Kelly v. Abel et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-01178
District Judge Michael H. Simon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 22, 2016 at 11:22 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ROBERT A. KELLY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly, Roberta

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roberta Kelly +1 503 849 4334 +1 503 296 5762
v.
No Logo A. Richard Walje, Defendant
No Logo Advance Publications, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alex Kozinski, Defendant
No Logo Ally Financial Inc., Defendant
No Logo Amanda Fritz, Defendant
No Logo American City Business Journals, Defendant
No Logo Ancer L. Haggerty, Defendant
No Logo Ann L. Aiken, Defendant
No Logo Anna J. Brown, Defendant
No Logo Arlene Schnitzer, Defendant
No Logo B. Andrew Jones, Defendant
Bernanke, Ben Shalom Bernanke, Ben Shalom, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ben S. Bernanke"
No Logo Betty B. Fletcher, Defendant
No Logo Bishop White Marshall & Weibel PS, Defendant
Officially listed as "Bishop White Marshal and Weibel P.S."
No Logo Blackrock Fund, Defendant
No Logo Bonnie Krieger, Defendant
No Logo Brent E. Gale, Defendant
No Logo Brian Playfair, Defendant
No Logo C. Marie Eckert, Defendant
No Logo C. Scott Gibson, Defendant
No Logo Charles T. Munger, Defendant
No Logo Chase Manhattan Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "Chase Manhattan Bank USA National Assoc."
No Logo Christine Gregorie, Defendant
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "Condolezza Rice"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.
No Logo Consuelo M. Callahan, Defendant
No Logo Corina Bergeland, Defendant
No Logo Cowlitz County Commissioners, Defendant
No Logo Dan Salzman, Defendant
No Logo Dania Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Daniel N. Gordon PC, Defendant
No Logo David A. Viniar, Defendant
No Logo DAVID A WEIBEL, Defendant
No Logo David B. Frohnmayer, Defendant
No Logo David De David De Brunner, Defendant
No Logo David Rockefeller, Defendant
No Logo David Sokol, Defendant
No Logo Detention Center Industries Mut. Co., Defendant
No Logo Douglas H. Schulman, Defendant
No Logo Douglas K. Stuver, Defendant
No Logo Douglas L. Anderson, Defendant
No Logo Dwight C. Holton, Defendant
No Logo Earl Blumenauer, Defendant
No Logo Edward Leavy, Defendant
No Logo Evergreen International Aviation, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Federal Reserve Bank, Defendant
Officially listed as "Federal Reserve System"
No Logo Fidelity National Title Financial, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Garr M. King, Defendant
No Logo Gary Blackmer, Defendant
No Logo General Mortgage Acceptance Corp. Corporation, Defendant
No Logo George Soros, Defendant
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Defendant
Officially listed as "George W. Bush"
No Logo George W. Madison, Defendant
No Logo Gerald M. Auebach, Defendant
No Logo Golden West Financial, Defendant
The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Goldman Sachs & Co."
No Logo Gregg S. Kantor, Defendant
No Logo Gregory E. Abel, Defendant
No Logo Gregory K. Palm, Defendant
No Logo Harsch-Schnitzer Investment Co., Defendant
No Logo Henry H. Lazenby, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Henry Kissinger, Defendant
No Logo Herbert Sandler, Defendant
No Logo Hillary Rodham Clinton, Defendant
No Logo Homecomings Financial Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hon. Dennis J. Hubel, Defendant
United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, Defendant
Officially listed as "Internal Revenue Service"
No Logo International Council for Local Environmental Issues, Defendant
No Logo International Monetary Fund, Defendant
No Logo J. Scott Moede, Defendant
No Logo Jack L. Landau, Defendant
No Logo James A. Redden, Defendant
Dimon, Jamie Dimon, Jamie, Defendant
Officially listed as "Jamie Dimon"
No Logo Jan Dean, Defendant
No Logo Jane L. Peverett, Defendant
No Logo Jay S. Bybee, Defendant
No Logo Jean Kerr Maurer, Defendant
No Logo Jeanne K. Sinnott, Defendant
No Logo Jeff Merkley, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey D. Sapiro, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey S. Cogen, Defendant
No Logo Jen Coney, Defendant
No Logo Joaquin Sampson, Defendant
