Lodsys, LLC v. Combay, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:11-cv-00272-JRG
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 9, 2017 at 6:41 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lodsys Group, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Donion Gill Huck & Goldfarb PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A. Goldfarb +1 206 452 0260 +1 206 397 3062 goldfarb@kdg-law.com
Space Christopher M. Huck +1 206 452 0260 +1 206 397 3062 huck@kdg-law.com
Space Kit W Roth +1 206 452 0260 +1 206 397 3062 roth@kdg-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Davis Firm, PC-Longview

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Ellsworth Davis, III +1 903 230 9090 +1 903 230 9661 bdavis@bdavisfirm.com
Apple, Inc. Apple, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Findlay Craft, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 efindlay@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Michael Newcombe +1 650 251 5000 +1 650 251 5002 gnewcombe@stblaw.com
Space Jeffrey Eric Ostrow +1 650 251 5030 +1 650 251 5002 jostrow@stblaw.com
Space Jonathan C Sanders +1 650 251 5071 +1 650 251 5002 jsanders@stblaw.com
No Logo Atari Interactive, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JASON C. LO +1 310 552 8500 +1 310 552 7010 jlo@gibsondunn.com
Electronic Arts, Inc. Electronic Arts, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JASON C. LO +1 310 552 8500 +1 310 552 7010 jlo@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Quickoffice, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Elrod, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Craig Tadlock +1 214 953 0182 +1 214 953 0185 ctadlock@elrodtrial.com
No Logo Take-two Interactive Software, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JASON C. LO +1 310 552 8500 +1 310 552 7010 jlo@gibsondunn.com
v.
No Logo Combay, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Inc., Combay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Combay, Inc. +1 469 438 6361 duanng@combay.com
No Logo Iconfactory, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2012 Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413
No Logo Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413
No Logo Quickoffice, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ketan Pastakia +1 212 556 2216 +1 212 556 2222 kpastakia@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Christopher Banner , +1 512 457 2000 +1 512 457 2100 bbanner@kslaw.com
Space Christopher C. Carnaval +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 ccarnaval@kslaw.com
Space Lowell D Jacobson +1 212 556 2130 +1 212 556 2222 ljacobson@kslaw.com
Space Robert F. Perry +1 212 827 4350 +1 212 556 2222 rperry@kslaw.com
Space Scott T. Weingaertner +1 212 556 2227 +1 212 556 2222 sweingaertner@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV +1 903 597 8311 patrickclutter@potterminton.com
Space Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
Space Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo Lodsys Group, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A Goldfarb +1 206 223 1600 +1 206 467 0298

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Donion Gill Huck & Goldfarb PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A. Goldfarb +1 206 452 0260 +1 206 397 3062 goldfarb@kdg-law.com
Space Christopher M. Huck +1 206 452 0260 +1 206 397 3062 huck@kdg-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by PETERSON YOUNG PUTRA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher M Huck +1 206 624 6800 huck@pypfirm.com

Represented by The Davis Firm, PC-Longview

No Logo Lodsys, LLC, Counter-Defendant
Unknown Role, Lodsys Holdings, LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A Goldfarb +1 206 223 1600 +1 206 467 0298

Toggle Switch Represented by PETERSON YOUNG PUTRA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher M Huck +1 206 624 6800 huck@pypfirm.com

Represented by The Davis Firm, PC-Longview

Apple, Inc. Apple, Inc., Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Eric Ostrow +1 650 251 5030 +1 650 251 5002 jostrow@stblaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan C Sanders +1 650 251 5071 +1 650 251 5002 jsanders@stblaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Office Marshall
Filed 5/31/2011
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Cause Section 35 U.S.C. § 271 Patent Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Harrison
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
211-cv-00090-JRG
Related Case
211-cv-00090-JRG
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CONSOL,JURY,PATENT/TRADEMARK,TransWard
  Entries (180) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Notice of Docket Correction
***FILED IN ERROR. FILED IN LEAD CASE - TERMED PER LC Document # 152, Memorandum and Opinion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: 9/24/2013 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
    ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED IN LEAD CASE. PLEASE IGNORE.***MEMORANDUM AND OPINION - Apples counterclaim against Lodsys be and it is DISMISSED AS MOOT. This dismissal for mootness does not bar reassertion of such claims at a future date, either before this Court or elsewhere. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/24/13. (ehs, ) Modified on 9/25/2013 (ch, ).
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Sealed Legal Document 151 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: 6/26/2013 Sealed Transcript
      Sealed Transcript. (lss, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: 6/5/2013 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER - all claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendant Rovio Entertainment Ltd. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/4/13. (ehs, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: 6/3/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neema Jalali on behalf of Electronic Arts Inc. (Jalali, Neema)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: 6/3/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn Liu on behalf of Electronic Arts Inc. (Liu, Shawn)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: 5/29/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ketan Pastakia on behalf of Quickoffice, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4157170. (Pastakia, Ketan)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: 11/28/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER of DISMISSAL - all claims and counterclaims asserted against Deft Square Enix Ltd are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/28/12. (ehs, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  Scheduling Conference
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy Payne: Scheduling Conference held on 8/29/12. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before Judge Payne. The parties were then given Markman and jury selection dates. The parties were directed to meet and confer regarding any changes to the Court's scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders within 14 days of the conference. Court adjourned.(Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (jml)
                    LREF
                    Blank  Scheduling Conference
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy Payne.: Scheduling Conference held on 8/29/12. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before Judge Payne. The parties were then given Markman and jury selection dates. The parties were directed to meet and confer regarding any changes to the Courts scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders within 14 days of the conference. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (bga, )
                      LREF
                      Blank  Notice of Docket Correction
                      ***FILED IN ERROR, FILED IN WRONG CASE (MUST BE FILED IN LEAD CASE ONLY). Document # 145, Answer. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: 8/20/2012 Answer to Amended Complaint
                        ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***ANSWER to [26] Amended Complaint, by Illusion Labs AB.(Findlay, Michael) Modified on 8/21/2012 (sm, ).
