Capital Records, Inc. et al v. Alaujan

Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-11661
District Judge Nancy Gertner, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Nancy Gertner
Last Updated September 16, 2016 at 3:19 AM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Answerthink, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Holme Roberts & Owen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eve Goldstein Burton +1 303 866 0551 +1 303 866 0200 eve.burton@hro.com

Represented by Mann & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Simon B. Mann +1 508 270 0500 +1 508 270 0515 simon@sbmannlaw.com

Represented by Recording Industry Association Of America, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Oppenheim +1 202 775 0101

Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher S. Feudo +1 617 557 5900 +1 617 557 5999 cfeudo@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire E. Newton +1 617 557 5900 +1 617 557 5999 cnewton@rc.com
No Logo Arista Records Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Collora LLP

Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabriel M. Helmer +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 ghelmer@foleyhoag.com
TERMINATED: 03/07/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colin J. Zick +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 czick@foleyhoag.com

Represented by Holme Roberts & Owen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/11/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JEFFREY C. BLAIR +1 303 861 7000 jeffrey.blair@hro.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eve Goldstein Burton +1 303 866 0551 +1 303 866 0200 eve.burton@hro.com
TERMINATED: 06/12/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Lance Gabriel +1 303 866 0331 +1 303 866 0200 richard.gabriel@hro.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurie Rust +1 415 268 2000 +1 415 268 1999 laurie.rust@hro.com

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/24/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Perrelli +1 202 639 6004 +1 202 661 4855 tperrelli@jenner.com

Represented by Recording Industry Association Of America, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Oppenheim +1 202 775 0101

Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy M. Cremins +1 617 557 5971 +1 617 557 5999 ncremins@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/14/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa M. D'Alelio +1 617 557 5924 +1 617 557 5999 mdalelio@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher S. Feudo +1 617 557 5900 +1 617 557 5999 cfeudo@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire E. Newton +1 617 557 5900 +1 617 557 5999 cnewton@rc.com

Represented by Testa, Hurwitz & Thibeault LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Bauer +1 617 248 7000
No Logo Atlantic Recording Corporation, Plaintiff

Represented by Collora LLP

Represented by Holme Roberts & Owen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/11/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JEFFREY C. BLAIR +1 303 861 7000 jeffrey.blair@hro.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eve Goldstein Burton +1 303 866 0551 +1 303 866 0200 eve.burton@hro.com
TERMINATED: 06/12/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Lance Gabriel +1 303 866 0331 +1 303 866 0200 richard.gabriel@hro.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurie Rust +1 415 268 2000 +1 415 268 1999 laurie.rust@hro.com

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/24/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Perrelli +1 202 639 6004 +1 202 661 4855 tperrelli@jenner.com

Represented by Recording Industry Association Of America, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Oppenheim +1 202 775 0101

Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy M. Cremins +1 617 557 5971 +1 617 557 5999 ncremins@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/14/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa M. D'Alelio +1 617 557 5924 +1 617 557 5999 mdalelio@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher S. Feudo +1 617 557 5900 +1 617 557 5999 cfeudo@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire E. Newton +1 617 557 5900 +1 617 557 5999 cnewton@rc.com

Represented by Testa, Hurwitz & Thibeault LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Bauer +1 617 248 7000
BMG Music BMG Music, Plaintiff

Represented by Collora LLP

Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabriel M. Helmer +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 ghelmer@foleyhoag.com
TERMINATED: 03/07/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colin J. Zick +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 czick@foleyhoag.com

Represented by Holme Roberts & Owen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eve Goldstein Burton +1 303 866 0551 +1 303 866 0200 eve.burton@hro.com
TERMINATED: 06/12/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Lance Gabriel +1 303 866 0331 +1 303 866 0200 richard.gabriel@hro.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurie Rust +1 415 268 2000 +1 415 268 1999 laurie.rust@hro.com

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/24/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Perrelli +1 202 639 6004 +1 202 661 4855 tperrelli@jenner.com

Represented by Recording Industry Association Of America, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Oppenheim +1 202 775 0101

Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy M. Cremins +1 617 557 5971 +1 617 557 5999 ncremins@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/14/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa M. D'Alelio +1 617 557 5924 +1 617 557 5999 mdalelio@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher S. Feudo +1 617 557 5900 +1 617 557 5999 cfeudo@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire E. Newton +1 617 557 5900 +1 617 557 5999 cnewton@rc.com

Represented by Testa, Hurwitz & Thibeault LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Bauer +1 617 248 7000
Capitol Records, Inc. Capitol Records, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabriel M. Helmer +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 ghelmer@foleyhoag.com
TERMINATED: 03/07/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colin J. Zick +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 czick@foleyhoag.com

Represented by Holme Roberts & Owen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eve Goldstein Burton +1 303 866 0551 +1 303 866 0200 eve.burton@hro.com
TERMINATED: 06/12/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Lance Gabriel +1 303 866 0331 +1 303 866 0200 richard.gabriel@hro.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurie Rust +1 415 268 2000 +1 415 268 1999 laurie.rust@hro.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eve Goldstein Burton +1 303 866 0551 +1 303 866 0200 eve.burton@hro.com
TERMINATED: 06/12/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Lance Gabriel +1 303 866 0331 +1 303 866 0200 richard.gabriel@hro.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurie Rust +1 415 268 2000 +1 415 268 1999 laurie.rust@hro.com

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/24/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Perrelli +1 202 639 6004 +1 202 661 4855 tperrelli@jenner.com

Represented by Mann & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Simon B. Mann +1 508 270 0500 +1 508 270 0515 simon@sbmannlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Simon B. Mann +1 508 270 0500 +1 508 270 0515 simon@sbmannlaw.com

Represented by Recording Industry Association Of America, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Oppenheim +1 202 775 0101
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Oppenheim +1 202 775 0101

Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy M. Cremins +1 617 557 5971 +1 617 557 5999 ncremins@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher S. Feudo +1 617 557 5900 +1 617 557 5999 cfeudo@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire E. Newton +1 617 557 5900 +1 617 557 5999 cnewton@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy M. Cremins +1 617 557 5971 +1 617 557 5999 ncremins@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher S. Feudo +1 617 557 5900 +1 617 557 5999 cfeudo@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire E. Newton +1 617 557 5900 +1 617 557 5999 cnewton@rc.com

Represented by Testa, Hurwitz & Thibeault LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Bauer +1 617 248 7000
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Bauer +1 617 248 7000
No Logo Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabriel M. Helmer +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 ghelmer@foleyhoag.com
TERMINATED: 03/07/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colin J. Zick +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 czick@foleyhoag.com

Represented by Holme Roberts & Owen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eve Goldstein Burton +1 303 866 0551 +1 303 866 0200 eve.burton@hro.com
TERMINATED: 06/12/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Lance Gabriel +1 303 866 0331 +1 303 866 0200 richard.gabriel@hro.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurie Rust +1 415 268 2000 +1 415 268 1999 laurie.rust@hro.com

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/24/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Perrelli +1 202 639 6004 +1 202 661 4855 tperrelli@jenner.com

Represented by Recording Industry Association Of America, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Oppenheim +1 202 775 0101

Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy M. Cremins +1 617 557 5971 +1 617 557 5999 ncremins@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher S. Feudo +1 617 557 5900 +1 617 557 5999 cfeudo@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire E. Newton +1 617 557 5900 +1 617 557 5999 cnewton@rc.com

Represented by Testa, Hurwitz & Thibeault LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Bauer +1 617 248 7000
No Logo Fonovisa, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2006, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabriel M. Helmer +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 ghelmer@foleyhoag.com

Represented by Holme Roberts & Owen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eve Goldstein Burton +1 303 866 0551 +1 303 866 0200 eve.burton@hro.com
TERMINATED: 06/12/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Lance Gabriel +1 303 866 0331 +1 303 866 0200 richard.gabriel@hro.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurie Rust +1 415 268 2000 +1 415 268 1999 laurie.rust@hro.com

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/24/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Perrelli +1 202 639 6004 +1 202 661 4855 tperrelli@jenner.com

Represented by Recording Industry Association Of America, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Oppenheim +1 202 775 0101

Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy M. Cremins +1 617 557 5971 +1 617 557 5999 ncremins@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher S. Feudo +1 617 557 5900 +1 617 557 5999 cfeudo@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire E. Newton +1 617 557 5900 +1 617 557 5999 cnewton@rc.com

Represented by Testa, Hurwitz & Thibeault LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Bauer +1 617 248 7000
No Logo Interscope Records, Plaintiff

Represented by Recording Industry Association Of America, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Oppenheim +1 202 775 0101
No Logo Maverick Recording Company, Plaintiff

Represented by Recording Industry Association Of America, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Oppenheim +1 202 775 0101
Motown Record Company, LP Motown Record Company, LP, Plaintiff

Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2006, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabriel M. Helmer +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 ghelmer@foleyhoag.com

Represented by Holme Roberts & Owen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eve Goldstein Burton +1 303 866 0551 +1 303 866 0200 eve.burton@hro.com
TERMINATED: 06/12/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Lance Gabriel +1 303 866 0331 +1 303 866 0200 richard.gabriel@hro.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurie Rust +1 415 268 2000 +1 415 268 1999 laurie.rust@hro.com

Represented by Recording Industry Association Of America, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Oppenheim +1 202 775 0101

Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy M. Cremins +1 617 557 5971 +1 617 557 5999 ncremins@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher S. Feudo +1 617 557 5900 +1 617 557 5999 cfeudo@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire E. Newton +1 617 557 5900 +1 617 557 5999 cnewton@rc.com

Represented by Testa, Hurwitz & Thibeault LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Bauer +1 617 248 7000
No Logo Recording Industry Association of America, Plaintiff

Represented by Holme Roberts & Owen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eve Goldstein Burton +1 303 866 0551 +1 303 866 0200 eve.burton@hro.com

Represented by Mann & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Simon B. Mann +1 508 270 0500 +1 508 270 0515 simon@sbmannlaw.com

Represented by Recording Industry Association Of America, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Oppenheim +1 202 775 0101

Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher S. Feudo +1 617 557 5900 +1 617 557 5999 cfeudo@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire E. Newton +1 617 557 5900 +1 617 557 5999 cnewton@rc.com
Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. Sony Music Entertainment, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Collora LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victoria L. Steinberg +1 617 371 1000 vsteinberg@dwyercollora.com

Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabriel M. Helmer +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 ghelmer@foleyhoag.com
TERMINATED: 03/07/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colin J. Zick +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 czick@foleyhoag.com

Represented by Holme Roberts & Owen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eve Goldstein Burton +1 303 866 0551 +1 303 866 0200 eve.burton@hro.com
TERMINATED: 06/12/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Lance Gabriel +1 303 866 0331 +1 303 866 0200 richard.gabriel@hro.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurie Rust +1 415 268 2000 +1 415 268 1999 laurie.rust@hro.com

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/24/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Perrelli +1 202 639 6004 +1 202 661 4855 tperrelli@jenner.com

Represented by Recording Industry Association Of America, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Oppenheim +1 202 775 0101

Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy M. Cremins +1 617 557 5971 +1 617 557 5999 ncremins@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher S. Feudo +1 617 557 5900 +1 617 557 5999 cfeudo@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire E. Newton +1 617 557 5900 +1 617 557 5999 cnewton@rc.com

Represented by Testa, Hurwitz & Thibeault LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Bauer +1 617 248 7000
No Logo UMG Recordings, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Collora LLP

Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabriel M. Helmer +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 ghelmer@foleyhoag.com
TERMINATED: 03/07/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colin J. Zick +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 czick@foleyhoag.com

Represented by Holme Roberts & Owen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/11/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JEFFREY C. BLAIR +1 303 861 7000 jeffrey.blair@hro.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eve Goldstein Burton +1 303 866 0551 +1 303 866 0200 eve.burton@hro.com
TERMINATED: 06/12/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Lance Gabriel +1 303 866 0331 +1 303 866 0200 richard.gabriel@hro.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurie Rust +1 415 268 2000 +1 415 268 1999 laurie.rust@hro.com

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/24/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Perrelli +1 202 639 6004 +1 202 661 4855 tperrelli@jenner.com

Represented by Recording Industry Association Of America, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Oppenheim +1 202 775 0101

Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy M. Cremins +1 617 557 5971 +1 617 557 5999 ncremins@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/14/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa M. D'Alelio +1 617 557 5924 +1 617 557 5999 mdalelio@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher S. Feudo +1 617 557 5900 +1 617 557 5999 cfeudo@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire E. Newton +1 617 557 5900 +1 617 557 5999 cnewton@rc.com

Represented by Testa, Hurwitz & Thibeault LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Bauer +1 617 248 7000
No Logo Virgin Records America, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabriel M. Helmer +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 ghelmer@foleyhoag.com
TERMINATED: 03/07/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colin J. Zick +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 czick@foleyhoag.com

Represented by Holme Roberts & Owen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/11/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JEFFREY C. BLAIR +1 303 861 7000 jeffrey.blair@hro.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eve Goldstein Burton +1 303 866 0551 +1 303 866 0200 eve.burton@hro.com
TERMINATED: 06/12/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Lance Gabriel +1 303 866 0331 +1 303 866 0200 richard.gabriel@hro.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurie Rust +1 415 268 2000 +1 415 268 1999 laurie.rust@hro.com

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/24/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Perrelli +1 202 639 6004 +1 202 661 4855 tperrelli@jenner.com

Represented by Recording Industry Association Of America, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Oppenheim +1 202 775 0101

Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy M. Cremins +1 617 557 5971 +1 617 557 5999 ncremins@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/14/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa M. D'Alelio +1 617 557 5924 +1 617 557 5999 mdalelio@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher S. Feudo +1 617 557 5900 +1 617 557 5999 cfeudo@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire E. Newton +1 617 557 5900 +1 617 557 5999 cnewton@rc.com

Represented by Testa, Hurwitz & Thibeault LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Bauer +1 617 248 7000
No Logo Warner Bros. Records Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Recording Industry Association Of America, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Oppenheim +1 202 775 0101
No Logo Joel Tenenbaum, Counter-Claimant

Represented by President and Fellows of Harvard College

No Logo Katherine Monahan, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Karol
v.
No Logo ALL PLAINTIFFS, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2006, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabriel M. Helmer +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 ghelmer@foleyhoag.com
TERMINATED: 03/07/2006, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colin J. Zick +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 czick@foleyhoag.com

Represented by Holme Roberts & Owen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eve Goldstein Burton +1 303 866 0551 +1 303 866 0200 eve.burton@hro.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katheryn Jarvis Coggon +1 303 866 0408 +1 303 866 0200 katheryn.coggon@hro.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurie Rust +1 415 268 2000 +1 415 268 1999 laurie.rust@hro.com

Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy M. Cremins +1 617 557 5971 +1 617 557 5999 ncremins@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/14/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa M. D'Alelio +1 617 557 5924 +1 617 557 5999 mdalelio@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire E. Newton +1 617 557 5900 +1 617 557 5999 cnewton@rc.com

Represented by Testa, Hurwitz & Thibeault LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Bauer +1 617 248 7000
No Logo Arista Records Inc., Counter-Defendant

Represented by Collora LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victoria L. Steinberg +1 617 371 1000 vsteinberg@dwyercollora.com
BMG Music BMG Music, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Collora LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victoria L. Steinberg +1 617 371 1000 vsteinberg@dwyercollora.com
No Logo Interscope Records, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2006, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabriel M. Helmer +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 ghelmer@foleyhoag.com

Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa M. D'Alelio +1 617 557 5924 +1 617 557 5999 mdalelio@rc.com
No Logo Maverick Recording Company, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2006, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabriel M. Helmer +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 ghelmer@foleyhoag.com
No Logo Priority Records, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2006, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabriel M. Helmer +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 ghelmer@foleyhoag.com
Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. Sony Music Entertainment, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Represented by Collora LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victoria L. Steinberg +1 617 371 1000 vsteinberg@dwyercollora.com

Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabriel M. Helmer +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 ghelmer@foleyhoag.com
TERMINATED: 03/07/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colin J. Zick +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 czick@foleyhoag.com

Represented by Holme Roberts & Owen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eve Goldstein Burton +1 303 866 0551 +1 303 866 0200 eve.burton@hro.com
TERMINATED: 06/12/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Lance Gabriel +1 303 866 0331 +1 303 866 0200 richard.gabriel@hro.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurie Rust +1 415 268 2000 +1 415 268 1999 laurie.rust@hro.com

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/24/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Perrelli +1 202 639 6004 +1 202 661 4855 tperrelli@jenner.com

Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy M. Cremins +1 617 557 5971 +1 617 557 5999 ncremins@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher S. Feudo +1 617 557 5900 +1 617 557 5999 cfeudo@rc.com
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire E. Newton +1 617 557 5900 +1 617 557 5999 cnewton@rc.com

Represented by Testa, Hurwitz & Thibeault LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Bauer +1 617 248 7000
No Logo UMG Recordings, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Represented by Collora LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victoria L. Steinberg +1 617 371 1000 vsteinberg@dwyercollora.com
No Logo Warner Bros. Records Inc., Counter-Defendant

Represented by Collora LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victoria L. Steinberg +1 617 371 1000 vsteinberg@dwyercollora.com

Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2006, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabriel M. Helmer +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 ghelmer@foleyhoag.com

Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa M. D'Alelio +1 617 557 5924 +1 617 557 5999 mdalelio@rc.com
Other Parties
No Logo Albert Michaud, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Donovan Hatem, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/14/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul G. Boylan +1 617 406 4500 +1 617 406 4501
No Logo Amanda Paul, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by 708 John Quincy Adams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amanda Paul +1 978 297 3232
No Logo Andrea M. O'Shaughnessy, Consolidated Defendant

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrea M. O'Shaughnessy
No Logo Brian Cusack, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth M. Yurdin +1 617 620 4044 +1 617 344 5957 syurdin@hotmail.com
No Logo Catherine Simmons, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Law Office of George W. Gray Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George W. Gray, Jr. +1 978 388 1032 +1 978 388 1033
No Logo Colleen Fanguiaire, Consolidated Defendant

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Colleen Fanguiaire
No Logo Daniel Richardson, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Deborah Ann, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Law Office of John J. McGlynn, Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J. McGlynn, Jr. +1 978 740 4091 +1 978 740 2703

Represented by Law Offices of John J. McGlynn, Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charmaine M. Blanchard +1 978 740 4091 +1 978 740 2703 charmaine@jmcglynnlaw.com
No Logo Diane Briggs, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Briggs, Diane

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Diane Briggs +1 508 577 5660
No Logo Edward Kerrissey, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles M. MacLean +1 508 879 5730 Charles.Maclean@verizon.net
No Logo Elizabeth Stewart, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Law Offices of Ronald N. Whitney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald N. Whitney +1 617 447 3899 +1 781 447 4042 rwhitneylaw@hotmail.com
No Logo Florcie Mathe, Consolidated Defendant

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Florcie Mathe
No Logo Francis Haley, Jr., Consolidated Defendant

Represented by The Law offices of Partridge,Ankner & Horstmann,LLP

No Logo George Nadolny, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Jamie Stillman, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles J. DiMare +1 413 549 5330 +1 413 549 3333 cjdimare3152@aol.com

Represented by Univ. of MA - Amherst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa G. Kent +1 413 545 1995 +1 413 545 2373 lkent@lnn-law.com
No Logo Jason Connolly, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles J. DiMare +1 413 549 5330 +1 413 549 3333 cjdimare3152@aol.com

Represented by Univ. of MA - Amherst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa G. Kent +1 413 545 1995 +1 413 545 2373 lkent@lnn-law.com
No Logo Jill Hibbard, Consolidated Defendant

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jill Hibbard
No Logo Jin, Yang, Consolidated Defendant

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jin Yang
No Logo Joel Tenenbaum, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Feinberg & Kamholtz

Represented by President and Fellows of Harvard College

No Logo John Huttunen, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo John Leiendecker, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/20/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daryl J. Lapp +1 617 239 0174 +1 617 316 8272 dlapp@eapdlaw.com
No Logo John McDermott, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Joseph Robichaud, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles J. DiMare +1 413 549 5330 +1 413 549 3333 cjdimare3152@aol.com

Represented by Univ. of MA - Amherst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa G. Kent +1 413 545 1995 +1 413 545 2373 lkent@lnn-law.com
No Logo Joyce Crowe, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Partridge, Snow & Hahn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Kehoe +1 774 206 8200 +1 774 206 8210 mak@psh.com
No Logo Judith Sabatino, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth M. Yurdin +1 617 620 4044 +1 617 344 5957 syurdin@hotmail.com
No Logo Katherine Monahan, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Karol
No Logo Kristin Ktsanes, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Verrill & Dana, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/06/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George P. Field +1 617 309 2600 +1 617 309 2601 gfield@verrilldana.com
No Logo LaShaana Straw, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donna L. Conley +1 617 696 6360 countess2@msn.com
No Logo Linda Whiting, Consolidated Defendant

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda Whiting
No Logo Mary Manning, Consolidated Defendant

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary Manning
No Logo Maryann Brayden, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Campo Anderson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/22/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles M. Campo, Jr. +1 617 423 4949 +1 617 423 4929 cmc@campoanderson.com
No Logo Matthew Bittarelli, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J. Regan +1 978 538 9500 +1 978 538 9550 jreganesq@aol.com
No Logo Maureen Jones, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Michael Manzi, III, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Manzi +1 978 682 5343 mmanzi@manzilaw.com
No Logo Michael Fitzgerald, Consolidated Defendant

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Fitzgerald +1 801 756 9763
No Logo Michael Sturge, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Univ. of MA - Amherst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa G. Kent +1 413 545 1995 +1 413 545 2373 lkent@lnn-law.com
No Logo Michele Mulligan, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth M. Yurdin +1 617 620 4044 +1 617 344 5957 syurdin@hotmail.com
No Logo Mitchell Klasky, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Nancy Kinchla, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel T. Doyle +1 508 883 1130 +1 808 883 1357 ddoylepc@comcast.net
No Logo Nancy Madden, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Law Offices of Kerry L Timbers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/01/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kerry L. Timbers KTimbers@sunsteinlaw.com
No Logo Patti Callagy, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Law Offices of Douglas T. Evans

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas T. Evans +1 978 887 5044 +1 978 887 6044
No Logo Peter Delgardo, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth M. Yurdin +1 617 620 4044 +1 617 344 5957 syurdin@hotmail.com
No Logo Regina Poshkus, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2006, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colin J. Zick +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 czick@foleyhoag.com

