Solis Luis Rivera
Bankruptcy Case Pennsylvania Middle Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 5:09-bk-09868
District Judge Robert N. Opel II, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Charles J. DeHart, III (Trustee), Trustee
No Logo Elizabeth Rivera, Joint Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy B. Fisher, II +1 570 842 2753 +1 570 842 8949 tbf18424@hotmail.com
No Logo Solis Luis Rivera, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy B. Fisher, II +1 570 842 2753 +1 570 842 8949 tbf18424@hotmail.com
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, Asst. U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "United States Trustee"
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None
Proceeding Memo confirmation hearing 5/18/2010 held. Plan is eligible for confirmation per Trustee. Proposed Order to be submitted. Record made. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) . (Tracy, Jane) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
    Certification that 341 Meeting of Creditors Held. Notice of confirmation hearing to be sent to all creditors. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.). Last day to Object to Plan Confirmation 3/12/2010. Confirmation hearing to be held on 3/22/2010 at 11:00 AM at 197 South Main Street, Courtroom 2, Max Rosenn US Courthouse, Wilkes-Barre, PA. (dehart, III(jd), Charles) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
      Matrix filed/Creditor List Uploaded. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Filed by Timothy B. Fisher II of Fisher and Fisher Law Offices on behalf of Elizabeth Rivera, Solis Luis Rivera (RE: related document(s)1). (Fisher, Timothy) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Space Space

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 41 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?