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank  Remark
                          ***ALL PARTIES ARE INSTRUCTED TO FILE ANY FUTURE FILINGS (EXCEPT RELATING TO VENUE) IN THE LEAD CASE 2:11-CV-90*** (ch, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: 8/17/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER - the above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the first-filed action, Cause No. 2:11- cv-90. All parties are instructed to file any future motions (except relating to venue) in the first-filed case. Individual cases remain active for venue determinations and trial. The Court will enter one docket control order, one protective order, and one discovery order that will govern the entire consolidated case. All parties to the consolidated case are ordered to meet-and-confer following the upcoming August 29, 2012 scheduling conference to discuss the entry of uniform docket control, protective and discovery orders, which will govern the consolidated case, regardless of whether the same have previously been entered in individual actions. The local rules page limitations for Markman briefs and other motions will apply to the consolidated case. To further promote judicial economy and to conserve the parties resources, the Court encourages the parties to file a notice with the Court in the event that there are other related cases currently pending on the Courts docket that may also be appropriate for consolidation with this case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/17/2012. (ch, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: 8/9/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Court Filing
                              ORDER granting [141] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deadline for Lodsys to comply with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 is extended to Monday, September 17, 2012, and the deadline for defendants to comply with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 is extended to Monday, December 10, 2012. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/9/12. (ehs, )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: 8/9/2012 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Quickoffice, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Google Inc. for Quickoffice, Inc.. (Banner, Brian)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: 8/8/2012, Terminated: 8/9/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Re: (Dkt. 129) Certain Discovery Deadlines by Lodsys Group LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: 8/7/2012 application to appear pro hac vice
                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lowell D Jacobson for Quickoffice, Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-9888) (bsw, )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: 8/1/2012 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Illusion Labs AB.(Findlay, Eric).
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank  Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Illusion Labs AB to 8/20/2012. 19 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: 7/27/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV on behalf of Quickoffice, Inc. (Clutter, Patrick)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 137 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: 7/23/2012 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [136] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Charles Craig Tadlock terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on July 23, 2012. (jrg1, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: 7/20/2012, Terminated: 7/23/2012 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Craig Tadlock) by Quickoffice, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: 7/19/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Thomas Weingaertner on behalf of Quickoffice, Inc. (Weingaertner, Scott)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: 7/19/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert F Perry on behalf of Quickoffice, Inc. (Perry, Robert)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: 7/19/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Charles Carnaval on behalf of Quickoffice, Inc. (Carnaval, Christopher)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: 7/19/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Christopher Banner on behalf of Quickoffice, Inc. (Banner, Brian)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: 7/19/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Quickoffice, Inc. (Jones, Michael)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: 7/19/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Quickoffice, Inc. (Gardner, Allen)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: 7/17/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER - Status Conference set for 8/29/2012 10:15 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and the Honorable Roy Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/17/2012. (ch, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: 6/5/2012 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [126] Motion to Dismiss Defendant Combay, Inc. with prejudice. All attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/5/12. (ehs, )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: 6/1/2012 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by Kit W Roth (Roth, Kit)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: 5/31/2012, Terminated: 6/5/2012 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                  Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Combay by Lodsys Group LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: 5/21/2012 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys Group LLC. Rovio Mobile Ltd served on 4/13/2012, answer due 7/13/2012. (ehs, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/22/2012: # (1) Affidavit of Service) (ehs, ).
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: 5/21/2012 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys Group LLC. Square Enix Ltd. served on 4/23/2012, answer due 7/23/2012. (ehs, )
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: 5/21/2012 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys Group LLC. Illusion Labs AB served on 5/2/2012, answer due 8/1/2012. (ehs, )
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: 5/18/2012 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kit W Roth for Lodsys Group LLC (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1097) (bsw, )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: 5/18/2012 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                            Plaintiff's Original ANSWER to [118] Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Lodsys Group LLC.(Huck, Christopher)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: 5/18/2012 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                              Plaintiff's Original ANSWER to [111] Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Lodsys Group LLC.(Huck, Christopher)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: 5/14/2012 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Square Enix Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Square Enix Holdings Co., Ltd. for Square Enix Ltd.. (Barsky, Wayne)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: 5/14/2012 Answer
                                                                                  Square Enix Ltd.'s ANSWER to Complaint , Amended (D.I. 26), Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM S against Lodsys Group LLC by Square Enix Ltd..(Barsky, Wayne)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: 5/14/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Rose Pezzano on behalf of Rovio Mobile Ltd, Square Enix Ltd. (Pezzano, Amanda)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: 5/14/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer J Rho on behalf of Rovio Mobile Ltd, Square Enix Ltd. (Rho, Jennifer)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: 5/14/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason C Lo on behalf of Rovio Mobile Ltd, Square Enix Ltd. (Lo, Jason)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: 5/14/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wayne M Barsky on behalf of Rovio Mobile Ltd, Square Enix Ltd. (Barsky, Wayne)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                            Plaintiff's Original ANSWER to [107] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Lodsys Group LLC.(Huck, Christopher)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rovio Mobile Ltd identifying Corporate Parent Trema International Holdings BV for Rovio Mobile Ltd. (Barsky, Wayne)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012 Answer
                                                                                                Rovio Entertainment Ltd.'s ANSWER to Complaint , Amended (D.I. 26), Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM S against Lodsys Group LLC by Rovio Mobile Ltd.(Barsky, Wayne)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: 5/1/2012 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Charles Craig Tadlock (Tadlock, Charles)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: 4/13/2012 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: 4/13/2012 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                      APPLE INC.'s ANSWER to [26] Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Lodsys Group LLC by Apple, Inc..(Smith, Melissa)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: 4/13/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kirby Blair Drake on behalf of Combay, Inc. (Drake, Kirby)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 105 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: 4/12/2012 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                          SEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - Apple has satisfied each of the four requirements for intervention as a matter of right under Rule 24(a)(2). The Court finds that permissive intervention is also appropriate under Rule 24(b). To avoid any potential prejudice to Lodsys rights under the License Agreement such intervention shall be and is hereby limited to the issues of license and patent exhaustion. Apples Motion to Intervene is GRANTED-IN-PART to the extent and as specified herein. Motions terminated: [4] MOTION to Intervene filed by Apple, Inc.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/12/12. (ehs, ) Modified on 4/12/2012 (ch, ).
