B. et al v. Patrick et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 3:10-cv-30073
District Judge Michael A Ponsor, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 12, 2016 at 5:37 AM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Adams, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Childrens' Rights, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara Michelle Bartosz +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 sbartosz@childrensrights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurence D. Borten +1 212 683 2210 lborten@childrensrights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Lambiase +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 slambiase@childrensrights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcia Robinson Lowry +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 mlowry@childrensrights.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Clifford Chance, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kara Morrow +1 212 878 8000 +1 212 878 8375 kara.morrow@cliffordchance.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nutter, McClennen & Fish, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J. Gleason +1 617 439 2233 +1 617 310 9233 dgleason@nutter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary K. Ryan +1 617 439 2212 +1 617 310 9212 mryan@nutter.com
No Logo Andres, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Childrens' Rights, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara Michelle Bartosz +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 sbartosz@childrensrights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurence D. Borten +1 212 683 2210 lborten@childrensrights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Lambiase +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 slambiase@childrensrights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcia Robinson Lowry +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 mlowry@childrensrights.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Clifford Chance, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kara Morrow +1 212 878 8000 +1 212 878 8375 kara.morrow@cliffordchance.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nutter, McClennen & Fish, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J. Gleason +1 617 439 2233 +1 617 310 9233 dgleason@nutter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary K. Ryan +1 617 439 2212 +1 617 310 9212 mryan@nutter.com
No Logo Camila R., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Childrens' Rights, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara Michelle Bartosz +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 sbartosz@childrensrights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurence D. Borten +1 212 683 2210 lborten@childrensrights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Lambiase +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 slambiase@childrensrights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcia Robinson Lowry +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 mlowry@childrensrights.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Clifford Chance, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kara Morrow +1 212 878 8000 +1 212 878 8375 kara.morrow@cliffordchance.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nutter, McClennen & Fish, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J. Gleason +1 617 439 2233 +1 617 310 9233 dgleason@nutter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary K. Ryan +1 617 439 2212 +1 617 310 9212 mryan@nutter.com
No Logo Connor B., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Childrens' Rights, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara Michelle Bartosz +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 sbartosz@childrensrights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurence D. Borten +1 212 683 2210 lborten@childrensrights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Lambiase +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 slambiase@childrensrights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcia Robinson Lowry +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 mlowry@childrensrights.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Clifford Chance, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kara Morrow +1 212 878 8000 +1 212 878 8375 kara.morrow@cliffordchance.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nutter, McClennen & Fish, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J. Gleason +1 617 439 2233 +1 617 310 9233 dgleason@nutter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary K. Ryan +1 617 439 2212 +1 617 310 9212 mryan@nutter.com
No Logo Rakeem D., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Childrens' Rights, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara Michelle Bartosz +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 sbartosz@childrensrights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurence D. Borten +1 212 683 2210 lborten@childrensrights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Lambiase +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 slambiase@childrensrights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcia Robinson Lowry +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 mlowry@childrensrights.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Clifford Chance, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kara Morrow +1 212 878 8000 +1 212 878 8375 kara.morrow@cliffordchance.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nutter, McClennen & Fish, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J. Gleason +1 617 439 2233 +1 617 310 9233 dgleason@nutter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary K. Ryan +1 617 439 2212 +1 617 310 9212 mryan@nutter.com
No Logo Seth T., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Childrens' Rights, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara Michelle Bartosz +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 sbartosz@childrensrights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurence D. Borten +1 212 683 2210 lborten@childrensrights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Lambiase +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 slambiase@childrensrights.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcia Robinson Lowry +1 212 683 2210 +1 212 683 4015 mlowry@childrensrights.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Clifford Chance, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kara Morrow +1 212 878 8000 +1 212 878 8375 kara.morrow@cliffordchance.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nutter, McClennen & Fish, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J. Gleason +1 617 439 2233 +1 617 310 9233 dgleason@nutter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary K. Ryan +1 617 439 2212 +1 617 310 9212 mryan@nutter.com
v.