Represented by Shneyer & Associates Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul A. Shneyer
No Logo Renee Hudec, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth M. Yurdin +1 617 620 4044 +1 617 344 5957 syurdin@hotmail.com
No Logo Ryan Hallahan, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Hallahan, Ryan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan Hallahan +1 774 218 5706
No Logo Ryan Lindsey, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan Lindsey +1 714 513 5100 +1 714 513 5130 rlindsey@sheppardmullin.com
No Logo Shawn Scott, Consolidated Defendant

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shawn Scott

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/02/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William H. Sims +1 508 588 6900
No Logo Shelagh Hayes, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Byrne & Drechsler, L.L.P

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/01/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan E. Tobin +1 617 265 3900 +1 617 265 3627 JETobin@FBDLegal.com
No Logo Terrance Fitzgerald, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by Nutter, McClennen & Fish, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J. Gleason +1 617 439 2233 +1 617 310 9233 dgleason@nutter.com
TERMINATED: 09/30/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rebecca L. Sipowicz +1 617 439 2416 +1 617 310 9416 rsipowicz@nutter.com
No Logo Yevgeniya Shnayder, Consolidated Defendant

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Yevgeniya Shnayder
United States of America United States of America, Intervenor-Plaintiff
Attributes
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 501
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
Timeline
  Entries (957) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Page 1 Page 2

