229 cmason@nixonpeabody.com
Space Arthur Pressman +1 617 345 1000 +3451 345 345 1300 apressman@nixonpeabody.com
Space David S. Rosenthal +1 617 345 6183 +9511 951 951 1295 drosenthal@nixonpeabody.com
Space Gregg A Rubenstein +1 617 345 1000 +1 617 345 1300 grubenstein@nixonpeabody.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy W. Mungovan +1 617 345 1000 +1 617 345 1300 tmungovan@proskauer.com
No Logo Jani-King Of Boston, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Jani-king, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Edward Shanley, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lichten & Liss-Riordan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shannon E. Liss-Riordan +1 617 994 5800 +1 617 994 5801 sliss@llrlaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (270) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 275 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Sara E. Smolik (Smolik, Sara) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
    LREF
    Blank 274 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    Judge Mark L. Wolf: Preliminary Approval Order entered. PLEASE NOTE: There is an endorsed modification of the Order at p.8, paragraph 18.(Hohler, Daniel) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
      LREF
      Blank 273 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      Judge Mark L. Wolf: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 269 Motion to Consolidate Cases "Allowed"(Hohler, Daniel) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
        NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          Transcript of Motion Hearing held on March 20, 2014, before Judge Mark L. Wolf. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com Redaction Request due 4/21/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/1/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/30/2014. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 269 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
            Assented to MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Vincent De Giovanni.(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
              NOTICE by Vincent De Giovanni of Revised Notice and Preliminary Approval Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Mark L. Wolf: Motion Hearing held on 3/20/2014 re 265 Assented to MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Vincent De Giovanni. (Court Reporter: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Liss-riordan, Rosenthal, Van Oort) (Hohler, Daniel) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 266 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                    Assented to MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Vincent De Giovanni. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING The hearing previously scheduled for 2/25/2014 is RESCHEDULED and the hearing is now set for 3/20/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Mark L. Wolf. (Hohler, Daniel) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 262 Motion for Extension of Time "This motion is ALLOWED. The parties shall file their Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement and supporting filings by March 14, 2014. A hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement shall be held on Thursday, March 20, 2014 at 2:00 p.m." (Hohler, Daniel) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                          Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 14, 2014 to File a Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement by Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc., Jani-King, Inc.,.(Horvitz, Matthew) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing.Hearing set for 2/25/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Mark L. Wolf. (Hohler, Daniel) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The parties have reported this case has settled. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference scheduled for February 25, 2014 at 10:30 a.m. is converted into a Preliminary Approval of Settlement hearing. The parties shall file their motions, memoranda and all other supporting documents by February 19, 2014. (Hohler, Daniel) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                Judge Mark L. Wolf: ENDORSED ORDER entered. "ALLOWED. The parties shall, by February 20. 2013, report whether the case has settled. If not, the Scheduling Conference will be held on February 25, 2014 at 10:30 a.m."( Scheduling Conference set for 2/25/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Mark L. Wolf.)(Hohler, Daniel) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                  Joint MOTION to Reschedule Status Conference by Vincent De Giovanni.(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Judge Mark L. Wolf: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 246 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nicholas D. Stellakis terminated. (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Mark L. Wolf. (Hohler, Daniel) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        Judge Mark L. Wolf: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 252 Motion "ALLOWED. The conference is hereby RESCHEDULED for January 24, 2014 at 3:00 pm. The parties shall, by January 17, 2014 report the results of their mediation."(Hohler, Daniel) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                          Joint MOTION to Reschedule Status Conference by Vincent De Giovanni.(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 12/16/2013 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Mark L. Wolf. (Hohler, Daniel) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. Scheduling Conference 10/15/2013 canceled.(Hohler, Daniel) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                Judge Mark L. Wolf: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 248 Motion "ALLOWED. The parties shall, by December 2, 2013 report whether this case has been settled. If not, the parties shall, by December 9, 2013 respond to paragraph 2 of the September 12, 2013 Order and the conference described in paragraph 3 of that Order will be held on December 16, 2013 at 3:30 p.m." (Hohler, Daniel) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                  Joint MOTION to Reschedule Status Conference by Vincent De Giovanni.(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Horvitz on behalf of Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc., Jani-King, Inc., (Horvitz, Matthew) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc., Jani-King, Inc.,.(Stellakis, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Barbara L. Moore (Moore, Barbara) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Mark L. Wolf to develop a schedule to resolve the outstanding issues in this case, particularly damages and the possible amendment of the definition of the class. (Hohler, Daniel) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Attached Memorandum and Order) In view of the foregoing, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration (Docket No. 212) is DENIED, without prejudice to being renewed concerning the issues of direct employment and joint employment after damages are determined. 2. The parties shall confer and, by October 1, 2013, report their respective positions concerning the issues of damages and class definition, and the schedule on which this case should proceed. 