K. v. NH Department of Health and Human Services

Federal Civil Lawsuit New Hampshire District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-00094-JL
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 4:01 PM EST (6.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Bk, Plaintiff

Represented by Bk

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space B. K.

Represented by Law Offices of Susan Kellman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy Sue Tierney +1 603 448 4722 nstierney1@aol.com
No Logo SK, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Offices of Susan Kellman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/15/2012

otherM. G.
TERMINATED: 10/15/2012
otherK.K (terminated 3/7/12)
TERMINATED: 10/15/2012 Nancy Sue Tierney +1 603 448 4722 nstierney1@aol.com

Represented by SK

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/15/2012

otherM. G.
TERMINATED: 10/15/2012
otherK.K (terminated 3/7/12)
TERMINATED: 10/15/2012 S.K.
v.
No Logo DCYF - Claremont DO Department Health and Human Services, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2012 James Spencer Culp +1 603 271 1250 +1 603 271 2110 James.Culp@doj.nh.gov
TERMINATED: 03/07/2012 Jeanne P. Herrick +1 603 271 3650 jeanne.herrick@doj.nh.gov

Represented by Office of Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2012 Nancy J. Smith +1 603 271 3650 +1 603 223 6236 nancy.smith@doj.nh.gov

Represented by Office of the New Hampshire Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2012 Karen A. Schlitzer +1 603 271 1210 karen.schlitzer@doj.nh.gov
No Logo Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and in her Official Capacity James Spencer Culp +1 603 271 1250 +1 603 271 2110 James.Culp@doj.nh.gov
Individually and in her Official Capacity Jeanne P. Herrick +1 603 271 3650 jeanne.herrick@doj.nh.gov

Represented by Office of Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and in her Official Capacity Nancy J. Smith +1 603 271 3650 +1 603 223 6236 nancy.smith@doj.nh.gov

Represented by Office of the New Hampshire Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and in her Official Capacity Karen A. Schlitzer +1 603 271 1210 karen.schlitzer@doj.nh.gov
No Logo Mark Rissala, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and in his Official Capacity James Spencer Culp +1 603 271 1250 +1 603 271 2110 James.Culp@doj.nh.gov
Individually and in his Official Capacity Jeanne P. Herrick +1 603 271 3650 jeanne.herrick@doj.nh.gov

Represented by Office of Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and in his Official Capacity Nancy J. Smith +1 603 271 3650 +1 603 223 6236 nancy.smith@doj.nh.gov

Represented by Office of the New Hampshire Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and in his Official Capacity Karen A. Schlitzer +1 603 271 1210 karen.schlitzer@doj.nh.gov
No Logo NH Department of Health and Human Services, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2012 James Spencer Culp +1 603 271 1250 +1 603 271 2110 James.Culp@doj.nh.gov
TERMINATED: 03/07/2012 Jeanne P. Herrick +1 603 271 3650 jeanne.herrick@doj.nh.gov

Represented by Office of Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2012 Nancy J. Smith +1 603 271 3650 +1 603 223 6236 nancy.smith@doj.nh.gov

Represented by Office of the New Hampshire Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2012 Karen A. Schlitzer +1 603 271 1210 karen.schlitzer@doj.nh.gov
No Logo NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and in his Official Capacity

otherNicholas Toumpas James Spencer Culp +1 603 271 1250 +1 603 271 2110 James.Culp@doj.nh.gov
Individually and in his Official Capacity

otherNicholas Toumpas Jeanne P. Herrick +1 603 271 3650 jeanne.herrick@doj.nh.gov

Represented by Office of Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and in his Official Capacity

otherNicholas Toumpas Nancy J. Smith +1 603 271 3650 +1 603 223 6236 nancy.smith@doj.nh.gov

Represented by Office of the New Hampshire Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and in his Official Capacity

otherNicholas Toumpas Karen A. Schlitzer +1 603 271 1210 karen.schlitzer@doj.nh.gov
No Logo NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and in her Offical Capacity for the Claremont District Office
TERMINATED: 03/07/2012

otherMary-Ann Babic-Keith
TERMINATED: 03/07/2012 James Spencer Culp +1 603 271 1250 +1 603 271 2110 James.Culp@doj.nh.gov
Individually and in her Offical Capacity for the Claremont District Office
TERMINATED: 03/07/2012

otherMary-Ann Babic-Keith
TERMINATED: 03/07/2012 Jeanne P. Herrick +1 603 271 3650 jeanne.herrick@doj.nh.gov