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: 4/25/2012 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Motion Hearing held on 4/4/2012 re [4] MOTION to Intervene filed by Apple, Inc. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (Attachments: # (1) Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (bga, )
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: 4/3/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Rose Pezzano on behalf of Atari Interactive, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. (Pezzano, Amanda)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: 3/8/2012 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                SUMMONS Issued as to Rovio Mobile Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) Square Enix Ltd)(ch, )
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: 3/7/2012 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [101] Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendant Iconfactory, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that all attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/7/12. (ehs, )
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: 3/6/2012, Terminated: 3/7/2012 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Iconfactory, Inc., with Prejudice by Lodsys Group LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: 3/6/2012 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lodsys Group LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lodsys Holdings Group, LLC for Lodsys Group LLC. (Huck, Christopher)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [4] MOTION to Intervene : Motion Hearing previously set for 3/13/2012 10:00 AM is RESET for 4/4/2012 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (bga, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: 3/5/2012 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeffrey E Ostrow for Apple, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-954) (ehs, )
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [4] MOTION to Intervene : Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2012 10:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (bga, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: 2/21/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER denying as moot [85] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/21/2012. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: 2/9/2012 Order on Motion to Substitute PartyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [96] Motion to Substitute Party. Lodsys Group, LLC is substituted for Lodsys, LLC for all purposes in this action, including as plaintiff and counterclaim defendant. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/9/12. (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 96 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: 2/7/2012, Terminated: 2/9/2012 Motion to Substitute Party
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Substitute Party by Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: 1/31/2012 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Lodsys, LLC of Assignment and Intent to File Motion to Substitute (Huck, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                    Case reassigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap re: misc order 11-2. Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to the case. (rvw, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: 12/8/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ANSWER and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES to [26] Amended Complaint, by Combay, Inc..(ehs, )
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: 12/2/2011 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Iconfactory, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Iconfactory, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: 12/2/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to [26] Amended Complaint, by Iconfactory, Inc..(Findlay, Eric)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: 11/30/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [90] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Iconfactory, Inc. be given to December 2, 2011 to answer,. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/29/11. (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: 11/23/2011, Terminated: 11/30/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [26] Amended Complaint, by Iconfactory, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 89 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: 11/9/2011 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff Lodsys Original ANSWER to [80] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,,[82] AMENDED ANSWER of Defendant Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., by Lodsys, LLC.(Huck, Christopher) Modified on 11/9/2011 (ch, ).
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 88 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: 11/9/2011 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff Lodsys Original ANSWER to [78] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Atari Interactive, Inc., by Lodsys, LLC.(Huck, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 87 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: 11/9/2011 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff Lodsys Original ANSWER to [76] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Electronic Arts, Inc. by Lodsys, LLC.(Huck, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank  ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE - modified # 89, to link to # 82 also per request from attorney (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: 10/28/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [84] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Iconfactory, Inc. deadline is 11/25/201. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/28/2011. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Update Answer Deadline
                                                                                                                                                          Answer Due Deadline Updated for Iconfactory, Inc. to 11/25/2011. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: 10/27/2011, Terminated: 2/21/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Combay, Inc.. (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: 10/25/2011, Terminated: 10/28/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [26] Amended Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Iconfactory, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: 10/20/2011 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. (Barsky, Wayne)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 82 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: 10/20/2011 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED ANSWER to [26] Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Lodsys, LLC by Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. (Barsky, Wayne)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: 10/19/2011 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. (Barsky, Wayne)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 80 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: 10/19/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                      Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.'s ANSWER to [26] Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Lodsys, LLC by Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc..(Barsky, Wayne) Modified on 10/20/2011 to add Software to defts title(ehs, ).
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: 10/19/2011 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Atari Interactive, Inc. (Barsky, Wayne)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 78 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: 10/19/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                          Atari Interactive, Inc.'s ANSWER to [26] Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Lodsys, LLC by Atari Interactive, Inc..(Barsky, Wayne)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: 10/19/2011 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Electronic Arts Inc. (Barsky, Wayne)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 76 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: 10/19/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                              Electronic Arts Inc.'s ANSWER to [26] Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Lodsys, LLC by Electronic Arts Inc..(Barsky, Wayne)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: 10/19/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer J Rho on behalf of Atari Interactive, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. (Rho, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: 10/19/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason C Lo on behalf of Atari Interactive, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. (Lo, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: 10/19/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wayne M Barsky on behalf of Atari Interactive, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. (Barsky, Wayne)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: 10/14/2011 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. Combay, Inc. served on 10/6/2011, answer due 10/27/2011. (baf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: 10/14/2011 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. Combay, Inc. served on 10/6/2011 by serving Marshall F Trotter who is designated by law to accept service on behalf of Combay Inc, Keller, Texas by Process Server Fred L Svidlow, answer due 10/27/2011. (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: 10/12/2011 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. Combay, Inc. served on 9/27/2011, answer due 10/18/2011. (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: 10/12/2011 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Returned Unexecuted by Lodsys, LLC as to Combay, Inc.. returned unclaimed # (1) unclaimed, # (2) unclaimed) (ehs, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 68 Filed: 10/10/2011, Entered: 10/10/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Lodsys, LLC of Dismissal of Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate (Huck, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/11/2011: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: 10/6/2011 Summons Reissued