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 958 Filed: None, Entered: None
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 957 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: 8/26/2010 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 956 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: 8/26/2010 Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 955 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: 8/26/2010 Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 954 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: 8/26/2010 Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 953 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: 8/26/2010 Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 952 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: 8/26/2010 Transcript
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 951 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: 7/9/2010 Order on Motion for New Trial
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 950 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: 6/28/2010 Writ Issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 949 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 948 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
EXCERPT Transcript of Jury Trial Day One held on July 27, 2009, before Judge Gertner. Court Reporter: Valerie A.O'Hara at 617/737-2346. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 2/5/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/16/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/15/2010. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2010: # 1 Transcript) (Scalfani, Deborah). (Entered: 01/15/2010)
LREF
Blank 947 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: 1/4/2010 Motion for New Trial
MOTION for New Trial or Remittitur by Joel Tenenbaum.(Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 946 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered; DEFAULT JUDGMENT and Permanent Injunction in favor of plaintiffs as to Alexandra Griffin.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 945 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered; DEFAULT JUDGMENT and Permanent Injunction in favor of plaintiffs against Keri Ingemi.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 944 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered; DEFAULT JUDGMENT and Permanent Injunction in favor of plaintiffs against Alfonso Burgess.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 943 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered; DEFAULT JUDGMENT and Permanent Injunction in favor of plaintiffs against David E. Lopes.(Gaudet, Jennifer) Modified on 9/25/2009 (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 09/25/2009)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 942 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: 9/23/2009 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Charles Doherty (Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 941 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: 9/23/2009 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Michael Fitzgerald (Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 940 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: 9/14/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION for Extension of Time to 10 days after judgment to Respond to Plaintiffs' request for injunction by Joel Tenenbaum.(Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 939 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: 9/8/2009 Letter/request (non-motion)
ANSWER in letter form filed by Ryan Lindsey. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
LREF
Blank 938 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: 9/1/2009 Motion for Injunctive Relief
MOTION for Injunctive Relief and for Entry of Judgment in Tenenbaum by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Burton, Eve) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 937 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: 8/24/2009 Remark
Notes from the jury during deliberations. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/24/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 936 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: 8/21/2009 Letter/request (non-motion)
Letter/request (non-motion) from Timothy Reynolds in response to Letter of Charles Nesson (Doc. No. 927) in Tenenbaum. (Reynolds, Timothy) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 935 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: 8/21/2009 Satisfaction of Judgment
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT of Monetary Portion of Judgment re Colleen Azevedo by All Plaintiffs. (Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 934 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: 8/21/2009 Satisfaction of Judgment
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT of Monetary Portion of Judgment re Guri Jane Andersskog by All Plaintiffs. (Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 933 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: 8/21/2009 Satisfaction of Judgment
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT of Monetary Portion of Judgment re Jessica Williamson by All Plaintiffs. (Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 932 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: 8/21/2009 Satisfaction of Judgment
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT of Monetary Portion of Judgment re Heather Milton by All Plaintiffs. (Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 931 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: 8/21/2009 Motion for Entry of Default
MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Ryan Lindsey by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel J. Cloherty re Ryan Lindsey, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Daniel J. Cloherty re Lindsey, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Daniel J. Cloherty re Lindsey, # 4 Default by Clerk re Lindsey)(Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 930 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: 8/20/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM in Support re 929 MOTION for Default Judgment as to David E. Lopes filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 929 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: 8/20/2009 Motion for Default Judgment
MOTION for Default Judgment as to David E. Lopes by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel J. Cloherty re Lopes, # 2 Exhibit 1 Complaint for Copyright Infringement re Lopes, # 3 Exhibit 1A to Declaration of Daniel J. Cloherty re Lopes, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Daniel J. Cloherty re Lopes, # 5 Exhibit 3 Proposed Form of Default Judgment re Lopes, # 6 Exhibit 4 Proposed Form of Permanent Injunction re Lopes)(Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 928 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: 8/20/2009 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Dismissal Without Prejudice re Lucan Zabrorowski (Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
LREF
Blank 927 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: 8/20/2009 Letter/request (non-motion)Court Filing
Letter/request (non-motion) from Charles Nesson to Judge Gertner regarding digital recordings. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 926 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: 8/19/2009 Permanent InjunctionCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered; PERMANENT INJUNCTION as to Tahirih LaForest.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/19/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 925 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: 8/19/2009 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered; DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs against Tahirih LaForest. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/19/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 924 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: 8/19/2009 Permanent InjunctionCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered; PERMANENT INJUNCTION as to Melissa L. Desisto.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/19/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 923 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: 8/19/2009 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered; DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs against defendant Melissa L. Desisto.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/19/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 922 Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: 8/19/2009 Motion for Default Judgment
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Keri Ingemi by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel J. Cloherty, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Daniel J. Cloherty Declaration re Ingemi, # 3 Exhibit Ex 2 to Daniel J. Cloherty Declaration re Ingemi, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Daniel J. Cloherty Declaration re Ingemi, # 5 Exhibit 3 Proposed Form of Permanent Injunction re Ingemi, # 6 Exhibit 4 Proposed Form of Default Judgment re Ingemi)(Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 08/19/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 921 Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: 8/19/2009 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Dismissal With Prejudice re Janeen Nemes (Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 08/19/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 920 Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: 8/19/2009 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Satisfaction of Monetary Portion of Judgment re Joyce Crowe (Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 08/19/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 919 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: 8/14/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM in Support re 918 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Alfonso Burgess filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 918 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: 8/14/2009 Motion for Default Judgment
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Alfonso Burgess by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel J. Cloherty as to Alfonso Burgess, # 2 Exhibit Ex 1 to Declaration of Daniel J. Cloherty Complaint for Copyright Infringement re Alfonso Burgess, # 3 Exhibit Ex 1a re Alfonso Burgess, # 4 Exhibit Ex 2 Notice of Default re Alfonso Burgess, # 5 Exhibit Proposed Form of Permanent Injunction re Alfonso Burgess, # 6 Exhibit Proposed Form of Default Judgment re Alfonso Burgess)(Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 917 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: 8/12/2009 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 916 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: 8/12/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
Transcript of Jury Trial Day held on July 30 2009, before Judge Gertner. Court Reporter: Valerie A. O'Hara at 617/737-2346. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 8/31/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/9/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 915 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: 8/12/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM in Support re 914 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Alexandra Griffin filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 914 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: 8/12/2009 Motion for Default Judgment
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Alexandra Griffin by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Daniel J. Cloherty, # 2 Exhibit Ex 1 to Daniel J. Cloherty Declaration Complaint for Copyright Infringement, # 3 Exhibit Ex 1A to Daniel J. Cloherty Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Ex 2 to Daniel J. Cloherty Declaration Notice of Default, # 5 Exhibit Ex 3 to Daniel J. Cloherty Declaration Proposed Form of Permanent Injunction, # 6 Exhibit Ex 4 to Daniel J. Cloherty Declaration Proposed Form of Default Judgment)(Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 913 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: 8/10/2009 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Alanna Gandelman by All Plaintiffs (Cloherty, Daniel) Modified on 8/11/2009 (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 08/10/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 912 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: 8/10/2009 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Julie Dobson by All Plaintiffs (Cloherty, Daniel) Modified on 8/11/2009 (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 08/10/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 911 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: 8/3/2009 Jury Verdict
JURY VERDICT in favor of Plaintiffs against Joel Tenenbaum. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 910 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: 8/3/2009 Exhibit
Stipulated Exhibit List by Joel Tenenbaum, All Plaintiffs.. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 909 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: 7/31/2009 Jury Instructions
Jury Instructions. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 908 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: 7/31/2009 Proposed Jury Instructions
Proposed Jury Instructions by Capitol Records, Inc.. (Burton, Eve) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 907 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/30/2009 Proposed Jury Instructions
Proposed Jury Instructions by Joel Tenenbaum. (Kamholtz, Matthew) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 906 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/30/2009 Response
Response by All Plaintiffs to Proposed Jury Instruction 110. (Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 905 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: 7/29/2009 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Alexandra Griffin (Attachments: # 1 standing order)(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 904 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: 7/27/2009 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 903 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: 7/27/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
Transcript of Motion Hearing held on July 20, 2009, before Judge Gertner. Court Reporter: Valerie A. O'Hara at 617/737-2346. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 8/14/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/24/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/22/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 902 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: 7/27/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
Transcript of Motion Hearing held on June 5, 2009, before Judge Gertner. Court Reporter: Valerie A. O'Hara at 617/737-2346. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 8/14/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/24/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/22/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 901 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: 7/24/2009 Witness List
Witness List of Potential Witnesses to be Read to Jury by All Plaintiffs. (Burton, Eve) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 900 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: 7/24/2009 Exhibit
Exhibit List of Stipulated Exhibits by All Plaintiffs.. (Burton, Eve) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 899 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: 7/24/2009 Exhibit
Exhibit List of Disputed Exhibits by All Plaintiffs.. (Burton, Eve) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 898 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: 7/22/2009 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Corrected Joint Jury Questionnaire (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Joint Jury Questionnaire)(Burton, Eve) (Entered: 07/22/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 897 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: 7/22/2009 Motion in Limine
MOTION in Limine to Preclude Wayne Marshall from Testifying as a Fact Witness by All Plaintiffs.(Burton, Eve) (Entered: 07/22/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 896 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: 7/22/2009 Motion in Limine
MOTION in Limine to Preclude Oberholzer-Gee from Testifying as Expert Witness by All Plaintiffs.(Burton, Eve) (Entered: 07/22/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 895 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: 7/22/2009 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Joint Jury Qustionnaire (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Joint Jury Questionnaire)(Burton, Eve) (Entered: 07/22/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 894 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: 7/21/2009 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Alfonso Burgess (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 893 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: 7/20/2009 Pretrial Memorandum
PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Joel Tenenbaum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Witness List), # 2 Exhibit B (Exhibit List), # 3 Exhibit C (Jury Instructions))(Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 892 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: 7/20/2009 Response
Response by All Plaintiffs to Court's July 14, 2009 Order Regarding Fair Use Issues. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits to Plaintiffs' Response to Court's July 14 Order regarding Fair Use Issues)(Burton, Eve) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 891 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: 7/20/2009 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Dismissal of Plaintiff Atlantic Recording Corporation (Burton, Eve) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 890 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: 7/20/2009 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 871 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Defendant's Fair Use Defense (In Tenenbaum) filed by Joel Tenenbaum. (Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 889 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Opposition to Motion
Opposition re 871 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Defendant's Fair Use Defense (In Tenenbaum) and Supplemental Brief Pursuant to the Court's July 14, 2009 Order filed by Joel Tenenbaum. (Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 888 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Motion in Limine
MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of John Palfrey in Tenenbaum by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Burton, Eve) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 887 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Pretrial Memorandum
CORRECTED PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Burton, Eve) Modified on 7/20/2009 (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 07/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 886 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Pretrial Memorandum
PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Burton, Eve) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 885 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Response to Motion
RESPONSE to Motion re 877 MOTION in Limine Re: Access to Internet During Trial in Tenenbaum filed by All Plaintiffs. (Burton, Eve) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 884 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. J.A. Pouwelse by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Reynolds, Timothy) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 883 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: 7/16/2009 Opposition to Motion
Opposition re 878 MOTION Waive Witness Fees filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 882 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: 7/16/2009 Response to Motion
RESPONSE to Motion re 879 MOTION Lawyer-Conducted Voir Dire filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 881 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/14/2009 Motion for Clarification
MOTION for Clarification (in Tenenbaum) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Plaintiffs' Motion for Clarification)(Reynolds, Timothy) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 880 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/14/2009 OrderCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 879 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/14/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION Lawyer-Conducted Voir Dire by Joel Tenenbaum.(Kamholtz, Matthew) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 878 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/14/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION Waive Witness Fees by Joel Tenenbaum.(Kamholtz, Matthew) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 877 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/14/2009 Motion in Limine
MOTION in Limine Re: Access to Internet During Trial by Joel Tenenbaum.(Kamholtz, Matthew) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 876 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/14/2009 USCA Mandate
MANDATE of USCA as to 734 Notice of Appeal, filed by All Plaintiffs. Appeal 734 Terminated. Mandate issued in the USCA 7/13/2009 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 875 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: 7/13/2009 Appendix/Exhibit
APPENDIX/EXHIBIT re 871 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Defendant's Fair Use Defense (In Tenenbaum) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Part 2 of 4, # 2 Appendix Part 3 of 4, # 3 Appendix Part 4 of 4)(Burton, Eve) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 874 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: 7/13/2009 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 871 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Defendant's Fair Use Defense (In Tenenbaum) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Burton, Eve) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 873 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: 7/13/2009 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Motion to Exceed Page Limitation by All Plaintiffs.(Burton, Eve) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 872 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: 7/13/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM in Support re 871 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Defendant's Fair Use Defense (In Tenenbaum) (In Tenenbaum) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Burton, Eve) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 871 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: 7/13/2009 Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Defendant's Fair Use Defense (In Tenenbaum) by All Plaintiffs.(Burton, Eve) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 870 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: 7/10/2009 Motion for Protective Order
MOTION for Protective Order and Request for Expedited Ruling in Tenenbaum by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burton, Eve) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 869 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: 7/9/2009 Response
Response by All Plaintiffs to 867 Response to Order to Show Cause in Tenenbaum. (Burton, Eve) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 868 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: 7/9/2009 Opposition to Motion