No Logo John A. Kitzhaber, Defendant
No Logo John D. Carter, Defendant
No Logo John Frohnmayer, Defendant
No Logo John Jelderks, Defendant
No Logo John R. Kroger, Defendant
No Logo Johns, Thomas, Defendant
No Logo John Savage, Defendant
No Logo John V. Acosta, Defendant
No Logo Jordan Schnitzer, Defendant
No Logo Joseph A. O'Leary, Defendant
No Logo Joyce Fred, Defendant
No Logo JP Morgan Chase, Defendant
No Logo Judge Marco A. Hernandez, Defendant
No Logo Julie Davie, Defendant
No Logo Krista L. White, Defendant
No Logo Kyle Knoll, Defendant
No Logo Lavonne Griffin-Valade, Defendant
No Logo Lee C. Bollinger, Defendant
No Logo Lee Hullinger, Defendant
No Logo Lee Mitau, Defendant
No Logo Linda Barnett, Defendant
No Logo Linda Meng, Defendant
Blankfein, Lloyd C. Blankfein, Lloyd C., Defendant
Officially listed as "Lloyd C. Blankfein"
No Logo Malcolm F. Marsh, Defendant
No Logo Marc Williams, Defendant
No Logo Mardilyn Saathoff, Defendant
No Logo Marilyn Bergsma, Defendant
No Logo Marion Sandler, Defendant
No Logo Mark C. Moench, Defendant
No Logo Mark D. Clarke, Defendant
No Logo Martha Lee Walters, Defendant
No Logo Martha Lillie, Defendant
No Logo Mary Nekuda, Defendant
No Logo Matthew J. Donohue, Defendant
No Logo Michael G. Dunn, Defendant
No Logo Michael R. Hogan, Defendant
No Logo Michael W. Mosman, Defendant
No Logo Mid Atlantic [Reliant] Energy Power Holdings LLC, Defendant
No Logo Mike Reese, Defendant
No Logo Miller Nash LLP, Defendant
No Logo Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Nancy Cody, Defendant
No Logo Natalie L. Hocken, Defendant
No Logo Neil McFarlane, Defendant
No Logo Neuberger Berman, Defendant
No Logo Newhouse News Group, Defendant
No Logo Nicholas Fish, Defendant
No Logo Nora McConnell, Defendant
No Logo North West Natural, Defendant
No Logo OR Public Employees' Retirement System, Defendant
No Logo Oregonian, Defendant
No Logo Pacificorp, Defendant
No Logo Pamela Stroebel, Defendant
No Logo Parnassus Investments, Defendant
No Logo Patricia A. Ihnat, Defendant
No Logo Patrick J. Goodman, Defendant
No Logo Paul J. De Muniz, Defendant
No Logo Penny Evans, Defendant
No Logo Peter T. Sadowski, Defendant
No Logo Portland Development Commission, Defendant
No Logo Portland Police Bureau, Defendant
No Logo Portland Water Bureau, Defendant
No Logo President George H.W. Bush, Defendant
No Logo R. Patrick Reiten, Defendant
No Logo Randall L. Dunn, Defendant
No Logo Randy Leonard, Defendant
No Logo Raymond R. Quirk, Defendant
No Logo Rebecca L. Chiao, Defendant
Cheney, Richard B. Cheney, Richard B., Defendant
Officially listed as "Richard B. Cheney"
No Logo Rives Kistler, Defendant
No Logo Robert D. Durham, Defendant
No Logo ROBERT E. JONES, Defendant
No Logo Robert M. McKenna, Defendant
No Logo Ron Wyden, Defendant
No Logo Ronald Frashour, III, Defendant
No Logo Russel E. Burger, Defendant
No Logo Ryan K. Petrey, Defendant
No Logo Sabrina P. Loiselle, Defendant
No Logo Sam Adams, Defendant
No Logo Samuel I. Newhouse, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Sandy McDonnell, Defendant
No Logo Selig A. Zises Partners, Defendant
No Logo Shane E. Abma, Defendant
No Logo State Street Corp, Defendant
No Logo Stephen M. Cutler, Defendant
No Logo Stephen Reinhart, Defendant
No Logo Steve Roso, Defendant
No Logo Steve S. Staul, Defendant
No Logo Susan K. Ackerman, Defendant
No Logo Teresa H. Pearson, Defendant
No Logo Thomas A. Balmer, Defendant
No Logo Thomas M. Coffin, Defendant
No Logo Timothy F. Geithner, Defendant
No Logo Todd W. Bennett, Defendant
No Logo Tri-Co. Metropolitan Transportation District of Oregon, Defendant
No Logo U.S. Bank National Assoc. NA, Defendant
No Logo Unifund, Defendant
U.S. Bancorp Corporation U.S. Bancorp Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "US Bancorp"
No Logo Vanguard Group, Defendant
No Logo Vena McCoy, Defendant
No Logo Virginia L. Linder, Defendant
No Logo Wachovia Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "Wachovia"
No Logo Warren Buffett, Defendant
No Logo Wedge Abels, Defendant
No Logo William J. Clinton, Defendant
No Logo William Knaust, Defendant
No Logo World Savings, Defendant
No Logo Youlee Y. Yoo, Defendant
No Logo Zalane Nunn, Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 3 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: 10/3/2011 Judgment*Court Filing
