Hedges v. Obama
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00331
District Judge Katherine B. Forrest, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 11, 2018 at 5:33 AM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Christopher Hedges, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carl J. Mayer +1 212 382 4686 +1 212 382 4687

Toggle Switch Represented by Appeal for Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David H. Remes +1 202 669 6508

Toggle Switch Represented by Bruce Afran, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space BRUCE IRA AFRAN +1 609 924 2075 +1 609 924 1045 bruceafran@aol.com
v.
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Defendant
Officially listed as "Barak Obama"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher Blake Harwood +1 202 307 0372 +1 212 637 2786 christopher.harwood@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin H. Torrance +1 212 637 2703 +1 212 637 2702 benjamin.torrance@usdoj.gov
No Logo Leon Panetta, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher Blake Harwood +1 202 307 0372 +1 212 637 2786 christopher.harwood@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin H. Torrance +1 212 637 2703 +1 212 637 2702 benjamin.torrance@usdoj.gov
No Logo Bill of Rights Defense Committee, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Freidman, Harfenist, Langer & Kraut (LIs)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jay Harfenist +1 516 775 5800 +1 516 775 4082 sharfenist@friedharf.com
No Logo Bob Avakian, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Stone & Associates, Ltd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jed H. Stone +1 847 336 7888 +1 847 336 0733 jstone@jedstone.com
No Logo Bob Marshall, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Freidman, Harfenist, Langer & Kraut (LIs)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jay Harfenist +1 516 775 5800 +1 516 775 4082 sharfenist@friedharf.com
No Logo Center for Media and Democracy, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Freidman, Harfenist, Langer & Kraut (LIs)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jay Harfenist +1 516 775 5800 +1 516 775 4082 sharfenist@friedharf.com
No Logo Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Freidman, Harfenist, Langer & Kraut (LIs)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jay Harfenist +1 516 775 5800 +1 516 775 4082 sharfenist@friedharf.com
No Logo Constitution Party National Committee, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Freidman, Harfenist, Langer & Kraut (LIs)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jay Harfenist +1 516 775 5800 +1 516 775 4082 sharfenist@friedharf.com
No Logo Dick Black, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Freidman, Harfenist, Langer & Kraut (LIs)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jay Harfenist +1 516 775 5800 +1 516 775 4082 sharfenist@friedharf.com
No Logo Downsize DC Foundation, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Freidman, Harfenist, Langer & Kraut (LIs)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jay Harfenist +1 516 775 5800 +1 516 775 4082 sharfenist@friedharf.com
No Logo DownsizeDC.org, Inc., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Freidman, Harfenist, Langer & Kraut (LIs)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jay Harfenist +1 516 775 5800 +1 516 775 4082 sharfenist@friedharf.com
No Logo Gun Owners Foundation, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Freidman, Harfenist, Langer & Kraut (LIs)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jay Harfenist +1 516 775 5800 +1 516 775 4082 sharfenist@friedharf.com
No Logo Gun Owners of America, Inc., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Freidman, Harfenist, Langer & Kraut (LIs)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jay Harfenist +1 516 775 5800 +1 516 775 4082 sharfenist@friedharf.com
No Logo Institute on the Constitution, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Freidman, Harfenist, Langer & Kraut (LIs)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jay Harfenist +1 516 775 5800 +1 516 775 4082 sharfenist@friedharf.com
No Logo Jerome Aumente, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Freidman, Harfenist, Langer & Kraut (LIs)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jay Harfenist +1 516 775 5800 +1 516 775 4082 sharfenist@friedharf.com
No Logo Pastor Chuck Baldwin, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Freidman, Harfenist, Langer & Kraut (LIs)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jay Harfenist +1 516 775 5800 +1 516 775 4082 sharfenist@friedharf.com
No Logo Restoring Liberty Action Committee, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Freidman, Harfenist, Langer & Kraut (LIs)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jay Harfenist +1 516 775 5800 +1 516 775 4082 sharfenist@friedharf.com
No Logo Tenth Amendment Center, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Freidman, Harfenist, Langer & Kraut (LIs)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jay Harfenist +1 516 775 5800 +1 516 775 4082 sharfenist@friedharf.com
No Logo The Lincoln Institute for Research and Education, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Freidman, Harfenist, Langer & Kraut (LIs)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jay Harfenist +1 516 775 5800 +1 516 775 4082 sharfenist@friedharf.com
No Logo U.S. Border Control, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Freidman, Harfenist, Langer & Kraut (LIs)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jay Harfenist +1 516 775 5800 +1 516 775 4082 sharfenist@friedharf.com
No Logo US Justice Foundation, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Freidman, Harfenist, Langer & Kraut (LIs)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jay Harfenist +1 516 775 5800 +1 516 775 4082 sharfenist@friedharf.com
