Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Foxit Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:10-cv-00691
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 13, 2017 at 11:08 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Data Access Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Collins Edmonds & Pogorzelski PLLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Faucett & Preberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael James Collins +1 713 877 1515 +1 713 877 1737 mcollins@gfpiplaw.com
No Logo Final Draft, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Collins Edmonds & Pogorzelski PLLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Faucett & Preberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael James Collins +1 713 877 1515 +1 713 877 1737 mcollins@gfpiplaw.com
No Logo Foxit Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Klemchuk Kubasta LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kirby Blair Drake +1 214 367 6000 +1 214 367 6001 kirby.drake@kk-llp.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Kelly James Kubasta +1 214 367 6000 +1 214 367 6001 kelly@kk-llp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schein & Cai LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE James Cai +1 408 436 0789 +1 408 436 0758 jcai@sacattorneys.com
No Logo GEAR Software Holdings, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Germer Gertz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Louis Germer +1 409 654 6700 +1 409 835 2115 llgermer@germer.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles W. Goehringer, Jr. +1 409 654 6700 +1 409 835 2115 cwgoehringer@germer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mathew John Yang +1 612 349 0146 +1 612 339 4181 mjyang@rkmc.com
No Logo Gear Software, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Germer Gertz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Louis Germer +1 409 654 6700 +1 409 835 2115 llgermer@germer.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles W. Goehringer, Jr. +1 409 654 6700 +1 409 835 2115 cwgoehringer@germer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mathew John Yang +1 612 349 0146 +1 612 339 4181 mjyang@rkmc.com
No Logo Imsi/design, LLC., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Cordon Smith +1 310 543 2244 +1 310 543 2204 pi.law@verizon.net
No Logo Magix Computer Products International Co, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Cordon Smith +1 310 543 2244 +1 310 543 2204 pi.law@verizon.net
No Logo Simtech Software, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Tableau Software, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Collins Edmonds & Pogorzelski PLLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Faucett & Preberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael James Collins +1 713 877 1515 +1 713 877 1737 mcollins@gfpiplaw.com
No Logo Transmagic, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE +1 303 607 3500 +1 303 607 3600 jared.briant@faegrebd.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Natalie Marie Hanlon-Leh +1 303 607 3500 +1 303 607 3600 natalie.hanlonleh@faegrebd.com
No Logo Manifold Net Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Methodsmarket.com Incorporated, Defendant
No Logo Microlead Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Adam Noureddine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Microlead Corporation +1 817 656 8352 +1 817 656 0094 adam@microlead.com
No Logo Quinstar Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Robert Benson +1 512 536 3003 +1 512 536 4598 cbenson@fulbright.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Alejandro Prati +1 713 651 3726 +1 713 651 5246 dprati@fulbright.com
No Logo Sage Software Holdings, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/17/2011 William Chad Shear +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 shear@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Faucett & Preberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J Healey +1 713 877 1515
No Logo Sage Software North America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/17/2011 William Chad Shear +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 shear@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Faucett & Preberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J Healey +1 713 877 1515
No Logo Sage Software, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martina Tyreus Hufnal +1 302 652 5070 +1 302 652 0607 hufnal@fr.com
doing business asSage MMD, Inc. Martina Tyreus Hufnal +1 302 652 5070 +1 302 652 0607 hufnal@fr.com
doing business asSage MMD, Inc. William Chad Shear +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 shear@fr.com
doing business asSage MMD, Inc. Jonathan E. Singer +1 612 335 5070 +1 612 288 9696 singer@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Faucett & Preberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J Healey +1 713 877 1515

Toggle Switch Represented by Love Law Firm PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
doing business asSage MMD, Inc. Gregory Phillip Love +1 903 690 7100 +1 903 392 2267 greg@lovetrialfirm.com
No Logo Scriptlogic Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by One LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph K Liu +1 949 502 2870 +1 949 258 5081 jliu@onellp.com
No Logo Uniloc (Singapore) Private Ltd., Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com
No Logo Honorable Robert Faulkner, Mediator

Represented by JAMS

Toggle Switch Represented by Jams Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert W Faulkner +1 214 744 5267 +1 214 720 6010 rfaulkner@jamsadr.com
No Logo Michael T McLemore, Technical Advisor
