Juxtacomm-Texas Software, LLC v. Axway, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:10-cv-00011
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 29, 2017 at 11:38 PM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Axway Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Dataflux Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith Bryan Davis +1 214 220 3939 +1 214 969 5100 kbdavis@jonesday.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chijioke E. Offor +1 214 969 5172 +1 214 969 5100 ceoffor@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Wayne Turner +1 214 969 3700 +1 214 969 5100 rwturner@jonesday.com
No Logo Iona Technologies Ltd., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Iona Technologies Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Bond, Schoeneck & King PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/02/2011 Jeremy P Oczek +1 716 566 2800 +1 716 566 2808 jpoczek@bsk.com

Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacob K. Baron +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 jbaron@proskauer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin J Daniels +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 1600 danielsj@sullcrom.com

Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

No Logo L'Occitane, Inc, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Represented by Ward & Olivo, LLP

No Logo Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William B Dawson +1 612 897 1040

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah J Race +1 903 561 1600 drace@icklaw.com

Represented by White & Case LLP

No Logo Lawson Software, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William B Dawson +1 612 897 1040

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah J Race +1 903 561 1600 drace@icklaw.com

Represented by White & Case LLP

No Logo Magic Software Enterprises Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/26/2010 Steven Gregory Schortgen +1 214 939 5567 +1 214 939 5849 steve.schortgen@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/21/2011 Robert Christopher Bunt +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 rcbunt@pbatyler.com

Represented by White & Case LLP

No Logo Magic Software Enterprises Ltd., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/26/2010 Steven Gregory Schortgen +1 214 939 5567 +1 214 939 5849 steve.schortgen@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/21/2011 Robert Christopher Bunt +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 rcbunt@pbatyler.com

Represented by White & Case LLP

No Logo Pervasive Software, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Daffer McDaniel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/13/2012 Stacy L Zoern +1 512 476 1400 +1 512 703 1250 szoern@dmtechlaw.com
No Logo Progress Software Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bond, Schoeneck & King PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/02/2011 Jeremy P Oczek +1 716 566 2800 +1 716 566 2808 jpoczek@bsk.com

Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacob K. Baron +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 jbaron@proskauer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin J Daniels +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 1600 danielsj@sullcrom.com

Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew G Heinz +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 andrew.heinz@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E. Marina +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 jmarina@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo Ricoh Americas Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott D. Baker +1 415 543 8700 +1 415 391 8269 sbaker@reedsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua S. Bish +1 412 288 3131 +1 412 288 3063 jbish@reedsmith.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric L Toscano +1 415 543 8700 +1 415 391 8269 etoscano@reedsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ilan D Barzilay +1 617 946 4800 +1 617 946 4801 ibarzilay@seyfarth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Debra Elaine Gunter +1 903 595 3111 debby@yw-lawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Herbert A Yarbrough, III +1 903 595 3111 +1 903 595 0191 trey@yw-lawfirm.com
No Logo Rotech Healthcare Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin J Daniels +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 1600 danielsj@sullcrom.com

Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

Toggle Switch Represented by zanadaclothing.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/20/2010 Guy N Harrison +1 903 758 7361 +1 903 753 9557 guy@gnhlaw.com
No Logo SAS Institute Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith Bryan Davis +1 214 220 3939 +1 214 969 5100 kbdavis@jonesday.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chijioke E. Offor +1 214 969 5172 +1 214 969 5100 ceoffor@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Wayne Turner +1 214 969 3700 +1 214 969 5100 rwturner@jonesday.com
No Logo Schenker, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Welsh & Katz, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2010 Robert B. Breisblatt +1 312 526 1510 +1 312 655 0008 rbbreisblatt@welshkatz.com
No Logo Seco Tools Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Dickinson Wright PLLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah J Race +1 903 561 1600 drace@icklaw.com

Represented by White & Case LLP

TIBCO Software, Inc. TIBCO Software, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Unknown Role, Talarian Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott D. Baker +1 415 543 8700 +1 415 391 8269 sbaker@reedsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua S. Bish +1 412 288 3131 +1 412 288 3063 jbish@reedsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric L Toscano +1 415 543 8700 +1 415 391 8269 etoscano@reedsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Debra Elaine Gunter +1 903 595 3111 debby@yw-lawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Herbert A Yarbrough, III +1 903 595 3111 +1 903 595 0191 trey@yw-lawfirm.com
No Logo Vitria Technology Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. David Hadden +1 650 988 8500 +1 650 938 5200 dhadden@fenwick.com
No Logo British Airways Plc, Defendant
Unknown Role, Usair Group, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Strasburger & Price LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Charles M Hosch +1 214 651 4678 +1 214 651 4330 charles.hosch@strasburger.com

Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

No Logo Insight Enterprises, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE James T Hultquist +1 312 207 6494 +1 312 207 6400 jhultquist@reedsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Debra Elaine Gunter +1 903 595 3111 debby@yw-lawfirm.com
Space Herbert A Yarbrough, III +1 903 595 3111 +1 903 595 0191 trey@yw-lawfirm.com
No Logo L'Occitane, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

No Logo Office Depot, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Dan Duncan Davison +1 214 855 8000 +1 214 855 8200 dan.davison@nortonrosefulbright.com
No Logo Sonic Software Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bond, Schoeneck & King PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/02/2011 Jeremy P Oczek +1 716 566 2800 +1 716 566 2808 jpoczek@bsk.com

Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

No Logo JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
No Logo Honorable Robert Faulkner, Mediator

