Condatis LLC v. A.P. Moller-Maersk A/S et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:10-cv-00600
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Leonard Davis
Last Updated September 27, 2016 at 7:26 AM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Airbus, SAS, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Trevor R Jefferies +1 713 632 1415 +1 713 583 8410 trevor.jefferies@hoganlovells.com
Space Eric J. Lobenfeld ejlobenfeld@hhlaw.com
Space Ira James Schaefer +1 212 918 8228 +1 212 918 3100 ijschaefer@hhlaw.com
Space David J. Weiner +1 202 637 5617 david.weiner@hoganlovells.com

Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo American Eurocopter Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Weitzman Law Offices, LLC (NJ)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason E Mueller +1 214 740 8657 +1 214 756 8657 jmueller@lockelord.com
Delta Air Lines, Inc. Delta Air Lines, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officer/Director, Orbitz Inc
Officer/Director, Clear Secure, Inc.

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257

Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2011 Jon Robert Pierce +1 336 607 7503 +1 336 734 2638 jpierce@kilpatricktownsend.com
No Logo Emirates, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Trevor R Jefferies +1 713 632 1415 +1 713 583 8410 trevor.jefferies@hoganlovells.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric J. Lobenfeld ejlobenfeld@hhlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ira James Schaefer +1 212 918 8228 +1 212 918 3100 ijschaefer@hhlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Weiner +1 202 637 5617 david.weiner@hoganlovells.com

Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/14/2011 Jon Robert Pierce +1 336 607 7503 +1 336 734 2638 jpierce@kilpatricktownsend.com
Goodrich Corporation Goodrich Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Goodrich Corp."

Represented by Carrington, Coleman, Sloman & Blumenthal, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig William Weinlein +1 214 855 3051 +1 214 855 1333 cweinlein@ccsb.com

Represented by Darby & Darby PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Charles Schechter +1 212 527 7723 +1 212 527 7701 pschechter@darbylaw.com

Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2011 Jon Robert Pierce +1 336 607 7503 +1 336 734 2638 jpierce@kilpatricktownsend.com
No Logo Jetblue Airways Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "JetBlue Airways Corp."

Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/24/2011 Neil J. McNabnay +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mcnabnay@fr.com

Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Trevor R Jefferies +1 713 632 1415 +1 713 583 8410 trevor.jefferies@hoganlovells.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric J. Lobenfeld ejlobenfeld@hhlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ira James Schaefer +1 212 918 8228 +1 212 918 3100 ijschaefer@hhlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Weiner +1 202 637 5617 david.weiner@hoganlovells.com
No Logo Kongsberg Maritime, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Gardere Wynne Sewell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chris Paul Perque +1 713 276 5020 +1 713 276 6020 cperque@gardere.com
No Logo L-3 Communications Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "L-3 Communications Corp."
No Logo L-3 Communications Integrated Systems LP, Counter-Claimant
No Logo MTU Aero Engines, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257
Northrop Grumman Corporation Northrop Grumman Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Northrop Grumman Corp."

Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Steven G. Schortgen +1 214 953 6826 + 214 953 6503 steve.schortgen@bakerbotts.com

Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Gregory Schortgen +1 214 939 5567 +1 214 939 5849 steve.schortgen@klgates.com
No Logo Osisoft, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

No Logo Pratt & Whitney Services, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James George Warriner +1 512 482 6800 +1 512 482 6859 jim.warriner@klgates.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roderick B Williams +1 512 482 6880 +1 512 482 6859 rick.williams@klgates.com
Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd. Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas R. Goots +1 216 586 3939 trgoots@jonesday.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

No Logo Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James George Warriner +1 512 482 6800 +1 512 482 6859 jim.warriner@klgates.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roderick B Williams +1 512 482 6880 +1 512 482 6859 rick.williams@klgates.com
No Logo Smartsignal Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257
No Logo Telcordia Technologies, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Herbert A Yarbrough, III +1 903 595 3111 +1 903 595 0191 trey@yw-lawfirm.com
No Logo The Timken Company, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Webb Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kent E. Baldauf, Jr. +1 412 471 8815 +1 412 471 4094 webblaw@webblaw.com

Represented by Wiley Rein LLP

Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Debra Elaine Gunter +1 903 595 3111 debby@yw-lawfirm.com
Space Herbert A Yarbrough, III +1 903 595 3111 +1 903 595 0191 trey@yw-lawfirm.com
United Technologies Corporation United Technologies Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James George Warriner +1 512 482 6800 +1 512 482 6859 jim.warriner@klgates.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roderick B Williams +1 512 482 6880 +1 512 482 6859 rick.williams@klgates.com
No Logo Us Airways, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/24/2011 Neil J. McNabnay +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mcnabnay@fr.com

Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Trevor R Jefferies +1 713 632 1415 +1 713 583 8410 trevor.jefferies@hoganlovells.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric J. Lobenfeld ejlobenfeld@hhlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ira James Schaefer +1 212 918 8228 +1 212 918 3100 ijschaefer@hhlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Weiner +1 202 637 5617 david.weiner@hoganlovells.com
v.
No Logo A. P. Moller-maersk A/s, Defendant
ABB Inc. ABB Inc., Defendant

Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas R. Goots +1 216 586 3939 trgoots@jonesday.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark John Ziegelbein +1 214 969 3648 mjziegelbein@jonesday.com
ABB Ltd. ABB Ltd., Defendant
Officer/Director, Alchemy Enterprises, Ltd.
ABB Asea Brown Boveri Ltd. Officer/Director, ABB Asea Brown Boveri Ltd.
Officer/Director, Power-one, Inc.
No Logo Airbus Americas, Inc., Defendant
No Logo American Eurocopter LLC, Defendant
No Logo Celebrity Cruises, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark John Ziegelbein +1 214 969 3648 mjziegelbein@jonesday.com
No Logo Electro-motive Diesel, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G. Abrams ,. +1 202 861 1500 +1 202 861 1783

Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory J Commins, Jr. +1 202 861 1500 +1 202 861 1783 gcommins@bakerlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phong D Nguyen +1 202 861 1610 +1 202 861 1783 my@theyogiberry.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shawnna Marie Yashar +1 202 861 1518 +1 202 861 1783 syashar@bakerlaw.com

Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Phong Nguyen +1 202 861 1610 +1 202 861 1783 pnguyen@bakerlaw.com

Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/08/2011 Gary Jason Fischman +1 713 651 2600 +1 713 651 2700 gfischman@winston.com
No Logo Jigsaw Technologies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Leica Geosystems Ltd., Defendant
Lockheed Martin Corporation Lockheed Martin Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/15/2011 Matthew John Moore +1 202 637 2200 +1 202 637 2201 matt.moore@lw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew John Moore +1 202 637 2200 +1 202 637 2201 matt.moore@lw.com

Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
Space Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo Maersk Line, Limited, Defendant
Officially listed as "Maersk Line, Ltd."

Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas R. Goots +1 216 586 3939 trgoots@jonesday.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark John Ziegelbein +1 214 969 3648 mjziegelbein@jonesday.com
Maersk, Inc. Maersk, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas R. Goots +1 216 586 3939 trgoots@jonesday.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark John Ziegelbein +1 214 969 3648 mjziegelbein@jonesday.com
No Logo Michelin North America, Inc., Defendant
No Logo MTU Maintenance Hanover, Defendant
No Logo Optimized Systems and Solutions, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Represented by Krieg DeVault LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Costakis +1 317 238 6225 +1 317 636 1507 tcostakis@kdlegal.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason A Houdek +1 317 238 6265 +1 317 636 1507 jhoudek@kdlegal.com
No Logo Rolls-royce Plc, Defendant

Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Represented by Krieg DeVault LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Birk K Billingsley +1 317 238 6259 bbillingsley@kdlegal.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Costakis +1 317 238 6225 +1 317 636 1507 tcostakis@kdlegal.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason A Houdek +1 317 238 6265 +1 317 636 1507 jhoudek@kdlegal.com
No Logo Rovsing Dynamics, Defendant

Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary R Maze +1 713 402 3900 +1 713 402 3901 grmaze@duanemorris.com
No Logo The Emirates Group, Defendant
No Logo Trico Marine Services, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Angela B Degeyter +1 214 220 7763 +1 214 999 7763 adegeyter@velaw.com
TERMINATED: 12/13/2010 John E. Mitchell +1 214 220 7766 +1 214 999 7766 jmitchell@velaw.com
No Logo Windrock, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/06/2011 Ruffin B. Cordell +1 262 626 6449 +1 202 783 2331 cordell@fr.com
No Logo Condatis LLC, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Spangler & Fussell PC