No Logo Western Center for Journalism, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Freidman, Harfenist, Langer & Kraut (LIs)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jay Harfenist +1 516 775 5800 +1 516 775 4082 sharfenist@friedharf.com
No Logo Dale B. Adams, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dale B. Adams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
doing business asMajestic Publishers Dale B. Adams
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (86) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 85 Status Report filed by Christopher Hedges. ENDORSEMENT: Order: Based on the representations in this Report, the Court dismisses this action at this time. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 2/11/2014) (mro) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    STATUS REPORT. View of Counsel for Plaintiffs as to any remaining issues following remand Document filed by Christopher Hedges.(Afran, Bruce) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER: On October 31, 2013, plaintiffs were Ordered to propose an Amended Complaint and/or provide the Court with its view as to what is left in this action no later than January 30, 2014. To date, the Court has received no such submission. Accordingly, plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED to either submit a proposed Amended Complaint or advise the Court with its view as to what is left in this action by February 7, 2014. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 2/3/2014) (mro) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/31/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 82 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/31/2013 before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/20/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/30/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/27/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
            LREF
            Blank 81 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER: As discussed at that conference, plaintiffs have until on or before January 30, 2014 to propose an Amended Complaint and/or provide the Court with its view as to what is left in this action, and its rationale therefor. (Amended Pleadings due by 1/30/2014.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/31/2013) (tn) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
              LREF
              Blank 80 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER granting 79 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Ordered: Conference adjourned to 10/31/13 at noon. Status Conference set for 10/31/2013 at 12:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/28/2013) (mro) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference presently scheduled for October 30, 2013 addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Bruce I. Afran dated October 25, 2013. Document filed by Christopher Hedges.(Afran, Bruce) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 78 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER: The conference set Wednesday, October 30, 2013, will be heard on the same date (10/30/2013), at 11:00 a.m. ( Status Conference set for 10/30/2013 at 11:00 AM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/22/2013) (mro) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    STANDING ORDER M10-468: Stay of Certain Civil Cases Pending the Restoration of Department of Justice Funding. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2013) ***Original Standing Order docketed in case no. 1:13-mc-00334-LAP, document no. 2 on 10/1/2013.***(tro) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER: On September 10, 2013, this Court received the USCA Mandate from the Second Circuit Court of Appeals. The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a status conference on October 30, 2013 at 1:00 P.M. ( Status Conference set for 10/30/2013 at 01:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 9/11/2013) (mro) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 75 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
                        MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 56 Notice of Appeal, filed by Barak Obama, Leon Panetta, 62 Notice of Appeal, filed by Barak Obama, Leon Panetta, 63 Notice of Appeal, filed by Barak Obama, Leon Panetta USCA Case Number 12-3176(L), 12-3644(con). Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the decision of the District Court is VACATED and the case is REMANDED in accordance with the opinion of this court. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 9/10/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Opinion)(nd) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                          TRUE COPY ORDER of USCA as to 56 Notice of Appeal, filed by Barak Obama, Leon Panetta, 63 Notice of Appeal, filed by Barak Obama, Leon Panetta USCA Case Number 12-3176(L), 12-3644(con). Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the decision of the District Court is VACATED and the case is REMANDED in accordance with the opinion of this court. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 7/17/2013. (nd) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: 10/23/2012 Notice of Filing Transcript
                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 8/7/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Moya, Goretti)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: 10/23/2012 transcriptCourt Filing
                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 8/7/2012 before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/16/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/25/2013.(Moya, Goretti)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER denying 70 Motion for Joinder; denying 70 Motion to Appoint Counsel. That the motion is DENIED for lack of jurisdiction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motion at Dkt. No. 70. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/12/2012) (pl) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Joinder of Pertinent Party and Motion for Appointment of Legal Counsel. Document filed by Dale B. Adams.(lmb) Modified on 10/11/2012 (lmb). Modified on 10/11/2012 (lmb). (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None
