Singh et al v. Chertoff et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-02362-SI
District Judge Susan Illston, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dharam Singh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by jobelaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Bradford Jobe +1 415 956 5513 +1 415 840 0308 bob@jobelaw.com
No Logo Sukhwinder Singh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by jobelaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Bradford Jobe +1 415 956 5513 +1 415 840 0308 bob@jobelaw.com
v.
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "Condoleezza Rice"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward A. Olsen +1 415 436 6915 +1 415 436 6927 edward.olsen@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Homeland Security"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward A. Olsen +1 415 436 6915 +1 415 436 6927 edward.olsen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Lynne Skeirik, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward A. Olsen +1 415 436 6915 +1 415 436 6927 edward.olsen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward A. Olsen +1 415 436 6915 +1 415 436 6927 edward.olsen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael S. Owen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward A. Olsen +1 415 436 6915 +1 415 436 6927 edward.olsen@usdoj.gov
Office San Francisco
Filed 5/7/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 465 - Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County San Francisco
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP, E-Filing
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Parties' Joint Request to be Exempt from Formal ADR Process (Olsen, Edward) (Filed on 9/3/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER continuing cmc to 9/22/08. Signed by Judge Illston on 8/12/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2008)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2008. Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2008 02:00 PM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2008)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008 Stipulation
        STIPULATION to Extend Dates; and [Proposed] Order by Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Lynne Skeirik, Michael S. Owen, Condoleezza Rice. (Olsen, Edward) (Filed on 8/6/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Answer
          ANSWER to Complaint byMichael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Lynne Skeirik, Michael S. Owen, Condoleezza Rice. (Olsen, Edward) (Filed on 7/14/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER granting deadline to answer. Signed by Judge Illston on 7/8/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2008)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Stipulation
              STIPULATION to Extend Answer Deadline by Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Lynne Skeirik, Michael S. Owen, Condoleezza Rice. (Olsen, Edward) (Filed on 7/7/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sukhwinder Singh, Dharam Singh. Michael Chertoff served on 5/8/2008, answer due 5/28/2008; Department of Homeland Security served on 5/8/2008, answer due 5/28/2008; Lynne Skeirik served on 5/8/2008, answer due 5/28/2008; Michael S. Owen served on 5/8/2008, answer due 5/28/2008; Condoleezza Rice served on 5/8/2008, answer due 5/28/2008. (Jobe, Robert) (Filed on 5/16/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 Summons Issued as to USA
                  Summons Issued as to Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Lynne Skeirik, Michael S. Owen, Condoleezza Rice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 ADR Scheduling Order
                    ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/8/2008. Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2008 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # (1) standing orders)(ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2008)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 Complaint
                      COMPLAINT (summons issued); against Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Lynne Skeirik, Michael S. Owen, Condoleezza Rice ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611018939.). Filed bySukhwinder Singh, Dharam Singh. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2008) (ys, COURT STAFF).
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 Case Referred to ECF
                        CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2008)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 170 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?