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (265) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/23/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER that all claims and counterclaims between Plaintiffs and Defendants Manifold Net Ltd and Microlead Corporation are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/15/13. cc:attys 3-18-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 57 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims between pltf and deft Methodsmarket.com are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear their own atty's fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/12/13. cc:attys 3-12-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        CONSOLIDATION ORDER. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial purposes only. The earliest filed civil action 6:10cv373 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated case. The model ESI Order, previously filed Discovery Order, and Protective Order (filed in Civil Action 6:10cv373) will govern the consolidated case. All parties to the consolidated case are ORDERED to meet-and-confer and submit a uniform Docket Control Order incorporating the dates designated in this Order. As the stay has been lifted, the parties may engage in discovery. However, the parties may not amend their infringement and invalidity contentions without leave of Court. The parties are further ORDERED to attend mediation before 5-21-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/04/13. cc:attys 3-05-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 2/25/2013. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign in Sheet) (cwk) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
            Opposed MOTION to Join Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. as Plaintiff by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
              NOTICE by Quinstar Corporation Request for Termination of Notices (Prati, Daniel) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER granting 252 Motion to Lift Stay and Set Case Management Conference. These cases are hereby set for a case management conference on 2-25-2013, at 2:00 P.M. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/25/13. cc:attys 1-25-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting 256 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims between pltf and deft Quinstar Corporation are dismissed with prejudice. Parties shall each bear their own atty's fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/28/12. cc:attys 11-28-12(mll, ) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
                    STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Quinstar Corporation by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                      RESPONSE in Support re 252 Opposed MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND NOTICE OF READINESS FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                        NOTICE by Sage Software, Inc. re 253 Response to Motion, Joinder in Defendants' Response to Motion to Lift Stay (Love, Gregory) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                          RESPONSE to Motion re 252 Opposed MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND NOTICE OF READINESS FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by GEAR Software Holdings, Inc., GEAR Software, Inc., Quinstar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Benson, Christopher) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                            Opposed MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND NOTICE OF READINESS FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Order dismissing California Action, # 2 Exhibit B - Markman Hearing transcript, # 3 Exhibit C - Claim Construction Order, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Wesley Hill (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER granting 245 Motion to Stay. This civil action, including all discovery, is STAYED until further order of the Court, pending resolution of the California Action filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Corp. Pty, Ltd., and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. The Clerk of the Court is ORDERED to administratively close this case. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/01/11. cc:attys 12-01-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER. The Court advises the parties that it does not accept communications to the Court outside of CM/ECF filings. Any letters, faxes, or other communications that have not been specifically requested by the Court will be disregarded. All arguments and communications to the Court shall be made through formal CM/ECF filings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/28/11. cc:attys 11-29-11(mll, ) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting 246 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Bret Thomas Winterle terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/28/11. cc:attys 11-28-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing Proceedings held on 10/19/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 91 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2012. (sms, ) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by GEAR Software Holdings, Inc., GEAR Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                          Joint MOTION to Stay All Above Actions by GEAR Software Holdings, Inc., GEAR Software, Inc., Quinstar Corporation, Sage Software, Inc., Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Benson, Christopher) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER. This provisional claim construction Order sets forth the Courts initial constructions for the disputed claim terms in U.S. Patent No. 5,490,216. The Court will issue a Memorandum Opinion, including a full analysis of the disputed claim terms, at a later date. The Court may modify these provisional constructions when it issues the Memorandum Opinion. ThisOrder is intended to serve as a guideline and framework with which the parties may proceed at an earlier point in the litigation. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/03/11. cc:attys 11-04-11(mll, ) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting 242 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Any and all claims are dismissed with prejudice as to deft Tableau Software Inc. Tableaus counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice, and such counterclaims may only be asserted defensively in response to a complaint asserting infringement of the 216 patent. Tableau shall not file any declaratory judgment action concerning the '216 patent. Plaintiffs and Defendant Tableau, Inc. shall each bear their own attorneys fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/02/11. cc:attys 11-02-11(mll, ) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Tableau Software, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER that pltf and defts each pay $14,850.00 to Michael T. McLemore for services rendered and expenses incurred through 10-19-2011 as Technical Advisor to the Court, for a total amount of $29,700.00. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/25/11. cc:attys 10-26-11(mll, ) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Markman Hearing held on 10/19/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER that as time allows, the Court will hear argument on all currently pending motions at the Markman hearing scheduled for 10-19-2011 at 9 a.m. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/12/11. cc:attys 10-13-11(mll, ) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Patent Rule 4-5(d) (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Regarding Estimated Amount of Time Required for Markman Hearing (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                            RESPONSE to 231 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 230 Reply to Claim Construction Brief, by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Steven W. Hartsell, # 2 Exhibit G)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER appointing Michael T. McLemore, 10333 Richmond Ave., Suite 1100, Houston, Texas 77042, to the position of technical advisor in this case with his costs to be assessed equally between Plaintiff and Defendants and timely paid as billed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/4/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 233 Motion to Stay. All deadlines between Plaintiffs and Defendant Tableau Software, Inc. are hereby stayed up through 10-15-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/03/11. cc:attys 10-03-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Stay by Tableau Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tower, Andrew) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE by Transmagic, Inc. re 218 Order, to Terminate Court Notices of Electronic Filing (Sooter, Mary) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 231 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 230 Reply to Claim Construction Brief,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Hector J. Ribera, # 2 Exhibit A)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        Defendants' REPLY to 222 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Sage Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Phillip Love on behalf of Sage Software, Inc. (Love, Gregory) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER. The Court intends to appoint Michael T. McLemore to the position of technical advisor in this case. Any objection to the appointment shall be presented to the Court for in camera review within 10 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/22/11. cc:attys 9-23-11(mll, ) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting 225 Motion to Stay Deadlines. All deadlines between Plaintiffs and Defendant Tableau Software, Inc. are hereby stayed to 9-30-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/15/11. cc:attys 9-15-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting 224 Motion to withdraw; withdrawing 208 Motion and 221 Notice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/15/11. cc:attys 9-15-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Further Stay of Deadlines Following Settlement and Notice of Settlement by Tableau Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tower, Andrew) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION Motion and Joint Stipulation to Address Issues in Markman Proceeding and to Withdraw Docket Nos. 208 and 221 by GEAR Software Holdings, Inc., GEAR Software, Inc., Microlead Corporation, Quinstar Corporation, Sage Software, Inc., Tableau Software, Inc., Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prati, Daniel) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      Additional Attachments to Main Document: 222 Claim Construction Brief,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D7 - part 1, # 2 Exhibit D7 - part 2, # 3 Exhibit D8, # 4 Exhibit D9, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Hill, Jack) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/15/2011: # 7 Exhibit E Searchable, # 8 Exhibit F Searchable) (mjc, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/15/2011: # 9 Exhibit E Searchable, # 10 Exhibit F Searchable) (mjc, ). (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Steve W. Hartsell, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D1, # 6 Exhibit D2, # 7 Exhibit D3, # 8 Exhibit D4, # 9 Exhibit D5, # 10 Exhibit D6)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE by Sage Software, Inc. re 208 Joint MOTION Motion for Leave to Address File History Disclaimer Issues, Arising from the Recent Reexamination, in The Upcoming Claim Construction Proceedings (Notice of Joinder to Motion) (Hufnal, A) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 216 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing 205 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/06/11. cc:attys 9-07-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER denying as moot 167 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/06/11. cc:attys 9-07-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting 215 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft TransMagic Inc are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/06/11. cc:attys 9-06-11(mll, ) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting 144 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft Magix Computer Products International Co are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/02/11. cc:attys 9-02-11(mll, ) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 205 MOTION to Strike PREVIOUSLY CONSTRUED CLAIM TERMS FROM THE PARTIES P.R. 4-3 STATEMENT by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant TransMagic, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting 211 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing 166 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/02/11. cc:attys 9-02-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/02/11. cc:attys 9-02-11(mll, ) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting 209 Motion for Extension of Time to Conduct Mediation. The mediation deadline is extended to 9-15-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/02/11. cc:attys 9-02-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Agreed MOTION to Withdraw 166 MOTION for Protective Order by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Agreed MOTION for Protective Order by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File To Conduct Mediation by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION Motion for Leave to Address File History Disclaimer Issues, Arising from the Recent Reexamination, in The Upcoming Claim Construction Proceedings by GEAR Software Holdings, Inc., GEAR Software, Inc., Magix Computer Products International Co., Microlead