Opposition re 860 MOTION for Leave to Serve the Expert Report of Dr. Wayne Marshall in Tenenbaum filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Burton, Eve) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 867 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: 7/9/2009 Response to Order to Show Cause
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Joel Tenenbaum. (Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 866 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: 7/7/2009 Opposition to Motion
Opposition re 853 MOTION to Suppress Evidence in Tenenbaum filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Burton, Eve) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 865 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: 7/6/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION for Expedited Ruling on Miscellaneous Relief by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 07/06/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 864 Filed: 7/3/2009, Entered: 7/3/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Joint MOTION to Amend Schedule and Request for Expedited Ruling by All Plaintiffs.(Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 07/03/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 863 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: 7/1/2009 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by Joel Tenenbaum of Stipulation (Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 07/01/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 862 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: 7/1/2009 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/01/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 861 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: 7/1/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
Transcript of Motion Hearing held on June 29, 2009, before Judge Gertner. Court Reporter: Valerie A. O'Hara at 617/737-2346. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 7/20/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/28/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/01/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 860 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: 6/29/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION for Leave to Serve the Expert Report of Dr. Wayne Marshall by Joel Tenenbaum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 859 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: 6/29/2009 Document disclosure
Document disclosure by Joel Tenenbaum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Feinberg, Matthew) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 858 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: 6/26/2009 Opposition to Motion
Opposition re 852 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Respond to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories in Tenenbaum filed by All Plaintiffs. (Burton, Eve) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 857 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: 6/26/2009 Motion for Hearing
MOTION for Hearing on Outstanding Discovery Issues by All Plaintiffs.(Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 856 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: 6/25/2009 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Matthew Oppenheim, Esq. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002483528. by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Matthew Oppenheim, Esq. in Support of Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice)(Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 855 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: 6/24/2009 Motion to Strike
MOTION to Strike 850 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Compel Rule 26(a)(2) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Burton, Eve) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 854 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: 6/24/2009 Response
Response by Joel Tenenbaum to 850 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Compel. (Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 853 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/23/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION to Suppress Evidence by Joel Tenenbaum.(Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 06/23/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 852 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/23/2009 Motion to Compel
MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Respond to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories by Joel Tenenbaum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 06/23/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 851 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: 6/22/2009 Motion for Costs
MOTION for Costs and Fees Incurred in Filing Motion to Compel (Doc No. 842) in Tenenbaum by All Plaintiffs.(Burton, Eve) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 850 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: 6/16/2009 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered denying 841 Motion to exclude expert witness; granting 842 Motion to Compel (setting Revised Schedule for trial)(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 849 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: 6/15/2009 Response to Motion
RESPONSE to Motion re 842 MOTION to Compel Defendant Tenenbaum's Discovery Responses filed by Joel Tenenbaum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Charles R. Nesson))(Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 848 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: 6/15/2009 Response to Motion
RESPONSE to Motion re 844 MOTION to Modify Discovery Schedule and For Expedited Briefing, 841 MOTION Exclude Rule 26(a)(2) Witnesses of Defendant Tenenbaum filed by Joel Tenenbaum. (Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 847 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: 6/15/2009 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER Re: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss entered denying 779 Motion to Dismiss. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 846 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: 6/11/2009 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re 820 Opposition to Motion, Supplemental Authority in Tenenbaum (Attachments: # 1 Order in Capitol Records Inc., et al v. Jammie Thomas)(Burton, Eve) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 845 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: 6/11/2009 OrderCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: Electronic ORDER entered Re: 844 MOTION to Modify Discovery Schedule and For Expedited Briefing filed by All Plaintiffs:"The Defendant is directed to file his response to the Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify Discovery Schedule 844 on an expedited basis, by 5:00 p.m. on Monday, June 15, 2009."SO ORDERED./s/Nancy Gertner, D.J.(GAM) Modified on 6/15/2009. This is an electronic order, not document to be attached, number assigned in error (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 06/11/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 844 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: 6/11/2009 Motion to Modify
MOTION to Modify Discovery Schedule and For Expedited Briefing by All Plaintiffs.(Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 843 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: 6/9/2009 Memorandum of Law
MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Joel Tenenbaum. (Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 842 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: 6/5/2009 Motion to Compel
MOTION to Compel Defendant Tenenbaum's Discovery Responses by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-G)(Burton, Eve) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 841 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: 6/5/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION Exclude Rule 26(a)(2) Witnesses of Defendant Tenenbaum by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-G)(Burton, Eve) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 840 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: 6/5/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM in Support re 806 MOTION to Amend 625 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, 686 MOTION to Amend 625 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim with respect to Fair Use -- leave to file granted May 15, 2009 filed by Joel Tenenbaum. (Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 839 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: 6/5/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION to digitally audio record the public hearing before the Court on June 5, 2009, and all further public proceedings by Joel Tenenbaum.(Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 838 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: 6/3/2009 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Amanda Paul by Interscope Records, Maverick Recording Company, Warner Bros. Records Inc., Arista Records, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order of Dismissal)(Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 06/03/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 837 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009 Response
Submission in Response by All Plaintiffs to 833 Scheduling Order, dated May 28, 2009. (Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 836 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: 6/1/2009 Response
Response by Joel Tenenbaum to 833 Scheduling Order,. (Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 835 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: 6/1/2009 Declaration
DECLARATION re 834 MOTION to Stay to Allow Supreme Court Review by Joel Tenenbaum. (Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 834 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: 6/1/2009 Motion to Stay
MOTION to Stay to Allow Supreme Court Review by Joel Tenenbaum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 833 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: 5/28/2009 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/13/2009 02:30 PM before Judge Nancy Gertner. Fact Discovery to be completed by 5/30/2009. Motions due by 6/23/2009. Jury Trial set for 7/20/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Nancy Gertner.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/28/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 832 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: 5/19/2009 Protective OrderCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: PROTECTIVE ORDER Governing Inspection of the Hard Drive of Defendant's Gateway Computer entered.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/19/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 831 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: 5/18/2009 Amicus brief filed
AMICUS BRIEF filed by Free Software Foundation Leave to File Revised Brief Granted on May 18, 2009. (Fletcher, Theodore) (Entered: 05/18/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 830 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: 5/18/2009 Proposed Document(s) submitted
Proposed Document(s) submitted by All Plaintiffs. Document received: Proposed Protective Order. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 05/18/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 829 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: 5/15/2009 Motion for Leave to File
MOTION for Leave to File Reply Briefs by Joel Tenenbaum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Proposed Reply to USA), # 2 Exhibit B (Proposed Reply on Fair Use))(Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 828 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: 5/13/2009 Opposition to Motion
Opposition re 825 MOTION for Leave to File Revised Amicus Brief with Appendix filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 827 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: 5/8/2009 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 826 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: 5/6/2009 Order on Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 672 Motion for Protective Order. (GAM) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 825 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: 5/1/2009 Motion for Leave to File
MOTION for Leave to File Revised Amicus Brief with Appendix by Free Software Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Amicus Brief)(Fletcher, Theodore) (Entered: 05/01/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 824 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: 5/1/2009 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss by Sara Weiner.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/01/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 823 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: 5/1/2009 Motion to Withdraw
MOTION to Withdraw by Capital Records, Inc..(Mann, Simon) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/5/2009: # 1 certificate of service) (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 05/01/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 822 Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: 4/30/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re 709 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Joel Tenenbaum filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Reynolds, Timothy) (Entered: 04/30/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 821 Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: 4/30/2009 Motion for Hearing
EMERGENCY MOTION for Order Permitting Telephonic Deposition of Tenenbaum and Request for Status Conference by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Burton, Eve) Modified on 5/1/2009 (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 04/30/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 820 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: 4/29/2009 Opposition to Motion
Opposition re 806 MOTION to Amend 625 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, 686 MOTION to Amend 625 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 04/29/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 819 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: 4/28/2009 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re 703 Opposition to Motion by Tenenbaum to Amend Answer - Submission of Supplemental Authority in Opposition (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Burton, Eve) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 818 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: 4/28/2009 Motion to Stay
NOTICE by Joel Tenenbaum of Petition for Rehearing En Banc in the Court of Appeals and MOTION to Stay the April 30, 2009 Omnibus Hearing (Nesson, Charles) Modified on 4/29/2009 to change the event to a pending motion (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 04/28/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 817 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: 4/23/2009 Response
Response by All Plaintiffs to 791 Amicus brief filed in Tenenbaum by FSF. (Reynolds, Timothy) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 816 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: 4/21/2009 Motion for Leave to File
MOTION for Leave to File Response Brief in Tenenbaum by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Plaintiffs' Response to Amicus Brief of Free Software Foundation)(Reynolds, Timothy) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 815 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: 4/17/2009 USCA Judgment
USCA Judgment as to 734 Notice of Appeal, filed by All Plaintiffs. The instant appeal is dismissed as moot, in light of In re Sony BMG Music Entertainment et al, No. 09-1090. Judgment issued in the USCA 4/16/2009 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 814 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: 4/17/2009 Remark
USCA Opinion No 09-1090: Re: Petition for writ of Mandamus. Opinion issued in the USCA 4/16/2009 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 813 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: 4/17/2009 Remark
USCA Judgment No. 09-1090: Re: Petition for writ of mandamus. This cause came on to be heard on petition for a writ of mandamus or prohibition to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts and was argued by counsel. Upon consideration whereof, it is now here ordered, adjudged and decreed as follows: The petition is granted. The district court is prohibited from enforcing the challenged order, and the case is remanded for further proceedings consistent with the opinion issued this day. Judgment issued in the USCA 4/16/2009 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 812 Filed: 4/16/2009, Entered: 4/16/2009 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed Sara Weiner served on 4/6/2009, answer due 4/27/2009. (Steinberg, Victoria) (Entered: 04/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 811 Filed: 4/16/2009, Entered: 4/16/2009 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria L. Steinberg on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Steinberg, Victoria) (Entered: 04/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 810 Filed: 4/16/2009, Entered: 4/16/2009 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by Free Software Foundation Leave to File Granted on April 16, 2009 (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Law Review Article)(Fletcher, Theodore) (Entered: 04/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 809 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: 4/15/2009 Opposition to Motion
Opposition re 802 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Papers in Tenenbaum filed by All Plaintiffs. (Reynolds, Timothy) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 808 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: 4/15/2009 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by John R. Bauer (Bauer, John) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 807 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: 4/15/2009 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Claire E. Newton (Newton, Claire) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 806 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: 4/15/2009 Motion to Amend
MOTION to Amend 625 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, 686 MOTION to Amend 625 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Joel Tenenbaum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Proposed Amended Answer and Counterclaim))(Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 805 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: 4/14/2009 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Lisa G. Kent (Kent, Lisa) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 804 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: 4/14/2009 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss by Capital Records, Inc..(Mann, Simon) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: 4/14/2009 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Melissa M. D'Alelio (D'Alelio, Melissa) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 802 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: 4/14/2009 Motion for Leave to File
MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Papers by Free Software Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Samuelson Law Review Article)(Fletcher, Theodore) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 801 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: 4/13/2009 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Christopher S. Feudo (Feudo, Christopher) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 800 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: 4/13/2009 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Nancy M. Cremins (Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 799 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: 4/13/2009 Amicus Curiae Appearance
Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Theodore G. Fletcher on behalf of Free Software Foundation. (Fletcher, Theodore) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 798 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: 3/30/2009 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A. Kamholtz on behalf of Joel Tenenbaum (Kamholtz, Matthew) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 797 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: 3/30/2009 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew H. Feinberg on behalf of Joel Tenenbaum (Feinberg, Matthew) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 796 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: 3/25/2009 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Laurie Rust (Rust, Laurie) (Entered: 03/25/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 795 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: 3/25/2009 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to defendant Ryan Lindsey. (Newton, Claire) Modified on 4/3/2009 (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 03/25/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 794 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: 3/23/2009 Opposition to Motion
Opposition re 779 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A & B)(Rust, Laurie) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 793 Filed: 3/22/2009, Entered: 3/22/2009 Memorandum of Law
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 779 Motion to Dismiss by United States of America. (Bennett, Michelle) Modified on 4/3/2009 (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 03/22/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 792 Filed: 3/22/2009, Entered: 3/22/2009 Motion to Intervene
Assented to MOTION to Intervene, Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages ( Responses due by 4/6/2009) by United States of America.(Bennett, Michelle) (Entered: 03/22/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 791 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: 3/20/2009 Amicus brief filed
AMICUS BRIEF filed by Free Software Foundation. (Fletcher, Theodore) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 790 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: 3/20/2009 Motion for Leave to File
MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Free Software Foundation.(Fletcher, Theodore) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 789 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: 3/17/2009 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by Joel Tenenbaum (Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 788 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM in Support re 787 MOTION for Reconsideration re 730 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief and Reaffirmance, 786 MOTION for Extension of Time to 03/13/2009 to File Motion for Reconsideration and Reaffirmance of the Court's January 14, 2009 Order filed by Joel Tenenbaum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Excerpts from Office of the Circuit Executive), # 2 Exhibit B (February 20, 2009 First Circuit Order soliciting supplemental briefing), # 3 Exhibit C (Declaration of Dean Kawamoto), # 4 Exhibit D (Excerpts from CVN First Circuit brief amicus curiae), # 5 Exhibit E (Local Rules from D.Me. and D.N.H.))(Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 787 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Motion for Reconsideration