                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Combay, Inc.. (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: 10/5/2011 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MISC. ORDER 11-1 REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Judge T. John Ward no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10-3-11. (jml, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: 9/30/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [62] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Iconfactory, Inc deadline is extended to 10/26/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/30/2011. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Update Answer Deadline
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer Due Deadline Updated for Iconfactory, Inc. to 10/26/2011. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: 9/27/2011 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Combay, Inc.. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: 9/26/2011 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. Atari Interactive, Inc. served on 9/26/2011 by CM RRR through Registered Agent, answer due 10/17/2011. (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: 9/26/2011, Terminated: 9/30/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [26] Amended Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Iconfactory, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: 9/23/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [60] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Michael G. Karr deadline is 9/23/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/23/2011. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Update Answer Deadline
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer Due Deadline Updated for Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate to 9/23/2011. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: 9/21/2011, Terminated: 9/23/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [26] Amended Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: 9/20/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [55] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Atari Interactive, Inc deadline is extended to 10/19/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/20/2011. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 58 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: 9/19/2011 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to [48] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Lodsys, LLC.(Huck, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Atari Interactive, Inc. to 10/17/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: 9/16/2011 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Atari Interactive, Inc..( Barsky, Wayne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [53] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Electronic Arts Inc deadline is extended to 10/19/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/15/2011. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011, Terminated: 9/20/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [26] Amended Complaint, by Atari Interactive, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Barsky, Wayne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Update Answer Deadline
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer Due Deadline Updated for Electronic Arts Inc. to 10/16/2011. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. to 10/19/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: 9/14/2011 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc..( Barsky, Wayne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: 9/14/2011, Terminated: 9/15/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Electronic Arts Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Barsky, Wayne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: 9/12/2011 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. served on 8/29/2011 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Corporation Service Company d/b/a CSC, answer due 9/19/2011. (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: 9/9/2011 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Returned Unexecuted on 9/6/11 by Lodsys, LLC as to Illusion Labs AB. (ehs, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: 9/7/2011 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Quickoffice, Inc. (Tadlock, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: 8/31/2011 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. Electronic Arts Inc. served on 8/26/2011 by CM RRR, answer due 9/16/2011. (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: 8/29/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Quickoffice's ANSWER to [26] Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Lodsys, LLC by Quickoffice, Inc..(Tadlock, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: 8/24/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [46] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Iconfactory Inc deadline is extended to 9/26/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/24/2011. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: 8/24/2011, Terminated: 8/24/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [26] Amended Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Iconfactory, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Update Answer Deadline
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer Due Deadline Updated for Iconfactory, Inc. to 9/26/2011. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: 8/23/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [38] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Quickoffice, Inc. has until August 29, 2011 in which to answer. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/23/11. (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: 8/23/2011 Update Answer Deadline
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer Due Deadline Updated for Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate to 9/21/2011. (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: 8/23/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [41] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate be given to and including September 21, 2011 to answer. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/23/11. (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Update Answer Deadline
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer Due Deadline Updated for Quickoffice, Inc. to 8/29/2011. (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: 8/22/2011 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Atari Interactive, Inc., (Attachments: # (1) Electronics Arts Inc, # (2) Take-Two Interactive Software Inc)(ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: 8/19/2011, Terminated: 8/23/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [26] Amended Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: 8/18/2011 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re [4] MOTION to Intervene filed by Lodsys, LLC. (Huck, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 39 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: 8/18/2011 Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED SURREPLY TO REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion re [4] MOTION to Intervene filed by Lodsys, LLC. (Huck, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: 8/16/2011, Terminated: 8/23/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Quickoffice, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: 8/9/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Atari Interactive, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Quickoffice, Inc., Square Enix Ltd. re [4] MOTION to Intervene (Statement in Support of Apple's Motion to Intervene) (Barsky, Wayne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 36 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: 8/8/2011 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re [4] MOTION to Intervene filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: 8/8/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [4] MOTION to Intervene - Apple Inc.'s Redacted Reply In Support of Motion to Intervene - filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: 8/3/2011 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Returned Unexecuted by Lodsys, LLC as to Combay, Inc.. Summons returned unclaimed and returned to sender on 7/21/11 (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: 8/1/2011 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Combay, Inc.. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: 7/29/2011 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Lodsys, LLC of Dismissal of Defendant Richard Shinderman without Prejudice (Huck, Christopher) 33 Filed & Entered: 08/01/2011 Summons Issued E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Combay, Inc.. (ch, ) 34 Filed: 08/02/2011Entered: 08/03/2011 Summons Returned Unexecuted Summons Returned Unexecuted by Lodsys, LLC as to Combay, Inc.. Summons returned unclaimed and returned to sender on 7/21/11 (ehs, ) 35 Filed & Entered: 08/08/2011 Reply to Response to Motion REPLY to Response to Motion re [4] MOTION to Intervene - Apple Inc.'s Redacted Reply In Support of Motion to Intervene - filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) 36 Filed & Entered: 08/08/2011 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re [4] MOTION to Intervene filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) 37 Filed & Entered: 08/09/2011 Notice (Other) NOTICE by Atari Interactive, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Quickoffice, Inc., Square Enix Ltd. re [4] MOTION to Intervene (Statement in Support of Apple's Motion to Intervene) (Barsky, Wayne) 38 Filed & Entered: 08/16/2011Terminated: 08/23/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Quickoffice, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles) 39 Filed & Entered: 08/18/2011 Sealed Response to Motion SEALED SURREPLY TO REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion re [4] MOTION to Intervene filed by Lodsys, LLC. (Huck, Christopher) 40 Filed & Entered: 08/18/2011 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re [4] MOTION to Intervene filed by Lodsys, LLC. (Huck, Christopher) 41 Filed & Entered: 08/19/2011Terminated: 08/23/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [26] Amended Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) 42 Filed & Entered: 08/22/2011 Summons Issued E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Atari Interactive, Inc., (Attachments: # (1) Electronics Arts Inc, # (2) Take-Two Interactive Software Inc)(ch, ) Filed & Entered: 08/23/2011 Update Answer Deadline Answer Due Deadline Updated for Quickoffice, Inc. to 8/29/2011. (ehs, ) 43 Filed & Entered: 08/23/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ORDER granting [41] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate be given to and including September 21, 2011 to answer. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/23/11. (ehs, ) 44 Filed & Entered: 08/23/2011 Update Answer Deadline Answer Due Deadline Updated for Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate to 9/21/2011. (ehs, ) 45 Filed & Entered: 08/23/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ORDER granting [38] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Quickoffice, Inc. has until August 29, 2011 in which to answer. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/23/11. (ehs, ) Filed & Entered: 08/24/2011 Update Answer Deadline Answer Due Deadline Updated for Iconfactory, Inc. to 9/26/2011. (ch, ) 46 Filed & Entered: 08/24/2011Terminated: 08/24/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [26] Amended Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Iconfactory, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) 47 Filed & Entered: 08/24/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ORDER granting [46] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Iconfactory Inc deadline is extended to 9/26/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/24/2011. (ch, ) 48 Filed & Entered: 08/29/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint Quickoffice's ANSWER to [26] Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Lodsys, LLC by Quickoffice, Inc..(Tadlock, Charles) 49 Filed & Entered: 08/31/2011 Summons Returned Executed E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. Electronic Arts Inc. served on 8/26/2011 by CM RRR, answer due 9/16/2011. (ehs, ) 50 Filed & Entered: 09/07/2011 Corporate Disclosure Statement CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Quickoffice, Inc. (Tadlock, Charles) 51 Filed & Entered: 09/09/2011 Summons Returned Unexecuted Summons Returned Unexecuted on 9/6/11 by Lodsys, LLC as to Illusion Labs AB. (ehs, ). 52 Filed: 09/09/2011Entered: 09/12/2011 Summons Returned Executed E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. served on 8/29/2011 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Corporation Service Company d/b/a CSC, answer due 9/19/2011. (ehs, ) 53 Filed & Entered: 09/14/2011Terminated: 09/15/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Electronic Arts Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Barsky, Wayne) 54 Filed & Entered: 09/14/2011 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc..( Barsky, Wayne) Filed & Entered: 09/15/2011 Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. to 10/19/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, ) Filed & Entered: 09/15/2011 Update Answer Deadline Answer Due Deadline Updated for Electronic Arts Inc. to 10/16/2011. (ch, ) 55 Filed & Entered: 09/15/2011Terminated: 09/20/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [26] Amended Complaint, by Atari Interactive, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Barsky, Wayne) 56 Filed & Entered: 09/15/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ORDER granting [53] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Electronic Arts Inc deadline is extended to 10/19/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/15/2011. (ch, ) 57 Filed & Entered: 09/16/2011 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Atari Interactive, Inc..( Barsky, Wayne) Filed & Entered: 09/19/2011 Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Atari Interactive, Inc. to 10/17/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, ) 58 Filed & Entered: 09/19/2011 Answer to Counterclaim ANSWER to [48] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Lodsys, LLC.(Huck, Christopher) 59 Filed & Entered: 09/20/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ORDER granting [55] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Atari Interactive, Inc deadline is extended to 10/19/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/20/2011. (ch, ) 60 Filed & Entered: 09/21/2011Terminated: 09/23/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [26] Amended Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) Filed & Entered: 09/23/2011 Update Answer Deadline Answer Due Deadline Updated for Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate to 9/23/2011. (ch, ) 61 Filed & Entered: 09/23/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ORDER granting [60] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Michael G. Karr deadline is 9/23/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/23/2011. (ch, ) 62 Filed & Entered: 09/26/2011Terminated: 09/30/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [26] Amended Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Iconfactory, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) 63 Filed & Entered: 09/26/2011 Summons Returned Executed E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. Atari Interactive, Inc. served on 9/26/2011 by CM RRR through Registered Agent, answer due 10/17/2011. (ehs, ) 64 Filed & Entered: 09/27/2011 Summons Issued E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Combay, Inc.. (ch, ) Filed & Entered: 09/30/2011 Update Answer Deadline Answer Due Deadline Updated for Iconfactory, Inc. to 10/26/2011. (ch, ) 65 Filed & Entered: 09/30/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ORDER granting [62] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Iconfactory, Inc deadline is extended to 10/26/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/30/2011. (ch, ) 66 Filed & Entered: 10/05/2011 Order Reassigning Case MISC. ORDER 11-1 REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Judge T. John Ward no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10-3-11. (jml, ) 67 Filed & Entered: 10/06/2011 Summons Reissued E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Combay, Inc.. (ehs, ) 68 Filed & Entered: 10/10/2011 Notice (Other) NOTICE by Lodsys, LLC of Dismissal of Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate (Huck, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/11/2011: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). 69 Filed & Entered: 10/12/2011 Summons Returned Unexecuted Summons Returned Unexecuted by Lodsys, LLC as to Combay, Inc.. returned unclaimed # (1) unclaimed, # (2) unclaimed) (ehs, ). 70 Filed & Entered: 10/12/2011 Summons Returned Executed E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. Combay, Inc. served on 9/27/2011, answer due 10/18/2011. (ehs, ) 71 Filed & Entered: 10/14/2011 Summons Returned Executed E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. Combay, Inc. served on 10/6/2011 by serving Marshall F Trotter who is designated by law to accept service on behalf of Combay Inc, Keller, Texas by Process Server Fred L Svidlow, answer due 10/27/2011. (ehs, ) 72 Filed & Entered: 10/14/2011 Summons Returned Executed E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. Combay, Inc. served on 10/6/2011, answer due 10/27/2011. (baf, ) 73 Filed & Entered: 10/19/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wayne M Barsky on behalf of Atari Interactive, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. (Barsky, Wayne) 74 Filed & Entered: 10/19/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason C Lo on behalf of Atari Interactive, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. (Lo, Jason) 75 Filed & Entered: 10/19/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer J Rho on behalf of Atari Interactive, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. (Rho, Jennifer) 76 Filed & Entered: 10/19/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint Electronic Arts Inc.'s ANSWER to [26] Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Lodsys, LLC by Electronic Arts Inc..