UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al. v. MERCK & CO.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:10-cv-04374-CDJ
District Judge C. DARNELL JONES, II, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 25, 2021 at 1:24 PM DT (3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Constantine Cannon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JASON ENZLER +1 202 204 3500 jenzler@constantinecannon.com
Space Marlene Koury +1 212 350 2700 +1 212 350 2701 mkoury@constantinecannon.com
Space GORDON SCHNELL +1 212 350 2700 gschnell@constantinecannon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keller Grover LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey F Keller +1 415 543 1305 +1 415 543 7861 jfkeller@kellergrover.com
Space Kathleen R. Scanlan +1 415 543 1305 +1 415 543 7861 kscanlan@kellergrover.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Meredith Cohen Greenfogel & Skirnick, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel B Allanoff +1 215 564 5182 dallanoff@mcgslaw.com
Space Joel C Meredith +1 215 564 5182 +1 215 569 0958 jmeredith@mcgslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schlam Stone & Dolan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert L. Begleiter +1 212 350 2715 +1 212 350 2701 rbegleiter@schlamstone.com
No Logo STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Constantine Cannon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JASON ENZLER +1 202 204 3500 jenzler@constantinecannon.com
Space Marlene Koury +1 212 350 2700 +1 212 350 2701 mkoury@constantinecannon.com
Space GORDON SCHNELL +1 212 350 2700 gschnell@constantinecannon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keller Grover LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey F Keller +1 415 543 1305 +1 415 543 7861 jfkeller@kellergrover.com
Space Kathleen R. Scanlan +1 415 543 1305 +1 415 543 7861 kscanlan@kellergrover.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Meredith Cohen Greenfogel & Skirnick, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel B Allanoff +1 215 564 5182 dallanoff@mcgslaw.com
Space Joel C Meredith +1 215 564 5182 +1 215 569 0958 jmeredith@mcgslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schlam Stone & Dolan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert L. Begleiter +1 212 350 2715 +1 212 350 2701 rbegleiter@schlamstone.com
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOEL M. SWEET +1 215 875 3000

Toggle Switch Represented by Meredith Cohen Greenfogel & Skirnick, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joel C Meredith +1 215 564 5182 +1 215 569 0958 jmeredith@mcgslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARGARET L. HUTCHINSON +1 215 861 8282 +1 215 861 8618 margaret.hutchinson@usdoj.gov
Space Gerald B. Sullivan +1 215 861 8786 +1 215 861 8349 gerald.sullivan@usdoj.gov
Space JOEL M. SWEET +1 215 861 8581 +1 215 861 8618 joel.sweet@usdoj.gov
v.
Merck & Company, Inc. Merck & Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "MERCK & CO."
Officer/Director, Rosetta Inpharmatics,inc.
Officer/Director, Sibia Neurosciences, Inc.
Officer/Director, SCHERING PLOUGH CORP

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LISA DYKSTRA +1 215 963 5699 +1 215 963 5001 ldykstra@morganlewis.com
Space Eric W. Sitarchuk +1 215 963 5840 +1 215 963 5001 eric.sitarchuk@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SALLY W. BRYAN +1 410 244 7704 srbryan@venable.com
Space Dino S Sangiamo +1 410 244 7400 +1 410 244 7742 dssangiamo@venable.com
Citation Section 31 U.S.C. § 3729
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Office Philadelphia
Filed 8/27/2010
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Cause Section 31 U.S.C. § 3729 False Claims Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition
County Philadelphia
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag STANDARD
  Entries (301) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 6/25/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Response
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Seal
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Seal
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None Response
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 1/18/2021, Entered: None Seal
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: None Statement
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: None Letter
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Strike
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None Modify
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Modify
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None Modify
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None Praecipe/Request
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Order Referring Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Initial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Clarification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 12/26/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 162 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE COURT'S JULY 24, 2017 ORDER together with Memorandum and Certificate of Service filed by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (ti, ) Modified on 8/29/2017 (ti, ). (Entered: 08/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE MOTION TO SEAL MERCK'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SITARSKI'S JULY 24, 2017 DISCOVERY ORDER, IT IS ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 8/28/17.8/29/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal Document [Motion for Leave to File Reply In Support of Plaintiffs Objection to Magistrate Courts July 24, 2017 Order] filed by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(VITELLI, DANIEL) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND THE PROTECTIVE ORDER SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 8/28/17. 8/28/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response to (Doc. No. 135) Plaintiffs' Objections to Magistrate Judge Sitarski's 7/24/2017 Discovery Order with exhibits by MERCK & CO. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (ti, ) (lisad, ). (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal Document Merck's Response to Plaintiffs' Objections to Magistrate Judge Sitarski's July 24, 2017 Discovery Order filed by MERCK & CO..