Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. NATIONAL INSTRUMENTS CORP. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:10-cv-00472
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 23, 2017 at 4:32 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Adobe Systems, Inc. Adobe Systems, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Unknown Role, Salon Internet, Inc.
Unknown Role, OMNITURE Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven R Katz +1 617 542 5070 +1 617 542 8906 katz@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Faucett & Preberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J Healey +1 713 877 1515
No Logo Alladin Knowledge Systems Ltd., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven R Katz +1 617 542 5070 +1 617 542 8906 katz@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Faucett & Preberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J Healey +1 713 877 1515
No Logo Alladin Knowledge Systems, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven R Katz +1 617 542 5070 +1 617 542 8906 katz@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Faucett & Preberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J Healey +1 713 877 1515
No Logo Filemaker, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257
No Logo National Instruments Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "NATIONAL INSTRUMENTS CORP."

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven R Katz +1 617 542 5070 +1 617 542 8906 katz@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Faucett & Preberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J Healey +1 713 877 1515
No Logo Onyx Graphics, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven R Katz +1 617 542 5070 +1 617 542 8906 katz@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Faucett & Preberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J Healey +1 713 877 1515
No Logo Pinnacle Systems Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven R Katz +1 617 542 5070 +1 617 542 8906 katz@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Faucett & Preberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J Healey +1 713 877 1515
No Logo Safenet, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven R Katz +1 617 542 5070 +1 617 542 8906 katz@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Faucett & Preberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J Healey +1 713 877 1515
No Logo Sonic Solutions, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Farella Braun & Martel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Noel Andrew Leibnitz +1 415 954 4400 +1 415 954 4480 aleibnitz@fbm.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc Tarlock +1 415 954 4423 +1 415 954 4480 mtarlock@fbm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roderick Manley Thompson +1 415 954 4400 +1 415 954 4480 rthompson@fbm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Faucett & Preberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/20/2011 David J Healey +1 713 877 1515

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah J Race +1 903 561 1600 drace@icklaw.com
Symantec Corporation Symantec Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Symantec Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Farella Braun & Martel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/19/2011, PRO HAC VICE Roderick Manley Thompson +1 415 954 4400 +1 415 954 4480 rthompson@fbm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Faucett & Preberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/20/2011 David J Healey +1 713 877 1515

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean Geoffrey Dunlavey +1 714 540 1235 dean.dunlavey@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yury Kapgan +1 213 485 1234 yury.kapgan@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo C, A, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/03/2011, PRO HAC VICE John Allcock +JohnAllcockd lap ipercom

Toggle Switch Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth L DeRieux +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ederieux@capshawlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/03/2011 Brian K Erickson +1 512 457 7059 +1 512 457 7001 brian.erickson@dlapiper.com
TERMINATED: 06/03/2011 John M. Guaragna +1 512 457 7125 +1 512 457 7001 john.guaragna@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Farella Braun & Martel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/19/2011, PRO HAC VICE Roderick Manley Thompson +1 415 954 4400 +1 415 954 4480 rthompson@fbm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Faucett & Preberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/20/2011 David J Healey +1 713 877 1515

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Benjamin M Stern +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 benjamin.stern@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Pervasive Software, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Daffer McDaniel, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles D Huston +1 512 476 1400 +1 512 703 1250 chuston@dmtechlaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/04/2011 Aaron James Pickell +1 512 476 1400 +1 512 703 1250 apickell@dmtechlaw.com
TERMINATED: 08/29/2011 Stacy L Zoern +1 512 476 1400 +1 512 703 1250 szoern@dmtechlaw.com
No Logo Uniloc (Singapore) Private Ltd., Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "Uniloc Singapore Private Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Hayes Bostock & Cronin LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/13/2011 Dean G Bostock +1 978 809 3850 +1 978 809 3869 dbostock@hbcllc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/13/2011 Paul J. Hayes +1 617 542 6000 +1 617 542 2241 phayes@mintz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hayes Bostock & Cronin LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/13/2011 Dean G Bostock +1 978 809 3850 +1 978 809 3869 dbostock@hbcllc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/13/2011 Paul J. Hayes +1 617 542 6000 +1 617 542 2241 phayes@mintz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
No Logo Honorable Robert Faulkner, Mediator

Represented by JAMS

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (323) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 312 Sealed Patent Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/23/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
    Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of Authority to seal): 321 Sealed Response to Motion,,.. (Casto, Edward) Modified on 3/22/2013 (sm, ). (Entered: 03/22/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Sealed Legal Document 321 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
      SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 312 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Steven W. Hartsell, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K-1, # 13 Exhibit K-2, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Casto, Edward) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE by Adobe Systems Inc., Alladin Knowledge Systems Ltd., Alladin Knowledge Systems, Inc., NATIONAL INSTRUMENTS CORP., Onyx Graphics, Inc., Pinnacle Systems, Inc., Safenet, Inc. for Termination of Electronic Notices (Katz, Steven) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          CONSOLIDATION ORDER. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial purposes only. The earliest filed civil action 6:10cv373 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated case. The model ESI Order, previously filed Discovery Order, and Protective Order (filed in Civil Action 6:10cv373) will govern the consolidated case. All parties to the consolidated case are ORDERED to meet-and-confer and submit a uniform Docket Control Order incorporating the dates designated in this Order. As the stay has been lifted, the parties may engage in discovery. However, the parties may not amend their infringement and invalidity contentions without leave of Court. The parties are further ORDERED to attend mediation before 5-21-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/04/13. cc:attys 3-05-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