Represented by Stevens Law Firm

Represented by Stevens Love

Other Parties
No Logo James Knowles, Mediator

Represented by Knowles Mediations

Attributes
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (403) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: 7/30/2012 Judgment*
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: 7/24/2012 Order on Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: 7/20/2012 Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: 7/17/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: 7/16/2012 Motion for Extension of Time
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: 6/19/2012 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: 6/15/2012 Motion to Amend/Correct
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: 6/8/2012 Answer to Amended Complaint
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: 6/8/2012 ~Notice (other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: 6/8/2012 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: 6/7/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: 6/6/2012 Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: 6/6/2012 Order Cancelling Deadline
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: 6/1/2012 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: 5/31/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: 5/31/2012 ~Notice (other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: 5/29/2012 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: 5/25/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 381 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss. It is ordered that all claims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff Condatis LLC and Defendant MTU Aero Engines N.A. Inc. are dismissed without prejudice. All attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/23/2012. (leh, ) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice. It is ORDERED that all claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff Condatis LLC and Defendant Goodrich, are dismissed with prejudice subject to the terms of the Settlement Agreement. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be born by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/23/2012. (leh, ) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Electro-Motive Diesel, Inc., filed by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Patent No. 5,450,321)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice as to United Technologies Corporation, Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation, and Pratt & Whitney Services, Inc. by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dotson, Darrell) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Goodrich Corporation by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 349 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by United Technologies Corporation. Early Markman Hearing and hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement set for 7/10/2012 09:00 AM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/11/12. (mjc, ) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 377 Motion to Amend/Correct Deadlines. Goodrichs deadline to file a motion for summary judgment is extended to 6-04-2012; Condatiss deadline for response to Goodrichs motion for summary judgment is 6-25-2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/07/12. cc:attys 5-08-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 319 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,, Extend Defendant Goodrich's Deadline to File a Motion for Summary Judgment Related to Its 28 U.S.C. 1498 Defenses and Condatis's Responses Thereto by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE by L-3 Communications Corp., L-3 Communications Integrated Systems, L.P. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Turner, John) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 373 Motion to Extend Time. Defendant MTU Aero Engines' deadline for service of its additional disclosures is extended to 5-27-2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/30/12. cc:attys 4-30-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 371 Motion to Amend/Correct. The deadline for exchange of additional disclosures as to Defendants, Goodrich Corp., Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation, and Pratt & Whitney Services, Inc., is hereby extended to 5-24-2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/30/12. cc:attys 4-30-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION To Extend Deadline for Service of Additional Disclosures by MTU Aero Engines. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Condatis LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Additional Disclosures (Love, Gregory) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 316 Order, 319 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,, by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE by Electro-Motive Diesel, Inc. DEFENDANT ELECTRO-MOTIVE DIESEL, INC.'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Yashar, Shawnna) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 367 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Condatis LLC. All claims and counter-claims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff and Defendants L-3 Communications Corp. and L-3 Communications Integrated Systems, L.P., are hereby dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/25/12. cc:attys 4-25-12(mll, ) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 366 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Condatis LLC. All claims and counter-claims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff and Defendant Delta Airlines Inc. are hereby dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/24/12. cc:attys 4-25-12(mll, ) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to L-3 Communications Corp. and L-3 Communications Integrated Systems, L.P., by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Delta Airlines Inc. by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 363 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for mediation is extended to 5-20-2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/17/12. cc:attys 4-18-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 362 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs deadline to file its Response to Defendant United Technologies Corporations Letter Brief 349 is extended to 5-03-2012. Defendant, United Technologies Corporations Additional Disclosures is extended to 5-24-2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/17/12. cc:attys 4-17-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR MEDIATION by MTU Aero Engines. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 349 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief and for United Technologies Corporation's Exchange of Additional Disclosures by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
REPORT of Mediation by James Knowles. Mediation result: Suspended(Knowles, James) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 358 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/09/12. cc:attys 4-09-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 357 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Condatis LLC. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff, and Defendant, SmartSignal Corporation, are hereby dismissed with prejudice, subject to the terms of the Settlement Agreement. All attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/05/12. cc:attys 4-05-12(mll, ) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 349 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief and for United Technologies Corporation's Exchange of Additional Disclosures by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice as to SmartSignal Corporation by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by L-3 Communications Corp., L-3 Communications Integrated Systems, L.P. (Turner, John) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE by Telcordia Technologies, Inc., The Timken Company Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 345 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Condatis LLC. All claims and counterclaims of Condatis LLC and The Timken Company against each other are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own attorneys fees and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/26/12. cc:attys 3-26-12(mll, ) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE by Electro-Motive Diesel, Inc. NOTICE OF DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO DISCOVERY ORDER (D.I. #316) (Nguyen, Phong) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Pratt & Whitney Services, Inc., Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation, United Technologies Corporation Service of Initial Disclosures (Williams, Roderick) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by MTU Aero Engines NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING SERVICE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Delta Air Lines Inc. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING SERVICE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
Letter Brief filed by United Technologies Corporation (Williams, Roderick) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Condatis LLC Initial Disclosures (Dotson, Darrell) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawnna Marie Yashar on behalf of Electro-Motive Diesel, Inc. (Yashar, Shawnna) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE by Goodrich Corp. of Service of Disclosures Pursuant to Discovery Order Para. 1 (Schechter, Peter) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to The Timken Company by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 343 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Condatis LLC. All claims by pltf against defts Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd and Celebrity Cruises Inc are dismissed with prejudice; all counter-claims by defts against pltf are dismissed without prejudice, subject to the terms of the Settlement Agreement. All attys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/09/12. cc:attys 3-09-12(mll, ) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dotson, Darrell) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James A Fussell, III on behalf of Condatis LLC (Fussell, James) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE by Condatis LLC of Change of Firm Name (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 339 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to comply with Patent Rules 3-1 and 3-2 as to Defendants Celebrity Cruises, Inc. and Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd. is extended to 3-16-2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/21/12. cc:attys 2-21-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Comply with PR 3-1 and 3-2 as to Defendants Celebrity Cruises, Inc., and Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd. by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dotson, Darrell) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE by Electro-Motive Diesel, Inc. re 319 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,, 336 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH ORDER TO