No Logo Angelo McClain, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Spector +6177272 200 ext2076 +1 617 727 5785 amy.spector@state.ma.us
No Logo Deval L. Patrick, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Spector +6177272 200 ext2076 +1 617 727 5785 amy.spector@state.ma.us
No Logo Judyann Bigby, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Spector +6177272 200 ext2076 +1 617 727 5785 amy.spector@state.ma.us
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (165) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 199 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ORDER entered. ORDER OF TRANSFER, this case is hereby ordered transferred to the Clerk in Boston to be redrawn to another judge. See the attached order for complete details. (Lindsay, Maurice)
    LREF
    Blank 174 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: 10/4/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: 9/27/2012 Reply to Response to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: 9/26/2012 Declaration
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: 9/26/2012 Response to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: 9/21/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: 9/18/2012 Declaration
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: 9/18/2012 Declaration
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: 9/18/2012 Opposition to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: 9/7/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: 9/7/2012 Motion for Extension of Time
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: 8/24/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: 8/17/2012 Opposition to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: 8/13/2012 Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: 8/9/2012 Motion for Protective Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: 8/7/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Opposition to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Motion to Quash
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: 8/1/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: 8/1/2012 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: 8/1/2012 Motion for Protective Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: 7/30/2012 Opposition to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: 7/18/2012 Motion for Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: 7/6/2012 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: 6/22/2012 Declaration
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: 6/22/2012 Opposition to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: 6/13/2012 Response to Court Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: 6/8/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: 6/8/2012 Motion for Sanctions
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: 6/1/2012 Joint statement of counsel
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: 5/22/2012 Transcript
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: 5/16/2012 Statement of counsel
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012 Response to Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: 5/1/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: 5/1/2012 Motion for Hearing
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: 4/27/2012 Opposition to Motion
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: 4/27/2012 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/26/2012 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/26/2012 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/26/2012 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/26/2012 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: 4/16/2012 Declaration
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: 4/16/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: 4/16/2012 Motion to Compel
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: 4/13/2012 Objection
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: 4/12/2012 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: 4/12/2012 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: 3/22/2012 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: 3/20/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: 3/15/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: 3/15/2012 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: 3/9/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: 3/9/2012 Response to Motion
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: 3/2/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: 3/2/2012 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: 3/2/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: 3/2/2012 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: 2/29/2012 Protective Order
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: 2/24/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: 2/24/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: 2/24/2012 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: 2/24/2012 Notice regarding mandatory registration for ECF (Western Division only)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/24/2012 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/23/2012 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/23/2012 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/23/2012 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/23/2012 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: 2/16/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: 2/16/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: 2/16/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: 2/16/2012 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: 2/3/2012 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: 1/12/2012 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: 1/6/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: 1/6/2012 Joint submission
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: 1/6/2012 Joint submission
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: 1/6/2012 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: 12/23/2011 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: 12/12/2011 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: 12/12/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: 12/8/2011 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: 12/7/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: 11/23/2011 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: 11/23/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: 11/23/2011 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: 11/17/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 79 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: 11/10/2011 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Michael A. Ponsor: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. As follows: Defendants Motion to Decertify the Plaintiffs Class Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(c), (Dkt. No. 66 ), is hereby DENIED. Defendants Motion to Stay Discovery Pending a Ruling on their Motion to Decertify the Class, (Dkt. No. 67 ), is also hereby DENIED, as moot. (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: 11/3/2011 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: 11/3/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: 11/3/2011 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: 10/20/2011 Notice regarding mandatory registration for ECF (Western Division only)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: 10/20/2011 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: 10/18/2011 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: 10/18/2011 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 79 Filed: 11/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Michael A. Ponsor: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. As follows: Defendants Motion to Decertify the Plaintiffs Class Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(c), (Dkt. No. 66 ), is hereby DENIED. Defendants Motion to Stay Discovery Pending a Ruling on their Motion to Decertify the Class, (Dkt. No. 67 ), is also hereby DENIED, as moot. (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: 9/21/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 