SuperValu Inc Sec, et al v. ., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:02-cv-01738
District Judge Joan N. Ericksen, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 13, 2016 at 2:45 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Acadian Asset Management, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa-NA Beard Glover

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Lechtzin +1 215 875 3071 +1 215 875 5715 elechtzin@bm.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Allen Carney +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Gene Cauley +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 gcauley@cauleybowman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randall Keith Pulliam +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 rpulliam@carneywilliams.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Jeffrey Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 e_file_fl@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 abarroway@sbtklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc A Topaz +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 ecf_filings@sbclasslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Keith Yarnoff +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 myarnoff@btkmc.com

Represented by Zimmerman Reed PLLP

No Logo Carolyn Linoff, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John-NA G Emerson, Jr.
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa-NA Beard Glover

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Allen Carney +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randall Keith Pulliam +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 rpulliam@carneywilliams.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Jeffrey Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 e_file_fl@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc A Topaz +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 ecf_filings@sbclasslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Keith Yarnoff +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 myarnoff@btkmc.com

Represented by Zimmerman Reed PLLP

No Logo Janis Dolan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa-NA Beard Glover

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Allen Carney +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Gene Cauley +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 gcauley@cauleybowman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randall Keith Pulliam +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 rpulliam@carneywilliams.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Jeffrey Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 e_file_fl@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean M. Handler, Esq. +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 ecf_filings@ktmc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc A Topaz +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 ecf_filings@sbclasslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Keith Yarnoff +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 myarnoff@btkmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STUART LANE BERMAN +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 sberman@ktmc.com

Represented by Zimmerman Reed PLLP

No Logo John McConnel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa-NA Beard Glover

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Lechtzin +1 215 875 3071 +1 215 875 5715 elechtzin@bm.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Allen Carney +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Gene Cauley +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 gcauley@cauleybowman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randall Keith Pulliam +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 rpulliam@carneywilliams.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Jeffrey Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 e_file_fl@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 abarroway@sbtklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc A Topaz +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 ecf_filings@sbclasslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Keith Yarnoff +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 myarnoff@btkmc.com

Represented by Zimmerman Reed PLLP

No Logo McDonald Wellford, Jr, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth M Colton +1 651 484 9371 smcucg@comcast.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura L Enga +1 763 540 9992 +1 763 540 9993 lauraenga@aol.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa-NA Beard Glover

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Allen Carney +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randall Keith Pulliam +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 rpulliam@carneywilliams.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Jeffrey Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 e_file_fl@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc A Topaz +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 ecf_filings@sbclasslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Keith Yarnoff +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 myarnoff@btkmc.com

Represented by Zimmerman Reed PLLP

No Logo SuperValu, Inc. Securities Litigation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa-NA Beard Glover

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Allen Carney +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randall Keith Pulliam +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 rpulliam@carneywilliams.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Jeffrey Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 e_file_fl@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc A Topaz +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 ecf_filings@sbclasslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Keith Yarnoff +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 myarnoff@btkmc.com

Represented by Zimmerman Reed PLLP

No Logo Troy Hoffman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa-NA Beard Glover

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MEL E. LIFSHITZ +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Allen Carney +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randall Keith Pulliam +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 rpulliam@carneywilliams.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Egleston Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Michael Egleston +1 212 683 3400 +1 212 683 3402 greg.egleston@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Jeffrey Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 e_file_fl@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc A Topaz +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 ecf_filings@sbclasslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Keith Yarnoff +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 myarnoff@btkmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kay E. Sickles +1 610 747 7706 +1 610 667 7056 ksickles@sbclasslaw.com

Represented by Zimmerman Reed PLLP

No Logo Valerio Luccio, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa-NA Beard Glover

Toggle Switch Represented by Brower Piven, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles J. Piven +1 410 332 0030 +1 410 685 1300 piven@browerpiven.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Allen Carney +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randall Keith Pulliam +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 rpulliam@carneywilliams.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick William Gerkens, III +1 212 382 2221 +1 212 382 3944 fgerkens@glancylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Jeffrey Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 e_file_fl@rgrdlaw.com

Represented by Harwood Feffer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc A Topaz +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 ecf_filings@sbclasslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Keith Yarnoff +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 myarnoff@btkmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kay E. Sickles +1 610 747 7706 +1 610 667 7056 ksickles@sbclasslaw.com

