Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. v. Abt Electronics, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:09-cv-00313
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 28, 2017 at 12:15 AM EST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon S Judkins +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 bsjudkins@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Trevor Carter +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 trevor.carter@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DANIEL M. LECHLEITER +1 317 237 1070 +1 317 237 1000 Daniel.Lechleiter@FaegreBD.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STACY L. PRALL +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 stacy.prall@faegrebd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stevens Henry, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott English Stevens +1 903 753 6760 +1 903 753 6761 scott@stevenshenry.com
No Logo Abt Electronics, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brann & Isaacson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/10/2012, PRO HAC VICE Peter J. Brann +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 pbrann@brannlaw.com
TERMINATED: 02/10/2012 Stacy O Stitham +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 sstitham@brannlaw.com
TERMINATED: 02/10/2012, PRO HAC VICE David A. Swetnam-Burland +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 dsb@brannlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste 3000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/10/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark T. Mitchell +1 512 542 7000 +1 512 542 7272 mmitchell@gardere.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/10/2012 Jennifer Parker Ainsworth +1 903 509 5000 +1 903 509 5092 jainsworth@wilsonlawfirm.com
No Logo Bluefly, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by One Financial Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/02/2011, PRO HAC VICE Courtney M. Quish cquish@mintz.com
TERMINATED: 03/02/2011, PRO HAC VICE Courtney M. Quish cquish@mintz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/02/2011 William Belanger +1 617 204 5101 +1 607 204 5150 belangew@pepperlaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/02/2011 William Belanger +1 617 204 5101 +1 607 204 5150 belangew@pepperlaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/02/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Alexandra C. Fennell +1 617 204 5158 fennella@pepperlaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/02/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Alexandra C. Fennell +1 617 204 5158 fennella@pepperlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 4500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/02/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Ernest Richardson +1 713 951 6284 +1 713 951 3720 mrichardson@brsfirm.com
TERMINATED: 03/02/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Ernest Richardson +1 713 951 6284 +1 713 951 3720 mrichardson@brsfirm.com
No Logo Coastal Contacts Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/05/2010 Robert Christopher Bunt +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 rcbunt@pbatyler.com
No Logo Improvement Direct, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Charles van Cleef, Attorney at Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/07/2011 Charles Van Cleef +1 903 248 8244 +1 903 248 8249 charles@vancleef.pro

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 125

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/07/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Henry Pogorzelski +1 281 501 3425 +1 832 415 2535 hpogorzelski@cepiplaw.com
No Logo PetMed Express, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brann & Isaacson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/30/2012, PRO HAC VICE Peter J. Brann +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 pbrann@brannlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by One Financial Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/28/2011, PRO HAC VICE Courtney M. Quish cquish@mintz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/28/2011 William Belanger +1 617 204 5101 +1 607 204 5150 belangew@pepperlaw.com
TERMINATED: 02/28/2011 Alexandra C. Fennell +1 617 204 5158 fennella@pepperlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 4500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/28/2011 Michael Ernest Richardson +1 713 951 6284 +1 713 951 3720 mrichardson@brsfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/30/2012 Jennifer Parker Ainsworth +1 903 509 5000 +1 903 509 5092 jainsworth@wilsonlawfirm.com
No Logo Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of MATTHEW GROSSMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/09/2012 Donald Daybell +1 949 567 6700 +1 949 567 6710 ddaybell@orrick.com
TERMINATED: 01/09/2012 Donald Daybell +1 949 567 6700 +1 949 567 6710 ddaybell@orrick.com
TERMINATED: 01/09/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY Donald Daybell +1 949 567 6700 +1 949 567 6710 ddaybell@orrick.com
TERMINATED: 01/09/2012, PRO HAC VICE Benjamin S Lin +1 949 567 6700 +1 949 567 6710 blin@orrick.com
TERMINATED: 01/09/2012, PRO HAC VICE Benjamin S Lin +1 949 567 6700 +1 949 567 6710 blin@orrick.com
TERMINATED: 01/09/2012, PRO HAC VICE Benjamin S Lin +1 949 567 6700 +1 949 567 6710 blin@orrick.com
TERMINATED: 01/09/2012, PRO HAC VICE Mark P Wine +1 949 852 7704 +1 949 567 6710 mwine@orrick.com
TERMINATED: 01/09/2012, PRO HAC VICE Mark P Wine +1 949 852 7704 +1 949 567 6710 mwine@orrick.com
TERMINATED: 01/09/2012, PRO HAC VICE Mark P Wine +1 949 852 7704 +1 949 567 6710 mwine@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ritcheson, Lauffer & Vincent, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/09/2012 Lance Vincent +1 903 535 2900 +1 903 533 8646 lancev@rllawfirm.net
TERMINATED: 01/09/2012 Lance Vincent +1 903 535 2900 +1 903 533 8646 lancev@rllawfirm.net
TERMINATED: 01/09/2012 Lance Vincent +1 903 535 2900 +1 903 533 8646 lancev@rllawfirm.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1600

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/09/2012, PRO HAC VICE Andre De La Cruz +1 949 672 7686 andre.delacruz@wdc.com
TERMINATED: 01/09/2012 Andre De La Cruz +1 949 672 7686 andre.delacruz@wdc.com
TERMINATED: 01/09/2012, PRO HAC VICE Andre De La Cruz +1 949 672 7686 andre.delacruz@wdc.com
TERMINATED: 01/09/2012 Cynthia A Lock +1 949 567 6700 clock@orrick.com
v.