            REPLY to Response to Motion re 311 Opposed MOTION to Join Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. as Plaintiff filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 2/25/2013. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign in Sheet) (cwk) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER granting 314 Motion to Modify Briefing Scheduling. ORDERED that the Unilocs deadline to respond to Symantec and Xteamloks Motion to Dismiss is extended to March 21, 2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/1/2013. (gsg) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kathy Yu on behalf of Symantec Corp. (Yu, Kathy) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                    Unopposed MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 311 Opposed MOTION to Join Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. as Plaintiff filed by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 312 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
                        SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of M. Flagel, # 2 Exhibit 1 - 082712 Notice of Ruling, # 3 Exhibit 2 - 030712 Rev 3rd Amended Comp, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Articles of Inc. for Uniloc PC Preload, # 5 Exhibit 4 - UNI077559-77563, # 6 Exhibit 5 - 042202 Richardson letter, # 7 Exhibit 6 - 2010 2011 Cert of Status, # 8 Exhibit 7 - UNI043334-43341, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Gewirtz and Nelson email 11-2011, # 10 Exhibit 9 - UNI098729-98732, # 11 Exhibit 10 - UNI097606-097626, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                          Opposed MOTION to Join Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. as Plaintiff by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                            NOTICE by Sonic Solutions Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Leibnitz, Noel) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward E Casto, Jr on behalf of Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                NOTICE by Sonic Solutions of Request for Termination of Electronic Notification of Filings (Carroll, Otis) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting 304 Motion to Lift Stay and Set Case Management Conference. These cases are hereby set for a case management conference on 2-25-2013, at 2:00 P.M. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/25/13. cc:attys 1-25-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                                    RESPONSE in Support re 304 Opposed MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND NOTICE OF READINESS FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 304 Opposed MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND NOTICE OF READINESS FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Sureloc Final Declaratory Judgment, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                                        Opposed MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND NOTICE OF READINESS FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Order dismissing California Action, # 2 Exhibit B - Markman Hearing transcript, # 3 Exhibit C - Claim Construction Order, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting 302 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Yury Kapgan terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/13/12. cc:attys 5-15-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
                                            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Yury Kapgan by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Charles D Huston (Huston, Charles) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting 299 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Any and all claims by pltfs against deft Filemaker, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice; Filemakers counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice. Parties shall each bear their own attorneys fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/23/12. cc:attys 1-25-12(mll, ) (Entered: 01/25/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant FileMaker, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting 295 Motion to Stay. This civil action, including all discovery, is STAYED until further order of the Court, pending resolution of the California Action filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Corp. Pty, Ltd., and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. The Clerk of the Court is ORDERED to administratively close this case. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/01/11. cc:attys 12-01-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER. The Court advises the parties that it does not accept communications to the Court outside of CM/ECF filings. Any letters, faxes, or other communications that have not been specifically requested by the Court will be disregarded. All arguments and communications to the Court shall be made through formal CM/ECF filings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/28/11. cc:attys 11-29-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing Proceedings held on 10/19/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 91 pages NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2012. (sms, ) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                          Joint MOTION to Stay All Above Actions by FileMaker, Inc., Pervasive Software, Inc., Symantec Corp., Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Uniloc v. Sureloc Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - Ltr from Miller to Attys in Uniloc litigation re 216 patent, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting 293 Motion to Stay. All pending deadlines in this matter between Uniloc and Defendant Filemaker are stayed through and including 12-12-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/08/11. cc:attys 11-08-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                              Agreed MOTION to Stay All Deadlines for Defendant Filemaker, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 291 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims in this action by pltfs against deft Adobe Systems Inc are dismissed with prejudice; all counterclaims by deft are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/07/11. cc:attys 11-07-11(mll, ) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Adobe Systems Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER denying as moot 200 Motion for Protective Order; denying as moot 201 Motion to Expedite Briefing Schedule regarding Plaintiffs Motion For Entry of Protective Order; denying 243 Motion for Leave to Construe Previously Construed Term. This provisional claim construction Order sets forth the Courts initial constructions for the disputed claim terms in U.S. Patent No. 5,490,216. The Court will issue a Memorandum Opinion, including a full analysis of the disputed claim terms, at a later date. The Court may modify these provisional constructions when it issues the Memorandum Opinion. This Order is intended to serve as a guideline and framework with which the parties may proceed at an earlier point in the litigation. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/03/11. cc:attys 11-04-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting 287 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft National Instruments Corporation are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/31/11. cc:attys 11-01-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting 285 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft Onyx Graphics Inc are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/31/11. cc:attys 11-01-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant National Instruments Corporation by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER that pltf and defts each pay $14,850.00 to Michael T. McLemore for services rendered and expenses incurred through 10-19-2011 as Technical Advisor to the Court, for a total amount of $29,700.00. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/25/11. cc:attys 10-26-11(mll, ) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Onyx Graphics, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting 282 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft Pinnacle Systems Inc are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/24/11. cc:attys 10-24-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting 281 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and defts SafeNet Inc, Aladdin Knowledge Systems Inc, and Aladdin Knowledge Systems Ltd are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/24/11. cc:attys 10-24-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Pinnacle Systems, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendants SafeNet, Inc., Aladdin Knowledge Systems, Inc., and Aladdin Knowledge Systems Ltd. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Markman & Motion Hearing held on 10/19/2011 re 243 Opposed MOTION for Leave to Construe Previously Construed Term filed by Pervasive Software, Inc. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting 278 Motion to Dismiss Sonic Solutions. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, on the one hand, and Defendant Sonic Solutions, on the other hand, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/18/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Sonic Solutions by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER that as time allows, the Court will hear argument on all currently pending motions at the Markman hearing scheduled for 10-19-2011 at 9 a.m. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/12/11. cc:attys 10-13-11(mll, ) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Patent Rule 4-5(d) (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting 272 Motion to Stay. All pending deadlines in this matter between Uniloc and Defendant Adobe are stayed through 11-09-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/11/11. cc:attys 10-11-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Regarding Estimated Amount of Time Required for Markman Hearing (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      REPLY to 265 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Steven W. Hartsell, # 2 Exhibit G)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION to Stay All Deadlines with Defendant Adobe Systems, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER appointing Michael T. McLemore, 10333 Richmond Ave., Suite 1100, Houston, Texas 77042, to the position of technical advisor in this case with his costs to be assessed equally between Plaintiff and Defendants and timely paid as billed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/4/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting 269 Motion to Stay. All pending deadlines in this matter between Uniloc and Defendants SafeNet, Onyx, Aladdin, Pinnacle, and National Instruments are stayed through 11-07-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/04/11. cc:attys 10-04-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Agreed MOTION to Stay All Deadlines with Defendants SafeNet, Inc., Onyx Graphics, Inc., Aladdin Knowledge Systems, Inc., Aladdin Knowledge Systems, Ltd., Pinnacle Systems, Inc. and National Instruments Corporation by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting 267 Motion to Stay. All pending deadlines in this matter are stayed to 10-10-2011 for Defendant and Counterclaimant Sonic Solutions LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/29/11. cc:attys 9-29-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION to Stay for Stay of Deadlines for Sonic Solutions LLC by Sonic Solutions. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion for Stay of Deadlines for Sonic Solutions LLC)(Thompson, Roderick) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 266 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 265 Claim Construction Brief,. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of H. Ribera, # 2 Exhibit A - 1st Amended PR 3-1 and 3-2)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Responsive CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by FileMaker, Inc., Pervasive Software, Inc., Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - '216 patent, # 2 Exhibit 2 - PTO Amendment, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Reply to PTO, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Response to PTO, # 5 Exhibit 5 - PTO Notice of Reexam, # 6 Exhibit 6 - PTO Dec of Pooch, # 7 Exhibit 7 - PTO Interview Summary, # 8 Exhibit 8 - PTO Dec of Rosenblatt)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 260 Motion to Stay. All pending deadlines in this matter are stayed to 9-30-2011 for the Fish Defendants. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/22/11. cc:attys 9-23-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER. The Court intends to appoint Michael T. McLemore to the position of technical advisor in this case. Any objection to the appointment shall be presented to the Court for in camera review within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/22/11. cc:attys 9-23-11(mll, ) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 113 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/20/11. cc:attys 9-21-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 243 Opposed MOTION for Leave to Construe Previously Construed Term filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D, # 2 Exhibit E, # 3 Exhibit F)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Agreed MOTION to Stay All Deadlines with Defendants National Instruments Corp., Adobe Systems Inc., Safenet, Inc., Pinnacle Systems, Inc., Onyx Graphics, Inc., Aladdin Knowledge Systems, Inc. and Aladdin Knowledge Systems Ltd. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 256 Motion to Stay. All pending deadlines in this matter are stayed to 9-26-2011 for Defendant and Counterclaimant Sonic Solutions LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/13/11. cc:attys 9-13-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 255 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing 249 Motion for Leave. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/12/11. cc:attys 9-12-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Steven W. Hartsell, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D1, # 6 Exhibit D2, # 7 Exhibit D3, # 8 Exhibit D4, # 9 Exhibit D5, # 10 Exhibit D6, # 11 Exhibit D7, part 1, # 12 Exhibit D7, part 2, # 13 Exhibit D8, # 14 Exhibit D9, # 15 Exhibit E, # 16 Exhibit F)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/15/2011: # 17 Exhibit E Searchable, # 18 Exhibit F Searchable) (mjc, ). (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Stay OF DEADLINES FOR SONIC SOLUTIONS LLC by Sonic Solutions. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING AGREED MOTION FOR STAY OF DEADLINES FOR SONIC SOLUTIONS LLC)(Thompson, Roderick) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Approve the Joint Stipulation to Address Issues in Markman Proceeding and to Withdraw Dkt No. 249 re 249 MOTION for Leave to Address File History Disclaimer Issues, Arising From the Recent Reexamination, in the Upcoming Claim Construction Proceeings by Symantec Corp., Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 243 Opposed MOTION for Leave to Construe Previously Construed Term filed by Pervasive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Huston, Charles) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 252 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing 248 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/06/11. cc:attys 9-07-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 248 MOTION to Strike Previously Construed Claim Terms From the Parties' P.R. 4-3 Statement by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 243 Opposed MOTION for Leave to Construe Previously Construed Term filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE. Atty filed corrected document at DE 251. PLEASE IGNORE. REPLY to Response to Motion re 243 Opposed MOTION for Leave to Construe Previously Construed Term filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) Modified on 9/1/2011 (leh, ). (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Address File History Disclaimer Issues, Arising From the Recent Reexamination, in the Upcoming Claim Construction Proceeings by Adobe Systems Inc., Alladin Knowledge Systems Ltd., Alladin Knowledge Systems, Inc., FileMaker, Inc., NATIONAL INSTRUMENTS CORP., Onyx Graphics, Inc., Pervasive Software, Inc., Pinnacle Systems, Inc., Safenet, Inc., Sonic Solutions, Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Claim Construction Letter, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Alternate Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike Previously Construed Claim Terms From the Parties' P.R. 4-3 Statement by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. of Filing of Patent Rule 4-3 Joint Claim Construction and Pre-Hearing Statement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Symantec Corp. -- Notice of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 -- (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Symantec Corp. -- Notice of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 -- (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 237 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stacy L Zoern terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/29/11. cc:attys 8-29-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Opposed MOTION for Leave to Construe Previously Construed Term by Pervasive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Rosenblatt Declaration), # 2 Exhibit B (Proposed Claim Construction), # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Huston, Charles) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/29/11. cc:attys 8-29-11(mll, ) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 239 Motion for Extension of Time. Defts shall have to 9-16-2011 to comply with PR 3-3 and 3-4. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/29/11. cc:attys 8-29-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION for Protective Order by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Patent Rule 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures by Adobe Systems Inc., Alladin Knowledge Systems Ltd., Alladin Knowledge Systems, Inc., NATIONAL INSTRUMENTS CORP., Onyx Graphics, Inc., Pinnacle Systems, Inc., Safenet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Steven) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by FileMaker, Inc. of Compliance of Service of P.R. 4-2 Disclosures (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Stacy L. Zoern by Pervasive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zoern, Stacy) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 234 Motion to Stay. All pending deadlines in this matter are stayed to 9-12-2011 for Defendant Sonic Solutions LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/25/11. cc:attys 8-25-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Pervasive Software, Inc. Compliance with P.R. 4-2 - Service of Preliminary Claim Constructions (Huston, Charles) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Agreed MOTION to Stay of Deadlines for Sonic Solutions LLC by Sonic Solutions. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion for Stay of Deadlines for Sonic Solutions LLC)(Tarlock, Marc) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by CA, Inc. of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 223 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft CA Inc are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/22/11. cc:attys 8-23-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 226 Motion for Extension of Time. Deft FileMaker, Inc shall have to 8-26-2011 to file its Opposition to pltfs' Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/22/11. cc:attys 8-23-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 225 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Symantec Corporations deadline to respond to Plaintiffs Motion forEntry of Protective Order is extended to 8-26-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/22/11. cc:attys 8-23-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 224 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 200 MOTION for Protective Order; Responses due by 8/26/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/22/11. cc:attys 8-23-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 222 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing 113 Motion to Change Venue; withdrawing 162 Sealed Patent Motion. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/22/11. cc:attys 8-23-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 196 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/22/11. cc:attys 8-23-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Protective Order by FileMaker, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Rudolph) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Adobe Systems Inc., Alladin Knowledge Systems Ltd., Alladin Knowledge Systems, Inc., NATIONAL INSTRUMENTS CORP., Onyx Graphics, Inc., Pinnacle Systems, Inc., Safenet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Katz, Steven) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Agreed MOTION to Dismiss by CA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 162 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Exhibit B to Plaintiffs Preliminary Patent Infringement Contentions and Participation in Dkt. 113 Motion to Transfer Venue by CA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying without prejudice 98 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/16/11. cc:attys 8-18-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Adobe Systems Inc., Alladin Knowledge Systems Ltd., Alladin Knowledge Systems, Inc., NATIONAL INSTRUMENTS CORP., Onyx Graphics, Inc., Pinnacle Systems, Inc., Safenet, Inc. re Proposed Claim Terms (Katz, Steven) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Symantec Corp. of Compliance with Discovery Order. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by FileMaker, Inc. - Notice of Compliance of Service (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Pervasive Software, Inc. Service of Proposed Claim Terms, Phrases and Clauses in accordance with P.R. 4-1(a) (Huston, Charles) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Pervasive Software, Inc. Service of Invalidity Contentions (Huston, Charles) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Regarding Amended Infringement Contentions for Defendants Adobe Systems Inc., Aladdin Knowledge Systems Ltd., Aladdin Knowledge Systems, Inc., National Instruments Corp., Onyx Graphics, Inc., Pinnacle Systems, Inc. and SafeNet, Inc. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 210 Motion to Stay Deadlines for Sonic Solutions LLC. to 8/24/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/15/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 212 Motion for Extension of Time for Symantec Corporation and XtreamLok, Pty to Comply with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 to furnish invalidity contentions and accompanying document production to 8/26/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/15/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Agreed MOTION For Extension of Time to Comply with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 209 Motion to Withdraw, and withdrawing 60 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/12/11. cc:attys 8-12-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Agreed MOTION to Stay Deadlines for Sonic Solutions LLC by Sonic Solutions. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Roderick) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 60 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(3), FRCP MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(3), FRCP by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Regarding Technical Advisor (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. of United States Patent Office's Notice of Intent to Issue Ex Parte Reexamination Certificate for Patent-in-Suit (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 204 Motion for Extension of Time. Parties shall have to 8-26-2011 to comply with PR 3-3 and 3-4. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/09/11. cc:attys 8-10-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 203 Motion to Stay. All pending deadlines in this matter are stayed to 8-19-2011 for Defendant CA, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/09/11. cc:attys 8-10-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Patent Rule 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures by Adobe Systems Inc., Alladin Knowledge Systems Ltd., Alladin Knowledge Systems, Inc., NATIONAL INSTRUMENTS CORP., Onyx Graphics, Inc., Pinnacle Systems, Inc., Safenet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Steven) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION to Stay Deadlines by CA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to 178 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Symantec Corporation by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule regarding Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of Protective Order by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/22/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Protective Order by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Adobe Systems Inc., Alladin Knowledge Systems Ltd., Alladin Knowledge Systems, Inc., NATIONAL INSTRUMENTS CORP., Onyx Graphics, Inc., Pinnacle Systems, Inc., Safenet, Inc. of Compliance of Service of Initial Disclosures (Katz, Steven) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Sonic Solutions regarding Initial Disclosures (Hollander, Christina) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by FileMaker, Inc. of Compliance of Service of Initial Disclosures (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re Initial Disclosures by CA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Pervasive Software, Inc. Initial Disclosures (Huston, Charles) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Symantec Corp. regarding Initial Disclosures (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 188 Motion to extend time. The new deadline for Sonic Solutions' first mediation is 8-13-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/29/11. cc:attys 7-29-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 187 Motion for Extension of Time. The new deadline for Uniloc and FileMaker Inc's first mediation is 8-13-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/29/11. cc:attys 7-29-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 186 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 162 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike; Replies due by 8/8/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/29/11. cc:attys 7-29-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 184 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/29/11. cc:attys 7-29-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension to Conduct First Mediation by Sonic Solutions. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hollander, Christina) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION For An Extension of Time to Conduct First Mediation by FileMaker, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 162 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE EXHIBIT B TO PLAINTIFFS PRELIMINARY PATENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS by CA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 185 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 162 Defendant CA, Inc.s Motion to Strike Exhibit B to Plaintiffs Preliminary Patent Infringement Contentions filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant CA, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Exhibit B to Plaintiffs' Preliminary Patent Infringement Contentions and Accompanying Declarations by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Adobe Systems Inc., Alladin Knowledge Systems Ltd., Alladin Knowledge Systems, Inc., NATIONAL INSTRUMENTS CORP., Onyx Graphics, Inc., Pinnacle Systems, Inc., Safenet, Inc. of Request for Correction of the Court's Docket (Healey, David) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion and Status Proceedings held on 4/26/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 51 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/12/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Sonic Solutions of Request for Correction of the Court's Docket (Carroll, Otis) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 177 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 162 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike; Responses due by 7/22/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/15/11. cc:attys 7-15-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Frank E Scherkenbach for Adobe Systems Inc., Alladin Knowledge Systems Ltd., Alladin Knowledge Systems, Inc., NATIONAL INSTRUMENTS CORP., Onyx Graphics, Inc., Pinnacle Systems, Inc., Safenet, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Symantec Corp..(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant CA, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Exhibit B to Plaintiffs' Preliminary Patent Infringement Contentions by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 172 Motion to Extend Time. Deft Symantec Corporation shall have to 8-11-2011 to conduct its first mediation with pltfs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/13/11. cc:attys 7-13-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Brannon Latimer on behalf of Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Latimer, Steven) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 171 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Edward R Nelson, III, Barry Bumgardner, Steven Wayne Hartsell for Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Attorney Dean G Bostock and Paul J Hayes terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/13/11. cc:attys 7-13-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Conduct First Mediation on August 11, 2011 re 150 Order by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Adobe Systems Inc., Alladin Knowledge Systems Ltd., Alladin Knowledge Systems, Inc., NATIONAL INSTRUMENTS CORP., Onyx Graphics, Inc., Pinnacle Systems, Inc., Safenet, Inc. of Source Code (Katz, Steven) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by FileMaker, Inc. of Voluntary Source Code Disclosure Pursuant to the Court's Docket Control Order [Dkt. 150] (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by CA, Inc. re Source Code Review (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Symantec Corp. of Disclosure of Source Code (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Sonic Solutions Sonic Solutions' Notice of Disclosure (Hollander, Christina) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Pervasive Software, Inc. Re Disclosure of Source Code (Zoern, Stacy) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 161 Motion to Seal Document. CA Inc's Motion to Strike Exhibit B to pltfs' Preliminary Patent Infringement Contentions and Supporting Memorandum of Law and accompanying declarations may be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/29/11. cc:attys 6-30-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by CA, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 162 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/15/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT MOTION by CA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Joshua C. Krumholz with Exhibits A thru F, # 3 Declaration of Pricilla Sanginario, # 4 Declaration of Anthony Piergallini)(Krumholz, Joshua) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Motion to Strike and Supporting Documents by CA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Krumholz, Joshua) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2011: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Lewis Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Pervasive Software, Inc. re Accused Product Sales Data (Zoern, Stacy) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Adobe Systems Inc., Alladin Knowledge Systems Ltd., Alladin Knowledge Systems, Inc., NATIONAL INSTRUMENTS CORP., Onyx Graphics, Inc., Pinnacle Systems, Inc., Safenet, Inc. (Katz, Steven) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Symantec Corp. Pursuant to Docket Control Order Dkt. 150 (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Sonic Solutions (Hollander, Christina) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by CA, Inc. re Accused Product Sales Data (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by FileMaker, Inc. of Disclosures Pursuant to Docket Control Order [Dkt. 150] (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael A Jacobs on behalf of FileMaker, Inc. (Jacobs, Michael) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rudolph Y Kim on behalf of FileMaker, Inc. (Kim, Rudolph) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Frederick Jeu on behalf of FileMaker, Inc. (Jeu, Christopher) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/08/11. cc:attys 6-09-11(mll, ) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Andrew Leibnitz for Sonic Solutions (mll, ) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christina R Hollander for Sonic Solutions (mll, ) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 147 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/07/11. cc:attys 6-07-11(mll, ) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 140 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Erin P Gibson; John M Guaragna; John Allcock and Brian K Erickson terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/3/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 141 Motion for Extension of Time to File the proposed Docket Control Order. Deadline is 6/2/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/3/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DOCKET CONTROL ORDER (PARTIALLY AGREED) by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Courts Order of May 20, 2011, # 2 Text of Proposed Order (Ex B - Proposed Docket Control Order incorporating the Plaintiffs positions), # 3 Text of Proposed Order (Ex C - Proposed Docket Control Order incorporating the Defendants positions))(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION ENTRY OF DISCOVERY ORDER by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Docket Control Order by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Roderick M Thompson on behalf of Sonic Solutions (Thompson, Roderick) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Joshua C Krumholz on behalf of CA, Inc. (Krumholz, Joshua) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Symantec Corp. of Designation of Lead Counsel - Mark Flagel (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The parties shall submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the Court by 5-31-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/20/11. cc:attys 5-20-11(mll, ) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 113 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) in Opposition to Defendants' Motion filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney J Mitchell Herbert, Jr for CA, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              4.26.11 Minute Entry - Status Conf: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 4/26/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-in Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Support re 113 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by Adobe Systems Inc., Alladin Knowledge Systems Ltd., Alladin Knowledge Systems, Inc., CA, Inc., NATIONAL INSTRUMENTS CORP., Onyx Graphics, Inc., Pinnacle Systems, Inc., Safenet, Inc., Sonic Solutions, Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Healey, David) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joshua C Krumholz for CA, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Benjamin M Stern for CA, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 123 Motion for Extension of Time. Defts shall have to 4-29-2011 to file their Reply in Support of 113 Motion to transfer. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/27/11. cc:attys 4-27-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kurt L Glitzenstein for Adobe Systems Inc., Alladin Knowledge Systems Ltd., Alladin Knowledge Systems, Inc., NATIONAL INSTRUMENTS CORP., Onyx Graphics, Inc., Pinnacle Systems, Inc., Safenet, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven R Katz for Adobe Systems Inc., Alladin Knowledge Systems Ltd., Alladin Knowledge Systems, Inc., NATIONAL INSTRUMENTS CORP., Onyx Graphics, Inc., Pinnacle Systems, Inc., Safenet, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. re 120 Order, Set Hearings,, of In Camera Submission (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Adobe Systems Inc., Alladin Knowledge Systems Ltd., Alladin Knowledge Systems, Inc., NATIONAL INSTRUMENTS CORP., Onyx Graphics, Inc., Pinnacle Systems, Inc., Safenet, Inc., Symantec Corp. re 116 Notice (Other) Response to Uniloc's Notice That Case Is Ready For Status Conference (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Healey, David) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Marc Tarlock for Sonic Solutions. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply On Motion To Transfer by Adobe Systems Inc., Alladin Knowledge Systems Ltd., Alladin Knowledge Systems, Inc., CA, Inc., NATIONAL INSTRUMENTS CORP., Onyx Graphics, Inc., Pinnacle Systems, Inc., Safenet, Inc., Sonic Solutions, Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Paul J Hayes on behalf of Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hayes, Paul) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul J Hayes (Hayes, Paul) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER setting Status Conference for 4/26/2011 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. By 4-25-2011 at 9:00 a.m., pltfs shall submit, for in camera review, a table summarizing the licenses or settlements reached in the instant or prior cases involving the patents-in-suit. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/20/11. cc:attys 4-20-11(mll, ) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 113 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) of Michael Lin filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hayes, Paul) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 113 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) of Dean G. Bostock filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hayes, Paul) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 113 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - G)(Hayes, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/13/2011: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Uniloc USA, Inc. that Case is Ready for Status Conference (Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Support re 98 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by FileMaker, Inc. re 113 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) Notice of Joinder to Defendant's Joint Motion to Change Venue (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit - Declaration of John Pinheiro)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) by Adobe Systems Inc., Alladin Knowledge Systems Ltd., Alladin Knowledge Systems, Inc., CA, Inc., NATIONAL INSTRUMENTS CORP., Onyx