(Barsky, Wayne) 77 Filed & Entered: 10/19/2011 Corporate Disclosure Statement CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Electronic Arts Inc. (Barsky, Wayne) 78 Filed & Entered: 10/19/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint Atari Interactive, Inc.'s ANSWER to [26] Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Lodsys, LLC by Atari Interactive, Inc..(Barsky, Wayne) 79 Filed & Entered: 10/19/2011 Corporate Disclosure Statement CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Atari Interactive, Inc. (Barsky, Wayne) 80 Filed & Entered: 10/19/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.'s ANSWER to [26] Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Lodsys, LLC by Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc..(Barsky, Wayne) Modified on 10/20/2011 to add Software to defts title(ehs, ). 81 Filed & Entered: 10/19/2011 Corporate Disclosure Statement CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. (Barsky, Wayne) 82 Filed & Entered: 10/20/2011 Amended Answer to Complaint AMENDED ANSWER to [26] Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Lodsys, LLC by Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. (Barsky, Wayne) 83 Filed & Entered: 10/20/2011 Corporate Disclosure Statement CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. (Barsky, Wayne) 84 Filed & Entered: 10/25/2011Terminated: 10/28/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [26] Amended Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Iconfactory, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) 85 Filed & Entered: 10/27/2011Terminated: 02/21/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Combay, Inc.. (ehs, ) Filed & Entered: 10/28/2011 Update Answer Deadline Answer Due Deadline Updated for Iconfactory, Inc. to 11/25/2011. (ch, ) 86 Filed & Entered: 10/28/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ORDER granting [84] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Iconfactory, Inc. deadline is 11/25/201. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/28/2011. (ch, ) Filed & Entered: 11/09/2011 Notice (Other) NOTICE - modified # 89, to link to # 82 also per request from attorney (ch, ) 87 Filed & Entered: 11/09/2011 Answer to Counterclaim Plaintiff Lodsys Original ANSWER to [76] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Electronic Arts, Inc. by Lodsys, LLC.(Huck, Christopher) 88 Filed & Entered: 11/09/2011 Answer to Counterclaim Plaintiff Lodsys Original ANSWER to [78] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Atari Interactive, Inc., by Lodsys, LLC.(Huck, Christopher) 89 Filed & Entered: 11/09/2011 Answer to Counterclaim Plaintiff Lodsys Original ANSWER to [80] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,,[82] AMENDED ANSWER of Defendant Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., by Lodsys, LLC.(Huck, Christopher) Modified on 11/9/2011 (ch, ). 90 Filed & Entered: 11/23/2011Terminated: 11/30/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [26] Amended Complaint, by Iconfactory, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) 91 Filed & Entered: 11/30/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ORDER granting [90] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Iconfactory, Inc. be given to December 2, 2011 to answer,. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/29/11. (ehs, ) 92 Filed & Entered: 12/02/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint ANSWER to [26] Amended Complaint, by Iconfactory, Inc..(Findlay, Eric) 93 Filed & Entered: 12/02/2011 Corporate Disclosure Statement CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Iconfactory, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Iconfactory, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric) 94 Filed & Entered: 12/08/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint AMENDED ANSWER and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES to [26] Amended Complaint, by Combay, Inc..(ehs, ) Filed & Entered: 12/20/2011 Case Assigned/Reassigned Case reassigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap re: misc order 11-2. Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to the case. (rvw, ) 95 Filed & Entered: 01/31/2012 Notice (Other) NOTICE by Lodsys, LLC of Assignment and Intent to File Motion to Substitute (Huck, Christopher) 96 Filed & Entered: 02/07/2012Terminated: 02/09/2012 Motion to Substitute Party MOTION to Substitute Party by Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) 97 Filed & Entered: 02/09/2012 Order on Motion to Substitute Party ORDER granting [96] Motion to Substitute Party. Lodsys Group, LLC is substituted for Lodsys, LLC for all purposes in this action, including as plaintiff and counterclaim defendant. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/9/12. (ehs, ) 98 Filed & Entered: 02/21/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ORDER denying as moot [85] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/21/2012. (ch, ) Filed & Entered: 03/01/2012 Notice of Hearing on Motion NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [4] MOTION to Intervene : Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2012 10:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (bga, ) 99 Filed & Entered: 03/05/2012 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeffrey E Ostrow for Apple, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-954) (ehs, ) Filed & Entered: 03/06/2012 Notice of Hearing on Motion NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [4] MOTION to Intervene : Motion Hearing previously set for 3/13/2012 10:00 AM is RESET for 4/4/2012 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (bga, ) 100 Filed & Entered: 03/06/2012 Corporate Disclosure Statement CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lodsys Group LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lodsys Holdings Group, LLC for Lodsys Group LLC. (Huck, Christopher) 101 Filed & Entered: 03/06/2012Terminated: 03/07/2012 Motion to Dismiss Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Iconfactory, Inc., with Prejudice by Lodsys Group LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) 102 Filed & Entered: 03/07/2012 Order on Motion to Dismiss ORDER granting [101] Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendant Iconfactory, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that all attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/7/12. (ehs, ) 103 Filed & Entered: 03/08/2012 Summons Issued SUMMONS Issued as to Rovio Mobile Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) Square Enix Ltd)(ch, ) 104 Filed & Entered: 04/03/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Rose Pezzano on behalf of Atari Interactive, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. (Pezzano, Amanda) 109 Filed: 04/04/2012Entered: 04/25/2012 Motion Hearing Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Motion Hearing held on 4/4/2012 re [4] MOTION to Intervene filed by Apple, Inc. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (Attachments: # (1) Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (bga, ) 105 Filed & Entered: 04/12/2012 Memorandum & Opinion SEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - Apple has satisfied each of the four requirements for intervention as a matter of right under Rule 24(a)(2). The Court finds that permissive intervention is also appropriate under Rule 24(b). To avoid any potential prejudice to Lodsys rights under the License Agreement such intervention shall be and is hereby limited to the issues of license and patent exhaustion. Apples Motion to Intervene is GRANTED-IN-PART to the extent and as specified herein. Motions terminated: [4] MOTION to Intervene filed by Apple, Inc.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/12/12. (ehs, ) Modified on 4/12/2012 (ch, ). 106 Filed & Entered: 04/13/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kirby Blair Drake on behalf of Combay, Inc. (Drake, Kirby) 107 Filed & Entered: 04/13/2012 Answer to Amended Complaint APPLE INC.'s ANSWER to [26] Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Lodsys Group LLC by Apple, Inc..(Smith, Melissa) 108 Filed & Entered: 04/13/2012 Corporate Disclosure Statement CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) 110 Filed & Entered: 05/01/2012 Notice of Change of Address NOTICE of Change of Address by Charles Craig Tadlock (Tadlock, Charles) 111 Filed & Entered: 05/04/2012 Answer to Complaint Rovio Entertainment Ltd.'s ANSWER to Complaint , Amended (D.I. 26), Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM S against Lodsys Group LLC by Rovio Mobile Ltd.(Barsky, Wayne) 112 Filed & Entered: 05/04/2012 Corporate Disclosure Statement CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rovio Mobile Ltd identifying Corporate Parent Trema International Holdings BV for Rovio Mobile Ltd. (Barsky, Wayne) 113 Filed & Entered: 05/04/2012 Answer to Counterclaim Plaintiff's Original ANSWER to [107] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Lodsys Group LLC.