No Logo Abt Electronics, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brann & Isaacson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/10/2012, PRO HAC VICE Peter J. Brann +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 pbrann@brannlaw.com
TERMINATED: 02/10/2012 Stacy O Stitham +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 sstitham@brannlaw.com
TERMINATED: 02/10/2012, PRO HAC VICE David A. Swetnam-Burland +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 dsb@brannlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste 3000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/10/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark T. Mitchell +1 512 542 7000 +1 512 542 7272 mmitchell@gardere.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/10/2012 Jennifer Parker Ainsworth +1 903 509 5000 +1 903 509 5092 jainsworth@wilsonlawfirm.com
No Logo Bluefly, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by One Financial Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/02/2011, PRO HAC VICE Courtney M. Quish cquish@mintz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/02/2011 William Belanger +1 617 204 5101 +1 607 204 5150 belangew@pepperlaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/02/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Alexandra C. Fennell +1 617 204 5158 fennella@pepperlaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/02/2011 Tuhin Ganguly gangulyt@pepperlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 4500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/02/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Ernest Richardson +1 713 951 6284 +1 713 951 3720 mrichardson@brsfirm.com
No Logo Coastal Contacts Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold, Knobloch & Saunders, L.l.p.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/05/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Gordon T Arnold +1 713 972 1649 +1 713 972 1150 garnold@arnold-iplaw.com
TERMINATED: 10/05/2010 Jason A Saunders +1 713 335 3020 +1 713 972 1150 jsaunders@arnold-iplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Benjamin Law PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/05/2010, PRO HAC VICE Marcus Burrowes amy@benjaminlawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/05/2010 Charles Ainsworth +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 charley@pbatyler.com
TERMINATED: 10/05/2010 Robert Christopher Bunt +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 rcbunt@pbatyler.com
No Logo Improvement Direct, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Charles van Cleef, Attorney at Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/07/2011 Charles Van Cleef +1 903 248 8244 +1 903 248 8249 charles@vancleef.pro

Toggle Switch Represented by Red Hat, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/07/2011 Erick Scott Robinson +1 713 256 3879 erobinson@redhat.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 125

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/07/2011 Michael James Collins +1 281 501 3490 +1 832 415 2535 mcollins@ip-lit.com
TERMINATED: 01/07/2011 John J Edmonds +1 713 364 5291 +1 832 415 2535 jedmonds@ip-lit.com
TERMINATED: 01/07/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Henry Pogorzelski +1 281 501 3425 +1 832 415 2535 hpogorzelski@cepiplaw.com
No Logo PetMed Express, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brann & Isaacson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/30/2012, PRO HAC VICE Peter J. Brann +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 pbrann@brannlaw.com
TERMINATED: 05/30/2012 Stacy O Stitham +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 sstitham@brannlaw.com
TERMINATED: 02/10/2012 David A. Swetnam-Burland +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 dsb@brannlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by One Financial Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/28/2011, PRO HAC VICE Courtney M. Quish cquish@mintz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/28/2011 William Belanger +1 617 204 5101 +1 607 204 5150 belangew@pepperlaw.com
TERMINATED: 02/28/2011 Alexandra C. Fennell +1 617 204 5158 fennella@pepperlaw.com
TERMINATED: 05/30/2012 Tuhin Ganguly gangulyt@pepperlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 4500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/28/2011 Michael Ernest Richardson +1 713 951 6284 +1 713 951 3720 mrichardson@brsfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/30/2012 Jennifer Parker Ainsworth +1 903 509 5000 +1 903 509 5092 jainsworth@wilsonlawfirm.com
No Logo Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of MATTHEW GROSSMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/09/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY Donald Daybell +1 949 567 6700 +1 949 567 6710 ddaybell@orrick.com
TERMINATED: 01/09/2012, PRO HAC VICE Benjamin S Lin +1 949 567 6700 +1 949 567 6710 blin@orrick.com
TERMINATED: 01/09/2012, PRO HAC VICE Mark P Wine +1 949 852 7704 +1 949 567 6710 mwine@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ritcheson, Lauffer & Vincent, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/09/2012 Lance Vincent +1 903 535 2900 +1 903 533 8646 lancev@rllawfirm.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1600

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/09/2012, PRO HAC VICE Andre De La Cruz +1 949 672 7686 andre.delacruz@wdc.com
TERMINATED: 01/09/2012, PRO HAC VICE Cynthia A Lock +1 949 567 6700 clock@orrick.com
No Logo The Estee Lauder Companies, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Coghlan Crowson et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/20/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Rickey Lawrence Faulkner +1 903 758 5543 +1 903 753 6989 rfaulkner@ccfww.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins Kaplan Miller & Ciresi - Minneapolis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/20/2010, PRO HAC VICE Jan M Conlin +1 612 361 8200 JMC@CiresiConlin.com
TERMINATED: 12/20/2010 Sharon Elizabeth Roberg-Perez +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 seroberg-perez@rkmc.com
No Logo Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2011 Brandon S Judkins +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 bsjudkins@gmail.com
TERMINATED: 09/30/2011 Brandon S Judkins +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 bsjudkins@gmail.com
TERMINATED: 09/30/2011 Brandon S Judkins +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 bsjudkins@gmail.com
TERMINATED: 09/30/2011 Brandon S Judkins +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 bsjudkins@gmail.com
TERMINATED: 09/30/2011 Brandon S Judkins +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 bsjudkins@gmail.com
TERMINATED: 09/30/2011 Brandon S Judkins +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 bsjudkins@gmail.com
TERMINATED: 09/30/2011 Brandon S Judkins +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 bsjudkins@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Trevor Carter +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 trevor.carter@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Trevor Carter +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 trevor.carter@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Trevor Carter +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 trevor.carter@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Trevor Carter +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 trevor.carter@faegrebd.com
LEAD ATTORNEY R. Trevor Carter +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 trevor.carter@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Trevor Carter +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 trevor.carter@faegrebd.com
Space R. Trevor Carter +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 trevor.carter@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DANIEL M. LECHLEITER +1 317 237 1070 +1 317 237 1000 Daniel.Lechleiter@FaegreBD.com
Space DANIEL M. LECHLEITER +1 317 237 1070 +1 317 237 1000 Daniel.Lechleiter@FaegreBD.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DANIEL M. LECHLEITER +1 317 237 1070 +1 317 237 1000 Daniel.Lechleiter@FaegreBD.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DANIEL M. LECHLEITER +1 317 237 1070 +1 317 237 1000 Daniel.Lechleiter@FaegreBD.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DANIEL M. LECHLEITER +1 317 237 1070 +1 317 237 1000 Daniel.Lechleiter@FaegreBD.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DANIEL M. LECHLEITER +1 317 237 1070 +1 317 237 1000 Daniel.Lechleiter@FaegreBD.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STACY L. PRALL +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 stacy.prall@faegrebd.com