Graphics, Inc., Pinnacle Systems, Inc., Safenet, Inc., Sonic Solutions, Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Sony motion to transfer, # 2 Exhibit 2-Sony reply ISO motion to transfer, # 3 Exhibit 3-Sony reply to sur-reply ISO motion to transfer, # 4 Exhibit 4-Uniloc complaint (USDC D. RI), # 5 Exhibit 5-Notice of dismissal of Aladdin Knowledge Systems Inc., # 6 Exhibit 6-National Instruments Corporation declaration, # 7 Exhibit 7-Adobe Systems Incorporated declaration, # 8 Exhibit 8-SafeNet, Inc. declaration, # 9 Exhibit 9-CA, Inc. declaration, # 10 Exhibit 10-Pinnacle Systems, Inc. declaration, # 11 Exhibit 11-Sonic Solutions declaration, # 12 Exhibit 12-Onyx Graphics, Inc. declaration, # 13 Exhibit 13-Symantic Corp. declaration, # 14 Exhibit 14-Aladdin Knowledge Systems, Inc. and Aladdin Knowledge Systems, Ltd. declaration, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David) Modified on 9/12/2011 (mll, ). (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 98 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Substitute Parties Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.25(c) filed by Adobe Systems Inc., Alladin Knowledge Systems Ltd., Alladin Knowledge Systems, Inc., CA, Inc., NATIONAL INSTRUMENTS CORP., Onyx Graphics, Inc., Pinnacle Systems, Inc., Safenet, Inc., Sonic Solutions, Symantec Corp.. (Thompson, Roderick) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 106 Motion for Extension of Time. Deft Sonic Solutions shall have to 3-18-2011 to file its response to 98 Motion to Substitute Parties. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/09/11. cc:attys 3-10-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 105 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 98 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c); Responses due by 3/18/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/09/11. cc:attys 3-10-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 104 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 98 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c); Responses due by 3/18/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/09/11. cc:attys 3-10-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 103 Motion for Extension of Time. Deft CA Inc shall have to 3-18-2011 to file its Response to pltfs' 98 Motion to Substitute Parties. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/09/11. cc:attys 3-10-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sonic Solutions identifying Corporate Parent Sonic Holdings, Inc, Other Affiliate Sonic Solutions LLC for Sonic Solutions, Sonic Solutions. (Thompson, Roderick) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant Sonic Solutions' Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to File a Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Substitute Parties Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(c) by Sonic Solutions. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Sonic Solutions' Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to File a Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Substitute Parties Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 24(c))(Thompson, Roderick) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 98 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) by Adobe Systems Inc., Alladin Knowledge Systems Ltd., Alladin Knowledge Systems, Inc., NATIONAL INSTRUMENTS CORP., Onyx Graphics, Inc., Pinnacle Systems, Inc., Safenet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 98 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Substitute Parties Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(c) by CA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 101 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Aaron James Pickell terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/04/11. cc:attys 3-04-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Aaron J. Pickell by Pervasive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zoern, Stacy) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Aaron J. Pickell by Pervasive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zoern, Stacy) Modified on 3/2/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Singapore Private Limited's ANSWER to 97 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Pinnacle Systems, Inc. by Uniloc USA, Inc..(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/9/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Affidavit of Bradley C. Davis in Support of Motion, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Pinnacle Systems, Inc..(Healey, David) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. re 60 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(3), FRCP MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(3), FRCP of Decision (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 60 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(3), FRCP MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(3), FRCP filed by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark Flagel, # 2 Exhibit J, # 3 Exhibit K, # 4 Exhibit L, # 5 Exhibit M, # 6 Exhibit N, # 7 Exhibit O, # 8 Exhibit P, # 9 Exhibit Q, # 10 Exhibit R, # 11 Exhibit S, # 12 Exhibit T)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by SafeNet, Inc. by Uniloc USA, Inc..(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 77 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Pinnacle Systems, Inc. by Uniloc USA, Inc..(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 75 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Onyx Graphics, Inc. by Uniloc USA, Inc..(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 73 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by National Instruments Corp. by Uniloc USA, Inc..(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 71 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Adobe Systems, Inc. by Uniloc USA, Inc..(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 69 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Aladdin Knowledge Systems, Ltd. by Uniloc USA, Inc..(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 67 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Defendant Aladdin Knowledge Systems, Inc. by Uniloc USA, Inc..(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 65 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Defendant Filemaker, Inc. by Uniloc USA, Inc..(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 57 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Sonic Solutions, Inc. by Uniloc USA, Inc..(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 84 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eric M. Albritton terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/03/10. cc:attys 12-03-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Eric M. Albritton by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yury Kapgan on behalf of Symantec Corp. (Kapgan, Yury) (Entered: 11/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 60 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(3), FRCP MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(3), FRCP filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Declaration of Bradley C. Davis, # 11 Declaration of Dean G. Bostock, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 11/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. of Request for Status Conference (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Safenet, Inc. (Healey, David) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SafeNet, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Safenet, Inc..(Healey, David) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Pinnacle Systems, Inc. (Healey, David) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Pinnacle Systems, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Pinnacle Systems, Inc..(Healey, David) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Onyx Graphics, Inc. (Healey, David) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Onyx Graphics, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Onyx Graphics, Inc..