Represented by Zimmerman Reed PLLP

v.
No Logo Jeffrey Noddle, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J Brown +1 612 340 2600 +1 612 340 8800 brown.daniel@dorsey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter W Carter +1 612 340 5635 +1 612 340 2868 carter.peter@dorsey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard B Solum +1 612 340 8871 +1 612 340 8800 solum.rick@dorsey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by uhc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchell W Granberg +1 763 797 7123 +1 763 797 7142 mitch_granberg@uhc.com
No Logo Michael W Wright, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J Brown +1 612 340 2600 +1 612 340 8800 brown.daniel@dorsey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter W Carter +1 612 340 5635 +1 612 340 2868 carter.peter@dorsey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard B Solum +1 612 340 8871 +1 612 340 8800 solum.rick@dorsey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by uhc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchell W Granberg +1 763 797 7123 +1 763 797 7142 mitch_granberg@uhc.com
No Logo Pamela K Knous, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J Brown +1 612 340 2600 +1 612 340 8800 brown.daniel@dorsey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter W Carter +1 612 340 5635 +1 612 340 2868 carter.peter@dorsey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard B Solum +1 612 340 8871 +1 612 340 8800 solum.rick@dorsey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by uhc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchell W Granberg +1 763 797 7123 +1 763 797 7142 mitch_granberg@uhc.com
No Logo Supervalu Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J Brown +1 612 340 2600 +1 612 340 8800 brown.daniel@dorsey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter W Carter +1 612 340 5635 +1 612 340 2868 carter.peter@dorsey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard B Solum +1 612 340 8871 +1 612 340 8800 solum.rick@dorsey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by uhc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchell W Granberg +1 763 797 7123 +1 763 797 7142 mitch_granberg@uhc.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (63) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 64 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 59 Motion for Disbursement of Funds . Signed by Judge Joan N Ericksen on March 1, 2006. (slf) (Entered: 03/02/2006)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None
    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Acadian Asset Management, John McConnel re 60 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 62 Affidavit in Support of Motion,,,, 61 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, 59 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund (Anderson, Carolyn) (Entered: 02/21/2006)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None
      AFFIDAVIT of Anya Verkhovskaya-Cohen in SUPPORT OF 59 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund filed by Acadian Asset Management, John McConnel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-G# 2 Exhibit H-I Part 1 (pg. 1-16)# 3 Exhibit I Part 2 (pg. 17-44)# 4 Exhibit I Part 3 (pg.45-69)# 5 Exhibit I Part 4 (pg. 70-92)# 6 Exhibit J Part 1 (pg. 1-20)# 7 Exhibit J Part 2 (pg. 21-40)# 8 Exhibit J Part 3 (pg. 41-60)# 9 Exhibit J Part 4 (pg. 61-80)# 10 Exhibit J Part 5 (pg. 81-105)# 11 Exhibit K1-K2# 12 Exhibit L Part 1 (pg. 1-25)# 13 Exhibit L Part 2 (pg. 26-46)# 14 Exhibit L Part 3 (pg. 47-67)# 15 Exhibit L Part 4 (pg. 68-98)# 16 Exhibit L Part 5 (pg. 99-120)# 17 Exhibit L Part 6 (pg. 121-142)# 18 Exhibit L Part 7 (pg. 143-153)# 19 Exhibit M)(Anderson, Carolyn) (Entered: 02/21/2006)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None
        LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Acadian Asset Management, John McConnel re 60 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Anderson, Carolyn) (Entered: 02/21/2006)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 60 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None
          MEMORANDUM in Support re 59 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund filed by Acadian Asset Management, John McConnel. (Anderson, Carolyn) (Entered: 02/21/2006)
            LREF
            Blank 59 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None
            MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund by Acadian Asset Management, John McConnel. (Anderson, Carolyn) (Entered: 02/21/2006)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: None
              Letter dated 8/17/04 from Herbert I Mendelsohn re objection to time period within which to file a proof of claim. (HLL) (Entered: 08/20/2004)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                Letter from Fred Ronal Baum dated 8/4/04 to Judge Ericksen. (HLL) (Entered: 08/18/2004)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 56 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER for award of attorneys' fees and reimbursement of expenses. Signed by Judge Joan N Ericksen on 08/17/04. (dak) (Entered: 08/17/2004)
                    LREF
                    Blank 55 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER of dismissal with prejudice and final judgment. Signed by Judge Joan N Ericksen on 08/17/04. (dak) (Entered: 08/17/2004)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan N Ericksen : Fairness Hearing for Class Action Settlement held on 8/16/2004. (Court Reporter Maria Weinbeck) (slf) (Entered: 08/16/2004)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: None
