Wynn Resorts, Limited v. Okada et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Nevada District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-00400
District Judge Larry R. Hicks, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Larry R. Hicks
Last Updated January 11, 2017 at 6:36 AM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Wynn Resorts, Limited, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert L. Shapiro

Represented by Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd L. Bice +1 702 382 2101 +1 702 382 8135

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jarrod L. Rickard +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 jlr@pisanellibice.com

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. DiPrima +1 212 403 1382 +1 212 403 2208 srdiprima@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Grant R Mainland +1 212 403 1021 +1 212 403 2021 grmainland@wlrk.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul K. Rowe +1 212 403 1210 +1 212 403 2000 pkrowe@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com
No Logo Aruze USA, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Brobeck, Phleger & Harrison LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F Sullivan +1 858 720 2500 +1 858 720 2500 wmfsullivan@gmail.com

Represented by Lionel Sawyer & Collins

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul R. Hejmanowski +1 702 383 8888 phejmanowski@lionelsawyer.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel S. Lionel +1 702 388 8888 slionel@lionelsawyer.com

Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John S. Durrant +1 213 683 6144 +1 213 627 0705 johndurrant@paulhastings.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas P. OBrien +1 213 683 6000 +1 213 627 0705 thomasobrien@paulhastings.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard M. Privette +1 213 683 6229 +1 213 627 0705 howardprivette@paulhastings.com

Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A. Zaccaro +1 323 965 3998 +1 323 965 3812 zaccarot@sec.gov
No Logo Elaine P Wynn, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Jolley Urga Wirth Woodbury & Standish

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Urga +1 702 699 7500 +1 702 699 7555 FedCt@juww.com

Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark B Helm +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 683 5187 mark.helm@mto.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald Leroy Olson , +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 ron.olson@mto.com
No Logo Universal Entertainment Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Brobeck, Phleger & Harrison LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F Sullivan +1 858 720 2500 +1 858 720 2500 wmfsullivan@gmail.com

Represented by Lionel Sawyer & Collins

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul R. Hejmanowski +1 702 383 8888 phejmanowski@lionelsawyer.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel S. Lionel +1 702 388 8888 slionel@lionelsawyer.com

Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John S. Durrant +1 213 683 6144 +1 213 627 0705 johndurrant@paulhastings.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas P. OBrien +1 213 683 6000 +1 213 627 0705 thomasobrien@paulhastings.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard M. Privette +1 213 683 6229 +1 213 627 0705 howardprivette@paulhastings.com

Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A. Zaccaro +1 323 965 3998 +1 323 965 3812 zaccarot@sec.gov
v.
No Logo Aruze USA, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Brobeck, Phleger & Harrison LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F Sullivan +1 858 720 2500 +1 858 720 2500 wmfsullivan@gmail.com

Represented by Lionel Sawyer & Collins

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul R. Hejmanowski +1 702 383 8888 phejmanowski@lionelsawyer.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel S. Lionel +1 702 388 8888 slionel@lionelsawyer.com

Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John S. Durrant +1 213 683 6144 +1 213 627 0705 johndurrant@paulhastings.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas P. OBrien +1 213 683 6000 +1 213 627 0705 thomasobrien@paulhastings.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard M. Privette +1 213 683 6229 +1 213 627 0705 howardprivette@paulhastings.com

Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A. Zaccaro +1 323 965 3998 +1 323 965 3812 zaccarot@sec.gov
No Logo Universal Entertainment Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Brobeck, Phleger & Harrison LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F Sullivan +1 858 720 2500 +1 858 720 2500 wmfsullivan@gmail.com

Represented by Lionel Sawyer & Collins

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul R. Hejmanowski +1 702 383 8888 phejmanowski@lionelsawyer.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel S. Lionel +1 702 388 8888 slionel@lionelsawyer.com

Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John S. Durrant +1 213 683 6144 +1 213 627 0705 johndurrant@paulhastings.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas P. OBrien +1 213 683 6000 +1 213 627 0705 thomasobrien@paulhastings.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard M. Privette +1 213 683 6229 +1 213 627 0705 howardprivette@paulhastings.com

Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A. Zaccaro +1 323 965 3998 +1 323 965 3812 zaccarot@sec.gov
No Logo Allan Zeman, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. DiPrima +1 212 403 1382 +1 212 403 2208 srdiprima@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Grant R Mainland +1 212 403 1021 +1 212 403 2021 grmainland@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul K. Rowe +1 212 403 1210 +1 212 403 2000 pkrowe@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com
No Logo Alvin V Shoemaker, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. DiPrima +1 212 403 1382 +1 212 403 2208 srdiprima@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Grant R Mainland +1 212 403 1021 +1 212 403 2021 grmainland@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul K. Rowe +1 212 403 1210 +1 212 403 2000 pkrowe@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com
No Logo Aruze USA, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Represented by Brobeck, Phleger & Harrison LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F Sullivan +1 858 720 2500 +1 858 720 2500 wmfsullivan@gmail.com

Represented by Lionel Sawyer & Collins

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul R. Hejmanowski +1 702 383 8888 phejmanowski@lionelsawyer.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel S. Lionel +1 702 388 8888 slionel@lionelsawyer.com

Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John S. Durrant +1 213 683 6144 +1 213 627 0705 johndurrant@paulhastings.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas P. OBrien +1 213 683 6000 +1 213 627 0705 thomasobrien@paulhastings.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard M. Privette +1 213 683 6229 +1 213 627 0705 howardprivette@paulhastings.com

Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A. Zaccaro +1 323 965 3998 +1 323 965 3812 zaccarot@sec.gov
No Logo D Boone Wayson, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. DiPrima +1 212 403 1382 +1 212 403 2208 srdiprima@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Grant R Mainland +1 212 403 1021 +1 212 403 2021 grmainland@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul K. Rowe +1 212 403 1210 +1 212 403 2000 pkrowe@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com
No Logo Elaine P Wynn, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Jolley Urga Wirth Woodbury & Standish

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Urga +1 702 699 7500 +1 702 699 7555 FedCt@juww.com

Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark B Helm +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 683 5187 mark.helm@mto.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald Leroy Olson , +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 ron.olson@mto.com
No Logo John A Moran, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. DiPrima +1 212 403 1382 +1 212 403 2208 srdiprima@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Grant R Mainland +1 212 403 1021 +1 212 403 2021 grmainland@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul K. Rowe +1 212 403 1210 +1 212 403 2000 pkrowe@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com
No Logo Kimmarie Sinatra, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. DiPrima +1 212 403 1382 +1 212 403 2208 srdiprima@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Grant R Mainland +1 212 403 1021 +1 212 403 2021 grmainland@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul K. Rowe +1 212 403 1210 +1 212 403 2000 pkrowe@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com
No Logo Linda Chen, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. DiPrima +1 212 403 1382 +1 212 403 2208 srdiprima@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Grant R Mainland +1 212 403 1021 +1 212 403 2021 grmainland@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul K. Rowe +1 212 403 1210 +1 212 403 2000 pkrowe@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com
No Logo Marc D Schorr, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. DiPrima +1 212 403 1382 +1 212 403 2208 srdiprima@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Grant R Mainland +1 212 403 1021 +1 212 403 2021 grmainland@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul K. Rowe +1 212 403 1210 +1 212 403 2000 pkrowe@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com
No Logo Ray R Irani, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. DiPrima +1 212 403 1382 +1 212 403 2208 srdiprima@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Grant R Mainland +1 212 403 1021 +1 212 403 2021 grmainland@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul K. Rowe +1 212 403 1210 +1 212 403 2000 pkrowe@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com
No Logo Robert J. Miller, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. DiPrima +1 212 403 1382 +1 212 403 2208 srdiprima@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Grant R Mainland +1 212 403 1021 +1 212 403 2021 grmainland@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul K. Rowe +1 212 403 1210 +1 212 403 2000 pkrowe@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com
No Logo Russell Goldsmith, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. DiPrima +1 212 403 1382 +1 212 403 2208 srdiprima@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Grant R Mainland +1 212 403 1021 +1 212 403 2021 grmainland@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul K. Rowe +1 212 403 1210 +1 212 403 2000 pkrowe@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com
No Logo Wynn, Stephen A., Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "Stephen A Wynn"
Officer/Director, Wynn Resorts Ltd