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(DYKSTRA, LISA) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF RELATORS' AND PRIVATE ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS' MOTION REQUESTING PERMISSION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE COURT'S JULY 24, 2017 ORDER, AND REQUESTING PERMISSION TO FILE EXCESS PAGES, IT IS ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 8/11/17.8/11/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiffs' Objections to Magistrate's Court's 133 Order (FILED UNDER SEAL) (ti, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2017: # 1 Sealed Document, # 2 Sealed Document, # 3 Sealed Document, # 4 Sealed Document, # 5 Sealed Document, # 6 Sealed Document, # 7 Sealed Document, # 8 Sealed Document, # 9 Sealed Document, # 10 Sealed Document, # 11 Sealed Document, # 12 Sealed Document, # 13 Sealed Document, # 14 Sealed Document, # 15 Sealed Document, # 16 Sealed Document, # 17 Sealed Document, # 18 Sealed Document, # 19 Sealed Document, # 20 Sealed Document, # 21 Sealed Document, # 22 Sealed Document, # 23 Sealed Document, # 24 Sealed Document, # 25 Sealed Document, # 26 Sealed Document, # 27 Sealed Document, # 28 Sealed Document, # 29 Sealed Document, # 30 Sealed Document, # 31 Sealed Document, # 32 Sealed Document, # 33 Sealed Document, # 34 Sealed Document, # 35 Sealed Document, # 36 Sealed Document, # 37 Sealed Document, # 38 Sealed Document, # 39 Sealed Document) (lisad, ). (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Document [Plaintiffs Objections to July 24, 2017 Order] filed by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(VITELLI, DANIEL) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE PARTIES AGREE, THAT MERCK'S TIME TO RESPOND TO RELATORS' THRID SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION AND PLAINTIFFS' FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES IS EXTENDED TO 6/21/2017, AND RELATORS' TIME TO RESPOND TO MERCK'S SECOND SET OF INTERROGATORIES IS EXTENDED TO 6/22/2017. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 5/25/17. 5/26/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 4/30/2018. ALL DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED AND SERVED ON 6/19/2018. PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE AND SERVE THEIR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION BY 9/11/2018, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 5/25/17. 5/26/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF RELATORS' LETTER REQUEST FOR PERMISSION TO FILE UNDER SEAL THEIR REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL AND EXHIBITS 128 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE REQUEST IS GRANTED AND PLAINTIFFS' REPLY AND ITS EXHIBITS SHALL BE FILED UNDER SEAL. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 5/17/17.5/18/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER REPLY in Support of 117 MOTION to Compel together with Exhibits filed by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (ti, ) (lisad, ). Modified on 5/17/2017 (lisad, ). (Entered: 05/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION AND EXHIBITS TO RELATORS' AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RELATING TO POTENCY AND STABILITY OF MUMPS VACCINES (DOC. NO. 117 ) filed by MERCK & CO. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (aeg) Modified on 5/11/2017 (lisad, ). (Entered: 05/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Discovery Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for Telephonic Discovery Dispute held on 5/8/17, before MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI. (lisad, ) Modified on 5/10/2017 (lisad, ). (Main Document 124 replaced on 5/10/2017) (lisad, ). (Entered: 05/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION TO COMPEL filed by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(ti, )(Additional attachment(s) added on 4/19/2017: # 1 Sealed Document, # 2 Sealed Document, # 3 Sealed Document, # 4 Sealed Document, # 5 Sealed Document, # 6 Sealed Document, # 7 Sealed Document, # 8 Sealed Document) (lisad, ). Modified on 4/19/2017 (lisad, ). (Entered: 04/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Minute Entry - Multicase
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: 3/1/2017 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND THE AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. THE FACT DISCOVERY COMPLETION DEADLINE SHALL BE EXTENDED TO 6/1/2017, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 3/1/17. 3/1/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: 3/1/2017 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order to amend the amended scheduling order by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING. (FORWARD TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) (lvj, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: 2/24/2017 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI Change of Firm Affiliation (MEREDITH, JOEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: 2/21/2017 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION Leave to Depose Relators for Two Seven-Hour Days (Letter Motion to Judge Sitarski) filed by MERCK & CO... (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Text of Proposed Order)(DYKSTRA, LISA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: 2/8/2017 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kathleen S. Hardway by MERCK & CO.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-11857811.). (DYKSTRA, LISA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: 12/6/2016 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. VITELLI on behalf of STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI with Certificate of Service(VITELLI, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: 12/5/2016 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION PROTOCOL SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 12/2/16. 12/5/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION PROTOCOL SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 12/2/16. 12/5/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE PARTIES' LETTERS (ECF NOS. 99, 100), INFORMING THE COURT THAT THEY DO NOT OPPOSE THE COURT'S UNSEALING OF THE COURT'S 2/5/2016 MEMORANDUM 97 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM IS UNSEALED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 2/18/16. 