Represented by JAMS

No Logo MICHAEL MCLEMORE, Technical Advisor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T. Mclemore +1 210 598 8563
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (1133) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1133 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1132 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1131 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Withdraw
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1130 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1129 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1128 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1127 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1126 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1125 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Bill of Costs
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1124 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1124 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None
                      Return of Service Executed as toJuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC on 8/26/2014, answer due: 9/16/2014. (gsg) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1123 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Writ Issued
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1122 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1121 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1120 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                              PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS filed by Pervasive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Itemization & Documentation)(Huston, Charles) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1119 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER denying as moot 1106 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/25/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1118 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting 1103 MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by TIBCO Software, Inc., granting-in-part and denying-in-part 1102 MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by SAS Institute, Inc., DataFlux Corporation, and granting-in-part and denying-in-part 1101 Proposed Bill of Costs, filed by Pervasive Software, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/21/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1117 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc. re 1102 MOTION for Bill of Costs Notice of Final Adjudication and Request for Ruling on Motion (Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1116 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE by TIBCO Software, Inc. of Final Adjudication and Request for Ruling on 1103 Motion for Bill of Costs (Mitchell, Jonah) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1115 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Filing Supplemental Declaration of Craig Jordheim by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC re 1106 MOTION to Stay re 1103 MOTION for Bill of Costs, 1102 MOTION for Bill of Costs, 1101 Proposed Bill of Costs, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1114 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                          USCA MANDATE in Accordance with the Judgment of USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT entered September 30, 2013, as to 1086 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC, 1091 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, filed by SAS Institute, Inc. (dlc, ) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1113 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT JUDGMENT was entered on this date and attached opinion filed affirming in part and dismissing in part as to 1086 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC, 1091 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, filed by SAS Institute, Inc. The mandate will be issued in due course. Chief Judge Rader, Circuit Judges: Linn, and Reyna. (Attachments: # 1 USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT Opinion, # 2 Supreme Court Information, # 3 Rehearing Information)(dlc, ) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1112 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 1106 MOTION to Stay re 1103 MOTION for Bill of Costs, 1102 MOTION for Bill of Costs, 1101 Proposed Bill of Costs, PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY AND RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' BILL OF COSTS MOTION to Stay re 1103 MOTION for Bill of Costs, 1102 MOTION for Bill of Costs, 1101 Proposed Bill of Costs, PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY AND RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' BILL OF COSTS PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STAY filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1111 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 1103 MOTION for Bill of Costs, 1102 MOTION for Bill of Costs PLAINTIFF'S SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' BILL OF COSTS filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1110 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE by Pervasive Software, Inc. re 1107 Sealed Response to Motion,, Defendant Pervasive Software Inc.'s Notice of Joinder (Huston, Charles) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE by TIBCO Software, Inc. re 1107 Sealed Response to Motion,, DEFENDANT TIBCO SOFTWARE INC.'S NOTICE OF JOINDER (Mitchell, Jonah) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1108 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                      Additional Attachments to Main Document: 1107 Sealed Response to Motion,,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Search Term Chart)(Davis, Keith) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1107 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                        SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 1106 MOTION to Stay re 1103 MOTION for Bill of Costs, 1102 MOTION for Bill of Costs, 1101 Proposed Bill of Costs, PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY AND RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' BILL OF COSTS MOTION to Stay re 1103 MOTION for Bill of Costs, 1102 MOTION for Bill of Costs, 1101 Proposed Bill of Costs, PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY AND RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' BILL OF COSTS filed by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc.. (Davis, Keith) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1106 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION to Stay re 1103 MOTION for Bill of Costs, 1102 MOTION for Bill of Costs, 1101 Proposed Bill of Costs, PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY AND RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' BILL OF COSTS by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1105 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC re 1103 MOTION for Bill of Costs, 1102 MOTION for Bill of Costs, 1101 Proposed Bill of Costs, PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' BILLS OF COST (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1104 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                              AFFIDAVIT in Support re 1103 MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by TIBCO Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Fees of the Clerk and Marshall, # 2 Exhibit B-Fees for Printed or Electronically Recorded Transcripts, # 3 Exhibit C-Vido Deposition Fees, # 4 Exhibit D-Court Transcript Fees, # 5 Exhibit E-General Printing and Copying Charges, # 6 Exhibit E-1, # 7 Exhibit F-Document Production Copying Costs, # 8 Exhibit F-1, # 9 Exhibit F-2, # 10 Exhibit F-3, # 11 Exhibit G-Compensation of Cosrt Appointed Experts)(Mitchell, Jonah) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1103 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Bill of Costs by TIBCO Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Bill of Costs)(Mitchell, Jonah) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1102 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION for Bill of Costs by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Bill of Costs, # 2 Exhibit B - Offor Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit C - Bosselman Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit D - Nov. 6, 2012 Ltr from Macon to Galvan, # 5 Exhibit 1 Fees for Clerk and Marshall, # 6 Exhibit 2 Deposition Transcript Fees, # 7 Exhibit 3 Video Deposition Fees, # 8 Exhibit 4 Court Transcript Fees, # 9 Exhibit 5 General Printing and Copying Charges, # 10 Exhibit 6 Jones Day Copying Charges, # 11 Exhibit 7 Document Production Copying Charges (with highlights), # 12 Exhibit 8 Deposition Witness Fees, # 13 Exhibit 9 Court Appointed Technical Advisor Fee, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Keith) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1101 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS filed by Pervasive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Huston Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Huston Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Huston Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Huston Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Huston Declaration)(Huston, Charles) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1100 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting 1099 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to Submit Proposed Bill of Costs is extended to 11-07-12. The Court will not grant any further extensions absent a showing of good cause. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/01/12. cc:attys 11-01-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1099 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs (UNOPPOSED) by TIBCO Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Bill of Costs)(Mitchell, Jonah) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1098 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re 1091 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, filed by SAS Institute, Inc.. USCA Case Number 13-1025 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1097 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 1096 Motion for Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/19/12. cc:attys 10-19-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1096 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs (UNOPPOSED) by TIBCO Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Jonah) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1095 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing Proceedings held on 12/7/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/12/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/22/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2013. (sms, ) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1094 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1093 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE ENTRY 1094 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC (Macon, Richard) Modified on 10/17/2012 (gsg). (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1092 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by U S Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit as to 388 Order denying Sealed Motion, 405 Memorandum & Opinion, 1047 Order denying Motion to Stay, 1091 Notice of Cross Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, 1085 Judgment and Certified copy of Docket Sheet. (dlc, ) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1091 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT by SAS Institute, Inc. as to 1085 Final Judgment, 1047 Order denying Emergency Motion to Stay, 405 Memorandum Opinion and Order, and 388 Order denying Motion to Disqualify. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0540-3826545. (Galvan, Hilda) Modified on 10/12/2012 (gsg). (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1090 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re 1086 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. USCA Case Number 13-1004 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1089 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 1088 Motion for Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/4/2012. (gsg) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1088 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs by DataFlux Corporation, JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC, Pervasive Software, Inc., SAS Institute, Inc., TIBCO Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Unopposed MOtion to Extend Deadline to File Bill of Costs)(Mitchell, Jonah) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1087 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit as to Transmission of 1086 Notice of Appeal, 1085 Final Judgment, 1079 Order, and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet as to 1086 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (dlc, ) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1086 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to 1085 Judgment by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0540-3804735. (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1085 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    FINAL JUDGMENT. Plaintiff shall take nothing from Defendants and all pending motions are DENIED. Defendants' costs of court should be taxed against Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/19/12. cc:attys 9-20-12(mll, ) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1084 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 1083 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Maxwell James Goss terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/24/12. cc:attys 7-24-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1083 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1082 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting 1081 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael Louis Kiklis terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/18/12. cc:attys 7-18-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1081 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1080 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Wesley Hill (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1079 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting 1051 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 112 Paragraph 2 filed by Pervasive Software, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/05/12. cc:attys 7-06-12(mll, ) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1078 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 4/24/12 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/11/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/21/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2012. (sms, ) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1077 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 3/26/12 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/11/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/21/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2012. (sms, ) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1076 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER staying all deadlines and vacating the trial setting in this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/16/12. cc:attys 5-16-12(mll, ) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1075 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 1051 Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity. A memorandum opinion explaining the Court's reasoning will be provided in the near future. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/14/12. cc:attys 5-15-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1074 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          SEALED Re-filed SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 1069 Opposed SEALED MOTION Refiled Emergency Sealed Motion to Reconsider Denial of SAS's Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel 117 Opposed SEALED MOTION Refiled Emergency Sealed Motion to Reconsider Denial of SAS's Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel 117 Opposed SEALED MOTION Refiled Emergency Sealed Motion to Reconsider Denial of SAS's Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel 117 Opposed SEALED MOTION Refiled Emergency Sealed Motion to Reconsider Denial of SAS's Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel 117 filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1073 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            SEALED REPLY in Support of 1069 Opposed SEALED MOTION Refiled Emergency Sealed Motion to Reconsider Denial of SAS's Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel 117 filed by SAS Institute, Inc. Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Patent-in-Suit (U.S. Patent No. 6,195,662 B1), # 2 Exhibit 2 - Legal Ethics - Rotunda & Dzienkowski, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Law of Lawyering - Hazard et al, # 4 Exhibit 4 - JuxtaComm 2004 Article-Undated and Dated)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1072 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              SEALED REFILED RESPONSE to Motion re 1069 Opposed SEALED MOTION Refiled Emergency Sealed Motion to Reconsider Denial of SAS's Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel 117 Opposed SEALED MOTION Refiled Emergency Sealed Motion to Reconsider Denial of SAS's Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel 117 Opposed SEALED MOTION Refiled Emergency Sealed Motion to Reconsider Denial of SAS's Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel 117 Opposed SEALED MOTION Refiled Emergency Sealed Motion to Reconsider Denial of SAS's Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel 117 filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1071 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1070 Unopposed MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory Concerning Ken Prather. Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2 - (SEALED) Excerpts from Juxtacomm I Initial Disclosures, # 2 Exhibit 3 - (SEALED) 2011-08-30 Excerpts from Dansky Damages Rpt, Appx E - SAS and Dataflux, # 3 Exhibit 4 - (SEALED) - Excerpt from 2011-10-20 Depositon of D. Brown, # 4 Exhibit 5 - (SEALED) Patent License Agreement, # 5 Exhibit 6 - (SEALED) Patent License Agreement, # 6 Exhibit 7 - (SEALED) Patent License Agreement, # 7 Exhibit 8 - (SEALED) Certificate of Filing of JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1070 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory Concerning Ken Prather by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Letter Rogatory Re Subpoena Ken Prather to Produce Documents and Give a Deposition, # 2 Exhibit 9 - 2011-09-01 Macon email Galvan re AG representation of K. Prather, # 3 Exhibit 10 - 2011-09-13 Offor Ltr to Macon re Prather Deposition and Subpoena, # 4 Exhibit 11 - 2011-09-14 Macon ltr to Offor re Prather Subpoena, # 5 Exhibit 12 - 2012-04-26 Macon to Davis RE Prather, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1069 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Opposed SEALED MOTION Refiled Emergency Sealed Motion to Reconsider Denial of SAS's Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel 117 by SAS Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Hearing Transcript October 27, 2010, # 2 Exhibit B - Plf's Objs & Resps to Iona's 2nd Set of Interrogatories January 28, 2011, # 3 Exhibit C - Macon Letter to Counsel February 28, 2011, # 4 Exhibit D - Akin Gump Juxtacomm Retention Agreement, 2007 Agreement July 13, 2007, # 5 Exhibit E - Akin Gump Letter to Teilhard Shareholders May 21, 2010 JXCM I, # 6 Exhibit F - Akin Gump Juxtacomm 2nd Retention Agreement, 2010 Agreement January 20, 2010, # 7 Exhibit G - ABA Model Rules of Professional Conduct 1.7 and 1.8, # 8 Exhibit H - Akin Gump-SAS Engagement of Services Agreement September 10, 2007, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1068 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc. Second Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Earl Sacerdoti (Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1067 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Pervasive Software, Inc. (Supplemental Expert Report of Colin White) (Huston, Charles) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1066 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by TIBCO Software, Inc. Supplemental Invalidity Expert Report of Craig W. Thompson and Supplemental Expert Report of Colin White (Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1065 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Motion Hearing held on 4/24/2012 re 1051 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 112 Paragraph 2 filed by Pervasive Software, Inc. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign in Sheets) (cwk) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1064 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC re 1051 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 112 Paragraph 2 Notice of Filing Slides Presented During April 24, 2012 Hearing In Response to Pervasive Software Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 112 2 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Slides))(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1063 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Pervasive Software, Inc. re 1051 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 112 Paragraph 2 Notice of Filing of Slides Presented at the April 24, 2012 Hearing Regarding Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 112 2 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Slides))(Huston, Charles) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1062 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 1051 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 112 Paragraph 2 PLAINTIFF'S SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO PERVASIVE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. Section 112, Paragraph 2 filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1061 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by TIBCO Software, Inc. re 1059 Reply to Response to Motion Defendant TIBCO Software Inc.'s Notice of Joinder in Pervasive Software Inc.'s Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Pervasive's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 112 Paragraph 2 (Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1060 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc. re 1059 Reply to Response to Motion SAS Institute Inc. and Dataflux Corporation's Notice of Joinder in Pervasive Software Inc.'s Reply to Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 112 Paragraph 2 (Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1059 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 1051 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 112 Paragraph 2 filed by Pervasive Software, Inc.. (Huston, Charles) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1058 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 1051 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 112 Paragraph 2 filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Excerpt from 12/7/2011 Hearing Transcript), # 2 Exhibit B (Declaration of Michael Hoskins), # 3 Exhibit C (Excerpt from Memorandum Opinion 07-CV-359-LED), # 4 Exhibit D (Declaration of Walter G. Rudd), # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1057 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Vitria Technology, Inc. for Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Erskine, Blake) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1056 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Jury instructions due by 8/20/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 8/14/2012; Response to Dispositive Motions due 8-31-2012. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/20/2012. Jury Selection set for 10/1/2012 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 10/9/2012 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2012 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Expected Length of Trial is 14 days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/10/12. cc:attys 4-10-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1055 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION Entry of Amended Docket Control Order by DataFlux Corporation, JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC, Pervasive Software, Inc., SAS Institute, Inc., TIBCO Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1054 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc. re 1051 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 112 Paragraph 2, 1052 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document Defendants SAS Institute Inc. and Dataflux Corporation's Notice of Joinder in Pervasive Software Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 112 Paragraph 2 (Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1053 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by TIBCO Software, Inc. re 1051 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 112 Paragraph 2 Defendant TIBCO SOFTWARE INC.'S Notice of Joinder in Pervasive Software Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 112 Paragraph 2 (Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1052 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1051 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 112 Paragraph 2. (Huston, Charles) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1051 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 112 Paragraph 2 by Pervasive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (US6195662), # 2 Exhibit B (Amended Memorandum Opinion), # 3 Exhibit C (JXCM Reply on Clm Construction), # 4 Exhibit E (ROA 9/5/2000), # 5 Exhibit F (JXCM Opening Clm Construction Brief Excerpt), # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Huston, Charles) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1050 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 1048 Motion to Dismiss. All claims, counterclaims or causes of action asserted in this suit by and between Plaintiff and Defendant Vitria Technology, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/04/12. cc:attys 4-04-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1049 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Charles D Huston (Huston, Charles) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1048 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Dismiss by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC, Vitria Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1047 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 625 Emergency Motion to Stay Proceedings in View of Imminent Appeal of Final PTO Action Invalidating Asserted Claims. The Court sets this case for jury selection on 10-01-2012 at 9:00 a.m., with trial to begin on 10-09-2012 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are ORDERED to submit a new agreed Docket Control Order within 10 days to accommodate the new trial setting. The Court DENIES all pending motions, except Pervasive Software Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement 759 , WITHOUT PREJUDICE to refiling once the Court enters a new Docket Control Order. The Court ORDERS Defendants to file a brief addressing 759 Motion for Summary Judgment by 4-04-2012, with a response due by 4-11-2012, reply due 4-17-2012 and surreply due 4-20-2012. The Court further sets a hearing on 4-24-2012 at 1:30 p.m. regarding the parties briefing. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/27/12. cc:attys 3-27-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1046 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 1039 Motion to Dismiss. All claims, counterclaims or causes of action asserted in this suit by and between Plaintiff and Defendants Progress Software Corporation and Iona Technologies Limited are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/26/12. cc:attys 3-26-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1045 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    ***PLEASE DISREGARD. PROPOSED ORDER ATTACHED TO 1043 *** Additional Attachments to Main Document: 1043 Response in Opposition to Motion.. (Macon, Richard) Modified on 3/27/2012 (gsg). (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1044 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 3/26/2012. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign In Sheets) (cwk) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1043 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 1038 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Stay filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Macon, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/27/2012: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ). (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1042 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 1034 MOTION Plaintiff's Request for a Trial Setting filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1041 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc., Seco Tools, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Race, Deborah) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1040 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc. re 625 Emergency MOTION to Stay Proceedings in View of Imminent Appeal of Final PTO Action Invalidating Asserted Claims (Second Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Stay) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 2012-02-17 PTO Comm - 08-23 Petition to Reissue Final OA as Non Final Denied)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1039 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Iona Technologies Limited, JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC, Progress Software Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1038 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Stay by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Second Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Stay, # 2 Exhibit A - 2012-02-17 PTO Comm - 08-23 Petition to Reissue Final OA as Non Final Denied, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1037 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 1034 MOTION Plaintiff's Request for a Trial Setting filed by DataFlux Corporation, Pervasive Software, Inc., SAS Institute, Inc., TIBCO Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt from the Oct. 20, 2011 Dep of D. Brown, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt of May 24, 2011 Markman Hearing Transcript, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts from the Dec. 7, 2011 Motions Hearing Transcript, # 4 Exhibit 4 - 289 2010-07-23 Docket Control Order, # 5 Exhibit 5 - 2012-03-08 Toscano Ltr to Macon, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1036 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order granting 1035 Joint Motion to Dismiss. All claims, counterclaims or causes of action asserted in this suit between Plaintiff JuxtaComm-Texas Software LLC and Defendants Lawson Software Inc and Lawson Software Americas Inc, are dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/21/2012. (leh, ) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1035 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Dismiss by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC, Lawson Software Americas, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1034 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION Plaintiff's Request for a Trial Setting by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1033 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 1031 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stacy L Zoern terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/13/12. cc:attys 3-13-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1032 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** MOTION Plaintiff's Request for a Trial Setting by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Macon, Richard) Modified on 3/13/2012 (gsg). (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1031 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Pervasive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zoern, Stacy) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1030 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 1029 Motion for Extension of Time. Progress and Iona are provided an additional extension of time, until 3-23-2012, to serve their amended Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/10/12. cc:attys 3-12-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1029 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Serve Amended Invalidity Contentions) by Iona Technologies Limited, JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC, Progress Software Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1028 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 1027 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Progress and Iona are provided an additional extension of time, until 3-09-2012, to serve their amended Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/05/12. cc:attys 3-05-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1027 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Serve Amended Invalidity Contentions) by Iona Technologies Limited, JuxtaComm Technologies, Inc., Progress Software Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1026 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 1023 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Progress Software Corporation and Iona Technologies Limited shall have to 3-02-2012, to serve their amended Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/23/12. cc:attys 2-23-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1025 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 1022 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for deft Vitria Technology Inc to comply with P.R. 3-6 shall be extended to 3-23-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/23/12. cc:attys 2-23-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1024 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by TIBCO Software, Inc. TIBCO Software Inc.'s Second Amended Supplemental Invalidity Contentions (Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1023 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Serve Amended Invalidity Contentions) by Iona Technologies Limited, JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC, Progress Software Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1022 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File /SERVE PURSUANT TO P.R. 3-6 by Vitria Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyz, Ryan) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1021 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC (Service of Plf's Supplemental Infringement Expert Reports & P.R. 3-6 Infringement Contentions) (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1020 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 1018 Motion for Extension of Time. The time for Plaintiff and Defendant Vitria Technology, Inc. to complete mediation is extended to 2-06-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/30/12. cc:attys 1-30-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1019 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 1017 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Camden Robert Webb terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/30/12. cc:attys 1-30-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1018 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION Extension of Mediation Deadlines as to Vitria re 1008 Order,, by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC, Vitria Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1017 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by SAS Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Webb, Camden) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1016 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 1015 Motion for Extension of Mediatiion Deadline. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/26/12. cc:attys 1-27-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1015 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION Extension of Mediation Deadline re 1008 Order,, by DataFlux Corporation, JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC, SAS Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 01/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1014 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 445 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 460 Motion to Compel; denying 485 Sealed Motion; denying 487 Motion to Compel; denying 652 Motion to Strike ; granting 666 Motion for Leave to File; denying 724 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 727 Sealed Patent Motion; denying 738 Motion ; denying 744 Motion ; denying 751 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 753 Motion to Strike ; denying 801 Sealed Motion; denying 802 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 805 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 807 Motion to Strike ; denying 810 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 813 Sealed Motion; denying 814 Sealed Motion; denying 825 Sealed Motion; granting 827 Sealed Motion; denying 831 Sealed Motion; granting 847 Motion for Leave to File; granting 852 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 853 Motion to Sever; granting 858 Motion for Leave to File; granting 861 Motion for Leave to File; granting 865 Motion for Leave to File; granting 876 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 905 Motion for Leave to File; denying 923 Sealed Motion; denying 973 Motion in Limine; denying 976 Motion for Leave to File; denying 978 Sealed Motion; denying 982 Motion in Limine; denying 983 Sealed Motion; denying 987 Sealed Motion; denying 993 Motion for Leave to File; denying 995 Motion to Expedite; denying 997 Sealed Motion; denying 998 Sealed Motion; denying 1000 Sealed Motion; denying 1002 Motion for Summary Judgment. Any motions still pending are taken under advisement and will be ruled upon after 2-01-2012, when the Court's temporary stay is lifted. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/15/11. cc:attys 2-16-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1013 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc. re 625 Emergency MOTION to Stay Proceedings in View of Imminent Appeal of Final PTO Action Invalidating Asserted Claims (Notice of Filing of Slides Presented at December 7, 2011 Motions Hearing regarding Defendants' Motion to Stay (ECF No. 625)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Slides Presented at December 7, 2011 Motions Hearing regarding Defendants' Motion to Stay (ECF No. 625))(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1012 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1011 Notice of Filing of Slides Presented at the December 7, 2011 Motions Hearing Regarding SAS Institute Inc.'s Sealed Emergency Motion to Reconsider Denial of Motion to Disqualify Plaintiffs Counsel (ECF No. 479). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Slides Presented at the December 7, 2011 Motions Hearing Regarding SAS Institute Inc.'s Sealed Emergency Motion to Reconsider Denial of Motion to Disqualify Plaintiffs Counsel (ECF No. 479)) (Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1011 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by SAS Institute, Inc. re 479 Emergency SEALED MOTION TO RECONSIDER DENIAL OF MOTION TO DISQUALIFY (Notice of Filing of Slides Presented at the December 7, 2011 Motions Hearing Regarding SAS Institute Inc.'s Sealed Emergency Motion to Reconsider Denial of Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel (ECF No. 479)) (Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1010 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Motion Hearing held on 11/30/2011 re 910 SEALED MOTION Expedited Motion to Recuse Under Local Rule CV-63(d) filed by SAS Institute, Inc., DataFlux Corporation. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Main Document 1010 replaced on 12/9/2011) (rlf, ). (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION. ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL TO Document # 980 Notice of Joinder. PLEASE NOTE.*** (mjc, ) (Entered: 12/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1008 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that this case is STAYED until 2-01-2012. Parties shall attend mediation by 2-01-2012. All parties shall have representatives with settlement authority in attendance. The Court also VACATES all dates in the current docket control order, including the trial setting. Plaintiffs amended infringement contentions are due on 2-01-2012, and Defendants may amend their invalidity contentions as provided for in the local rules. In the meantime, the Court will enter appropriate orders resetting the pretrial and trial dates. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/08/11. cc:attys 12-08-11(mll, ) (Entered: 12/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1007 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Evidentiary Motions Hearing held on 12/7/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan, CSR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-in Sheet) (jml, ) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1006 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER striking the Court's construction of "systems interface" in 961 Memorandum Opinion, and replacing construction. See 1005 Amended Memorandum Opinion reflecting this change. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/07/11. cc:attys 12-07-11(mll, ) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1005 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION. The Court interprets the claim language in this case in the manner set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/07/11. cc:attys 12-07-11(mll, ) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1004 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 825 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO WILLFULNESS AND INDIRECT INFRINGEMENT AND NO ACTUAL NOTICE filed by Vitria Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Tyz, Ryan) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1003 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1002 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement [Corrected]. Declaration of Mandy Pezzano In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement (Corrected) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit 1 (Part 2), # 3 Exhibit 1 (Part 3), # 4 Exhibit 1 (Part 4))(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1002 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***CORRECTED DOCUMENT. REPLACES 996 .*** MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement [Corrected] by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Phillip Faillace, Ph.D., # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) Modified on 12/7/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1001 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 828 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF LACHES filed by Vitria Technology, Inc.. (Tyz, Ryan) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1000 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT by Vitria Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "1", # 2 Exhibit "2", # 3 Exhibit "3")(Tyz, Ryan) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 999 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT 1003 .***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 996 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Noninfringement. Declaration of Mandy Pezzano In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (part 1), # 2 Exhibit 1 (part 2), # 3 Exhibit 1 (part 3), # 4 Errata 1 (part 4), # 5 Exhibit 2 (part 1), # 6 Exhibit 2 (part 2))(Reiter, Mark) Modified on 12/7/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 998 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposed SEALED MOTION TIBCO Software Inc.s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non Infringement by TIBCO Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Eric L. Toscano in support of TIBCO Software Inc.s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non Infringement, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting TIBCO Software Inc.s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non Infringement)(Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 997 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Iona Technologies Limited, Progress Software Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Justin J. Daniels, # 3 Exhibit A to Daniels Decl., # 4 Exhibit B to Daniels Decl., # 5 Exhibit C to Daniels Decl., # 6 Exhibit D to Daniels Decl., # 7 Exhibit E to Daniels Decl., # 8 Exhibit F to Daniels Decl., # 9 Exhibit G to Daniels Decl., # 10 Exhibit H to Daniels Decl., # 11 Exhibit I to Daniels Decl.)(Daniels, Justin) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 996 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT 1002 .***MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Noninfringement by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) Modified on 12/7/2011 (mjc, ). Document sealed by the Court. (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 995 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposed MOTION to Expedite Defendants TIBCO Software Inc., Lawson Software, Inc., Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Progress Software Corporation, Iona Technologies Limited, And Vitria Technology, Inc.s Motion For Expedited Briefing On Their Motions For Summary Judgment Re Non-Infringement by Iona Technologies Limited, Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc., Progress Software Corporation, TIBCO Software, Inc., Vitria Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants TIBCO Software Inc., Lawson Software, Inc., Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Progress Software Corporation, Iona Technologies Limited, And Vitria Technology, Inc.s Motion For Expedited Briefing On Their Motions For Summary Judgment Re Non-Infringement)(Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 994 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposed MOTION to Expedite Defendants TIBCO Software Inc., Lawson Software, Inc., Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Progress Software Corporation, Iona Technologies Limited, And Vitria Technology, Inc.s Motion For Expedited Briefing On Their Motion For Leave To File Motions For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement by Iona Technologies Limited, Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc., Progress Software Corporation, TIBCO Software, Inc., Vitria Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants TIBCO Software Inc., Lawson Software, Inc., Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Progress Software Corporation, Iona Technologies Limited, And Vitria Technology, Inc.s Motion For Expedited Briefing On Their Motion For Leave To File Motions For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement)(Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 993 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendants TIBCO Software Inc., Lawson Software, Inc., Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Progress Software Corporation, Iona Technologies Limited, And Vitria Technology, Inc.s Motion For Leave To File Motions For Summary Judgment Re Non-Infringemen by Iona Technologies Limited, Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc., Progress Software Corporation, TIBCO Software, Inc., Vitria Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants TIBCO Software Inc., Lawson Software, Inc., Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Progress Software Corporation, Iona Technologies Limited, And Vitria Technology, Inc.s Motion For Leave To File Motions For Summary Judgment Re Non-Infringement)(Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 992 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT (PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL STATUS REPORT REGARDING MOTIONS SET FOR HEARING DECEMBER 7, 2011) by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 991 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 815 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT AS TO FOREIGN SALES filed by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc. Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Aug. 30, 2011 Initial Expert Report of Walter G. Rudd on SAS Institute Inc. Products, # 2 Exhibit B -- Dec. 5, 2011 Declaration of Cyndi Schnupper, # 3 Exhibit C -- SAS's Oct. 7, 2011 Supplemental Answers and Objections to JuxtaComm's First Common Interrogatories (Nos. 3-7)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 990 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William B Dawson on behalf of Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc. (Dawson, William) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 989 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 847 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims filed by TIBCO Software, Inc.. (Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 988 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 905 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave for Additional Trial Exhibits filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Case Correspondence, # 2 Exhibit B-Case Correspondence, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 987 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposed SEALED MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S MOTONS IN LIMINE) by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-JXTS Production Document, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motions)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 986 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by TIBCO Software, Inc. Defendant TIBCO Software Inc.s Rebuttal Designations and Objections to Deposition Testimony, and Amended Deposition Designations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Rebuttal Designations and Objections to Deposition Testimony, # 2 Exhibit B - Amended Deposition Designations)(Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 985 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc. Of Joinder In Defendants Motions In Limine (Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 984 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Iona Technologies Limited, Progress Software Corporation re 983 Opposed SEALED MOTION in Limine PARTIAL JOINDER (Daniels, Justin) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 983 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposed SEALED MOTION in Limine by DataFlux Corporation, Pervasive Software, Inc., SAS Institute, Inc., TIBCO Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 982 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine Nos. 1 and 2 by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 981 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 980 Notice (Other), Notice (Other). (Attachments: # Exhibit Exh A to Defendant TIBCO Software Inc.s Notice Of Joinder In Defendant Vitrias Motion In Limine To Exclude JuxtaComms Technical Experts Testimony Regarding Pre-Filing Communications Between Vitria And An Agent Of JuxtaComms Parent Company) (1) Exhibit Exh B to Defendant TIBCO Software Inc.s Notice Of Joinder In Defendant Vitrias Motion In Limine To Exclude JuxtaComms Technical Experts Testimony Regarding Pre-Filing Communications Between Vitria And An Agent Of JuxtaComms Parent Company)(Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 980 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by TIBCO Software, Inc. re 978 Opposed SEALED MOTION in Limine Defendant TIBCO Software Inc.s Notice Of Joinder In Defendant Vitrias Motion In Limine To Exclude Juxtacomms Technical Experts Testimony Regarding Pre-Filing Communications Between Vitria and An Agent Of JuxtaComms Parent Company (Toscano, Eric) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/8/2011: # 1 Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal) (mjc, ). (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 979 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc. Objections and Counter-Designations to JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC Deposition Designations (Kalogeras, Steven) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 978 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposed SEALED MOTION in Limine by Vitria Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyz, Ryan) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 977 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc. re 902 Notice (Other) Notice of Amended Deposition Designations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit First Amended Deposition Designations)(Oskoui, Nickou) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 976 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposed MOTION for Leave to File a Vitria and TIBCO specific Motion in Limine by Vitria Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyz, Ryan) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 975 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PLEASE IGNORE. Document filed in error. Atty refiled corrected document at DE 987. PLEASE IGNORE. Opposed SEALED MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE) by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Macon, Richard) Modified on 12/6/2011 (leh, ). (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 974 