QLM ASSOCIATES, INC. v. MARSH & MCLENNAN COMPANIES, INC. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:04-cv-05184
Magistrate Judge Claire C. Cecchi, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 6, 2018 at 12:33 PM DT (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ABERFELDY LP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ABERFELDY LP
No Logo ACCENT ON EYES CORP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ACCENT ON EYES CORP

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/14/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/14/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com
No Logo Air Liquide America LP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert L. Royer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT M. PARKER +1 903 533 9288
No Logo Air Liquide Large Industries US LP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert L. Royer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT M. PARKER +1 903 533 9288
No Logo Air Liquide USA LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert L. Royer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT M. PARKER +1 903 533 9288
No Logo AL AMERICA HOLDINGS, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert L. Royer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT M. PARKER +1 903 533 9288
No Logo AMERICAN AIR LIQUIDE HOLDINGS, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert L. Royer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT M. PARKER +1 903 533 9288
No Logo American Air Liquide, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert L. Royer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT M. PARKER +1 903 533 9288
No Logo American Plumbing & Mechanical, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert L. Royer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT M. PARKER +1 903 533 9288
No Logo American Standard Companies, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID T. EMANUELSON +1 312 846 5662

Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

No Logo American Standard, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID T. EMANUELSON +1 312 846 5662

Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

No Logo Avery Dennison Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Gerard McCarney +1 212 896 6500 +1 212 896 6501 mccarneyj@howrey.com
No Logo BAYOU STEEL CORP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levin, Fishbein, Sedran & Berman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Austin Blair Cohen +1 215 592 1500 +1 215 592 4663 acohen@lfsblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com
No Logo BELMONT HOLDINGS CORP., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kohn Swift & Graf PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/22/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHRISTINA DONATO SALER +1 215 238 1700 cdsaler@kohnswift.com
No Logo BIG BEAR PROPERTIES, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space BIG BEAR PROPERTIES, INC.
No Logo CAMERON OFFSHORE BOATS INC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Stockwell, Sievert, Viccellio, Clements & Shaddock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED H Alan McCall +1 337 436 9491 +1 337 493 7210 hamccall@ssvcs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com
Caterpillar, Inc. Caterpillar, Inc., Plaintiff
Unknown Role, Asv Inc /mn/

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT G. ABRAMS +1 202 383 6610 +1 202 383 6610 abramsr@howrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GREGORY L. BAKER +1 202 383 6610 bakerg@howrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Martin Reidy +1 202 383 7485 reidya@howrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WESTERVELT JOHNSON NICOLL & KELLER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DANIEL L. JOHNS +1 309 671 3588 +1 309 671 3588 djohns@westerveltlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MICHELE A. MILLER +1 309 671 3550 +1 309 671 3588 mamiller@westerveltlaw.com
No Logo Cellect, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com
No Logo City of Stamford, Connecticut, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "CITY OF STAMFORD"

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com
No Logo Clear Lam Packaging, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Currie Chavez +1 630 232 4480 +1 630 845 8982 gkeg4@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com
No Logo Comcar Industries, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com
No Logo CONNECTICUT SPRING & STAMP CO., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert L. Royer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT M. PARKER +1 903 533 9288
No Logo Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/28/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MICHAEL F. BUCHANAN +1 973 645 2778 michael.buchanan@usdoj.gov
No Logo DAVID BOROS, Plaintiff

Represented by Saveri & Saveri, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com
No Logo Delta Pride Catfish, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Well Marble and Hurst PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roy Hamilton Liddell +1 601 605 6900 +1 601 605 6901 rliddell@wellsmar.com
No Logo DELTA RESEARCH INSTITUTE INC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID HUGHES HARRIS +1 239 898 9050 +1 239 221 8274 dhhesq@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com

Represented by VERDE, STEINBERG & PONTELL

No Logo DIANE PRUESS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Console Law Offices LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CAROL A. MAGER +1 215 545 7676 +1 215 827 5101 mager@consolelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARY JANE EDELSTEIN FAIT +1 312 466 9200

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com
No Logo DR ROBERT H KIMBALL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L. Reed +1 713 986 7000

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com
No Logo Emerson Electric Company, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "EMERSON ELECTRIC CO."

Represented by Cabaniss Law

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WHITE COLEMAN AND ASSOCIATES, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dorothy L. White-Coleman +1 314 621 7676 +1 314 621 0959 whitecoleman@whitecoleman.net
No Logo Epix Holdings Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PALMISANO & GOODMAN, ESQS.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT GERARD GOODMAN rgg@palmisanogoodman.com
No Logo ESTELLE LANGENDORF, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com
No Logo Fortune Brands, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Baker & Daniels LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID T. EMANUELSON +1 312 846 5662
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED THOMAS LOUIS RUFFNER +1 312 846 5625

Represented by Howrey LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com
No Logo GATEWAY CLUB APARTMENTS, LTD., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com
No Logo GLENN SINGER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com
No Logo GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT, Plaintiff

Represented by The Furth Firm LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com
No Logo HAROLD FOLSOM JENSEN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Tauber Spievack & Wagner, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea J. Lawrence +1 212 586 5800 +1 212 586 5095 alawrence@ctswlaw.com
No Logo HAVENSURE, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Parry Deering Futscher & Sparks, P.S.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ron R. Parry +1 859 291 9000 +1 859 291 9300 rparry@pdfslaw.com
No Logo Henley Management Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space HENLEY MANAGEMENT COMPANY
No Logo HERITAGE CORPORATION OF SOUTH FLORIDA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bailey & Dawes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Guy Burdette Bailey, Jr. +1 305 374 5505 +3746 374 374 6715 gbailey@baileydawes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED OWEI BELLEH +1 305 374 5505 +6750 675 675 0390
No Logo HUNTSMAN ADVANCE MATERIALS LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert L. Royer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT M. PARKER +1 903 533 9288
No Logo Huntsman Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert L. Royer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT M. PARKER +1 903 533 9288
No Logo HUNTSMAN HOLDINGS, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert L. Royer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT M. PARKER +1 903 533 9288
No Logo Mr. Robert Holthus, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "HUNTSMAN LLC"

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert L. Royer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT M. PARKER +1 903 533 9288
No Logo INTERNATIONAL RISK INSURANCE COMPANY, Plaintiff

Represented by Bracewell LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert L. Royer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT M. PARKER +1 903 533 9288
No Logo JACK THORNELL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Sheppard +1 512 478 9483 +1 512 478 8643 dsheppard@sbcglobal.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Childress Duffy Goldblatt, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew D. Arons +1 312 494 0200 aarons@childresslawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RYAN A. HAAS +1 312 494 0200
No Logo JOHN BAIRD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert L. Royer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT M. PARKER +1 903 533 9288
No Logo JUDY THORNELL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Sheppard +1 512 478 9483 +1 512 478 8643 dsheppard@sbcglobal.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Childress Duffy Goldblatt, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew D. Arons +1 312 494 0200 aarons@childresslawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RYAN A. HAAS +1 312 494 0200
No Logo KITCHENS, INC., Plaintiff
No Logo Kllm, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Well Marble and Hurst PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roy Hamilton Liddell +1 601 605 6900 +1 601 605 6901 rliddell@wellsmar.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WELLS MARBLE & HURST

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED THOMAS M. LOUIS +1 601 355 8321 +1 504 585 7386 tlouis@wellsmar.com
No Logo Kmart Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space KMART CORPORATION
No Logo Lands' End, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lands' End, Inc.
No Logo Lincoln Adventures Llc, Plaintiff
No Logo MARYANN WAXMAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com
No Logo MICHIGAN MULTI-KING CORP., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1900

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Robert Merrick +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 tmerrick@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com
No Logo Michigan Multi-King Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Schopf & Weiss LLP

No Logo NORTHBROOK PROPERTIES, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space NORTHBROOK PROPERTIES, INC.
No Logo OPTICARE HEALTH SYSTEMS INC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/25/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Othni J Lathram +1 205 533 1957 +1 888 367 8307 olathram@gmail.com
TERMINATED: 03/25/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Donald McNamara +1 614 464 2770 +1 614 464 0043 psilbach@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/15/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore Joseph Pintar +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 TedP@csgrr.com

Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1900

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Robert Merrick +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 tmerrick@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com
No Logo PALM TREE COMPUTERS SYSTEMS INC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID HUGHES HARRIS +1 239 898 9050 +1 239 221 8274 dhhesq@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com

Represented by VERDE, STEINBERG & PONTELL

No Logo PALOMAR GRADING AND PAVING, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Tauber Spievack & Wagner, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea J. Lawrence +1 212 586 5800 +1 212 586 5095 alawrence@ctswlaw.com
No Logo PAYROLL AND INSURANCE GROUP, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peterson and ERB, Inc.
No Logo Plaint Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert L. Royer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT M. PARKER +1 903 533 9288
No Logo PRIORITY ULTRASOUND SERVICES INC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARTIN W ZUMMACH +1 662 349 6900

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com
No Logo Public Service Enterprise Group, Plaintiff

Represented by Schopf & Weiss LLP

No Logo QLM ASSOCIATES, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cafferty Faucher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Lee Clobes +1 215 864 2800 +1 215 864 2810 bclobes@millerfaucher.com

Represented by Doffermyre, Shields, Canfield & Knowles, LLC

Represented by Lite DePalma Greenberg & Rivas, LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

No Logo RCK PROPERTIES, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RCK PROPERTIES, INC.
No Logo REDWOOD OIL CO, Plaintiff

Represented by The Furth Firm LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com
No Logo REDWOOD OIL COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James S. Shedden +1 847 540 6757 jsheddenlaw@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Schad, Diamond & Shedden, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael S Hilicki +1 312 939 6280
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tony Kim +1 312 939 6280 tkim@lawsds.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence W. Schad +1 312 939 6280 +1 312 939 4661 lschad@lawsds.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com
No Logo Applied Materials, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "ROBERT MULCAHY"

Toggle Switch Represented by Cafferty Faucher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ellen Meriwether +1 215 864 2800 +1 215 864 2810 emeriwether@millerfaucher.com

Represented by Lite DePalma Greenberg & Rivas, LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com
No Logo SCI INTERNATIONAL, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/07/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PAUL J. HALASZ +1 973 966 6300 phalasz@daypitney.com
Sears Holdings Corporation Sears Holdings Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JEFFREY D. HORST +1 404 888 9577

Toggle Switch Represented by Krevolin & Horst, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Anthony Sirna +1 404 888 9700 sirna@khlawfirm.com

Represented by Schopf & Weiss LLP

Sears, Roebuck & Company Sears, Roebuck & Company, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "SEARS ROEBUCK & CO."