70 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: 9/21/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 68 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: 9/7/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: 9/6/2011 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: 9/6/2011 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: 7/7/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: 7/1/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: 6/17/2011 Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: 6/16/2011 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: 5/3/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: 4/4/2011 Procedural Order re pretrial/trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: 4/4/2011 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: 3/30/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: 3/30/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: 3/30/2011 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: 3/30/2011 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: 3/24/2011 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: 3/24/2011 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: 3/24/2011 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: 3/24/2011 Joint submission
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011 Notice of Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: 2/28/2011 Order on Motion to Certify Class
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: 2/11/2011 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: 2/11/2011 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: 2/11/2011 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: 1/4/2011 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: 12/7/2010 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: 12/7/2010 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: 11/18/2010 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: 11/18/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: 11/18/2010 Surreply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: 11/17/2010 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: 11/17/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Motion to Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: 11/10/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: 11/5/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: 10/14/2010 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: 9/30/2010 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 17 MOTION to Dismiss As to the Governor, 18 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Bartosz, Sara) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: 9/30/2010 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Plaintiffs.(Bartosz, Sara) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: 8/31/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 9/30/2010 to File Response/Reply as to 17 MOTION to Dismiss As to the Governor, 18 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by All Plaintiffs.(Persky, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: 8/26/2010 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter/request (non-motion) from Amy Spector, A.A.G. for Purpose of Filing Table of Authorities in Connection with Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss. (Spector, Amy) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: 8/20/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 18 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: 2007 CFSR Report, # 2 Exhibit B: Program Improvement Plan, # 3 Legal Addendum: Court Rules)(Spector, Amy) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: 8/20/2010 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Defendants.(Spector, Amy) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: 8/20/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by All Defendants.(Spector, Amy) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: 8/20/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss As to the Governor by Deval L. Patrick.(Spector, Amy) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Spector on behalf of All Defendants (Spector, Amy) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: 8/3/2010 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION and Proposed Order Governing the Treatment of Confidential Information by All Parties. (Quinan, Robert) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: 7/2/2010 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION re 2 MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Counsel MOTION to Appoint Counsel ; Stipulation Concerning Initial Rule 23 Discovery and Defendants' Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by All Parties, All Defendants, All Plaintiffs. (Quinan, Robert) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: 6/29/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to August 20, 2010 to File Answer or Other Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Deval L. Patrick, Judy Ann Bigby and Angelo McClain .(Quinan, Robert) Modified on 6/30/2010 to add Judy Ann Bigby and Angelo McClain as filers. (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: 6/29/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. Quinan, Jr on behalf of Deval L. Patrick, Judyann Bigby and Angelo McClain. (Quinan, Robert) Modified on 6/30/2010 to add Judyann Bigby and Angelo McClain's names to the text. (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed Angelo McClain served on 6/21/2010, answer due 7/12/2010. (Persky, Jonathan) (Finn, Mary). (Main Document 11 replaced on 6/22/2010) (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed Judyann Bigby served on 6/21/2010, answer due 7/12/2010. (Persky, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed Deval L. Patrick served on 6/21/2010, answer due 7/12/2010. (Persky, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed Angelo McClain served on 4/15/2010, answer due 5/6/2010. (Persky, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Judyann Bigby served on 4/15/2010, answer due 5/6/2010. (Persky, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed Deval L. Patrick served on 4/15/2010, answer due 5/6/2010. (Persky, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: 4/15/2010 Notice regarding mandatory registration for ECF (Western Division only)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE issued to Attorney Kara Morrow, Laurence Borton, Marcia Robinson Lowry, Sara Michelle Bartosz, Susan Lambiase regarding mandatory registration and use with ECF in compliance with the Standing Order entered by Judge Ponsor and Magistrate Judge Neiman. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: 4/15/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 2 MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Counsel MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Connor B., Rakeem D., Camila R., Adam S., Andre S., Seth T.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Marcia Robinson Lowry)(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: 4/15/2010 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Marcia Robinson Lowry, Susan Lambiase, Sara Michelle Bartosz, Laurence D. Borten, and Kara Morrow Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 0101-2866706 by Connor B., Rakeem D., Camila R., Adam S., Andre S., Seth T.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Affidavit, # 4 Affidavit, # 5 Affidavit)(Gleason, Daniel) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: 4/15/2010 Motion to Certify Class
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Counsel by Connor B., Rakeem D., Camila R., Adam S., Andre S., Seth T.. (Attachments: Added MOTION to Appoint of Class Counsel on 4/15/2010 (Finn, Mary). Modified on 4/15/2010 (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: 4/15/2010 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 0101-2866458 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Connor B., Rakeem D., Camila R., Adam S., Andre S., Seth T.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Form)(Gleason, Daniel) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/15/2010) (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 369 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?