Represented by Office of Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and in her Offical Capacity for the Claremont District Office
TERMINATED: 03/07/2012

otherMary-Ann Babic-Keith
TERMINATED: 03/07/2012 Nancy J. Smith +1 603 271 3650 +1 603 223 6236 nancy.smith@doj.nh.gov

Represented by Office of the New Hampshire Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and in her Offical Capacity for the Claremont District Office
TERMINATED: 03/07/2012

otherMary-Ann Babic-Keith
TERMINATED: 03/07/2012 Karen A. Schlitzer +1 603 271 1210 karen.schlitzer@doj.nh.gov
No Logo NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Director, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and in her Official Capacity

otherMaggie Bishop James Spencer Culp +1 603 271 1250 +1 603 271 2110 James.Culp@doj.nh.gov
Individually and in her Official Capacity

otherMaggie Bishop Jeanne P. Herrick +1 603 271 3650 jeanne.herrick@doj.nh.gov

Represented by Office of Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and in her Official Capacity

otherMaggie Bishop Nancy J. Smith +1 603 271 3650 +1 603 223 6236 nancy.smith@doj.nh.gov

Represented by Office of the New Hampshire Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and in her Official Capacity

otherMaggie Bishop Karen A. Schlitzer +1 603 271 1210 karen.schlitzer@doj.nh.gov
No Logo Susan Holdsworth, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and in her Official Capacity James Spencer Culp +1 603 271 1250 +1 603 271 2110 James.Culp@doj.nh.gov
Individually and in her Official Capacity Jeanne P. Herrick +1 603 271 3650 jeanne.herrick@doj.nh.gov

Represented by Office of Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and in her Official Capacity Nancy J. Smith +1 603 271 3650 +1 603 223 6236 nancy.smith@doj.nh.gov