MOTION for Reconsideration re 730 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief and Reaffirmance by Joel Tenenbaum.(Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 786 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION for Extension of Time to 03/13/2009 to File Motion for Reconsideration and Reaffirmance of the Court's January 14, 2009 Order by Joel Tenenbaum.(Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 785 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: 3/12/2009 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs in Tenenbaum re Order of March 4, 2009 (Doc No. 776) (Reynolds, Timothy) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 784 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: 3/11/2009 Affidavit in Support
AFFIDAVIT in Support re 783 MOTION Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant Alexandra Griffin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 783 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: 3/11/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant Alexandra Griffin by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 782 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: 3/11/2009 Motion to Withdraw
MOTION to Withdraw Appearance of Jeffrey C. Blair by All Plaintiffs.(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 781 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: 3/9/2009 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered denying 736 Motion to Compel (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 780 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: 3/9/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM in Support re 779 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joel Tenenbaum. (Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 779 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: 3/9/2009 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss by Joel Tenenbaum.(Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 778 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: 3/6/2009 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Dismissal with Prejudice Against Defendant LaShaana Straw (Newton, Claire) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 777 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: 3/5/2009 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Satisfaction of Monetary Portion of Judgment Against Defendant James Kelly (Newton, Claire) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 776 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: 3/4/2009 OrderCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered. (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 775 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Anna V. Volftsun on behalf of Joel Tenenbaum (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 774 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C. Sanchez on behalf of Joel Tenenbaum (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 773 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Richardson on behalf of Joel Tenenbaum (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 772 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Dawson on behalf of Joel Tenenbaum (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 771 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Debra B. Rosenbaum on behalf of Joel Tenenbaum (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 770 Filed: 3/1/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 OrderCourt Filing
Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER of Temporary Admission as to Anna V. Volftsun entered. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 769 Filed: 3/1/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 OrderCourt Filing
Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER of Temporary Admission as to Matthew C. Sanchez entered. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 768 Filed: 3/1/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 OrderCourt Filing
Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER of Temporary Admission as to James E. Richardson entered. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 767 Filed: 3/1/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 OrderCourt Filing
Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER of Temporary Admission as to Jennifer L. Dawson entered. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 766 Filed: 3/1/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 OrderCourt Filing
Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER of Temporary Admission as to Debra B. Rosenbaum entered. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 765 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: 3/2/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM in Support re 764 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Amanda Paul's Counterclaims filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 764 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: 3/2/2009 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Amanda Paul's Counterclaims by All Plaintiffs.(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 763 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Motion for Leave to File
Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief Regarding Defendant's Conditional Motion to Compel the Deposition of Matthew Oppenheim by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 762 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Letter/request (non-motion)
Letter/request (non-motion) from Donna L. Conley, Esq.. (Conley, Donna) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 761 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Letter/request (non-motion)
Appearance of Counsel For Defendant Letter/request (non-motion) from Donna Conley, Esq. with Appearance. (Conley, Donna) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 760 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: 2/24/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to March 23, 2009 to notify the Court whether the United States intends to intervene in this case and file a brief regarding the constitutionality of the Copyright Act's statutory damages provision by United States of America.(Bennett, Michelle) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 759 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: 2/23/2009 OrderCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered. (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 758 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: 2/23/2009 Motion for Leave to File
MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendant's Conditional Motion to Compel the Deposition of Matthew Oppenheim by Joel Tenenbaum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Proposed Reply), # 2 Exhibit B (Exhibit A to Proposed Reply), # 3 Exhibit C (Exhibit B to Proposed Reply), # 4 Exhibit D (Exhibit C to Proposed Reply), # 5 Exhibit E (Exhibit D to Proposed Reply))(Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 757 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009 USCA Order
ORDER of USCA as to 734 Notice of Appeal, filed by All Plaintiffs. See Order for details. Order issued in the USCA 2/18/2009 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 756 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009 Motion to Stay
MOTION to Stay in Part the February 24, 2009 Omnibus Hearing by Joel Tenenbaum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (First Circuit Order))(Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 755 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009 USCA Case Number
USCA Case Number 09-1091 for 734 Notice of Appeal, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 754 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: 2/19/2009 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Order and Request for Hearing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 753 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Answer
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Sony Music Entertainment Inc., Warner Bros. Records, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Arista Records, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Interscope Records, Maverick Recording Company by Amanda Paul.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 752 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009 Withdrawal of Motion
Withdrawal of motion: 750 MOTION to Enforce Judgment filed by Capital Records, Inc... (Mann, Simon) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 751 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed Alexandra Griffin served on 1/30/2009, answer due 2/19/2009. (Newton, Claire) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 750 Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: 2/5/2009 Motion to Enforce Judgment
MOTION to Enforce Judgment by Capital Records, Inc..(Mann, Simon) (Entered: 02/05/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 749 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: 2/4/2009 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by All Plaintiffs as to defendant Elizabeth Stewart. (Newton, Claire) Modified on 2/5/2009 (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 02/04/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 748 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: 2/4/2009 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed Amanda Paul served on 1/20/2009, answer due 2/9/2009. (Newton, Claire) (Entered: 02/04/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 747 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: 2/3/2009 Affidavit in Support
AFFIDAVIT in Support re 746 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Melissa DeSisto. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 746 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: 2/3/2009 Motion for Default Judgment
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Melissa DeSisto by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Form of Default Judgment, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Form of Permanent Injunction)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 745 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: 2/3/2009 Affidavit in Support
AFFIDAVIT in Support re 744 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Tahirih LaForest. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 744 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: 2/3/2009 Motion for Default Judgment
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Tahirih LaForest by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Form of Default Judgment, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Form of Permanent Injunction)(Newton, Claire) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2009: # 3 Corrected Motion) (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 02/03/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 743 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: 1/29/2009 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Tahirih LaForest. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 742 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: 1/26/2009 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT of Claire Newton re 741 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Alfonso Burgess by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 741 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: 1/26/2009 Motion for Entry of Default
MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Alfonso Burgess by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 740 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: 1/23/2009 Full Record on Appeal Sent to USCA
Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 734 Notice of Appeal, 734, 718-720, 722, 728, 730 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 739 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: 1/22/2009 Response to Motion
RESPONSE to Motion re 736 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Matthew Oppenheim on January 22, 2009 in Tenenbaum filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A January 21, 2009 Letter from TMReynolds to CNesson)(Reynolds, Timothy) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 738 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: 1/20/2009 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 733 Motion to Stay for the reasons outlined in the attached document. (Gertner, Nancy) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 737 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: 1/20/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM in Support re 736 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Matthew Oppenheim on January 22, 2009 filed by Joel Tenenbaum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 736 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: 1/20/2009 Motion to Compel
MOTION to Compel Deposition of Matthew Oppenheim on January 22, 2009 by Joel Tenenbaum.(Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 735 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: 1/20/2009 Response to Motion
RESPONSE to Motion re 733 MOTION to Stay THE COURTS ORDER filed by Joel Tenenbaum. (Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 734 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: 1/16/2009 Notice of Appeal
NOTICE OF APPEAL by All Plaintiffs re: 730 Order granting 718 Motion to Allow courtroom View Network to Provide Coverage of Proceedings over the Internet. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 01010000000002263424 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Appeal Record due by 2/5/2009. (Cloherty, Daniel) Modified on 2/20/2009 (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 01/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 733 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: 1/16/2009 Motion to Stay
MOTION to Stay THE COURTS ORDER by All Plaintiffs.(Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 732 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: 1/16/2009 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered. DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs against Defendant, Aleksey Shnayder.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 731 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: 1/15/2009 Response
Response by Joel Tenenbaum to 707 Recommendations for Scheduling Order - leave to file granted 01/15/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 730 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: 1/14/2009 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered granting 718 Motion to Allow Courtroom View Network to Provide Coverage of Proceedings Over the Internet. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 729 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: 1/13/2009 Answer
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Diane Briggs.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 728 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: 1/12/2009 Response to Motion
RESPONSE to Motion re 718 MOTION Allows Courtroom View Network to Provide Coverage of Proceedings Over the Internet filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 727 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: 1/12/2009 Response to Motion
Amended RESPONSE to Motion re 724 MOTION for Extension of Time to February 27, 2009 to Notify the Court whether the United States intends to file a motion to intervene and to file a brief regarding the constitutionality of the Copyright Act's statutory damages provision withdrawing objection filed by Joel Tenenbaum. (Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 726 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: 1/12/2009 Response to Motion
RESPONSE to Motion re 724 MOTION for Extension of Time to February 27, 2009 to Notify the Court whether the United States intends to file a motion to intervene and to file a brief regarding the constitutionality of the Copyright Act's statutory damages provision withdrawing objection filed by Joel Tenenbaum. (Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 725 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: 1/12/2009 Opposition to Motion
First Opposition re 709 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Joel Tenenbaum filed by Joel Tenenbaum. (Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 724 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: 1/9/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION for Extension of Time to February 27, 2009 to Notify the Court whether the United States intends to file a motion to intervene and to file a brief regarding the constitutionality of the Copyright Act's statutory damages provision by United States of America.(Bennett, Michelle) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 723 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: 1/7/2009 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed Diane Briggs served on 12/26/2008, answer due 1/15/2009. (Bauer, John) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 722 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: 1/5/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
MOTION for Extension of Time to January 16, 2009 to TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO ALLOW COURTROOM VIEW NETWORK TO PROVIDE COVERAGE OF PROCEEDINGS OVER THE INTERNET by All Plaintiffs.(Newton, Claire) Modified on 1/7/2009 (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 01/05/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 721 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: 12/29/2008 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 12/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 720 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: 12/24/2008 Declaration
DECLARATION re 718 MOTION Allows Courtroom View Network to Provide Coverage of Proceedings Over the Internet Declaration of Charles Nesson by Joel Tenenbaum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1a, # 2 Exhibit 1b, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23a, # 25 Exhibit 23b, # 26 Exhibit 23c, # 27 Exhibit 23d, # 28 Exhibit 23e, # 29 Exhibit 23f, # 30 Exhibit 23g, # 31 Exhibit 23h, # 32 Exhibit 24)(Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 12/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 719 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: 12/23/2008 Declaration
DECLARATION re 718 MOTION Allows Courtroom View Network to Provide Coverage of Proceedings Over the Internet Declaration of John Shin by Joel Tenenbaum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 718 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: 12/23/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION Allows Courtroom View Network to Provide Coverage of Proceedings Over the Internet by Joel Tenenbaum.(Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 717 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: 12/22/2008 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 716 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: 12/22/2008 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 715 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: 12/22/2008 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Thomas Perrelli by Arista Records, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., BMG Music, Capital Records, Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Atlantic Recording Corporation, Fonovisa, Inc., Virgin Records America, Inc..(Perrelli, Thomas) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 714 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/15/2008 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT of Claire Newton re 713 Second MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Tahirih LaForest by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 713 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/15/2008 Motion for Entry of Default
Second MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Tahirih LaForest by All Plaintiffs.(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 712 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/15/2008 Status Report
STATUS REPORT In Support of Renewed Request for Entry of Default Against Tahirih LaForest by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 711 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: 12/11/2008 Order consolidating casesCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER consolidating cases entered.Associated Cases: 1:03-cv-11661-NG, 1:08-cv-12046-NG(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 710 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: 12/11/2008 Order consolidating casesCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER consolidating cases entered.Associated Cases: 1:03-cv-11661-NG, 1:08-cv-12045-NG(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 709 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: 12/11/2008 Motion to Compel
MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Joel Tenenbaum by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Referenced Portions of Deposition of Joel Tenenbaum)(Burton, Eve) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 708 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: 12/4/2008 Motion for Leave to File
MOTION for Leave to File REPLY TO Plaintiffs RESPONSE to Defendants Discovery Plan by Joel Tenenbaum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 707 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: 12/3/2008 Recommendations for Scheduling Order
Recommendations for Scheduling Order in Response to Defendant's Discovery Plan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order Re: Discovery Schedule)(Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 706 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: 12/2/2008 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re 703 Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Amended Counterclaim (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit D to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Amended Counterclaim)(Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 12/02/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 705 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: 12/1/2008 Motion to Transfer Case
MOTION to Transfer Case Against Defendant Alfonso Burgess by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 704 Filed: 11/28/2008, Entered: 11/28/2008 Opposition to Motion
Opposition re 693 MOTION to Add the Recording Industry Association of America (RIAA) as a Party to Defendant's Amended Counterclaim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - transcript excerpt)(Burton, Eve) (Entered: 11/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 703 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: 11/24/2008 Opposition to Motion
Opposition re 686 MOTION to Amend 625 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 702 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: 11/24/2008 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Plaintiffs.(Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 701 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: 11/24/2008 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26
Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Joel Tenenbaum.(Nesson, Charles) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 700 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: 11/21/2008 Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider
REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider as to Michael Fitzgerald. (Roland, Lisa) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 699 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: 11/20/2008 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher S. Feudo on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Feudo, Christopher) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 698 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: 11/19/2008 Affidavit in Support of Motion