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 897 Notice (Other) (SAS and DataFlux's Objections and Counter-Designations) by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc.. (Offor, Chijioke) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 973 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine To Preclude JuxtaComm from Introducing Opinion Testimony on Relevant Subject Matter Where the Expert Refused to Testify by Pervasive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huston, Charles) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 972 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nickou Oskoui on behalf of DataFlux Corporation (Oskoui, Nickou) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 971 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nickou Oskoui on behalf of SAS Institute, Inc. (Oskoui, Nickou) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 970 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC (PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS AND COUNTER-DESIGNATIONS) (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 969 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Pervasive Software, Inc. of Rebuttal Deposition Testimony Designations (Huston, Charles) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 968 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Iona Technologies Limited, Progress Software Corporation (Counter Deposition Designations and Objections) (Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 967 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Additional Attachments to Main Document: 966 Sealed Response to Motion,,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F-JXTS00015451 Production Doc, # 2 Exhibit G-PRG0080007 Production Doc, # 3 Exhibit H-JXTS01206773 Production Doc, # 4 Exhibit I-LAWSON00000005 Production Doc)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 966 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 853 MOTION to Sever DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION FOR SEVERANCE FOLLOWED BY SEPARATE TRIALS filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Sacerdoti Report Excerpts, # 2 Exhibit B-Faillace Report Excerpts, # 3 Exhibit D-SASJX001561388 Production Doc, # 4 Exhibit E-PSI0028792 Production Doc, # 5 Exhibit J-TIBCO00046057 Production Doc, # 6 Exhibit K-VTIJ0080765 Production Doc, # 7 Exhibit L-White Report Exceripts, # 8 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 965 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 855 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/05/11. cc:attys 12-05-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 964 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 802 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DataFlux Corporation. (Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 963 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 805 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SAS Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Keith B. Davis, # 2 Exhibit 10 -- JuxtaComms March 7, 2011 Response in Ex Parte Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 6,195,662, # 3 Exhibit 11 -- March 7, 2011 Rudd Declaration Under 37 C.F.R. § 1.132 on DBMS Copy Plus Operating Within a Single Computer System, # 4 Exhibit 12 -- Sept. 8, 2011 Letter from H. Galvan to L. Macon, # 5 Exhibit 13 -- Sept. 20, 2011 Letter from C. Offor to L. Macon, # 6 Exhibit 14 -- Sept. 23, 2011 Letter from K. Davis to L. Macon, # 7 Exhibit 15 -- Oct. 19, 2011 Letter from C. Offor to L. Macon)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 962 Filed: 12/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc. of Compliance with 35 U.S.C. § 282 (Offor, Chijioke) (Entered: 12/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 961 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION. The Court interprets the claim language in this case in the manner set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/02/11. cc:attys 12-02-11(mll, ) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 960 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 952 Motion to Withdraw; and withdrawing 484 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/02/11. cc:attys 12-02-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 959 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc. re 655 MOTION Modify the Docket Control Order And Vacate The Deadline For Lawson To Submit A Rebuttal Report On Issues Of Damages Pending Decision On Lawson's Motion To Strike The Dansky Report Notice of Withdrawal (Kalogeras, Steven) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 958 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc. re 801 SEALED MOTION JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' ASSERTION OF THE 28 U.S.C.§ 1498(A) "GOVERNMENT CONTRACTOR'S DEFENSE" SEALED MOTION JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' ASSERTION OF THE 28 U.S.C.§ 1498(A) "GOVERNMENT CONTRACTOR'S DEFENSE" (Kalogeras, Steven) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 957 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT Regarding Motions Set for Hearing December 7, 2011 by DataFlux Corporation, Iona Technologies Limited, Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc., Pervasive Software, Inc., Progress Software Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc., TIBCO Software, Inc., Vitria Technology, Inc.. (Davis, Keith) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 956 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 953 Sealed Motion to Withdraw 769 Notice of Affiliation, and striking 769 Notice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/01/11. cc:attys 12-01-11(mll, ) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 955 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 910 Sealed Motion to Recuse. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/01/11. cc:attys 12-01-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 954 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT (STATUS REPORT REGARING MOTIONS SET FOR HEARING DECEMBER 7, 2011) by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 953 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 952 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw (PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW MOTION TO STRIKE) by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 951 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 813 SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Indirect and No Willful Infringement filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11, # 2 Exhibit 21, # 3 Exhibit 28, # 4 Exhibit 29, # 5 Exhibit 33, # 6 Exhibit 34, # 7 Exhibit 35, # 8 Exhibit 36, # 9 Exhibit 37, # 10 Exhibit 38, # 11 Exhibit 39, # 12 Exhibit 40, # 13 Affidavit Declaration of Melanie Cowart, # 14 Text of Proposed Order Denying Moton)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 950 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 826 Opposed SEALED MOTION TIBCO Software Inc.'s Daubert Motion to Preclude Walter G. Rudd's Testimony Regarding Intent, Knowledge, and State of Mind filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion, # 2 Exhibit 29, # 3 Exhibit 10, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Melanie Cowart)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 949 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 807 Opposed MOTION to Strike Portions of the Rudd Expert Reports filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion, # 6 Affidavit Declaration of Melanie Cowart)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 948 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED RESPONSE to 833 Motion filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Melanie Cowart, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion)(Macon, Richard) Modified on 11/30/2011 (leh, ). (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 947 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 823 SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF MICHAEL J. DANSKY, 818 Opposed SEALED MOTION (Defendants' Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Expert Testimony Regarding Damages)Opposed SEALED MOTION (Defendants' Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Expert Testimony Regarding Damages)Opposed SEALED MOTION (Defendants' Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Expert Testimony Regarding Damages)Opposed SEALED MOTION (Defendants' Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Expert Testimony Regarding Damages), 822 Opposed SEALED MOTION MOTION TO STRIKE MICHAEL J. DANSKYS OPINIONS ON REASONABLE ROYALTY, 816 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Michael Dansky Relying On the Entire Market Value Rule, 821 Opposed SEALED MOTION TIBCO Software Inc.'s Daubert Motion to Exclude the Opinion of Michael Dansky re Reasonable Royalty, or, in the Alternative, to Strike Portions of his Proposed Testimony filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Melanie Cowart, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit A1, # 7 Exhibit A2, # 8 Exhibit A3, # 9 Exhibit A4, # 10 Exhibit A5, # 11 Exhibit A6, # 12 Exhibit A7, # 13 Exhibit A8, # 14 Exhibit B1, # 15 Exhibit B2, # 16 Exhibit B3, # 17 Exhibit B4, # 18 Exhibit B5, # 19 Exhibit B6, # 20 Exhibit B7, # 21 Exhibit B8)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 946 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 817 SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Michael Dansky Relying on Third-Party Licenses, 823 SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF MICHAEL J. DANSKY, 818 Opposed SEALED MOTION (Defendants' Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Expert Testimony Regarding Damages)Opposed SEALED MOTION (Defendants' Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Expert Testimony Regarding Damages)Opposed SEALED MOTION (Defendants' Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Expert Testimony Regarding Damages)Opposed SEALED MOTION (Defendants' Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Expert Testimony Regarding Damages), 822 Opposed SEALED MOTION MOTION TO STRIKE MICHAEL J. DANSKYS OPINIONS ON REASONABLE ROYALTY, 821 Opposed SEALED MOTION TIBCO Software Inc.'s Daubert Motion to Exclude the Opinion of Michael Dansky re Reasonable Royalty, or, in the Alternative, to Strike Portions of his Proposed Testimony filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Melanie Cowart, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit A1, # 4 Exhibit A2, # 5 Exhibit A3, # 6 Exhibit A4, # 7 Exhibit A5, # 8 Exhibit A6, # 9 Exhibit A7, # 10 Exhibit A8, # 11 Exhibit B1, # 12 Exhibit B2, # 13 Exhibit B3, # 14 Exhibit B4, # 15 Exhibit B5, # 16 Exhibit B6, # 17 Exhibit B7, # 18 Exhibit B8, # 19 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion, # 20 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion, # 21 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 945 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 941 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 944 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 802 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Melanie Cowart, # 2 Exhibit Redd Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion)(Macon, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/30/2011: # 4 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 943 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Additional Attachments to Main Document: 942 Sealed Response to Motion,,.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 942 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 820 Opposed SEALED MOTION TIBCO Software Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Foreign Copies and Daubert Motion to Preclude Expert Testimony, 815 SEALED MOTION MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT AS TO FOREIGN SALES filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declarationf of Melanie Cowart, # 2 Exhibit 23-Rog Response, # 3 Exhibit 24-Dora Depo Excerpts, # 4 Exhibit 25-Rog Responses, # 5 Exhibit 26-Williams Depo Excerpts, # 6 Exhibit 27-Rog Responses, # 7 Exhibit 28-Revenue Document, # 8 Exhibit 29-Rudd Delaration)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 941 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 805 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declartion of Melanie Cowart, # 2 Exhibit 30-Rudd Depo Excerpts, # 3 Exhibit 31-Correspondence, # 4 Exhibit 32--Sacerdoti Expert Report Excerpts, # 5 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 940 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PLEASE IGNORE. Filed in Error. PLEASE IGNORE. SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 807 Opposed MOTION to Strike Portions of the Rudd Expert Reports filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Melanie Cowart, # 2 Exhibit 23-Rog Response, # 3 Exhibit 24-Dora Depo Excerpts, # 4 Exhibit 25-Rog Responses, # 5 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion)(Macon, Richard) Modified on 11/30/2011 (leh, ). (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 939 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 830 Opposed SEALED MOTION TIBCO Software Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Actual Notice Under 35 U.S.C. Section 287 filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion, # 2 Exhibit 20-Correspondence, # 3 Exhibit 21-David Brown Depo Excerpts, # 4 Exhibit 22-Response to Rogs, # 5 Affidavit Declaration of Melanie Cowart)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 938 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 935 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 934 Sealed Response to Motion,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Q, # 2 Exhibit R, # 3 Exhibit S, # 4 Exhibit T, # 5 Exhibit U, # 6 Exhibit V, # 7 Exhibit W, # 8 Exhibit X, # 9 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] order)(Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 937 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 828 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF LACHES filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Melanie Cowart, # 3 Exhibit 19-09/22/04 Correspondence)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 936 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 825 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO WILLFULNESS AND INDIRECT INFRINGEMENT AND NO ACTUAL NOTICE filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Melanie Cowart, # 3 Exhibit 11-Crummey Depo Excerpts, # 4 Exhibit 12-Prather Depo Excerpts, # 5 Exhibit 13-09/11/04 Correspondence, # 6 Exhibit 14-09/22/04 Correspondence, # 7 Exhibit 15-10/22/04-Correspondence, # 8 Exhibit 16-10/25/04 Correspondence, # 9 Exhibit 17-Vitria 10K, # 10 Exhibit 18-10/25/04 Correspondence)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 935 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 934 Sealed Response to Motion,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J, # 2 Exhibit K, # 3 Exhibit L, # 4 Exhibit M, # 5 Exhibit N, # 6 Exhibit O)(Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 934 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 811 Opposed SEALED MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' EQUITABLE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES)Opposed SEALED MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' EQUITABLE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES)Opposed SEALED MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' EQUITABLE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES) filed by TIBCO Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Eric L. Toscano In Support of TIBCO Software Inc.s Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment On Defendants Equitable Affirmative Defenses, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H)(Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 933 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 827 Opposed SEALED MOTION TIBCO Software Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Melanie Cowart, # 3 Exhibit 7- 11/03/04 Correspondence, # 4 Exhibit 8-11/019/04 Correspondence, # 5 Exhibit 9-Press Release, # 6 Exhibit 10-Fitzsimmons Depo Excerpts)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 932 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Additional Attachments to Main Document: 930 Response in Opposition to Motion,,.. (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 931 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 929 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 930 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 810 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Infringement Under the Doctrine of Equivalents filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Denying Moton, # 2 Exhibit 2-Claim Construction Memo Opinion, # 3 Exhibit 3-Infringement Contention Cover Sheet, # 4 Exhibit 4-Supplemental Infringement Contention Cover Sheet, # 5 Exhibit 5-Markman Hearing Transcript, # 6 Exhibit 6-Colin White Depo Excerpts)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 929 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 836 SEALED MOTION (Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (License)) filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-US Patent, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion)(Macon, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2011: # 3 Exhibit 1 Searchable) (mjc, ). (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 928 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 814 Opposed SEALED MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIE THE REPORT OF CRAIG W. THOMPSON ON NON-INFRINGEMENT AND RELATED TESTIMONY)Opposed SEALED MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIE THE REPORT OF CRAIG W. THOMPSON ON NON-INFRINGEMENT AND RELATED TESTIMONY)Opposed SEALED MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIE THE REPORT OF CRAIG W. THOMPSON ON NON-INFRINGEMENT AND RELATED TESTIMONY) filed by TIBCO Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Eric L. Toscano in support of TIBCO Software Inc.s Response To JuxtaComms Motion to Strike the Reports Of Craig W. Dr. Thompson on Non-Infringement and Related Testimony, # 2 Exhibit A - Rudd Initial Expert Report and Exh E, # 3 Exhibit B - Rudd ActiveMatrix and Exh A, # 4 Exhibit C - 0902 Thompson Rebuttal Expert Report - Non-Infringement, # 5 Exhibit C1 - Thompson CV, # 6 Exhibit C2 - US Patent 6,195,662, # 7 Exhibit C3 - List of Materials Reviewed, # 8 Exhibit D - 1007 Thompson Rebuttal Expert, # 9 Exhibit E - Thompson Opening pp 1-37, # 10 Exhibit F - relevant deposition citations, # 11 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Toscano, Eric) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2011: # 12 Searchable Copy of '662 Patent) (mjc, ). (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 927 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 811 Opposed SEALED MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' EQUITABLE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES filed by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc. Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of C. Offor, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of E. Sacerdoti, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Limited Liability Agreement of JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC, # 4 Exhibit 2 - Teilhard Techs. 2004 Consolidated Financial Statements, # 5 Exhibit 3 - U.S. Patent No. 6,195,662, # 6 Exhibit 4 - Excerpts from the Aug. 30, 2011 Expert Report of Walter G. Rudd on SAS Products, # 7 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts from the Mar. 25, 2011 Deposition of Gail Stephens, # 8 Exhibit 6 - Excerpts from the Mar. 30, 2011 Deposition of Craig Rubendall, # 9 Exhibit 7 - The retirement of SAS Warehouse Administrator, # 10 Exhibit 8 - What's New in SAS 9, 9.1, 9.1.2, # 11 Exhibit 9 - Facts Figures Methodologies, Sept. 7, 2011, # 12 Exhibit 10 - Excerpts from the Oct. 20, 2011 Deposition of Walter G. Rudd, # 13 Exhibit 11 - Worldwide Data Movement and Replication Software and Competitive Analysis, 2003, # 14 Exhibit 12 - Nov. 2004 Email from R. Shannon to D. Brown attaching Data Movement,, # 15 Exhibit 13 - Excerpts from the Oct. 19-21, 2011 30(b)(6) Deposition of David Brown, # 16 Exhibit 14 - Excerpts from the July 14, 2011 Deposition of Michael Doyle, # 17 Exhibit 15 - Excerpts from the July 12, 2011 Deposition of Darin Ellis, # 18 Exhibit 16 - JuxtaComm Aug. 29, 2011 Responses to SAS's First Set of Specific Rogs, # 19 Exhibit 17 - Patrick, Calgary firm's patent may have big impact, # 20 Exhibit 18 - Review of United States Patent 6,195,662, # 21 Exhibit 19 - Updated Patent Review for Teilhard, Sept. 2006, # 22 Exhibit 20 - Apr. 22, 2004 Email from K. Prather to D. Smith, D. Brown, # 23 Exhibit 21 - June 1, 2009 Decl. of Ken Prather in JuxtaComm I, # 24 Exhibit 22 - Aug. 17, 2007 Original Complaint for Patent Infringement in JuxtaComm I, # 25 Exhibit 23 - July 13, 2007 Retention Agreement regarding US Patent No. 6,195,662, # 26 Exhibit 24 - Excerpts from the Sept. 19, 2011 Rebuttal Report of Dr. Earl Sacerdoti, # 27 Exhibit 25 - Sept. 14, 2011 Letter from L. Macon to C. Offor, # 28 Exhibit 26 - Excerpts from the Feb. 25, 2009 Deposition of Michael Doyle in JuxtaComm I, # 29 Exhibit 27 - Excerpts from the Mar. 18, 2009 Deposition of Divjot Narang, # 30 Exhibit 28 - Excerpts from the Nov. 18, 2011 Deposition of Earl Sacerdoti, # 31 Text of Proposed Order)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 926 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 811 Opposed SEALED MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' EQUITABLE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES)Opposed SEALED MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' EQUITABLE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES)Opposed SEALED MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' EQUITABLE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES) filed by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Steven M. Kalogeras, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8 (Part 1), # 10 Exhibit 8 (Part 2), # 11 Exhibit 8 (Part 3), # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 14, # 18 Exhibit 15, # 19 Exhibit 16, # 20 Exhibit 17, # 21 Exhibit 18, # 22 Exhibit 19, # 23 Exhibit 20, # 24 Exhibit 21, # 25 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 925 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Additional Attachments to Main Document: 924 Sealed Response to Motion,,,.. (Tyz, Ryan) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 924 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 811 Opposed SEALED MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' EQUITABLE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES)Opposed SEALED MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' EQUITABLE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES)Opposed SEALED MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' EQUITABLE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES) filed by Vitria Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 11, # 11 Exhibit 12, # 12 Exhibit 13, # 13 Exhibit 14, # 14 Exhibit 15, # 15 Exhibit 16, # 16 Exhibit 17, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyz, Ryan) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 923 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposed SEALED MOTION (MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATION OF MARK SCHNEIDER) by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Initial Disclosures, # 2 Exhibit B-Supplemental Disclosures, # 3 Exhibit C-Trial Witness List, # 4 Exhibit D-Rebuttal Trial Witness List, # 5 Exhibit E-Sacredoti Report, # 6 Exhibit F-110/02/11 Counsel Correspondence, # 7 Exhibit G-11/18/11 Counsel Correspondence, # 8 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Strike)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 922 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Iona Technologies Limited, Progress Software Corporation re 908 Notice (Other) of Correction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit B (Deposition Designations) (Corrected))(Daniels, Justin) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 921 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 811 Opposed SEALED MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' EQUITABLE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES)Opposed SEALED MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' EQUITABLE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES)Opposed SEALED MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' EQUITABLE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES) filed by Iona Technologies Limited, Progress Software Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Doyle Email, # 2 Exhibit B - D - Brown Deposition Excerpts 10.20.11, # 3 Exhibit C - Narang Email, # 4 Exhibit D - Sonic Product History, # 5 Exhibit E - Artix ESB; Configuration Reference C++ Runtime, # 6 Exhibit F - Artix ESB and Sonic ESB Compared, # 7 Exhibit G - Merritt Deposition Excerpts, # 8 Exhibit H - Brown Deposition Excerpts 10.19.11, # 9 Exhibit I - Ellis Deposition Excerpts, # 10 Exhibit J - Doyle Deposition Excerpts, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Daniels, Justin) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 920 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 919 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,. (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 919 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 847 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims, 858 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answers and Affirmative Defenses to First Amended Complaint, and Counterclaims (Dkt ## 856 and 857) MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answers and Affirmative Defenses to First Amended Complaint, and Counterclaims (Dkt ## 856 and 857), 865 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim to Juxtacomm's First Amended Complaint, 861 MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims, 876 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Vitria's Answer and Counterclaims, 852 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer to First Amended Complaint filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2-Excerpts from Markman Transcript, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 918 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 801 SEALED MOTION JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' ASSERTION OF THE 28 U.S.C.§ 1498(A) "GOVERNMENT CONTRACTOR'S DEFENSE" SEALED MOTION JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' ASSERTION OF THE 28 U.S.C.