Sulehria v. The City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-04072
District Judge Sidney H. Stein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Iqbal Naz Sulehria, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Alan Vengersky, Defendant
No Logo Alethia Cicero, Defendant
No Logo Anita Sandoval, Defendant
No Logo Arthur Harris, Defendant
No Logo Bruce Richardson, Defendant
No Logo CWA 1180 AFL-CIO, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Atul Talwar +1 212 419 1550 +1 212 419 1555 atalwar@cwa-union.org
No Logo Cyril Dolly, Defendant
No Logo Danielle Stringer, Defendant
No Logo E. Lisa Forte, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Firm Of Joel Spivak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joel Spivak +1 516 829 3939 +1 516 829 3946 joel@joelspivaklaw.com
No Logo Edwin M Knight, Defendant
No Logo Ernest Omorogbe, Defendant
No Logo Frank Squillante, Defendant
No Logo John/Jane Does 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Calderon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Atul Talwar +1 212 419 1550 +1 212 419 1555 atalwar@cwa-union.org
No Logo Karen A. Powell, Defendant
No Logo Kimberly Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Larry J. Triplett, Defendant
No Logo Linda Murdaugh, Defendant
No Logo Luis R. Burgos, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Grossberg +1 212 442 0144 +1 212 788 8877 agrossbe@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Martin F. Horn, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Grossberg +1 212 442 0144 +1 212 788 8877 agrossbe@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Mava Burnett, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael R. Bloomberg"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Grossberg +1 212 442 0144 +1 212 788 8877 agrossbe@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Michelle Bacon, Defendant
No Logo Mirkin & Gordon, PC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Firm Of Joel Spivak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joel Spivak +1 516 829 3939 +1 516 829 3946 joel@joelspivaklaw.com
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Advocate for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Grossberg +1 212 442 0144 +1 212 788 8877 agrossbe@law.nyc.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (59) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: Defts are to serve and file their answer to the amended complaint by 7/16/2007; All Fact Discovery due by 11/30/2007. Plt to designate his expert witnesses and provide the informatin required under FRCP 26(a)(2)(B) by 12/14/2007. Defts to provide the equivalent information by 12/31/2007. All remaining expert witness discovery is to be completed by 1/11/2008. Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/31/2008. [Original filed in 05cv4486 doc. no.80] (Signed by Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 5/29/2007) (jar) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
    STIPULATION AND ORDER that this action is discontinued, with prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/22/07) (dle) (Entered: 03/26/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER that Magistrate Judge Dolinger's "Report and Recommendation" is adopted by this court and the above dfts' motions to dismiss (27,28,51) are granted on consent. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/16/07) (dle) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, we recommend that their motions be granted on consent re: 28 MOTION to Dismiss. filed by E. Lisa Forte, 51 MOTION to Dismiss. filed by CWA 1180 AFL-CIO, Joseph Calderon Objections to R&R due by 4/2/2007 (Signed by Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 3/14/07) copies sent by chambers.(cd) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Anthony. Morelli on behalf of Iqbal Naz Sulehria. (jar) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None
            AFFIRMATION in Opposition re: 51 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Iqbal Naz Sulehria. (jco, ) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None
              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 51 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by CWA 1180 AFL-CIO, Joseph Calderon. (jco, ) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None
                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 51 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by CWA 1180 AFL-CIO, Joseph Calderon. (jco, ) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None
                  MOTION for an order, pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) dismissing the Complaint in this action against these defendants, on the grounds that (a) the complaint fails to state a claim against them upon which relief can be granted; and (b) the claims against them arose more than four months prior to the filing of the complaint and therefore are barred by the applicable statute of limitations. Document filed by CWA 1180 AFL-CIO, Joseph Calderon. (jco, ) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Michael H. Dolinger from Amy Grossberg dated 8/31/06 re: a request that the City defendants' time to respond to the pro se complaint in this matter be held in abeyance until the Court decides the pending motion to dismiss in case 05cv4486. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Defendant's time to respond to the complaint will be held in abeyance pending he resolution of the dismissal motion in Sulehria v. NYC 05cv4486. (Signed by Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 9/1/06) (kco, ) (Entered: 09/07/2006)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: None
                      MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,, served. The City of New York served on 8/14/2006, answer due 9/4/2006. Service was accepted by J. Pinn. Document filed by Iqbal Naz Sulehria. (pl, ) (Entered: 08/31/2006)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: None
