The City of Farmington Hills Employees Retirement System v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:10-cv-04372
District Judge Donovan W. Frank, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 3, 2017 at 5:33 PM EDT (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo The City of Farmington Hills Employees Retirement System, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill Duerler +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 788 0841 jilllevine1@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Arthur Binkow +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 info@glancylaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andy Sohrn +1 310 201 9150 asohrn@glancylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by VanOverbeke Michaud & Timmony, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas C. Michaud +1 313 578 1200 +1 313 578 1201 tmichaud@vmtlaw.com

Represented by Zimmerman Reed PLLP

No Logo The City of Farmington Hills Employess Retirement System, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter-NA A. Binkow
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher-NA D. Kaye
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas-NA C. Michaud
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E.-NA Powell Miller
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andy-NA Sohn

Represented by Zimmerman Reed PLLP

v.
Wells Fargo Bank, NA Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Defendant
Officer/Director, NORWEST CORP
Officer/Director, Day Runner, Inc.
Officer/Director, Yucca Uranium Inc
Officer/Director, Munienhanced Fund Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Zelle, Hofmann, Voelbel, Mason & Gette LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R Cashman +1 612 339 2020 +1 612 336 9100 mcashman@zelle.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Michael Hagstrom +1 612 339 2020 +1 612 336 9100 rhagstrom@zelle.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence T Hofmann +1 612 339 2020 +1 612 336 9100 lhofmann@zelle.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rory D Zamansky +1 612 359 4280 +1 612 336 9100 rzamansky@zelle.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (237) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 686 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT. 1. The Court, for purposes of this Final Order and Judgment (the "Judgment") adopts all defined terms as set forth in the Settlement, and incorporates them herein by reference as if fully set forth. 2. The Court has jurisdiction over the subject matter of the Action, and all matters relating to the Settlement, as well as personal jurisdiction over all of the Settling Parties and each of the Class Members. 3. The Notice, the publication of Notice on a dedicated website and the notice methodology implemented pursuant to the Settlement Agreement and the Court's orders: (i) constituted the best notice practicable under the circumstances to all persons within the definition of the Class; (ii) constituted notice that was reasonably calculated, under the circumstances, to apprise Class Members of the pendency of the Action, of the effect of the Settlement Agreement, including releases, of their right to object to the proposed Settlement, of their right to participate in the Settlement, and of their right to appear at the Final Approval Hearing; (iii) were reasonable and constituted due, adequate and sufficient notice to all persons or entities entitled to receive notice; and (iv) met all applicable requirements of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the United States Constitution (including the Due Process Clause), the Rules of the Court and any other applicable law. (See Order for additional information.) (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 8/18/2014. (BJS) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 685 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donovan W. Frank: Motion Hearing held on 8/14/2014 re 675 MOTION for Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds filed by The City of Farmington Hills Employees Retirement System, The Arizona State Carpenters Defined Contribution Trust Fund, The Board of Trustees of the Arizona State Carpenters Pension Trust Fund, 670 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Awards filed by The City of Farmington Hills Employees Retirement System, The Arizona State Carpenters Defined Contribution Trust Fund, The Board of Trustees of the Arizona State Carpenters Pension Trust Fund. Motions taken under advisement; written order to issue. (Court Reporter Jeanne Anderson) (BJS) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 666 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, APPROVING FORM AND MANNER OF NOTICE, AND SETTING DATE FOR HEARING ON FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT. 1. The Court, for purposes of this Order, adopts all defined terms as set forth in the Settlement Agreement unless otherwise defined herein. (See order for additional information.) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 6/5/2014. (BJS) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 665 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donovan W. Frank: Motion Hearing held on 6/5/2014 re 653 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by The City of Farmington Hills Employees Retirement System, The Arizona State Carpenters Defined Contribution Trust Fund, The Board of Trustees of the Arizona State Carpenters Pension Trust Fund. Written order to issue. (Court Reporter Jeanne Anderson) (BJS) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 664 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER in re Stipulation Regarding Notice to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. 651 . 1. Supplemental Notice, attached hereto as Exhibit A, shall be disseminated to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/29/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(BJS) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 663 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
