Li v. Chertoff et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-02425-MEJ
Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Meggy Cai Qing Li, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baughman & Wang

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Justin X. Wang +1 415 576 9923 +1 415 576 9929 justin@lawbw.com
v.
No Logo Christina Poulos, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "Condoleezza Rice"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Emilio T. Gonzalez, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office San Francisco
Filed 5/12/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 465 - Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County San Francisco
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP, E-Filing
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 ERRATA
ERRATA re [14] Reply to Response to Motion,, Cover Page by Michael Chertoff, Emilio T. Gonzalez, Christina Poulos, Condoleezza Rice. (Proctor, Melanie) (Filed on 9/4/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
    REPLY to Response to Motion re [5] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or for Summary Judgment "Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment; and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment" filed byMichael Chertoff, Emilio T. Gonzalez, Christina Poulos, Condoleezza Rice. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A--Department of State/Dybdahl Declaration, # (2) Exhibit B--USCIS/Louis Declaration)(Hollis, Christopher) (Filed on 9/4/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document 13 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/3/08. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2008)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Wayne Hollis (Hollis, Christopher) (Filed on 9/3/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 set motion and R&R; deadlines/hearings
          Set/Reset Deadlines as to [5] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2008)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
            Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' [5] Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment; and Cross Motion for Summary Judgment filed byMeggy Cai Qing Li. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of Justin X. Wang)(Wang, Justin) (Filed on 8/18/2008) Modified on 8/21/2008 (ga, COURT STAFF).
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re [9] Stipulation filed by Michael Chertoff, Emilio T. Gonzalez, Condoleezza Rice, Christina Poulos. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/4/08. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2008)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Stipulation
                STIPULATION to Vacate CMC by Michael Chertoff, Emilio T. Gonzalez, Christina Poulos, Condoleezza Rice. (Proctor, Melanie) (Filed on 7/31/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of
                  ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Wang, Justin) (Filed on 7/30/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 ~Notice (other)
                    NOTICE by Michael Chertoff, Emilio T. Gonzalez, Christina Poulos, Condoleezza Rice of Unavailability (Proctor, Melanie) (Filed on 7/16/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Proposed Order
                      Proposed Order re [5] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or for Summary Judgment by Michael Chertoff, Emilio T. Gonzalez, Christina Poulos, Condoleezza Rice. (Proctor, Melanie) (Filed on 7/14/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                        MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Chertoff, Emilio T. Gonzalez, Christina Poulos, Condoleezza Rice. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # (2) Proctor Declaration, # (3) Dybdahl Declaration, # (4) Cook Declaration, # (5) Exhibits A-C)(Proctor, Melanie) (Filed on 7/14/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                          CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Chertoff, Emilio T. Gonzalez, Christina Poulos, Condoleezza Rice.. (Proctor, Melanie) (Filed on 7/14/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Meggy Cai Qing Li (Wang, Justin) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 ADR Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                              ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2008. Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2008 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/12/08. (Attachments: # (1) Judge Standing Order, # (2) Court Standing Order, # (3) Consent/Decline Form)(gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2008)
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
                                PETITION for Writ of Mandamus / issued summons (Filing fee $350 receipt number 34611019057). Filed byMeggy Cai Qing Li. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2008)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 Case Referred to ECF
                                  CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2008)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 104 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?