§ 1498(A) "GOVERNMENT CONTRACTOR'S DEFENSE" filed by Vitria Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyz, Ryan) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 917 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 801 SEALED MOTION JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' ASSERTION OF THE 28 U.S.C.§ 1498(A) "GOVERNMENT CONTRACTOR'S DEFENSE" SEALED MOTION JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' ASSERTION OF THE 28 U.S.C.§ 1498(A) "GOVERNMENT CONTRACTOR'S DEFENSE" filed by Iona Technologies Limited, Progress Software Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Daniels, Justin) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 916 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 801 SEALED MOTION JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' ASSERTION OF THE 28 U.S.C.§ 1498(A) "GOVERNMENT CONTRACTOR'S DEFENSE" SEALED MOTION JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' ASSERTION OF THE 28 U.S.C.§ 1498(A) "GOVERNMENT CONTRACTOR'S DEFENSE" filed by TIBCO Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration Of Eric L. Toscano In Support Of TIBCO Software Inc.s Response To JuxtaComms Motion For Summary Judgment On Defendants Assertion Of The 28 USC §1498(A) Government Contractors Defense, # 2 Exhibit A - Relevant excerpts of Rudd Initial Expert Report, # 3 Exhibit B - Supp Expert Report of Dansky, # 4 Affidavit Declaration Of Marthe Theodore In Support Of TIBCO Software Inc.s Response To JuxtaComms Motion For Summary Judgment On Defendants Assertion Of The 28 USC §1498(A) Government Contractors Defense, # 5 Exhibit A - Spreadsheet, # 6 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 915 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 801 SEALED MOTION JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' ASSERTION OF THE 28 U.S.C.§ 1498(A) "GOVERNMENT CONTRACTOR'S DEFENSE" SEALED MOTION JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' ASSERTION OF THE 28 U.S.C.§ 1498(A) "GOVERNMENT CONTRACTOR'S DEFENSE" filed by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 914 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PLEASE IGNORE. Atty linked response to incorrect document. Atty refiled corrected response at DE 915. RESPONSE to Motion re 811 Opposed SEALED MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' EQUITABLE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES)Opposed SEALED MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' EQUITABLE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES)Opposed SEALED MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' EQUITABLE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES) filed by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Galvan, Hilda) Modified on 11/29/2011 (leh, ). (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 913 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 893 Motion to Dismiss. JuxtaComms claims of willful infringement against Progress and IONA, and Progresss and IONAs affirmative defenses of equitable estoppel, waiver and acquiescence are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys fees with regard to these claims and affirmative defenses. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/28/11. cc:attys 11-28-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 912 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 910 SEALED MOTION Expedited Motion to Recuse Under Local Rule CV-63(d) SEALED MOTION Expedited Motion to Recuse Under Local Rule CV-63(d) SEALED MOTION Expedited Motion to Recuse Under Local Rule CV-63(d) SEALED MOTION Expedited Motion to Recuse Under Local Rule CV-63(d) SEALED MOTION Expedited Motion to Recuse Under Local Rule CV-63(d) filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Excerpt from Texas Disciplinary Rules of Prof. Conduct R 1.11, # 2 Exhibit B-Excerpt from Model Rules of Prof. Conduct R. 1.12, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 911 Filed: 11/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 727 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of '662 Patent Claims 1-11 and 14-19 filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- McGoveran Depo Excerpts, # 2 Exhibit B-Rudd Depo Excerpts, # 3 Exhibit C-Hoskins Depo Excerpts)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 910 Filed: 11/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION Expedited Motion to Recuse Under Local Rule CV-63(d) by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Oct. 21, 2011 Plaintiff's Notice of Affiliation, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Nov. 4, 2011 SAS Letter to Macon & Everingham - Joint Submission of Issue to Chief Judge Folsom, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Nov. 8, 2011 SAS Letter to Macon & Everingham - Withdrawal of Notice, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Nov. 14, 2011 SAS Letter to Macon & Everingham - Follow-Up on Withdrawal of Notice, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Nov. 7, 2011 JX Letter to Galvan - Rejecting Nov. 4 Proposal, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Nov. 14, 2011 JX Letter to Galvan - Rejecting Nov. 8 Proposal, # 7 Exhibit 7 - General Order Adopting New Local Rule CV-62(d), # 8 Exhibit 8 - Written Testimony of Judge McKeown, Hearing on Examining the State of Judicial Recusals, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Committee on Codes of Conduct Advisory Opinion No. 70, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Code of Conduct for United States Judges, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Nov. 21, 2011 SAS Letter to Judge Davis Requesting Conference to Address Dispute Over Notice of Affiliation, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 11/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 909 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER that if SAS Institute Inc intends to request recusal in this case, it is ORDERED to file a motion, under seal, regarding the same by Friday, 11-25-2011 by 12pm. Plaintiff Juxtacomm-Texas Software, LLC is ORDERED to file a response by Monday, 11-28-2011 by 5pm. Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2011 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/22/11. cc:attys 11-22-11(mll, ) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 908 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Iona Technologies Limited, Progress Software Corporation Pretrial Disclosures (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Witness List), # 2 Exhibit B (Deposition Designations), # 3 Exhibit C (Exhibit List))(Daniels, Justin) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 907 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 890 Motion to Dismiss. JuxtaComms claims of willful infringement against Vitria; Vitrias Eighth Affirmative Defense of Inequitable Conduct; and Vitrias Third Counterclaim for Relief requesting a Declaration of Unenforceability are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys fees with regard to these claims, counterclaims, and affirmative defenses. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/21/11. cc:attys 11-22-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 906 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by TIBCO Software, Inc. Defendant TIBCO Software Inc.'s Pretrial Disclosures (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Defendant TIBCO Software Inc.'s Trial Witness List, # 2 Exhibit B - Defendant TIBCO Software Inc.'s Opening Deposition Designations, # 3 Exhibit C - Defendant TIBCO Software Inc.'s Trial Exhibit List)(Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 905 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave for Additional Trial Exhibits by TIBCO Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 904 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***NOTICE by Progress Software Corporation Pretrial Disclosures (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Witnesses), # 2 Exhibit B (Designations), # 3 Exhibit C (Exhibits))(Daniels, Justin) Doc. sealed by Court. Modified on 11/22/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 903 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibit List by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc... (Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 902 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by SAS Institute, Inc. Pretrial Disclosures of SAS and DataFlux (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Davis, Keith) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 901 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc. LIST OF DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS (Torchia, Paul) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 900 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit List by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc... (Torchia, Paul) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 899 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit List by Vitria Technology, Inc... (Tyz, Ryan) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 898 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit List (PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST) by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC.. (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 897 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC (PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL DESIGNATIONS) (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 896 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Vitria Technology, Inc. (Deposition Testimony Designations) (Tyz, Ryan) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 895 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Pervasive Software, Inc. of Initial Deposition Testimony Designations (Huston, Charles) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 894 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit List Defendant Pervasive Software Inc.'s Trial Exhibit List by Pervasive Software, Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Trial Exhibit List))(Huston, Charles) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 893 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Dismiss (JOINT MOTION TO PARTIALLY DISMISS) by Iona Technologies Limited, JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC, Progress Software Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Partially Dismiss)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 892 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 751 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (PLAINTIFF JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ON DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (PLAINTIFF JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ON DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (PLAINTIFF JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ON DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (PLAINTIFF JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ON DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (PLAINTIFF JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ON DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT) filed by SAS Institute, Inc.. (Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 891 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 753 Opposed MOTION to Strike (Plf's Motion to Strike the Exprert Report of David McGoveran) filed by Pervasive Software, Inc.. (Zoern, Stacy) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 890 Filed: 11/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Dismiss (JOINT MOTION TO PARTALLY DISMISS) by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC, Vitria Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion for Partial Dismissal)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 889 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc. Status of Pending Motions (Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 888 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Pervasive Software, Inc. Regarding Pending Motions (Zoern, Stacy) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 887 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by TIBCO Software, Inc. re 878 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, TIBCO Software Inc.'s Notice Regarding Pending Motions in Response to Docket No. 878 (Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 886 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC re 878 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 885 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc. re 878 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, (Kalogeras, Steven) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 884 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Iona Technologies Limited, Progress Software Corporation re 878 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, (Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 883 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Vitria Technology, Inc. Regarding Pending Motions (Tyz, Ryan) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 882 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 862 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Answer. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/18/11. cc:attys 11-18-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 881 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 743 MOTION for Summary Judgment in View of Patent Office Decision Invalidating All Claims filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 880 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 744 Emergency MOTION FOR A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BETWEEN JUXTACOMM AND LAWSON filed by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Mandy Pezzano, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 879 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document Defendant Vitria Technology, Inc.'s Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law on Issues Tried to the Bench (Tyz, Ryan) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 878 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2011 09:30 AM in Ctrm 329 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. Parties are ordered to inform the Court by 11/18/11 if any of the motions have been resolved, and to file at status update regarding remaining issues by 12/1/11. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/17/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 877 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED ANSWER to First Amended Complaint, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Shopplex.com Corporation, JuxtaComm Technologies, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC by Vitria Technology, Inc.. (Tyz, Ryan) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 876 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Vitria's Answer and Counterclaims by Vitria Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyz, Ryan) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 875 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kimberly A Mottley for Iona Technologies Limited, Progress Software Corporation. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 874 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ANSWER to (Lawson's Third Amended Answer to) First 173 Amended Complaint,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against JuxtaComm Technologies, Inc., JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC by Lawson Software, Inc., Lawson Software Americas, Inc.. (Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 873 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TIBCO Software Inc.'s Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 872 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** SEALED MOTION Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Vitria Technology, Inc.. (Tyz, Ryan) Modified on 11/17/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 871 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document. Progress's and IONA's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Daniels, Justin) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 870 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Findings of Fact by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 869 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document. SAS INSTITUTE INC.'S AND DATAFLUX CORP.'S PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW (Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 868 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Second Amended ANSWER to 173 Amended Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC by DataFlux Corporation.(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 867 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Second Amended ANSWER to 173 Amended Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC by SAS Institute, Inc..(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 866 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document. Pervasive Software Inc.'s Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Huston, Charles) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 865 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim to Juxtacomm's First Amended Complaint by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 864 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document. DEFENDANTS LAWSON SOFTWARE, INC. AND LAWSON SOFTWARE AMERICAS, INC.S PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW ON LACHES, INTERVENING RIGHTS, AND INEQUITABLE CONDUCT (Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 863 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED ANSWER to 173 Amended Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC by Pervasive Software, Inc.. (Huston, Charles) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 862 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Answer to First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement and Counterclaims by Vitria Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyz, Ryan) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 861 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims by Pervasive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huston, Charles) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 860 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ANSWER to First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Shopplex.com Corporation, JuxtaComm Technologies, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC by Vitria Technology, Inc.. (Tyz, Ryan) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 859 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Answer to First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement and Counterclaims by Vitria Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyz, Ryan) Modified on 11/16/2011 (gsg). (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 858 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answers and Affirmative Defenses to First Amended Complaint, and Counterclaims (Dkt ## 856 and 857) by Iona Technologies Limited, Progress Software Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 857 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED ANSWER to 173 Amended Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC by Iona Technologies Limited. (Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 856 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED ANSWER to 173 Amended Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC by Progress Software Corporation. (Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 855 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION FOR SEVERANCE FOLLOWED BY SEPARATE TRIALS by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 854 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Kalogeras Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Kalogeras Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Kalogeras Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Kalogeras Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 5 to Kalogeras Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 6 to Kalogeras Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 7 to Kalogeras Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 8 to Kalogeras Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 9 to Kalogeras Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 10 to Kalogeras Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 11 to Kalogeras Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 12 to Kalogeras Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 13 to Kalogeras Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 14 to Kalogeras Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 15 to Kalogeras Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 16 to Kalogeras Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 17 to Kalogeras Declaration, # 18 Exhibit 18 to Kalogeras Declaration, # 19 Exhibit 19 to Kalogeras Declaration, # 20 Exhibit 20 to Kalogeras Declaration, # 21 Exhibit 21 to Kalogeras Declaration, # 22 Exhibit 22 to Kalogeras Declaration, # 23 Exhibit 23 to Kalogeras Declaration)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 853 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Sever DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION FOR SEVERANCE FOLLOWED BY SEPARATE TRIALS by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 852 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer to First Amended Complaint by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Third Amended Answer, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 851 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED ANSWER to 173 Amended Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM TIBCO Software Inc.'s [Proposed] Second Amended Answer, Defenses, and Counterclaims against JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC by TIBCO Software, Inc.. (Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 850 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Vitria Technology, Inc. NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANTS PROGRESS SOFTWARE CORPORATION AND IONA TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (NON-LICENSE) (Haack, Phillip) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 849 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 759 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by Pervasive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Dingman Declaration))(Huston, Charles) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 848 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 845 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice Plaintiff JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC's claims against Defendant Ricoh Americas Corporation and without prejudice Ricoh Americas Corporation's counterclaims against Plaintiff JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/14/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 847 Filed: 11/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims by TIBCO Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Eric L. Toscano in Support of TIBCO Software Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Answer and Counterclaims, # 2 Exhibit A - TIBCO Software Inc.'s proposed Second Amended Answer, Defenses, And Counterclaims To JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC's First Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit B - Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief in JuxtaComm I, # 4 Exhibit C - JuxtaComm Technologies, Inc.'s Opening Claim Construction Brief in JuxtaComm I, # 5 Exhibit D - Memorandum Opinion in JuxtaComm I, # 6 Exhibit E - July 31, 2009 Order Granting Request for Ex Parte Reexamination in SN 90/010,526, # 7 Exhibit F - December 16, 2009 Office Action in SN 90/010,526, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 11/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 846 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by TIBCO Software, Inc. Notice of Joinder in Defendants Progress Software Corporation and IONA Technologies Limited's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Non-License) (Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 845 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***CORRECTED DOCUMENT. REPLACES 844 .***Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Ricoh Americas Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Jonah) Modified on 11/14/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 844 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT 845 . ***Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Ricoh Americas Corporation. (Mitchell, Jonah) Modified on 11/14/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 843 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 727 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of '662 Patent Claims 1-11 and 14-19 filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 842 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 841 Reply to Response to Motion,,,,,. (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 841 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 751 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (PLAINTIFF JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ON DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (PLAINTIFF JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ON DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (PLAINTIFF JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ON DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (PLAINTIFF JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ON DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (PLAINTIFF JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ON DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT) filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Kirt S. O'Neill, # 2 Exhibit V-11/10/11 Screen Shoots of 10/30/09 Submission, # 3 Exhibit W-04/28/11 PTO Submission, # 4 Exhibit X-04/28/11 USPTO's Electronic Receipt, # 5 Exhibit Y-11/10/11 Business Record Affidavit of Melanie Langford, # 6 Exhibit AA-02/22/08 Plf's Infirngement Contentions as to Informatica Corporation, # 7 Exhibit BB-02/10/09 Prel. Claim Construction Order, # 8 Exhibit CC-03/07/11- Declaration of Walter G. Rudd, # 9 Exhibit DD-05/24/11 Markman Hearing Excerpts)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 840 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 836 SEALED MOTION (Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (License)). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 839 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 836 SEALED MOTION (Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (License)). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 838 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to 833 Main Document:. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit KK, # 2 Exhibit LL, # 3 Exhibit MM)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) Modified on 11/10/2011 (leh, ). (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 837 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to 833 Main Document:. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Y, # 2 Exhibit Z, # 3 Exhibit AA, # 4 Exhibit BB, # 5 Exhibit CC, # 6 Exhibit DD, # 7 Exhibit EE, # 8 Exhibit FF, # 9 Exhibit GG, # 10 Exhibit HH, # 11 Exhibit II, # 12 Exhibit JJ)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) Modified on 11/10/2011 (leh, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/17/2011: # 13 Exhibit JJ Searchable) (mjc, ). (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 836 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION (Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (License)) by Iona Technologies Limited, Progress Software Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Justin Daniels)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 835 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to 833 Main Document:. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit M, # 2 Exhibit N, # 3 Exhibit O, # 4 Exhibit P, # 5 Exhibit Q, # 6 Exhibit R, # 7 Exhibit S, # 8 Exhibit T, # 9 Exhibit U, # 10 Exhibit V, # 11 Exhibit W, # 12 Exhibit X)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) Modified on 11/10/2011 (leh, ). (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 834 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Vitria Technology, Inc. Notice of Joinder in Summary Judgment Motions (Haack, Phillip) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 833 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION (Defendants' Motions for Partial Summary Judgment (Non-License) by Iona Technologies Limited, Progress Software Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Justin Daniels, # 3 Exhibit A - Accused products, # 4 Exhibit B-RFA response, # 5 Exhibit C-Dansky Report, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 832 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Additional Attachments to Main Document: 831 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT.. (Tyz, Ryan) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 831 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT by Vitria Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit 6, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyz, Ryan) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 830 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposed SEALED MOTION TIBCO Software Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Actual Notice Under 35 U.S.C. Section 287 by TIBCO Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Eric L. Toscano, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Eric L. Toscano, # 3 Exhibit B Declaration of Eric L. Toscano, # 4 Exhibit C Declaration of Eric L. Toscano, # 5 Exhibit D Declaration of Eric L. Toscano, # 6 Exhibit E Declaration of Eric L. Toscano, # 7 Exhibit F Declaration of Eric L. Toscano, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 829 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Additional Attachments to Main Document: 828 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF LACHES.. (Tyz, Ryan) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 828 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF LACHES by Vitria Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 12, # 12 Exhibit 13, # 13 Exhibit 14, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyz, Ryan) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 827 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposed SEALED MOTION TIBCO Software Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement by TIBCO Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Eric L. Toscano, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Toscano Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Toscano Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Toscano Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Toscano Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E to Toscano Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F to Toscano Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit G to Toscano Declaration, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit H to Toscano Declaration, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 826 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposed SEALED MOTION TIBCO Software Inc.'s Daubert Motion to Preclude Walter G. Rudd's Testimony Regarding Intent, Knowledge, and State of Mind by TIBCO Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Eric L. Toscano, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Toscano Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Toscano Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Toscano Declaration, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 825 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO WILLFULNESS AND INDIRECT INFRINGEMENT AND NO ACTUAL NOTICE by Vitria Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyz, Ryan) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 824 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Additional Attachments to Main Document: 823 SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF MICHAEL J. DANSKY.. (Tyz, Ryan) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 823 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF MICHAEL J. DANSKY by Vitria Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit 6, # 6 Exhibit 7, # 7 Exhibit 8, # 8 Exhibit 9, # 9 Exhibit 10, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyz, Ryan) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 822 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposed SEALED MOTION MOTION TO STRIKE MICHAEL J. DANSKYS OPINIONS ON REASONABLE ROYALTY by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Aug. 30, 2011 Expert Report of M. Dansky, Appendix E SAS and Dataflux, # 2 Exhibit 2 - DataFlux 2009 Company Meeting Presentation, SASJX003128109, # 3 Exhibit 3 - DataFlux 2007 Company Meeting Presentation, SASJX003128786, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Sept. 8, 2011 Letter from H. Galvan to L. Macon Re Aug. 26 Letter, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Exhibit 3 to SAS Reply in Support of Mot to Compel ICs - ECF No. 544-2, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Exhibit 6 to SAS Reply in Support of Emergency Mot to Stay - ECF No. 669-6, # 7 Exhibit 7 - US Patent No. 6,195,662 B1, # 8 Exhibit 8 - JuxtaComm's Complaint for Patent Infringement ECF No. 001, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Aug. 30, 2011 Expert Rpt of Walter G. Rudd as to SAS, # 10 Exhibit 10 - SAS Packaging Overviews Documents, SAS 00064619-36, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Sept. 19, 2011 Rebuttal Expert Rpt of Dr. Earl Sacerdoti, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Aug. 30, 2011 Expert Rpt of Walter G. Rudd as to DataFlux, # 13 Exhibit 13 - Excerpt from SAS 00043485, SAS Fact Sheet, # 14 Exhibit 14 - SAS 00063900 SAS Release History, # 15 Exhibit 15 - SAS Suppl Responses to JuxtaComm's Common Interrogatories (Nos. 3-7), # 16 Exhibit 16 - License Agreement between JuxtaComm and PetroCore, JXTS00660250, # 17 Exhibit 17 - License Agreement between JuxtaComm and JD Barnes, related documents, JXTS01021100, # 18 Exhibit 18 - License Agreement between JuxtaComm and Illumicell, JXTS00395806, # 19 Exhibit 19 - Excerpt of Transcript of Phone Conversation between K. Prather and J. Rosenthal, JXTS01037249, # 20 Exhibit 20 - Excerpt of 30(b)(6) deposition of K. Prather from JuxtaComm I, JXTS00232469 (2009-02-27), # 21 Exhibit 21 - Shopplex 2006 Annual Report, JXTS00274001, # 22 Exhibit 22 - May 2006 Letter to Teilhard Shareholders, JXTS00698491, # 23 Exhibit 23 - Corporate Structure and Existing Relationships, JXTS01000790, # 24 Exhibit 24 - Press Release RE JuxtaComm-Illumicell license agreement, JXTS00276398, # 25 Exhibit 25 - E-mail from K. Prather to D. Jackson RE Illumicell royalties, JXTS01001324, # 26 Exhibit 26 - Excerpts from the Oct. 20, 2011 Rudd Dep Transcript, # 27 Exhibit 27 - Excerpts from the Aug. 30, 2011 Expert Report of Michael Dansky, # 28 Text of Proposed Order)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 821 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposed SEALED MOTION TIBCO Software Inc.'s Daubert Motion to Exclude the Opinion of Michael Dansky re Reasonable Royalty, or, in the Alternative, to Strike Portions of his Proposed Testimony by TIBCO Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Eric L. Toscano, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Toscano Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Toscano Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Toscano Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Toscano Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Exhibiti E to Toscano Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F to Toscano Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit G to Toscano Declaration, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit H to Toscano Declaration, # 10 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting TIBCO's Motion)(Mitchell, Jonah) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 820 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposed SEALED MOTION TIBCO Software Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Foreign Copies and Daubert Motion to Preclude Expert Testimony by TIBCO Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Eric L. Toscano, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Toscano Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Toscano Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Toscano Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Toscano Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E to Toscano Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F to Toscano Declaration, # 8 Affidavit Declaration of Lou Dora, # 9 Affidavit Declaration of Randy Welch, # 10 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting TIBCO's motion)(Mitchell, Jonah) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 819 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 816 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Michael Dansky Relying On the Entire Market Value Rule, 817 SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Michael Dansky Relying on Third-Party Licenses. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Steven M. Kalogeras In Support of Motions to Strike, # 2 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Steven M. Kalogeras In Support of Motions to Strike, # 3 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Steven M. Kalogeras In Support of Motions to Strike, # 4 Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Steven M. Kalogeras In Support of Motions to Strike, # 5 Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Steven M. Kalogeras In Support of Motions to Strike, # 6 Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of Steven M. Kalogeras In Support of Motions to Strike, # 7 Exhibit 7 to the Declaration of Steven M. Kalogeras In Support of Motions to Strike, # 8 Exhibit 8 to the Declaration of Steven M. Kalogeras In Support of Motions to Strike, # 9 Exhibit 9 to the Declaration of Steven M. Kalogeras In Support of Motions to Strike, # 10 Exhibit 10 to the Declaration of Steven M. Kalogeras In Support of Motions to Strike)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 818 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposed SEALED MOTION (Defendants' Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Expert Testimony Regarding Damages) by Iona Technologies Limited, Progress Software Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1-Unpub.Opinion, # 3 Exhibit 2-Unpub.Opinion, # 4 Declaration of Justin Daniels, # 5 Exhibit A-Excerpts from Dansky Report, # 6 Exhibit B-Excerpts from Dansky Prelim.Report, # 7 Exhibit C-Dansky Appendix Excerpts, # 8 Exhibit D-Excerpts from Deloitte Ltr, # 9 Exhibit E-3/12/03 Licensing Agreement Excerpts, # 10 Exhibit F-8/6/06 Licensing Agreement Excerpts, # 11 Exhibit G-1/2/07 Licensing Agreement Excerpts, # 12 Exhibit H-6/24/03 Article, # 13 Exhibit I-Quarterly Rpt, # 14 Exhibit J-9/12/06 Press Release)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2011: # 15 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 817 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Michael Dansky Relying on Third-Party Licenses by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 816 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Michael Dansky Relying On the Entire Market Value Rule by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 815 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT AS TO FOREIGN SALES by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Keith B. Davis, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Mark Schneider, # 3 Exhibit A - Excerpts from the Oct. 20, 2011 Rudd Deposition Transcript, # 4 Exhibit B - Initial Expert Report of Walter G. Rudd as to SAS, # 5 Exhibit C - Juxtacomm's Mar. 7, 2011 Resp to OA in SN 90-011,267, # 6 Exhibit D - Appendix E to Dansky Damages Report as to SAS and Dataflux, # 7 Exhibit E - 2011-10-07 SAS Suppl Common Rog Resp (Nos. 3-7), # 8 Exhibit F - Excerpts from the Aug. 24, 2011 Akamai Deposition Transcript, # 9 Exhibit G - Nov. 3, 2011 Op., EMD Crop Bioscience, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 814 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposed SEALED MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIE THE REPORT OF CRAIG W. THOMPSON ON NON-INFRINGEMENT AND RELATED TESTIMONY) by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Melanie G. Cowart in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Strike, # 2 Exhibit A-09/02/11 Rebuttal Expert Report of Thompson, # 3 Exhibit B-10/07/11 Rebuttal Expert Report of Thompson, # 4 Exhibit C-Exhibit 3 to 09/02/11 Rebuttal Expert Report of Thompson, # 5 Exhibit D-Exhibit 1 to 10/07/11 Rebuttal Expert Report of Thompson, # 6 Exhibit E-10/26/11 Thompson Depo Excerpts, # 7 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 813 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Indirect and No Willful Infringement by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Mandy Pezzano, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 812 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 810 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Infringement Under the Doctrine of Equivalents. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit 1 (Part 2), # 3 Exhibit 1 (Part 3), # 4 Exhibit 2 (Part 1), # 5 Exhibit 2 (Part 2), # 6 Exhibit 2 (Part 3), # 7 Exhibit 3)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 811 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposed SEALED MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' EQUITABLE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES) by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Melanie G. Cowart, # 2 Exhibit A-Progress & Iona's 01/25/11 Rog Responses, # 3 Exhibit B-Lawson Def.'s 02/11/11 Rog Responses, # 4 Exhibit C-SAS's 10/07/11 Rog Responses, # 5 Exhibit D-DataFlux's 10/08/11 Rog Responses, # 6 Exhibit E-04/14/11 Kilmer Depo Excerpts, # 7 Exhibit F-TIBCO's 08/29/11 Rog Responses, # 8 Exhibit G-Vitria's 10/07/11 Rog Responses, # 9 Exhibit H-07/06/11 Knox Depo Excerpts, # 10 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 810 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Infringement Under the Doctrine of Equivalents by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 809 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 767 Motion to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/9/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 808 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 807 Opposed MOTION to Strike Portions of the Rudd Expert Reports. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2 - Initial Expert Report of Walter G. Rudd as to SAS, # 2 Exhibit 3 - Initial Expert Report of Walter G. Rudd as to DataFlux, # 3 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts from the Oct. 20, 2011 Rudd Deposition Transcript, # 4 Exhibit 7 - Excerpts from the Oct. 25, 2011 Rudd Deposition Transcript, # 5 Exhibit 8 - Excerpts from the Aug. 24, 2011 Akamai Deposition Transcript, # 6 Exhibit 9 - Rebuttal Expert Report of Walter G. Rudd to Dr. Earl Sacerdoti Validity Report)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 807 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposed MOTION to Strike Portions of the Rudd Expert Reports by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Curriculum Vitae of Walter G. Rudd, # 2 Exhibit 4 - Calgary Firm's Patent May Have a Big Impact, JXTS00562248, # 3 Exhibit 6 - May 24, 2011 Markman Hearing Transcript, # 4 Exhibit 10 - Sept. 14 and Nov 8, 2011 Letters from C. Offor to L. Macon, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 806 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 805 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2 - Initial Expert Report of Walter G. Rudd as to SAS, # 2 Exhibit 3 - Juxtacomm's Suppl Infringe Conts as to SAS, # 3 Exhibit 4 - Claim Chart to Juxtacomm's Suppl Infringe Conts as to SAS, # 4 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts from Oct. 20, 2011 Rudd Depo Transcript, # 5 Exhibit 9 - Sept. 19, 2011 Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Earl Sacerdoti)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 805 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment by SAS Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Keith B. Davis, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Earl Sacerdoti, PH.D., # 3 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. 6,195,662, # 4 Exhibit 6 - May 24, 2011 Markman Hearing Transcript, # 5 Exhibit 7 - Juxtacomm's Mar. 7, 2011 Resp to OA in SN 90-011,267, # 6 Exhibit 8 - July 14, 2009 Mem Op., Dkt. No. 631, Juxtacomm v Ascential, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 804 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 753 Opposed MOTION to Strike (Plf's Motion to Strike the Exprert Report of David McGoveran) filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-List of Paragraphs & Exhibits JuxtaComm Moves to Strike)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 803 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 802 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Aug. 30, 2011 Rudd Initial Report as to DataFlux, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Exhibit E to the Aug. 30, 2011 Rudd Initial Report as to DataFlux, # 3 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts from the Oct. 20, 2011 Rudd Dep, # 4 Exhibit 6 - Exhibit 15 to the Oct. 20, 2011 Rudd Dep, # 5 Exhibit 7 - Exhibit 16 to the Oct. 20, 2011 Rudd Dep)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 802 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment by DataFlux Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Keith B. Davis, # 2 Exhibit 3 - U.S. Patent No. 6,195,662, # 3 Exhibit 4 - Exhibit 12 to the Oct. 20, 2011 Rudd Dep, JXTS00172470, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 801 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' ASSERTION OF THE 28 U.S.C.§ 1498(A) "GOVERNMENT CONTRACTOR'S DEFENSE" by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Excerpts of christopher Vellturo Report, # 2 Exhibit B-Depo Excerpts of 07/06/11Knox, # 3 Exhibit C-TIBCO00131820 Production Document, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 800 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 796 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/08/11. cc:attys 11-08-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 799 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 798 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 797 Reply to Response to Motion,. (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 797 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***CORRECTED DOCUMENT. REPLACES 791 .***REPLY to Response to Motion re 744 Emergency MOTION FOR A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BETWEEN JUXTACOMM AND LAWSON filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declarlation of Melanie G. Cowart, # 2 Exhibit 1-Dec. of Elgin Lee, # 3 Exhibit 3-Apr 25, 2011 Letter from Lawson to Plaintiff, # 4 Exhibit 4-Oct. 17, 2011 Letter from Plaintiff to Lawson, # 5 Exhibit 5-Oct. 31, 2011 Letter from Plaintiff to Lawson)(Macon, Richard) Modified on 11/8/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 796 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Ricoh Americas Corporation, TIBCO Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Unopposed Motion to Amend Docket Control Order)(Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 795 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Pervasive Software, Inc. re 784 Response to Motion,,,,,,,,, Notice of Joinder in SAS Institute, Inc.'s and DataFlux Corporation's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendants' Claims of Inequitable Conduct (Huston, Charles) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 794 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 743 MOTION for Summary Judgment in View of Patent Office Decision Invalidating All Claims filed by Pervasive Software, Inc.. (Huston, Charles) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 793 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended Trial Witness List by Ricoh Americas Corporation, TIBCO Software, Inc.. (Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 792 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 791 Reply to Response to Motion,. (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 791 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***REPLY to Response to Motion re 744 Emergency MOTION FOR A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BETWEEN JUXTACOMM AND LAWSON filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Melanie G. Cowart, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Decl. of Elgin Lee, # 3 Exhibit 3 - April 25, 2011 Letter from Lawson to Plaintiff, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Oct. 17, 2011 Letter from Plaintiff to Lawson, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Oct. 31, 2011 Letter from Plaintiff to Lawson)(Macon, Richard) Modified on 11/8/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 790 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc. re 784 Response to Motion,,,,,,,,, Notice of Joinder in Defendants SAS and Dataflux's Response to JuxtaComm's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment On Defendants' Claims Of Inequitable Conduct (Kalogeras, Steven) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 789 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Additional Attachments to Main Document: 788 Sealed Response to Motion,.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order A.1-Walter Rudd CV, # 2 Text of Proposed Order B-Kirt O'Neill Declaration)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 788 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 759 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Walter Rudd, # 2 Exhibit A.2-10/25/11 Rudd Depo Excerpts, # 3 Exhibit A.3-Demonstration, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Denying Pervasive's Motion)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 786 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Ricoh Americas Corporation, TIBCO Software, Inc. re 784 Response to Motion,,,,,,,, Notice of Joinder in SAS and DataFlux's Response to JuxtaComm's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendants' Claims of Inequitable Conduct (Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 785 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 784 Response to Motion re 751 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (PLAINTIFF JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ON DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9 - Excerpts from the Mar. 30, 2011 Deposition of Scott McKeown)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 784 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 751 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (PLAINTIFF JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ON DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (PLAINTIFF JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ON DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (PLAINTIFF JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ON DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (PLAINTIFF JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ON DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (PLAINTIFF JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ON DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT) filed by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Keith B. Davis, # 2 Exhibit 1 - July 14, 2009 Memorandum Opinion in JuxtaComm I, # 3 Exhibit 2 - July 31, 2009 Office Action in SN 90-010,526, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Dec. 16, 2009 Office Action in SN 90-010,526, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Index of Certified Copy of '662 Patent Reexamation File History, # 6 Exhibit 5 - July 12, 2010 Letter from L. Macon to Defendants' Counsel, # 7 Exhibit 6 - July 28, 2010 Letter from L. Macon to Defendants' Counsel, # 8 Exhibit 7 - May 4, 2011 Letter from H. Galvan to L. Macon, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, # 10 Exhibit 10 - May 12, 2011 Office Action in SN 90-011,267, # 11 Exhibit 11 - JuxtaComm's July 12, 2010 Discl of Assrtd Claims, Infringe Conts for SAS, # 12 Exhibit 12 - July 8, 2011 Letter from L. Macon to H. Galvan, # 13 Exhibit 13 - April 27, 2011 Letter from L. Macon to Defendants' Counsel, # 14 Exhibit 14 - Jan. 7, 2010 IDS Under 37 CFR 1.97 in SN 90-010,526, # 15 Exhibit 15 - Jan. 8, 2010 IDS Under 37 CFR 1.97 in SN 90-010,526, # 16 Exhibit 16 - Jan. 14, 2010 IDS Under 37 CFR 1.97 in SN 90010,526, # 17 Exhibit 17 - Jan. 27, 2010 IDS Under 37 CFR 1.97 in SN 90-010,526, # 18 Exhibit 18 - Feb. 2, 2010 IDS Under 37 CFR 1.97 in SN 90-010,526)(Galvan, Hilda) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2011: # 19 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 783 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Pervasive Software, Inc. re 778 Sealed Response to Motion,,,, Notice of Joinder in Vitria Technology, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendants' Claims of Inequitable Conduct (Zoern, Stacy) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 782 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 781 Reply to Response to Motion re 727 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of '662 Patent Claims 1-11 and 14-19. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1 (Data Bags Code) # 2 Exhibit B-1 (Distinct Processor Code), # 3 Exhibit C-1 (Script Code), # 4 Exhibit D (Various Excerpts))(Huston, Charles) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 781 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 727 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of '662 Patent Claims 1-11 and 14-19 filed by Pervasive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Dingman Declaration - Data Bags), # 2 Exhibit B (Dingman Declaration - Distinct Processor), # 3 Exhibit C (Dingman Declaration - Scripts))(Huston, Charles) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 780 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 779 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: (1) Exhibit A (Excerpt from Rudd Initial Report) (Attachments: # 2 Exhibit B (Excerpt from Rudd Validity Report))(Zoern, Stacy) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 779 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 753 Opposed MOTION to Strike (Plf's Motion to Strike the Exprert Report of David McGoveran) filed by Pervasive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zoern, Stacy) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 778 Filed: 10/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 751 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (PLAINTIFF JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ON DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (PLAINTIFF JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ON DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (PLAINTIFF JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ON DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (PLAINTIFF JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ON DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (PLAINTIFF JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ON DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT) filed by Vitria Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Ryan Tyz, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit H)(Tyz, Ryan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2011: # 15 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). (Entered: 10/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 777 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC (NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS & VERDICT FORMS) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Plf's Proposed Jury Instructions, # 2 Exhibit B-Plf's Proposed Verdict Form, # 3 Exhibit C-Defendants Proposed Jury Instructions, # 4 Exhibit D-Defendants' Proposed Verdict Form)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 776 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Pretrial Order (JOINT PRE-TRIAL ORDER) by DataFlux Corporation, Iona Technologies Limited, JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC, Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc., Pervasive Software, Inc., Progress Software Corporation, Ricoh Americas Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc., TIBCO Software, Inc., Vitria Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Plf's Trial Witness List, # 2 Exhibit B-Lawson Defendants' Trial Witness List, # 3 Exhibit C-Pervasive's Trial Witness List, # 4 Exhibit D-Progress Defendants' Trial Witness List, # 5 Exhibit E-SAS & DataFlux's Trial Witness List, # 6 Exhibit F-TIBCO's Trial Witness List, # 7 Exhibit G-Vitria's Trial Witness List)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 775 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 743 MOTION for Summary Judgment in View of Patent Office Decision Invalidating All Claims filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2011.08.23 Petition to USPTO, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Denying Pervasive's MSJ)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 774 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 768 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses. JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC shall file its Responses to Defendant Pervasive Software, Inc.s Motions for Summary Judgment as follows: 743 Motion for Summary Judgment in View of Patent Office Decision Invalidating All Claims, Response due 10-27-2011; 759 Motion for Summary Judgment of NonInfringement, Response due 11-02-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/24/11. cc:attys 10-24-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 773 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 744 Emergency MOTION FOR A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BETWEEN JUXTACOMM AND LAWSON filed by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Steven Kalogeras, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Steven Kalogeras, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Steven Kalogeras, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Steven Kalogeras, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Steven Kalogeras, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Steven Kalogeras, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Steven Kalogeras, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Steven Kalogeras, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Steven Kalogeras, # 10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Steven Kalogeras, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 772 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc. OF REQUEST FOR REAL TIME REPORTING AND DAILY TRANSCRIPTS OF COURT PROCEEDINGS (Kalogeras, Steven) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 771 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc. of Request for Real Time Reporting and Daily Transcripts of Court Proceedings (Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 770 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Ricoh Americas Corporation, TIBCO Software, Inc. of Request for Daily Transcription and Real Time Reporting (Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 769 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***STRIKEN PER 956 ORDER*** NOTICE by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC OF AFFILIATION (Macon, Richard) Modified on 12/1/2011 (mll, ). (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 768 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 743 MOTION for Summary Judgment in View of Patent Office Decision Invalidating All Claims, 759 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 767 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by TIBCO Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Unopposed Motion to Amend Docket Control Order)(Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 766 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Additional Attachments to Main Document: 765 Sealed Response to Motion,,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B - Data Junction Ref in Reexamination, # 2 Exhibit D - Pages from Joint Claim Construction Chart, # 3 Exhibit F - Pages from Markman Hearing Transcript, # 4 Exhibit G - Ex. 10 to Dingman's News Articles)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 765 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 727 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of '662 Patent Claims 1-11 and 14-19 filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Dr. Walter Rudd Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A.2 - Pages from Rudd Report, # 3 Exhibit C - Dingman Depo Pages, # 4 Exhibit E - Hoskins Depo Pages, # 5 Exhibit H - Pages from White Report, # 6 Exhibit I - Pervasive's Invalidity Contention Pages, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 764 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Vitria Technology, Inc. NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR REAL TIME REPORTING AND DAILY TRANSCRIPTS OF COURT PROCEEDINGS (Haack, Phillip) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 763 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC re 289 Order NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DAILY TRANSCRIPTION AND REAL TIME REPORTING (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 762 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Iona Technologies Limited, Progress Software Corporation (Request for Real Time Reporting and Daily Transcripts of Court Proceedings) (Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 761 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Ricoh Americas Corporation, TIBCO Software, Inc. NOTICE OF JOINDER IN SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS (Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 760 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 759 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement. (Huston, Charles) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 759 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement by Pervasive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (US6195662), # 2 Exhibit B (Hoskins Declaration), # 3 Exhibit C (JXCM Infringement Contentions), # 4 Exhibit D (JXCM Opening Claim Construction Brief), # 5 Exhibit F (Memorandum Opinion), # 6 Exhibit G (September 5, 2000 ROA), # 7 Exhibit H (JXCM Reply Brief on Claim Construction), # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Huston, Charles) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2011: # 9 Exhibit A Searchable) (mjc, ). (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 758 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Adaline J Hilgard for Ricoh Americas Corporation, TIBCO Software, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 757 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 755 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 727 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of '662 Patent Claims 1-11 and 14-19; Responses due by 10/20/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/13/11. cc:attys 10-13-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 756 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Red Hat, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 755 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 727 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of '662 Patent Claims 1-11 and 14-19 by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 754 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document. ATTACHMENTS TO 753 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B-Chart of Excerpts of McGoveran Expert Report)(Macon, Richard) Modified on 10/13/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 753 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposed MOTION to Strike (Plf's Motion to Strike the Exprert Report of David McGoveran) by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 752 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 751 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (PLAINTIFF JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ON DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (PLAINTIFF JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ON DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (PLAINTIFF JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ON DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (PLAINTIFF JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ON DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (PLAINTIFF JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ON DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit O-04/21/11 Correspondence with Counsel, # 2 Exhibit R-01/07/10 IDS)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 751 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (PLAINTIFF JUXTACOMM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ON DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT) by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Kirt O'Neill, # 2 Exhibit A-10/30/09 USPTO Submission, # 3 Exhibit B-10/30/09 USPTO Receipt, # 4 Exhibit D-02/28/11 Correspondence with Counsel, # 5 Exhibit E-05/19/11 USPTO Submission, # 6 Exhibit F-12/2110 IDS, # 7 Exhibit G-01/07/10 Petition of Expungement, # 8 Exhibit H-01/13/10 Correspondence with Counsel, # 9 Exhibit I-01/14/10 Correspondence with Counsel, # 10 Exhibit J-01/29/10 Request by Patent Holder, # 11 Exhibit K-04/16/10 PTO's Decision, # 12 Exhibit L-02/18/10 Correspondence with Counsel, # 13 Exhibit M-02/24/11 Correspondence with Counsel, # 14 Exhibit N 04/11/11 Correspondence with Counsel, # 15 Exhibit P-01/07/10 IDS, # 16 Exhibit Q-12/21/10 IDS, # 17 Exhibit S-07/27/10 Ex Parte Reexam, # 18 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 750 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 738 Emergency MOTION Case Management Conference filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-10/06/11 Correspondence between Counsel, # 2 Exhibit B-10/07/11 Correspondence Between Counsel)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 749 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 529 Motion to Stay; granting 543 Motion to extend Mediation Deadline; denying as moot 567 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; granting 572 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order; granting 572 Motion to Serve Amended Infringement Contentions and Amended Invalidity Contentions; denying as moot 593 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; granting 621 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/11/11. cc:attys 10-11-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 748 Filed: 10/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE OF JUXTACOMM-TEXAS SOFTWARE, LLC'S EXPERT REPORT (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 747 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by TIBCO Software, Inc. Supplemental Expert Report of Professor Stephen P. Magee - TIBCO Software Inc. (Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 746 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Vitria Technology, Inc. (Haack, Phillip) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 745 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by TIBCO Software, Inc. Rebuttal Expert Report of Craig Thompson - Non-Infringement of 662 Patent by TIBCO ActiveMatrix BPM (Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 744 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Emergency MOTION FOR A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BETWEEN JUXTACOMM AND LAWSON by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Melanie G. Cowart, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 743 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment in View of Patent Office Decision Invalidating All Claims by Pervasive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Request for Ex Parte Reexam), # 2 Exhibit B (Order Granting Reexam), # 3 Exhibit C (Nonfinal Action), # 4 Exhibit D (Interview Summary), # 5 Exhibit E (Response), # 6 Exhibit F (Ex Parte Reexam Action), # 7 Exhibit G (Ex Parte Reexam Advisory Action), # 8 Exhibit H (Response to Final Office Action), # 9 Exhibit I (Ex Parte Reexam Advisory Action 2), # 10 Exhibit J (Notice of Appeal), # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Huston, Charles) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 742 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment in View of Patent Office Decision Invalidating All Claims by Pervasive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Request for Ex Parte Reexam), # 2 Exhibit B (Order Granting Reexam), # 3 Exhibit C (Nonfinal Action), # 4 Exhibit D (Interview Summary), # 5 Exhibit E (Response), # 6 Exhibit F (Ex Parte Reexam Action), # 7 Exhibit G (Ex Parte Reexam Advisory Action), # 8 Exhibit H (Response to Final Office Action), # 9 Exhibit I (Ex Parte Reexam Advisory Action 2), # 10 Exhibit J (Notice of Appeal), # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Huston, Charles) Modified on 10/7/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 741 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 740 Response to 738 Emergency MOTION Case Management Conference. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 15 - Excerpts from the April 6, 2011 Deposition of H. Feldman, # 2 Exhibit 16 - April 6, 2011 Exhibit 1 to Deposition of H. Feldman, # 3 Exhibit 17 - Excerpts from the Mar. 10, 2011 Deposition of B. Laster, # 4 Exhibit 22 - Part 1 of 2, Mar. 10, 2011 Exhibit 3 to Deposition of B. Laster, # 5 Exhibit 22 - Part 2 of 2, Mar. 10, 2011 Exhibit 3 to Deposition of B. Laster, # 6 Exhibit 23 - Excerpts from the Mar. 25, 2011 Deposition of G. Stephens, # 7 Exhibit 32 - DBMS Copy Strategic Direction (March 16, 2005) at SASJX003213335, # 8 Exhibit 33 - Business Plan for Conceptual Software, Inc. at SASJX003893231, # 9 Exhibit 34 - SAS-Conceptual Software Acquisition Agreement (unexecuted copy))(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 740 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 738 Emergency MOTION Case Management Conference filed by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Sept. 20, 2011 Letter from A. Hilgard to L. Macon, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Sept. 22, 2011 Letter from L. Macon to Defendants' Counsel, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Sept. 29, 2011 Letter from A. Hilgard to L. Macon, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Sept. 30, 2011 Letter from L. Macon to Defendants' Counsel, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Oct. 3, 2011 Letter from A. Hilgard to L. Macon, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Oct. 4, 2001 Letter from L. Macon to A. Hilgard, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Sept. 14, 2011 Letter from L. Macon to C. Offor, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Aug. 25, 2011 Email from H. Galvan to L. Macon, # 9 Exhibit 9 - April 25, 2011 Email from M. Cowart to H. Galvan, # 10 Exhibit 10 - June 28, 2011 Defs' Not of Depo to Pl Pur to FRCP 30(b)(6), # 11 Exhibit 11 - May 25, 2011 Email from L. Macon to Defendants' Counsel, # 12 Exhibit 12 - April 25, 2011 Email from H. Galvan to M. Cowart, # 13 Exhibit 13 - April 18, 2011 Letter from L. Macon to H. Galvan, # 14 Exhibit 14 - Sept. 8, 2011 Letter from H. Galvan to L. Macon, # 15 Exhibit 18 - Jan. 28, 2011 Letter from C. Offor to L. Macon, # 16 Exhibit 19 - Feb. 11, 2011 Letter from C. Offor to L. Macon, # 17 Exhibit 20 - Mar. 9, 2011 Pl's Am Not of Depo to SAS Pur to FRCP 30(b)(6), # 18 Exhibit 21 - Mar. 9, 2011 Pl's Am Not of Depo of DataFlux Pur to FRCP 30(b)(6), # 19 Exhibit 24 - Sept. 23, 2011 Letter from K. Davis to L. Macon, # 20 Exhibit 25 - Aug. 26, 2011 Letter from L. Macon to H. Galvan, # 21 Exhibit 26 - Sept. 20, 2011 Letter from C. Offor to L. Macon, # 22 Exhibit 27 - Sept. 22, 2011 Letter from L. Macon to H. Galvan, # 23 Exhibit 28 - Aug. 19, 2010 Plaintiff's Disclosures, # 24 Exhibit 29 - Sept. 8, 2011 Letter from L. Macon to H. Galvan, # 25 Exhibit 30 - May 31, 2011 Email from M. Cowart to R. Tyz, # 26 Exhibit 31 - April 26, 2011 Email from M. Cowart to Defendants)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 739 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 575 Notice, and withdrawing 444 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/06/11. cc:attys 10/06/11 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 738 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Emergency MOTION Case Management Conference by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-09/08/11 Counsel Correspondence, # 2 Exhibit B-Feldman Deposition Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit C-02/23/11 Counsel Correspondence, # 4 Exhibit D-Counsel Email Correspondence, # 5 Exhibit E-Plf's Notices of Deposition to SAS & DataFlux, # 6 Exhibit F-09/22/11 Counsel Correspondence, # 7 Exhibit G-SAS & DataFlux Trial Witness List, # 8 Exhibit H-Counsel Email Correspondence, # 9 Exhibit I-09/23/11 Counsel Correspondence, # 10 Text of Proposed Order Granting Emergency Motion for a Case Management Conference)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 737 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 715 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO SAS' NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY) by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 736 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 735 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing 721 Motion for a Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/30/11. cc:attys 9-30-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 735 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 721 Emergency MOTION FOR A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 734 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 731 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/28/11. cc:attys 9-28-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 733 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Walter Rudd (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 732 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc. of Disclosure of Lawson's Rebuttal Trial Witness List (Kalogeras, Steven) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 731 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by TIBCO Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order)(Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 730 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by TIBCO Software, Inc. Supplemental Expert Report of Colin White (Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 729 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by TIBCO Software, Inc. Second Invalidity Expert Report of Craig W. Thompson (Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 728 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Pervasive Software, Inc. Regarding Service of Rebuttal Trial Witness List (Huston, Charles) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 727 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/13/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of '662 Patent Claims 1-11 and 14-19 by Pervasive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Patent Pages), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Hoskins Depo Pages), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Article), # 4 Exhibit 4 (Article), # 5 Exhibit 5 (Article), # 6 Exhibit 6 (Infringement Contention Pages), # 7 Exhibit 7 (Pages from Interrogatory Responses), # 8 Exhibit 8 (Chart), # 9 Exhibit 9 (Pages from PTO Office Action), # 10 Exhibit 10 (Pages from User Manual), # 11 Exhibit 11 (Hoskins Depo Pages), # 12 Exhibit 12 (Article), # 13 Exhibit 13 (Advertisement), # 14 Exhibit 14 (Pages from McGoveran Report), # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Huston, Charles) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 726 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 721 Emergency MOTION FOR A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Iona Technologies Limited, Progress Software Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 725 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Iona Technologies Limited, Progress Software Corporation regarding Rebuttal Trial Witness List (Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 724 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 289 Order (MSJ and Daubert Deadlines) by DataFlux Corporation, Ricoh Americas Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc., TIBCO Software, Inc., Vitria Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 723 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Ricoh Americas Corporation, TIBCO Software, Inc. regarding Rebuttal Trial Witness List (Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 722 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Rebuttal Witness List by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 721 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Emergency MOTION FOR A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 720 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC of Plf's Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Rudd and the Supplemental Expert Report of Michael Dansky) (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 719 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc. Notice of Disclosure of Expert Report of Dr. Christopher S. Vellturo (Davis, Keith) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 718 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc. Notice of Disclosure of Expert Report and Rebuttal Report of Dr. Earl Sacerdoti (Davis, Keith) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 717 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Iona Technologies Limited, Progress Software Corporation (Rebuttal Expert Report of Arthur Keller) (Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 716 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 715 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc. re 625 Emergency MOTION to Stay Proceedings in View of Imminent Appeal of Final PTO Action Invalidating Asserted Claims (SAS's Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of its Emergency Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Reexamination) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - White House - Signed Legislation, # 2 Exhibit B - HR 1249)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 714 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by TIBCO Software, Inc. Supplemental Expert Report of Craig W. Thompson (Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 713 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by TIBCO Software, Inc. Expert Report of Professor Stephen P. Magee (Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 712 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Pervasive Software, Inc. Expert Report of Professor Stephen P. Magee (Huston, Charles) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 711 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Pervasive Software, Inc. Rebuttal Expert Report of David McGoveran (Huston, Charles) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 710 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Ricoh Americas Corporation, TIBCO Software, Inc. regarding Trial Witness List (Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 709 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 704 Motion to Modify Certain Docket Control Deadlines. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/15/11. cc:attys 9-15-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 708 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Red Hat, Inc. [REQUEST FOR TERMINATION OF ELECTRONIC NOTICES] (Bufe, John) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 707 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc. Trial Witness List (Kalogeras, Steven) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 706 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc. of Expert Report (Kalogeras, Steven) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 705 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc. regarding Trial Witness List (Offor, Chijioke) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 704 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION STIPULATED FOR ORDER MODIFYING CERTAIN DOCKET CONTROL ORDER DEADLINES by Vitria Technology, Inc.. (Tyz, Ryan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 703 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 696 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/13/11. cc:attys 9-13-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 702 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc. re 691 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief Providing Further Evidence in Support of Motion to Stay , Briefing is Complete for SAS and DataFlux's Motion for Leave (Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 701 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Pervasive Software, Inc. Compliance Regarding Service of Trial Witness List (Zoern, Stacy) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 700 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC (NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION) (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 699 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Iona Technologies Limited, Progress Software Corporation (regarding Trial Witness List) (Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 698 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's Trial Witness List by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 697 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 691 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief Providing Further Evidence in Support of Motion to Stay filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Melanie G. Cowart in Support of Plf's Resp., # 2 Exhibit 1A-03/30/11 Macon ltr. to SAS Counsel, # 3 Exhibit 1-B-04/07/11 Macon ltr. to SAS Counsel, # 4 Exhibit 1C-04/18/11 Macon ltr. to SAS Counsel, # 5 Exhibit 1D-09/07/11 Macon ltr. to SAS Counsel, # 6 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion for Leave)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 696 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 289 Order (REGARDING JUXTACOMM'S EXPERT REPORTS ON TIBCO ACTIVE MATRIX BPM AND TIBCO'S REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT ON DAMAGES) by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC, TIBCO Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 695 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc. re 625 Emergency MOTION to Stay Proceedings in View of Imminent Appeal of Final PTO Action Invalidating Asserted Claims (Notice Regarding Juxtacomm's Appeal of the USPTO's Invalidation of the U.S. Patent No. 6,195,662 Claims) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Notice of Appeal Filed in Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 6,195,662, # 2 Exhibit B - Petition Filed in Reexamination of U.S. Patent No.6,195,662)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 694 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 692 Reply to Response to Motion,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 2011-08-30 Rudd Report Excerpts, # 2 Exhibit B - 2011-08-30 Dansky Report Excerpts, # 3 Exhibit D - 2011-09-02 Macon Ltr to Defense Counsel)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 693 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: 692 Reply to Response to Motion,,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 2011-08-30 Rudd Report Excerpts, # 2 Exhibit B - 2011-08-30 Dansky Report Excerpts, # 3 Exhibit D - 2011-09-02 Macon Ltr to Defense Counsel)(Galvan, Hilda) Modified on 9/8/2011 (mjc, ). Sealed by Court. (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 692 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 625 Emergency MOTION to Stay Proceedings in View of Imminent Appeal of Final PTO Action Invalidating Asserted Claims (Supplemental Brief Providing Further Evidence in Support of Emergency Motion to Stay) filed by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C - 2011-09-02 Galvan Ltr to Macon, # 2 Exhibit E - 2011-09-05 Davis Ltr to Macon, # 3 Exhibit F - 2011-08-29 Macon ltr to Defense Counsel, # 4 Exhibit G - 2011-08-31 Macon ltr Bovich)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 691 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief Providing Further Evidence in Support of Motion to Stay by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 690 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc. of First Supplemental Initial Disclosure (Torchia, Paul) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 689 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc. of Supplemental Invalidity Contentions Pursuant to L.P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Kalogeras, Steven) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 688 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc. of the Supplemental Expert Report of Colin White and the Rebuttal Expert Report of Philip Faillace (Kalogeras, Steven) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 687 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 652 MOTION to Strike The Damages Expert Report Of Michael Dansky And To Preclude Juxtacomm From Introducing Damages Expert Testimony Relating To Lawson At Trial filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 686 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua R Furman on behalf of Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc. (Furman, Joshua) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 685 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC OF REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT OF DR. WALTER RUDD ON VALIDITY (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 684 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 652 MOTION to Strike The Damages Expert Report Of Michael Dansky And To Preclude Juxtacomm From Introducing Damages Expert Testimony Relating To Lawson At Trial filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Macon, Richard) Modified on 9/6/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 683 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 625 Emergency MOTION to Stay Proceedings in View of Imminent Appeal of Final PTO Action Invalidating Asserted Claims filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 682 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by TIBCO Software, Inc. Rebuttal Expert Report of Craig W. Thompson - Non-Infringement (Toscano, Eric) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 681 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 666 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File JUXTACOMM-TEXAS SOFTWARE, LLC'S OPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT OF MICHAEL DANSKY AS TO DEFENDANTS LAWSON SOFTWARE, INC. AND LAWSON SOFTWARE AMERICAS, INC. filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 680 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 655 MOTION Modify the Docket Control Order And Vacate The Deadline For Lawson To Submit A Rebuttal Report On Issues Of Damages Pending Decision On Lawson's Motion To Strike The Dansky Report filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 679 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 652 MOTION to Strike The Damages Expert Report Of Michael Dansky And To Preclude Juxtacomm From Introducing Damages Expert Testimony Relating To Lawson At Trial filed by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc.. (Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 678 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE OF JUXTACOMM-TEXAS SOFTWARE, LLC'S EXPERT REPORTS (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 677 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***REPLY to Response to Motion re 652 MOTION to Strike The Damages Expert Report Of Michael Dansky And To Preclude Juxtacomm From Introducing Damages Expert Testimony Relating To Lawson At Trial filed by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc.. (Reiter, Mark) Modified on 9/1/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 676 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 666 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File JUXTACOMM-TEXAS SOFTWARE, LLC'S OPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT OF MICHAEL DANSKY AS TO DEFENDANTS LAWSON SOFTWARE, INC. AND LAWSON SOFTWARE AMERICAS, INC. filed by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc.. (Torchia, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/1/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 675 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 655 MOTION Modify the Docket Control Order And Vacate The Deadline For Lawson To Submit A Rebuttal Report On Issues Of Damages Pending Decision On Lawson's Motion To Strike The Dansky Report filed by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit OF MANDY PEZZANO IN SUPPORT OFLAWSONS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO MODIFY THE DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND VACATE THE DEADLINE FOR LAWSON TO SUBMIT A REBUTTAL REPORT ON ISSUES OF DAMAGES PENDING DECISION ON LAWSONS MOTION TO STRIKE THE DANSKY REPORT, # 2 Exhibit 1 TO DECLARATION OF MANDY PEZZANO, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Torchia, Paul) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 674 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 670 Motion for Leave to File. ORDERED that the SAS Defendants are granted leave to serve supplemental invalidity contentions on or before September 22, 2011, and to serve a supplemental expert report on invalidity on or before October 6, 2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/30/2011. (gsg) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 673 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 667 Sealed Response to Motion,,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 10-Expert Report of Michael Danksy)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 672 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION. ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL TO Document # 667 Sealed Response to Motion. PLEASE NOTE.*** (mjc, ) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 671 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 664 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. TIBCO Software Inc. may serve its initial rebuttal expert report on damages by 9-12-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/29/11. cc:attys 8-29-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 670 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Invalidity Contentions (9/22) and Supplemental Expert Report on Invalidity (10/6) by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order to Serve Supplemental Invalidity contentions and supplemental expert report on invalidity)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 669 Filed: 8/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 625 Emergency MOTION to Stay Proceedings in View of Imminent Appeal of Final PTO Action Invalidating Asserted Claims filed by DataFlux Corporation, SAS Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - JuxtaComms Petition Under C.F.R. 1.181, Aug. 23, 2011, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Kenneth M. Schor, Petition Practice in Patent Reexamination from a USPTO Perspective, Jan. 10, 2011, # 3 Exhibit 3 - MonkeyMedia slip op, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Request for Ex Parte Reexamination Filing Receipt, Oct. 15, 2010, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Letter from J. Bovich to R. L. Macon, Aug. 26, 2011, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Documents Cited in Juxtacomms Supplemental Infringement Contentions as to SAS and Dataflux, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Letter from Macon to Offor, July 7, 2011)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 08/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 668 Filed: 8/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***"CORRECTED EXHIBIT 10" FILED UNDER SEAL TO JUXTACOMM-TEXAS SOFTWARE, LLC'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT LAWSON SOFTWARE, INC. AND LAWSON SOFTWARE AMERICAS, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND MOTION TO MODIFY THE DOCKET CONTROL ORDER RE SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 652 MOTION to Strike The Damages Expert Report Of Michael Dansky And To Preclude Juxtacomm From Introducing Damages Expert Testimony Relating To Lawson At Trial, 666 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File JUXTACOMM-TEXAS SOFTWARE, LLC'S OPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT OF MICHAEL DANSKY AS TO DEFENDANTS LAWSON SOFTWARE, INC. AND LAWSON SOFTWARE AMERICAS, INC., 655 MOTION Modify the Docket Control Order And Vacate The Deadline For Lawson To Submit A Rebuttal Report On Issues Of Damages Pending Decision On Lawson's Motion To Strike The Dansky Report filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Macon, Richard) Modified on 8/29/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 08/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 667 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 652 MOTION to Strike The Damages Expert Report Of Michael Dansky And To Preclude Juxtacomm From Introducing Damages Expert Testimony Relating To Lawson At Trial, 655 MOTION Modify the Docket Control Order And Vacate The Deadline For Lawson To Submit A Rebuttal Report On Issues Of Damages Pending Decision On Lawson's Motion To Strike The Dansky Report filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Dennis J. Windscheffel in Support of Juxtacomm-Texas Software, LLC's Response to Defendant Lawson Software, Inc. and Lawson Software Americas, Inc.'s Motion to Strike and Motion to Modify the Docket Control Order, # 2 Exhibit "1", # 3 Exhibit "2", # 4 Exhibit "3", # 5 Exhibit "4", # 6 Exhibit "5", # 7 Exhibit "6", # 8 Exhibit "7", # 9 Exhibit "8", # 10 Exhibit "9", # 11 Exhibit "10", # 12 Exhibit "11")(Macon, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/29/2011: # 13 Certificateof Authorization to File Under Seal) (mjc, ). (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 666 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposed MOTION for Leave to File JUXTACOMM-TEXAS SOFTWARE, LLC'S OPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT OF MICHAEL DANSKY AS TO DEFENDANTS LAWSON SOFTWARE, INC. AND LAWSON SOFTWARE AMERICAS, INC. by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Macon, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/29/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 665 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC (NOTICE OF WITHDRWAL OF JOHN FULTON GIANOLA) (Macon, Richard) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 664 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 289 Order (JOINT MOTION TO AMEND DOCKET CONTROL ORDER REGARDING TIBCO'S EXPERT REPORT ON DAMAGES) by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC, TIBCO Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 663 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 659 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/25/11. cc:attys 8-25-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 662 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 658 Motion to Serve Supplemental Infringement Contentions and Invalidity Contentions. Plaintiff may serve supplemental infringement contentions on Defendants Progress Software Corporation and Iona Technologies Limited by 8-24-2011 and Progress may serve supplemental invalidity contentions, if any, on JuxtaComm y 8-29-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/25/11. cc:attys 8-25-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 661 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 656 Motion to Expedite Briefing. The briefing schedule for Lawsons Motion to Modify the Docket Control Order And Vacate the Deadline for Lawson To Submit A Rebuttal Report On Issues Of Damages Pending Decision On Lawsons Motion To Strike The Dansky Report 655 is set as follows: JuxtaComms opposition brief due 8-26-2011; Lawsons reply brief due 8-30-2011;JuxtaComms surreply brief due 9-02-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/25/11. cc:attys 8-25-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 660 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 654 Motion to Expedite Briefing. The briefing schedule for Lawsons Motion To Strike Damages Expert Report of Michael Dansky and to Preclude JuxtaComm From Introducing Damages Expert Testimony Relating to Lawson at Trial is set as follows: JuxtaComms opposition brief due on 8-26-2011; Lawsons reply brief due on 8-30-2011; JuxtaComms surreply brief due on 9-02-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/25/11. cc:attys 8-25-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 659 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***CORRECTED DOCUMENT. REPLACES 657 .***Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 289 Order (JOINT MOTION TO AMEND DOCKET CONTROL ORDER REGARDING EXPERT REPORTS & DISCOVERY) by Iona Technologies Limited, JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC, Progress Software Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Amend)(Macon, Richard) Modified on 8/25/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 658 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION Leave to Serve Supplemental Infringment Contentions & Invalidity Contentions by Iona Technologies Limited, JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC, Progress Software Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 657 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT 659 .***Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 289 Order (JOINT MOTION TO AMEND DOCKET CONTROL ORDER REGARDING EXPERT REPORTS AND DISCOVERY AS TO PROGRESS & IONA) by Iona Technologies Limited, JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC, Progress Software Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Amend)(Macon, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2011: # 2 Text of Proposed Order Corrected) (mjc, ). Modified on 8/25/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 656 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING ON LAWSONS MOTION TO MODIFY THE DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND VACATE THE DEADLINE FOR LAWSON TO SUBMIT A REBUTTAL REPORT ON ISSUES OF DAMAGES PENDING DECISION ON LAWSONS MOTION TO STRIKE THE DANSKY REPORT by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 655 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE 959 .***MOTION Modify the Docket Control Order And Vacate The Deadline For Lawson To Submit A Rebuttal Report On Issues Of Damages Pending Decision On Lawson's Motion To Strike The Dansky Report by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) Modified on 12/2/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 654 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING ON LAWSONS MOTION TO STRIKE THE DAMAGES EXPERT REPORT OF MICHAEL DANSKY AND TO PRECLUDE JUXTACOMM FROM INTRODUCING DAMAGES EXPERT TESTIMONY RELATING TO LAWSON AT TRIAL by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 653 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 652 MOTION to Strike The Damages Expert Report Of Michael Dansky And To Preclude Juxtacomm From Introducing Damages Expert Testimony Relating To Lawson At Trial. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Declaraion of Mandy Pezzano In Support of Lawson's Motion to Strike, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Declaraion of Mandy Pezzano In Support of Lawson's Motion to Strike, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Declaraion of Mandy Pezzano In Support of Lawson's Motion to Strike, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Declaraion of Mandy Pezzano In Support of Lawson's Motion to Strike, # 5 Exhibit 5 to Declaraion of Mandy Pezzano In Support of Lawson's Motion to Strike, # 6 Exhibit 6 to Declaraion of Mandy Pezzano In Support of Lawson's Motion to Strike, # 7 Exhibit 7 to Declaraion of Mandy Pezzano In Support of Lawson's Motion to Strike, # 8 Exhibit 8 to Declaraion of Mandy Pezzano In Support of Lawson's Motion to Strike, # 9 Exhibit 9 to Declaraion of Mandy Pezzano In Support of Lawson's Motion to Strike, # 10 Exhibit 10 to Declaraion of Mandy Pezzano In Support of Lawson's Motion to Strike)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 652 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike The Damages Expert Report Of Michael Dansky And To Preclude Juxtacomm From Introducing Damages Expert Testimony Relating To Lawson At Trial by Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 625 Emergency MOTION to Stay Proceedings in View of Imminent Appeal of Final PTO Action Invalidating Asserted Claims filed by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Melanie Cowart in Support of Plf's Response, # 2 Exhibit A1-Peition Under 37 C.F.R., # 3 Exhibit 212/15/09 Office Action, # 4 Exhibit A3-Memorandum Opinion & Order, # 5 Exhibit A4-Chart on Fed Cir. Median Disposition Time, # 6 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 650 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 649 Notice (Other) Declaration of Jonah D. Mitchell (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A JuxtaComm Document (JXTS00386374), # (2 Exhibit B JuxtaComm Document (JXTS00946377 - JXTS00946396)(Mitchell, Jonah) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Ricoh Americas Corporation, TIBCO Software, Inc. NOTICE OF JOINDER IN EMERGENCY MOTION OF DEFENDANTS SAS INSTITUTE, INC. AND DATAFLUX CORPORATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS IN VIEW OF IMMINENT APPEAL OF FINAL PTO ACTION INVALIDATING ASSERTED CLAIMS (Mitchell, Jonah) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 648 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 645 Motion for Leave to Serve Supplemental Infringement Contentions on SAS and DataFlux. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/23/11. cc:attys 8-23-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 647 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 641 Motion to Dismiss. All claims, counterclaims or causes of action asserted in this suit by Plaintiff against Defendant Red Hat, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice, and all claims, counterclaims or causes of action asserted by Defendant are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/22/11. cc:attys 8-23-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 632 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/22/11. cc:attys 8-22-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 645 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Serve Supplemental Infringement Contentions on SAS and DataFlux by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 643 MOTION for Joinder in Emergency Motion of Defendants SAS Institute, Inc. and Dataflux Corporation to Stay Proceedings in View of Imminent Appeal of Final PTO Action Invalidating Asserted Claims - Declaration of Jonah D. Mitchell (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - JuxtaComm Document (JXTS00386374), # 2 Exhibit B - JuxtaComm Document (JXTS00946377-JXTS00946396))(Mitchell, Jonah) Modified on 8/23/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 643 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** MOTION for Joinder in Emergency Motion of Defendants SAS Institute, Inc. and Dataflux Corporation to Stay Proceedings in View of Imminent Appeal of Final PTO Action Invalidating Asserted Claims by Ricoh Americas Corporation, TIBCO Software, Inc.. (Mitchell, Jonah) Modified on 8/23/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 642 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Vitria Technology, Inc. re 625 Emergency MOTION to Stay Proceedings in View of Imminent Appeal of Final PTO Action Invalidating Asserted Claims [NOTICE OF JOINDER] (Tyz, Ryan) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 641 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Dismiss as to Red Hat by JuxtaComm-Texas Software, LLC, Red Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Macon, Richard) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 640 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY TO REFILE. PLEASE DISREGARD*** SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 639 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 636 Exhibit A MOTION for Joinder in Emergency Motion of Defendants SAS Institute, Inc. and Dataflux Corporation to Stay Proceedings in View of Imminent Appealof Final PTO Action Invalidating Asserted Claims. (Mitchell, Jonah) Modified on 8/19/2011 (mll, ). (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 639 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY TO REFILE. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 636 Exhibit B to MOTION for Joinder in Emergency Motion of Defendants SAS Institute, Inc. and Dataflux Corporation to Stay Proceedings in View of Imminent Appealof Final PTO Action Invalidating Asserted Claims, 638 Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document,. (Mitchell, Jonah) Modified on 8/19/2011 (mll, ). (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 638 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY TO REFILE. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: Exhibit A to Defendants TIBCO Software Inc. and Ricoh Americas Corporation's Notice of Joinder in Emergency Motion of Defendants SAS Institute, Inc. and Dataflux Corporation to Stay Proceedings in View of Imminent Appeal of Final PTO Action Invalidating Asserted Claims. (Mitchell, Jonah) Modified on 8/19/2011 (mll, ). (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Pervasive Software, Inc. re 625 Emergency MOTION to Stay Proceedings in View of Imminent Appeal of Final PTO Action Invalidating Asserted Claims Joinder by Pervasive Software Inc. (Zoern, Stacy) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY TO REFILE. PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION for Joinder in Emergency Motion of Defendants SAS Institute, Inc. and Dataflux Corporation to Stay Proceedings in View of Imminent Appealof Final PTO Action Invalidating Asserted Claims by Ricoh Americas Corporation, TIBCO Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Jonah D. Mitchell)(Mitchell, Jonah) Modified on 8/19/2011 (mll, ). (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 635 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Nolan Reiter on behalf of Lawson Software Americas, Inc., Lawson Software, Inc. (Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 634 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 611 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jennifer P Gossain terminated as counsel for Lawson Software Inc and Lawson Software Americas Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/18/11. cc:attys 8-18-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 668 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?