Order of Dismissal. Signed on 9/30/11 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: 9/29/2011 Case Assignment NoticeCourt Filing
    Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael H. Simon. Copy mailed to plaintiff. (eo) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 1 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: 9/29/2011 Complaint
      Complaint. No filing fee, no IFP application. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Roberta Kelly against Gregory E. Abel, Wedge Abels, Shane E. Abma, Susan K. Ackerman, John V. Acosta, Sam Adams, Advance Publications Inc., Ann L. Aiken, Ally Financial Inc., American City Business Journals, Douglas L. Anderson, Gerald M. Auebach, Thomas A. Balmer, Linda Barnett, Todd W. Bennett, Corina Bergeland, Marilyn Bergsma, Ben S. Bernanke, Bishop White Marshal and Weibel P.S., Gary Blackmer, Blackrock Fund, Lloyd C. Blankfein, Earl Blumenauer, Lee C. Bollinger, Anna J. Brown, Warren Buffett, Russel E. Burger, George H.W. Bush, George W. Bush, Jay S. Bybee, Consuelo M. Callahan, John D. Carter, Chase Manhattan Bank USA National Assoc., Richard B. Cheney, Rebecca L. Chiao, Mark D. Clarke, Hillary Rodham Clinton, William J. Clinton, Nancy Cody, Thomas M. Coffin, Jeffrey S. Cogen, Jen Coney, Cowlitz County Commissioners, Stephen M. Cutler, Daniel N. Gordon PC, Julie Davie, David De David De Brunner, Paul J. De Muniz, Jan Dean, Detention Center Industries Mut. Co., Jamie Dimon, Matthew J. Donohue, Michael G. Dunn, Randall L. Dunn, Robert D. Durham, C. Marie Eckert, Penny Evans, Evergreen International Aviation, Inc., Federal Reserve System, Fidelity National Title Financial, Inc., Nicholas Fish, Betty B. Fletcher, Ronald Frashour, III, Joyce Fred, Amanda Fritz, David B. Frohnmayer, John Frohnmayer, Brent E. Gale, Timothy F. Geithner, General Mortgage Acceptance Corp. Corporation, C. Scott Gibson, Golden West Financial, Goldman Sachs & Co., Patrick J. Goodman, Christine Gregorie, Lavonne Griffin-Valade, Ancer L. Haggerty, Harsch-Schnitzer Investment Co., Marco A. Hernandez, Natalie L. Hocken, Michael R. Hogan, Dwight C. Holton, Homecomings Financial Inc., Dennis J. Hubel, Lee Hullinger, Patricia A. Ihnat, Internal Revenue Service, International Council for Local Environmental Issues, International Monetary Fund, JP Morgan Chase, John Jelderks, Dania Johnson, B. Andrew Jones, Robert E. Jones, Gregg S. Kantor, Garr M. King, Henry Kissinger, Rives Kistler, John A. Kitzhaber, William Knaust, Kyle Knoll, Alex Kozinski, Bonnie Krieger, John R. Kroger, Jack L. Landau, Henry H. Lazenby, Jr, Edward Leavy, Randy Leonard, Martha Lillie, Virginia L. Linder, Sabrina P. Loiselle, George W. Madison, Malcolm F. Marsh, Jean Kerr Maurer, Nora McConnell, Vena McCoy, Sandy McDonnell, Neil McFarlane, Robert M. McKenna, Linda Meng, Jeff Merkley, Mid Atlantic [Reliant] Energy Power Holdings LLC, Miller Nash LLP, Lee Mitau, J. Scott Moede, Mark C. Moench, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., Michael W. Mosman, Charles T. Munger, Mary Nekuda, Neuberger Berman, Samuel I. Newhouse, Jr, Newhouse News Group, North West Natural, Zalane Nunn, Joseph A. O'Leary, OR Public Employees' Retirement System, Oregonian, PacifiCorp, Gregory K. Palm, Parnassus Investments, Teresa H. Pearson, Ryan K. Petrey, Jane L. Peverett, Brian Playfair, Portland Development Commission, Portland Police Bureau, Portland Water Bureau, Raymond R. Quirk, James A. Redden, Mike Reese, Stephen Reinhart, R. Patrick Reiten, Condolezza Rice, David Rockefeller, Steve Roso, Mardilyn Saathoff, Peter T. Sadowski, Dan Salzman, Joaquin Sampson, Herbert Sandler, Marion Sandler, Jeffrey D. Sapiro, John Savage, Arlene Schnitzer, Jordan Schnitzer, Douglas H. Schulman, Selig A. Zises Partners, Jeanne K. Sinnott, David Sokol, George Soros, State Street Corp, Steve S. Staul, Pamela Stroebel, Douglas K. Stuver, John S. Thomas, Tri-Co. Metropolitan Transportation District of Oregon, U.S. Bank National Assoc. NA, US Bancorp, Unifund, Vanguard Group, David A. Viniar, Wachovia, A. Richard Walje, Martha Lee Walters, David A. Weibel, Krista L. White, Marc Williams, World Savings, Ron Wyden, Youlee Y. Yoo. (eo) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
        LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 543 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?