Represented by Schopf & Weiss LLP

No Logo SHELDON LANGENDORF, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com
No Logo Shell Vacations LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WILLIAM HENRY LONDON +1 312 524 2000 +1 224 632 4521

Toggle Switch Represented by Freed Kanner London & Millen LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Millen +1 224 632 4500 +1 224 632 4519 doug@fklmlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Much Shelist, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven A. Kanner +1 312 346 3100 +1 312 521 2100 skanner@muchshelist.com

Represented by The Furth Firm LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com
No Logo Signum LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Lewis Babcock and Griffin

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SUZANNE ILENE SCHILLER +1 856 778 8100 +1 215 241 8844
No Logo SINCLAIR OIL CORP, Plaintiff

Represented by Holme Roberts & Owen LLP

No Logo SLAY INDUSTRIES, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com
No Logo SLAY TRANSPORTATION CO INC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com
No Logo STEPHEN LEWIS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard L. Stone +1 212 317 2300 rstoneesq@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaufman, Malchman, Kaufmann & Kirby

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter S Linden +1 212 371 6600

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com
No Logo SUNBURST HOSPITALITY CORPORATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cafferty Faucher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Lee Clobes +1 215 864 2800 +1 215 864 2810 bclobes@millerfaucher.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ellen Meriwether +1 215 864 2800 +1 215 864 2810 emeriwether@millerfaucher.com

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/26/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TIMOTHY FRASER +1 215 864 2800 +1 215 864 2810

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com
No Logo SUPREME AUTO TRANSPORT, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SUPREME AUTO TRANSPORT, LLC
No Logo THE ENCLAVE, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com
No Logo THE OMNI GROUP OF COMPANIES, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com
No Logo THEODORE S. FORMAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com
No Logo TRI-STATE CONTAINER CORP., Plaintiff

Represented by Shepherd, Finkelman, Miller & Shah, LLC

Tyson Foods, Inc. Tyson Foods, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Schopf & Weiss LLP

v.
No Logo ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO."

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARC D. HAEFNER +1 973 535 0500 mhaefner@connellfoley.com
No Logo Ace Ina, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Ragan Seely +1 713 222 3800 +1 713 222 3850

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JEREMY J BRANDON +1 214 754 1933 jbrandon@SusmanGodrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED H. LEE GODFREY +1 713 651 9366 +1 713 654 6666
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED FREDERIC STANLEY, JR +1 407 682 3536
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED L. JANE RAY +1 713 651 9366
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GRETHCHEN S. SWEEN +1 214 754 1933

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARC D. HAEFNER +1 973 535 0500 mhaefner@connellfoley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Johnny William Carter +1 713 651 9366 jcarter@susmangodfrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neal S Manne +1 713 651 9366 +1 713 654 3380 nmanne@susmangodfrey.com
No Logo ACE INA HOLDINGS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JEREMY J BRANDON +1 214 754 1933 jbrandon@SusmanGodrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARC D. HAEFNER +1 973 535 0500 mhaefner@connellfoley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LIZA M. WALSH +1 973 535 0500 lwalsh@connellfoley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED M. Duncan Grant +1 215 981 4000 +1 215 981 4750 grantm@pepperlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Johnny William Carter +1 713 651 9366 jcarter@susmangodfrey.com
No Logo Ace Ina Holdings Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Ragan Seely +1 713 222 3800 +1 713 222 3850

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT J KRISS +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 701 7711
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan N Salpeter +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 701 7711 asalpeter@mayerbrownrowe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED H. LEE GODFREY +1 713 651 9366 +1 713 654 6666

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARC D. HAEFNER +1 973 535 0500 mhaefner@connellfoley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED M. Duncan Grant +1 215 981 4000 +1 215 981 4750 grantm@pepperlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vineet Bhatia +1 713 653 7855 +1 713 654 3344 vbhatia@susmangodfrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Johnny William Carter +1 713 651 9366 jcarter@susmangodfrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael P. Geiser - PHV +1 713 651 9366 +1 713 654 6666 mgeiser@susmangodfrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neal S Manne +1 713 651 9366 +1 713 654 3380 nmanne@susmangodfrey.com
No Logo Ace Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Ragan Seely +1 713 222 3800 +1 713 222 3850

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT J KRISS +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 701 7711
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan N Salpeter +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 701 7711 asalpeter@mayerbrownrowe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JEREMY J BRANDON +1 214 754 1933 jbrandon@SusmanGodrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED H. LEE GODFREY +1 713 651 9366 +1 713 654 6666

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARC D. HAEFNER +1 973 535 0500 mhaefner@connellfoley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LIZA M. WALSH +1 973 535 0500 lwalsh@connellfoley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARC D. HAEFNER +1 973 535 0500 mhaefner@connellfoley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vineet Bhatia +1 713 653 7855 +1 713 654 3344 vbhatia@susmangodfrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Johnny William Carter +1 713 651 9366 jcarter@susmangodfrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael P. Geiser - PHV +1 713 651 9366 +1 713 654 6666 mgeiser@susmangodfrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neal S Manne +1 713 651 9366 +1 713 654 3380 nmanne@susmangodfrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED M. Duncan Grant +1 215 981 4000 +1 215 981 4750 grantm@pepperlaw.com
No Logo Ace Usa, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Ragan Seely +1 713 222 3800 +1 713 222 3850

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT J KRISS +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 701 7711
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan N Salpeter +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 701 7711 asalpeter@mayerbrownrowe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JEREMY J BRANDON +1 214 754 1933 jbrandon@SusmanGodrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED H. LEE GODFREY +1 713 651 9366 +1 713 654 6666
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED FREDERIC STANLEY, JR +1 407 682 3536
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED L. JANE RAY +1 713 651 9366
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GRETHCHEN S. SWEEN +1 214 754 1933

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARC D. HAEFNER +1 973 535 0500 mhaefner@connellfoley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LIZA M. WALSH +1 973 535 0500 lwalsh@connellfoley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED M. Duncan Grant +1 215 981 4000 +1 215 981 4750 grantm@pepperlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vineet Bhatia +1 713 653 7855 +1 713 654 3344 vbhatia@susmangodfrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Johnny William Carter +1 713 651 9366 jcarter@susmangodfrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael P. Geiser - PHV +1 713 651 9366 +1 713 654 6666 mgeiser@susmangodfrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neal S Manne +1 713 651 9366 +1 713 654 3380 nmanne@susmangodfrey.com
No Logo Acordia, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ANDREW O. BUNN +1 973 622 4444 abunn@mccarter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RICHARD C. PEPPERMAN, II +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 peppermanr@sullcrom.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/20/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CARLOS FRANCISCO ORTIZ +1 856 757 5026
Aetna, Inc. Aetna, Inc., Defendant
No Logo AFFILIATED FM INSURANCE COMPAMY, Defendant

Represented by Gibbons PC

No Logo Affinity Insurance Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JILL M. STEINBERG +1 901 526 2000

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Cartier Godfrey +1 312 862 2000 +1 312 862 2200 richard.godfrey@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RICHARD C. PEPPERMAN, II +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 peppermanr@sullcrom.com
No Logo AIG LIFE INSURANCE Company, Defendant

Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

No Logo Aiu Insurance Co., Defendant
No Logo Allied World Assurance Company Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Martin Chioffi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Scott Gregory +1 203 973 5200 mgregory@martinllp.net
No Logo AMERICAN ALTERNATIVE INSURANCE CO. CORP., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaye Scholer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eamon O'Kelly +1 212 259 8000 +1 212 259 6333 eokelly@dl.com
No Logo American Alternative Insurance Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of JEFFREY S. RUGG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/07/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JEFFREY S. RUGG +1 702 382 2101
No Logo American Bankers Insurance Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/09/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CARL D. POPLAR +1 856 227 5575
No Logo AMERICAN CASUALTY CO. OF READING, Defendant

Represented by Carella, Byrne, Cecchi, Olstein, Brody & Agnello, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Wildman Harrold Allen & Dixon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Blankshain +1 312 201 2000 blankshain@wildmanharrold.com
No Logo AMERICAN GUARANTEE & LIABILITY INSURANCE CO., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dewey & LeBoeuf LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth B. Sandza +1 202 346 8036 +1 202 956 3245 ebsandza@DL.com

Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

No Logo American Home Assurance Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "AMERICAN HOME ASSURANCE CO."
American International Group, Inc. American International Group, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Ipcs, Inc.
Unknown Role, Perini Corp
Unknown Role, Ipc Holdings Ltd
Unknown Role, Selmer Industries Inc
Unknown Role, Blackstone Group Lp
Unknown Role, AIG BG Holdings LLC
Unknown Role, Tidewater Inc.
Unknown Role, On Minerals Co Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlton Fields, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jeffrey Brodie +1 305 530 0050 +1 305 530 0055 sbrodie@carltonfields.com

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHRIS S. COUTROULIS +1 813 229 4133
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JAMES E. FOSTER +1 407 386 6207
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED VIRGINIA B. TOWNES +1 407 419 8513
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LAYALIZA KLEIN SOLOVEICHIK +1 212 373 3271

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Bayard Isaacson +1 312 368 4000 +1 312 251 5827 samuel.isaacson@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CARL H POCDTKE +1 312 368 7294
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen W. Schwab +1 312 368 4000 stephen.schwab@dlapiper.com

Represented by Hangley, Aronchick, Segal & Pudlin, Esqs.

Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

No Logo American International Insurance Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL INSURANCE CO."
No Logo AMERICAN PROTECTION INSURANCE CO., Defendant
No Logo AMERICAN RE CORP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaye Scholer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eamon O'Kelly +1 212 259 8000 +1 212 259 6333 eokelly@dl.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of JEFFREY S. RUGG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/07/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JEFFREY S. RUGG +1 702 382 2101
No Logo American Re Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Grais & Ellsworth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MOLLY LEHR PEASE +1 212 755 0100 mpease@graisellsworth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaye Scholer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eamon O'Kelly +1 212 259 8000 +1 212 259 6333 eokelly@dl.com
No Logo AMERICAN RE INSURANCE CO, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaye Scholer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eamon O'Kelly +1 212 259 8000 +1 212 259 6333 eokelly@dl.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of JEFFREY S. RUGG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/07/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JEFFREY S. RUGG +1 702 382 2101
No Logo American Re-insurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Grais & Ellsworth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MOLLY LEHR PEASE +1 212 755 0100 mpease@graisellsworth.com
No Logo AON BROKERS SERVICES INC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN ARMANDO BOUDET +1 407 841 1295

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Rhae Ostapuk +1 415 439 1406 +1 415 439 1500 bostapuk@kirkland.com

Represented by ROBINSON, WETTRE & MILLER LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RICHARD C. PEPPERMAN, II +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 peppermanr@sullcrom.com
No Logo Aon Corp, Defendant

Represented by ROBINSON, WETTRE & MILLER LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RICHARD C. PEPPERMAN, II +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 peppermanr@sullcrom.com
No Logo Aon Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN ARMANDO BOUDET +1 407 841 1295
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMY D HARMON +1 803 771 8900
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JILL M. STEINBERG +1 901 526 2000

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Cartier Godfrey +1 312 862 2000 +1 312 862 2200 richard.godfrey@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth A. Larsen +1 312 862 2000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Rhae Ostapuk +1 415 439 1406 +1 415 439 1500 bostapuk@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RENEE WICKLUND +1 312 861 2198

Toggle Switch Represented by Nexsen Pruet PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Thomas Burke +1 803 771 8900 +1 803 727 1417 rburke@nexsenpruet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marguerite S. Willis +1 803 771 8900 +1 803 253 8277 mwillis@nexsenpruet.com

Represented by ROBINSON, WETTRE & MILLER LLC

No Logo Aon Direct Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JILL M. STEINBERG +1 901 526 2000

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Cartier Godfrey +1 312 862 2000 +1 312 862 2200 richard.godfrey@kirkland.com

Represented by ROBINSON, WETTRE & MILLER LLC

No Logo Aon Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN ARMANDO BOUDET +1 407 841 1295
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JILL M. STEINBERG +1 901 526 2000

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Cartier Godfrey +1 312 862 2000 +1 312 862 2200 richard.godfrey@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Rhae Ostapuk +1 415 439 1406 +1 415 439 1500 bostapuk@kirkland.com

Represented by ROBINSON, WETTRE & MILLER LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RICHARD C. PEPPERMAN, II +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 peppermanr@sullcrom.com
No Logo AON GROUP INT, Defendant

Represented by ROBINSON, WETTRE & MILLER LLC

No Logo AON RE WORLDWIDE, INC., Defendant

Represented by ROBINSON, WETTRE & MILLER LLC

No Logo Aon Re Inc., Defendant

Represented by ROBINSON, WETTRE & MILLER LLC

No Logo Aon Risk Services Companies, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN ARMANDO BOUDET +1 407 841 1295

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Rhae Ostapuk +1 415 439 1406 +1 415 439 1500 bostapuk@kirkland.com

Represented by ROBINSON, WETTRE & MILLER LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RICHARD C. PEPPERMAN, II +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 peppermanr@sullcrom.com
No Logo Aon Risk Services Inc. U.s., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN ARMANDO BOUDET +1 407 841 1295

Represented by ROBINSON, WETTRE & MILLER LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RICHARD C. PEPPERMAN, II +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 peppermanr@sullcrom.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Rhae Ostapuk +1 415 439 1406 +1 415 439 1500 bostapuk@kirkland.com
No Logo AON RISK SERVICES OF TEXAS, INC., Defendant

Represented by ROBINSON, WETTRE & MILLER LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RICHARD C. PEPPERMAN, II +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 peppermanr@sullcrom.com
No Logo AON RISK SERVICES OF THE CAROLINAS INC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMY D HARMON +1 803 771 8900

Toggle Switch Represented by Nexsen Pruet PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Thomas Burke +1 803 771 8900 +1 803 727 1417 rburke@nexsenpruet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marguerite S. Willis +1 803 771 8900 +1 803 253 8277 mwillis@nexsenpruet.com

Represented by ROBINSON, WETTRE & MILLER LLC

No Logo AON RISK SERVICES, INC. OF LOUISIANA, Defendant

Represented by ROBINSON, WETTRE & MILLER LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RICHARD C. PEPPERMAN, II +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 peppermanr@sullcrom.com
No Logo Aon Risk Services, Inc. Of Maryland, Defendant

Represented by ROBINSON, WETTRE & MILLER LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RICHARD C. PEPPERMAN, II +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 peppermanr@sullcrom.com
No Logo AON RISK SERVICES, INC. OF MICHIGAN, Defendant

Represented by ROBINSON, WETTRE & MILLER LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RICHARD C. PEPPERMAN, II +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 peppermanr@sullcrom.com
No Logo AON SERVICES GROUP, Defendant

Represented by ROBINSON, WETTRE & MILLER LLC

No Logo Aon Services Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN ARMANDO BOUDET +1 407 841 1295

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Rhae Ostapuk +1 415 439 1406 +1 415 439 1500 bostapuk@kirkland.com

Represented by ROBINSON, WETTRE & MILLER LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RICHARD C. PEPPERMAN, II +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 peppermanr@sullcrom.com
No Logo Arch Capital Group Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT J. BRENER +1 973 520 2300 +1 973 520 2600 rbrener@eapdlaw.com
No Logo Arch Insurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT J. BRENER +1 973 520 2300 +1 973 520 2600 rbrener@eapdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT J. BRENER +1 973 520 2300 +1 973 520 2600 rbrener@eapdlaw.com
No Logo Arch Reinsurance Ltd, Defendant
Officially listed as "ARCH REINSURANCE LIMITED"

Toggle Switch Represented by Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT J. BRENER +1 973 520 2300 +1 973 520 2600 rbrener@eapdlaw.com
No Logo ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT J. BRENER +1 973 520 2300 +1 973 520 2600 rbrener@eapdlaw.com
No Logo ARTHUR J GALLAGHER & CO, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/01/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine E Borden +1 312 558 5600 +1 312 558 5700 kborden@winston.com
TERMINATED: 09/04/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry M. Grimm +1 312 558 5600 +1 312 558 5700 tgrimm@winston.com
TERMINATED: 10/10/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DANIELLE A. R. COFFMAN +1 312 558 5600

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/02/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ANDREW KENNETH LEVINE +1 850 681 6810
TERMINATED: 10/02/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STEPHEN CHARLES SCHULTE +1 312 558 5600

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edwin Michael Larkin, III +1 212 307 5500 +1 212 307 5598 emlarkin@venable.com

Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

No Logo ARTHUR J. GALLAGHER RISK MANAGEMENT SERVICE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edwin Michael Larkin, III +1 212 307 5500 +1 212 307 5598 emlarkin@venable.com

Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

No Logo ASSURANCE CO. OF AMERICA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dewey & LeBoeuf LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth B. Sandza +1 202 346 8036 +1 202 956 3245 ebsandza@DL.com
No Logo ATHENA ASSURANCE CO., Defendant
No Logo Athena Assurance Company, Defendant
No Logo AXA ART INSURANCE CORP., Defendant

Represented by Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

No Logo AXIS CAPITAL HOLDINGS LIMITED, Defendant

Represented by Dechert LLP

Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

No Logo AXIS REINSURANCE CO., Defendant

Represented by Dechert LLP

Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

No Logo Axis Specialty Insurance Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "AXIS SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO."

Represented by Dechert LLP

Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

No Logo AXIS Surplus Insurance Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE CO."

Represented by Dechert LLP

Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

BB&T Corporation BB&T Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JAMES PAUL WEHNER, JR. +1 202 626 6600
TERMINATED: 05/31/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED HOWARD J.C. NICOLS +1 212 872 9800
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JAMES PAUL WEHNER, JR. +1 202 626 6600

Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

No Logo BENEFITS COMMERCE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/03/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STEPHEN J SIEGAL +1 312 419 6900

Toggle Switch Represented by McBreen & Kopko

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/05/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID A. GABIANELLI +1 415 403 8830 DGABIANELLI@HRBLAW.COM

Toggle Switch Represented by Novack & Macey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Neal Macey +1 312 419 6900 +1 312 419 6928 emacey@novackandmacey.com

Represented by Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/03/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RICHARD LANE MILLER, II +UND ELI VERABLE
No Logo Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Budd Larner, PC

Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

No Logo BIRMINGHAM FIRE INSURANCE CO. OF PA, Defendant
No Logo Brown and Brown, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED VICTORIA ASHWORTH +1 212 318 6057

Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

No Logo C. V. Starr & Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "C. V. STARR & CO."

Toggle Switch Represented by Starnes & Atchison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/02/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED P. Andrew Laird, Jr. +1 205 868 6000 +1 205 868 6099 plaird@starneslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stone & Magnanini

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/06/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT A. MAGNANINI +1 973 218 1111 rmagnanini@stonemagnalaw.com
No Logo Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Organized as Syndicate of 2001 (AML), Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT J. BURNS +1 908 685 9700
No Logo CHICAGO INSURANCE CO., Defendant

Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Chubb Corporation Chubb Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "CHUBB CORPORATION, THE"

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DUSTIN E DEESE +1 813 223 7474

Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Trennan, Kemker, etal.,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marvin E. Barkin +1 813 223 7474 +1 813 229 6553 mebarkin@trenam.com
CNA Financial Corporation CNA Financial Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "CNA FINANCIAL CORP."

Represented by Carella, Byrne, Cecchi, Olstein, Brody & Agnello, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Wildman Harrold Allen & Dixon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Blankshain +1 312 201 2000 blankshain@wildmanharrold.com
No Logo COMMERCE AND INDUSTRY INSURANCE CO., Defendant
No Logo COMMONWEALTH INSURANCE CO., Defendant

Represented by Mound Cotton Wollan & Greengrass

No Logo Continental Casualty Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "CONTINENTAL CASUALTY CO."

Represented by Carella, Byrne, Cecchi, Olstein, Brody & Agnello, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Wildman Harrold Allen & Dixon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Blankshain +1 312 201 2000 blankshain@wildmanharrold.com
No Logo CRUM & FORSTER HOLDINGS CORP, Defendant

Represented by Landman Corsi Ballanine & Ford PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Saiber Schlesinger Satz & Goldstein, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/08/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN HERBERT NOORLANDER +1 973 645 4822 +1 973 622 3349 jnoorlander@windelsmarx.com
No Logo Discover Re Managers, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MIRIAM THERESA DOWD +1 212 705 7000
No Logo DISCOVER REINSURANCE COMPANY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Copeland, Cook, Taylor Bush, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael W. Baxter +1 601 856 7200 +1 601 353 6235 mbaxter@cctb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BARRY HASSELL +1 601 856 7200 bhassell@cctb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHARLES GREG COPELAND +1 601 856 7200
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MIRIAM THERESA DOWD +1 212 705 7000
No Logo DISCOVERY MANAGERS LTD, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Copeland, Cook, Taylor Bush, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael W. Baxter +1 601 856 7200 +1 601 353 6235 mbaxter@cctb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BARRY HASSELL +1 601 856 7200 bhassell@cctb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHARLES GREG COPELAND +1 601 856 7200
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MIRIAM THERESA DOWD +1 212 705 7000
No Logo DOUGLAS P. COX, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/03/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STEPHEN J SIEGAL +1 312 419 6900

Toggle Switch Represented by McBreen & Kopko

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/05/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID A. GABIANELLI +1 415 403 8830 DGABIANELLI@HRBLAW.COM

Toggle Switch Represented by Novack & Macey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Neal Macey +1 312 419 6900 +1 312 419 6928 emacey@novackandmacey.com

Represented by Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/03/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RICHARD LANE MILLER, II +UND ELI VERABLE
No Logo EMPIRE FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE CO., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dewey & LeBoeuf LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth B. Sandza +1 202 346 8036 +1 202 956 3245 ebsandza@DL.com
No Logo EMPIRE INDEMNITY INSURANCE CO., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dewey & LeBoeuf LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth B. Sandza +1 202 346 8036 +1 202 956 3245 ebsandza@DL.com
No Logo Employers Reinsurance Corporation, Defendant
No Logo ENDURANCE SPECIALTY INSURANCE LIMITED, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Raymond J. Schroth +1 212 752 8000 +1 646 563 2027 kschroth@coleschotz.com
No Logo Executive Risk Indemnity, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

No Logo Factory Mutual Insurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT WAYNE FISHER +1 404 760 3802 rwfisher@rkmc.com
No Logo Federal Insurance Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "FEDERAL INSURANCE CO."

Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

No Logo Fidelity And Deposit Company Of Maryland, Defendant
Officially listed as "FIDELITY & DEPOSIT CO. OF MARYLAND"

Toggle Switch Represented by Dewey & LeBoeuf LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth B. Sandza +1 202 346 8036 +1 202 956 3245 ebsandza@DL.com
No Logo Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE CO."

Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

No Logo FIRST MARKET INTERNATIONAL INC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by King, Blackwell, Downs & Zehnder, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/20/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MAYANNE DOWNS +1 407 422 2472 +1 407 648 0161 mdowns@kbdzlaw.com
TERMINATED: 09/20/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KIMBERLY DUNKEL HEALY +1 407 422 2472 khealy@kbdzlaw.com
No Logo General Re Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Budd Larner, PC

No Logo General Reinsurance Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "GENERAL REINSURANCE CORP."

Represented by Budd Larner, PC

No Logo GREAT AMERICAN ASSURANCE CO., Defendant
No Logo GREENWICH INSURANCE CO., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cahill Gordon & Reindell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMY E. BARABAS +1 212 701 3374
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JUSTIN M. GIOVANNELLI +1 212 701 3000 jgiovannelli@cahill.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CAROLINE SPINDLER WHITTEMORE +1 212 701 3171 cwhittemore@cahill.com

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/22/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARY CAIT CURRAN +1 212 701 3642
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ALAN PATRICK SMITH +1 212 701 3372

Represented by FARRELL & THURMAN, PC

No Logo Gulf Insurance Company, Defendant
No Logo Guy Carpenter & Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/24/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARY SUSAN HENIFIN +1 609 987 6800 mary.henifin@bipc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JAMES E. FOSTER +1 407 386 6207
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WILLIAM M HANNAY +1 312 258 5500 +2585 258 258 5700
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED VIRGINIA B. TOWNES +1 407 419 8513

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiff Hardin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marci A. Eisenstein +1 312 258 5500 +3380 338 338 0070 meisenstein@schiffhardin.com

Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

No Logo Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/24/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARY SUSAN HENIFIN +1 609 987 6800 mary.henifin@bipc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JAMES E. FOSTER +1 407 386 6207
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED VIRGINIA B. TOWNES +1 407 419 8513

Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

The Hartford The Hartford, Defendant
Officially listed as "HARTFORD INSURANCE CO OF THE SOUTHEAST"

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JAMES E. FOSTER +1 407 386 6207
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED VIRGINIA B. TOWNES +1 407 419 8513

Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

No Logo Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection & Insurance Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "HARTFORD STEAM BOILER INSPECTION AND INSURANCE CO."

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MITCHELL JAY AUSLANDER +1 212 728 8000 +1 212 728 8111 mauslander@willkie.com
No Logo HARTFORD UNDERWRITER INS. CO., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JAMES E. FOSTER +1 407 386 6207
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED VIRGINIA B. TOWNES +1 407 419 8513

Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

No Logo HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS SERVICE ORGANIZATION, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JILL M. STEINBERG +1 901 526 2000

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Cartier Godfrey +1 312 862 2000 +1 312 862 2200 richard.godfrey@kirkland.com
No Logo HILB ROGAL & HAMILTON CO, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JONATHAN MICHAEL WILAN +1 202 955 1500 jwilan@hunton.com
No Logo HILB, ROGAL & HOBBS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbons PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/27/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WILLIAM P. DENI, JR. +1 973 596 4500 wdeni@gibbonslaw.com
TERMINATED: 10/27/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Rey Griffinger +1 973 596 4701 +1 973 639 6294 mgriffinger@gibbonslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JONATHAN MICHAEL WILAN +1 202 955 1500 jwilan@hunton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RICHARD C. PEPPERMAN, II +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 peppermanr@sullcrom.com
No Logo Hub International Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ALAN SETH RABINOWITZ +1 212 848 4000
No Logo ILLINOIS UNION INSURANCE CO., Defendant
No Logo INDEMNITY INSURANCE CO. NORTH AMERICA, Defendant
No Logo INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE CO., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cahill Gordon & Reindell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMY E. BARABAS +1 212 701 3374
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JUSTIN M. GIOVANNELLI +1 212 701 3000 jgiovannelli@cahill.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CAROLINE SPINDLER WHITTEMORE +1 212 701 3171 cwhittemore@cahill.com

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/22/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARY CAIT CURRAN +1 212 701 3642
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ALAN PATRICK SMITH +1 212 701 3372

Represented by FARRELL & THURMAN, PC

No Logo INSURANCE CO OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Starnes & Atchison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/27/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED P. Andrew Laird, Jr. +1 205 868 6000 +1 205 868 6099 plaird@starneslaw.com
No Logo JOSEPH E LAMPEN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MITCHELL JAY AUSLANDER +1 212 728 8000 +1 212 728 8111 mauslander@willkie.com
No Logo Lexington Insurance Company, Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc. Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE CO."

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRIAN E. ROBISON +1 214 698 3370 +1 214 999 7770 BRobison@gibsondunn.com

Represented by Kornstein Veisz & Wexler, LLP

No Logo LLOYDS LONDON SYNDICATE 2791 MAP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT J. BRENER +1 973 520 2300 +1 973 520 2600 rbrener@eapdlaw.com
No Logo Lumbermens Mutual Casualty Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "LUMBERMENS MUTUAL CASUALTY CO."
No Logo MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED, Defendant

Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

No Logo MARK A SMITH, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MITCHELL JAY AUSLANDER +1 212 728 8000 +1 212 728 8111 mauslander@willkie.com
No Logo Marsh, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Parr Waddoups Brown Gee & Loveless, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren K. Nelson +1 801 532 7840 dnelson@parrbrown.com
No Logo Marsh & McLennan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Parr Waddoups Brown Gee & Loveless, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren K. Nelson +1 801 532 7840 dnelson@parrbrown.com
No Logo Marsh & Mclennan Companies, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Mmc Capital Inc
Unknown Role, Benefitfocus, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRIAN J OSIAS +1 973 622 4444 bosias@mccarter.com
No Logo Marsh & Mclennan, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew T. Berry +1 212 466 9018 aberry@mccarter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew T. Berry +1 212 466 9018 aberry@mccarter.com
No Logo MARSH ADVANTAGE AMERICA, Defendant
No Logo MARSH GLOBAL BROKING, INC. (MISSOURI), Defendant
No Logo MARSH GLOBAL BROKING, INC. (NEW JERSEY), Defendant
No Logo MARSH GLOBAL PLACEMENT, Defendant
No Logo Marsh Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRIAN J OSIAS +1 973 622 4444 bosias@mccarter.com
No Logo MARSH PLACEMENT INC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MITCHELL JAY AUSLANDER +1 212 728 8000 +1 212 728 8111 mauslander@willkie.com
No Logo MARSH RISK CONSULTING, Defendant
No Logo MARSH USA INC (NEVADA), Defendant
No Logo MARSH USA INC OF LOUISIANA, Defendant
No Logo Marsh USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew T. Berry +1 212 466 9018 aberry@mccarter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRIAN J OSIAS +1 973 622 4444 bosias@mccarter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MITCHELL JAY AUSLANDER +1 212 728 8000 +1 212 728 8111 mauslander@willkie.com
No Logo MARSH USA INC. (CONNECTICUT), Defendant
No Logo MARSHA USA INC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew T. Berry +1 212 466 9018 aberry@mccarter.com
No Logo MAX RE LTD., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovells LLP-Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KATHRYN K. WYCOFF +1 312 832 4400 kathryn.wycoff@lovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wildman Harrold Allen & Dixon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED THOMAS F. BUSH +1 312 201 2127 bush@wildman.com
No Logo Mercer Human Resource Consulting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo MERCER HUMAN RESOURCE CONSULTING OF TEXAS INC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MITCHELL JAY AUSLANDER +1 212 728 8000 +1 212 728 8111 mauslander@willkie.com
Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "METLIFE INC"

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PAUL JEFFREY RIEHLE +1 415 781 2635 paul.riehle@faegredrinker.com

Toggle Switch Represented by UNGER LAW GROUP, PL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHRISTOPHER CHARLES GILBERT +1 407 425 0595
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARTIN B. UNGER +1 407 425 0595
No Logo MT. HAWLEY INSURANCE CO., Defendant

Represented by King & Spalding LLP

No Logo MUNICH RE GROUP, Defendant
No Logo MUNICH-AMERICAN RISK PARTNERS INC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Grais & Ellsworth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MOLLY LEHR PEASE +1 212 755 0100 mpease@graisellsworth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaye Scholer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eamon O'Kelly +1 212 259 8000 +1 212 259 6333 eokelly@dl.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of JEFFREY S. RUGG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/07/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JEFFREY S. RUGG +1 702 382 2101
No Logo National Financial Partners Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DONNA L. MCDEVITT +1 312 407 0700 +1 312 407 0700
No Logo National Surety Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "NATIONAL SURETY CORP."

Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

No Logo NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE CO. OF LOUISIANA, Defendant
No Logo NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE CO. OF PITTSBURG, PA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MITCHELL JAY AUSLANDER +1 212 728 8000 +1 212 728 8111 mauslander@willkie.com
No Logo NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF PITTSBURG PA, Defendant
No Logo Navigators Group, Inc.,, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Raymond J. Schroth +1 212 752 8000 +1 646 563 2027 kschroth@coleschotz.com
No Logo Navigators Insurance Company, Defendant

Represented by MORGAN, MELHUISH & ABRUTYN, ESQS.