                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Motion to dismiss with supporting papers served on Corporation Counsel, and Semel, Young & Norum on 8/22/2006. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by E. Lisa Forte, Mirkin and Gordon P.C. (lb, ) (Entered: 08/31/2006)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Amy S. Young dated 8/15/2006 re: to request an extension of time to file reply papers in the pending Motion to Dismiss in the above-reference matter. Replies due by 9/5/2006. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted Reply papers are to be served and filed by Sept. 5, 2006. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/18/2006) (jmi, ) (Entered: 08/23/2006)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: None
                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amy Grossberg on behalf of The City of New York, Michael R. Bloomberg, Martin F. Horn, Luis R. Burgos, Jr (jmi, ) (Entered: 08/23/2006)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for dispositive motion. Referred to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/16/06) (cd, ) (Entered: 08/22/2006)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None
                                AFFIRMATION of Iqbal Naz Sulehria in Opposition re: 28 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Iqbal Naz Sulehria. (djc, ) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None
                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 28 MOTION to Dismiss; and in response to Plaintiff's Motion and Affirmation in Opposition. Document filed by E. Lisa Forte and MIrkin & Gordon. (djc, ) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None
                                    MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Edwin M Knight served on 6/22/2006, answer due 7/12/2006. Service was accepted by Capt. Riddick. Document filed by Iqbal Naz Sulehria. (jmi, ) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None
                                      MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Frank Squillante served on 6/22/2006, answer due 7/12/2006. Service was accepted by R. Lopez. Document filed by Iqbal Naz Sulehria. (jmi, ) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None
                                        MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Cyril Dolly served on 6/22/2006, answer due 7/12/2006. Service was accepted by Capt. Burnett. Document filed by Iqbal Naz Sulehria. (jmi, ) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None
                                          MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Linda Murdaugh served on 6/22/2006, answer due 7/12/2006. Service was accepted by Capt Burnett. Document filed by Iqbal Naz Sulehria. (jmi, ) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None
                                            MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Mava Burnett served on 6/22/2006, answer due 7/12/2006. Service was accepted by Capt Burnett. Document filed by Iqbal Naz Sulehria. (jmi, ) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None
                                              MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Bruce Richardson served on 6/22/2006, answer due 7/12/2006. Service was accepted by Capt. Small. Document filed by Iqbal Naz Sulehria. (jmi, ) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Kimberly Johnson served on 6/22/2006, answer due 7/12/2006. Service was accepted by Capt. Small. Document filed by Iqbal Naz Sulehria. (jmi, ) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                  MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Karen A. Powell served on 6/22/2006, answer due 7/12/2006. Service was accepted by E. Hewitt. Document filed by Iqbal Naz Sulehria. (jmi, ) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                    MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Larry J. Triplett served on 6/22/2006, answer due 7/12/2006. Service was accepted by E. Hewitt. Document filed by Iqbal Naz Sulehria. (jmi, ) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                      MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Danielle Stringer served on 8/14/2006, answer due 9/4/2006. Service was accepted by Esther Hewitt, Office Machineaide. Document filed by Iqbal Naz Sulehria. (jmi, ) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                        MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. The City of New York served on 6/23/2006, answer due 7/13/2006. Service was accepted by Martin Cater Business man. Document filed by Iqbal Naz Sulehria. (jmi, ) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joel Spivak on behalf of E. Lisa Forte, Mirkin and Gordon P.C. (jmi, ) (Entered: 08/09/2006)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                            RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by E. Lisa Forte.(jmi, ) (Entered: 08/09/2006)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 28 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by E. Lisa Forte. (jmi, ) (Entered: 08/09/2006)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint in this action against these Defendants, on the grounds that (a) Defendants Forte and M&G as attorneys are immune from liability; (b) the Complaint fails to sate a claim against them upon which relief can be granted; and (c) the claims against them arose more than four months prior to the filing of the compalint and therefore are barred by the applicable Statute of Limitations. Document filed by E. Lisa Forte. (jmi, ) (Entered: 08/09/2006)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION for an order denying defendants namely E. Lisa Forte's and Mirkin and Gordon P.C.'s Motion to Dismiss dated 7/27/2006. Document filed by Iqbal Naz Sulehria. (jar, ) (Entered: 08/09/2006)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support Defendants CWA 1180 AFL-CIO and Joseph Calderon motion to dismiss. Document filed by CWA 1180 AFL-CIO, Joseph Calderon. (jmi, ) (Entered: 08/09/2006)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                      MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Joseph Calderon served on 7/14/2006, answer due 