2/19/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Returned Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Copy of Order dated 2/5/16 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to JASON ENZLER for the following reason: Forward Expired; Re-mailed to 1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 1300N, Washington, DC 20004-2579. (ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: 2/19/2016 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE PARTIES' LETTERS (ECF NOS. 99, 100), INFORMING THE COURT THAT THEY DO NOT OPPOSE THE COURT'S UNSEALING OF THE COURT'S 2/5/2016 MEMORANDUM [97], IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM IS UNSEALED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 2/18/16. 2/19/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Returned Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Copy of Order dated 2/5/16 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to DANIEL B. ALLANOFF for the following reason: Deceased. (ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: 2/10/2016 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          letter Response to Court's February 5, 2016 Order (ECF No. 98)] by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI. (SCHNELL, GORDON) Modified on 2/10/2016 (afm, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT RELATOR'S MOTION IS DENIED, AS OUTLINED. OUT OF UTMOST CAUTION, AND BECAUSE RELATOR'S MOTION AND THE PARTIES' RESPONSES ARE ALL FILED UNDER SEAL, THE COURT FILES ITS MEMORANDUM UNDER SEAL. AFTER REVIEWING THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM, THE PARTIES ARE ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE BY 2/16/2016 WHY THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM SHOULD REMAIN UNDER SEAL. SHOULD THE PARTIES FAIL TO SHOW CAUSE, THE COURT WILL UNSEAL THE MEMORANDUM ON 2/17/2016. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 2/5/16. 2/8/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) Modified on 2/8/2016 (ti, ). (Entered: 02/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: 2/9/2016 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement (Letter to The Honorable Lynne A. Sitarski) by MERCK & CO.. (DYKSTRA, LISA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: 2/8/2016 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT RELATOR'S MOTION IS DENIED, AS OUTLINED. OUT OF UTMOST CAUTION, AND BECAUSE RELATOR'S MOTION AND THE PARTIES' RESPONSES ARE ALL FILED UNDER SEAL, THE COURT FILES ITS MEMORANDUM UNDER SEAL. AFTER REVIEWING THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM, THE PARTIES ARE ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE BY 2/16/2016 WHY THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM SHOULD REMAIN UNDER SEAL. SHOULD THE PARTIES FAIL TO SHOW CAUSE, THE COURT WILL UNSEAL THE MEMORANDUM ON 2/17/2016. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 2/5/16. 2/8/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) Modified on 2/8/2016 (ti, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 3/1/2017. ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 10/31/2017. ALL DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED AND SERVED ON 12/20/2017. PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE AND SERVE THEIR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION BY 3/1/2018. DEFENDANT SHALL FILE AND SERVE ITS OPPOSITION TO CLASS CERTIFICATION BY 4/5/2018, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 1/8/16. 1/12/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) Modified on 1/12/2016 (ti, ). (Entered: 01/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 97 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: 2/8/2016 Memorandum and/or Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 2/5/16. 2/8/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (ti, ) Modified on 2/19/2016 (ti, ). (ti, ). Modified on 2/19/2016 (afm, ).(UNSEALED PER ORDER [101])
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF RELATOR JOAN WLOCHOWSKI'S LETTER REQUEST 93 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE REQUEST IS GRANTED AND RELATOR WLOCHOWKSI'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER SHALL BE FILED UNDER SEAL. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 11/12/15. 11/13/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: 1/12/2016 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 3/1/2017. ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 10/31/2017. ALL DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED AND SERVED ON 12/20/2017. PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE AND SERVE THEIR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION BY 3/1/2018. DEFENDANT SHALL FILE AND SERVE ITS OPPOSITION TO CLASS CERTIFICATION BY 4/5/2018, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 1/8/16. 1/12/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) Modified on 1/12/2016 (ti, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/13/2015 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF RELATOR JOAN WLOCHOWSKI'S LETTER REQUEST [93], IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE REQUEST IS GRANTED AND RELATOR WLOCHOWKSI'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER SHALL BE FILED UNDER SEAL. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 11/12/15. 11/13/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to MERCK's Opposition to MOTION (Doc. No. 89) for Protective Order filed by JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: 11/10/2015, Terminated: 11/10/2015 Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER REQUEST to Seal Document [Reply re: Motion for Protective Order] filed by JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Certificate of Service)(SCHNELL, GORDON) Modified on 11/12/2015 (afm, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: 11/5/2015 Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANT'S LETTER REQUEST FOR PERMISSION TO FILE ITS RESPONSE TO THE MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER UNDER SEAL [90], IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE REQUEST IS GRANTED AND DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER SHALL BE FILED UNDER SEAL. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 11/4/15. 