Liberty Media Holdings, LLC v. Swarm Sharing Hash File et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-10802
District Judge William Young, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Avant Pavidapha, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Molari, Edward R.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/23/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Molari +1 617 942 1532 +1 815 642 8351 edward@molarilaw.com
No Logo Doe 10, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perry, Krumsiek & Jack, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/23/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy M. Cornell +1 617 720 4300 tcornell@pkjlaw.com
No Logo Doe 2, Defendant

Represented by Booth Sweet LLP

No Logo Does 1-38, Defendant
No Logo Jeremy Marron, Defendant
No Logo John Does 39-51, Defendant
No Logo Kyle Boran, Defendant
No Logo Larry Son, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Dan N Tran

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/23/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dan N. Tran +1 617 825 4849 dtran215@yahoo.com
No Logo Mark Packard, Defendant
No Logo Michael Rapisarda, Defendant
No Logo Philip Pirello, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/23/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexandra C. Fennell +1 617 204 5158 fennella@pepperlaw.com
No Logo Shannon Lyons, Defendant
No Logo Swarm Sharing Hash File, Defendant
No Logo Tha Chahn, Defendant
No Logo Theodore Warner, Defendant
No Logo Tim Granger, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ryan, Coughlin & Betke, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin J. O'Leary +1 617 988 8045 koleary@coughlinbetke.com
No Logo Tim Zoller, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tim Zoller
No Logo Liberty Media Holdings LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Saunders & Silverstein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Y. Silverstein +1 978 463 9130 +1 978 463 9109 trademarks@massiplaw.com;asilverstein@m
No Logo Doe 15, Objector
No Logo Jeffrey Menard, Deponent
No Logo Robert B. Collings, Mediator
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (123) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None
REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider (Dolan, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/21/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 122 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
      LREF
      Blank 121 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: 5/25/2012 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
        LREF
        Blank 120 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: 5/24/2012 OrderCourt Filing
        Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ORDER entered. NOTICE OF AND ORDER REGARDING MEDIATION. Mediation set for 7/30/2012 @ 11:15 AM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. Counsel are directed to be present with their respective clients or representatives thereof with full settlement authority. In addition, each party shall submit to Magistrate Judge Collings no later than five (5) business days before the conference a brief memorandum addressing the partys position on the merits of the case and on settlement. The memorandum should be marked Confidential - Not for Docketing and will be held in confidence by the court. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for FULL DETAILS AND REQUIREMENTS. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
          LREF
          Blank 119 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: 5/16/2012 ~Notice (other)
          NOTICE by Tim Granger on behalf of plaintiff Liberty Media Holdings LLC and Defendant Timothy Granger (O'Leary, Kevin) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
            LREF
            Blank 118 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: 4/18/2012 Order Referring Case to ADR
            REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution.(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
              LREF
              Blank 117 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: 4/17/2012 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                LREF
                Blank 116 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: 4/16/2012 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: 3/30/2012 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                  CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Timothy Granger. (O'Leary, Kevin) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 114 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: 3/30/2012 Stipulation of Dismissal
                    STIPULATION of Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                      LREF
                      Blank 113 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: 3/28/2012 Declaration
                      DECLARATION in Support re 110 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Michael Rapisarda by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Silverstein, Aaron) (Modified on 3/29/2012 to Correct Docket Text)) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 03/28/2012)
                        LREF
                        Blank 112 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: 3/28/2012 Declaration
                        DECLARATION in Support re 110 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Michael Rapisarda by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Silverstein, Aaron) (Modified on 3/29/2012 to COrrect Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 03/28/2012)
                          LREF
                          Blank 111 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: 3/28/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 110 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Michael Rapisarda filed by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
                            LREF
                            Blank 110 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: 3/28/2012 Motion for Default Judgment
                            MOTION for Default Judgment as to Michael Rapisarda by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
                              LREF
                              Blank 109 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: 3/22/2012 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                LREF
                                Blank 108 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: 3/21/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 58 Amended Complaint, by Tim Zoller.(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: 3/15/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                  Second MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/30/2012 to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Philip Pirello.(Fennell, Alexandra) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: 3/15/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                    Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. re 104 JOINT STATEMENT is so ordered as the case management scheduling order. DISCOVERY DUE December 7, 2012 and DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE January 2, 2013. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 105 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: 3/15/2012 Agreement for Judgment
                                      AGREEMENT FOR JUDGMENT by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: 3/13/2012 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                                        JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 103 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: 3/9/2012 Answer to Counterclaim
                                          ANSWER to Counterclaim by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC.(Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 102 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: 3/8/2012 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: 3/8/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                              Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 04/21/2012 to File Answer re 81 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC.(Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 100 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: 3/8/2012 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                                                JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 99 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: 3/7/2012 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                  CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D)(3). (Fennell, Alexandra) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 98 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: 3/7/2012 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                    Assented to MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Doe 15.(Irvine, Peter) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 97 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: 3/7/2012 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                      Assented to MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jeffrey Menard.(Irvine, Peter) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 96 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: 3/2/2012 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                        CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 95 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: 3/1/2012 Opposition to Motion