3. A conference shall be held on October 15, 2013, at 3:00 p.m., to develop a schedule to resolve the outstanding issues in this case, particularly damages and the possible amendment of the definition of the class.(Hohler, Daniel) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Hillary A. Schwab (Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephen S. Churchill (Churchill, Stephen) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  Response by Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc., Jani-King, Inc., to 239 Notice of Supplemental Authorities . (Bundy, Kerry) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 239 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    Notice of Supplemental Authorities re 212 MOTION for Reconsideration (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered denying 233 Motion to Consolidate Cases On December 13, 2012, plaintiffs filed a Conditional Motion to Consolidate, or Coordinate, This Case With Similar "Cleaning Franchise" Misclassification Cases (the "Motion to Consolidate"). Plaintiffs state in their Motion to Consolidate that, "[i] f the Court intends to retain th[is] case[], then this motion should be disregarded." Motion to Consolidate at 2. On December 26, 2012, defendants filed an opposition to plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate. The court intends to retain the instant case. Plaintiffs' Conditional Motion to Consolidate, or Coordinate, This Case With Similar "Cleaning Franchise" Misclassification Cases (Docket No. 233) is, therefore, hereby DENIED (Hohler, Daniel) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephen S. Churchill (Churchill, Stephen) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf added. Judge Joseph L. Tauro no longer assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Notice of reassignment done in error. Case re-reassigned to Judge Mark L. Wolf to correct (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 234 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              Opposition re 233 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , or Coordinate, this case with Similar "Cleaning Franchise" Misclassification Cases filed by Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc., Jani-King, Inc.,. (Stellakis, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 233 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION to Consolidate Cases , or Coordinate, this case with Similar "Cleaning Franchise" Misclassification Cases by Vincent De Giovanni.(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas D. Stellakis on behalf of Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc., Jani-King, Inc., (Stellakis, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Christopher M Mason (Mason, Christopher) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by David S. Rosenthal (Rosenthal, David) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Arthur L. Pressman (Pressman, Arthur) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Gregg A. Rubenstein (Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 11/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara L. Moore on behalf of Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc., Jani-King, Inc., (Moore, Barbara) (Entered: 11/12/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              SUR-REPLY to Motion re 212 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Vincent De Giovanni. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 221 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Hohler, Daniel) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  STIPULATION on Class Period by Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc., Jani-King, Inc.,. (Bundy, Kerry) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 223 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT to Court on Mediation by Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc., Jani-King, Inc.,. (Hunter, Eileen) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by Vincent De Giovanni. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Vincent De Giovanni. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to 212 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc., Jani-King, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bundy, Kerry) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 219 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Opposition re 212 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Mariett Barros, Vincent De Giovanni, Diamantino Fernandes, Maria Pinto. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying 217 Motion. However, plaintiffs' opposition to the motion for reconsideration is now due by Tuesday, August 7, 2012 and replies are due Tuesday, August 14, 2012. (Hohler, Daniel) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Defer Briefing on Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration Pending Mediation re 212 MOTION for Reconsideration by Vincent De Giovanni.(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING entered. It is hereby ORDERED that this action is hereby ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. The parties shall file a motion to reopen the case if warranted.(Hohler, Daniel) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. The Scheduling Conference previously set for 08/06/2012 is hereby canceled. No new hearing date has been set. (Hohler, Daniel) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 212 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc., Jani-King, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Bundy, Kerry) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 212 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Reconsideration by Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc., Jani-King, Inc.,.(Bundy, Kerry) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          JOINT STATEMENT of counsel . (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Timothy W. Mungovan (Mungovan, Timothy) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              Transcript of Summary Judgment Hearing held on June 6, 2012, before Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 7/4/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/11/2012. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 214 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. re 212 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Jani-King Of Boston, Inc., Jani-King, Inc.,, Jani-King International, Inc. It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. By August 3, 2012, the plaintiffs sh all file any opposition to the defendants' Motion for Reconsideration (Docket No. 212). 2. Any reply shall be filed by August 10, 2012. 3. The scheduling conference previously scheduled for August 6, 2012 is canceled. 4. By October 5, 2012, the parties shall report whether they have reached any agreement to resolve this case. 5. This case is otherwise STAYED in light of the parties' agreement to mediate.(Hohler, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: 6/8/2012 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: 1/25/2012 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: 1/19/2012 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: 12/29/2011 Response
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: 12/19/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: 12/2/2011 Notice of Supplemental Authorities