Corporation, Quinstar Corporation, Tableau Software, Inc., Transmagic, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Benson, Christopher) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Sage Software, Inc. (Supplemental Additional Disclosures) (Hufnal, A) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE by ScriptLogic Corporation re 202 Order, Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Liu, Joseph) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike PREVIOUSLY CONSTRUED CLAIM TERMS FROM THE PARTIES P.R. 4-3 STATEMENT by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. P.R. 4-3 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PRE-HEARING STATEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Uniloc's proposed construction or position for each disputed claim term, # 2 Exhibit B - Defendants proposed construction or position for each disputed claim term)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Sage Software, Inc. (Defendants' Notice of Preliminary Claim Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence, Pursuant to P.R. 4-2) (Hufnal, A) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 198 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft ScriptLogic Corporation are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/24/11. cc:attys 8-25-11(mll, ) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 196 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft Simtech Software Inc are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/24/11. cc:attys 8-25-11(mll, ) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 195 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft Foxit Corporation are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/24/11. cc:attys 8-25-11(mll, ) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying without prejudice 40 Motion to Dismiss. Deft Microlead is ordered to retain counsel by 9-23-2011. Should Microlead fail to retain counsel, the Court may conclude that the failure amounts to a default and proceed to a merits determination. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/23/11. cc:attys 8-24-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant ScriptLogic Corporation by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 191 Motion for Extension of Time. Gear Software defendants shall have to 8-26-2011 to file its opposition to pltfs' Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/22/11. cc:attys 8-23-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Simtech Software, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Foxit Corporation by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 169 Motion to Stay. All deadlines between Plaintiffs and Defendant TransMagic, Inc. are hereby stayed 14 days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/22/11. cc:attys 8-23-11 (mll, ) Modified on 8/23/2011 (mll, ). (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 174 Motion to Stay. All deadlines between Plaintiffs and Defendant ScriptLogic Corporation are hereby stayed 14 days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/22/11. cc:attys 8-23-11 (mll, ) Modified on 8/23/2011 (mll, ). (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 154 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. The first mediation deadline for Transmagic, Inc., is extended to 8-06-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/22/11. cc:attys 8-23-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order by GEAR Software Holdings, Inc., GEAR Software, Inc.. (Yang, Mathew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (mll, ). (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by GEAR Software Holdings, Inc., GEAR Software, Inc. of Patent Rule 3-3, 3-4, 4-1, and Additional Disclosures (Yang, Mathew) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Manifold Net Ltd. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 56 Motion for Entry of Default. Order that the Clerk enter a default against Manifold Net Ltd. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/17/11. cc:attys 8-18-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 184 Motion for Extension of Time. The first mediation deadline for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, and Defendants Aspyr Media, Inc., Digital River, Inc., GEAR Software, Inc. and GEAR Software Holdings, Inc. is extended to 9-01-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/18/11. cc:attys 8-18-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying without prejudice 53 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/16/11. cc:attys 8-18-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Quinstar Corporation re Patent Rule 3-3, 3-4, 4-1, and additional Disclosures (Prati, Daniel) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Extend the First Mediation Deadline by GEAR Software Holdings, Inc., GEAR Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yang, Mathew) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 178 Motion to Stay Deadlines Following Settlement and Notice of Settlement for 14 days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/16/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Sage Software, Inc. (Invalidity Contentions) (Hufnal, A) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 177 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Any and all claims and/or counterclaims by Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, and Defendant IMSI Design, LLC are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/15/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Sage Software, Inc. (Additional Disclosures) (Hufnal, A) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Sage Software, Inc. (Defendants Proposed Claim Terms and Claim Elements for Construction) (Hufnal, A) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines Following Settlement and Notice of Settlement regarding Defendant Tableau Software, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant IMSI Design, LLC by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. regarding Technical Advisor (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. of United States Patent Office's Notice of Intent to Issue Ex Parte Reexamination Certificate for Patent-In-Suit (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Patent Office notice)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Stay Following Settlement and Notice of Settlement regarding Defendant ScriptLogic Corporation by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 156 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft Final Draft Inc are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/05/11. cc:attys 8-08-11(mll, ) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 155 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft Data Access Corporation are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/05/11. cc:attys 8-08-11(mll, ) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 159 Motion to Stay. All deadlines between Plaintiffs and Defendant Simtech Software, Inc. are hereby stayed 14 days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/04/11. cc:attys 8-04-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 158 Motion to Stay. All deadlines between Plaintiffs and Defendant Foxit Corporation are hereby stayed 14 days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/04/11. cc:attys 8-04-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Stay Following Settlement and Notice of Settlement with Defendant TransMagic, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by GEAR Software Holdings, Inc., GEAR Software, Inc. of Initial Disclosures (Yang, Mathew) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule regarding Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of Protective Order by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Protective Order by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Sage Software, Inc. - Initial Disclosures (Hufnal, A) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 157 Motion for Extension of Time. The first mediation deadline for GEAR Software, Inc. and GEAR Software Holdings, Inc. is extended 14 days to 8-13-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/02/11. cc:attys 8-02-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Transmagic, Inc. - Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Sooter, Mary) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Quinstar Corporation Initial Disclosures (Prati, Daniel) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** NOTICE by GEAR Software Holdings, Inc., GEAR Software, Inc. of Compliance of Initial Disclosures (Yang, Mathew) Modified on 8/2/2011 (gsg). (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Stay Following Settlement and Notice of Settlement with Defendant Simtech Software, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Stay Following Settlement and Notice of Settlement with Defendant Foxit Corporation by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Conduct First Mediation) by GEAR Software Holdings, Inc., GEAR Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yang, Mathew) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Final Draft, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Data Access Corporation by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct /Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set/Reset Hearings,,,, Mediation Deadline by Transmagic, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Briant, Jared) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/28/2011: # 2 Text of Proposed Order Corrected) (mjc, ). (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 151 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven Gardner terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/26/11. cc:attys 7-26-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Jonathan E Singer on behalf of Sage Software, Inc. (Singer, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by GEAR Software Holdings, Inc., GEAR Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yang, Mathew) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 147 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines, Mediation Deadline filed by Quinstar Corporation. Mediation Completion due by 8/4/2011. Motions terminated: 147 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines, Mediation Deadline filed by Quinstar Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/19/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion and Status Proceedings held on 4/26/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 51 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/12/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 137 Motion to Stay. All deadlines between pltfs and deft Magix Computer Products International Co are stayed for 14 days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/15/11. cc:attys 7-15-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set/Reset Hearings,,,,,,,, Mediation Deadline by Quinstar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prati, Daniel) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by GEAR Software Holdings, Inc., GEAR Software, Inc. of Source Code (Yang, Mathew) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Foxit Corporation of Voluntary Disclosure of Foxit Corporation's Source Code (Drake, Kirby) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Magix Computer Products International Co. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Data Access Corporation, Final Draft Inc., Tableau Software, Inc. of Voluntary Early Disclosure of Source Code (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Scott R Maynard for Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (mll, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2011: # 1 Exhibit) (mll, ). (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by GEAR Software Holdings, Inc., GEAR Software, Inc. Production of Accused Product Sales Data (Yang, Mathew) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Sage Software, Inc. (Accused Product Sales Data) (Shear, W) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Foxit Corporation (Production of Accused Product Sales Data) (Drake, Kirby) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by ScriptLogic Corporation Regarding Sales Data (Liu, Joseph) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines and Notice of Settlement regarding Defendant Magix Computer Products International Co. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Quinstar Corporation of it's Compliance with Court Order, Dkt. No. 134 (Benson, Christopher) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Transmagic, Inc. of Sales Data and Source Code (Sooter, Mary) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Data Access Corporation, Final Draft Inc., Tableau Software, Inc. Notice of Disclosure of Sales Data (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Mary V Sooter (Sooter, Mary) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 66 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims against defts Sage Software North America and Sage Software Holdings Inc are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/17/11. cc:attys 6-20-11(mll, ) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jonathan E Singer for Sage Software, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/08/11. cc:attys 6-09-11(mll, ) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/07/11. cc:attys 6-07-11(mll, ) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Mary V Sooter on behalf of Transmagic, Inc. (Sooter, Mary) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 121 Motion for Extension of Time to File the Proposed Docket Control Order. Deadline is extended to 6/2/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/3/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DOCKET CONTROL ORDER (PARTIALLY AGREED) by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Courts Order of May 20, 2011, # 2 Text of Proposed Order (Ex B - Proposed Docket Control Order incorporating the Plaintiffs positions), # 3 Text of Proposed Order (Ex C - Proposed Docket Control Order incorporating the Defendants positions))(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Christopher Kenneth Larus on behalf of GEAR Software Holdings, Inc., GEAR Software, Inc. (Larus, Christopher) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mary V Sooter for Transmagic, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION ENTRY OF DISCOVERY ORDER by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Docket Control Order by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Charles W Goehringer, Jr on behalf of GEAR Software Holdings, Inc., GEAR Software, Inc. (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The parties shall submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the Court by 5-31-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/20/11. cc:attys 5-20-11(mll, ) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        4.26.11 Minute Entry - Status Conf: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 4/26/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-in Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David J Healey on behalf of Sage Software Holdings, Inc., Sage Software North America, Sage Software, Inc. (Healey, David) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. re 115 Order, Set Hearings,, of In Camera Submission (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting Status Conference for 4/26/2011 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. By 4-25-2011 at 9:00 a.m., pltfs shall submit, for in camera review, a table summarizing the licenses or settlements reached in the instant or prior cases involving the patents-in-suit. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/20/11. cc:attys 4-20-11(mll, ) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 53 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) filed by Data Access Corporation, Final Draft Inc., Tableau Software, Inc.. (Tower, Andrew) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence Louis Germer on behalf of GEAR Software Holdings, Inc., GEAR Software, Inc. (Germer, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Notice that case is ready for Status Conference (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney A Martina Tyreus Hufnal for Sage Software, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Support re 53 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER that plaintiff file a notice that the case is ready for scheduling conference when all of the defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice shall be filed within five days of the last remaining defendant's answer or motion. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/25/11. cc:attys 3-25-11(mll, ) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mathew John Yang on behalf of GEAR Software Holdings, Inc., GEAR Software, Inc. (Yang, Mathew) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Kenneth Larus on behalf of GEAR Software Holdings, Inc., GEAR Software, Inc. (Larus, Christopher) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by IMSI Design, LLC identifying Corporate Parent None for IMSI Design, LLC. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Todd A Nelson for Magix Computer Products International Co. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Terry L Watt for Magix Computer Products International Co. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Magix Computer Products International Co. identifying Corporate Parent MAGIX AG for Magix Computer Products International Co.. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 53 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) filed by Quinstar Corporation. (Prati, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/22/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 53 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) filed by GEAR Software Holdings, Inc., GEAR Software, Inc., Simtech Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Choe, Chong) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 85 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Foxit Corporation by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 90 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, of GEAR Software, Inc. and GEAR Software Holdings, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 83 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of IMSI Design, LLC by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 75 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of TransMagic, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 73 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Magix Computer Products International Co. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James Cai for Foxit Corporation (mll, ) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Omar Nakib for Foxit Corporation (mll, ) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by GEAR Software, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent GEAR Software Holdings, Inc. for GEAR Software, Inc.. (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by GEAR Software, Inc. (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by GEAR Software Holdings, Inc. (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM -- Answer and Counterclaims of Defendants GEAR Software, Inc. and GEAR Software Holdings, Inc. against Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by GEAR Software Holdings, Inc., GEAR Software, Inc..(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to Foxit Corporation on 1/7/2011, by cert mail through Texas Secretary of State. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 53 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) filed by Data Access Corporation, Final Draft Inc., Tableau Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tower, Andrew) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kirby Blair Drake on behalf of Foxit Corporation (Drake, Kirby) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Foxit Corporation (Kubasta, Kelly) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant Foxit Corporation's ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Foxit Corporation.(Kubasta, Kelly) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 84 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelly James Kubasta on behalf of Foxit Corporation (Kubasta, Kelly) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by IMSI Design, LLC.(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sage Software, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sage Group, PLC, Corporate Parent Sage Software Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Sage Software North America for Sage Software, Inc.. (Shear, W) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Natalie Hanlon-Leh for Transmagic, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 64 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Simtech Software, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 62 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Tableau Software, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 60 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Final Draft, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 58 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Data Access Corporation by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Transmagic, Inc. (Briant, Jared) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant TransMagic, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Transmagic, Inc..(Briant, Jared) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 69 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 53 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c); Responses due by 3/18/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/04/11. cc:attys 3-04-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited by Magix Computer Products International Co..(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ScriptLogic Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Quest Software, Inc. for ScriptLogic Corporation. (Liu, Joseph) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ScriptLogic Corporation's ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses by ScriptLogic Corporation.(Liu, Joseph) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph K Liu on behalf of ScriptLogic Corporation (Liu, Joseph) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 53 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) by GEAR Software Holdings, Inc., GEAR Software, Inc., Quinstar Corporation, Sage Software Holdings, Inc., Sage Software North America, Sage Software, Inc., ScriptLogic Corporation, Simtech Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prati, Daniel) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jared B Briant for Transmagic, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sage Software, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Sage Software, Inc..(Shear, W) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Simtech Software, Inc. (Choe, Chong) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Simtech Software, Inc..(Choe, Chong) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tableau Software, Inc. (Tower, Andrew) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Tableau Software, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Tableau Software, Inc..(Tower, Andrew) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Final Draft Inc. (Tower, Andrew) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Final Draft, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Final Draft Inc..(Tower, Andrew) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Data Access Corporation (Tower, Andrew) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Data Access Corporation's ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Data Access Corporation.(Tower, Andrew) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Methodsmarket.com Incorporated (d/b/a 6D Technologies) by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendant Manifold Net Ltd by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit - Declaration of Wesley Hill, # 2 Exhibit A to Hill Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Proposed Clerk's Entry of Default)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tonya R Deem on behalf of GEAR Software Holdings, Inc., GEAR Software, Inc. (Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael James Collins on behalf of Final Draft Inc. (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 02/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/4/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Affidavit of Bradley C. Davis in Support of Motion, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry Mark Pogorzelski on behalf of Data Access Corporation, Final Draft Inc., Tableau Software, Inc. (Pogorzelski, Henry) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John J Edmonds on behalf of Data Access Corporation, Final Draft Inc., Tableau Software, Inc. (Edmonds, John) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Patrick Tower on behalf of Data Access Corporation, Tableau Software, Inc. (Tower, Andrew) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bret Thomas Winterle on behalf of GEAR Software Holdings, Inc., GEAR Software, Inc. (Winterle, Bret) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to Manifold Net Ltd. on 1/31/2011, by cert mail through the Texas Secretary of State; answer due: 2/22/2011. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 40 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Scott R. Maynard, # 2 Exhibit A to Maynard Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to Maynard Decl., # 4 Exhibit C to Maynard Decl., # 5 Exhibit D to Maynard Decl., # 6 Exhibit E to Maynard Decl., # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 43 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft Foxit Corporation's deadline to move, answer, or otherwise respond to pltfs' Complaint is extended to 3-07-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/09/11. cc:attys 2-10-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 39 Answer to Complaint of Defendant Microlead Corporation by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Final Draft Inc.