            MEMORANDUM in Support re 653 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Amended) filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Millea, Daniel) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 662 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. re 660 Declaration in Support (Millea, Daniel) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 661 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by The Arizona State Carpenters Defined Contribution Trust Fund, The Board of Trustees of the Arizona State Carpenters Pension Trust Fund, The City of Farmington Hills Employees Retirement System re 653 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Binkow, Peter) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 660 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                  Declaration of Dan Millea in Support of 657 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Placeholder for Exhibits 1-14)(Millea, Daniel) Sealed document received on 5/29/2014 (JGK). (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 659 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Arizona State Carpenters Defined Contribution Trust Fund, The Board of Trustees of the Arizona State Carpenters Pension Trust Fund, The City of Farmington Hills Employees Retirement System re 656 Declaration in Support,, Certificate of Service of Conventionally Filed/Sealed Documents (Binkow, Peter) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 658 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                      MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re 653 Motion for Approval of Settlement, filed by The Arizona State Carpenters Defined Contribution Trust Fund, The Board of Trustees of the Arizona State Carpenters Pension Trust Fund, The City of Farmington Hills Employees Retirement System. (Binkow, Peter) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 657 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                        DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-INCORRECT DOCUMENT ATTACHED-REFILED AS 663 . [MEMORANDUM in Support re 653 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate). (Millea, Daniel) Modified text on 5/29/2014 (lmb). (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 656 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                          Declaration of Peter A. Binkow in Support of 653 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by The Arizona State Carpenters Defined Contribution Trust Fund, The Board of Trustees of the Arizona State Carpenters Pension Trust Fund, The City of Farmington Hills Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) A, # 3 Exhibit(s) B, # 4 Exhibit(s) B(1), # 5 Exhibit(s) C, # 6 Exhibit(s) D, # 7 Placeholder for 1-D(1) THROUGH 1-D(4), # 8 Exhibit(s) E)(Binkow, Peter)SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 5/28/14LGL Modified on 5/29/2014 (LGL). (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 655 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 653 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by The Arizona State Carpenters Defined Contribution Trust Fund, The Board of Trustees of the Arizona State Carpenters Pension Trust Fund, The City of Farmington Hills Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Binkow, Peter) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 654 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 653 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement : Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (Binkow, Peter) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 653 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                MOTION for Approval of Settlement Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by The Arizona State Carpenters Defined Contribution Trust Fund, The Board of Trustees of the Arizona State Carpenters Pension Trust Fund, The City of Farmington Hills Employees Retirement System. (Binkow, Peter) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 652 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. re 651 Stipulation, (Zamansky, Rory) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                    STIPULATION Regarding Notice to Wells Fargo Bank by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. Jointly Signed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., The City of Farmington Hills Employees Retirement System, The Board of Trustees of the Arizona State Carpenters Pension Trust Fund, and The Board of Trustees of the Arizona State Carpenters Defined Contribution Trust Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Zamansky, Rory) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 650 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donovan W. Frank: Status Conference held on 4/14/2014. Case has settled; Preliminary Approval Hearing set for 6/5/2014 at 9:00 AM. (Court Reporter Jeanne Anderson) (BJS) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 4/12/2014, Entered: None
                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. re 648 Stipulation, (Davis, Lindsey) (Entered: 04/12/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 648 Filed: 4/12/2014, Entered: None
                                          STIPULATION Regarding Admission of Documents Into Evidence by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. Jointly Signed by The City of Farmington Hills Employees Retirement System, The Board of Trustees of the Arizona State Carpenters Pension Trust Fund, The Arizona State Carpenters Defined Contribution Trust Fund, and Wells Fargo Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Davis, Lindsey) (Entered: 04/12/2014)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 647 Filed: 4/12/2014, Entered: None