                        TEXT ONLY ENTRY - ORDER granting 51 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Eric Lechtzin for Acadian Asset Management and John McConnel. Fee paid; receipt number 145240. Approved by Clerk Richard D Sletten on 8/9/2004. (MC) (Entered: 08/09/2004)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: None
                          Letter from Gene Howe. (HLL) (Entered: 08/09/2004)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Eric Lechtzin by Acadian Asset Management, John McConnel. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service for the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Proposed Admittee Eric Lechtzin, Esq.)(Anderson, Carolyn) Modified text on 8/9/2004 (HLL). (Entered: 08/06/2004)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: None
                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Acadian Asset Management, John McConnel re 46 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 47 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 48 Declaration in Support, 49 Affidavit in Support of Motion, (Anderson, Carolyn) (Entered: 07/27/2004)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: None
                                AFFIDAVIT of Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel and Liaison Counsel in SUPPORT OF 35 MOTION for Settlement Compendium of Lodestar Affidavits filed by Acadian Asset Management, John McConnel. (Attachments: # 1 Tab A# 2 Tab B# 3 Tab C# 4 Tab D)(Anderson, Carolyn) (Entered: 07/27/2004)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: None
                                  Declaration of Michael K. Yarnoff in Support of 35 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, Plan of Allocation, and Attorney Fee and Expense Application filed by Acadian Asset Management, John McConnel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 2 Continued# 4 Exhibit 3)(Anderson, Carolyn) Modified text on 7/28/2004 (HLL). (Entered: 07/27/2004)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: None
                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 35 MOTION for Settlement Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation filed by Acadian Asset Management, John McConnel. (Anderson, Carolyn) (Entered: 07/27/2004)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: None
                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 35 MOTION for Settlement Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Acadian Asset Management, John McConnel. (Anderson, Carolyn) (Entered: 07/27/2004)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: None
                                        Letter from Gerald P. Bury dated 7/7/04 re opposition to the attorney's fees and expense reimbursement. (HLL) (Entered: 07/08/2004)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: None
                                          AFFIDAVIT of Karen M Colt in SUPPORT OF 33 35 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement. (Separate)(HLL) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: None
                                            STIPULATION of Settlement by Acadian Asset Management, Janis Dolan, Troy Hoffman, Pamela K Knous, Carolyn Linoff, Valerio Luccio, John McConnel, Jeffrey Noddle, SuperValu, Inc. Securities Litigation, Supervalu Inc., McDonald Wellford Jr, Michael W Wright. 25 pgs. (HLL) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER Preliminarily Approving Settlement and Providing For Notice. Signed by Judge Joan N Ericksen on 5/5/04. (HLL) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan N Ericksen : Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement held on 4/29/2004. (Court Reporter Maria Weinbeck) (slf) (Entered: 04/30/2004)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                  Petition and Order for Admission of Pro Hac Vice Attorney J Allen Carney for Troy Hoffman; Carolyn Linoff; Valerio Luccio; John McConnel; SuperValu, Inc. Securities Litigation; Acadian Asset Management and Janis Dolan. Fee paid; receipt number 122588. Signed by Richard D Sletten, Clerk on 4/20/2004. 1pg(DFL) (Entered: 04/29/2004)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                    Petition and Order for Admission of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kay E Sickles for Troy Hoffman and Valerio Luccio. Fee paid; receipt number 144573.Signed by Richard D Sletten, Clerk on 4/16/04. (2 pgs)(MKC) (Entered: 04/27/2004)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Carolyn G. Anderson in SUPPORT OF 33 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement, 35 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement filed by Acadian Asset Management, Janis Dolan, Troy Hoffman, Carolyn Linoff, Valerio Luccio, John McConnel, SuperValu, Inc. Securities Litigation, McDonald Wellford Jr. 1+ pgs (Exhibits Attached) (GML) (Entered: 04/26/2004)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                        STIPULATION of Settlement by Acadian Asset Management, Janis Dolan, Troy Hoffman, Carolyn Linoff, Valerio Luccio, John McConnel, SuperValu, Inc. Securities Litigation, McDonald Wellford Jr. 24 pgs (GML) (Entered: 04/26/2004)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Preliminarily Approval of Settlement Agreement by Acadian Asset Management, Janis Dolan, Troy Hoffman, Carolyn Linoff, Valerio Luccio, John McConnel, SuperValu, Inc. Securities Litigation, McDonald Wellford Jr. 4 pgs (GML) Modified on 4/26/2004 (GML). (Entered: 04/26/2004)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jonathan