( Tower, Andrew) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, for Defendant Foxit Corporation (f/k/a Fox It Software Company) by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ScriptLogic Corporation.(Liu, Joseph) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft Transmagic Inc's deadline to move, answer, or otherwise respond to pltfs' Original Complaint is extended to 3-04-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/01/11. cc:attys 2-01-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss by Microlead Corporation. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Microlead Corporation.(mll, ) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to IMSI Design, LLC on 1/7/2011, by cert mail through the Texas Secretary of State. (mll, ) Modified on 2/1/2011 (mll, ). (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft IMSI Design LLC's deadline to move, answer, or otherwise respond to pltf's Original Complaint is extended to 3-07-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/01/11. cc:attys 2-01-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, for Defendant Transmagic, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Magix Computer Products International Co..(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Alejandro Prati on behalf of Quinstar Corporation (Prati, Daniel) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Quinstar Corporation (Benson, Christopher) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, by Quinstar Corporation.(Benson, Christopher) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Robert Benson on behalf of Quinstar Corporation (Benson, Christopher) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Tableau Software, Inc..( Collins, Michael) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Data Access Corporation.( Collins, Michael) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Simtech Software, Inc..( Choe, Chong) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***PLEASE DISREGARD. TO BE REFILED BY ATTORNEY*** Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Simtech Software, Inc..( Choe, Chong) Modified on 1/27/2011 (gsg). (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, on behalf of Defendant IMSI Design, LLC by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to ScriptLogic Corporation on 1/13/2011, by cert mail through the Texas Secretary of State; answer due: 2/3/2011. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to Manifold Net Ltd. on 1/18/2011, by cert mail through the Texas Secretary of State; answer due: 2/8/2011. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to Magix Computer Products International Co. on 1/13/2011, by cert mail through the Texas Secretary of State; answer due: 2/3/2011. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to GEAR Software, Inc. on 1/18/2011, by cert mail through the Texas Secretary of State; answer due: 2/8/2011. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to GEAR Software Holdings, Inc. on 1/18/2011, by cert mail through Texas Secretary of State; answer due: 2/8/2011. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to Final Draft Inc. on 1/12/2011, by cert mail through Texas Secretary of State; answer due: 2/2/2011. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Return of Service Executed as to Data Access Corporation on 1/13/2011, by cert mail through Texas Secretary of State; answer due: 2/3/2011. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re GEAR Software, Inc..( Gardner, Steven) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re GEAR Software Holdings, Inc..( Gardner, Steven) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to Sage Software, Inc. on 1/10/2011, by cert mail. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to Sage Software Holdings, Inc. on 1/7/2011, by cert mail. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to Sage Software North America on 1/7/2011, by cert mail. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sage Software, Inc..( Shear, W) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sage Software North America.( Shear, W) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sage Software Holdings, Inc..( Shear, W) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Return of Service Executed as to Methodsmarket.com Incorporated on 1/6/2011, by cert mail; answer due: 1/27/2011. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to Microlead Corporation on 1/7/2011, by cert mail; answer due: 1/28/2011. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to Quinstar Corporation on 1/7/2011, by cert mail; answer due: 1/28/2011. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to Simtech Software, Inc. on 1/6/2011, by cert mail; answer due: 1/27/2011. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to Tableau Software, Inc. on 1/7/2011, by cert mail; answer due: 1/28/2011. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: 1/3/2011 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Data Access Corporation, Final Draft Inc., Foxit Corporation, GEAR Software Holdings, Inc., GEAR Software, Inc., IMSI Design, LLC, Magix Computer Products International Co., Manifold Net Ltd., Methodsmarket.com Incorporated, Microlead Corporation, Quinstar Corporation, Sage Software Holdings, Inc., Sage Software North America, Sage Software, Inc., ScriptLogic Corporation, Simtech Software, Inc., Tableau Software, Inc., Transmagic, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: 12/30/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Lewis Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: 12/30/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: 12/30/2010 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: 12/30/2010 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Data Access Corporation, Final Draft Inc., Foxit Corporation, GEAR Software Holdings, Inc., GEAR Software, Inc., IMSI Design, LLC, Magix Computer Products International Co., Manifold Net Ltd., Methodsmarket.com Incorporated, Microlead Corporation, Quinstar Corporation, Sage Software Holdings, Inc., Sage Software North America, Sage Software, Inc., ScriptLogic Corporation, Simtech Software, Inc., Tableau Software, Inc., Transmagic, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2822196.), filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 283 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?