Space STACY L. PRALL +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 stacy.prall@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STACY L. PRALL +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 stacy.prall@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STACY L. PRALL +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 stacy.prall@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STACY L. PRALL +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 stacy.prall@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STACY L. PRALL +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 stacy.prall@faegrebd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stevens Henry, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott English Stevens +1 903 753 6760 +1 903 753 6761 scott@stevenshenry.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Scott English Stevens +1 903 753 6760 +1 903 753 6761 scott@stevenshenry.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott English Stevens +1 903 753 6760 +1 903 753 6761 scott@stevenshenry.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott English Stevens +1 903 753 6760 +1 903 753 6761 scott@stevenshenry.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott English Stevens +1 903 753 6760 +1 903 753 6761 scott@stevenshenry.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott English Stevens +1 903 753 6760 +1 903 753 6761 scott@stevenshenry.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott English Stevens +1 903 753 6760 +1 903 753 6761 scott@stevenshenry.com
No Logo Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of MATTHEW GROSSMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/09/2012 Donald Daybell +1 949 567 6700 +1 949 567 6710 ddaybell@orrick.com
TERMINATED: 01/09/2012, PRO HAC VICE Benjamin S Lin +1 949 567 6700 +1 949 567 6710 blin@orrick.com
TERMINATED: 01/09/2012, PRO HAC VICE Mark P Wine +1 949 852 7704 +1 949 567 6710 mwine@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ritcheson, Lauffer & Vincent, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/09/2012 Lance Vincent +1 903 535 2900 +1 903 533 8646 lancev@rllawfirm.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1600

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/09/2012, PRO HAC VICE Andre De La Cruz +1 949 672 7686 andre.delacruz@wdc.com
No Logo Abt Electronics, Inc., ThirdParty Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brann & Isaacson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/10/2012 Peter J. Brann +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 pbrann@brannlaw.com
TERMINATED: 02/10/2012 Stacy O Stitham +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 sstitham@brannlaw.com
TERMINATED: 02/10/2012 David A. Swetnam-Burland +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 dsb@brannlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste 3000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/10/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark T. Mitchell +1 512 542 7000 +1 512 542 7272 mmitchell@gardere.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/10/2012 Jennifer Parker Ainsworth +1 903 509 5000 +1 903 509 5092 jainsworth@wilsonlawfirm.com
No Logo Coastal Contacts Inc., ThirdParty Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold, Knobloch & Saunders, L.l.p.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/05/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Gordon T Arnold +1 713 972 1649 +1 713 972 1150 garnold@arnold-iplaw.com
TERMINATED: 10/05/2010 Jason A Saunders +1 713 335 3020 +1 713 972 1150 jsaunders@arnold-iplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Benjamin Law PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/05/2010 Marcus Burrowes amy@benjaminlawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/05/2010 Charles Ainsworth +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 charley@pbatyler.com
TERMINATED: 10/05/2010 Robert Christopher Bunt +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 rcbunt@pbatyler.com
No Logo Elastic Path Software, Inc., ThirdParty Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dan Duncan Davison +1 214 855 8000 +1 214 855 8200 dan.davison@nortonrosefulbright.com
No Logo PowerUser, ThirdParty Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/20/2012 Bradley H. Foreman +1 312 558 1850 +1 312 558 1852 brad@bradleyforeman.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (242) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 241 Motion to Dismiss the Third Party Complaint filed by ABT Electronics against PowerUser Incorporated be and is hereby dismissed. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/20/12. (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
    MOTION to Dismiss by PowerUser. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Foreman, Bradley) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER - granting 239 Stipulation of Dismissal. All claima and counterclaims against PetMed Express Inc is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own cost, expenses and attorney fees. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/30/2012. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
        STIPULATION of Dismissal of PetMed Express, Inc. by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Richard) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting 237 Motion to Stay All Deadlines as Between Plaintiff and Defendant PetMed Express, Inc. until May 31, 2012, pending the finalization of a settlement agreement between the parties. Parties to file with the Court either an Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Defendant PetMed or a status report regarding the finalization of the settlement agreement on or before May 31, 2012. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/2/12. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
            Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines as Between Plaintiff and PetMed Express, Inc. by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
              MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Petmed Express, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 David Swetnam-Burland Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A to David Swetnam-Burland Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to David Swetnam-Burland Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to David Swetnam-Burland Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to David Swetnam-Burland Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to David Swetnam-Burland Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to David Swetnam-Burland Declaration, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Swetnam-Burland, David) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER granting 234 Motion Leave to Produce Settlement Negotiation Documents. Plaintiff may comply with the Courts Order of April 3, 2012 (ECF No. 232, filed Apr. 4, 2012) on a rolling basis, with such compliance beginning on April 24, 2012 and continuing until completed no later than May 8, 2012. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/23/12. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Produce Settlement Negotiation Documents on a Rolling Basis re 232 Memorandum & Opinion,, by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lechleiter, Daniel) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER - Defendant PetMed Express, Inc. (PetMed) has filed a letter brief requesting permission to file a motion for summary judgment of invalidity under 35 U.S.C. § 112, 1. On consideration of the letter brief and all timely filed responses,the Court ORDERS that PetMeds request is GRANTED. PetMed has the Courts permission to file a motion for summary judgment on the issues set forth in its letter brief. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/11/12. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 232 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - GRANTS the Motion to Compel and ORDERS Plaintiff to produce draft license agreements and communications, if any, between Hill and third parties relating to the negotiation of license agr eements entered into to resolve past claims under the patents-in-suitwithin twenty-one (21) days of this Order. Pursuant to the existing Protective Order, such documents shall be designated "Outside Counsel Eyes Only Confidential Information.". Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/3/2012. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                        MOTION to Dismiss by PowerUser. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Foreman, Bradley) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/28/2012: # 2 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ). (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                          Letter Brief filed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Lechleiter, Daniel) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