Represented by Campbell & Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Jude Campbell +1 702 382 5222 +1 702 382 0540 djc@cwlawlv.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Colby Williams +1 702 382 5222 +1 702 382 0540 jcw@campbellandwilliams.com

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com
No Logo Wynn Resorts, Limited, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert L. Shapiro

Represented by Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd L. Bice +1 702 382 2101 +1 702 382 8135

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jarrod L. Rickard +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 jlr@pisanellibice.com

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. DiPrima +1 212 403 1382 +1 212 403 2208 srdiprima@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Grant R Mainland +1 212 403 1021 +1 212 403 2021 grmainland@wlrk.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul K. Rowe +1 212 403 1210 +1 212 403 2000 pkrowe@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com
No Logo Wynn, Stephen A., Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Stephen A Wynn"
Officer/Director, Wynn Resorts Ltd

Represented by Campbell & Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Jude Campbell +1 702 382 5222 +1 702 382 0540 djc@cwlawlv.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Colby Williams +1 702 382 5222 +1 702 382 0540 jcw@campbellandwilliams.com

Represented by Pisanelli Bice PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Pisanelli +1 702 214 2100 +1 702 214 2101 lit@pisanellibice.com
Other Parties
No Logo Elaine P Wynn, Cross-Claimant

Represented by Jolley Urga Wirth Woodbury & Standish

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Urga +1 702 699 7500 +1 702 699 7555 FedCt@juww.com

Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark B Helm +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 683 5187 mark.helm@mto.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald Leroy Olson , +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 ron.olson@mto.com
Attributes
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Timeline
  Entries (130) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 130 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None
JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Wynn Resorts, Limited and against Aruze USA, Inc., Universal Entertainment Corporation, Kazuo Okada in the amount of $148,583.00. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 8/21/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
LREF
Blank 129 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting 107 Request for attorneys fees. Case terminated. The clerk of court shall enter an award of attorneys fees in favor of plaintiff and against defendant in the amount of $148,583.00. This action, 2:12-cv-0400, is REMANDED in its entirety. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/21/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING 126 Stipulation to Vacate Scheduling Order 120 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/2/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None
(1st Notice) NOTICE: of Non-Compliance with Special Order 109: that Thomas A. Zaccaro is in violation of Special Order 109. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register for the Courts Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Courts website www.nvd.uscourts.gov, then select CM/ECF Info, to register the Attorney(s).(no image attached) (RFJ) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION re 120 Scheduling Order; filed by Counter Claimants Aruze USA, Inc., Universal Entertainment Corporation. (Privette, Howard) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 114 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Linda Chatman Thomsen for Aruze USA, Inc and Universal Entertainment Corporation and approving Designation of Attorney Charles H. McCrea Jr as Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/27/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 113 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul Spagnoletti for Aruze USA, Inc and Universal Entertainment Corporation and approving Designation of Attorney Charles H. McCrea Jr as Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/27/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 116 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jami Johnson for Aruze USA, Inc and Universal Entertainment Corporation and approving Designation of Attorney Charles H. McCrea Jr as Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/27/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 112 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gina Cora for Aruze USA, Inc and Universal Entertainment Corporation and approving Designation of Attorney Charles H. McCrea Jr as Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/27/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 115 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Greg D Andres for Aruze USA, Inc and Universal Entertainment Corporation and approving Designation of Attorney Charles H. McCrea Jr as Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/27/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 12/11/2012. Motions due by 1/10/2013. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/11/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/18/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re 105 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Counter Claimants Aruze USA, Inc., Universal Entertainment Corporation, Defendants Aruze USA, Inc., Universal Entertainment Corporation. (Privette, Howard) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 112 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Gina Cora and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Charles H. McCrea, Jr. (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2444310) filed by Defendant Aruze USA, Inc. VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Gina Cora and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Charles H. McCrea, Jr. (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2444310) filed by Defendant Aruze USA, Inc. by Defendant Aruze USA, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached). (McCrea, Jr., Charles) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
REPLY BRIEF WYNN RESORTS, LIMITED'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF 107 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1447 AND LR 54-16 re 102 Order, by Counter Defendants Linda Chen, Russell Goldsmith, Ray R Irani, Robert J. Miller, John A Moran, Marc D Schorr, Alvin V Shoemaker, Kimmarie Sinatra, D Boone Wayson, Allan Zeman, Plaintiff Wynn Resorts, Limited. (Pisanelli, James) Docket entry relationship modified on 7/19/2012 (SRK). (Entered: 07/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jami Johnson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Charles H. McCrea, Jr. (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2444454) filed by Defendant Aruze USA, Inc.. Motion ripe 7/16/2012. (McCrea, Jr., Charles) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Greg D. Andres and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Charles H. McCrea, Jr. (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2444445) filed by Defendant Aruze USA, Inc.. Motion ripe 7/16/2012. (McCrea, Jr., Charles) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Linda Chatman Thomsen and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Charles H. McCrea, Jr. (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2444380) filed by Defendant Aruze USA, Inc.. Motion ripe 7/16/2012. (McCrea, Jr., Charles) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Paul Spagnoletti and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Charles H. McCrea, Jr. (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2444356) filed by Defendant Aruze USA, Inc.. Motion ripe 7/16/2012. (McCrea, Jr., Charles) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Gina Cora and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Charles H. McCrea, Jr. (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2444310) filed by Defendant Aruze USA, Inc.. Motion ripe 7/16/2012. (McCrea, Jr., Charles) Modified to add corrected image on 7/17/2012 (MAJ). (Entered: 07/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING 109 Stipulation to Extend Time for Azure USA Inc to Respond to Elaine P. Wynn's Counterclaim. Azure USA Inc shall not be required to respond to Elaine P. Wynn's Counterlcaim/Crossclaim while the case is still pending in this Court prior to remand to Nevada state court. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/12/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None