PRODUCE SUMMARY FINANCIAL INFORMATION (Nguyen, Phong) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 334 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff, and Defendant, American Eurocopter Corporation, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/14/12. cc:attys 2-15-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 330 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Electro-Motive Diesel Inc to provide Condatis with summary financial information for the products or systems identified in Condatis infringement contentions is extended to 2-15-2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/13/12. cc:attys 2-14-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE by L-3 Communications Corp., L-3 Communications Integrated Systems, L.P. of Compliance with Order to Produce Summary Financial Information (Turner, John) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Pratt & Whitney Services, Inc., Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation, United Technologies Corporation re: Summary Financial Information (Warriner, James) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE by The Timken Company of Compliance with Court's Docket Control Order Regarding Service of Summary Financial Information (Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 328 Motion to Stay. All deadlines in the present case with respect to Smartsignal and all deadlines of Condatis with respect to Smartsignal are STAYED so that parties can focus on attempting to complete a final written agreement for settlement of the parties disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/10/12. cc:attys 2-10-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Financial Information by Electro-Motive Diesel, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Phong) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE by Goodrich Corp. of production of documents relating to 28 USC 1498 defense (Schechter, Peter) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines with regard to Condatis and SmartSignal by Condatis LLC, SmartSignal Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE by Condatis LLC Production of Prior Settlement Agreements Pursuant to Docket Control Order [Docket #319] (Love, Gregory) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/02/12. cc:attys 2-02-12(mll, ) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
Agreed MOTION for Protective Order by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevens, Scott) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
PLEASE IGNORE. Filed in Error. Atty to re-file as a motion. PLEASE IGNORE. Submission of Proposed Agreed Protective order by Condatis LLC. (Stevens, Scott) Modified on 2/2/2012 (leh, ). (Entered: 02/01/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 322 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/25/12. cc:attys 1-25-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
Agreed MOTION Extend Deadline as to Defendants American Eurocopter Corporation, Celebrity Cruises, Inc., and Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd. to Comply with Patent Rules 3-1 and 3-2 by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dotson, Darrell) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE by Airbus Americas, Inc., Airbus S.A.S. Termination of Electronic Notices (Dameris, Thad) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 314 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Condatis LLC. All claims and counterclaims between pltf and Defendant Telcordia Technologies, Inc., are dismissed without prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/18/12. cc:attys 1-19-12(mll, ) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 6/28/2012; Respond to Amended Pleadings by 7-12-2012. Discovery due by 3/29/2013. Expert Witness List due by 2/1/2013; Rebuttal Expert Witnesses designated by 2-22-2013. Identify trial witnesses by 4/12/2013; Rebuttal Trial Witnesses identified by 4-19-2013. Joinder of Parties due by 5/25/2012, for defts. Jury instructions due by 11/22/2013. First Mediation Completion due by 4/20/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 5/6/2013; Response to Dispositive Motions due 5-24-2013. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/22/2013. Jury Selection set for 2/3/2014 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 2/10/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 9/13/2012 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/17/12. cc:attys 1-18-12(mll, ) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE by Northrop Grumman Corp. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Schortgen, Steven) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE by Airbus S.A.S., Lockheed Martin Corporation Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/17/12. cc:attys 1-17-12(mll, ) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 311 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to comply with Patent Rules 3-1 and 3-2 as to Defendants American Eurocopter Corporation, Celebrity Cruises, Inc., and Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd., is extended to 1-27-2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/17/12. cc:attys 1-17-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 1/16/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Telcordia Technologies, Inc. by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 01/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 1/16/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE by Condatis LLC Patent Rules 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures (Dotson, Darrell) (Entered: 01/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
Submission of d s by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Discovery Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Docket Control Order)(Stevens, Scott) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevens, Scott) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevens, Scott) Modified on 1/13/2012 (gsg). (Entered: 01/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE by Kongsberg Maritime, Inc. to Terminate ECF Notification (Perque, Chris) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 305 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney J Thad Heartfield and M. Dru Montgomery terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/11/2012. (gsg) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Status Conference held on 1/10/2012. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (mjm, ) (Entered: 01/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None
***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Kongsberg Maritime, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel)(Perque, Chris) Modified on 1/11/2012 (mjc, ). (Entered: 01/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. James Knowles added as Mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/09/12. cc:attys 1-10-12(mll, ) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, James W. Knowles, filed by Condatis LLC. (Stevens, Scott) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
Submission of d s by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Discovery Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Docket Control Order)(Stevens, Scott) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 300 Motion to Extend Deadlines. ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and the parties deadline to submit an agreed docket control and discovery Order is extended to January 6, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/20/2011. (gsg) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION Extend Deadline to Submit Proposed Discovery Order and Docket Control Order by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dotson, Darrell) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER setting Scheduling/Status Conference for 1/10/2012 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/16/11. cc:attys 12-16-11(mll, ) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to conduct pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/13/11. cc:attys 12-14-11(mll, ) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 293 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Condatis LLC. All claims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff, and Defendant, Kongsberg Maritime, Inc., are hereby dismissed with prejudice subject to the terms of the Settlement Agreement. All attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/13/11. cc:attys 12-14-11(mll, ) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 294 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline tocomply with Patent Rules 3-1 and 3-2 is extended to 1-06-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/12/11. cc:attys 12-12-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 12/5/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (rlf, ) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevens, Scott) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Kongsberg Maritime, Inc. by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dotson, Darrell) (Entered: 12/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gregory R Lyons for The Timken Company. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric H Weisblatt for The Timken Company (mll, ) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian H Pandya on behalf of The Timken Company (Pandya, Brian) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER setting Status Conference for 12/5/2011 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/17/11. cc:attys 11-21-11(mll, ) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE by Condatis LLC re 85 Order, Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference (Love, Gregory) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 286 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Condatis LLC. Defendant Northrup Grumman Corp. is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/01/11. cc:attys 11-02-11(mll, ) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Northrop Grumman Corp. by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 282 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Condatis LLC. Defendant MTU Maintenance Hanover is hereby dismissed without prejudice of all claims. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/20/11. cc:attys 10-24-11(mll, ) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Celebrity Cruises Inc. (Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint by Celebrity Cruises Inc..(Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Condatis LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to Celebrity Cruises Inc. on 10/3/2011, by cert mail; answer due: 10/24/2011. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 278 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Condatis LLC. Defendant The Emirates Group is hereby dismissed without prejudice of allclaims. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/29/11. cc:attys 9-29-11(mll, ) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 276 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft OSISoft LLC are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/29/11. cc:attys 9-29-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Condatis LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Celebrity Cruises Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 274 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted in this action between pltf and deft Rovsing Dynamics are hereby dismissed without prejudice. All claims, counterclaims, and defenses that were raised or that could have been raised in this action shall be retained by and available to each party to the same extent as in this action. All attorneys fees, expenses, and costs in this action are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/13/11. cc:attys 9-13-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss (Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice) by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 272 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this action between Plaintiff and Defendants Airbus S.A.S.; Emirates; JetBlue Airways Corporation (previously named as JetBlue Airways Corp.); and US Airways, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys fees, expenses, and costs in this action are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/23/11. cc:attys 8-24-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (Stipulated) by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Rovsing Dynamics.( Maze, Gary) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to Rovsing Dynamics on 7/21/2011, by personal service pursuant to the Hague Convention; answer due: 8/11/2011. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 268 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Condatis LLC. All claims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff and Defendants Leica Geosystems Ltd. and Jigsaw Technologies, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice subject to the terms of the Settlement Agreement. All attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/05/11. cc:attys 8-08-11(mll, ) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Leica Geosystems Ltd. and Jigsaw Technologies, Inc. by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas R Goots on behalf of Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd. (Goots, Thomas) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark John Ziegelbein on behalf of Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd. (Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Rovsing Dynamics. (kls, ) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 263 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice Defendants A.P. Mller-Maersk A/S, Maersk, Inc. and Maersk Line, Ltd. Each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/13/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendants A.P. Moller-Maersk A/S, Maersk, Inc. and Maersk Line, Ltd. by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dotson, Darrell) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 260 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gary Jason Fischman terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/08/11. cc:attys 6-08-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 259 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants ABB Inc and ABB Ltd are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attys' fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/06/11. cc:attys 6-07-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Electro-Motive Diesel, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fischman, Gary) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss ABB Inc. and ABB Ltd. by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dotson, Darrell) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 257 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Condatis LLC. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft Windrock Inc are dismissed with prejudice, subject to the terms of the Settlement Agreement. Each party shall bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/06/11. cc:attys 5-10-11(mll, ) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Windrock Inc. by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dotson, Darrell) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed Fifth Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Windrock Inc.( Cordell, Ruffin) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Phong Nguyen on behalf of Electro-Motive Diesel, Inc. (Nguyen, Phong) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 237 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of The Timken Company by Condatis LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE by Electro-Motive Diesel, Inc. re change of counsel's law firm affiliation (Fischman, Gary) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Address by Gregory J Commins, Jr ( Commins, Gregory) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 218 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of American Eurocopter Corporation by Condatis LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas R Goots for ABB, Inc., Maersk Line, Ltd., Maersk, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Timken Company (Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 209 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of SmartSignal Corporation by Condatis LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 208 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of MTU Aero Engines North America Inc. by Condatis LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 207 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Delta Air Lines Inc. by Condatis LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 244 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and defts Optimized Systems and Solutions Inc and Rolls-Royce plc are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/24/11. cc:attys 3-24-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 244 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Rolls-Royce plc and Optimized Systems and Solutions, Inc. by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dotson, Darrell) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Maersk Line, Ltd. (Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Maersk, Inc. (Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ABB, Inc. (Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, by Maersk, Inc..(Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, by Maersk Line, Ltd..(Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, by ABB, Inc..(Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 237 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Condatis LLC by The Timken Company.(Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
LREF
Blank 236 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
Defendant Windrock Inc.'s Unopposed Fourth Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint ( Cordell, Ruffin) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss by Optimized Systems and Solutions, Inc., Rolls Royce PLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 182 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of OSIsoft, LLC by Condatis LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 178 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Pratt & Whitney Services, Inc., Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation, and United Technologies Corporation by Condatis LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 201 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Northrop Grumman Corp. by Condatis LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 171 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Airbus S.A.S. by Condatis LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 172 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Emirates by Condatis LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 174 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of US Airways, Inc. by Condatis LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 176 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of JetBlue Airways Corporations by Condatis LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 161 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Goodrich Corporation by Condatis LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
***FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT 227 FOR CORRECT PLEADING*** RESPONSE to 161 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Goodrich Corporation by Condatis LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) Modified on 3/8/2011 (mll, ). (Entered: 03/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 151 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of L-3 Communications Corp. by Condatis LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 150 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of L-3 Communications Integrated Systems, LP by Condatis LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 221 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stephen E Baskin terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/07/11. cc:attys 3-07-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 220 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jon Robert Pierce terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/07/11. cc:attys 3-07-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Delta Air Lines Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baskin, Stephen) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Delta Air Lines Inc., Goodrich Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pierce, Jon) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 219 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by American Eurocopter Corporation identifying Corporate Parent EADS North America, Corporate Parent European Aeronautic Defence and Space Company EADS for American Eurocopter Corporation. (Hardin, Roy) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
LREF
Blank 218 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Condatis LLC by American Eurocopter Corporation.(Hardin, Roy) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
LREF
Blank 217 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 212 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft Rolls Royce PLC's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint is extended to 3-14-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/01/11. cc:attys 3-01-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
LREF
Blank 216 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 211 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Optimized Systems and Solutions Inc's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint is extended to 3-14-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/01/11. cc:attys 3-01-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
LREF
Blank 215 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Delta Air Lines Inc. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
LREF
Blank 214 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MTU Aero Engines identifying Corporate Parent MTU Aero Engines GmbH for MTU Aero Engines. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
LREF