(Healey, David) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NATIONAL INSTRUMENTS CORP. (Healey, David) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      National Instruments Corp.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by NATIONAL INSTRUMENTS CORP..(Healey, David) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Adobe Systems Inc. (Healey, David) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Adobe Systems Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Adobe Systems Inc..(Healey, David) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Alladin Knowledge Systems Ltd. (Healey, David) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Aladdin Knowledge Systems Ltd.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Alladin Knowledge Systems Ltd..(Healey, David) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Alladin Knowledge Systems, Inc. (Healey, David) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Aladdin Knowledge Systems, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Alladin Knowledge Systems, Inc..(Healey, David) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by FileMaker, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Apple Inc. for FileMaker, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 65 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FileMaker, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by FileMaker, Inc..(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CA, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Careal Holding AG for CA, Inc.. (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by CA, Inc..(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Roderick M Thompson for Sonic Solutions. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Symantec Corp. identifying Corporate Parent None for Symantec Corp.. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(3), FRCP by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of M. Flagel, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sonic Solutions (Carroll, Otis) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sonic Solutions (Carroll, Otis) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sonic Solutions ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Sonic Solutions.(Carroll, Otis) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Erin P Gibson for CA, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John Allcock for CA, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deborah J Race on behalf of Sonic Solutions (Race, Deborah) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Otis W Carroll, Jr on behalf of Sonic Solutions (Carroll, Otis) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles D Huston on behalf of Pervasive Software, Inc. (Huston, Charles) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. FileMaker Inc is granted an extension of time to file its Answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint by 11-19-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/28/10. cc:attys 10-28-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian K Erickson on behalf of CA, Inc. (Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Guaragna on behalf of CA, Inc. (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by FileMaker, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stacy L Zoern on behalf of Pervasive Software, Inc. (Zoern, Stacy) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Pervasive Software, Inc. (Pickell, Aaron) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Pervasive Software, Inc..(Pickell, Aaron) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Symantec Corp..( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Symantec Corp. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Alladin Knowledge Systems, Inc..( Healey, David) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Alladin Knowledge Systems Ltd..( Healey, David) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Onyx Graphics, Inc..( Healey, David) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Safenet, Inc..( Healey, David) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Pinnacle Systems, Inc..( Healey, David) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re NATIONAL INSTRUMENTS CORP..( Healey, David) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Return of Service Executed as to Sonic Solutions on 9/24/2010, by cert mail through the Texas Secretary of State; answer due: 10/15/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to Onyx Graphics, Inc. on 9/24/2010, by cert mail through the Texas Secretary of State; answer due: 10/15/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to Alladin Knowledge Systems Ltd. on 9/27/2010, by cert mail through the Texas Secretary of State; answer due: 10/18/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to Alladin Knowledge Systems, Inc. on 9/24/2010, by cert mail through the Texas Secretary of State; answer due: 10/15/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to Pinnacle Systems, Inc. on 9/24/2010, by cert mail through the Texas Secretary of State; answer due: 10/15/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to Safenet, Inc. on 9/23/2010, by cert mail through the Texas Secretary of State; answer due: 10/14/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CA, Inc..( DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of CA, Inc. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Adobe Systems Inc..( Healey, David) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to CA, Inc. on 9/16/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 10/7/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to Symantec Corp. on 9/16/2010, by cert mail. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to NATIONAL INSTRUMENTS CORP. on 9/20/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 10/12/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to Adobe Systems Inc. on 9/16/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 10/7/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dean Geoffrey Dunlavey on behalf of Symantec Corp. (Dunlavey, Dean) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Alan Flagel on behalf of Symantec Corp. (Flagel, Mark) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Symantec Corp..( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to FileMaker, Inc. on 9/16/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 10/7/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Dean G Bostock for Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul J Hayes for Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Symantec Corp.. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Sonic Solutions. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Safenet, Inc.. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Pinnacle Systems, Inc. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Pervasive Software, Inc. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Onyx Graphics, Inc.. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to NATIONAL INSTRUMENTS CORP. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to FileMaker, Inc.. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to CA, Inc.. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Alladin Knowledge Systems, Inc.. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Alladin Knowledge Systems Ltd.. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Adobe Systems Inc.. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Adobe Systems Inc., Alladin Knowledge Systems Ltd., Alladin Knowledge Systems, Inc., CA, Inc., FileMaker, Inc., NATIONAL INSTRUMENTS CORP., Onyx Graphics, Inc., Pervasive Software, Inc., Pinnacle Systems, Inc., Safenet, Inc., Sonic Solutions, Symantec Corp. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2667655.), filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 345 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?