Anderson v. The City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-05363
Magistrate Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 1, 2017 at 4:57 PM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Marvin Anderson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Chukwuka Ofodile +1 718 852 8300 +1 718 852 7361 acofodile@aol.com
v.
No Logo James Petronella, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kimberly Dorothy Conway +1 212 788 0865 +1 212 788 0877 kconway@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Michael Pollack +1 212 788 1894 dpollack@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine Alice Macfarlane +1 212 788 1001 +1 212 788 9776 kmacfarl@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Police Officers John Doe #1, 2, and 3, Defendant
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kimberly Dorothy Conway +1 212 788 0865 +1 212 788 0877 kconway@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Michael Pollack +1 212 788 1894 dpollack@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine Alice Macfarlane +1 212 788 1001 +1 212 788 9776 kmacfarl@law.nyc.gov
No Logo William Larkin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kimberly Dorothy Conway +1 212 788 0865 +1 212 788 0877 kconway@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Michael Pollack +1 212 788 1894 dpollack@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine Alice Macfarlane +1 212 788 1001 +1 212 788 9776 kmacfarl@law.nyc.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (114) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Jury Verdict
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Witness List
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Transcript
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Letter
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Order(Other)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/10/2016, Entered: None Letter
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Letter
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Jury Selection
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Proposed Voir Dire
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Reply in Support
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Proposed Voir Dire
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None Reply in Support
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None In Limine
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None In Limine
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Pretrial Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Second MOTION to Adjourn Conference /Trial by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 81 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER denying 77 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by Visiting Judge VJ-Bernard A. Friedman on 9/27/2012. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  REPLY in Support re 77 MOTION for Reconsideration re 63 Order on Motion for Reconsideration filed by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York. (MacFarlane, Katherine) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 77 MOTION for Reconsideration re 63 Order on Motion for Reconsideration filed by Marvin Anderson. (Ofodile, Anthony) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 77 MOTION for Reconsideration re 63 Order on Motion for Reconsideration filed by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York. (MacFarlane, Katherine) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        MOTION for Reconsideration re 63 Order on Motion for Reconsideration by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York. (MacFarlane, Katherine) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER: Defendant City of New York shall file a motion for reconsideration of its motion for summary judgment dated December 9, 2010 by August 13, 2012. Plaintiff shall file a response no later than September 17, 2012. Trial date will be tentatively scheduled for the week of October 29. 2012. Ordered by Visiting Judge VJ-Bernard A. Friedman on 7/30/2012. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Visiting Judge VJ-Bernard A. Friedman:Settlement Conference held on 7/30/2012. Defendant to file their motion for reconsideration by 8/13/2012; response due 9/17/12. Court will rule on the papers.Trial will take place the first week of November. The court will issue a scheduling order. (Klein, Vivian) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Letter re: Adjournment of Trial Date, In Limine Deadline by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York (MacFarlane, Katherine) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Alice Macfarlane on behalf of William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Macfarlane, Katherine) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  MINUTE ENTRY for settlement conference held on 5/22/12 before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky: Settlement demand and offer exchanged; discussions held; settlement not reached. Parties are aware of the pretrial conference scheduled before Visiting Judge Friedman as well as the ensuring trial schedule. (Newton, Joan) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    Scheduling Order: Final pretrial/settlement conference scheduled for July 30, 2012 at the following times: 05-CV-3133, Snoussi vs. Bivona at 12:30 PM, 06-CV-5363, Anderson v. City of New York at 1:30PM, 08-CV-5156, Schwartz vs. Caravan Trucking at 2:30 PM, 10 CV 2229, Poslednik v. City of New York at 3:30 PM and 10 CV 4229, Diaz vs. Seamen's Society at 4:30 PM. Counsel must bring their clicnts with them to this conference. The cases which are not resolved prior to or at the final pretrial conference will be tried in the order indicated above. Jury selection will commence Tuesday, July 31, 2012, at 9:00a.m. Ordered by Visiting Judge VJ-Bernard A. Friedman on 5/2/2012. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto. (Brucella, Michelle) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Letter regarding agreed upon trial week by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York (Pollack, David) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          MINUTE ENTRY for Pretrial Conference held on 2/24/12 before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky: See annexed calendar minutes for details. (Newton, Joan) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Joint Pre-Trial Order and Motion for an Adjournment of the pre-trial conference by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York. (Conway, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              MINUTE ENTRY for telephone status conference held on 12/8/11 before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky: A joint pretrial order is due according to the attached schedule. The next conference will be held in person on February 17, 2012 at 12:00 noon. See annexed conference calendar minutes for details. (Newton, Joan) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                STATUS REPORT in Response to the Court's Order dated October 31, 2011 by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York (Conway, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Conway on behalf of William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Conway, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER denying 59 Motion for Reconsideration. For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, defendants' motion for reconsideration is denied. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 10/31/2011. (Chang, Emily) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      MINUTE ENTRY for telephone status conference held on 10/28/11 before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky: The defendants have moved for reconsideration of the courts recent decision regarding summary judgment, and the motion is now fully briefed. Once the motion is decided the court will promptly schedule the preparation of a pretrial order and a settlement conference. The next conference is adjourned sine die. Counsel shall advise the magistrate judge promptly after decision on the pending motion is entered to enable the scheduling of final pretrial proceedings as set forth above. (Newton, Joan) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 59 MOTION for Reconsideration re 57 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Marvin Anderson. (Ofodile, Anthony) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 59 MOTION for Reconsideration re 57 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            MOTION for Reconsideration re 57 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              MINUTE ENTRY for Telephone Conference held on 9/28/11 before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky: As the defendants intend to move for reconsideration of the courts recent decision regarding summary judgment, further settlement discussions at this point would be pointless. The next conference will be held by telephone on October 28, 2011 at 3:00 p.m., to be initiated by counsel for the plaintiff (Chambers: 718-613-2400). (Newton, Joan) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM and ORDER. For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 9/20/2011. (Chang, Emily) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  REPLY in Support re 47 Fully Briefed MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment and in Response to Plaintiff's Opposition filed by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 52 Response in Opposition to Motion, by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response in Support of Defendants' Summary Judgment motion, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 53 Response in Opposition to Motion, in opposition by plaintiff by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 47 Fully Briefed MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment Marvin Anderson's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Marvin Anderson. (Ofodile, Anthony) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 47 Fully Briefed MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Marvin Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Opposition Affidavit of Marvin Anderson in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Affidavit Affirmation of Anthony Ofodile in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Affirmation of Anthony Ofodile) (Ofodile, Anthony) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 47 Fully Briefed MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Court Docket, # 2 Exhibit B-Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C-Larkin Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit E-Petronella Affidavit, # 5 Exhibit F-Queens County Criminal Court Complaint, # 6 Exhibit G-Aided Report, # 7 Exhibit H-Order of Protection, # 8 Exhibit I-Criminal Court Docket, # 9 Exhibit J-Court Certficate of Disposition, # 10 Exhibit K- Notice of Claim) (Pollack, David) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              First MOTION for Reconsideration of 12/9/2010 Order Allowing Defendants to Submit their Motion as Unopposed by Marvin Anderson. (Ofodile, Anthony) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                RULE 56.1 STATEMENT re 47 Fully Briefed MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 47 Fully Briefed MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment Memorandum of Law filed by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 59 Motion for Reconsideration. For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, defendants' motion for reconsideration is denied. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 10/31/2011. (Chang, Emily)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Fully Briefed MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 57 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM and ORDER. For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 9/20/2011. (Chang, Emily)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Letter MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment as Fully Briefed by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgement by Marvin Anderson. (Ofodile, Anthony) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 41 Notice of MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Court Docket, # 2 Exhibit B-Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C-Affdavit of William Larkin, # 4 Exhibit E-Affidavit of James Petronella, # 5 Exhibit F-Queens County Crim Ct Complaint, # 6 Exhibit G-Aided report, # 7 Exhibit H-Order of Protection, # 8 Exhibit I-Queens County Crim Ct Docket, # 9 Exhibit J-Quenns Crim Ct Dispo, # 10 Exhibit K- Notice of Claim) (Pollack, David) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                RULE 56.1 STATEMENT re 41 Notice of MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 41 Notice of MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Notice of MOTION for Summary Judgment by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York. Responses due by 8/31/2010 (Pollack, David) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgement by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgement Motion by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Further Explore Settlement Opportunities before Motion for Summary Judgment by Marvin Anderson. (Ofodile, Anthony) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File summary Judgment by one week by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky: Settlement Conference held on 3/22/2010. See annexed conference minutes for details. (Newton, Joan) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Letter In Response to Defendants' Request to File a Motion for Summary Judgment by Marvin Anderson (Ofodile, Anthony) (Entered: 01/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky: Settlement Conference held on 1/26/2010. See annexed conference minutes for details. (Newton, Joan) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference set for January 8, 2010 by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying application to "so order" subpoenas. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky on 11/6/2009. (Pohorelsky, Viktor) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER entered with respect to discovery and other pretrial proceedings. (Attachment) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky on 10/30/2009. (Newton, Joan) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky: Telephone Conference held on 10/30/2009. See annexed conference calendar for details. (Newton, Joan) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by William Larkin, James Petronella, The City of New York. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr: Status/Telephone Conference held on 7/24/2009. Parties report adequate progress in completing discovery and should have no problem meeting the 10/24/09 factual discovery deadline. After a brief discussion regarding the plaintiff's pending federal criminal case, Magistrate Judge Carter recuses himself from this civil action. This case will be reassigned to Magistrate Judge Pohorelsky. (Brucella, Michelle) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendants ANSWER to 18 Amended Complaint by the City of New York and by William Larkin, James Petronella. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky:Scheduling Conference held on 4/24/2009. Scheduling order entered setting dates for discovery and other pretrial proceedings. (Newton, Joan) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky:Status and Scheduling Conference held on 2/26/09. See annexed order for details. (Newton, Joan) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marvin Anderson. William Larkin served on 3/17/2009, answer due 4/6/2009. (Ofodile, Anthony) (Entered: 03/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Petronella, William Larkin, Marvin Anderson. James Petronella served on 3/17/2009, answer due 4/6/2009. (Ofodile, Anthony) (Entered: 03/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT pursuant to Judge Pohorelsky's Order against all defendants, filed by Marvin Anderson. (Ofodile, Anthony) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter by Defendant New York City in response to the January 16, 2009 Order of the Court by The City of New York (Pollack, David) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky:Status and Scheduling Conference held on 1/16/2009. See annexed conference calendar for details. (Newton, Joan) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky:Status and Scheduling Conference held on 1/16/2009. See annexed conference calendar for details. (Newton, Joan) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky:Initial Scheduling Conference held on 12/3/2008. See annexed conference calendar for details. (Newton, Joan) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            First Appear by Telephone for conference set for December 3, 2008 at 10:00 AM by The City of New York. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 12/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by The City of New York. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER entered setting dates for initial conference and deadline for automatic disclosures. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky on 10/6/08. (Newton, Joan) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by The City of New York (Pollack, David) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint by The City of New York. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting the 6 Motion to Stay. Case stayed until 5/18/2007. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano, on 4/16/2007. (Endorsed on letter dated 4/13/2007 from David M. Pollack to USDJ Vitaliano) (Barrett, C) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT and Request for Continuation of Stay by The City of New York (Pollack, David) (Entered: 04/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental MOTION to Stay re 5 Order, for continuation of stay previously imposed by the Court by The City of New York. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER The court STAYS this matter until Feb. 26,2007. By that date the City should either answer the complaint or submit formal motion papers explaining why a further stay is warranted.. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 11/13/06. (Jackson, Ramona) (Entered: 11/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Support re 2 First MOTION to Stay Case pending conclusion of criminal court prosecution and in reply to plaintiff's opposition filed by The City of New York. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 11/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 2 First MOTION to Stay Case pending conclusion of criminal court prosecution filed by Marvin Anderson. (Ofodile, Anthony) (Entered: 11/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  First MOTION to Stay Case pending conclusion of criminal court prosecution by The City of New York. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 10/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against The City of New York, John Doe #1, 2, and 3 $ 350, filed by Marvin Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tzou, Ilene) (Entered: 10/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 104 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?