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: 10/7/2011 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: 10/7/2011 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: 10/7/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: 10/7/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: 9/9/2011 Response
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: 9/9/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: 9/9/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: 8/16/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: 8/12/2011 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: 8/12/2011 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: 8/12/2011 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: 8/12/2011 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: 8/12/2011 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: 8/12/2011 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: 8/12/2011 Motion to Modify
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: 5/18/2011 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: 4/29/2011 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: 3/4/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: 3/4/2011 Order Referring Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: 3/4/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 2/19/2011, Entered: 2/19/2011 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: 2/11/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: 1/28/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: 1/28/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: 1/28/2011 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: 1/28/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: 1/28/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: 1/28/2011 Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: 1/11/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: 1/10/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: 12/16/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: 10/22/2010 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: 9/17/2010 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: 9/17/2010 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: 8/30/2010 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: 8/18/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: 8/17/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: 8/16/2010 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: 8/16/2010 Notice of Supplemental Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: 7/16/2010 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: 5/10/2010 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Joint statement of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: 4/13/2010 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: 4/13/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 3/30/2010 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: 3/29/2010 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: 3/29/2010 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: 3/23/2010 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: 3/23/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: 3/23/2010 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: 3/3/2010 Memorandum and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: 3/1/2010 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: 2/26/2010 Surreply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: 2/26/2010 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: 2/3/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: 2/2/2010 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: 2/2/2010 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: 2/1/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: 2/1/2010 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: 1/28/2010 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: 1/26/2010 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: 1/14/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: 1/14/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: 1/13/2010 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: 1/13/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/15/2009 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/15/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/15/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: 12/2/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: 12/2/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: 12/2/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: 12/2/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: 12/2/2009 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: 11/12/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: 11/9/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 113 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: 10/30/2009 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Part I, # 2 Exhibit A- Part II)(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: 10/29/2009 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Michael H. Seid in Opposition re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Jani-King, Inc.,, Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Bundy, Kerry) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: 10/29/2009 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Aaron D. Van Oort in Opposition re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Jani-King, Inc.,, Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Bundy, Kerry) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: 10/29/2009 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Jani-King, Inc.,, Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Bundy, Kerry) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 109 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: 10/29/2009 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Jani-King, Inc.,, Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Bundy, Kerry) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: 10/29/2009 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 92 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Mariett Barros, Vincent De Giovanni. (Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: 10/29/2009 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 92 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Mariett Barros, Vincent De Giovanni. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Amero v. Townsend Oil Co. Decision)(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: 10/29/2009 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION to Seal Declaration of Dawn Dockery and Exhibits Thereto by Jani-King, Inc.,, Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc..(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: 10/28/2009 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter/request (non-motion) from Hillary Schwab, Esq.. (Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: 10/28/2009 Motion to Certify Class