                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. re 646 Stipulation, (Davis, Lindsey) (Entered: 04/12/2014)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646 Filed: 4/12/2014, Entered: None
                                              STIPULATION Regarding Authenticity of Certain Documents by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. Jointly Signed by The City of Farmington Hills Employees Retirement System, The Board of Trustees of the Arizona State Carpenters Pension Trust Fund, The Arizona State Carpenters Defined Contribution Trust Fund, and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Davis, Lindsey) (Entered: 04/12/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 630
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 628
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 627
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 623
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 622
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 386 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. 1. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Decertify the Class (Doc. No. 322 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: a. The motion for decertification is GRANTED with respect to the sixteen ERISA Plaintiffs. As such, the following entities are excluded from the Class: (1) Twin City Hospital Workers Pension Fund; (2) The Schwan Food Company Retirement Savings Plan; (3) Longview Fibre Company; (4) ABC Retirement Plan for Cooperatives; (5) Alliant Energy M aster Retirement Trust Plan; (6) Bemis Company, Inc. Master Pension Trust; (7) ITT Corporation Employee Benefits Trust; (8) ITT Corporation ISP for Salaried Employees; (9) Les Schwab Profit Sharing Retirement Trust; (10) MDU Resources Group Inc. Ma ster Trust; (11) Omaha Construction Industry Plans; (12) Presbyterian Healthcare Services; (13) Presbyterian Healthcare Services Employees Pension Plan; (14) Smithfield Foods, Inc. Master Trust; (15) Arizona Laborers Teamsters Local 395 Pension Trus t Fund; and (16) Arizona Laborers Teamsters Local 395 Defined Contribution Fund. b. As stipulated by the parties, the following seven entities are also excluded from the class: (1) IHC Foundation Inc.; (2) Mid-West Life Insurance Co.; (3) The Chesap eake Life Insurance Co.; (4) The Mega Life & Health Insurance Co.; (5) United Group Reinsurance, Inc.; (6) SIT/Kim Global Fund LLC International; and (7) SIT/Kim International Fund LLC International. c. In all other respects, the motion is DENIED. 2. Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Certain of Wells Fargo's Affirmative Defenses (Doc. No. 309 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: a. Wells Fargo's affirmative defenses numbered 6, 7, 15, 28, 43, and 48 are hereby DISMISSED. b. In all other respects, the motion is DENIED. 3. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 315 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: a. The motion is DENIED with respect to Plaintiffs' breach of fiduciary duty, MCFA, DTPA, and UTPA claims. b. The motion is DENIED AS MOOT to the extent Wells Fargo seeks judgment as to the claims of the sixteen ERISA Plaintiffs. c. The motion is GRANTED with respect to CFHERS' c laim for civil theft. As such, Wells Fargo is entitled to judgment as to Count VI of the Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 277 ). 4. Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Reports and Testimony of Defendant's Proposed Experts (Doc. No. 302 ) is DENIED. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 9/17/2013. (BJS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 284 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 260 Objection To Discovery Ruling, filed by The City of Farmington Hills Employees Retirement System. 1. Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham's September 24, 2012 Order (Doc. No. 260 ) is OVERRULED. 2. Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham's September 24, 2012 Order (Doc. No. 235 ) is AFFIRMED. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 11/19/2012. (BJS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 265 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 238 Motion Without Prejudice. (Written Opinion.) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 10/22/2012. (rlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 235 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part 212 Motion for clarification. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (Written Opinion). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 9/21/12. (RLR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 120 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. 1. Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification (Doc. No. 61 ) is GRANTED as to Count I (Breach of Fiduciary Duty), Count II (Breach of Contract), and Count III (Violation of Minnesota Prevention of Consumer Fraud Ac t Minn. Stat. § 325F.69) of Plaintiffs Class Action Complaint (Doc. No. 1, Ex. 1). 2. The following class is certified pursuant to Rule 23 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure: All participants in Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s secu rities lending program (the Program) from any time in the period January 1, 2006 to the present who suffered losses due to the Program's purchase and maintenance of high risk, long-term securities. 3. The parties shall negotiate the content of t he class notice. Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, the parties shall submit a joint proposed notice to the Court. If the parties are unable to agree on the content of the notice, the parties shall each submit a proposed notice, to gether with briefing not to exceed ten (10) pages per side, within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. 4. The Court appoints the City of Farmington Hill Employees Retirement System as class representative. 