11/5/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: 11/5/2015 Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF RELATOR JOAN WLOCHOWSKI'S LETTER REQUEST FOR PERMISSION TO FILE THEIR MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER UNDER SEAL [88], IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE REQUEST IS GRANTED AND RELATOR WLOCHOWSKI'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER SHALL BE FILED UNDER SEAL. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 11/4/15. 11/5/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER RESPONSE to Motion re [88] MOTION to Seal Document [Motion for Protective Order] filed by MERCK & CO.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Certificate of Service)(DYKSTRA, LISA) Modified on 11/4/2015 (afm, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/22/2015, Terminated: 11/5/2015 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT SAID OBJECTIONS ARE OVERRULED. JUDGE SITARSKI'S 7/31/15 ORDER IS AFFIRMED. RELATORS MOTION IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/16/15. 9/17/15 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl,) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015, Terminated: 11/5/2015 Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal Document [Motion for Protective Order] filed by JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Certificate of Service)(SCHNELL, GORDON)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: 9/17/2015 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT SAID OBJECTIONS ARE OVERRULED. JUDGE SITARSKI'S 7/31/15 ORDER IS AFFIRMED. RELATORS MOTION IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/16/15. 9/17/15 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl,)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Hearing held on 7/22/15, before Judge Lynne A. Sitarski. Court Reporter/Transcriber ESR/DIANA DOMAN TRANSCRIBING, LLC. (ti, ) Modified on 8/18/2015 (afm, ). (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: 8/27/2015 StatementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response to Relators' Written Statement of Objections to Judge Sitarski's July 31, 2015 Order by MERCK & CO., CERTIFICAE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Text of Proposed Order, # (3) Certificate of Service)(DYKSTRA, LISA) Modified on 8/28/2015 (afm, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: 8/17/2015 Transcript - RESTRICTEDCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Hearing held on 7/22/15, before Judge Lynne A. Sitarski. Court Reporter/Transcriber ESR/DIANA DOMAN TRANSCRIBING, LLC. (ti, ) Modified on 8/18/2015 (afm, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: 8/13/2015 ObjectionsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Objections by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI re [83] Order, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,, Relators Written Statement of Objections to Judge Sitarskis July 31, 2015 Order. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Certificate of Service)(SCHNELL, GORDON)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT RELATORS MOTION IS GRANTED TO THE EXTENT RELATORS SEEK TO COMPEL MERCK'S ANSWER TO INTERROGATORY NUMBER 1. RELATORS MOTION IS DENIED TO THE EXTENT RELATOR SEEKS TO COMPEL MERCK'S ANSWERS TO RFA 1,2,12,14,27,28,38,40,55,57,71 AND 72 AND INTERROGATORY NUMBER 1, ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 7/31/15. 7/31/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI Oral Argument held on 7/22/15 (ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT AN IN-PERSON MEET AND CONFER WILL BE HELD ON 7/22/2015, AT 1:30 PM, IN COURTROOM 3-E, U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106. IF APPROPRIATE, THE COURT SHALL CONDUCT AN ORAL ARGUMENT IMMEDIATELY THEREAFTER ON RELATORS' LETTER MOTION TO COMPEL, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 7/15/15. 7/16/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015 Pretrial Conference - Interim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI Telephonic Pretrial Conference held on 7/16/15. (ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT AN IN-PERSON MEET AND CONFER WILL BE HELD ON 7/27/2015, AT 1:00 PM, IN COURTROOM 3-E, U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106. IF APPROPRIATE, THE COURT SHALL CONDUCT AN ORAL ARGUMENT IMMEDIATELY THEREAFTER ON RELATORS' LETTER MOTION TO COMPEL, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 7/15/15. 7/16/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT AN IN-PERSON MEET AND CONFER WILL BE HELD ON 7/22/2015, AT 1:30 PM, IN COURTROOM 3-E, U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106. IF APPROPRIATE, THE COURT SHALL CONDUCT AN ORAL ARGUMENT IMMEDIATELY THEREAFTER ON RELATORS' LETTER MOTION TO COMPEL, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 7/15/15. 7/16/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: 7/16/2015 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT AN IN-PERSON MEET AND CONFER WILL BE HELD ON 7/27/2015, AT 1:00 PM, IN COURTROOM 3-E, U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106. IF APPROPRIATE, THE COURT SHALL CONDUCT AN ORAL ARGUMENT IMMEDIATELY THEREAFTER ON RELATORS' LETTER MOTION TO COMPEL, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 7/15/15. 7/16/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion re [76] MOTION to Compel filed by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(SCHNELL, GORDON) Modified on 6/23/2015 (afm, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: 6/15/2015 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re [76] MOTION to Compel filed by MERCK & CO.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Text of Proposed Order)(DYKSTRA, LISA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF HAMSA MAHENDRANATHAN, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 4/14/15. 4/15/15 ENTERED AND ECF APPLICATION & COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: 6/1/2015, Terminated: 6/1/2015 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to Judge Sitarski re: To compel Merck to respond to Interrogatories filed by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(SCHNELL, GORDON) Modified on 6/2/2015 (afm, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION OF HAMSA MAHENDRANATHAN, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b), Statement and Certificate of Service (Filing fee $40 receipt number 119280) by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI. (ti, ) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: 4/15/2015 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF HAMSA MAHENDRANATHAN, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 4/14/15. 