Blank 213 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SmartSignal Corporation identifying Corporate Parent General Electric Company, Corporate Parent GE Intelligent Platforms, Inc. for SmartSignal Corporation. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Rolls Royce PLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Optimized Systems and Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
Defendant Electro-Motive Diesel, Inc.'s Original ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, by Electro-Motive Diesel, Inc..(Fischman, Gary) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
Smartsignal Corporation's ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Condatis LLC by SmartSignal Corporation.(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
MTU Aero Engines' ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Condatis LLC by MTU Aero Engines.(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
Delta Air Lines Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Condatis LLC by Delta Air Lines Inc..(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 147 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd. by Condatis LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason E Mueller on behalf of American Eurocopter Corporation (Mueller, Jason) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bryan P Clark for The Timken Company. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kent E Baldauf, Jr for The Timken Company. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 194 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Condatis LLC. All claims asserted by pltf against deft American Eurocopter LLC are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attys' fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/17/11. cc:attys 2-17-11(mll, ) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
First Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Condatis LLC by Northrop Grumman Corp..(Schortgen, Steven) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 193 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Timken Company shall have to 3-18-2011 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/17/11. cc:attys 2-17-11 (mll, ) Modified on 2/17/2011 (mll, ). (Entered: 02/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Maersk, Inc..( Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Maersk Line, Ltd..( Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 192 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Condatis LLC. All claims asserted by pltf against deft Michelin North America Inc are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attys' fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/16/11. cc:attys 2-16-11(mll, ) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ABB, Inc..( Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 190 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for defts American Eurocopter Corporation and American Eurocopter LLC to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 3-02-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/16/11. cc:attys 2-16-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Condatis LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by The Timken Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 192 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Condatis LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 164 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted in this action between pltf and deft Lockheed Martin are hereby dismissed without prejudice. All attys' fees, expenses and costs in this action are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/15/11. cc:attys 2-15-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by American Eurocopter Corporation, American Eurocopter LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hardin, Roy) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Windrock Inc..( Cordell, Ruffin) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 170 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft Electro-Motive Diesel Inc has to 2-28-2011 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/15/11. cc:attys 2-15-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 158 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft Rolls Royce PLC's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint is extended to 2-28-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/14/11. cc:attys 2-15-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 157 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft Optimized Systems and Solutions Inc's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint is extended to 2-28-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/14/11. cc:attys 2-15-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 156 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft Smartsignal Corporation shall have to 2-28-2011 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/14/11. cc:attys 2-15-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 155 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft MTU Aero Engines has to 2-28-2011 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/14/11. cc:attys 2-15-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 154 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Delta Air Lines Inc has to 2-28-2011 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/14/11. cc:attys 2-15-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
DEFENDANT OSISOFT, LLC'S ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Condatis LLC by OSISoft, Inc..(Woo, Darryl) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by OSISoft, Inc. (Woo, Darryl) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darryl M Woo on behalf of OSISoft, Inc. (Woo, Darryl) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Pratt & Whitney Services, Inc., Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation, United Technologies Corporation (Warriner, James) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Condatis LLC by United Technologies Corporation, Pratt & Whitney Services, Inc., Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation.(Warriner, James) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by JetBlue Airways Corp. identifying Other Affiliate Deutsche Lufthansa AG for JetBlue Airways Corp.. (Dameris, Thad) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
JetBlue Airways Corporations's ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, and Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Condatis LLC by JetBlue Airways Corp..(Dameris, Thad) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by US Airways, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent US Airways Group, Inc. for US Airways, Inc.. (Dameris, Thad) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
US Airways, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, and Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Condatis LLC by US Airways, Inc..(Dameris, Thad) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Emirates identifying Corporate Parent Investment Corporation of Dubai for Emirates. (Dameris, Thad) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
Emirates' ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, and Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Condatis LLC by Emirates.(Dameris, Thad) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
Airbus S.A.S.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, and Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Condatis LLC by Airbus S.A.S..(Dameris, Thad) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to February 28, 2011 by Electro-Motive Diesel, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fischman, Gary) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
***PLEASE DISREGARD. TO BE REFILED BY ATTORNEY.*** Emirates' ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, affirmative defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Condatis LLC by Emirates.(Dameris, Thad) Modified on 2/14/2011 (gsg). (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Airbus S.A.S. identifying Corporate Parent EADS N.V. for Airbus S.A.S.. (Dameris, Thad) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
***DISREGARD ENTRY - TO BE REFILED*** Airbus S.A.S.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, affirmative defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Condatis LLC by Airbus S.A.S..(Dameris, Thad) Modified on 2/14/2011 (kls, ). (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 143 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Northrop Grumman Corp. by Condatis LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 128 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Kongsberg Maritime, Inc. by Condatis LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
Joint MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice (Stipulated) by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David J Weiner for Airbus S.A.S., Emirates, JetBlue Airways Corp., US Airways, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Goodrich Corp. (Schechter, Peter) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Condatis LLC by Goodrich Corp..(Schechter, Peter) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
***DISREGARD ENTRY - FILED IN WRONG CASE NUMBER*** Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) Modified on 2/11/2011 (kls, ). (Entered: 02/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 126 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Telcordia Technologies, Inc. by Condatis LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Rolls Royce PLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Optimized Systems and Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,, Or Otherwise Respond (Second) by SmartSignal Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,, Or Otherwise Respond (Second) by MTU Aero Engines. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,, Or Otherwise Respond (Second) by Delta Air Lines Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michelle C Jacobs on behalf of L-3 Communications Corp., L-3 Communications Integrated Systems, L.P. (Jacobs, Michelle) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by L-3 Communications Corp. identifying Corporate Parent L-3 Communications Holdings, Inc. for L-3 Communications Corp.. (Turner, John) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM and Jury Demand against Condatis LLC by L-3 Communications Corp..(Turner, John) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM and Jury Demand against Condatis LLC by L-3 Communications Integrated Systems, L.P..(Turner, John) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Elaine Gunter on behalf of The Timken Company (Gunter, Debra) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd. identifying Other Affiliate A WILHELMSEN A.S., Other Affiliate Cruise Associates for Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.. (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Condatis LLC by Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd..(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Northrop Grumman Corp. (Schortgen, Steven) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kongsberg Maritime, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Simrad North America, Inc. for Kongsberg Maritime, Inc.. (Perque, Chris) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kongsberg Maritime, Inc. (Perque, Chris) Modified on 1/25/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 01/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
Original ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Condatis LLC by Northrop Grumman Corp..(Schortgen, Steven) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 136 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Neil J McNabnay terminated as counsel for JetBlue Airways Corp. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/24/11. cc:attys 1-24-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 135 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Neil J McNabnay terminated as counsel for US Airways Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/24/11. cc:attys 1-24-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Trevor R. Jefferies on behalf of Airbus S.A.S., Emirates, JetBlue Airways Corp., US Airways, Inc. (Jefferies, Trevor) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ira James Schaefer on behalf of Airbus S.A.S., Emirates, JetBlue Airways Corp., US Airways, Inc. (Schaefer, Ira) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 138 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric J Lobenfeld on behalf of Airbus S.A.S., Emirates, JetBlue Airways Corp., US Airways, Inc. (Lobenfeld, Eric) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