AFFIDAVIT in Support re 697 MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment by the Court of Eve G. Burton filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - F)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 697 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: 11/19/2008 Motion for Entry of Default
MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment by the Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Form of Default Judgment)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 696 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: 11/19/2008 Motion to Enforce Judgment
MOTION to Enforce Judgment with certificate of service by Capital Records, Inc..(Mann, Simon) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 695 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE of Constitutional Question filed by Joel Tenenbaum. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 694 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Pretrial Memorandum
PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Joel Tenenbaum. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 693 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: 11/14/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION to Add the Recording Industry Association of America (RIAA) as a Party to Defendant's Amended Counterclaim by Joel Tenenbaum.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 692 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: 11/14/2008 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Cloherty on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cloherty, Daniel) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 691 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: 11/14/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM in Support re 670 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims Asserted By Defendant Joel Tenenbaum filed by All Plaintiffs. (Burton, Eve) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 690 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: 11/13/2008 Proposed Document(s) submitted
Proposed Document(s) submitted by All Plaintiffs. Document received: Plaintiffs' Proposed Pretrial Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Plaintiffs' Proposed Voir Dire, # 2 Exhibit B Plaintiffs' Witness List, # 3 Exhibit C Plaintiffs' Exhibit List, # 4 Exhibit D Plaintiffs' Proposed Jury Instructions)(Burton, Eve) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 689 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: 11/13/2008 Motion to Continue
MOTION to Continue Trial to and to Convert 11/18/08 Pretrial Conference to a Status Conference to Discuss Schedule to Complete Discovery and to Resolve Outstanding Issues by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Minutes of 9/23/08 Hearing, # 2 Exhibit B - Joel Tenenbaum Deposition Excerpts, # 3 Exhibit C - Subpoenas to Arthur and Judie Tenenbaum)(Burton, Eve) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 688 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: 11/13/2008 Motion to Strike
MOTION to Strike 685 MOTION to Quash Tova Tenenbaum's Subpoena by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Tova Tenenbaum Subpoena, # 2 Exhibit B - Tova Tenenbaum's Motion to Quash Subpoena, # 3 Exhibit C - Tova Tenenbaum Deposition Excerpts, # 4 Exhibit D - Arthur Tenenbaum Deposition Excerpts)(Burton, Eve) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 687 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: 11/12/2008 Motion to Strike
MOTION to Strike 677 MOTION of Joel Tenenbaum to Add the RIAA as Party to Defendant's Amended Counterclaim by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Eve G. Burton in Support of Motion, # 2 Exhibit A-D to Declaration of Eve G. Burton)(Burton, Eve) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 686 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: 11/12/2008 Motion to Amend
MOTION to Amend 625 Counterclaim by Joel Tenenbaum. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Document)(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 685 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: 11/12/2008 Motion to Quash
MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Tova Tenenbaum.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 684 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: 11/10/2008 Motion for Leave to File
Proposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Tenenbaum's Opposition (Doc. No. 676) and in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims (Doc No. 670) by All Plaintiffs.(Burton, Eve) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 683 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: 11/10/2008 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re 237 Default Judgment Notice of Satisfaction for Shelagh Hayes (Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 682 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: 10/30/2008 Opposition to Motion
Opposition re 672 MOTION for Protective Order filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Protective Order Exhibits A-H)(Burton, Eve) (Entered: 10/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 681 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: 10/29/2008 Motion to Enforce Judgment
Amended MOTION to Enforce Judgment with certificate of service by Capital Records, Inc..(Mann, Simon) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 680 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: 10/29/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION Extension of Time to Effectuate Service on Alexandra Griffin by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 679 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: 10/29/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION Extension of Time to Effectuate Service on Defendant Amanda Paul by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 678 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: 10/29/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION for Extension of Time to For An Additional 90 Days to To Effectuate Service on Defendant Ryan Lindsey by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 677 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: 10/28/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION Under Rule 19 and Rule 20 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to Add the Recording Industry Association of America (RIAA) as a Party to Defendant's Amended Counterclaim by Joel Tenenbaum.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 676 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: 10/28/2008 Opposition to Motion
Opposition re 670 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims Asserted By Defendant Joel Tenenbaum filed by Joel Tenenbaum. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 675 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: 10/28/2008 Counterclaim
AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against all Plaintiffs, filed by Joel Tenenbaum.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 674 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: 10/23/2008 Stipulation
STIPULATION TO JURY TRIAL by Defendant Tenenbaum and by All Plaintiffs. (Burton, Eve) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 673 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: 10/17/2008 Notice regarding mandatory use of ECF
NOTICE issued to Attorney Charles Nesson regarding mandatory use of ECF in compliance with Local Rule 5.4. Failure to comply may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 672 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: 10/17/2008 Motion for Protective Order
MOTION for Protective Order by Joel Tenenbaum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 671 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: 10/16/2008 Brief
BRIEF by All Plaintiffs to 656 Stipulation, Order,, Plaintiffs Response to Courts Order Requesting Information on Stipulation to Judgment and Permanent Injunction. (Newton, Claire) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 670 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: 10/6/2008 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims Asserted By Defendant Joel Tenenbaum by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 669 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: 10/6/2008 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Timothy M. Reynolds Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002138500. by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Timothy M. Reynolds)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 668 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: 10/3/2008 Letter/request (non-motion)Court Filing
Letter/request (non-motion) to Judge Gertner from Michael Fitzgerald regarding referral to mediation. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 667 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: 9/30/2008 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to David E. Lopes. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: 9/30/2008 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Keri Ingemi. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 665 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: 9/26/2008 Affidavit in Support
AFFIDAVIT in Support re 664 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Michael Fitzgerald. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 664 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: 9/26/2008 Motion for Entry of Default
MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Michael Fitzgerald by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 663 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: 9/26/2008 Procedural Order re pretrial/trialCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re pretrial/trial: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Nancy Gertner. Jury Trial set for 12/1/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Nancy Gertner. (Molloy, Maryellen) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 662 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: 9/25/2008 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered; DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION in favor of Plaintiffs against defendant Christopher Savasta. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 661 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: 9/25/2008 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered; DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION in favor of Plaintiffs against defendant Michelle Webber.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 660 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: 9/23/2008 Answer
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Tracy Lawrence.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 659 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: 9/23/2008 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Nesson on behalf of Joel Tenenbaum. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 658 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: 9/22/2008 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
FILED IN WRONG CASE-PLEASE SEE 04cv12434NG. NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Newton, Claire) Modified on 9/22/2008 (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 09/22/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 657 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: 9/22/2008 Status Report
STATUS REPORT re Defendant Joel Tenenbaum by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit I)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 656 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: 9/17/2008 Stipulation
STIPULATION To Judgment and Permanent Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 655 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008 OrderCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER to Appear for Hearing entered as to defendant Keri Ingemi. ( Status Conference set for 9/23/2008 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Nancy Gertner.)(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 654 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008 OrderCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER to Appear for Hearing entered as to defendant June Haskins. ( Status Conference set for 9/23/2008 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Nancy Gertner.)(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 653 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008 OrderCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER to Appear for Hearing entered as to defendant Tahirih Laforest. ( Status Conference set for 9/23/2008 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Nancy Gertner.)(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 652 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008 OrderCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER to Appear for Hearing as to defendant David Lopes entered. ( Status Conference set for 9/23/2008 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Nancy Gertner.)(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008 OrderCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER to Answer entered as to defendant Tracy Lawrence. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 650 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: 9/11/2008 OrderCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER to Appear for Hearing entered as to defendant Joel Tenenbaum. ( Status Conference set for 9/23/2008 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Nancy Gertner.)(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Letter/request (non-motion)
Copy of Letter from Joel Tenenbaum to Attorney John Bauer regarding proposed dates for deposition. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 648 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Letter/request (non-motion)Court Filing
Letter from Joel Tenenbaum to Judge Gertner regarding his deposition. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 647 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Letter/request (non-motion)
Letter from Joel Tenenbaum regarding rescheduling deposition. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Letter/request (non-motion)
Letter from Joel Tenenbaum regarding missing deposition due to illness. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 645 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Affidavit in Support
AFFIDAVIT in Support re 644 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Keri Ingemi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Motion for Entry of Default
MOTION for Entry of Default Against Keri Ingemi by All Plaintiffs.(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 643 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Affidavit in Support
AFFIDAVIT in Support re 642 MOTION for Entry of Default Against David E. Lopes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 642 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Motion for Entry of Default
MOTION for Entry of Default Against David E. Lopes by All Plaintiffs.(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 641 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Affidavit in Support
AFFIDAVIT in Support re 640 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Tahirih LaForest. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 640 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Motion for Entry of Default
MOTION for Entry of Default Against Tahirih LaForest by All Plaintiffs.(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 639 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Affidavit in Support
AFFIDAVIT in Support re 638 MOTION for Entry of Default Against June Haskins. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 638 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Motion for Entry of Default
MOTION for Entry of Default Against June Haskins by All Plaintiffs.(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: 9/9/2008 OrderCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER TO APPEAR FOR HEARING entered as to defendants Tracy Lawrence, Melissa Desisto, Mandy Ladebauche, Christopher Savasta, Michelle Webber, and Aleksey Shnayder. (Hearing set for 9/23/2008 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Nancy Gertner.)(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION for Extension of Time to September 29, 2008 to Respond to Defendant Joel Tenenbaum's Counterclaims by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 635 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008 Status Report
STATUS REPORT re Defendant Tracy Lawrence by All Plaintiffs. (Newton, Claire) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 634 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Proposed Form of Permanent Injunction re 631 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Aleksey Shnayder by All Plaintiffs.(Newton, Claire) Modified on 9/4/2008, not a motion(Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 09/03/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
PROPOSED Form of Default Judgment re 631 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Aleksey Shnayder by All Plaintiffs.(Newton, Claire) Modified on 9/4/2008, not a motion (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 09/03/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Affidavit in Support
AFFIDAVIT in Support re 631 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Aleksey Shnayder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Motion for Default Judgment
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Aleksey Shnayder by All Plaintiffs.(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 630 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed June Haskins served on 8/9/2008, answer due 8/29/2008. (Newton, Claire) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed Tahirih LaForest served on 8/2/2008, answer due 8/22/2008. (Newton, Claire) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 628 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed Keri Ingemi served on 7/22/2008, answer due 8/11/2008. (Newton, Claire) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 627 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed Michael Fitzgerald served on 8/5/2008, answer due 8/25/2008. (Newton, Claire) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Notice of ADR ConferenceCourt Filing
NOTICE of ADR Conference; Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing RE: JOEL TENENBAUM set for 8/27/2008 11:30 AM in Courtroom 16 before Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman. Please see notice for specific details.(Roland, Lisa) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Amended Answer to Complaint
AMENDED ANSWER to 511 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Joel Tenenbaum. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed David E. Lopes served on 7/22/2008, answer due 8/11/2008. (Newton, Claire) (Entered: 08/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 623 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Paul G. Boylan (Boylan, Paul) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 622 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Letter/request (non-motion)
Letter/request (non-motion) from All Plaintiffs In Opposition to Joel Tenenbaum's Letter to Cancel Scheduled Mediation. (Newton, Claire) (Entered: 08/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Notice of ADR ConferenceCourt Filing
NOTICE of ADR Conference; Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing as to Defendants' Tracy Lawrence and Melissa Desisto for 8/27/2008 11:30 AM in BOSTON, Courtroom 16 before Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman. Please see notice for specific details.(Roland, Lisa) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Order Referring Case to ADR
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution as to defendant Melissa DeSisto. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed Elizabeth Stewart served on 7/17/2008, answer due 8/6/2008. (Newton, Claire) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Aleksey Shnayder. (Attachments: # 1 standing order)(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
FILED IN WRONG CASE. SEE 04cv12434NG. NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Newton, Claire) Modified on 8/5/2008 (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 08/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Letter/request (non-motion)
Letter/request (non-motion) from Joel Tenenbaum re: request to cancel mediation. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
Transcript of Motion Hearing held on June 17, 2008, before Judge Gertner. Court Reporter: Valerie A. O'Hara at 617/737-2346. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 8/18/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/27/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/27/2008. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: DEFAULT JUDGMENT and Permanent Injunction as to defendant Henry Goldfarb in favor of Plaintiffs entered.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: DEFAULT JUDGMENT and Permanent Injunction as to defendant Yesenia Crespo in favor of Plaintiffs entered.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: DEFAULT JUDGMENT and Permanent Injunction as to defendant Elisa Cantone in favor of plaintiffs entered.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: DEFAULT JUDGMENT and Permanent Injunction as to defendant Edward Dutcher in favor of Plaintiffs entered.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: DEFAULT JUDGMENT and Permanent Injunction as to defendant Maria Mojica in favor of Plaintiffs entered.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: DEFAULT JUDGMENT and Permanent Injunction as to defendant Michael Sturge in favor of Plaintiffs entered.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: DEFAULT JUDGMENT and Permanent Injunction as to defendant, Kristina Ferrara in favor of Plaintiffs entered.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: DEFAULT JUDGMENT and Permanent Injunction as to defendant, Donna Scott in favor of Plaintiffs entered.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: DEFAULT JUDGMENT and Permanent Injunction entered as to defendant, Richard L. Dubrock in favor of Plaintiffs. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Order on Motion for Default JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: Electronic ORDER entered granting 603 Motion for Default Judgment as to Richard Dubrock. (Gaudet, Jennifer) Modified on 7/30/2008. Number assigned in error, no attachment (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 07/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Motion for Default Judgment
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Richard Dubrock by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) Motion originally filed on 1/11/2008. Defendant was consolidated with 04cv12434 in error, should have been consolidated with 03cv11661NG. Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default again Dubrock was entered in 04cv12434 on 8/7/2007, docket entry #123.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 OrderCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER RE: EXPEDITED DISCOVERY entered as to Alanna Gandelman. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Order on Motion for Default JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: Electronic ORDER entered granting 465 Motion for Default Judgment. For of default judgment is to be entered separately. (Gertner, Nancy) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Order Referring Case to ADRCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution as to defendant Tracy Lawrence. (The plaintiff requests this mediation scheduled with mediation for defendant Tenebaum.)(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Status Report