4/15/15 ENTERED AND ECF APPLICATION & COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/14/2015 Application/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION OF HAMSA MAHENDRANATHAN, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b), Statement and Certificate of Service (Filing fee $40 receipt number 119280) by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI. (ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: 3/20/2015 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by R. BRENDAN FEE on behalf of MERCK & CO. with Certificate of Service(FEE, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: 3/11/2015 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by DANIEL J. VITELLI on behalf of All Plaintiffs (VITELLI, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REGARDING PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INFORMATION SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 1/30/15. 2/2/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: 2/25/2015 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 3/1/2016. ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 10/31/2016. ALL DISPOSTIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED AND SERVED ON 12/9/2016. PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE AND SERVE THEIR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION BY 2/7/2017, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 2/24/15. 2/25/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: 2/2/2015 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REGARDING PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INFORMATION SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 1/30/15. 2/2/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: 1/26/2015 Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROTECTIVE ORDER WITH COURT APPROVAL RE: CERTAIN STATEMENTS; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 1/26/15. 1/26/15 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/26/2015: # (1) AGREEMENT) (jl, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT ANY AND ALL FUTURE DISCOVERY MOTIONS IN BOTH ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTERS ARE REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE LYNNE A. SITARSKI, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR DISPOSITION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 9/29/2015. ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 3/31/2016. ALL DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED AND SERVED ON 4/29/2016. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE AND SERVE ITS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION BY 7/8/2016. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 11/13/14. 11/17/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) Modified on 11/17/2014 (ti, ). (Entered: 11/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: 12/9/2014 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to join letter motion to enter protective order and compel by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI (VITELLI, DANIEL) Modified on 12/10/2014 (afm, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: 11/17/2014 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT ANY AND ALL FUTURE DISCOVERY MOTIONS IN BOTH ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTERS ARE REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE LYNNE A. SITARSKI, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR DISPOSITION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 9/29/2015. ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 3/31/2016. ALL DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED AND SERVED ON 4/29/2016. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE AND SERVE ITS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION BY 7/8/2016. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 11/13/14. 11/17/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) Modified on 11/17/2014 (ti, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: 11/13/2014 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF DANIEL J. VITELLI, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 11/13/14. 11/13/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) Modified on 11/13/2014 (ti, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT A FED. R. CIV. P. 16 CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD BY TELEPHONE ON 11/13/2014, AT 1:30 PM, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 10/15/14. 10/16/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: 11/6/2014 Application/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application of Daniel J. Vitelli, Esq. to practice in this Court pursuant to LRCP 83.5.2(b) (Pro Hac Vice) on behalf of STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI, Statement, Certificate of Service ($40 Filing Fee Pd. - Receipt #110876). (fdc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/16/2014 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT A FED. R. CIV. P. 16 CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD BY TELEPHONE ON 11/13/2014, AT 1:30 PM, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 10/15/14. 10/16/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: 10/14/2014 Proposed Case Management Plan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint report of RULE 26(f) meeting by MERCK & CO.. (DYKSTRA, LISA) Modified on 10/15/2014 (afm, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: 9/19/2014 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to [12] Amended Complaint by MERCK & CO.. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(DYKSTRA, LISA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 60 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IN CIVIL ACTION NO. 12-3555 (DKT NO. 40), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT SAID MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IN CIVIL ACTION NO. 10-4374 (DKT NO. 45), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT SAID MOTION IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/4/14. 