G Lebedoff on 4/20/04. (JR) (Entered: 04/22/2004)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement. Filed by the following Plaintiffs: Acadian Asset Management, Janis Dolan, Troy Hoffman, Carolyn Linoff, Valerio Luccio, John McConnel, SuperValu, Inc. Securities Litigation, and McDonald Wellford Jr. 4pg(s). (SS) (Entered: 04/19/2004)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of consent to Magistrate trial re 29 Notice of Hearing (JR) (Entered: 03/24/2004)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  Notice Of Cancellation Of Pretrial Conference scheduled before Chief Mag. Judge Lebedoff on 3/26/04 pursuant to settlement. A preliminary approval hearing has been scheduled before Judge Joan Ericksen. Pltf's motion for status conference 30 is moot . Signed by Judge Jonathan G Lebedoff on 3/9/04. (JR) (Entered: 03/10/2004)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION for Order for Status Conference by plaintiffs. 3 pgs (JMM) (Entered: 03/05/2004)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      NOTICE of Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2004 09:00 AM in chambers before Chief Mag. Judge Jonathan G Lebedoff. (JR) Modified on 3/30/2004 (Rustad, Julie). (Copies of Notice Regarding Consent to Magistrate Trial Mailed to all Counsel of Record) (Entered: 02/24/2004)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        LETTER RE: SVC OF DISPOSITIVE MOTION PAPERS by defendants to dismiss SVC LTR ( to Judge Joan N. Ericksen ). 1 pg(s) (JMM) (Entered: 05/22/2003)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Chief Mag. Judge Jonathan G. Lebedoff ) that defendants have until 5/15/03 to answer, move or otherwise respond to consolidated amended complaint; if defendants' response is in the form of a motion to dismiss, plaintiffs have until 6/30/03 to respond and defendants have until 7/30/03 to reply. 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL) (Entered: 04/22/2003)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Chief Mag. Judge Jonathan G. Lebedoff ) that defendants have to 4/15/03 to answer, move or otherwise respond to consolidated amended complaint; if response is in the form of a motion to dismiss, plaintiffs have to 5/30/03 to respond to the motion and defendants have to 6/30/03 to submit a reply 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL) (Entered: 03/11/2003)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Chief Mag. Judge Jonathan G. Lebedoff ) that defendants have to and including 3/10/03 to answer, move or otherwise respond to consolidated amemded complaint; if response is in the form of a motion to dismiss, plaintiffs have to 4/24/03 to respond and defendants have to 5/24/03 to reply 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL) (Entered: 02/18/2003)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/27/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] by lead plaintiffs Acadian Asset Mgt, John McConnel; jury demand 27pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 01/06/2003)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                  PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Clerk Richard D. Sletten ) on behalf of plaintiff Acadian Asset Mgt by Michael K Yarnoff (2 pgs) (MKC) (Entered: 11/18/2002)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Chief Mag. Judge Jonathan G. Lebedoff ) that plaintiffs file a consolidated amended complaint or designate one of the existing complaints to be filed as the consolidated amended complaint within 60 days from the date of this order; defendant shall have 45 days in which to answer, move or otherwise respond to complaint; if defendants' response is in the form of a motion to dismiss, plaintiffs shall have 45 days to respond; defendants shall not be required to answer, move, or to otherwise respond to the complaint in any action consolidated into this action; in the event additional actions are filed, this order shall apply to every such action, and absent order of the court, defendants shall not be required to answer in those actions except as set forth herein; defendants may properly effect service by serving co-lead counsel and effecting personal service on co-liaison counsel 3pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL) (Entered: 11/04/2002)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      LETTER dated 10/10/02 to counsel from Magistrate Judge Lebedof, Re: Status Conference hearing 1pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 10/29/2002)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Chief Mag. Judge Jonathan G. Lebedoff ) consolidating cases 0:02-cv-1738 with member cases 0:02-cv-1757, 0:02-cv-2831, 0:02-cv-2939, 0:02-cv-3376 for all purposes, with 02-1738 as Master Docket and shall have the following caption: In Re: SuperValu, Inc. Securities Litigation; class members Aradian Asset Management and John McConnel are appointed lead plaintiffs and the law firms of Schiffrin & Barroway and Cauley Geller Bowman & Coates are approved as co-lead counsel; the law firms of Zimmerman Reed and Reinhardt & Anderson are approved as co-liaison counsel 11pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL) (Entered: 10/29/2002)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          LETTER in regards to finding the motion for order appointing him as lead plaintiff [10-1] moot. finding the motion for order approving his selection of law firms for lead and liason counsel [10-2] moot. finding the motion to consolidate related cases ( to Chief Mag. Judge Jonathan G. Lebedoff ) [10-3] moot 2pgs (DFL) (Entered: 