(Huck, Christopher) 114 Filed & Entered: 05/14/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wayne M Barsky on behalf of Rovio Mobile Ltd, Square Enix Ltd. (Barsky, Wayne) 115 Filed & Entered: 05/14/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason C Lo on behalf of Rovio Mobile Ltd, Square Enix Ltd. (Lo, Jason) 116 Filed & Entered: 05/14/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer J Rho on behalf of Rovio Mobile Ltd, Square Enix Ltd. (Rho, Jennifer) 117 Filed & Entered: 05/14/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Rose Pezzano on behalf of Rovio Mobile Ltd, Square Enix Ltd. (Pezzano, Amanda) 118 Filed & Entered: 05/14/2012 Answer to Complaint Square Enix Ltd.'s ANSWER to Complaint , Amended (D.I. 26), Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM S against Lodsys Group LLC by Square Enix Ltd..(Barsky, Wayne) 119 Filed & Entered: 05/14/2012 Corporate Disclosure Statement CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Square Enix Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Square Enix Holdings Co., Ltd. for Square Enix Ltd.. (Barsky, Wayne) 120 Filed & Entered: 05/18/2012 Answer to Counterclaim Plaintiff's Original ANSWER to [111] Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Lodsys Group LLC.(Huck, Christopher) 121 Filed & Entered: 05/18/2012 Answer to Counterclaim Plaintiff's Original ANSWER to [118] Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Lodsys Group LLC.(Huck, Christopher) 122 Filed & Entered: 05/18/2012 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kit W Roth for Lodsys Group LLC (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1097) (bsw, ) 123 Filed & Entered: 05/21/2012 Summons Returned Executed SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys Group LLC. Illusion Labs AB served on 5/2/2012, answer due 8/1/2012. (ehs, ) 124 Filed & Entered: 05/21/2012 Summons Returned Executed SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys Group LLC. Square Enix Ltd. served on 4/23/2012, answer due 7/23/2012. (ehs, ) 125 Filed & Entered: 05/21/2012 Summons Returned Executed SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys Group LLC. Rovio Mobile Ltd served on 4/13/2012, answer due 7/13/2012. (ehs, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/22/2012: # (1) Affidavit of Service) (ehs, ). 126 Filed & Entered: 05/31/2012Terminated: 06/05/2012 Motion to Dismiss Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Combay by Lodsys Group LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) 127 Filed & Entered: 06/01/2012 Notice of Change of Address NOTICE of Change of Address by Kit W Roth (Roth, Kit) 128 Filed & Entered: 06/05/2012 Order on Motion to Dismiss ORDER granting [126] Motion to Dismiss Defendant Combay, Inc. with prejudice. All attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/5/12. (ehs, ) 129 Filed & Entered: 07/17/2012 Order ORDER - Status Conference set for 8/29/2012 10:15 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and the Honorable Roy Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/17/2012. (ch, ) 130 Filed & Entered: 07/19/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Quickoffice, Inc. (Gardner, Allen) 131 Filed & Entered: 07/19/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Quickoffice, Inc. (Jones, Michael) 132 Filed & Entered: 07/19/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Christopher Banner on behalf of Quickoffice, Inc. (Banner, Brian) 133 Filed & Entered: 07/19/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Charles Carnaval on behalf of Quickoffice, Inc. (Carnaval, Christopher) 134 Filed & Entered: 07/19/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert F Perry on behalf of Quickoffice, Inc. (Perry, Robert) 135 Filed & Entered: 07/19/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Thomas Weingaertner on behalf of Quickoffice, Inc. (Weingaertner, Scott) 136 Filed & Entered: 07/20/2012Terminated: 07/23/2012 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Craig Tadlock) by Quickoffice, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles) 137 Filed & Entered: 07/23/2012 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ORDER granting [136] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Charles Craig Tadlock terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on July 23, 2012. (jrg1, ) 138 Filed & Entered: 07/27/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV on behalf of Quickoffice, Inc. (Clutter, Patrick) Filed & Entered: 08/01/2012 Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Illusion Labs AB to 8/20/2012. 19 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, ) 139 Filed & Entered: 08/01/2012 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Illusion Labs AB.(Findlay, Eric). 140 Filed & Entered: 08/07/2012 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lowell D Jacobson for Quickoffice, Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-9888) (bsw, ) 141 Filed & Entered: 08/08/2012Terminated: 08/09/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Re: (Dkt. 129) Certain Discovery Deadlines by Lodsys Group LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) 142 Filed & Entered: 08/09/2012 Corporate Disclosure Statement CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Quickoffice, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Google Inc. for Quickoffice, Inc.. (Banner, Brian) 143 Filed & Entered: 08/09/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery ORDER granting [141] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deadline for Lodsys to comply with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 is extended to Monday, September 17, 2012, and the deadline for defendants to comply with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 is extended to Monday, December 10, 2012. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/9/12. (ehs, ) 144 Filed & Entered: 08/17/2012 Order ORDER - the above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the first-filed action, Cause No. 2:11- cv-90. All parties are instructed to file any future motions (except relating to venue) in the first-filed case. Individual cases remain active for venue determinations and trial. The Court will enter one docket control order, one protective order, and one discovery order that will govern the entire consolidated case. All parties to the consolidated case are ordered to meet-and-confer following the upcoming August 29, 2012 scheduling conference to discuss the entry of uniform docket control, protective and discovery orders, which will govern the consolidated case, regardless of whether the same have previously been entered in individual actions. The local rules page limitations for Markman briefs and other motions will apply to the consolidated case. To further promote judicial economy and to conserve the parties resources, the Court encourages the parties to file a notice with the Court in the event that there are other related cases currently pending on the Courts docket that may also be appropriate for consolidation with this case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/17/2012. (ch, ) Filed & Entered: 08/20/2012 Remark ***ALL PARTIES ARE INSTRUCTED TO FILE ANY FUTURE FILINGS (EXCEPT RELATING TO VENUE) IN THE LEAD CASE 2:11-CV-90*** (ch, ) 145 Filed & Entered: 08/20/2012 Answer to Amended Complaint ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***ANSWER to [26] Amended Complaint, by Illusion Labs AB.(Findlay, Michael) Modified on 8/21/2012 (sm, ). Filed & Entered: 08/21/2012 Notice of Docket Correction ***FILED IN ERROR, FILED IN WRONG CASE (MUST BE FILED IN LEAD CASE ONLY). Document # 145, Answer. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, ) Filed: 08/29/2012Entered: 09/04/2012 Scheduling Conference Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy Payne.: Scheduling Conference held on 8/29/12. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before Judge Payne. The parties were then given Markman and jury selection dates. The parties were directed to meet and confer regarding any changes to the Courts scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders within 14 days of the conference. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (bga, ) Filed: 08/29/2012Entered: 09/04/2012 Scheduling Conference Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy Payne: Scheduling Conference held on 8/29/12. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before Judge Payne. The parties were then given Markman and jury selection dates. The parties were directed to meet and confer regarding any changes to the Court's scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders within 14 days of the conference. Court adjourned.(Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (jml) 146 Filed & Entered: 11/28/2012 Order ORDER of DISMISSAL - all claims and counterclaims asserted against Deft Square Enix Ltd are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/28/12. (ehs, ) 147 Filed & Entered: 05/29/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ketan Pastakia on behalf of Quickoffice, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4157170. (Pastakia, Ketan) 148 Filed & Entered: 06/03/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn Liu on behalf of Electronic Arts Inc. (Liu, Shawn) 149 Filed & Entered: 06/03/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neema Jalali on behalf of Electronic Arts Inc. (Jalali, Neema) 150 Filed & Entered: 06/05/2013 Order ORDER - all claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendant Rovio Entertainment Ltd. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/4/13. (ehs, ) 151 Filed & Entered: 06/26/2013 Sealed Transcript Sealed Transcript. (lss, ) 152 Filed & Entered: 09/24/2013 Memorandum & Opinion ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED IN LEAD CASE. PLEASE IGNORE.