LREF
Blank 137 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher M Odell on behalf of Airbus S.A.S., Emirates, JetBlue Airways Corp., US Airways, Inc. (Odell, Christopher) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by JetBlue Airways Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dameris, Thad) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by US Airways, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dameris, Thad) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thad Thano Dameris on behalf of Airbus S.A.S. (Dameris, Thad) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd. (Montgomery, M.) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 131 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft OSISoft Inc shall have to 2-14-2011 to file its answer or otherwise respond to the Original Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/21/11. cc:attys 1-21-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,, UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by OSISoft, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ribera, Hector) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph Giordano for Telcordia Technologies, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Optimized Systems and Solutions, Inc., Rolls Royce PLC identifying Corporate Parent Rolls-Royce Group PLC for Optimized Systems and Solutions, Inc., Rolls Royce PLC. (Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
Defendant Kongsberg Maritime, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, for Patent Infringement, COUNTERCLAIM against Condatis LLC by Kongsberg Maritime, Inc..(Perque, Chris) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Elaine Gunter on behalf of Telcordia Technologies, Inc. (Gunter, Debra) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Condatis LLC by Telcordia Technologies, Inc..(Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 124 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft Emirates has to 2-14-2011 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/18/11. cc:attys 1-18-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Emirates. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dameris, Thad) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 115 Motion to Substitute Attorney Thad T. Dameris as lead counsel of record for Emirates. Attorney Jon Robert Pierce terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/14/2011. (kls, ) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Maersk, Inc.( Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Maersk Line, Ltd.( Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ABB, Inc.( Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re American Eurocopter LLC.( Hardin, Roy) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re American Eurocopter Corporation.( Hardin, Roy) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 117 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re JetBlue Airways Corp..( McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
***FILED IN ERROR*** Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re OSISoft, Inc..( Ribera, Hector) Modified on 1/19/2011 (mll, ). (Entered: 01/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Emirates. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dameris, Thad) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hector Ribera on behalf of OSISoft, Inc. (Ribera, Hector) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 110 Motion for Extension of Time. Deft Electro-Motive Diesel Inc shall have to 2-14-2011 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/12/11. cc:attys 1-12-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re US Airways, Inc..( McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Windrock Inc..( Cordell, Ruffin) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint,,,, by Electro-Motive Diesel, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fischman, Gary) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Peter C Schechter for Goodrich Corp.. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 105 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft Lockheed Martin Corporation shall respond to pltf's Complaint by 2-14-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/10/11. cc:attys 1-10-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 99 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft Goodrich Corp may respond to pltf's complaint by 2-14-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/10/11. cc:attys 1-10-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David T McDonald for Pratt & Whitney Services, Inc., Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation, United Technologies Corporation. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,, by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Matthew) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 98 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 98 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond. Delta Air Lines' answer is due 2/23/11. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/7/11. (mjc, ) Modified on 1/7/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 01/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 96 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 96 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond. Answer due 2/21/11. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/7/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 95 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 95 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond. Deadline is extended to 2/14/11. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/7/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Matthew J Moore on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation (Moore, Matthew) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew J Moore on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation (Moore, Matthew) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Goodrich Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Defendant Goodrich Corp.'s Unopposed Motion for a Second Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Weinlein, Craig) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 1/7/2011
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,, or Otherwise Respond by Delta Air Lines Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Craig William Weinlein on behalf of Goodrich Corp. (Weinlein, Craig) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 1/7/2011
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,, or Otherwise Respond by SmartSignal Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 1/7/2011
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,, or Otherwise Respond by MTU Aero Engines. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 93 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defts United Technologies Corp, Pratt & Whitney Services Inc, and Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation shall have to 2-14-2011 to respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/06/11. cc:attys 1-06-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,, by Pratt & Whitney Services, Inc., Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation, United Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warriner, James) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 86 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted between pltf and deft Airbus Americas Inc are hereby dismissed without prejudice. All attys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/30/10. cc:attys 12-30-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Birk K Billingsley for Rolls Royce PLC. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jason A Houdek for Optimized Systems and Solutions, Inc., Rolls Royce PLC. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas J Costakis for Optimized Systems and Solutions, Inc., Rolls Royce PLC. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Condatis LLC. Airbus S.A.S. waiver sent on 12/16/2010, answer due 2/14/2011. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re JetBlue Airways Corp..( McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that plaintiff file a notice that the case is ready for scheduling conference when all of the defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice shall be filed within five days of the last remaining defendant's answer or motion. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/21/10. cc:attys 12-21-10(mll, ) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re L-3 Communications Integrated Systems, L.P..( Turner, John) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re L-3 Communications Corp..( Turner, John) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Timken Company.( Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re SmartSignal Corporation.(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 77 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. ORDERED that Optimized Systems and Solutions, Inc.s deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Condatis, LLCs Complaint is extended to February 14, 2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/17/2010. (gsg) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd..( Heartfield, J) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Maersk, Inc.( Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,, by Optimized Systems and Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Parke Latham on behalf of Optimized Systems and Solutions, Inc., Rolls Royce PLC (Latham, Robert) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew C Acosta on behalf of Optimized Systems and Solutions, Inc., Rolls Royce PLC (Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Kongsberg Maritime, Inc..