                            Letter Brief filed by Petmed Express, Inc., (Attachments: # 1 Reply Letter Brief in Support of Request for Permission to File Motion for Summary Judgment)(Swetnam-Burland, David) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                              ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***Letter Brief filed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. (Lechleiter, Daniel) Modified on 3/13/2012 (sm, ). (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                Letter Brief filed by Petmed Express, Inc., (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Letter Brief), # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Swetnam-Burland, David) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ***ENTERED IN WRONG CASE BY CHAMBERS.***ORDER granting 170 Motion to Compel. GRANTS the Motion to Compel upon the following term herein. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/22/2012. (ch, ) Modified on 2/22/2012 (ch, ). (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting 220 Motion for Reconsideration. The Courts prior construction of the terms integrating and combining be, and hereby is, modified as follows: With respect to the asserted claims in this case, the terms integrating and combining mean merging or uniting in the remote computer the constant data and variable data in a meaningful way except that as used in claim 1 of the 649 Patent combining means merging or uniting in the remote computer the graphics data and textual data in a meaningful way.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/15/12. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      FIRST AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Discovery due by 8/3/2012., Motions due by 9/26/2012., Pretrial Order due by 9/19/2012., Jury Selection set for 11/5/2012 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2012 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap.), Motions terminated: 222 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 121 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions filed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc... Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/10/12. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting 221 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. as to deft Abt Electronics Inc. Plaintiff's Complaint against Abt Electronics, Inc. is dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. Abt Electronics, Inc.'s claims and counterclaims against Plaintiff are dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses and attorney's fees.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/10/12. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                                          Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 121 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,,,,, by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lechleiter, Daniel) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None
                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Abt Electronics, Inc. by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Richard) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                              Unopposed MOTION for Reconsideration re 219 Memorandum & Opinion,, by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Lechleiter Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lechleiter, Daniel) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 219 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - The Court adopts the constructions set forth in this opinion for the disputed terms of the patents-in-suit. The parties are ordered that they may not refer, directly or indirectly, to each others claim construction positions in the presence of the jury. Likewise, the parties are ordered to refrain from mentioning any portion of this opinion, other than the actual definitions adopted by the Court, in the presence of the jury. Any reference to claim construction proceedings is limited to informing the jury of the definitions adopted by the Court. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/10/12. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. of Change of Law Firm and E-Mail Addresses (Carter, Richard) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting 216 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. as to deft Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation. Plaintiffs Complaint against Ralph Lauren is dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. Ralph Laurens claims and counterclaims against Plaintiff are dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/6/12. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal Between Plaintiff and Defendant Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Richard) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/22/11 before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons, CSR,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 1/30/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/9/2012. (lss, ) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. Regarding Submission of Second Revised Claim Construction Chart Pursuant to P.R. 4-5(d) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Second Revised Joint Claim Construction Chart)(Carter, Richard) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Markman Hearing held on 12/22/2011. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (bga, ) (Entered: 12/27/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. Regarding Submission of Revised Claim Construction Chart Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 4-5(d) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Revised Joint Claim Construction Chart)(Lechleiter, Daniel) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. of Compliance with Local Patent Rule 4-5(d) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Joint Claim Construction Chart)(Lechleiter, Daniel) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER - Claim Construction Hearing set for 12/22/2011 09:00 AM in (Marshall) before Judge David Folsom. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/2/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER - The Court previously set the above-captioned case for a Claim Construction Hearing on November 29, 2011. See 12/8/2010 Docket Control Order, Dkt. No. 121 at 3. The criminal trial of USA v. Ansan Suman-Amir Meadows, No. 5:10-CR-5, is set to begin on November 28, 2011. The Claim Construction Hearing in the above-captioned case is therefore hereby CONTINUED to a date to be determined by the Court. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/21/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting 207 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/17/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lechleiter, Daniel) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Lechleiter, Daniel) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 204 Motion to Amend docket control order to extend deadline. The Docket Control Order is hereby modified such that the new deadline for Hills Reply Claim Construction Brief is November 16, 2011.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/14/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 11/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order to Extend the Deadline for Hill's Reply Claim Construction Brief by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lechleiter, Daniel) (Entered: 11/11/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                DEFENDANTS' RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Abt Electronics, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc., and Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Swetnam-Burland, David) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  MISC. ORDER 11-1 REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Judge T. John Ward no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/3/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 200 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brandon S Judkins terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/30/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed on behalf of Brandon S. Judkins by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Richard) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting 198 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/29/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lechleiter, Daniel) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Lechleiter Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A - US Pat 5,528,490, # 3 Exhibit B - US Pat 5,761,649, # 4 Exhibit C - US Pat 6,029,142, # 5 Exhibit D - Compusere Claim Constr Order, # 6 Exhibit E - Amazon Claim Constr Order, # 7 Exhibit F - Abercrombie Claim Constr Order, # 8 Exhibit G - definition of graphics, # 9 Exhibit H - definition of graphics, # 10 Exhibit I - definition of data, # 11 Exhibit J - definition of data, # 12 Exhibit K - definition of request, # 13 Exhibit L - definition of query, # 14 Exhibit M - definition of query, # 15 Exhibit N - definition of coupled, # 16 Exhibit O - definition of automatic connection, # 17 Exhibit P - definition of automatic, # 18 Exhibit Q - definition of automatic, # 19 Exhibit R - definition of connection, # 20 Exhibit S - definition of disconnect)(Lechleiter, Daniel) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting 195 Motion to Amend/Correct. Docket Control Order is hereby modified to the new deadlines herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/28/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order to Extend Claim Construction Briefing Deadlines by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lechleiter, Daniel) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting 193 Motion to Amend/Correct. Parties shall complete mediation by 10/5/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/22/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 121 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,,,,, 191 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Abt Electronics, Inc., Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,, Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Richard) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      ANSWER to 189 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc..(Lechleiter, Daniel) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting 190 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/11/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Abt Electronics, Inc., Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,, Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swetnam-Burland, David) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            First Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. by Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation.(Wine, Mark) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting 187 Plantiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Modify the Docket Control Order to Extend Claim Construction Briefing Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on August 4, 2011. (jml) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Claim Construction Briefing by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lechleiter, Daniel) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Pursuant to patent local rule 4-3 by Abt Electronics, Inc., Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,, Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - chart of Agreed Limitations, # 2 Exhibit B - chart of Disputed Limitations)(Lechleiter, Daniel) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 177 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Abt Electronics, Inc.. (Stitham, Stacy) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 181 Motion to Amend docket control order deadlines. The deadlines for P.R. 4-2, P.R. 4-3, and the discovery deadline for claim construction issues are respectively moved to July 14, 2011, July 28, 2011, and August 12, 2011.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/5/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 177 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by PowerUser. (Foreman, Bradley) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 182 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 170 MOTION to Compel Settlement Negotiation Documents filed by Abt Electronics, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,, Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter J. Brann, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 121 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,,,,, Modify the Docket Control Order to Extend Deadlines for Claim Construction by Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wine, Mark) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 177 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Abt Electronics, Inc.. (Stitham, Stacy) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 170 MOTION to Compel Settlement Negotiation Documents filed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Lechleiter, Daniel) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 175 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. 170 MOTION to Compel Settlement Negotiation Documents. Responses due by 6/23/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on June 16, 2011. (delat, ) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by PowerUser. (Foreman, Bradley) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ljw, ). (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      PLEASE IGNORE, ATTORNEY TO REFILE MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by PowerUser. Responses due by 6/29/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Foreman, Bradley) Modified on 6/16/2011 (ljw, ). (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 170 MOTION to Compel Settlement Negotiation Documents by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Richard) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (Lechleiter, Daniel) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Abt Electronics, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,, Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation of Compliance with Local Patent Rules (Wine, Mark) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 171 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Compel (ECF No. 170). Responses due by 6/16/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/27/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 170 MOTION to Compel Settlement Negotiation Documents by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lechleiter, Daniel) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel Settlement Negotiation Documents by Abt Electronics, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,, Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stitham, Stacy) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. of Compliance with Identification of Privileged Materials (Lechleiter, Daniel) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation Compliance with Identification of Privileged Materials (Vincent, Lance) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation Compliance with Identification of Privileged Materials (Vincent, Lance) Modified on 5/20/2011 (ch, ). (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Abt Electronics, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc., of Compliance with Identification of Privileged Materials (Stitham, Stacy) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant Abt Electronics, Inc. to Produce Documents and Electronically Stored Information in a Reasonably Usable Format (Dkt. #118) set for 5/10/2011, 12:00 PM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham is CANCELLED. (delat, ) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER withdrawing 118 Motion to Compel; granting 163 Motion to Withdraw. The Motion to Compel is withdrawn without prejudice to re-file. Further, there is no need for the hearing on the Motion to Compel on May 10, 2011 at 12:00 noon (see ECF No. 162), and the hearing is, therefore, CANCELED.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/2/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 118 MOTION to Compel Defendant Abt Electronics, Inc. to Produce Documents and Electronically Stored Information in a Reasonably Usable Format by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lechleiter, Daniel) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant ABT Electronics, Inc., to Produce Documents and Electronically Stored Information in a Reasonably Usable Format (Dkt. #118) set for 5/10/2011, 12:00 PM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (delat, ) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 159 Motion to Withdraw 143 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on April 26, 2011. (jml) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 158 Motion for Extension of Time to Exchange Privilege Logs. Deadline is extended through and including May 20, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on April 26, 2011. (jml) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Letter Brief by Abt Electronics, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,, Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stitham, Stacy) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Lechleiter, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/21/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). (Entered: 04/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 156 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants Abt Electronics, Inc., PetMed Express, Inc. and Polo Ralph Lauren Corporations Letter Brief. Responses due by 4/25/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/12/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 142 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, Plaintiff's Third Unopposed Motion to Extend Time by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevens, Scott) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 154 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Dfts Letter Brief 142 . Responses due by 4/11/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/29/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiff's Second Unopposed Motion To Extend Time by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevens, Scott) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 151 Motion for Extension of Time to File a response to Defendants Abt Electronics, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc. and Polo Ralph Lauren Corporations Letter Brief. Plaintiff Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc., shall have until and including March 28, 2011, to file a response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/17/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 139 Third Party Complaint by PowerUser.(Foreman, Bradley) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Letter Brief by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevens, Scott) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. PowerUser served on 2/24/2011 by CM RRR, answer due 3/17/2011. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bradley H Foreman for PowerUser. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-357) (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER - granting 147 Stipulation of Dismissal. Dft Bluefly Inc is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/2/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal for Bluefly, Inc. by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Richard) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 141 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Jennifer Parker Ainsworth,Peter J Brann for Petmed Express, Inc.,,Jennifer Parker Ainsworth,Peter J Brann for Petmed Express, Inc.,. Attorney William D Belanger and Michael Ernest Richardson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/28/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 141 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Jennifer Parker Ainsworth,Peter J Brann,David Asher Swetnam-Burland,Stacy O Stitham for Petmed Express, Inc.,. Attorney Courtney Quish; Michael Ernest Richardson; William D Belanger and Alexandra C Fennell terminated as counsel for Petmed Express Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/28/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Additional Attachments to Main Document: 143 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed,.. (Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 143 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Letter Brief filed by Abt Electronics, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,, Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Letter Brief Seeking Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***Letter Brief filed by Abt Electronics, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,, Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Letter Brief Seeking Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment)(Stitham, Stacy) Modified on 2/25/2011 (ch, ). (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Petmed Express, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richardson, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to PowerUser. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against PowerUser, filed by Abt Electronics, Inc..(Stitham, Stacy) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 137 Motion for Leave to File to File Third-Party Complaint.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/16/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint by Abt Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Third Party Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stitham, Stacy) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation (Compliance with P.R. 3-4(a)) (Lin, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. of Compliance with Discovery Order (Lechleiter, Daniel) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by Abt Electronics, Inc., Bluefly, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,, Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation (Invalidity Contentions) (Swetnam-Burland, David) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by Abt Electronics, Inc. (Compliance with PR 3-4(a)) (Swetnam-Burland, David) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re 131 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. as to deft Build.com Inc f/k/a Improvement Direct Inc.All claims in complaint dismissed with prejudice. Any counterclaims by Build.com, are dismissed with prejudice except that Build.com's counterclaims for non-infringement and patent invalidity are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses and attorney fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/7/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, R) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 129 Motion for Leave to File Excess Page Limits in regard to Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Compel Abt Electronics, Inc. to Produce Documents and Electronically Stored Information in a Reasonably Usable Format ("Reply Brief"). Plaintiff may have leave to exceed the page limit for reply briefs set forth under Local Rule CV-7(a)(2) by three (3) pages, and deems the Reply Brief as properly filed.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/22/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lechleiter, Daniel) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 118 MOTION to Compel Defendant Abt Electronics, Inc. to Produce Documents and Electronically Stored Information in a Reasonably Usable Format filed by Abt Electronics, Inc.. (Stitham, Stacy) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 124 Motion to modify the discovery order. Deadline for Additional Disclosures 3(b) is extended to January 11, 2011.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/20/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 118 MOTION to Compel Defendant Abt Electronics, Inc. to Produce Documents and Electronically Stored Information in a Reasonably Usable Format filed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Carter, R) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 123 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by The Estee Lauder Companies Inc., Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. All claims and counterclaims against pltf and deft are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses and attorneys' fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/20/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct The Discovery Order To Extend Deadline for Additional Disclosures by Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wine, Mark) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal of The Estee Lauder Companies Inc. by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc., The Estee Lauder Companies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, R) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 118 MOTION to Compel Defendant Abt Electronics, Inc. to Produce Documents and Electronically Stored Information in a Reasonably Usable Format filed by Abt Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Stitham, Stacy) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, ( Amended Pleadings due by 8/8/2011., Discovery due by 8/3/2012., Expert Witness List due by 6/1/2012., Joinder of Parties due by 2/15/2011., Markman Hearing set for 11/29/2011 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham., Motions due by 10/17/2012., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/10/2012., Jury Selection set for 11/5/2012 09:00AM before Judge T. John Ward., Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2012 09:00 AM before Judge T. John Ward.), Motions terminated: 119 Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order and Discovery Order filed by The Estee Lauder Companies Inc., Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,, Improvement Direct, Inc., Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation, Abt Electronics, Inc., Bluefly, Inc... Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/8/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/8/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Abt Electronics, Inc., Bluefly, Inc., Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc., Improvement Direct, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,, Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation, The Estee Lauder Companies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Docket Control Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Discovery Order)(Carter, R) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER # 118 *** MOTION to Compel Defendant Abt Electronics, Inc. to Produce Documents and Electronically Stored Information in a Reasonably Usable Format by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of D. Lechleiter, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Lechleiter Decl, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Lechleiter Decl, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Lechleiter Decl, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Lechleiter Decl, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Lechleiter Decl, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Lechleiter Decl, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Lechleiter Decl, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Lechleiter Decl, # 10 Affidavit of G. Barberio, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, R) Modified on 5/3/2011 (ehs, ). (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 94 Joint Motion for Entry of Docket Control Order and Discovery Order. The parties will submit a docket control order and discovery order reflecting this order within ten days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/22/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 95 Motion to Compel. Pursuant to the terms of the protective order entered in this litigation, the court orders Hill to produce all final, executed, license and settlement agreements between Hill and any third party related to the patents-in-suit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/19/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 103 Motion - The Court adopts the parties Agreed Electronic Discovery Protocol (Dkt. # 103).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/19/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Improvement Direct, Inc. (Pogorzelski, Henry) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Bluefly, Inc. Notice of Compliance with Initial Disclosure Requirements (Richardson, Michael) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Petmed Express, Inc., Notice of Compliance with Initial Disclosure Requirements (Richardson, Michael) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation (Lin, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by The Estee Lauder Companies Inc. (Faulkner, Rickey) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. of service of initial disclosures (Lechleiter, Daniel) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by Abt Electronics, Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Swetnam-Burland, David) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Tuhin Ganguly for Bluefly, Inc.,Tuhin Ganguly for Petmed Express, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-45) (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 99 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Abt Electronics, Inc. by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc..(Lechleiter, Daniel) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Improvement Direct, Inc. of Name Change (Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erick Scott Robinson on behalf of Improvement Direct, Inc. (Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Enter Agreed Electronic Discovery Protocol by Bluefly, Inc., Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc., Improvement Direct, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,, Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation, The Estee Lauder Companies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lechleiter, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/5/2010: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 101 Motion to Dismiss Defendant, Coastal Contacts Inc without prejudice until full payment of the Agreement is made. Defendant's claims and counterclaims against Plaintiff are dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE until full payment under the agreement is made. Once full payment is made, any claims and counterclaims asserted by Defendant are dismissed with PREJUDICE. 3. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/5/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, R) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2010: # 2 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ). (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. of Preliminary Infringement Contentions (Lechleiter, Daniel) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. by Abt Electronics, Inc..(Stitham, Stacy) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. re 97 Order, confirming compliance (Judkins, Brandon) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER - The court grants leave for the third-party licensees to file objections to the motion to compel within fourteen days of this order. Hill shall immediately forward a copy of this order to the last known counsel of the objecting third parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/21/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 90 Report and Recommendations denying # 48 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/20/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Compel Production of License Agreements by Abt Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Peter J. Brann, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brann, Peter) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Docket Control Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Discovery Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Defendants' Proposed Docket Control Order, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Defendants' Proposed Discovery Order)(Carter, R) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2010: # 5 PLFT'S REVISED DISCOVERY ORDER, # 6 Exhibit B Plt's REVISED DOCKED CONTROL ORDER, # 7 Exhibit C Dft's REVISED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, # 8 Exhibit D - Dft's REVISED DISCOVERY ORDER) (ch, ). (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 91 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control and Discovery Orders. Deadline extended to 9/16/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/10/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OBJECTION to 90 Report and Recommendations by Abt Electronics, Inc.. (Stitham, Stacy) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control and Discovery Orders by Coastal Contacts Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - recommends denying 48 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Abt Electronics, Inc... Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/31/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Van Cleef on behalf of Improvement Direct, Inc. (Van Cleef, Charles) (Entered: 08/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bobby Lance Vincent on behalf of Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation (Vincent, Bobby) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AGREED ORDER on Expert Discovery as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/18/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/17/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION Entry of Agreed Order on Expert Discovery by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prall, Stacy) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prall, Stacy) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by Henry Mark Pogorzelski (Pogorzelski, Henry) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sharon E Roberg-Perez for The Estee Lauder Companies Inc.. (APPROVED FEE PAID 2-1-5507)(ehs, ) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jan M Conlin for The Estee Lauder Companies Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5507) (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER setting Status Conference set for 8/30/2010 09:45 AM before Judge T. John Ward and Magistrate Judge Chad Everingham. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/21/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Cynthia A Lock for Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5487 (ch, ) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 76 Motion to Dismiss. ORDERED that Defendant and Third-Party Plaintiff Coastal Contacts, Inc.s Third- Party Complaint and any and all motions relating thereto, including the following Elastic Path motions: Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint, Motion for Enforcement of Arbitration Agreement, Motion to Compel Arbitration are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/18/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 75 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 73 Third Party MOTION to Compel Arbitration, 71 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint, 72 Third Party MOTION Enforcement of Arbitration Agreement Responses due by 5/14/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/18/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Coastal Contacts Inc.. Responses due by 6/1/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Saunders, Jason) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 72 Third Party MOTION Enforcement of Arbitration Agreement, 71 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint, 73 Third Party MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Coastal Contacts Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Benjamin S Lin,Andre De La Cruz,Mark P Wine for Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation,Benjamin S Lin,Andre De La Cruz,Mark P Wine for Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation,Benjamin S Lin,Andre De La Cruz,Mark P Wine for Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation,Benjamin S Lin,Andre De La Cruz,Mark P Wine for Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 PHV de La Cruz, # 2 PHV Mark Wine RECEIPT 2--1-5336)(rml, ) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/18/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Third Party MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Elastic Path Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Appendix, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Davison, Dan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/26/2010: # 5 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ). (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Third Party MOTION Enforcement of Arbitration Agreement by Elastic Path Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Appendix, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Davison, Dan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/26/2010: # 5 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ). (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint by Elastic Path Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Appendix, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Davison, Dan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/26/2010: # 5 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ). (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dan Duncan Davison on behalf of Elastic Path Software, Inc. (Davison, Dan) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to (Third Party Dft) Elastic Path Software, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 65 Motion for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint for Indemnity. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/30/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. re 65 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint for Indemnity that Hill does not oppose Coastal Contacts' Motion for Leave (Carter, R) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Elastic Path Software, Inc., filed by Coastal Contacts Inc..