                                    ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 56 Notice of Appeal, filed by Barak Obama, Leon Panetta, 63 Notice of Appeal, filed by Barak Obama, Leon Panetta USCA Case Number 12-3176(L), 12-3644(con). Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the Government's motion for stay is GRANTED. The District Court's order dated September 12, 2012 is stayed pending a decision on the appeal by merits panel. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Order: 10/02/2012. Certified: 10/03/2012. (nd) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 68 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER denying 64 Motion to Stay: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Government's request for an immediate interim stay is DENIED. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 9/14/2012) (djc) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a PHONE CONFERNCE proceeding held on 6/1/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: PHONE CONFERNCE held on 6/1/2012 before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/18/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 65 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 64 MOTION to Stay re: 61 Memorandum & Opinion,,,. MOTION to Stay re: 61 Memorandum & Opinion,,,.. Document filed by Barak Obama(individually), Barak Obama(as representative of the United States of America), Leon Panetta(in his capacity as the executive and representative of the Department of Defense), Leon Panetta(individually). (Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 64 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                                              MOTION to Stay re: 61 Memorandum & Opinion,,,. Document filed by Barak Obama(individually), Barak Obama(as representative of the United States of America), Leon Panetta(in his capacity as the executive and representative of the Department of Defense), Leon Panetta(individually).(Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 63 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL from 61 Memorandum & Opinion,,,. Document filed by Barak Obama(individually), Barak Obama(as representative of the United States of America), Leon Panetta(in his capacity as the executive and representative of the Department of Defense), Leon Panetta(individually). Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Harwood, Christopher) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 62 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                  FILING ERROR - NO ORDER SELECTED FOR APPEAL - NOTICE OF APPEAL. Document filed by Barak Obama(individually), Barak Obama(as representative of the United States of America), Leon Panetta(in his capacity as the executive and representative of the Department of Defense), Leon Panetta(individually). Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Harwood, Christopher) Modified on 9/13/2012 (tp). (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 61 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth on this Opinion and Order, this Court permanently enjoins enforcement of § 1021(b)(2) in any manner, as to any person. The Court invites Congress to examine whether there are amendments that might cure the statutes deficiencies, or whether, in light of existing authorization and existing criminal statutes, § 1021 is needed at all.This Court has stated its position, as directly presented to it by the Government, that the AUMF and § 1021(b)(2) are not the same; they are not co-extensive. Military detention based on allegations of substantially supporting or directly supporting the Taliban, al-Qaeda or associated forces, is not encompassed within the AUMF and is enjoined by this Order regarding § 1021(b)(2). No detention based upon § 1021(b)(2) can occur.The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate this action. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 9/12/2012) (jp) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a argument proceeding held on 8/7/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: argument held on 8/7/2012 before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/17/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/27/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON ORAL MOTION granting 57 Motion for David H. Remes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee waived. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 8/7/2012) (lmb) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION for David H. Remes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Christopher Hedges.(pgu) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL from 43 Order,, 41 Memorandum & Opinion,,, 36 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,. Document filed by Barak Obama(individually), Barak Obama(as representative of the United States of America), Leon Panetta(in his capacity as the executive and representative of the Department of Defense), Leon Panetta(individually). Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (nd) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 53 Memorandum of Law in Support, re-filed Reply Memorandum of Plaintiffs in response to Memorandum of Government opposing entry of permanent injunction. Document filed by Christopher Hedges. (Afran, Bruce) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant's Trial Brief. Document filed by Christopher Hedges.