                                                          Emergency Opposition re 93 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to 03/31/2012 to Serve Doe 15 filed by Doe 15, Jeffrey Menard. (Irvine, Peter) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 94 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: 3/1/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 93 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to 03/31/2012 to Serve Doe 15 filed by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 93 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: 3/1/2012 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                              Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to 03/31/2012 to Serve Doe 15 by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC.(Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 92 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: 2/28/2012 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 91 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: 2/27/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 58 Amended Complaint, by Tim Zoller.(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/27/2012)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: 2/27/2012 Standing Order re motions for default judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                    Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment as to Michael Rapisarda. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/27/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: 2/27/2012 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
                                                                      NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Michael Rapisarda (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/27/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank 88 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: 2/24/2012 Declaration
                                                                        DECLARATION re 87 Request for notice of default by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 87 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: 2/24/2012 Request for notice of default
                                                                          Request for notice of default by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC . (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 86 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/23/2012 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 85 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: 2/22/2012 Motion to Continue
                                                                              MOTION to Continue scheduling conference by Tim Granger.(O'Leary, Kevin) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 84 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: 2/21/2012 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 3/7/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 83 Filed: 2/20/2012, Entered: 2/20/2012 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 02/20/2012)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 82 Filed: 2/20/2012, Entered: 2/20/2012 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 02/20/2012)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 81 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                      ANSWER to 58 Amended Complaint, , First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Avant Pavidapha.(Molari, Edward) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 80 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Edward R. Molari on behalf of Avant Pavidapha (Molari, Edward) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 79 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: 2/16/2012 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Larry Son served on 1/27/2012, answer due 2/17/2012 by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Silverstein, Aaron) (Modified on 2/17/2012 to Correct Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 78 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: 2/16/2012 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Mark Packard served on 1/28/2012, answer due 2/21/2012 by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Silverstein, Aaron) (Modified on 2/17/2012 to Correct Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 77 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: 2/16/2012 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Tha Chahn served on 1/27/2012, answer due 2/17/2012 by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Silverstein, Aaron) (Modified on 2/17/2012 to Correct Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 76 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: 2/16/2012 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Avant Pavidapha served on 1/27/2012, answer due 2/17/2012 by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Silverstein, Aaron) (Modified on 2/17/2012 to Correct Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 75 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: 2/16/2012 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Michael Rapisarda served on 1/28/2012, answer due 2/18/2012 by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Silverstein, Aaron) (Modified on 2/17/2012 to Correct Docket Text and Answer Date) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 74 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: 2/16/2012 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Shannon Lyons served on 1/27/2012, answer due 2/17/2012 by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Silverstein, Aaron) (Modified on 2/17/2012 to Correct Docket Text and Answer Deadline) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 73 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: 2/16/2012 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Tim Granger served on 1/26/2012, answer due 2/16/2012 by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Silverstein, Aaron) (Modified on 2/17/2012 to Correct Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: 2/16/2012 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Philip Pirello served on 1/27/2012, answer due 3/19/2012 by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Silverstein, Aaron) (Modified on 2/17/2012 to Correct Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 71 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: 2/15/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 19, 2012 to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Philip Pirello.(Fennell, Alexandra) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 70 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: 2/15/2012 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra C. Fennell on behalf of Philip Pirello (Fennell, Alexandra) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: 2/15/2012 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                              ANSWER to 58 Amended Complaint, and Jury Demand by Tim Granger.(O'Leary, Kevin) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 68 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: 2/15/2012 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J. O'Leary on behalf of Tim Granger (O'Leary, Kevin) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 67 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: 2/13/2012 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 58 Amended Complaint, by Larry Son.(Tran, Dan) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 66 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: 2/10/2012 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. Tim Zoller served on 2/4/2012, answer due 2/27/2012. Acknowledgement filed by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: 2/2/2012 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Dan N. Tran on behalf of Larry Son (Tran, Dan) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 64 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: 1/30/2012 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                        Opposition re 62 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order (Second), 61 Second MOTION to Stay filed by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: 1/26/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 62 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order (Second), 61 Second MOTION to Stay filed by Jeffrey Menard. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Affidavit)(Irvine, Peter) (Entered: 01/26/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 62 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: 1/26/2012 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                            Emergency MOTION for Protective Order (Second) by Jeffrey Menard.(Irvine, Peter) (Entered: 01/26/2012)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 61 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: 1/26/2012 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                              Second MOTION to Stay by Jeffrey Menard.