(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint for Indemnity by Coastal Contacts Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason A Saunders on behalf of Coastal Contacts Inc. (Saunders, Jason) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gordon T Arnold on behalf of Coastal Contacts Inc. (Arnold, Gordon) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's ANSWER to 57 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Coastal Contacts, Inc. by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc..(Prall, Stacy) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Amy J Benjamin for Coastal Contacts Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5128. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Abt Electronics, Inc. (Swetnam-Burland, David) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Ainsworth on behalf of Coastal Contacts Inc. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Coastal Contacts Inc. (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant Coastal Contacts, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. by Coastal Contacts Inc..(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 48 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Abt Electronics, Inc.. (Swetnam-Burland, David) (Entered: 01/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 48 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order of 7-2-09)(Prall, Stacy) (Entered: 12/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 53 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Coastal Contacts Inc deadline is extended to 1/8/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/28/09. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Coastal Contacts Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 38 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Improvement Direct, Inc. by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Prall, Stacy) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to 31 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, of Petmed Express, Inc. by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Prall, Stacy) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 42 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Prall, Stacy) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to 32 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, of Bluefly, Inc. by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Prall, Stacy) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss by Abt Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swetnam-Burland, David) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David Swetnam-Burland for Abt Electronics, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5071. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Peter J Brann for Abt Electronics, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5071. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stacy O Stitham for Abt Electronics, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5071. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Petmed Express, Inc., (Richardson, Michael) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation (Daybell, Donald) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation.(Daybell, Donald) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael James Collins on behalf of Improvement Direct, Inc. (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John J Edmonds on behalf of Improvement Direct, Inc. (Edmonds, John) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Improvement Direct, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., Other Affiliate Wolseley plc for Improvement Direct, Inc.. (Pogorzelski, Henry) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Improvement Direct's ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. by Improvement Direct, Inc..(Pogorzelski, Henry) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bluefly, Inc. (Richardson, Michael) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bluefly, Inc. (Beck, David) Modified on 12/3/2009 (sm, ). (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Abt Electronics, Inc..( Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Estee Lauder Companies Inc. (Faulkner, Rickey) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by The Estee Lauder Companies Inc..(Faulkner, Rickey) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Bluefly, Inc.'s Answer and Counterclaims to Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.'s Original Complaint for Patent Infringement ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. by Bluefly, Inc..(Richardson, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PetMed Express, Inc.'s Answer and Counterclaims to Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.'s Original Complaint for Patent Infringement ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. by Petmed Express, Inc.,.(Richardson, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Bluefly, Inc.'s Answer and Counterclaims to Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.'s Original Complaint for Patent Infringement ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. by Bluefly, Inc..(Richardson, Michael) Modified on 12/2/2009 (sm, ). (Entered: 12/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. Coastal Contacts Inc. served on 10/22/2009, answer due 11/12/2009. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Courtney Quish for Bluefly, Inc. and Petmed Express, Inc.. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5010(ch, ) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William D Belanger for Bluefly, Inc. and Petmed Express, Inc. (ATTORNEY FEE PAID) 2-1-5009. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Improvement Direct, Inc..( Pogorzelski, Henry) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Abt Electronics, Inc..( Mitchell, Mark) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation.(Daybell, Donald) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***REPLACES # 21 ***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexandra C Fennell on behalf of Petmed Express, Inc., (Fennell, Alexandra) Modified on 10/28/2009 (ch, ). (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***REPLACES # 20 ***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexandra C Fennell on behalf of Bluefly, Inc. (Fennell, Alexandra) Modified on 10/28/2009 (ch, ). (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***FILED IN ERROR. NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexandra C Fennell on behalf of Petmed Express, Inc., (Fennell, Alexandra) Modified on 10/28/2009 (ch, ). (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***FILED IN ERROR. NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexandra C Fennell on behalf of Bluefly, Inc. (Fennell, Alexandra) Modified on 10/28/2009 (ch, ). (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Bluefly, Inc..( Richardson, Michael) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint re The Estee Lauder Companies Inc..( Faulkner, Rickey) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Petmed Express, Inc.,.( Richardson, Michael) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. Abt Electronics, Inc. served on 10/18/2009, answer due 11/9/2009. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. Bluefly, Inc. served on 10/14/2009, answer due 11/3/2009. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. The Estee Lauder Companies Inc. served on 10/14/2009, answer due 11/3/2009. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. Petmed Express, Inc., served on 10/13/2009, answer due 11/2/2009. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation served on 10/13/2009, answer due 11/2/2009. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. Improvement Direct, Inc. served on 10/13/2009, answer due 11/2/2009. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney R Trevor Carter for Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. (APPROVE FEE PAID) 2-1-4965. (ch, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2009: # 1 Confidential Information) (ch, ). (Entered: 10/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daniel M Lechleiter for Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4965. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stacy L Prall for Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4965. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brandon S Judkins for Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.(APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4965. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. (Stevens, Scott) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Bluefly, Inc., (Attachments: # 1 PetMed Express Inc (Bruce Rosenbloom), # 2 Coastal Contacts Inc (Washington), # 3 Coastal Contacts Inc., # 4 Improvement Direct, Inc., # 5 Abt Electronic Inc. (Marshall D. Krolick), # 6 Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation, # 7 The Estee Lauder Companies Inc.)(ch, ) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Magistrate Consent Form Mailed to Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/9/09. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Stevens, Scott) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000002192519.), filed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stevens, Scott) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 1,259 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?