9/5/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 61 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: 9/5/2014 Memorandum and/or Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/5/14. 9/5/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 59 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/4/14. 9/5/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 60 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: 9/5/2014 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IN CIVIL ACTION NO. 12-3555 (DKT NO. 40), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT SAID MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IN CIVIL ACTION NO. 10-4374 (DKT NO. 45), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT SAID MOTION IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/4/14. 9/5/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 59 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: 9/5/2014 Memorandum and/or Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/4/14. 9/5/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: 3/19/2014 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by JOEL M. SWEET on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA with Certificate of Service(SWEET, JOEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: 8/12/2013 Transcript - RESTRICTEDCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/31/13, before Judge C. Darnell Jones, II. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katie Furphy. (ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 56 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: 6/14/2013 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENTS SHALL BE HELD ON THE PENDING MOTION TO DISMISS ON 7/31/2013, AT 11:00 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 6/14/13. 6/14/13 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: 5/20/2013 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JOEL M. SWEET on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(SWEET, JOEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 54 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: 5/20/2013 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statement of Interest Addressing Merck's Motion to Dismiss by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(SULLIVAN, GERALD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI of Change of Firm Affiliation (MEREDITH, JOEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/17/2013 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI of Change of Firm Affiliation.(MEREDITH, JOEL) (INCORRECT PDF; ATTY HAS RE-FILED AT PAPER #53) Modified on 1/22/2013 (md).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: 11/7/2012 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY BRIEF in Support [45] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MERCK & CO. (ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 50 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: 11/5/2012 Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF, AND ANY RESPONSES THERETO, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO FILE THE REPLY BRIEF IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED ACTION FORTHWITH. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 11/5/12. 11/5/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: 10/31/2012, Terminated: 11/5/2012 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Brief filed by MERCK & CO..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Proposed Reply Brief, # (3) Exhibit B)(SITARCHUK, ERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: 10/9/2012 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re [45] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Declaration of Marlene Koury In Support of Relators Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Text of Proposed Order, # (7) Certificate of Service)(SCHNELL, GORDON)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: 10/9/2012 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re [45] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI. (SCHNELL, GORDON)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: 9/27/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT RELATORS SHALL FILE THEIR OPPOSITION BRIEF TO MERCK'S MOTION TO DISMISS ON OR BEFORE 10/9/2012; DEFENDANT SHALL FILE LEAVE FOR A REPLY BRIEF, ATTACHING THE REPLY BRIEF THERETO, ON OR BEFORE 10/30/2012. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/26/12. 9/27/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: 8/31/2012, Terminated: 9/4/2014 Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MERCK & CO..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Proposed Order, # (4) Certificate of Service)(SITARCHUK, ERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: 7/27/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANT SHALL FILE IS RESPONSIVE PLEADING ON OR BEFORE 8/31/2012, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 7/27/12. 7/27/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: 7/11/2012 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Service by C & E Legal Courier Service, Inc. re: served Amended Complaint and Summons upon Merck & Co. c/o Lisa Dykstra by Personal on June 27, 2012 (NARINE, KRISHNA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: 7/11/2012 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Service by C & E Legal Courier Service, Inc. re: served Amended Complaint and Summons upon Merck & Co.c/o CT Corporation by Personal on June 27, 2012 (NARINE, KRISHNA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: 7/10/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF DINO S. SANGIAMO, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 7/9/12. 7/10/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: 7/10/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF SALLY W. BRYAN, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 7/9/12. 