( Perque, Chris) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chris Paul Perque on behalf of Kongsberg Maritime, Inc. (Perque, Chris) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Emirates.( Pierce, Jon) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re American Eurocopter LLC.( Hardin, Roy) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re American Eurocopter Corporation.( Hardin, Roy) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re MTU Aero Engines.(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Goodrich Corp..( Pierce, Jon) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Airbus S.A.S. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Telcordia Technologies, Inc..( Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 65 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER severing defendant Trico Marine Services, Inc into a separate case, staying that case, and ordering deft to file a notice that the bankruptcy proceedings have concluded within 10 days of their completion. The Court waives the filing fee in the new case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/13/10. cc:attys 12-14-10(mll, ) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Maersk Line, Ltd.( Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ABB, Inc.( Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to Windrock Inc. on 11/26/2010, by cert mail. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to US Airways, Inc. on 11/24/2010, by cert mail. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to United Technologies Corporation on 11/24/2010, by cert mail. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to Trico Marine Services Inc. on 11/24/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/15/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to The Timken Company on 11/29/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/20/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to Telcordia Technologies, Inc. on 11/24/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/15/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to SmartSignal Corporation on 11/30/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/21/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation on 11/24/2010, by cert mail. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd. on 11/26/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/17/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to Pratt & Whitney Services, Inc. on 11/24/2010, by cert mail. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to OSISoft, Inc. on 11/24/2010, by cert mail. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to Optimized Systems and Solutions, Inc. on 11/24/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/15/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to Northrop Grumman Corp. on 11/24/2010, by cert mail. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to MTU Aero Engines on 11/24/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/15/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to Maersk Line, Ltd. on 11/24/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/15/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to Maersk, Inc. on 11/24/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/15/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to Lockheed Martin Corporation on 11/24/2010, by cert mail. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to L-3 Communications Integrated Systems, L.P. on 12/6/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/27/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to Kongsberg Maritime, Inc. on 11/29/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/20/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to L-3 Communications Corp. on 12/6/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/27/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as toJigsaw Technologies, Inc. on 11/24/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/15/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to JetBlue Airways Corp. on 11/24/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/15/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to Goodrich Corp. on 11/24/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/15/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to Emirates on 11/24/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/15/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to Electro-Motive Diesel, Inc. on 11/24/2010, by cert mail. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to Delta Air Lines Inc. on 11/30/2010, by cert mail. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to American Eurocopter LLC on 11/23/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/14/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to American Eurocopter Corporation on 11/23/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/14/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to Airbus Americas, Inc. on 11/24/2010, by cert mail. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to ABB, Inc. on 11/24/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/15/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Windrock Inc..( Cordell, Ruffin) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stephen E Baskin for Delta Air Lines Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gregory J Commins, Jr for Electro-Motive Diesel, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert G Abrams for Electro-Motive Diesel, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Airbus Americas, Inc..(Dameris, Thad) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Trico Marine Services Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Degeyter, Angela) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation.( Warriner, James) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Pratt & Whitney Services, Inc..( Warriner, James) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James George Warriner on behalf of Pratt & Whitney Services, Inc., Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation (Warriner, James) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roderick B Williams on behalf of Pratt & Whitney Services, Inc., Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation, United Technologies Corporation (Williams, Roderick) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Northrop Grumman Corp..(Schortgen, Steven) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Electro-Motive Diesel, Inc..( Fischman, Gary) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Electro-Motive Diesel, Inc. (Fischman, Gary) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary Jason Fischman on behalf of Electro-Motive Diesel, Inc. (Fischman, Gary) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 17 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Lockheed Martin Corporation.( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re United Technologies Corporation.( Warriner, James) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James George Warriner on behalf of United Technologies Corporation (Warriner, James) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to The Emirates Group, which is not listed in the CT Corporation's records or on the records on the State of Texas. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re OSISoft, Inc..( Morrow, Charlene) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT 13 .***Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re OSISoft, Inc..( Morrow, Charlene) Modified on 12/3/2010 (mjc, ). (Entered: 12/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charlene M Morrow on behalf of OSISoft, Inc. (Morrow, Charlene) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Delta Air Lines Inc..( Pierce, Jon) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re US Airways, Inc..( McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to L-3 Communications Corp., L-3 Communications Integrated Systems, L.P., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to ABB, Inc., Airbus Americas, Inc., American Eurocopter Corporation, American Eurocopter LLC, Delta Air Lines Inc., Electro-Motive Diesel, Inc., Emirates, Goodrich Corp., JetBlue Airways Corp., Jigsaw Technologies, Inc., Kongsberg Maritime, Inc., Lockheed Martin Corporation, MTU Aero Engines, Maersk Line, Ltd., Maersk, Inc., Northrop Grumman Corp., OSISoft, Inc., Optimized Systems and Solutions, Inc., Pratt & Whitney Services, Inc., Rolls Royce PLC, Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd., Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation, SmartSignal Corporation, Telcordia Technologies, Inc., The Emirates Group, The Timken Company, Trico Marine Services Inc., US Airways, Inc., United Technologies Corporation, Windrock Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es), # 2 Summons(es), # 3 Summons(es), # 4 Summons(es), # 5 Summons(es), # 6 Summons(es), # 7 Summons(es), # 8 Summons(es), # 9 Summons(es), # 10 Summons(es), # 11 Summons(es), # 12 Summons(es), # 13 Summons(es), # 14 Summons(es), # 15 Summons(es), # 16 Summons(es), # 17 Summons(es), # 18 Summons(es), # 19 Summons(es), # 20 Summons(es), # 21 Summons(es), # 22 Summons(es), # 23 Summons(es), # 24 Summons(es), # 25 Summons(es), # 26 Summons(es), # 27 Summons(es), # 28 Summons(es))(kls, ) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Phillip Love on behalf of Condatis LLC (Love, Gregory) (Entered: 11/11/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darrell Glyn Dotson on behalf of Condatis LLC (Dotson, Darrell) (Entered: 11/11/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyle Joseph Nelson on behalf of Condatis LLC (Nelson, Kyle) (Entered: 11/11/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott English Stevens on behalf of Condatis LLC (Stevens, Scott) (Entered: 11/11/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: None
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 11/11/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/17/2010
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against A.P. Moller-Maersk A/S, ABB, Inc., ABB, Ltd., Airbus Americas, Inc., Airbus S.A.S., American Eurocopter Corporation, American Eurocopter LLC, Celebrity Cruises Inc., Delta Air Lines Inc., Electro-Motive Diesel, Inc., Emirates, Goodrich Corp., JetBlue Airways Corp., Jigsaw Technologies, Inc., Kongsberg Maritime, Inc., L-3 Communications Corp., L-3 Communications Integrated Systems, L.P., Leica Geosystems Ltd., Lockheed Martin Corporation, MTU Aero Engines, MTU Maintenance Hanover, Maersk Line, Ltd., Maersk, Inc., Michelin North America, Inc., Northrop Grumman Corp., OSISoft, Inc., Optimized Systems and Solutions, Inc., Pratt & Whitney Services, Inc., Rolls Royce PLC, Rovsing Dynamics, Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd., Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation, SmartSignal Corporation, Telcordia Technologies, Inc., The Emirates Group, The Timken Company, Trico Marine Services Inc., US Airways, Inc., United Technologies Corporation, Windrock Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2756740.), filed by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 11/11/2010)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 297 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?