(Afran, Bruce) Modified on 7/31/2012 (ka). (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 53 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Final Judgment Denying Plaintiffs' Request for a Permanent Injunction and Dismissing This Action. Document filed by Barak Obama(individually), Barak Obama(as representative of the United States of America), Leon Panetta(in his capacity as the executive and representative of the Department of Defense), Leon Panetta(individually). (Harwood, Christopher) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - TRIAL BRIEF (Government's Memorandum of Law in Support of Final Judgment Denying a Permanent Injunction and Dismissing This Action). Document filed by Barak Obama(individually), Barak Obama(as representative of the United States of America), Leon Panetta(in his capacity as the executive and representative of the Department of Defense), Leon Panetta(individually).(Harwood, Christopher) Modified on 7/24/2012 (ka). (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Benjamin H. Torrance dated 7/13/2012 re: This Office represents certain defendants (the "government") in the above-named action. We are writing with two requests regarding the government's upcoming brief, now due July 18, 2012. First, we respectfully request that, as an equivalent extension to the three-day extension the Court granted to plaintiffs, the government's deadline for filing its brief be extended to July 23, 2012 (as the third day would fall on a Saturday). Second, we respectfully request that the government be permitted to file a brief not exceeding fifty pages. Plaintiffs' counsel have consented to both requests. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. ( Brief due by 7/23/2012.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 7/16/2012) (djc) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Notice of Filing - Memorandum of Concern (Amicus Curiae) re: 49 Amicus Curiae Appearance. Document filed by Bob Avakian. (Stone, Jed) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Jed H. Stone on behalf of Bob Avakian.(Stone, Jed) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Jed H. Stone on behalf of Bob Avakian.(Stone, Jed) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting 46 Motion for Jed H. Stone to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 7/9/2012) (jfe) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION for Jed H. Stone to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Bob Avakian.(pgu) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    TRIAL BRIEF. Document filed by Christopher Hedges.(Afran, Bruce) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER: Plaintiffs have requested an extension of the date on which their brief on the motion for permanent injunction is due from June 29, 2012 to July 2, 2012. ( Motions due by 7/2/2012.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 6/29/2012) (jfe) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER: It is Ordered that the factual record in this matter is closed. The parties shall use the existing factual record as the trial record on the motion for permanent injunctive relief. It is further Ordered that plaintiff's brief on the motion is for a permanent injunction on August 7, 2012 at 2 p.m. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 6/8/2012) (mro) Modified on 6/11/2012 (mro). (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER: The Telephonic status conference set for June 6, 2012 at 1:00p.m. is ADJOURNED until June 7, 2012 at 1:00 p.m. SO ORDERED.( Telephone Conference set for 6/7/2012 at 01:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 6/06/2012) (ama) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            MEMORANDUM AND OPINION & ORDER # re: 37 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 36 Memorandum & Opinion. Accordingly, court decisions, such as this Court's May 16 Order, enjoining enforcement of overly broad or vague statutes may apply generally--they need not be limited only to the parties to the action, and as further set forth in this document. In sum, although it is certainly true as a general proposition that "injunctive relief should be narrowly tailored to fit specific legal violations," Waldman Publishing Corp. v. Landoll, Inc., 43 F.3d 775, 785 (2d Cir. 1994) (Lanham Act claim), and "should be no more burdensome to the defendant than necessary to provide complete relief to the plaintiffs." This order should eliminate any doubt as to the 5/16 Order's scope. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 6/6/2012) (cd) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Court will hold a telephonic status conference on June 6, 2012, at 1:00 p.m., (Telephone Conference set for 6/6/2012 at 01:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 6/4/2012) (lmb) (Entered: 06/05/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: 36 Memorandum & Opinion. (Attachments: # 1 DCPD-201200136, # 2 Justice for Assange) (tro) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 37 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 36 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,. MOTION for Reconsideration re; 36 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,.. Document filed by Barak Obama(individually), Barak Obama(as representative of the United States of America), Leon Panetta(in his capacity as the executive and representative of the Department of Defense), Leon Panetta(individually). (Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION for Reconsideration re; 36 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,. Document filed by Barak Obama(individually), Barak Obama(as representative of the United States of America), Leon Panetta(in his capacity as the executive and representative of the Department of Defense), Leon Panetta(individually).(Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      OPINION AND ORDER # 101806: re: 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order enjoing the operation of the Homeland Battlefield provisions of the National Defense Authorization Act. filed by Christopher Hedges, 31 FIRST MOTION to File Amicus Brief. filed by Constitution Party National Committee, U.S. Justice Foundation, Bill of Rights Defense Committee, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Dick Black, Center for Media and Democracy, Institute on the Constitution, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, Tenth Amendment Center, The Lincoln Institute for Research and Education, Jerome Aumente, Restoring Liberty Action Committee, Western Center for Journalism, Downsize DC Foundation, Gun Owners Foundation, U.S. Border Control, Chuck Baldwin, DownsizeDC.org, Inc., Bob Marshall.For the aforementioned reasons, plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction is GRANTED; enforcement of § 1021 of the NDAA is preliminarily enjoined pending further order of this Court or amendments to the statute rendering this Opinion & Order moot. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motion for preliminary injunction and the motion to file amicus brief at Docket Nos. 3 and 31. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 5/16/2012) (pl) Modified on 5/17/2012 (ft). (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a HEARING proceeding held on 3/30/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: HEARING held on 3/30/2012 before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/8/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2012. (Attachments: # 1 TRANSCRIPT)(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order enjoing the operation of the Homeland Battlefield provisions of the National Defense Authorization Act.. Document filed by Barak Obama(individually), Barak Obama(as representative of the United States of America), Leon Panetta(in his capacity as the executive and representative of the Department of Defense), Leon Panetta(individually). (Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Steven J. Harfenist in Support re: 31 FIRST MOTION to File Amicus Brief.. Document filed by Jerome Aumente, Chuck Baldwin, Bill of Rights Defense Committee, Dick Black, Center for Media and Democracy, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, Constitution Party National Committee, Downsize DC Foundation, DownsizeDC.org, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Institute on the Constitution, Bob Marshall, Restoring Liberty Action Committee, Tenth Amendment Center, The Lincoln Institute for Research and Education, U.S. Border Control, U.S. Justice Foundation, Western Center for Journalism. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Brief)(Harfenist, Steven) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              FIRST MOTION to File Amicus Brief. Document filed by Jerome Aumente, Chuck Baldwin, Bill of Rights Defense Committee, Dick Black, Center for Media and Democracy, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, Constitution Party National Committee, Downsize DC Foundation, DownsizeDC.org, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Institute on the Constitution, Bob Marshall, Restoring Liberty Action Committee, Tenth Amendment Center, The Lincoln Institute for Research and Education, U.S. Border Control, U.S. Justice Foundation, Western Center for Journalism. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Harfenist, Steven) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                POST TRIAL MEMORANDUM. Document filed by Christopher Hedges.(Afran, Bruce) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION to File Amicus Brief. Document filed by Jerome Aumente, Chuck Baldwin, Bill of Rights Defense Committee, Dick Black, Center for Media and Democracy, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, Constitution Party National Committee, Downsize DC Foundation, DownsizeDC.org, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Institute on the Constitution, Bob Marshall, Restoring Liberty Action Committee, Tenth Amendment Center, The Lincoln Institute for Research and Education, U.S. Border Control, U.S. Justice Foundation, Western Center for Journalism. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steven J. Harfenist, # 2 Exhibit Amicus Curiae Brief, # 3 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Harfenist, Steven) Modified on 4/17/2012 (ldi). (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Steven Jay Harfenist on behalf of Bob Marshall, Dick Black, Downsize DC Foundation, DownsizeDC.org, Inc., U.S. Justice Foundation, Institute on the Constitution, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., The Lincoln Institute for Research and Education, Western Center for Journalism, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, U.S. Border Control, Restoring Liberty Action Committee, Tenth Amendment Center, Center for Media and Democracy, Bill of Rights Defense Committee, Chuck Baldwin, Jerome Aumente, Constitution Party National Committee.(Harfenist, Steven) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Kathleen B. Forrest from David H. Remes dated 4/11/2012 re: counsel for plaintiffs respectfully request an extension of time, from April 13 through April 20, to file their post-hearing brief in support of their preliminary injunction motion. ENDORSEMENT: Extension granted only until 4/16/2012. Government's brief now due May 4, 2012. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 4/12/2012) (pl) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER: As set forth at the March 29, 2012, hearing on plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs' post-hearing brief is due on April 13, 2012, and defendants' post-hearing brief is due on April 27, 2012. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 4/9/2012) (mro) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER: For purposes of clarification, the preliminary injunctionhearing scheduled for March 29, 2012, will commence at 9:00 a.m. (not 10:00 a.m.), in Courtroom 15A, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY, 10007. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 3/28/2012) (js) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order enjoing the operation of the Homeland Battlefield provisions of the National Defense Authorization Act. (corrected to add footnote 13). Document filed by Barak Obama(individually), Barak Obama(as representative of the United States of America), Leon Panetta(individually), Leon Panetta(in his capacity as the executive and representative of the Department of Defense). (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order enjoing the operation of the Homeland Battlefield provisions of the National Defense Authorization Act.. Document filed by Barak Obama(individually), Barak Obama(as representative of the United States of America), Leon Panetta(individually), Leon Panetta(in his capacity as the executive and representative of the Department of Defense). (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Court has determined that the non-recording party (here, the Government), has a right to review any recording for accuracy and note any errors. Accordingly, the parties may proceed in one of two ways regarding Mr. Hedge's additional recording of his deposition (i.e., in addition to the stenographic recording transcribed by the court reporter present at the deposition) : (a) Mr. Hedges can allow counsel for defendants to take the tape recording at the close of the deposition and review it over a 24-hour period to ensure its accuracy and reliability; or (b) relinquish the tape recording to the court reporter who will deliver it to Chambers first thing Monday morning, at which time counsel for defendants may come to Chambers to listen to it to ensure its accuracy and reliability. The parties need not engage in separate briefing by letter on the issue of the physical recording. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 3/23/2012) (lmb) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Christopher B. Harwood dated 3/23/2012 re: We write respectfully on behalf of defendants (collectively, the "Government") to request a page extension of 15 pages (i.e., leave to file up to a 40-page memorandum) for the Government's memorandum in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction, which is due this Monday. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 3/23/2012) (lmb) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order enjoing the operation of the Homeland Battlefield provisions of the National Defense Authorization Act. Re-filed Supplemental Brief with Appendix Attached. Document filed by Christopher Hedges. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Item A to Plaintiffs Supplemental Memorandum of Law, # 2 Appendix Item B to Plaintiiff's Supplemental Memorandum of Law)(Afran, Bruce) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order enjoing the operation of the Homeland Battlefield provisions of the National Defense Authorization Act. Supplement Memorandum of Plaintiffs filed by leave of Court with Appendix A and B to be filed separately. Document filed by Christopher Hedges. (Afran, Bruce) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        AFFIRMATION of Kai Wargalla in Support re: 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order enjoing the operation of the Homeland Battlefield provisions of the National Defense Authorization Act.. Document filed by Christopher Hedges. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Signature page for Kai Wargalla, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Wargalla Certification, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Wargalla Certification)(Afran, Bruce) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          AFFIRMATION of Brigitta Jonsdottir, M.P. in Support re: 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order enjoing the operation of the Homeland Battlefield provisions of the National Defense Authorization Act.. Document filed by Christopher Hedges. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Signature page for Jonsdottir Certification, # 2 Exhibit US Department of Justice Subpoena to Brigitta Jonsdottir)(Afran, Bruce) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file all affidavits of any plaintiff they expect to testify at the preliminary injunction hearing no later than March 13, 2012, at 5:00 p.m. Any affidavit filed after that date and time will not be considered in connection with the preliminary injunction proceedings, and any plaintiff filing an affidavit after that date and time shall not be permitted to testify at the March 29, 2012 preliminary injunction hearing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the February 29 Scheduling Order (Dkt. No.6) is modified to the extent that plaintiffs' supplemental briefing in support of a preliminary injunction may be filed no later than March 13, 2012 at 5:00 p.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for defendants shall notify the Court and counsel for plaintiffs no later than March 16, 2012 at 5:00 p.m. whether it intends to call any witnesses at the March 29 preliminary injunction hearing. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 3/12/2012) (jfe) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Signed Signature Pages for Verified Amended Complaint. (jp) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                AFFIRMATION of Alexa D. O'Brien in Support re: 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order enjoing the operation of the Homeland Battlefield provisions of the National Defense Authorization Act.. Document filed by Christopher Hedges. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement signed signature page for Alexa D. O'Brien Certification, # 2 Exhibit Appendix to Certification of Alexa D. O'Brien)(Afran, Bruce) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIRMATION of Christopher Lynn Hedges in Support re: 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order enjoing the operation of the Homeland Battlefield provisions of the National Defense Authorization Act. Document filed by Christopher Hedges. (Afran, Bruce) Modified on 3/13/2012 (ldi). (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIRMATION of Jennifer Ann Bolen in Support re: 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order enjoing the operation of the Homeland Battlefield provisions of the National Defense Authorization Act.. Document filed by Christopher Hedges. (Afran, Bruce) Modified on 3/13/2012 (ldi). (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Christopher Lynn Hedges in Support re: 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order enjoing the operation of the Homeland Battlefield provisions of the National Defense Authorization Act.. Document filed by Christopher Hedges. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Afran, Bruce) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Jennifer Ann Bolen in Support re: 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order enjoing the operation of the Homeland Battlefield provisions of the National Defense Authorization Act.. Document filed by Christopher Hedges. (Afran, Bruce) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Anticipated Witnesses for Hearing on Preliminary Injunction re: 6 Scheduling Order,. Document filed by Christopher Hedges. (Afran, Bruce) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Blake Harwood on behalf of Barak Obama(individually), Barak Obama(as representative of the United States of America), Leon Panetta(individually), Leon Panetta(in his capacity as the executive and representative of the Department of Defense) (Harwood, Christopher) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin H. Torrance on behalf of Barak Obama(individually), Barak Obama(as representative of the United States of America), Leon Panetta(individually), Leon Panetta(in his capacity as the executive and representative of the Department of Defense) (Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER:Preliminary injunction hearing set for 3/29/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Plaintiffs' affidavits in support of the preliminary injunction shall be filed no later than March 8, 2012 also, by letter on 3/8/2012, and as further set forth in this document. Defendants shall file their papers in opposition to the preliminary injunction no later than 5:00 p.m. on March 26, 2012. (Signed by Judge Katherine B Forrest on 2/29/2012) (cd) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order is set for Friday, March 2, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 15A, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs are to advise the Court no later than 5:00 p.m. today (February 29, 2012) whether they intend to call live witnesses at Friday's hearing or to supplement their current papers with affidavits from plaintiffs. If the latter, plaintiffs should submit such affidavits no later than 9:00 a.m. on Thursday, March 1, 2012, or at another time on March 1, 2012, if agreed to by counsel for defendants. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall submit their papers in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order by 6:15 a.m. on Friday, March 1, 2012. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order enjoining the operation of the Homeland Battlefield provisions of the National Defense Authorization Act:( Responses due by 3/1/2012, Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 2/29/2012) (mro) Modified on 2/29/2012 (mro). (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order enjoing the operation of the Homeland Battlefield provisions of the National Defense Authorization Act.. Document filed by Christopher Hedges. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Verified Complaint with signatures to be forwarded, # 2 Supplement Certificate of Service)(Afran, Bruce) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order enjoing the operation of the Homeland Battlefield provisions of the National Defense Authorization Act. Document filed by Christopher Hedges. Return Date set for 3/1/2012 at 03:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Temporary Restraints on the Operation of the Homeland Battlefield Act, # 2 Certificate of Service of Verified Amended Complaint, Notice of Motion, Proposed Order and Brief in Support of Application for Temporary Restraints)(Afran, Bruce) (Entered: 02/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff shall provide counsel for defendants 72-hour notice of the date that they plan to appear before the Court seeking injunctive relief. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file with the Court both proof of service of the complaint on defendants as well as proof of service of all papers in connection with the anticipated temporary restraining order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff meets the above-imposed obligations, the Court will hear argument from both parties on the temporary restraining order on March 1, 2012, at 3:00 p.m. Plaintiff shall provide the Court with copies of their papers in support of their temporary restraining order within the same 72-hour timeframe as they provide them to counsel for defendants. ( Oral Argument set for 3/1/2012 at 03:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 2/24/2012) (lmb) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Barak Obama(individually), Barak Obama(as representative of the United States of America), Leon Panetta(individually), Leon Panetta(in his capacity as the executive and representative of the Department of Defense). (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401027029)Document filed by Christopher Hedges.(mro) (rdz). (Entered: 01/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 134 times.

                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?