7/10/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: 7/6/2012 Application/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION OF DINO S. SANGIAMO, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b), Statement, Certificate of Service (Filing fee $40 receipt number 065765) by MERCK & CO. (ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: 7/6/2012 Application/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION OF SALLY W. BRYAN, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b), Statement, Certificate of Service (Filing fee $40 receipt number 065765) by MERCK & CO. (ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF GORDON SCHNELL, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 6/29/12. 7/2/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF KATHLEEN R. SCANLAN, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 6/29/12. 7/2/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF MARLENE KOURY, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 6/29/12. 7/2/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JEFFREY F. KELLER, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 6/29/12. 7/2/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JASON ENZLER, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 6/29/12. 7/2/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ROBERT L. BEGLEITER, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 6/29/12. 7/2/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: 6/29/2012 Disclosure Statement Form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MERCK & CO..(SITARCHUK, ERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: 6/28/2012 Application/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION OF GORDON SCHNELL, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b), Statement, Certificate of Service (Filing fee $40 receipt number 065358) by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI. (ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: 6/28/2012 Application/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION OF KATHLEEN R. SCANLAN, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b), Statement, Certificate of Service (Filing fee $40 receipt number 065358) by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI. (ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: 6/28/2012 Application/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION OF MARLENE KOURY, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b), Statement, Certificate of Service (Filing fee $40 receipt number 065358) by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI. (ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: 6/28/2012 Application/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION OF JEFFREY F. KELLER, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b), Statement, Certificate of Service (Filing fee $40 receipt number 065358) by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI. (ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: 6/28/2012 Application/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION OF JASON ENZLER, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b), Statement, Certificate of Service (Filing fee $40 receipt number 065358) by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI. (ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: 6/28/2012 Application/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION OF ROBERT L. BEGLEITER, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b), Statement, Certificate of Service (Filing fee $40 receipt number 065358) by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI. (ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: 6/22/2012 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by LISA DYKSTRA on behalf of MERCK & CO. with Certificate of Service(DYKSTRA, LISA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: 6/21/2012 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC W. SITARCHUK on behalf of MERCK & CO. with Notice of Appearance of Eric W. Sitarchuk and Lisa C. Dykstra with Certificate of Service(SITARCHUK, ERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: 6/21/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT THE JOINT MOTION IS GRANTED AND EXCEPT FOR THE DOCKET NUMBERS 1, 4, 6, AND 8, THE RECORD IN THIS ACTION IS HEREBY UNSEALED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DOCKET NO. 1, WHICH IS THE ORIGINAL, UNREDACTED COMPLAINT, DATED 8/27/2010, SHALL REMAIN UNDER SEAL UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DOCKET NOS. 4, 6, AND 8, WHICH ARE MOTIONS BY THE US, SHALL REMAIN UNDER SEAL INDEFINITELY. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES SHALL SERVE ALL PLEADING AND MOTIONS FILED IN THIS ACTION, INCLUDING SUPPORTING MEMORANDA, UPON THE US; THE PARTIES SHALL SERVE ALL NOTICES OF APPEAL UPON THE US; ALL ORDERS OF THIS COURT SHALL BE SENT TO THE US; AND SHOULD THE RELATORS OR THE DEFENDANT PROPOSE THIS ACTION BE DISMISSED, SETTLED, OR ORTHERWISE DISCONTINUED, THE COURT WILL SOLICIT THE WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE US BEFORE RULING OR GRANTING ITS APPROVAL. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT UPON THE SIGNING OF THIS ORDER, THE CLERK SHALL ISSUE SUMMONS IN THIS CASE; AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT UPON UNSEALING THE RECORD IN THIS ACTION, AND THE ISSUANCE OF THE SUMMONS, RELATORS WILL SERVE UPON DEFENDANT A COPY OF THE UNREDACTED COMPLAINT AND THE AMENDED COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 6/19/12. 6/21/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to MERCK & CO. One Original Forwarded To: Counsel - Relators on 6/21/12 (ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to MERCK & CO. One Original Forwarded To: Counsel - Relators on 6/21/12 (ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: 6/21/2012 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT MOTION TO UNSEAL THE RECORD EXCEPT FOR DOCKET NUMBERS 1, 4, 6 AND 8, Memorandum in Support filed by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: 6/21/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT RELATORS' MOTION IS GRANTED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PARAGRAPHS 52 AND 53 OF RELATORS' COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE FEDERAL FALSE CLAIMS ACT, DATED 8/27/2010, SHALL REMAIN UNDER SEAL UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE REDACTED COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT AND THE RECORD IN THIS ACTION BE UNSEALED UPON THE SIGNING OF THIS ORDER, AND THAT THE CLERK SHALL ISSUE SUMMONS IN THIS CASE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT UPON UNSEALING THE RECORD IN THIS ACTION, AND THE ISSUANCE OF THE SUMMONS, RELATORS WILL SERVE UPON THE DEFENDANT A COPY OF THE UNREDACTED COMPLAINT; AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE COPY OF RELATORS' COMPLAINT PARAGRAPHS 52 AND 53 REDACTED, ATTACHED TO THIS ORDER AS EXHIBIT A, WILL BE AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC UPON THE UNSEALING OF THE RECORD IN THIS ACTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 6/7/12. 