MCEACHERN v. STREETWIDE ASSET RECOVERY GROUP INC. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-02262
District Judge Peter G. Sheridan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 14, 2016 at 2:03 AM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JONELLE MCEACHERN, Plaintiff

Represented by PROCHNIAK WEISBERG, PC

v.
No Logo John Does 1-10, Defendant
No Logo MICHAEL COLUMBO, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gleason & Koatz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John P. Gleason +1 212 986 1544 +1 212 986 1379 jgleason@gleasonkoatz.com
No Logo STREETWIDE ASSET RECOVERY GROUP INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gleason & Koatz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John P. Gleason +1 212 986 1544 +1 212 986 1379 jgleason@gleasonkoatz.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1692
Nature of Suit 480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time for Defts STREETWIDE ASSET RECOVERY GROUP, INC. and MICHAEL COLOMBO (s/h/a MICHAEL COLUMBO) to respond to Pltf's Complaint is extended to 11/22/2012. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 10/24/2012. (gxh) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
    STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, 2 Summons Issued 04/17/2012 by MICHAEL COLUMBO, JOHN DOES 1-10, STREETWIDE ASSET RECOVERY GROUP INC.. (GLEASON, JOHN) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
      Corporate Disclosure Statement by MICHAEL COLUMBO, JOHN DOES 1-10, STREETWIDE ASSET RECOVERY GROUP INC. identifying Streetwide Asset Recovery Group Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (GLEASON, JOHN) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN P GLEASON on behalf of All Defendants (GLEASON, JOHN) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
          Letter from Matthew B. Weisberg, Esq. re 4 Notice of Call for dismissal. (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None
            SUMMONS Returned Executed by JONELLE MCEACHERN. STREETWIDE ASSET RECOVERY GROUP INC. served on 8/9/2012, answer due 8/30/2012. (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None
              SUMMONS Returned Executed by JONELLE MCEACHERN. MICHAEL COLUMBO served on 8/9/2012, answer due 8/30/2012. (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                Notice of Call for dismissal Pursuant to Rule 4(m). Motion set for 8/31/2012 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (NR ) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from JUDGE PETER G. SHERIDAN to JUDGE MICHAEL A. SHIPP. Signed by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 7/27/2012. (gxh) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/30/2012) (mmh). (Entered: 07/27/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                    SUMMONS ISSUED as to MICHAEL COLUMBO, STREETWIDE ASSET RECOVERY GROUP INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *KIM KORCHICK* (kak, ) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                      COMPLAINT against MICHAEL COLUMBO, JOHN DOES 1-10, STREETWIDE ASSET RECOVERY GROUP INC. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4297367) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JONELLE MCEACHERN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kak, ) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 674 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?