STATUS REPORT In Further Support of Motion For Default Judgment Against Maria Mojica by All Plaintiffs. (Newton, Claire) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Status Report
STATUS REPORT In Further Support of Motion For Default Judgment Against Mandy Ladebauche by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Status Report
STATUS REPORT In Further Support of Motion For Default Judgment Against Yesenia Crespo by All Plaintiffs. (Newton, Claire) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Status Report
STATUS REPORT In Further Support of Motion for Default Judgment Against Donna Scott by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Status Report
STATUS REPORT In Further Support of Motion for Default Judgment Against Christopher Savasta by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Status Report
STATUS REPORT in Further Support of Motion for Default Judgment Against Elisa Cantone by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Status Report
STATUS REPORT in Further Support of Motion for Default Judgment Against Kristina Ferrara by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM in Support re 591 MOTION For Leave to Take Immediate Discovery of Alanna Gandelman filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, B, C, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 07/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION For Leave to Take Immediate Discovery of Alanna Gandelman by All Plaintiffs.(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 07/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Motion to Enforce Judgment
MOTION to Enforce Judgment by Capital Records, Inc..(Mann, Simon) (Entered: 07/22/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider
REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider - Case to be reassigned to another ADR Provider.(Clarke, Barbara) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Motion to Continue
MOTION to Continue Mediation to July 29, 2008 Assented to by the Defendant Joel Tenenbaum by All Plaintiffs.(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Order consolidating casesCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered. ORDER consolidating cases entered.Associated Cases: 1:03-cv-11661-NG et al.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed LaShaana Straw served on 6/14/2008, answer due 7/4/2008. (Newton, Claire) (Entered: 06/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Motion to Withdraw
MOTION to Withdraw 584 Declaration, 583 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Julie Dobson by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 06/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Declaration
DECLARATION re 583 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Julie Dobson by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 06/27/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Motion for Entry of Default
MOTION for Entry of Default Against Julie Dobson by All Plaintiffs.(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 06/27/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Declaration
DECLARATION re 581 First MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Aleksey Shnayder by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 06/27/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Motion for Entry of Default
First MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Aleksey Shnayder by All Plaintiffs.(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 06/27/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Corporate Disclosure Statement
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by All Plaintiffs. (Newton, Claire) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 Consent JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: CONSENT JUDGMENT entered as to deft. Atkinson.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 Corporate Disclosure Statement
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by All Plaintiffs. (Newton, Claire) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Order Referring Case to ADRCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution for Mr. Tenebaum only.(Molloy, Maryellen) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Order on Motion for Default JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: Electronic ORDER entered finding as moot 546 Motion for Default Judgment as to defendant Heenan. (Gaudet, Jennifer) Modified on 6/19/2008-Number assigned in error, this is an electronic order/no document to be attached (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 06/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Newton, Claire) (Entered: 06/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to September 16, 2008 to Effectuate Service on Alanna Gandelman by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, B)(Newton, Claire) (Entered: 06/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Motion to Continue
MOTION to Continue Hearing Relative to Property and Ability to Pay by Shelagh Hayes.(Tobin, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/17/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan E. Tobin on behalf of Shelagh Hayes (Tobin, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/17/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed Julie Dobson served on 5/28/2008, answer due 6/17/2008. (Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 06/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Letter/request (non-motion)
Letter/request (non-motion) from Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice as to Ryan Hallahan by All Plaintiffs. (Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION for Extension of Time to September 10, 2008 to Serve process on Lashaana Straw by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Subpoena Returned executed
Summons Returned Executed as to Alphon Atkinson with service on 5/21/08. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/09/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Subpoena Returned executed
Summons Returned Executed as to Shelagh Hayes with service on 5/20/08. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/09/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Simon B. Mann on behalf of Capital Records, Inc. (Mann, Simon) (Entered: 06/06/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 Motion for Default Judgment
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Michelle Webber by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 06/06/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 06/06/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Nancy M. Cremins withdrawal by RIchard Gabriel (Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 Subpoena Issued
Summons Issued as to Shelagh Hayes. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 Subpoena Issued
Summons Issued as to Alphon Atkinson. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Corporate Disclosure Statement
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by All Plaintiffs. (Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Claire E. Newton on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Newton, Claire) (Entered: 05/06/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008 Suggestion of Bankruptcy
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Robin Heenan. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed Aleksey Shnayder served on 2/16/2008, answer due 3/7/2008. (Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Michelle Webber. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/23/2008 Motion to Enforce Judgment
MOTION to Enforce Judgment by Capitol Records, Inc..(Mann, Simon) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/23/2008 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Simon B. Mann on behalf of Capitol Records, Inc. (Mann, Simon) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/23/2008 Motion to Enforce Judgment
MOTION to Enforce Judgment by Capitol Records, Inc..(Mann, Simon) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/23/2008 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Simon B. Mann on behalf of Capitol Records, Inc. (Mann, Simon) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 OrderCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER to Appear for Hearing entered. ( Motion Hearing is set for 6/17/2008 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Nancy Gertner.)(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Motion for Default Judgment
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Christopher Savasta by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 04/15/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Motion for Default Judgment
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Henry Goldfarb by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Motion for Default Judgment
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Yesenia A. Crespo by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Motion for Default Judgment
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Robin Heenan by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Motion for Default Judgment
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Mandy Ladebauche by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Motion for Default Judgment
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Elisa Cantone by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Motion for Default Judgment
MOTION for Default Judgment as to EDWARD DUTCHER by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Motion for Default Judgment
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Maria Mojica by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Motion for Default Judgment
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Michael Sturge by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Motion for Default Judgment
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Kristina Ferrara by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Request for notice of default
Request for notice of default for Michelle Webber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Response
Response by All Plaintiffs to 530 Letter/request (non-motion). (Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION for Extension of Time to June 23, 2008 to serve process on Julie Dobson by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Christopher Savasta. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/20/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Yesenia A. Crespo (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 Request for notice of default
Request for notice of default for Christopher Savasta. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 Letter/request (non-motion)
Letter/request (non-motion) from Plaintiffs requesting settlement conference with Def. Aleksey Shnayder. (Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Request for notice of default
Request for notice of default for Yesenia Crespo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed Christopher Savasta served on 2/13/2008, answer due 3/4/2008. (Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Letter/request (non-motion)
Letter/request (non-motion) from Joel Tenenbaum re: appointment of counsel. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Melissa L. Desisto. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/25/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Motion for Default Judgment
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Melissa DeSisto by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 02/21/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 527 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Motion to Compel
MOTION to Compel Computer Inspection of Ryan Hallahan by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 02/21/2008)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Letter/request (non-motion)
Letter/request (non-motion) from Joel Tenebaum re: appt of counsel. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008 Motion for Default Judgment
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Donna Scott by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 02/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed Yesenia A. Crespo served on 1/28/2008, answer due 2/18/2008. (Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 02/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 2/10/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008 OrderCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER of Dismissal without Prejudice entered as to defendant Colleen Fanguiaire. Associated Cases: 1:03-cv-11661-NG, 1:03-cv-11704-NG(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008 OrderCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: Amended Procedural Order Re: Discovery entered as to Joel Tenenbaum. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 OrderCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: Amended Procedural Order Re: Discovery entered as to defendants Yevgeniya Shnayder and Aleksey Shnayder. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 OrderCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: Amended Procdural Order Re: Discovery entered as to defendant Ryan Hallahan. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION for Extension of Time to May 6, 2008 to effectuate service on Alanna Gandelman by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice for Colleen Fanguiaire by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 02/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by George P. Field (Field, George) (Entered: 02/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: DISCOVERY entered as to defendants Yevgeniya Shnayder & Aleksey Shnayder. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: DISCOVERY entered as to defendant Ryan Hallahan. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: DISCOVERY entered as to defendant Joel Tenenbaum. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Response to Motion
RESPONSE to Motion re 505 MOTION for Sanctions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Amended Complaint
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aleksey Shnayder, Yevgeniya Shnayder, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cremins, Nancy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/30/2008: # 2 Main Document) (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 01/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY to Response to Motion re 486 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to 497 Cross Motion for Continuance filed by Joel Tenenbaum. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY to Response to Motion re 480 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Joel Tenenbaum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY to Response to Motion re 484 MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer filed by Joel Tenenbaum. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
OPPOSITION to Response to Motion re 486 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joel Tenenbaum. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Affidavit in Support
AFFIDAVIT in Support re 505 MOTION for Sanctions Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 11(b). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Motion for Sanctions
MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Joel Tenenbaum.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008 Order consolidating casesCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER consolidating cases entered.Associated Cases: 1:03-cv-11661-NG (Lead), 1:08-cv-10092-NG, 1:08-cv-10093-NG(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Notice of Settlement
NOTICE of Settlement with Defendant Colleen Fanguiaire by All Plaintiffs (Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 01/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 01/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008 OrderCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: SETTLEMENT ORDER of Dismissal entered as to defendant John Huttunen only. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/09/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008 Notice of Settlement
NOTICE of Settlement for Defendant John Huttunen by All Plaintiffs (Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 01/09/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008 Motion to Amend
MOTION to Amend 491 MOTION to Dismiss Yevgeniya and Aleksy Shnayder by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Motion to Continue
CROSS-MOTION for Continuance Under Rule 56(f) and MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 486 MOTION to Dismiss and Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit F)(Bauer, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2008: # 6 Exhibit B part one, # 7 Exhibit B part two, # 8 Exhibit B part three, # 9 Exhibit B part four) (Gaudet, Jennifer). Modified on 1/8/2008 (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 01/03/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 486 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Bauer, John) (Entered: 01/03/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 484 MOTION to Amend filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bauer, John) (Entered: 01/03/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 1/2/2008 Response to Motion
RESPONSE to Motion re 489 MOTION for Extension of Time to January 3, 2008 to File Response/Reply as to 486 MOTION to Dismiss, 484 MOTION to Amend filed by Joel Tenenbaum. (Document sent back to deft. for a signature on this date.) (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2008: # 1 Main Document) (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 01/02/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa M. D'Alelio on behalf of All Plaintiffs (D'Alelio, Melissa) (Entered: 12/27/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Opposition to Motion
Opposition re 480 MOTION for Sanctions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Laurie Rust)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss Yevgeniya and Aleksy Shnayder by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 12/12/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Answer to Counterclaim
ANSWER to Counterclaim of Ryan Hallahan by All Plaintiffs.(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 12/11/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
MOTION for Extension of Time to January 3, 2008 to File Response/Reply as to 486 MOTION to Dismiss, 484 MOTION to Amend by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 12/11/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 11/23/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM in Support re 486 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Joel Tenenbaum. (Exhibits attached-too large to scan) (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 11/23/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007 Affidavit in Support
AFFIDAVIT in Support re 486 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 486 Filed: 11/23/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion for Summary Judgment by Joel Tenenbaum.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 11/23/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007 Affidavit in Support
AFFIDAVIT in Support re 484 MOTION to Amend. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 11/23/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007 Motion to Amend
MOTION to Amend Defendant's Answer by Joel Tenenbaum.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 12/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Affidavit in Support
AFFIDAVIT in Support re 480 MOTION for Sanctions. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION for Extension of Time to March 5, 2007 to serve Christopher Savasta by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B# 2 Exhibit C# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 12/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Motion for Sanctions
MOTION for Sanctions by Joel Tenenbaum.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION for Extension of Time to March 5, 2008 to serve Kate Polchlopek by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 12/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Donna Scott. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/04/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Request for notice of default
Request for notice of default for Donna Scott (03-11685). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 12/03/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed Erin D. Barry served on 11/2/2007, answer due 11/22/2007. (Bauer, John) (Entered: 11/28/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Order consolidating casesCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER consolidating cases entered.Associated Cases: 1:03-cv-11661-NG, 1:07-cv-12176-NG(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/28/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss Shawn Scott without Prejudice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Motion to Preserve Evidence
MOTION to Preserve Evidence of Ryan Hallahan by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 11/14/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 Order consolidating casesCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER consolidating cases entered.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/07/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Letter/request (non-motion)
Letter/request (non-motion) from Eve Burton re: status conferences and scheduling. (Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 10/29/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007 ~Notice (other)
FILED IN WRONG CASE, see 04cv12434NG. NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of dismissal w/o prejudice for Does #1, #3, #6-11, #13, #14, #15, and #17 (Cremins, Nancy) Modified on 10/31/2007 (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 10/26/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007 Letter/request (non-motion)
Letter/request (non-motion) from Eve Burton, Esq. re: 10/24/07 status conference. (Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed Alison Eccleston served on 9/21/2007, answer due 10/11/2007. (Bauer, John) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed Michelle Webber served on 9/26/2007, answer due 10/16/2007. (Bauer, John) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Motion for Default Judgment
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Tracy Lawrence by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Nancy M. Cremins# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed Donna Scott served on 9/13/2007, answer due 10/3/2007. (Bauer, John) (Entered: 09/26/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 Order consolidating casesCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER consolidating cases entered.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/26/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of dismissal without prejudice for Defendant Michael Katz (Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Tracy Lawrence. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner : ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 405 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Request for notice of default
Request for notice of default for defendant Tracy Lawrence. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cremins, Nancy) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 281 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?