Represented by Office of the New Hampshire Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and in her Official Capacity Karen A. Schlitzer +1 603 271 1210 karen.schlitzer@doj.nh.gov
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Timeline
  Entries (94) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with 110 Order on Motion, 103 Order, 70 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Clerk James R. Starr. (Case Closed) (cmp) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 110 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
///ORDER granting in part 84 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 108 Motion in Limine to Have Deemed Admisssions to Jury and exclude children's claims. Motion for Summary Judgment granted as to BK' s claims, denied as moot as to the 1983 claims against the individual defendants by SK (on her own behalf, as well as on behalf of the children) since those claims have been dismissed wthout prejudice. All pending motions denied as moot. Upcoming final pretrial conference and trial cancelled. The clerk of court shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Continue Trial filed by Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Susan Holdsworth, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Director, Mark Rissala. Follow up on Objection on 11/16/2012.(Smith, Nancy) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None Motion in Limine
MOTION in Limine to Have Deemed Admisssions to Jury and exclude children's claims filed by Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Susan Holdsworth, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Director, Mark Rissala. Follow up on Objection on 11/16/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Req. for Admissions, # 2 Exhibit B, April 20, 2012 ltr, # 3 Exhibit C. Depo MR. K)(Smith, Nancy) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
Proposed Jury Instructions by All Defendants. (Smith, Nancy) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
Proposed Voir Dire by All Defendants. (Smith, Nancy) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
Pretrial Statement filed by All Defendants. (Smith, Nancy) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
Mediation Statement: mediation not helpful (Smith, Nancy) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
///ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF S.K. FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY. THE CASE SHALL PROCEED AS THE REMAINING PARTIES. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by James Spencer Culp on behalf of NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Director(Culp, James) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Potential Conflict re Trial date by Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Susan Holdsworth, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Director, Mark Rissala.(Smith, Nancy) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 100 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 96 Motion to Stay/Continue Case and not Take Action between July 15th and September 5th to Stay. Stay is granted to September 5, 2012. Final pretrial is continued to November 20, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. Trial continued to December 4, 2012 at 9:30 a.m. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
OBJECTION to 96 MOTION to Stay filed by Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Susan Holdsworth, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Director, Mark Rissala. (Culp, James) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
Defendants' Reply to the Plaintiffs' Objection to 84 Motion for Summary Judgment by Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Susan Holdsworth, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Director, Mark Rissala(Culp, James) Modified on 8/1/2012 to add link to 84 : (cmp). (Entered: 07/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Exceed page limit re Objection to Motion to Dismiss filed by S. K.. Follow up on Objection on 8/6/2012.(Tierney, Nancy) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 96 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Stay/Continue Case and not Take Action between July 15th and September 5th filed by B. K., Pro se. Follow up on Objection on 8/2/2012.(cmp) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
MOTION Late Entry filed by S. K.. Follow up on Objection on 8/6/2012.(Tierney, Nancy) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
Objection to 84 Sealed Motion for summary judgment by S. K. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in opposition to motion for summary judgment)(Tierney, Nancy) Modified on 7/18/2012 to add:link to Motion (cmp). (Entered: 07/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None
AMENDED CLERK'S ORDER: Plaintiff S.K is directed to notify the Court no later than 30 days after July 17th of the name of a new attorney or Pro se appearance should be filed or the case will be referred to a judicial officer for further action. Notice of Compliance Deadline set for 8/17/2012.(cmp) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/22/2012
MOTION for a Trial from the Beginning of the Case in a Court Outside of New Hampshire and Vermont (& objection to Nancy Tierney's Withdrawal) filed by B. K. Follow up on Objection on 6/28/2012.(cmp) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
OBJECTION to 87 MOTION for Reconsideration re 86 Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond, filed by Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Susan Holdsworth, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Director, Mark Rissala. (Smith, Nancy) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE re 83 Miscellaneous Filing Reply to Objection filed by DCYF - Claremont DO Department Health and Human Services, Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Susan Holdsworth, NH Department of Health and Human Services, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Director, Mark Rissala. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Culp, James) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Reconsideration re 86 Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond, filed by Savita K.. Follow up on Objection on 6/28/2012.(Tierney, Nancy) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/10/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to 8/1/2012 (to obj to Motion for Summ Judgment) filed by Savita K.. Follow up on Objection on 6/28/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit emails)(Tierney, Nancy) (Entered: 06/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
Objection to all motions and Memo of Law filed by Attorney Culp and Request that he court not assign any court dates between July and September 2012 by B. K.(cmp) (Entered: 06/07/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None