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Certify Class Renewed as to Claims Brought Under Mass. Gen. L. Chapter 93A by Vincent De Giovanni. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: 10/28/2009 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jani-King, Inc.,, Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc., filed by Vincent De Giovanni.(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: 10/27/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re 99 Emergency MOTION to Stay of Proceedings and for Additional Discovery filed by Vincent De Giovanni. (Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: 10/23/2009 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Kerry L. Bundy in Support re 99 Emergency MOTION to Stay of Proceedings and for Additional Discovery filed by Jani-King, Inc.,, Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Bundy, Kerry) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: 10/23/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 99 Emergency MOTION to Stay of Proceedings and for Additional Discovery filed by Jani-King, Inc.,, Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Bundy, Kerry) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: 10/23/2009 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Emergency MOTION to Stay of Proceedings and for Additional Discovery by Jani-King, Inc.,, Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc..(Bundy, Kerry) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: 10/1/2009 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Vincent De Giovanni. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: 10/1/2009 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Vincent De Giovanni. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 96 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: 10/1/2009 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT in Support re 92 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N)(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: 10/1/2009 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT in Support re 92 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Donald Burleson. (Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: 10/1/2009 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT of facts re 92 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: 10/1/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 92 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Jani-King, Inc.,, Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: 10/1/2009 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Jani-King, Inc.,, Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc..(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 91 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part, denying in part motion for class certification(Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: 9/16/2009 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Alexander M. Sugerman-Brozan (Sugerman-Brozan, Alexander) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: 9/14/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, re: Filing of Summary Judgment Briefs by Mariett Barros, Jani-King, Inc.,, Vincent De Giovanni, Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc..(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: 8/14/2009 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response by Jani-King, Inc.,, Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc. to 87 Notice (Other) of Supplemental Authority in support of Motion for Class Certification. (Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: 8/10/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Vincent De Giovanni re 45 MOTION to Certify Class and Memorandum in Support Thereof of Supplemental Authority in Support (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: 7/31/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to October 30, 2009 to Complete Discovery and Modify Expert Disclosure Deadlines by Mariett Barros, Jani-King, Inc.,, Vincent De Giovanni, Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc..(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: 7/29/2009 Withdrawal of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Withdrawal of motion: 18 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Jani-King Of Boston, Inc., Jani-King International, Inc... (Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: 7/21/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to 78 MOTION to Compel Execution of IRS Form 4506 Leave to File Granted on July 21, 2009 filed by Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: 7/20/2009 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Eileen M. Hunter Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002513422. by Jani-King, Inc.,, Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Eileen M. Hunter)(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: 7/20/2009 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kerry L. Bundy Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002513407. by Jani-King, Inc.,, Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Kerry L. Bundy)(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: 7/20/2009 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Aaron D. Van Oort Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002513393. by Jani-King, Inc.,, Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Aaron D. Van Oort)(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: 7/15/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Execution of IRS Form 4506 by Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Reply Brief)(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: 7/13/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition re 78 MOTION to Compel Execution of IRS Form 4506 filed by Vincent De Giovanni. (Sugerman-Brozan, Alexander) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: 6/29/2009 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel Execution of IRS Form 4506 by Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Shannon E. Liss-Riordan (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: 5/22/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to 45 MOTION to Certify Class and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Mariett Barros, Vincent De Giovanni. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 75 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: 5/22/2009 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Exhibits 2&5 re 72 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (York, Steve) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: 5/22/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Jani-King Of Boston, Inc. re Order on Motion for Leave to File, 63 Opposition to Motion of Additional Authority In Opposition to Class Certification, Leave to File Granted on May 22, 2009 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: 5/15/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Additional Authority in Opposition to Class Certification by Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Supplemental Authority)(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: 5/15/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Vincent De Giovanni. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Class Certification Reply Brief, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6)(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: 5/15/2009 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christopher M. Mason Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002425292. by Jani-King, Inc.,, Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Christopher M. Mason)(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 70 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: 5/12/2009 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Exhibit E re 68 Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (York, Steve) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: 5/8/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re 67 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Mariett Barros, Vincent De Giovanni. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Sugerman-Brozan, Alexander) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: 5/6/2009 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 18 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Mariett Barros, Vincent De Giovanni. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: 4/24/2009 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Protective Order by Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: 4/13/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re 57 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Maria Monteiro in Support of Class Certification, 56 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Manuel Fernandes in Support of Class Certification, 55 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Vincent De Giovanni in Support of Class Certification, 54 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Diamantino Fernandes in Support of Class Certification, 58 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Maria Pinto in Support of Class Certification filed by Mariett Barros, Vincent De Giovanni. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: 4/10/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Parties to Brief the Issue of Jurisdiction by Mariett Barros, Vincent De Giovanni.(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009 Affidavit in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 63 Opposition to Motion (Revised). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition re 45 MOTION to Certify Class and Memorandum in Support Thereof (Revised) filed by Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: 4/2/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 53 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Joao Amado in Support of Class Certification, 57 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Maria Monteiro in Support of Class Certification, 56 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Manuel Fernandes in Support of Class Certification, 55 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Vincent De Giovanni in Support of Class Certification, 54 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Diamantino Fernandes in Support of Class Certification, 58 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Maria Pinto in Support of Class Certification by Mariett Barros, Vincent De Giovanni.(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: 3/30/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 3, 2009 to File Revised Opposition to Class Certification by Jani-King Of Boston, Inc..(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: 3/30/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 6, 2009 to File Response/Reply as to 53 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Joao Amado in Support of Class Certification, 57 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Maria Monteiro in Support of Class Certification, 56 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Manuel Fernandes in Support of Class Certification, 55 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Vincent De Giovanni in Support of Class Certification, 54 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Diamantino Fernandes in Support of Class Certification, 58 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Maria Pinto in Support of Class Certification by Mariett Barros, Vincent De Giovanni.(Sugerman-Brozan, Alexander) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: 3/30/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander M. Sugerman-Brozan on behalf of Mariett Barros, Vincent De Giovanni (Sugerman-Brozan, Alexander) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: 3/16/2009 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Maria Pinto in Support of Class Certification by Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: 3/16/2009 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Maria Monteiro in Support of Class Certification by Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: 3/16/2009 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Manuel Fernandes in Support of Class Certification by Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: 3/16/2009 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Vincent De Giovanni in Support of Class Certification by Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: 3/16/2009 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Diamantino Fernandes in Support of Class Certification by Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: 3/16/2009 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Joao Amado in Support of Class Certification by Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: 3/16/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re 51 Opposition to Motion of Gregg A. Rubenstein, Esq. by Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: 3/16/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition re 45 MOTION to Certify Class and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification by Jani-King Of Boston, Inc..(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time by Mariett Barros, Vincent De Giovanni.(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: 2/26/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge William G. Young: Electronic ORDER entered. Stipulated Agreed Protective Order(York, Steve) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Protective Order for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order by Jani-King, Inc.,, Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Stipulated Agreed Protective Order)(Pressman, Arthur) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: 2/3/2009 Motion to Certify Class
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Certify Class Regarding Pending Motion for Class Certification and to Modify Scheduling Order by Jani-King, Inc.,, Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc..(Pressman, Arthur) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: 1/16/2009 Motion to Certify Class
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Certify Class and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Mariett Barros, Vincent De Giovanni. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Affidavit of De Giovanni, # 3 Affidavit of Barros, # 4 Affidavit of D. Fernandes, # 5 Affidavit of Pinto, # 6 Affidavit of M. Fernandes, # 7 Affidavit of Montero, # 8 Affidavit of Amado)(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: 12/9/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 13 Amended Complaint by Jani-King, Inc.,.(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2008: # 1 Main Document) (York, Steve). (Entered: 12/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: 10/14/2008 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Vincent De Giovanni. Jani-King, Inc., waiver sent on 10/8/2008, answer due 12/8/2008. (Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: 10/2/2008 Certificate of Consultation pursuant to LR 7.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1. (Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: 10/1/2008 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Mariette Barros Filed by Vincent De Giovanni.(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 10/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: 10/1/2008 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Vincent De Giovanni.(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 10/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: 9/29/2008 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: 9/26/2008 Joint submission