(Irvine, Peter) (Entered: 01/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: 1/26/2012 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Peter R. Irvine on behalf of Jeffrey Menard (Attachments: # 1 certificate of service)(Irvine, Peter) (Entered: 01/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 59 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: 1/24/2012 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Kyle Boran, Tha Chahn, Tim Granger, John Does 39-51, Shannon Lyons, Jeremy Marron, Mark Packard, Avant Pavidapha, Philip Pirello, Michael Rapisarda, Larry Son, Theodore Warner, Tim Zoller. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 58 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: 1/23/2012 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against Swarm Sharing Hash File, Doe 15, Philip Pirello, Avant Pavidapha, Theodore Warner, Shannon Lyons, Tim Zoller, Mark Packard, Larry Son, Kyle Boran, Michael Rapisarda, John Does 39-51, Tha Chahn, Jeremy Marron, Tim Granger, filed by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: 1/23/2012 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 56 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: 11/14/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 55 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: 11/10/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 54 MOTION for Extension of Time to 03/01/2012 to Serve complaint filed by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: 11/10/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to 03/01/2012 to Serve complaint by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC.(Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/8/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 52 MOTION for Extension of Time to 03/01/2012 to Serve Complaint filed by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 52 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/8/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to 03/01/2012 to Serve Complaint by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC.(Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 11/6/2011, Entered: 11/6/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 11/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: 11/3/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: 11/1/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 10/31/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Y. Silverstein on behalf of Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 47 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 10/31/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 46 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 10/31/2011 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM as to ECF No. 26 Order denying the motions to quash. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: 10/20/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: 10/20/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: 10/19/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 41 Emergency MOTION to Stay Deposition, 42 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order filed by Jeffrey Menard. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Irvine, Peter) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: 10/19/2011 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                    Emergency MOTION for Protective Order by Jeffrey Menard.(Irvine, Peter) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: 10/19/2011 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                      Emergency MOTION to Stay Deposition by Jeffrey Menard.(Irvine, Peter) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: 10/19/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Peter R. Irvine on behalf of Jeffrey Menard (Irvine, Peter) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: 10/14/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: 10/11/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 10/9/2011, Entered: 10/9/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 10/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: 9/29/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: 9/23/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: 9/23/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: 8/29/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: 8/25/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 31 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/02/2011 to Serve Complaint filed by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: 8/25/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                          Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/02/2011 to Serve Complaint by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC.(Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: 8/24/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: 8/23/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: 7/27/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: 7/26/2011 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION to Seal Document or, in the Alternative, Redact Motion to Quash Subpoena by Doe 2.(Booth, Daniel) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: 7/25/2011 Order on Motion to QuashCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered denying 12 Motion to Quash; denying 13 Motion to Quash; denying 16 Motion to Quash (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: 7/20/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: 7/11/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy M. Cornell on behalf of Doe 10 (Cornell, Timothy) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: 7/5/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition re 16 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: 7/1/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re 12 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: 7/1/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re 13 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: 7/1/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond re 16 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Doe 15. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Irvine, Peter) (Modified on 7/5/2011 to Update Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: 6/30/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: 6/30/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: 6/30/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: 6/24/2011 Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Doe 15. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Subpoena, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Irvine, Peter) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: 6/24/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Peter R. Irvine on behalf of Doe 15 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Irvine, Peter) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: 6/23/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: 6/21/2011 Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Quash Subpoenas by John Doe.(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: 6/17/2011 Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Does 1-38.(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: 5/11/2011 Order on Motion for DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered granting 6 Emergency MOTION for Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Appendix - A) (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: 5/10/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT. Liberty Media Holdings, LLC re Order on Motion to Reassign Case (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: 5/10/2011 Motion to Reassign Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Reassign Case by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC.(Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: 5/9/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re 6 Emergency MOTION for Discovery by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: 5/9/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 6 Emergency MOTION for Discovery filed by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: 5/9/2011 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Emergency MOTION for Discovery by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: 5/9/2011 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons Issued as to Does 1-38, Swarm Sharing Hash File. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: 5/9/2011 Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the attached General Order and Notice regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: 5/6/2011 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: 5/6/2011 Report on the filing/termination of copyright case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case. (Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: 5/6/2011 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Swarm Sharing Hash File AE340D0560129AFEE8D78CE07F2394C7B5BC9C05, and Does 1-38 Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 0101-3394738 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Liberty Media Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Local Category Form)(Silverstein, Aaron) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 134 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?