Addendum/ to 80 MOTION for Tierney to Withdraw as Attorney by Nancy S. Tierney. (Tierney, Nancy) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Tierney to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Nancy S. Tierney. Follow up on Objection on 6/18/2012.(Tierney, Nancy) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
Supplement to Defs.' Objection by DCYF - Claremont DO Department Health and Human Services, Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Susan Holdsworth, NH Department of Health and Human Services, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Director, Mark Rissala (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Email From Nancy Tierney, # 2 Exhibit NH Super. Ct. Decision)(Culp, James) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
OBJECTION to 77 MOTION to Extend Discovery date and give an order to provide all papers from lower court, 76 MOTION for FBI Investigation filed by DCYF - Claremont DO Department Health and Human Services, Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Susan Holdsworth, NH Department of Health and Human Services, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Director, Mark Rissala. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law Memorandum of Law, # 2 Exhibit Ex. A, Family Ct. Order, # 3 Exhibit Ex.B, NH Supreme Ct. Order, # 4 Exhibit Ex. C, Oct. 6, 2011 Letter, # 5 Exhibit Ex. D-1, Interogatories, # 6 Exhibit Ex. D-2, Requests for Admissions, # 7 Exhibit Ex. D-3, Requests for Prod., # 8 Exhibit Ex. E, April 10 Letter, # 9 Exhibit (Affidavit) Ex. F, Affidavit of J. Culp, # 10 Exhibit Ex. G, April 20 Letter, # 11 Exhibit Ex. H, Notice of Dep., # 12 Exhibit Ex. I, April 12 Letter, # 13 Exhibit Ex. J, April 16 Letter, # 14 Exhibit Ex. K, April 19 Letter, # 15 Exhibit Ex. L, Dep. of Mr. K)(Culp, James) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Extend Discovery date and give an order to provide all papers from lower court and further motion to Order FBI investigation filed by B. K. Follow up on Objection on 5/21/2012.(cmp) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for FBI Investigation filed by B.K. Follow up on Objection on 5/11/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Letters in support of health condition)(cmp) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/15/2012, Entered: None
Reply to OBJECTION to 71 MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Discovery Requests response to objection filed by Savita K.(Tierney, Nancy) Modified on 4/16/2012 to add: Reply to (dae). (Entered: 04/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
Notice of Intent to Reply to Objection to Motion to Extend Time. Follow up on Reply on 4/30/2012.(Tierney, Nancy) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
OBJECTION to 71 MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Discovery Requests filed by DCYF - Claremont DO Department Health and Human Services, Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Susan Holdsworth, NH Department of Health and Human Services, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Director, Mark Rissala. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defs.' Interrogatories, # 2 Exhibit Defs.' Requests For Production of Documents, # 3 Exhibit Defs.' Requests for Admissions)(Culp, James) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None
FILED IN ERROR BY COUNSEL. Notice of Intent to Reply to Objection to 71 MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Discovery Requests. Follow up on Reply on 4/27/2012.(Culp, James) Modified on 4/10/2012 to add: FILED IN ERROR BY COUNSEL.(cmp). (Entered: 04/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Discovery Requests filed by Savita K.. Follow up on Objection on 4/26/2012.(Tierney, Nancy) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: None
REPLY to Objection to Motion re 63 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by DCYF - Claremont DO Department Health and Human Services, Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Susan Holdsworth, NH Department of Health and Human Services, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Director, Mark Rissala. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law Reply Memorandum To Plaintiff's Objection)(Culp, James) (Entered: 02/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
Notice of Intent to Reply to Objection to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Follow up on Reply on 3/5/2012.(Culp, James) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 67 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
SEALED OBJECTION to 63 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Savita K.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law In support of objection)(Tierney, Nancy) Modified on 2/21/2012 to add proper link to 63 and to seal per 2/21/12 order (cmp).. (Entered: 02/16/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal Document 67 OBJECTION to 63 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Savita K. Follow up on Objection on 3/5/2012.(Tierney, Nancy) Modified on 2/21/2012 to add:proper link to objection 67 (cmp). (Entered: 02/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
MOTION Late Filing of Objection to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Savita K.. Follow up on Objection on 3/5/2012.(Tierney, Nancy) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Spencer Culp on behalf of Jeszadiah Eisenberg, NH Department of Health and Human Services, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, Mark Rissala (cmp) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by DCYF - Claremont DO Department Health and Human Services, Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Susan Holdsworth, NH Department of Health and Human Services, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families. Follow up on Objection on 2/3/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law)(Smith, Nancy) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeanne P. Herrick on behalf of NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, DCYF - Claremont DO Department Health and Human Services, Susan Holdsworth, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Director, Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Mark Rissala, NH Department of Health and Human Services (Amended as to Certificate of Service to B.K.) (Herrick, Jeanne) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nancy J. Smith on behalf of NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, DCYF - Claremont DO Department Health and Human Services, Susan Holdsworth, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Director, Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Mark Rissala, NH Department of Health and Human Services (Amended as to Certificate of Service to B.K.) (Smith, Nancy) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Karen A. Schlitzer to Withdraw as Attorney filed by DCYF - Claremont DO Department Health and Human Services, Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Susan Holdsworth, NH Department of Health and Human Services, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Director, Mark Rissala. Follow up on Objection on 1/6/2012.(Schlitzer, Karen) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