Supplemental BRIEF re 107 Supplement, ; filed by Counter Claimants Aruze USA, Inc., Universal Entertainment Corporation, Defendants Aruze USA, Inc., Universal Entertainment Corporation. (Privette, Howard) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re 98 Answer to Counterclaim, Crossclaim, ; by Counter Defendant Aruze USA, Inc.. (Privette, Howard) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 106 Notice (Other) ; WYNN PARTIES' RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE FEDERAL SECURITIES CLAIMS filed by Counter Defendants Linda Chen, Russell Goldsmith, Ray R Irani, Robert J. Miller, John A Moran, Marc D Schorr, Alvin V Shoemaker, Kimmarie Sinatra, D Boone Wayson, Stephen A Wynn, Allan Zeman, Plaintiff Wynn Resorts, Limited. (Pisanelli, James) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENT to 102 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ; WYNN RESORTS, LIMITED'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1447 AND LR 54-16 by Plaintiff Wynn Resorts, Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Pisanelli, James) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Intent filed by Counter Claimant Aruze USA, Inc.. (Privette, Howard) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss re: 95 Amended COUNTERCLAIM; filed by Counter Defendants Linda Chen, Russell Goldsmith, Ray R Irani, Robert J. Miller, John A Moran, Marc D Schorr, Alvin V Shoemaker, Kimmarie Sinatra, D Boone Wayson, Elaine P Wynn, Stephen A Wynn, Wynn Resorts, Limited, Allan Zeman. Responses due by 7/19/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Pisanelli, James) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
NON-OPPOSITION to 103 MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/nondispositive matter (First Request) re 98 Answer to Counterclaim, Crossclaim, ; filed by Counter Claimant Elaine P Wynn, Cross Claimant Elaine P Wynn. (Little, Martin) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/nondispositive matter (First Request) re 98 Answer to Counterclaim, Crossclaim, by Cross Defendant Stephen A Wynn. Motion ripe 6/28/2012. (Williams, J.) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 6/21/2012 before Judge Larry R. Hicks. Crtrm Administrator: Dionna Negrete; Pla Counsel: Paul Rowe, James Pisanelli and Bradley Wilson for Wynn Resorts; Donald J. Campbell for Stephen A. Wynn; Jeffrey Wu and William R. Urga for Elaine P. Wynne; Robert Shapiro for Wynn Resorts, Ltd. and Kim Sinatra, General Counsel for Wynne Resorts, Ltd.; Def Counsel: Howard Privette, Charles McCrea, Samuel L. Lionel, Greg Andres, and John Durrant for Aruze USA, Inc. and Universal Entertainment Corporation; Court Reporter/FTR #: Donna Davidson; Time of Hearing: 2:05 - 3:02 p.m.; Courtroom: 6C; Counsel present their respective arguments as to plaintiff's Motion to Remand 43 , and counter claimants Motion for Preliminary Injunction 96 . IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion to Remand 43 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall submit briefing regarding an award of attorney fees pursuant to local rules within two weeks, by Thursday, July 5, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants/counter claimants may submit briefing to seek severance of counterclaims in federal court, by Thursday, July 5, 2012. Responses will be due by Thursday, July 12, 2012, and replies shall be filed within four days, by Monday, July 16, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' Motion for Preliminary Injunction 96 is DENIED as moot. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DBN) Modified on 6/26/2012 to correct filing date (DBN). Modified on 6/26/2012 (DBN). (Entered: 06/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/nondispositive matter (First Request) to Respond to 95 Amended Counterclaim , by Counter Defendants Linda Chen, Russell Goldsmith, Ray R Irani, Robert J. Miller, John A Moran, Marc D Schorr, Alvin V Shoemaker, Kimmarie Sinatra, D Boone Wayson, Elaine P Wynn, Stephen A Wynn, Wynn Resorts, Limited, Allan Zeman. Motion ripe 6/25/2012. (Pisanelli, James) . (Entered: 06/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, Motion to Remand, held on 6/21/12, before Judge Larry R. Hicks. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Donna Davidson, 775-329-0132. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website www.nvd.uscourts.gov before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 7/16/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/26/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2012. (DD) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 99 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Donald J. Campbell on behalf of Counter Defendants Stephen A Wynn, Stephen A Wynn, Cross Defendant Stephen A Wynn. (Campbell, Donald) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
Elaine P. Wynn's ANSWER to 95 Counterclaim,, CROSSCLAIM against Stephen A Wynn, COUNTERCLAIM against Aruze USA, Inc. filed by Elaine P Wynn.(Urga, William) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 97 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: 6/14/2012 Declaration
DECLARATION of Howard M. Privette re 96 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; filed by Counter Claimants Aruze USA, Inc., Universal Entertainment Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S)(Privette, Howard) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
LREF
Blank 96 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: 6/14/2012 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Counter Claimants Aruze USA, Inc., Universal Entertainment Corporation. Responses due by 7/1/2012. (Privette, Howard) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
LREF
Blank 95 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: 6/14/2012 Counterclaim
Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Linda Chen, Russell Goldsmith, Ray R Irani, Robert J. Miller, John A Moran, Marc D Schorr, Alvin V Shoemaker, Kimmarie Sinatra, D Boone Wayson, Elaine P Wynn, Stephen A Wynn, Wynn Resorts, Limited, Allan Zeman, filed by Aruze USA, Inc., Universal Entertainment Corporation. (Privette, Howard) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: 6/14/2012 Minute Order Setting HearingCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks, on 6/14/2012. By Deputy Clerk: Dionna Negrete. IT IS ORDERED that a hearing for presentation of oral argument regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand 43 , is scheduled on Thursday, 6/21/12 at 2:00 p.m. in Las Vegas Courtroom 6C before Judge Larry R. Hicks. Counsel have been notified of and are in agreement with the date and time. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DBN) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: 6/8/2012 ~Notice (other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: 6/8/2012 Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: 6/7/2012 Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: 6/6/2012 Verified Petition
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: 5/23/2012 Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: 5/23/2012 Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: 5/22/2012 Notice of Corrected Image/Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: 5/22/2012 Notice of Corrected Image/Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: 5/22/2012 Notice of Corrected Image/Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: 5/21/2012 Verified Petition