8/3/2006. Service was made by mail. (jar, ) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                        MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. E. Lisa Forte served on 6/21/2006, answer due 7/11/2006. Service was made by mail. (jar, ) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                          MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Michael R. Bloomberg served on 7/7/2006, answer due 7/27/2006. Service was made by mail. (jar, ) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                            MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Arthur Harris served on 6/23/2006, answer due 7/13/2006. Service was made by mail. (jar, ) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                              MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Martin F. Horn served on 6/23/2006, answer due 7/13/2006. Service was made by mail. (jar, ) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Anita Sandoval served on 6/23/2006, answer due 7/13/2006. Service was made by mail. (jar, ) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                  MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Luis R. Burgos, Jr served on 6/26/2006, answer due 7/17/2006. Service was made by mail. (jar, ) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                    MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. CWA 1180 AFL-CIO served on 7/14/2006, answer due 8/3/2006. Service was made by mail. (jar, ) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                      MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Alan Vengersky served on 6/23/2006, answer due 7/13/2006. Service was made by mail. (jar, ) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                        MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Mirkin and Gordon P.C. served on 7/11/2006, answer due 7/31/2006. Service was made by mail. (jar, ) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                          FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion, Attorney's Affirmation, Memorandum of Law, Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, Notice of Appearance served on Plaintiff on July 28, 2006. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Mirkin and Gordon P.C.. (Spivak, Joel) Modified on 7/31/2006 (kg, ). (Entered: 07/28/2006)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                            FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion, Attorney's Affirmation, Memorandum of Law, Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, Notice of Appearance served on Plaintiff on July 28, 2006. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by E. Lisa Forte. (Spivak, Joel) Modified on 7/31/2006 (kg, ). (Entered: 07/28/2006)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                              FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by Mirkin and Gordon P.C..(Spivak, Joel) Modified on 7/31/2006 (kg, ). (Entered: 07/28/2006)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by E. Lisa Forte.(Spivak, Joel) Modified on 7/31/2006 (kg, ). (Entered: 07/28/2006)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 9 MOTION to Dismiss., 8 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Mirkin and Gordon P.C.. (Spivak, Joel) Modified on 7/31/2006 (kg, ). (Entered: 07/28/2006)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 9 MOTION to Dismiss., 8 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by E. Lisa Forte. (Spivak, Joel) Modified on 7/31/2006 (kg, ). (Entered: 07/28/2006)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by E. Lisa Forte and Mirkin & Gordon P.C. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Joel Spivak, Esq.)(Spivak, Joel) Modified on 7/31/2006 (kg, ). Modified on 7/31/2006 (kg, ). (Entered: 07/28/2006)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by E. Lisa Forte and Mirkin & Gordon, P.C. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Joel Spivak, Esq.)(Spivak, Joel) Modified on 7/31/2006 (kg). Modified on 7/31/2006 (kg, ). (Entered: 07/28/2006)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joel Spivak on behalf of Mirkin and Gordon P.C. (Spivak, Joel) Modified on 7/31/2006 (kg, ). (Entered: 07/28/2006)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joel Spivak on behalf of E. Lisa Forte (Spivak, Joel) Modified on 7/31/2006 (kg). (Entered: 07/28/2006)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Michael H. Dolinger from Iqbal Sulehria dated 7/10/06 ENDORSEMENT: Defendant's counsel has already provided a service address for defendant Bacon and will do the equivalent for defendant Cicero in the next few days. No further relay is warranted. (Signed by Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 7/19/06) (kco, ) (Entered: 07/21/2006)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Michael H. Dolinger from Amy Grossberg dated 7/19/06 ENDORSEMENT: The deadline for the defendants to respond to her complaint is extended to 8/31/2006. In the event that her pending motion to dismiss in a related suit by plaintiff remains pending then, defendants may apply for additional time. (Signed by Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 7/19/06) (kco, ) (Entered: 07/21/2006)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 6/12/06) (js, ) (Entered: 06/13/2006)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Arthur Harris, Karen A. Powell, Larry J. Triplett, Danielle Stringer, Frank Squillante, Cyril Dolly, Edwin M Knight, Linda Murdaugh, Mava Burnett, Ernest Omorogbe, Bruce Richardson, Alethia Cicero, Kimberly Johnson, CWA 1180 AFL-CIO, Joseph Calderon, E. Lisa Forte, Mirkin and Gordon P.C., John/Jane Does 1-10, The City of New York, Michael R. Bloomberg, Martin F. Horn, Luis R. Burgos, Jr, Anita Sandoval, Michelle Bacon, Alan Vengersky. Document filed by Iqbal Naz Sulehria.(jbe, ) (Entered: 06/02/2006)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. (jbe, ) (Entered: 06/02/2006)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 400 times.

                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?