Proposed Discovery Plan (of all parties except for Mr. K) filed by DCYF - Claremont DO Department Health and Human Services, Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Susan Holdsworth, NH Department of Health and Human Services, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Director, Mark Rissala. (Schlitzer, Karen) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 55 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
///ORDER granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion to Dismiss (Reinstated). Granted as to counts 4-6 of the amended complaint, but denied as to counts 1-3. No preliminary pretrial conference. Parties to confer and submit a joint discovery plan by October 14, 2011. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/27/2011, Entered: None
Assented to MOTION to Seal Document at Level Level 1 filed by Savita K.. (Tierney, Nancy) (Entered: 02/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/27/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Conventional filing of Permission to file Surreply by Savita K.. (Tierney, Nancy) (Entered: 02/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Filing Notice that "Defendants' Reply to Objection to Reinstated Motion to Dismiss" Also Applies To Mr. K's Objection by DCYF - Claremont DO Department Health and Human Services, Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Susan Holdsworth, NH Department of Health and Human Services, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families. (Schlitzer, Karen) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 47 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None
SEALED (Unredacted) OBJECTION to Reinstated : 43 Motion to Dismiss at Level 1. filed by B.K. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Notice of Conventional Filing)(cmp) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/6/2011, Entered: None
Assented to MOTION to Seal Document 45 Objection to Motion at Level Level 1 filed by Savita K.. (Tierney, Nancy) (Entered: 02/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 45 Filed: 2/6/2011, Entered: None
SEALED OBJECTION to 43 MOTION to Dismiss (Reinstated) MOTION to Dismiss (Reinstated) MOTION to Dismiss (Reinstated) Objection filed by Savita K.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law)(Tierney, Nancy) Modified on 2/7/2011 to add the word 'SEALED': (cmp). (Entered: 02/06/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to ECF - Filing Error - Info Only,, 43 MOTION to Dismiss (Reinstated) MOTION to Dismiss (Reinstated) MOTION to Dismiss (Reinstated), 42 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) to 2/08/2011 (midnight of 2/7/11) filed by Savita K.. (Tierney, Nancy) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss (Reinstated) filed by DCYF - Claremont DO Department Health and Human Services, Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Susan Holdsworth, NH Department of Health and Human Services, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families. Follow up on Objection on 2/10/2011. Certain exhibit(s) maintained conventionally in Clerks Office. (Attorney filers must submit conventional materials to the court within 72 hours.) (Schlitzer, Karen) (Additional attachment(s) added # 1 SEALED Memorandum of Law) (cmp). Modified on 2/7/2011 to add:SEALED (cmp). (Entered: 01/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Conventional Filing (Memorandum of Law in Support of Reinstated Motion to Dismiss) by DCYF - Claremont DO Department Health and Human Services, Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Susan Holdsworth, NH Department of Health and Human Services, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families. (Schlitzer, Karen) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None
OBJECTION to 40 MOTION to Stay (Partial) filed by DCYF - Claremont DO Department Health and Human Services, Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Susan Holdsworth, NH Department of Health and Human Services, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families. (Schlitzer, Karen) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
REDACTED ORDER regarding Withdrawal of Counsel. Signed by Deputy Clerk Pappas. Notice of Compliance Deadline set for 10/12/2010. (cmp) Modified on 9/20/2010 to add REDACTED ORDER: (cmp). (Entered: 09/20/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT by DCYF - Claremont DO Department Health and Human Services, Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Susan Holdsworth, NH Department of Health and Human Services, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families (Schlitzer, Karen) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT by Savita K. (Tierney, Nancy) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT by DCYF - Claremont DO Department Health and Human Services, Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Susan Holdsworth, NH Department of Health and Human Services, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families : Unable to Determine (Schlitzer, Karen) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT by Savita K. : stayed (Tierney, Nancy) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT by Nancy S. Tierney (Tierney, Nancy) (Entered: 12/07/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None
Assented to MOTION to Stay filed by Nancy S. Tierney. (Tierney, Nancy) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None
MOTION for Nancy S. Tierney to Withdraw as Attorney for B.K, (father of minor children) filed by Nancy S. Tierney. Follow up on Objection on 10/2/2009. (Tierney, Nancy) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion: 21 MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to July 28, 2009 Amended Complaint. (Schlitzer, Karen) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 13 Motion to Expedite Motion to Return Passports. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal Document at Level 1 filed by Savita K.. Follow up on Objection on 8/7/2009. (Tierney, Nancy) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None
SURREPLY to Reply to 24 MOTION for Leave to File surreply, 9 MOTION to Dismiss objection thereto filed by Savita K.. (Tierney, Nancy) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File surreply filed by Savita K.. Follow up on Objection on 8/3/2009. (Attachments: # 1 surreply)(Tierney, Nancy) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: None
MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to July 28, 2009 Amended Complaint filed by NH Department of Health and Human Services, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Director, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Mark Rissala, Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Susan Holdsworth, DCYF - Claremont DO Department Health and Human Services. Follow up on Objection on 7/27/2009. (Schlitzer, Karen) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: None