No Logo NAVIGATORS INSURANCE SERVICES OF TEXAS INC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ELTON F DUNCAN +1 504 524 9003
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED THOMAS A. FRENCH +1 504 524 5566
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JESSICA G ROUX +1 504 524 5566
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KELLEY SEVIN +1 504 524 5566

Represented by MORGAN, MELHUISH & ABRUTYN, ESQS.

No Logo New Hampshire Insurance Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "NEW HAMPSHIRE INSURANCE CO."
No Logo NUTMEG LIFE INSURANCE CO., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/24/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARY SUSAN HENIFIN +1 609 987 6800 mary.henifin@bipc.com
No Logo PACIFIC INSURANCE CO., LTD, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/24/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARY SUSAN HENIFIN +1 609 987 6800 mary.henifin@bipc.com
No Logo PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/24/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARY SUSAN HENIFIN +1 609 987 6800 mary.henifin@bipc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WILLIAM M HANNAY +1 312 258 5500 +2585 258 258 5700

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiff Hardin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marci A. Eisenstein +1 312 258 5500 +3380 338 338 0070 meisenstein@schiffhardin.com
No Logo Prudential Financial, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Tortoise Mlp Corp.

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowenstein Sandler, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DOUGLAS SCOTT EAKELEY +1 973 597 2500 deakeley@lowenstein.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Richard Middleton, Jr. +1 973 597 2582 +1 973 597 2583 jmiddleton@lowenstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by UNGER LAW GROUP, PL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHRISTOPHER CHARLES GILBERT +1 407 425 0595
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARTIN B. UNGER +1 407 425 0595
No Logo Prudential Insurance Company of America, Defendant

Represented by Ulmer & Berne, LLP

No Logo RLI CORP, Defendant

Represented by King & Spalding LLP

No Logo RLI Insurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MITCHELL JAY AUSLANDER +1 212 728 8000 +1 212 728 8111 mauslander@willkie.com
No Logo RLI INSURANCE CORP, Defendant

Represented by King & Spalding LLP

No Logo Royal & Sun Alliance, Defendant

Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

No Logo Seabury & Smith, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MITCHELL JAY AUSLANDER +1 212 728 8000 +1 212 728 8111 mauslander@willkie.com
No Logo ST PAUL TRAVELERS COS INC, Defendant
No Logo St. Paul Fire And Marine Insurance Company, Defendant
No Logo ST. PAUL MERCURY INSURANCE CO., Defendant
No Logo St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, Defendant
No Logo STEADFAST INSURANCE CO., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dewey & LeBoeuf LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth B. Sandza +1 202 346 8036 +1 202 956 3245 ebsandza@DL.com
No Logo Summit Global Partners of Florida, Inc., Defendant
No Logo The Chubb Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "THE CHUBB CORP."

Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

No Logo THE CONTINENTAL INSURANCE Company, Defendant

Represented by Carella, Byrne, Cecchi, Olstein, Brody & Agnello, PC

No Logo THE CONTINENTAL INSURANCE GROUP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wildman Harrold Allen & Dixon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Blankshain +1 312 201 2000 blankshain@wildmanharrold.com
No Logo THE HARTFORD FIDELITY & BONDING, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/24/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARY SUSAN HENIFIN +1 609 987 6800 mary.henifin@bipc.com
No Logo The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, Defendant
No Logo THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowenstein Sandler, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Richard Middleton, Jr. +1 973 597 2582 +1 973 597 2583 jmiddleton@lowenstein.com
No Logo The St. Paul Travelers Companies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo The Travelers Companies, Inc., Defendant
The Travelers Indemnity Company The Travelers Indemnity Company, Defendant
No Logo THOSE CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON, MEMBERS OF SYNDICATES 190 AND 282 FOR THE UNDERWRITING YEARS AT ISSUE, Defendant

Represented by Fields, Howell, Athans & McLaughlin, LLP

No Logo Travelers Casualty And Surety Company Of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MITCHELL JAY AUSLANDER +1 212 728 8000 +1 212 728 8111 mauslander@willkie.com
No Logo Travelers Indemnity Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MITCHELL JAY AUSLANDER +1 212 728 8000 +1 212 728 8111 mauslander@willkie.com
No Logo Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/24/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARY SUSAN HENIFIN +1 609 987 6800 mary.henifin@bipc.com
No Logo U.S.I HOLDINGS CORP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/20/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PATRICK CHARLES SCHMITTER +1 212 872 1000 pschmitter@akingump.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Benjamin Zabel +1 212 872 8060 +1 212 872 1002 rzabel@akingump.com
No Logo Usi Holdings Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

No Logo UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S OF LONDON, ORGANIZED AS SYNDICATE 2001 (AML), Defendant

Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

No Logo United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Copeland, Cook, Taylor Bush, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael W. Baxter +1 601 856 7200 +1 601 353 6235 mbaxter@cctb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BARRY HASSELL +1 601 856 7200 bhassell@cctb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHARLES GREG COPELAND +1 601 856 7200
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MIRIAM THERESA DOWD +1 212 705 7000
No Logo UNITED STATES FIDELITY AND GUARANTY SPECIALITY INSURANCE COMPANY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MIRIAM THERESA DOWD +1 212 705 7000
No Logo United States Fire Insurance Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE CO."

Represented by Landman Corsi Ballanine & Ford PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Saiber Schlesinger Satz & Goldstein, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/08/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN HERBERT NOORLANDER +1 973 645 4822 +1 973 622 3349 jnoorlander@windelsmarx.com
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
No Logo UNIVERSAL LIFE RESOURCES, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/05/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID A. GABIANELLI +1 415 403 8830 DGABIANELLI@HRBLAW.COM
TERMINATED: 06/03/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STEPHEN J SIEGAL +1 312 419 6900

Toggle Switch Represented by Novack & Macey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Neal Macey +1 312 419 6900 +1 312 419 6928 emacey@novackandmacey.com

Represented by Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/03/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RICHARD LANE MILLER, II +UND ELI VERABLE
No Logo UNIVERSAL LIFE RESOURCES INC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED NED GELHAAR +1 213 689 7433
TERMINATED: 06/03/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STEPHEN J SIEGAL +1 312 419 6900

Toggle Switch Represented by McBreen & Kopko

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/05/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID A. GABIANELLI +1 415 403 8830 DGABIANELLI@HRBLAW.COM

Toggle Switch Represented by Novack & Macey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Neal Macey +1 312 419 6900 +1 312 419 6928 emacey@novackandmacey.com

Represented by Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/03/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RICHARD LANE MILLER, II +UND ELI VERABLE
No Logo Unumprovident Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah E. Hyrb +1 203 921 2309 +1 203 359 3031
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PATRICK SHEA +1 203 961 7400

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RACHEL ROSS KRAUSE +1 813 229 2336
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JENNIFER BATES MCINTYRE +1 312 324 8400
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TIMON V SULLIVAN +1 813 229 2336

Represented by McElroy Deutsch Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP

Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roseann Oliver +1 312 263 5601 Roliver@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Usi Consulting Group, Defendant
No Logo USI HOLDINGS INC, Defendant

Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DENIS L. DURKIN +1 407 649 4000

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/20/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ALYSSA C. BARILLARI +1 412 667 7984 abarillari@mcguirewoods.com
No Logo USI INSURANCE SERVICES OF FLORIDA, INC., Defendant
No Logo Usi Services Corporation, Defendant
No Logo VIGILANT INSURANCE CO., Defendant

Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

No Logo WAUSAU UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRIAN E. ROBISON +1 214 698 3370 +1 214 999 7770 BRobison@gibsondunn.com

Represented by Kornstein Veisz & Wexler, LLP

Wells Fargo Bank, NA Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "WELLS FARGO & CO"
Unknown Role, NORWEST CORP
Unknown Role, Day Runner, Inc.
Unknown Role, Yucca Uranium Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/20/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CARLOS FRANCISCO ORTIZ +1 856 757 5026
TERMINATED: 09/20/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CARLOS FRANCISCO ORTIZ +1 856 757 5026

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ANDREW O. BUNN +1 973 622 4444 abunn@mccarter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RICHARD C. PEPPERMAN, II +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 peppermanr@sullcrom.com
No Logo WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE CO., Defendant
No Logo Willis Group Holdings Ltd., Defendant

Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED FREDRICK H. MCCLURE +1 813 229 1446
No Logo Willis Group Ltd., Defendant

Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED FREDRICK H. MCCLURE +1 813 229 1446
No Logo Willis North America Inc., Defendant

Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

No Logo WILLIS NORTH AMERICAN INC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED FREDRICK H. MCCLURE +1 813 229 1446

Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

No Logo Willis of Michigan, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RICHARD C. PEPPERMAN, II +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 peppermanr@sullcrom.com
No Logo Willis Of New York, Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RICHARD C. PEPPERMAN, II +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 peppermanr@sullcrom.com
No Logo Xl Capital Ltd, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cahill Gordon & Reindell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JUSTIN M. GIOVANNELLI +1 212 701 3000 jgiovannelli@cahill.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CAROLINE SPINDLER WHITTEMORE +1 212 701 3171 cwhittemore@cahill.com

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/22/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARY CAIT CURRAN +1 212 701 3642
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ALAN PATRICK SMITH +1 212 701 3372

Represented by FARRELL & THURMAN, PC

Zurich-American Insurance Company Zurich-American Insurance Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE CO."

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/16/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MATTHEW J. CANNON +1 312 902 5200
TERMINATED: 02/16/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GIL M. SOFFER +1 312 902 5200

Represented by Dewey & LeBoeuf LLP

Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Zurich North America Zurich North America, Defendant
Officially listed as "ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS"

Toggle Switch Represented by Dewey & LeBoeuf LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/16/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth B. Sandza +1 202 346 8036 +1 202 956 3245 ebsandza@DL.com
No Logo ZURICH FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dewey & LeBoeuf LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/16/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth B. Sandza +1 202 346 8036 +1 202 956 3245 ebsandza@DL.com
Zurich Insurance Group Zurich Insurance Group, Defendant

Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

No Logo ZURICH SPECIALTIES LONDON LIMITED, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dewey & LeBoeuf LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/16/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth B. Sandza +1 202 346 8036 +1 202 956 3245 ebsandza@DL.com
No Logo American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company, Consol Defendant
Officially listed as "AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL SPECIALTY LINES INSURANCE CO."

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlton Fields, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jeffrey Brodie +1 305 530 0050 +1 305 530 0055 sbrodie@carltonfields.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Michael Cohen +1 305 530 0050 +1 305 530 0055 jmcohen@carltonfields.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PATRICIA C. CROWLEY +1 202 223 7300 pcrowley@paulweiss.com
No Logo Lexington Insurance Company, Consol Defendant
Officially listed as "LEXINGTON INSURANCE CO."