5. Having considered the require ments of Rule 23(g) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court appoints Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP, the Miller Law Firm, P.C., VanOverbeke Michaud & Timmony, P.C., and Zimmerman Reed, PLLP, as class counsel.(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 3/27/2012. (BJS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by The City of Farmington Hills Employees Retirement System Requesting Telephone Conference Regarding Rule 26(f) Report Issue. (Anderson, Carolyn) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ONLY ENTRY. Oral ORDER ruling on request for extension - Parties contacted chambers for an extension of time to file revised Rule 26(f) report - Extension to March 11, 2011 granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 02/25/11. (JMK) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/11/2011. (akl) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by The City of Farmington Hills Employees Retirement System, Wells Fargo Bank N.A..(Zamansky, Rory) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jill Duerler. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2692972 by The City of Farmington Hills Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Cialkowski, David) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Setting Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2011 11:30 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 342 (STP) or by telephone before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(RLR) Modified typo of date on 1/21/2011 (RLR). (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 10cv4372 DWF/JJG. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E Rau on 1/20/2011. (JME) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Thomas C. Michaud by The City of Farmington Hills Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Anderson, Carolyn) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for E. Powell Miller. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2688740 by The City of Farmington Hills Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Anderson, Carolyn) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Due to the appointment of Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau, this case is reassigned to him. Magistrate Judge X is no longer assigned to the case. Please contact Melissa Erstad at 651-848-1620, for scheduling or other matters related to Magistrate Judge Rau. (JME) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the elevation of Judge Susan R. Nelson, this case is reassigned to Magisitrate Judge X. Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson no longer assigned to the case.NOTE: the new case number is 10cv4372 DWF/MJ X. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. If you have questions regarding this assignment, please direct your inquiries to Kathy Thobe at 651-848-1210 in Chief Magistrate Judge Boylan's chambers. (TSS) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference scheduled before Magistrate JudgeSusan Richard Nelson on December 21, 2010, at 4:00 p.m. is hereby cancelled and will be rescheduled at a later date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 12/20/10. (akl) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. This case is reassigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank. Judge Richard H. Kyle no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 10cv4372 DWF/SRN. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (JME) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER for Disqualification and for Reassignment. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 12/17/10. (kll) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Joan N. Ericksen recused. Case reassigned to Judge Richard H. Kyle for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 10cv4372 RHK/SRN. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 12/16/2010. (JME) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by The City of Farmington Hills Employees Retirement System, Wells Fargo Bank N.A..(Zamansky, Rory) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Christopher D. Kaye by The City of Farmington Hills Employess Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Hedberg, Kirsten) Modified on 12/8/2010 (MMC). (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Andy Sohrn by The City of Farmington Hills Employess Retirement System. (Anderson, Carolyn) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Peter A. Binkow by The City of Farmington Hills Employess Retirement System. (Anderson, Carolyn) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/14/2010. Pretrial Conference set for 12/21/2010 04:00 PM in Judge's Chambers Suite 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 11/08/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(MMP) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. re 3 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) (Hofmann, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Hofmann, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Defendant Wells Fargo Bank N.A. is a direct and indirect subsidiary of Wells Fargo & Company. (jz) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 10/28/10. (KT) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. from Hennipen County District Court, case number unknown. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4049548) assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per Securities List referred to Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson, filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (Attachments: # 1 Summons & Complaint, # 2 Notice of Filing of Removal, # 3 Proof of Filing in State Court, # 4 Affidavit of Service, # 5 Affidavit of Service, # 6 Affidavit of Service, # 7 Cover Letter, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet) (jz) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 10/28/10. (KT) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 230 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?