6/21/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: 6/21/2012 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Revised Proposed Order Relating to MOTION to Keep Under Seal Two Paragraphs of the Original-Filed Complaint and Related Filings filed by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI. (ti, ) (Main Document 18 replaced on 6/21/2012) (ti, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: 6/21/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT RELATORS' MOTION IS GRANTED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PARAGRAPHS 52 AND 53 OF RELATORS COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS REMAIN UNDER SEAL UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT WITHIN 3 BUSINESS DAYS OF THE UNSEALING OF THE RECORD IN THIS ACTION, RELATORS WILL SERVE UPON DEFENDANT A COPY OF THE UNREDACTED COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS; AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE COPY OF THE RELATORS' COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE FEDERAL FALSE CLAIMS ACT PARAGRAPHS 52 AND 53 REDACTED, WILL BE AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC UPON THE UNSEALING OF THE RECORD IN THIS ACTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 5/30/12. 6/21/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: 6/21/2012 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION TO KEEP UNDER SEAL TWO PARAGRAPHS OF THE ORIGINAL-FILED COMPLAINT, Memorandum in Support, Certificate of Service filed by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: 6/20/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT THE COMPLAINT, THIS ORDER, AND THE US' NOTICE OF ELECTION TO DECLINE SHALL REMAIN UNDER SEAL INDEFINITELY AND SHALL NOT BE MADE PUBLIC OR SERVED UPON THE DEFENDANT OR THE RELATORS; PARTIES SHALL SERVE ALL PLEADINGS AND MOTIONS FILED IN THIS ACTION AFTER THE DATE OF THIS ORDER; PARTIES SHALL SERVE ALL NOTICES OF APPEAL UPON THE US; ALL ORDERS OF THIS COURT SHALL BE SENT TO THE US; AND SHOULD THE RELATORS OR THE DEFENDANT PROPOSE THAT THIS ACTION BE DISMISSED, SETTLED, OR OTHERWISE DISCONTINUED THE COURT WILL SOLICIT THE WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE US BEFORE FULING OR GRANTING ITS APPROVAL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 4/30/12. 6/20/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: 6/21/2012 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Election to Decline Intervention with Certificate of Service by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: 6/20/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT, DOCKET ENTRIES, AND ALL RELATED FILINGS, INCLUDING THE RELATORS' MOTION, SHALL REMAIN UNDER SEAL UNTIL AND INCLUDING 5/29/2012, OR UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 4/27/12. 6/20/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: 6/21/2012 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demand against MERCK & CO., filed by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 6/21/2012 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        UNCONTESTED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF THE SEAL ON QUI TAM ACTION AND RELATED FILINGS, Certificate of Service filed by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: 6/20/2012 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENTRY of Appearance by JOEL C. MEREDITH on behalf of STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI (ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: 6/20/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER THA THE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF SEAL IS GRANTED. THE PERIOD IN WHICH TO ELECT WHETHER TO INTERVENE IS EXTENDED UNTIL 4/27/2012. THE COMPLAINT AND ALL RELATED FILINGS SHALL REMAIN UNDER SEAL UNTIL 4/27/2012. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 10/27/11. 6/20/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: 6/20/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. THE US' PERIOD TO INTERVENE IS EXTENDED SIX MONTHS UNTIL AND INCLUDING 10/27/2011. THE COMPLAINT, DOCKET ENTRIES, AND ALL RELATED FILINGS INCLUDING THE US' MOTION AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW, SHALL OTHERWISE REMAIN UNDER SEAL. THE CLERK SHALL DELIVER A COPY OF THIS ORDER ONLY TO COUNSEL FOR THE US AND COUNSEL FOR THE RELATORS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 5/4/11. 6/20/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: 6/20/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT, DOCKET ENTRIES, AND ALL RELATED FILINGS, INCLUDING THE UNITED STATES' MOTION SHALL REMAIN UNDER SEAL AN ADDITIONAL SIX MONTHS, UNTIL AND INCLUDING 4/27/2011 OR FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT. THE US' PERIOD IN WHICH TO ELECT TO INTERVENE IS EXTENDED SIX MONTHS, UNTIL 4/27/2011. THE CLERK SHALL DELIVER A COPY OF THIS ORDER ONLY TO COUNSEL FOR THE US AND RELATORS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 10/22/10. 6/20/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: 6/20/2012 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENTRY of Appearance by GERALD B. SULLIVAN on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA with Certificate of Service(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: 6/20/2012 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENTRY of Appearance by JOEL M. SWEET on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA with Certificate of Service(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: 6/21/2012 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against MERCK & CO. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 028702.), filed by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI.(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEMAND for Trial by Jury by STEPHEN A. KRAHLING, JOAN A. WLOCHOWSKI. (ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 26,942 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?