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PATRICIA C. CROWLEY +1 202 223 7300 pcrowley@paulweiss.com
No Logo ANDERSON EXCAVATING COMPANY, Objector

Toggle Switch Represented by Hoffman Polland & Furman PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald David Coleman +1 212 338 0700 +1 917 591 3003 rcoleman@hpf-law.com
No Logo CONNIE PENTZ REALTY COMPANY, Objector
No Logo CROSS & SIR, Objector

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of IRA E. WEINER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED IRA E. WEINER +1 973 325 2002
No Logo DAN C.D. STURDEVANT, Objector

Toggle Switch Represented by Stephen Tsai Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STEPHEN TSAI +1 908 927 1000 +1 908 927 1002
No Logo EMERALD FINANCIAL GROUP, INC., Objector

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Tauber Spievack & Wagner, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea J. Lawrence +1 212 586 5800 +1 212 586 5095 alawrence@ctswlaw.com
No Logo HAROLD B. WOLFE, Objector

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John B.M. Frohling +1 973 226 4600 jcfrohling@aol.com
No Logo IAAD O INC., Objector

Toggle Switch Represented by Stein Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID MARC NIEPORENT +1 201 391 0770 +1 201 391 7776 dnieporent@stein-firm.com
No Logo PRIVATE CARE, INC. ET AL, Objector

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of THOMAS LARKIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED THOMAS LARKIN
No Logo ROMERO GENERAL CONSTRUCTION, Objector

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Tauber Spievack & Wagner, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea J. Lawrence +1 212 586 5800 +1 212 586 5095 alawrence@ctswlaw.com
No Logo SHAPIRO & LODWICK CO. LPA, Objector

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of IRA E. WEINER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED IRA E. WEINER +1 973 325 2002
No Logo SPORTS & SPINE PHYSICAL THERAPY, INC., Objector

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of IRA E. WEINER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED IRA E. WEINER +1 973 325 2002
No Logo STANLEY H. EPSTEIN, Objector

Toggle Switch Represented by Beatie & Osborn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Adam Osborn +1 212 888 9000 +1 212 888 9664 dosborn@bandolaw.com
No Logo THE CHABA LAW GROUP, LLC, Objector

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John B.M. Frohling +1 973 226 4600 jcfrohling@aol.com
No Logo VAN ENTERPRISES, INC., Objector

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Richard D. Grossman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/24/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alani Golanski +1 718 406 4488 +1 718 260 0842 alanigolanski@earthlink.net
No Logo WILLIAM AKERS, Objector

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John B.M. Frohling +1 973 226 4600 jcfrohling@aol.com
No Logo ZORKESS LLC, Objector

Toggle Switch Represented by Stein Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID MARC NIEPORENT +1 201 391 0770 +1 201 391 7776 dnieporent@stein-firm.com
No Logo Eagle Products, Inc., Movant
No Logo Independent Insurance Agents & Brokers Of America, Inc., Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Wigdor & Gilly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shaffin Abdul Datoo +1 212 257 6800 +1 212 257 6845 sdatoo@thompsonwigdor.com
No Logo National Association Of Professional Insurance Agents, Movant

Represented by Morris Manning & Martin, LLP

No Logo Office Depot, Inc., Movant

Represented by Saiber Schlesinger Satz & Goldstein, LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Thelen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED FREDERICK LEE WHITMER +1 212 895 2593 +1 212 895 2900 fwhitmer@thelen.com
No Logo STATE OF FLORIDA, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL - GAINES ST

