REQUEST FOR EXEMPTION FROM PACER FEES
Federal Court Proceeding New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:12-mc-00113-JBS
District Judge Jerome B. Simandle, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 3, 2016 at 1:47 AM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Office Camden
Filed 5/16/2012
Jury Demand
Demand
Nature of Suit
Cause
Jurisdiction
Disposition Statistical Closing
County
Terminated 6/29/2012
Origin
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: 9/5/2013 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting Limited Exemption from PACER Fee Schedule. Order sent to PACER Service Center, Alexander A. Reinert, and Michel Ishakian, Chief. Signed by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 9/4/2013. (drw)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: 9/4/2013 Letter
    Letter from Alexander A. Reinert re: Request for Exemption from PACER Fees. (drw)
      LREF
      Blank  Terminated Case
      ***Civil Case Terminated. (th, )
        LREF
        Blank 2 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: 6/20/2012 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [1] REQUEST FOR EXEMPTION FROM PACER FEES. ORDERED that Mr. Reinert's application is GRANTED for a period of 1 year commencing 6/19/2012 & expiring 6/19/2013, etc. Signed by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 6/19/2012. (drw)
          LREF
          Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: 5/17/2012 Letter
          REQUEST FOR EXEMPTION FROM PACER FEES filed by Alexander Reinert (nz, )
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 252 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?