REPLY to Objection to Motion re 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by NH Department of Health and Human Services, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Director, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Mark Rissala, Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Susan Holdsworth, DCYF - Claremont DO Department Health and Human Services. (Schlitzer, Karen) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of conventional filing by Bhavnesh K.. (Tierney, Nancy) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None
THIS DOCUMENT ENTERED IN ERROR BY COUNSEL. MEMORANDUM re 16 Objection to Motion filed by Savita K.. Certain exhibit(s) maintained conventionally in Clerks Office. (Tierney, Nancy) Modified on 7/1/2009 to add: THIS DOCUMENT ENTERED IN ERROR BY COUNSEL (cmp). (Entered: 06/30/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None
OBJECTION to 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Savita K.. Certain exhibit(s) maintained conventionally in Clerks Office. (Tierney, Nancy) Modified on 7/1/2009 to add: SEALED MEMO OF LAW(cmp). (Entered: 06/30/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None
Assented to MOTION to Seal Document 14 Motion to Amend at Level Level one filed by Savita K.. (Tierney, Nancy) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Savita K.. Follow up on Objection on 7/17/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended complaint)(Tierney, Nancy) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None
MOTION to Expedite Motion to Return Passports filed by Savita K.. Follow up on Objection on 7/16/2009. (Tierney, Nancy) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to 6/30/09 filed by Bhavnesh K., Savita K.. (Tierney, Nancy) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal Document 10 Memo of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss at Level I filed by NH Department of Health and Human Services, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Director, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Susan Holdsworth, DCYF - Claremont DO Department Health and Human Services. Follow up on Objection on 6/22/2009. (cmp) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss filed by NH Department of Health and Human Services, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Director, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Mark Rissala, Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Susan Holdsworth, DCYF - Claremont DO Department Health and Human Services. Follow up on Objection on 6/22/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Notice ECF Notice of Conventional Filing)(Schlitzer, Karen) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to DCYF - Claremont DO Department Health and Human Services, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families by Bhavnesh K., Savita K.. (Tierney, Nancy) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None
Return of Service/ Waivers Executed as to NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Director, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Mark Rissala, Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Susan Holdsworth by Bhavnesh K., Savita K. Answer due by 6/5/2009. (cmp) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal Document 3 Amended Complaint, at Level I and Amend Case Caption filed by NH Department of Health and Human Services, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Director, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Mark Rissala, Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Susan Holdsworth. Follow up on Objection on 4/13/2009. (Schlitzer, Karen) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Karen A. Schlitzer on behalf of NH Department of Health and Human Services, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Director, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Mark Rissala, Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Susan Holdsworth Special Appearance for Limited Purpose of Filing Motion to Seal Complaint & Amend Case Caption (Schlitzer, Karen) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Waiver(s) Issued Electronically as to NH Department of Health and Human Services, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Director, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Division for Children, Youth and Families, Mark Rissala, Jeszadiah Eisenberg, Susan Holdsworth. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the waiver(s) and all attachments in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: # 1 Assignment to Magistrate, # 2 Notice ECF)(amm) (Entered: 03/25/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead sent to plaintiff(s) with service copies for all parties. (amm) (Entered: 03/19/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 92 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
CLERK'S ORDER: Plaintiff S.K is directed to notify the Court by July 17th of the name of a new attorney or Pro se appearance should be filed or the case will be referred to a judicial officer for further action, which may include dismissal of case. (cmp)
LREF
Blank 91 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 80 Motion for Tierney to Withdraw as Attorney; granting in part and denying in part 87 Motion for Reconsideration re 86 Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond; denying [ 90] Motion for a Trial from the Beginning of the Case in a Court Outside of New Hampshire and Vermont (& objection to Nancy Tierney's Withdrawal). Plaintiffs' response to defendants' summary judgment motion due July 17, 2012. Defendants reply, if any, due July 31, 2012. No surreply shall be permitted. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
LREF
Blank 86 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 85 Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond to 8/1/2012 (to obj to Motion for Summ Judgment). Objection due on or before July 10, 2012. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Follow up on Objection on 7/10/2012.(jb)
LREF
Blank 81 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 76 Motion for FBI Investigation; denying 77 Motion to Extend Discovery date and give an order to provide all papers from lower court and further motion to Order FBI investigation. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
LREF
Blank 70 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
///ORDER granting 63 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. HHS, DCYF, the Claremont District Office, and KK are TERMINATED as parties in this matter. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
LREF
Blank 55 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
///ORDER granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion to Dismiss (Reinstated). Granted as to counts 4-6 of the amended complaint, but denied as to counts 1-3. No preliminary pretrial conference. Parties to confer and submit a joint discovery plan by October 14, 2011. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 152 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?