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher R. Hunt +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 488 9134 Christopher.Hunt@myfloridalegal.com
No Logo Foster Poultry Farms, Inc., Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Gerard McCarney +1 212 896 6500 +1 212 896 6501 mccarneyj@howrey.com
No Logo INTERVENOR ATTORNEYS GENERAL, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GREGG ABBOTT +1 512 463 1262 +1 512 320 0975
No Logo KIM VAN WINKLE, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GREGG ABBOTT +1 512 463 1262 +1 512 320 0975
No Logo MARK TOBEY, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GREGG ABBOTT +1 512 463 1262 +1 512 320 0975
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 15
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
  Entries (2629) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2906 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2902 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2901 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2900 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2899 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Transcript
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2898 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Status Conference
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2897 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2896 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Letter
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2895 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Transcript
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2892 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Order of Dismissal
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2891 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2890 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2889 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2888 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2887 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Stipulation
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2886 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2885 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Stipulation
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2884 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Transcript
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2876 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2875 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2874 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2873 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2872 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2871 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2870 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2869 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2868 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2867 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Statement of Material Facts in Opposition to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2866 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition of Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2865 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2864 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2863 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2862 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2861 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2860 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2859 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2858 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2857 Filed: 4/1/2017, Entered: None Statement of Material Fact in Support of Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2856 Filed: 4/1/2017, Entered: None Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2855 Filed: 4/1/2017, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2854 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2853 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2852 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2851 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2850 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2849 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2848 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2847 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2846 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2845 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2844 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2843 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Disbursement of funds
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2842 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2841 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2840 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2839 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2838 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2837 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2836 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2835 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2834 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2833 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2832 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2831 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2830 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2829 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2828 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2827 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2749 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2700 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to Case
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2699 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2690 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2688 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2687 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2686 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to Case
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2685 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to Case
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2684 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2683 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2682 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2681 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2680 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2679 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2678 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2677 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2676 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to Case
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2675 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2674 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2673 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2672 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2671 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2670 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None Letter Rule 7.1
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2669 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2668 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to Case
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2667 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2666 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2664 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2663 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Disbursement of funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2662 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2661 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2660 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2659 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2658 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2657 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2527 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Jack Corman, Esq. re: settlement. (jd, ) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2526 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by LINCOLN ADVENTURES LLC, MICHIGAN MULTI-KING CORP. Notice of Change of Address on behalf of Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, P.C. (JENSEN, RACHEL) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2525 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit to 2500 Motion to Dismiss,,,, by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Organized as Syndicates 2488, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Organized as Syndicate 2791 Map, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London organized as Syndicates 570 and 609, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Organized as Syndicate of 2001 (AML), Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London organized as syndicates 33, 102, 382, 435, 510, 623, 727, 958, 1003, 1084, 1096, 1183, 1245, 1886, 2003, 2020, 2623 and 2987. (PALMER, ANNE) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2524 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from Peter S. Pearlman to the Honorable Joseph A. Dickson re 2424 Order on Oral Motion, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,. (PEARLMAN, PETER) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2523 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from Patrick J. Heneghan (Joint Status Letter). (HENEGHAN, PATRICK) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2522 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney MICHAEL STEVEN TARRINGER terminated. (CLOBES, BRYAN) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2521 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney ANDREA ROBINSON terminated. (KOLASKY, WILLIAM) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2520 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney ROBERT W. TRENCHARD terminated. (KOLASKY, WILLIAM) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2519 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney WILLIAM J. KOLASKY terminated. (KOLASKY, WILLIAM) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2518 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER VOLUNTARILY DISMISSING action w/prejudice THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. & TWIN CITY FIRE INS. CO.. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 5/20/13. (DD, ) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2517 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN PETER CALANDRA on behalf of MUNICH RE GROUP (CALANDRA, BRIAN) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2516 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal by QLM ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(CLOBES, BRYAN) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2515 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by KMART CORPORATION, LANDS' END INC., SEARS HOLDINGS CORPORATION, SEARS ROEBUCK & CO. (FISHER, IAN) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2514 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from Rachel L. Jensen re re 2513 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits Cited in Joint Letter)(JENSEN, RACHEL) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2513 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter from All Parties in Lincoln Adventures Tag Along. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(JENSEN, RACHEL) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2512 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney NATALIE FINKELMAN BENNETT terminated. (BENNETT, NATALIE) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2511 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL as to defts., Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc., Marsh Inc., Marsh USA Inc., American International Group, Inc., AIU Insurance Company, and National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, w/prejudice. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 5/6/13. (DD, ) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2510 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney BRIAN E. ROBISON terminated. (ROBISON, BRIAN) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2509 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by MUNICH RE GROUP / Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (O'NEILL, CASEY) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2508 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal by MARSH & MCLENNAN COMPANIES, INC., MARSH USA INC., MARSH INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(AUSLANDER, MITCHELL) (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2507 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION/PETITION for Temporary Seal of Exhibits to the Declaration of Anne Johnson Palmer in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss the Revised First Amended Class Action Complaint for by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London organized as syndicates 33, 102, 382, 435, 510, 623, 727, 958, 1003, 1084, 1096, 1183, 1245, 1886, 2003, 2020, 2623 and 2987. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(PALMER, ANNE) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2506 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by MARSH & MCLENNAN COMPANIES, INC., MARSH USA INC., MARSH INC. re 2504 MOTION to Dismiss Huntsman Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of C. St. Jeanos, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration, # 3 Certificate of Service)(AUSLANDER, MITCHELL) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2505 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF in Opposition filed by HUNTSMAN ADVANCE MATERIALS LLC, HUNTSMAN CORPORATION, HUNTSMAN HOLDINGS, LLC, HUNTSMAN LLC, INTERNATIONAL RISK INSURANCE COMPANY re 2504 MOTION to Dismiss Huntsman Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Proposed Order)(AUSLANDER, MITCHELL) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2504 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Huntsman Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by MARSH & MCLENNAN COMPANIES, INC., MARSH USA INC., MARSH INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Proposed Order)(AUSLANDER, MITCHELL) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2503 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London organized as syndicates 33, 102, 382, 435, 510, 623, 727, 958, 1003, 1084, 1096, 1183, 1245, 1886, 2003, 2020, 2623 and 2987;Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Organized as Syndicate 2791 MAP; Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Organized as Syndicate 2001 (AML); Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Organized as Syndicates 570 and 609; Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Organized as Syndicates 2488 re 2500 MOTION to Dismiss the Revised First Amended Class Action Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(PALMER, ANNE) (jd). (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2502 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF in Opposition filed by LINCOLN ADVENTURES LLC, MICHIGAN MULTI-KING CORP. re 2500 MOTION to Dismiss the Revised First Amended Class Action Complaint (PALMER, ANNE) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2501 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Marc D. Haefner in Reply and Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (filed under seal with complete exhibit) re 2498 MOTION to Dismiss with all papers - moving, opposition, and reply - filed by Defendants on a date certain and in this manner pursuant to the Order of the Court, 2497 Consent MOTION to Seal Certain Exhibits referenced in Motion to Dismiss by ACE GROUP HOLDINGS, INC.. (HAEFNER, MARC) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2500 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss the Revised First Amended Class Action Complaint by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London organized as syndicates 33, 102, 382, 435, 510, 623, 727, 958, 1003, 1084, 1096, 1183, 1245, 1886, 2003, 2020, 2623 and 2987; Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Organized as Syndicate 2791 MAP; Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London organized as Syndicate 2001 (AML); Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Organized as Syndicates 570 and 609; Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Organized as Syndicates 2488. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Anne Johnson Palmer in Support, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Anne Johnson Palmer, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Anne Johnson Palmer, # 5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Anne Johnson Palmer, # 6 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Anne Johnson Palmer, # 7 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Anne Johnson Palmer, # 8 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Anne Johnson Palmer, # 9 Text of Proposed Order, # 10 Certificate of Service)(PALMER, ANNE) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2499 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re 2498 MOTION to Dismiss with all papers - moving, opposition, and reply - filed by Defendants on a date certain and in this manner pursuant to the Order of the Court, 2497 Consent MOTION to Seal Certain Exhibits referenced in Motion to Dismiss Complete Version of Declaration in Support of Motion to Dismiss that was filed with slip sheet in Entry 2498 by ACE GROUP HOLDINGS, INC.. (HAEFNER, MARC) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2498 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss with all papers - moving, opposition, and reply - filed by Defendants on a date certain and in this manner pursuant to the Order of the Court by ACE GROUP HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Declaration in Support of Motion Dismiss (with slip sheet for confidential document for which sealing is sought), # 3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss, # 4 Certification of Service of Defendants' Papers in Support of Motion to Dismiss, # 5 Brief by Plaintiffs in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (filed by Defendants pursuant to Order of the Court), # 6 Exhibit A to Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition (filed by Defendants pursuant to Order of the Court), # 7 Exhibit B to Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition (filed by Defendants pursuant to Order of the Court), # 8 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss (filed by Defendants pursuant to Order of the Court), # 9 Certification of Service of Plaintiffs' Papers (filed by Defendants pursuant to Order of the Court), # 10 Brief in Reply and Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, # 11 Declaration in Reply and Further Support of Motion to Dismiss (with slip sheet for confidential document for which sealing is sought), # 12 Certification of Service of All Papers)(HAEFNER, MARC) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2497 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION to Seal Certain Exhibits referenced in Motion to Dismiss by ACE GROUP HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order to Temporarily Seal)(HAEFNER, MARC) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2496 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER: The Court having read and considered the submissions of the parties (ECF #2485, 2487, 2488, 2492 and 2493), the request for a two week extension of the deadlines from 4/26/13 to 5/10/13 is GRANTED. The in person status conference scheduled for 5/8/13 has been adjourned to 5/22/2013 02:30 PM in Newark - Courtroom 2D before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. The plaintiff, in consultation with defendants, shall submit status letters to the Court, not to exceed five (5) pages in length, regarding the status of all matters in this litigation.SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 4/29/13. (nm, ) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2495 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Corrected Letter from All Parties in Lincoln Adventures re 2494 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(MEDICI, CARMEN) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2494 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from All Parties. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(MEDICI, CARMEN) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2493 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from Syndicate 2791, in Response to Plaintiffs Letter re 2492 Letter. (BUSH, THOMAS) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2492 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from Lincoln Adventures Plaintiffs re 2488 Letter. (MEDICI, CARMEN) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2491 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL w/prejudice as to defts., LIBERTY MUTUAL. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 4/25/13. (DD, ) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2490 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Edith M. Kallas and Bryan L. Clobes re 2489 MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Expenses and Service Award Payments to Named Plantiffs in Regard to Settlement with Defendants Ace, Chubb and Munich Re by QLM ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Summary of Fees and Expenses)(KALLAS, EDITH) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2489 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Expenses and Service Award Payments to Named Plantiffs in Regard to Settlement with Defendants Ace, Chubb and Munich Re by QLM ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion, # 2 Certificate of Service)(KALLAS, EDITH) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2488 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from Syndicate 2791, in response to re 2485 Letter. (BUSH, THOMAS) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2487 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from John M. Toriello to join the joint letter submission made on 4/23/13 seeking an extension of the discovery dispute deadline re 2485 Letter. (TORIELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2486 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER that, given the recent developments in this case which may have rendered the aforementioned appeals moot, including the settlement of several matters in mediation and the extension of the schedule, all pending appeals (Docket Entry Nos. 2203, 2232 & 2255) shall be administratively terminated. Any party that intends to pursue its appeal may re-file its papers.. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 4/24/13. (DD, ) Modified on 4/25/2013 (Reilly, M). (Main Document 2486 replaced on 4/25/2013) (DD). (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2485 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from Joint Letter from Plaintiffs and Certain Syndicates. (JENSEN, RACHEL) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2484 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney RICHARD E. DONOVAN terminated. (DONOVAN, RICHARD) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2483 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum of Law in Support of ACE Bermuda Insurance Ltd.s Motion to Compel Arbitration of Claims and to Stay Proceedings as Against ACE Bermuda Insurance Ltd. and portions of Exhibit F Part 1 attached to Declaration of Marc Haefner, MOTION to Seal Document 2480 Brief in Support of Motion by ACE LIMITED. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Liza M. Walsh, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Statement Pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1(d)(4), # 6 Certificate of Service, # 7 Letter to Hon. Joseph A. Dickson)(WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2482 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ACE LIMITED re 2479 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiffs Claims against ACE Bermuda Insurance Ltd. and to Stay Proceedings (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Liza M. Walsh, # 2 Exhibit 1-10, # 3 Exhibit 11A-18, # 4 Exhibit 19-27, # 5 Declaration of Jeremy Brandon)(WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2481 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF in Opposition filed by ACE LIMITED re 2479 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiffs Claims against ACE Bermuda Insurance Ltd. and to Stay Proceedings (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Ian Fisher, # 2 Exhibit 1-26, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2480 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF in Support filed by ACE LIMITED re 2479 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiffs Claims against ACE Bermuda Insurance Ltd. and to Stay Proceedings (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F- Part 1 (CONFIDENTIAL))(WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2479 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiffs Claims against ACE Bermuda Insurance Ltd. and to Stay Proceedings by ACE LIMITED. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Marc Haefner in support of Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiffs Claims against ACE Bermuda Insurance Ltd. and to Stay Proceedings, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B - Part 1, # 4 Exhibit B - Part 2, # 5 Exhibit B - Part 3, # 6 Exhibit B - Part 4, # 7 Exhibit B - Part 5, # 8 Exhibit C, # 9 Exhibit D - Part 1a, # 10 Exhibit D - Part 1b, # 11 Exhibit D - Part 1c, # 12 Exhibit D - Part 2, # 13 Exhibit D - Part 3, # 14 Exhibit E - Part 1-Part 4, # 15 Exhibit F - Part 1, # 16 Exhibit F - Part 2, # 17 Exhibit F - Part 3, # 18 Exhibit G - Part 1, # 19 Exhibit G - Part 2, # 20 Exhibit H, # 21 Exhibit I, # 22 Text of Proposed Order, # 23 12/21/12 Appendix N letter, # 24 12/21/12 Cover letter to Plaintiffs)(WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2478 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER VOLUNTARILY DISMISSING w/prejudice LIBERTY MUTUAL INS. CO., LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP & LIBERTY INS. UNDERWRITER, INC.. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 4/15/13. (DD, ) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2477 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by KMART CORPORATION, LANDS' END INC., SEARS HOLDINGS CORPORATION, SEARS ROEBUCK & CO. (FISHER, IAN) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2476 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by KMART CORPORATION, LANDS' END INC., SEARS HOLDINGS CORPORATION, SEARS ROEBUCK & CO. (FISHER, IAN) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2475 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER VOLUNTARILY DISMISSING ACTION as to the CHUBB DEFTS., w/prejudice.. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 4/12/13. (DD, ) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2474 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER VOLUNTARILY DISMISSING ACTION as to the CHUBB DEFTS., w/out prejudice. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 4/12/13. (DD, ) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2473 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL w/prejudice as to defts., MARSH & MCLENNAN COMPANIES, INC., MARSH, INC., MARSH PLACEMENT, INC., MARSH GLOBAL BROKING, INC. & MARSH USA, INC.. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 4/12/13. (DD, ) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2472 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER resetting Fairness Hrg. for 7/17/13 @ 11:30 a.m.; etc.. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 4/12/13. (DD, ) (Main Document 2472 replaced on 4/12/2013) (DD). (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2471 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by KMART CORPORATION, LANDS' END INC., SEARS HOLDINGS CORPORATION, SEARS ROEBUCK & CO. (FISHER, IAN) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2470 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS HEADQUARTERS, LLC, PUBLIC SERVICE ENTERPRISE GROUP, TYSON FOODS, INC., Texas Independent Energy, LLP (FISHER, IAN) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2469 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal by MARSH & MCLENNAN COMPANIES, INC., MARSH PLACEMENT INC, MARSH USA INC., MARSH GLOBAL BROKING, INC. (NEW JERSEY), MARSH INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(AUSLANDER, MITCHELL) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2468 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER that by June 20, 2013, all responses to objections and briefs in support of final approval shall be filed.. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 4/9/13. (DD, ) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2467 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MDL ORDER: In light of the Fairness Hearing scheduled for July 10, 2013 at 11:30 a.m., all responses to objections and briefs in support of final approval shall be filed by June 20, 2013. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 04-09-2013. (Reilly, M) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2466 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 2434 Motion for Settlement. The Court hereby schedules a Fairness Hearing for July 10, 2013 at 11:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 04-09-2013. (Reilly, M) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2465 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER VOLUNTARILY DISMISSING action as to ACE LIMITED, ACE IN A HOLDINGS, INC., ACE USA, INC., & ACE AMERICAN INS. CO.. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 4/8/13. (DD, ) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2464 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by AVERY DENNISON CORPORATION (MASTERSON, STEPHEN) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2463 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting deft., ACE BERMUDA INS. LTD's re 2458 Letter Request for a total of 20 pgs., in Times New Roman 12-point font, for its reply brief on its pending Motion to Compel Arbitration.. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 4/5/13. (DD, ) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2462 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER VOLUNTARILY DISMISSING ACTION as to SYNDICATE 2488 AGM w/prejudice.. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 4/4/13. (DD, ) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2461 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER VOLUNTARILY DISMISSING ACTION w/prejudice as to THE ST. PAUL/TRAVELERS DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 4/4/13. (DD, ) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2460 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER VOLUNTARILY DISMISSING action w/prejudice as to St. Paul Travelers Co., Inc. (n/kla The Travelers Companies Inc.), Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Gulf insurance Company, Travelers Excess and Surplus Lines Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Travelers Property Casualty insurance Company, St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company and certain Underwriters at Lloyds. London organized as syndicates 1211. 1511, and 5000.. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 4/4/13. (DD, ) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2459 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER that Defts. in both Huntsman & Lincoln Adventures shall serve their reply brief, as well as file motion, opposition & reply no later than 4/30/13; the return date shall be 5/6/13; etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 4/3/13. (DD, ) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2458 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/5/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from Liza M. Walsh on behalf of ACE Bermuda Insurance Limited seeking permission to file an overlength reply brief. (HAEFNER, MARC) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2457 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter from Marc D. Haefner to the Honorable Patty Shwartz, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Proposed Order)(HAEFNER, MARC) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2456 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by KMART CORPORATION, LANDS' END INC., SEARS HOLDINGS CORPORATION, SEARS ROEBUCK & CO. (FISHER, IAN) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2455 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by KMART CORPORATION, LANDS' END INC., SEARS HOLDINGS CORPORATION, SEARS ROEBUCK & CO. (FISHER, IAN) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2454 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS HEADQUARTERS, LLC, PUBLIC SERVICE ENTERPRISE GROUP, TYSON FOODS, INC., Texas Independent Energy, LLP (FISHER, IAN) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2453 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS HEADQUARTERS, LLC, PUBLIC SERVICE ENTERPRISE GROUP, TYSON FOODS, INC., Texas Independent Energy, LLP (FISHER, IAN) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2452 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER that Defts. shall serve their reply brief, as well as file the motion to dismiss, opposition & reply no later than 4/30/13; the return date shall be 5/6/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 4/1/13. (DD, ) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2451 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC, PUBLIC SERVICE ENTERPRISE GROUP, Texas Independent Energy, LLP (FISHER, IAN) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2450 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER VOLUNTARILY DISMISSING action as to the ACE DEFTS.. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 4/1/13. (DD, ) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2449 Filed: 3/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter from Marc Haefner, Defendants' Liaison Counsel, seeking, with the consent of the Plaintiffs, an extension of time to file Defendants' Omnibus Reply Brief on the Motions to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order and Stipulation Extending the time for the filing of the Reply Brief by Consent)(HAEFNER, MARC) (Entered: 03/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2448 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from JOINT LETTER from Sears and XL re Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings re 2377 Letter,. (FISHER, IAN) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2447 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS HEADQUARTERS, LLC, PUBLIC SERVICE ENTERPRISE GROUP, Texas Independent Energy, LLP (FISHER, IAN) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2446 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT MDL ORDER, At the request of the parties, the April 4, 2013 in-person status conference is adjourned to May 8, 2013 at 1:00 p.m. All deadlines shall remain in full force and effect. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 3/28/13. (Liriano, I) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2445 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from Liaison Counsel for the Defendants on behalf of all Parties seeking adjournment of the April 4, 2013 status conference and offering three alternative dates as requested by the Court re 2430 Order, Set Hearings,,,,. (HAEFNER, MARC) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2444 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by AVERY DENNISON CORPORATION. (MASTERSON, STEPHEN) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2443 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER on behalf of the Sears Plaintiffs, Tyson Plaintiffs, and ACE Bermuda Insurance, Ltd. (ABIL), extending time from April 2, 2013, to April 16, 2013, the time for ABIL to file its Reply in further support of the Motion to Compel Arbitration of Claims, which results in a new return date of May 6, 2013.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 3/25/13. (DD, ) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2442 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from Carmen Medici re Lincoln Adventures Plaintiffs' Corrected Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to Defense Counsel)(MEDICI, CARMEN) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2441 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter from Carmen Medici re Lincoln Adventures Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to Defense Counsel)(MEDICI, CARMEN) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2440 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from Jennifer A. Waters. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Appendix N Letter)(WATERS, JENNIFER) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2439 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney ROBERT A. ALESSI terminated. (THURMAN, JOHN) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2438 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney JOHN L. THURMAN terminated. (THURMAN, JOHN) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2437 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from Huntsman Tag-Along Plaintiffs regarding Hunstman Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Marsh Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter to Counsel for Marsh)(DUMESNIL, BRYAN) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2436 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Patty Shwartz, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Proposed Consent Order)(WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2435 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Stipulation of Settlement by QLM ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List of Defendant Groups, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Preliminary Approval Order, # 3 Exhibit Escrow Agreement, # 4 Exhibit Postcard Settlement Notice, # 5 Exhibit Detailed Settlement Notice, # 6 Exhibit Publication Notice, # 7 Exhibit Plan of Allocation, # 8 Exhibit Proposed Final Order, # 9 Exhibit Proposed Judgment)(CLOBES, BRYAN) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2434 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval by QLM ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Memorandom of Law in Support of Preliminary Approval of Settlement, # 2 Certificate of Service)(CLOBES, BRYAN) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2433 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER VOLUNTARILY DISMISSING action as to XL INS. (BERMUDA) LTD, XL INS. CO. LIMITED, XL INS. AMERICA, INC. & XL SPECIALTY INS. CO.. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 3/22/13. (DD, ) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2432 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER VOLUNTARILY DISMISSING action as to ACE USA, INC.. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 3/21/13. (DD, ) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2431 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by KMART CORPORATION, LANDS' END INC., SEARS HOLDINGS CORPORATION, SEARS ROEBUCK & CO. (FISHER, IAN) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2430 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT MDL ORDER, In light of the recent adjustments to the pretrial schedule, no later than March 27, 2013, the parties shall confer and notify the Court if they wish to proceed with the in-person status conference on April 4, 2013 or if they jointly request that the Court reschedule the in-person status conference and if so provide three dates convenient for counsel to appear for such a conference. All deadlines shall remain in full force and effect. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 3/21/13. (Liriano, I) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2429 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Aberfeldy Properties Inc., BIG BEAR PROPERTIES, INC., HENLEY MANAGEMENT COMPANY, KITCHENS, INC., NORTHBROOK PROPERTIES, INC., PAYROLL AND INSURANCE GROUP, INC., RCK PROPERTIES, INC. (FISHER, IAN) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2428 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by.ACE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO., ACE GROUP HOLDINGS, INC., ACE INA, ACE INA HOLDINGS, ACE INA HOLDINGS INC, ACE LIMITED, ACE LTD, ACE US HOLDINGS, INC., ACE USA Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Admitted Pro Hac Vice, Amy T. Brantly (WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2427 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from Ian H. Fisher. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter to Counsel, # 2 Certificate of Service)(FISHER, IAN) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2426 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL w/prejudice the claims by Henley Management Company, Big Bear Properties, Inc., Northbrook Properties, Inc., RCK Properties, Inc., Kitchens, Inc., Aberfeldy Properties, Inc., as successor in interest to Aberfeldy LP, and Payroll & Insurance Group, Inc. against Defendants Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc., Marsh Inc., Marsh USA Inc., Marsh Placement, Inc. and Marsh Global Broking, Inc.. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 3/13/13. (DD, ) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2425 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal by MARSH & MCLENNAN COMPANIES, INC., MARSH GLOBAL BROKING, INC. (NEW JERSEY), MARSH INC., MARSH PLACEMENT INC, MARSH USA INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(AUSLANDER, MITCHELL) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2424 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER ON INFORMAL APPL., ( Fact Discovery due by 7/26/2013., Class Certf. Motions due by 4/1/2013., In-Person Status Conference set for 4/4/2013 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz.); etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 3/11/13. (DD, ) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2423 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Joint Letter re Extension of Pre-Trial Deadlines. (JENSEN, RACHEL) (Entered: 03/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2422 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO., ACE GROUP HOLDINGS, INC., ACE INA, ACE INA HOLDINGS, ACE INA HOLDINGS INC, ACE LIMITED, ACE LTD, ACE US HOLDINGS, INC., ACE USA of Withdrawal of Pro Hac Vice Counsel David H. Orozco (WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2421 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MDL ORDER - requesting a report regarding the status of settlement and mediation efforts by March 5, 2013. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 2/27/13. (jl, ) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2420 Filed: 2/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Werner R. Kranenburg to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (PEARLMAN, PETER) (Entered: 02/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2419 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 2412 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 2/15/13. (jl, ) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2418 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by MUNICH RE GROUP / Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (CARUCCI, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2417 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting re 2416 NOTICE to Withdraw as Attorney [Kenneth W. Erickson] filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London organized as syndicates 33, 102, 382, 435, 510, 623, 727, 958, 1003, 1084, 1096, 1183, 1245, 1886, 2003, 2020, 2623 and 2987. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 1/25/13. (DD, ) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2416 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 1/28/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London organized as syndicates 33, 102, 382, 435, 510, 623, 727, 958, 1003, 1084, 1096, 1183, 1245, 1886, 2003, 2020, 2623 and 2987. (ERICKSON, KENNETH) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2415 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney LAYNE EDWIN KRUSE terminated. (KRUSE, LAYNE) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2414 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 2413 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to WERNER R. KRANENBURG, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 1/23/13. (DD, ) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2413 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice AS TO WERNER R. KRANENBURG by LINCOLN ADVENTURES LLC. (Attachments: # 1 STATEMENT AS TO WHY NO BRIEF IS NECESSARY, # 2 CERTIFICATION OF PETER S. PEARLMAN, # 3 CERTIFICATION OF WERNER R. KRANENBURG, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Certificate of Service)(PEARLMAN, PETER) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2412 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Disbursement of Funds (Distribution of Settlement Funds) by QLM ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support of Motion, # 2 Declaration of Daniel Coggeshall, # 3 Text of Proposed Order granting Motion)(KALLAS, EDITH) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2411 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW M. BURKE on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London organized as syndicates 33, 102, 382, 435, 510, 623, 727, 958, 1003, 1084, 1096, 1183, 1245, 1886, 2003, 2020, 2623 and 2987 (BURKE, MATTHEW) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2410 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney LAZAR P. RAYNAL; GEOFFREY A. VANCE; AMY GRAHAM DOEHRING and STEVEN P. HANDLER terminated. (DOEHRING, AMY) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2409 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MDL ORDER - All deadlines and briefing schedules, including those for motions to dismiss, to compel arbitration, and for class certification have been extended by the court's January 2, 2013 order. No motions or deadlines are excepted from the court's extension order. re 2408 Letter SO ORDERED by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 1/10/13. (jl, ) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2408 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from Tag Along Plaintiffs Liason Counsel re 2404 Letter,. (FISHER, IAN) (Entered: 01/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2407 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL w/prejudice against only Defendants Marsh &McLennan Companies, Inc., Marsh Inc., Marsh Placement, Inc., Marsh Global Broking, Inc. and Marsh USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 1/9/13. (DD, ) (Entered: 01/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2406 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal by MARSH & MCLENNAN COMPANIES, INC., MARSH GLOBAL BROKING, INC. (NEW JERSEY), MARSH INC., MARSH PLACEMENT INC, MARSH USA INC.((Connecticut) (Civil 05-1168)). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(AUSLANDER, MITCHELL) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2405 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT MDL ORDER, Because Judge Cecchi has extended the deadlines in this case by sixty-days, the Februar