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 By Defendants by Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc..(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 10/2/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 13 First AMENDED COMPLAINT (Amended) by Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc..(Rubenstein, Gregg) Modified on 9/8/2008 (York, Steve). (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc. (Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 08/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplemental MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Vincent De Giovanni. (Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 08/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to Ten days following the issuans of Court's Memo for Reasons for its ruling on defendants' motion to dismiss to File Response/Reply by Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc..(Pressman, Arthur) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to April 21, 2008 to File Answer to Summons and Amended Complaint by Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc..(Rosenthal, David) (Entered: 04/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Vincent De Giovanni of Additional Authority in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief by Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Supplemental Brief)(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 10/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION Motion to File Supplemental Brief by Vincent De Giovanni. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 10/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 18 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 07/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply by Vincent De Giovanni. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief and Nunc Pro Tunc Certification of Complaince with Local Rule 7.1 by Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Propopsed Reply Brief)(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 06/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re 23 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief filed by Vincent De Giovanni. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 06/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Reply Brief)(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 06/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: 5/30/2007 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Shannon Liss-Riordan in Opposition re 18 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Vincent De Giovanni. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: 5/30/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 18 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Vincent De Giovanni. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re 18 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H)(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 18 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc..(Rubenstein, Gregg) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2007 (York, Steve). Modified on 5/13/2009 (Hourihan, Lisa). (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION Estbliash Briefing Schedule re 13 Amended Complaint, 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted, Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to Join an Indispensable Party, 16 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Vincent De Giovanni, Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc..(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 04/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/16/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted, Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to Join an Indispensable Party filed by Vincent De Giovanni. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/16/2007 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Shannon Liss-Riordan in Opposition re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted, Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to Join an Indispensable Party with attached Exhibit A filed by Vincent De Giovanni. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/16/2007 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Vincent De Giovanni.(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/16/2007 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Vincent De Giovanni, filed by Vincent De Giovanni.(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Vincent De Giovanni.(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 3/26/2007 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Support re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted, Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to Join an Indispensable Party. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 03/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 3/26/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted, Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to Join an Indispensable Party filed by Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 03/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 3/26/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted, Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to Join an Indispensable Party by Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc..(Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 03/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Hillary A. Schwab on behalf of Vincent De Giovanni (Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy W. Mungovan on behalf of Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc. (Mungovan, Timothy) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur L. Pressman on behalf of Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc. (Pressman, Arthur) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg A. Rubenstein on behalf of Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc. (Rubenstein, Gregg) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/22/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 26, 2007 to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint by Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc..(Rosenthal, David) (Entered: 02/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 12, 2007 to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc..(Rosenthal, David) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed Jani-King Of Boston, Inc. served on 1/22/2007, answer due 2/12/2007. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King Of Boston, Inc. , filed by Vincent De Giovanni. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 Category Sheet)(Costello2, Helen) (Entered: 01/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 189 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?