***MEMORANDUM AND OPINION - Apples counterclaim against Lodsys be and it is DISMISSED AS MOOT. This dismissal for mootness does not bar reassertion of such claims at a future date, either before this Court or elsewhere. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/24/13. (ehs, ) Modified on 9/25/2013 (ch, ). Filed & Entered: 09/25/2013 Notice of Docket Correction ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED IN LEAD CASE - TERMED PER LC Document # 152, Memorandum and Opinion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: 7/28/2011 Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Additional Attachments to Main Document: [30] Sealed Response to Motion.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration in Support of Opposition, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE FROM CLERK re [29] Response in Opposition to Motion. Clerk has modified entry to reflect that this document (response) is a REDACTED version. (Complete version filed separately under seal) (sm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 30 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: 7/27/2011 Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re [4] MOTION to Intervene filed by Lodsys, LLC. (Huck, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: 7/27/2011 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***REPLACES DOCUMENT #[28] WHICH WAS FILED IN ERROR***REDACTED RESPONSE in Opposition re [4] MOTION to Intervene filed by Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration in Support of Opposition, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) Modified on 7/27/2011 (ehs, ). Modified on 7/28/2011 (sm, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: 7/27/2011 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT #[29]***RESPONSE in Opposition re [4] MOTION to Intervene filed by Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) Modified on 7/27/2011 (ehs, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Notice of Docket Correction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 28, response. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: 7/26/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re [4] MOTION to Intervene - Supplemental Declaration of Jonathan C. Sanders in Further Support of Apple Inc.'s Motion to Intervene - (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit - Declaration of Jonathan C. Sanders, # (2) Exhibit A to Declaration of Jonathan C. Sanders, # (3) Exhibit B to Declaration of Jonathan C. Sanders)(Smith, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: 7/21/2011 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against Combay, Inc., Iconfactory, Inc., Illusion Labs AB, Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate, Quickoffice, Inc., Richard Shinderman, Wulven Game Studios, filed by Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Huck, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: 7/18/2011 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. Richard Shinderman served on 7/7/2011, answer due 7/28/2011. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: 7/18/2011 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. Richard Shinderman served on 6/7/2011 by CM RRR, answer due 6/28/2011. (ehs, ) Modified on 7/18/2011 (ch, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: 7/18/2011 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate.(Findlay, Eric).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice of Docket Correction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***FILED IN ERROR. WRONG DATE ADDED Document # 24, Sealed Summons. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Update Answer Deadline
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer Due Deadline Updated for Richard Shinderman. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate to 8/20/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Quickoffice, Inc. (to 8/20/2011).(Tadlock, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Craig Tadlock on behalf of Quickoffice, Inc. (Tadlock, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Quickoffice, Inc. to 8/20/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: 7/14/2011 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Illusion Labs AB. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: 7/12/2011 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Iconfactory, Inc.(Findlay, Eric).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Iconfactory, Inc. to 8/25/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: 7/11/2011 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. Iconfactory, Inc. served on 7/5/2011 by CM RRR on Registered Agent, answer due 7/26/2011. (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: 7/8/2011 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate served by CM RRR on 6/30/2011, answer due 7/21/2011; Quickoffice, Inc. served on 6/30/2011, answer due 7/21/2011. (Attachments: # (1) Quickoffice)(ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: 6/27/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [14] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [4] MOTION to Intervene Responses due by 7/27/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/27/2011. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: 6/22/2011, Terminated: 6/27/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Apple Inc.'s Motion to Intervene by Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Notice of Docket Correction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 13, Motion for Extension of Time. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: 6/21/2011, Terminated: 6/22/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Apple Inc's Motion to Intervene by Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) Modified on 6/22/2011 (ch, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: 6/21/2011 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [5] Motion to Seal Document Exhibit A to the Declaration of Jonathan C. Sanders in Support of Apples Motion to Intervene shall be maintained under seal. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/21/2011. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: 6/17/2011 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Combay, Inc., Iconfactory, Inc., Illusion Labs AB, Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate, Quickoffice, Inc., Richard Shinderman, Wulven Game Studios. (Attachments: # (1) Iconfactory, # (2) Illusion Labs, # (3) Michael Karr, # (4) Quickoffice, # (5) Shindermann, # (6) Combay)(ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: 6/17/2011 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jonathan C Sanders for Apple, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 6-3599. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: 6/17/2011 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney George M Newcombe for Apple, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 6-3600. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: 6/15/2011 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher M Huck for Lodsys, LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-567) (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: 6/15/2011 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael A Goldfarb for Lodsys, LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-567) (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: 6/9/2011 Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS Exhibit A to Sanders Declartaion in Support of Main Document: [4] MOTION to Intervene. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A to Sanders Declaration)(Findlay, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: 6/9/2011, Terminated: 6/21/2011 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal Document Exhibit A to Sanders Declaration in Support of Apple Inc.'s Motion to Intervene by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: 6/9/2011, Terminated: 4/12/2012 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Intervene by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit A - Answer and Counterclaims, # (3) Affidavit of Sanders, # (4) Exhibit B to Sanders Declaration, # (5) Exhibit C to Sanders Declaration, # (6) Exhibit D to Sanders Declaration, # (7) Exhibit E to Sanders Declaration, # (8) Exhibit F to Sanders Declaration)(Findlay, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice of Magistrate Availability
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Case assigned to Judge T. John Ward. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: 5/31/2011 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Davis, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: 5/31/2011 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lodsys, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lodsys Holdings, LLC for Lodsys, LLC. (Davis, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: 5/31/2011 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Combay, Inc., Iconfactory, Inc., Illusion Labs AB, Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate, Quickoffice, Inc., Richard Shinderman, Wulven Game Studios ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3057445.), filed by Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,620,565, # (2) Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,222,078, # (3) Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 343 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?