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: 5/21/2012 Verified Petition
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: 5/21/2012 Joinder
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: 5/21/2012 Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: 5/9/2012 Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: 5/9/2012 Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: 5/9/2012 Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: 5/9/2012 Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012 Order on Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: 4/27/2012 Verified Petition
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/26/2012 Verified Petition
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/26/2012 Verified Petition
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/26/2012 Verified Petition
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: 4/23/2012 Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: 4/16/2012 Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: 4/16/2012 Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: 4/16/2012 Status Report in Removal Case
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: 4/12/2012 Certificate of Interested Parties
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: 4/12/2012 Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: 4/11/2012 Acceptance of Service
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: 4/10/2012 Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: 4/9/2012 Verified Petition
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: 4/4/2012 Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: 4/4/2012 Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: 4/4/2012 Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: 4/4/2012 Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: 4/4/2012 Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: 4/3/2012 Acceptance of Service
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: 4/3/2012 Acceptance of Service
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: 4/3/2012 Acceptance of Service
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: 4/3/2012 Acceptance of Service
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: 4/3/2012 Acceptance of Service
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: 4/3/2012 Acceptance of Service
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: 4/3/2012 Acceptance of Service
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: 4/3/2012 Acceptance of Service
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: 4/3/2012 Acceptance of Service
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: 4/3/2012 Acceptance of Service
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: 3/30/2012 Order on Motion to Extend Time/Shorten Time regarding Dispositive matter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: 3/30/2012 Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: 3/30/2012 Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: 3/29/2012 Motion to Extend Time/Shorten Time regarding Dispositive matter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: 3/29/2012 Motion to Remand to State Court
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 42 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: 3/29/2012 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER that Plaintiff shall file its Certificate as to Interested Parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than 4:00 p.m., April 11, 2012. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/28/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: 3/28/2012 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: 3/28/2012 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: 3/28/2012 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: 3/28/2012 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: 3/28/2012 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: 3/27/2012 Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: 3/21/2012 Waiver of Service Executed
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: 3/21/2012 Certificate of Interested Parties
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: 3/15/2012 Summons Issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: 3/14/2012 Proposed Summons to be issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: 3/14/2012 Proposed Summons to be issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: 3/14/2012 Proposed Summons to be issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: 3/14/2012 Proposed Summons to be issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: 3/14/2012 Proposed Summons to be issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: 3/14/2012 Proposed Summons to be issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: 3/14/2012 Proposed Summons to be issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: 3/14/2012 Proposed Summons to be issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: 3/14/2012 Proposed Summons to be issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: 3/14/2012 Proposed Summons to be issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: 3/14/2012 Proposed Summons to be issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: 3/14/2012 Proposed Summons to be issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: 3/14/2012 Notice: Attorney Action Required
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: 3/13/2012 Proposed Summons to be issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: 3/13/2012 Proposed Summons to be issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: 3/13/2012 Proposed Summons to be issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: 3/13/2012 Proposed Summons to be issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: 3/13/2012 Proposed Summons to be issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: 3/13/2012 Proposed Summons to be issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: 3/13/2012 Proposed Summons to be issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: 3/13/2012 Proposed Summons to be issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: 3/13/2012 Proposed Summons to be issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: 3/13/2012 Proposed Summons to be issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: 3/13/2012 Proposed Summons to be issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: 3/13/2012 Proposed Summons to be issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: 3/12/2012 Certificate Of Service.
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: 3/12/2012 Certificate Of Service.
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: 3/12/2012 Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: 3/12/2012 Notice for Desig of Local Counsel & VP
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: 3/12/2012 Minute Order re Removal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: 3/12/2012 Notice re AO 85 Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: 3/12/2012 Petition for Removal
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 352 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?