10/29/2002)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            LETTER in regards to finding the motion to consolidate cases [7-1] moot. finding the motion for order to be appointed lead plaintiff [7-2] moot. finding the motion for order approving selection of lead counsel and liaison counsel (to Judge Joan E. Lancaster). [7-3] moot 2pgs (DFL) (Entered: 10/29/2002)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE ( Chief Mag. Judge Jonathan G. Lebedoff / 10/2/02) status hearing set for 8:30 a.m. on 10/15/02 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL) (Entered: 10/11/2002)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Clerk Richard D. Sletten ) on behalf of plaintiff by S Gene Cauley, Randall K Pulliam 2pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 10/08/2002)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  AMENDED NOTICE by Acadian Asset Mgt setting hearing for motion to consolidate cases [7-1] at 8:30 a.m. on 10/15/02, setting hearing for motion for order to be appointed lead plaintiff [7-2] at 8:30 a.m. on 10/15/02, setting hearing for motion for order approving selection of lead counsel and liaison counsel (to Judge Joan E. Lancaster). [7-3] at 8:30 a.m. on 10/15/02 6pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 10/07/2002)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    Amended NOTICE by movant John McConnel setting hearing for motion for order appointing him as lead plaintiff [10-1] at 8:30 10/15/02, setting hearing for motion for order approving his selection of law firms for lead and liason counsel [10-2] at 8:30 10/15/02, setting hearing for motion to consolidate related cases ( to Chief Mag. Judge Jonathan G. Lebedoff ) [10-3] at 8:30 10/15/02 2pg(s) (SJH) (Entered: 10/05/2002)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER OF DIRECTION TO THE CLERK OF COURT FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASE ( Judge Joan E. Lancaster / 9/13/2) that Case Nos 02-1757 & 00-2939 be assigned to Judge Joan E. Lancaster. That as copy of this Order shall be placed in each of the above respective files. (2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DDB) (Entered: 09/23/2002)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Randall K. Pulliam re motion for order appointing him as lead plaintiff [10-1], re motion for order approving his selection of law firms for lead and liason counsel [10-2], re motion to consolidate related cases [10-3] 3+pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 09/17/2002)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by John McConnel in support of motion for order appointing him as lead plaintiff [10-1], of motion for approving his selection of law firms for lead and liason counsel [10-2], of motion to consolidate related cases [10-3] 9pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 09/17/2002)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/12/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            MOTION by John McConnel for order appointing him as lead plaintiff ; for order approving his selection of law firms for lead and liason counsel ; to consolidate related cases ( to Chief Mag. Judge Jonathan G. Lebedoff ) 3pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 09/17/2002)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Darren J. Check in support of motion to consolidate cases [7-1], for order to be appointed lead plaintiff [7-2], and for order approving selection of lead counsel and liaison counsel. [7-3] 4+ pg(s) (JVN) (Entered: 09/14/2002)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by movant Acadian Asset Mgt in support of motion to consolidate cases [7-1], for order to be appointed lead plaintiff [7-2], and for order approving selection of lead counsel and liaison counsel. [7-3] 12 pg(s) (JVN) (Entered: 09/14/2002)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  MOTION by movant Acadian Asset Mgt to consolidate cases , for order to be appointed lead plaintiff , and for order approving selection of lead counsel and liaison counsel (to Judge Joan E. Lancaster). 4 pg(s) (JVN) (Entered: 09/14/2002)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Chief Mag. Judge Jonathan G. Lebedoff ) that defendants have until 45 days following the court's appointment of lead plaintiff, to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint 2pg(s)(cc: all counsel) (DFL) (Entered: 08/06/2002)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      ORIGINAL SUMMONS AND RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Michael W Wright on 7/17/02 3pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 08/02/2002)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        ORIGINAL SUMMONS AND RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Jeffrey Noddle on 7/17/02 3pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 08/02/2002)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Pamela K Knous on 7/12/02 2pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 08/02/2002)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            ORIGINAL SUMMONS AND RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Supervalu Inc. on 7/12/02 2pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 08/02/2002)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT - 2 Summons issued. Assigned to Judge Joan E. Lancaster per securities list and referred to Chief Mag. Judge Jonathan G. Lebedoff. Receipt # 424210 for $150.00 (17 pgs) (MKC) (Entered: 07/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 158 times.

                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?