Lodsys, LLC v. DriveTime Automotive Group, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:11-cv-00309
District Judge David Folsom, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 10, 2016 at 7:05 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lodsys, LLC, Plaintiff
Unknown Role, Lodsys Holdings, LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A Goldfarb +1 206 223 1600 +1 206 467 0298

Toggle Switch Represented by PETERSON YOUNG PUTRA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher M Huck +1 206 624 6800 huck@pypfirm.com

Represented by The Davis Firm, PC-Longview

v.
Drivetime Automotive Group, Inc. Drivetime Automotive Group, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

No Logo ESET, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicola Anthony Pisano +1 858 314 1129 +1 858 314 1150 napisano@jonesday.com
No Logo Foresee Results, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Cannon Low +1 713 654 7632 +1 713 787 1440 jlow@mwe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael E Shanahan +1 212 547 5400 +1 212 547 5444 mshanahan@mwe.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Wallenstein Wagner & Rockey, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRENT A. HAWKINS. +1 312 554 3300 +5543 554 554 3301
No Logo Live Person, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

No Logo Opinionlab, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/15/2011 Christopher Wood Kennerly +1 214 953 6812 chris.kennerly@bakerbotts.com
The New York Times Company The New York Times Company, Defendant

Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (106) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 99 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendant LivePerson, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/8/2012. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lodsys Group LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV on behalf of LivePerson, Inc. (Clutter, Patrick) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 95 Stipulation regarding Motion to Dismiss. The filing of Lodsy's Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement has no impact on the substance of LivePerson's pending Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/16/2012. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting 93 Joint Motion to Extend Certain Case Deadlines. Defendant shall have until and including Friday, August 24, 2012, in which to comply with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4, and that the parties shall have until and including Monday, September 10, 2012, in which to produce or permit inspection of the materials set forth in paragraph 3(b) of the Discovery Order [Dkt. No. 84]. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/16/2012. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
            Joint MOTION to Approve the Parties' Stipulation Regarding Motion to Dismiss of Defendant LivePerson, Inc. re 61 MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of First-Filed Action, 62 Additional Attachments to Main Document, by LivePerson, Inc., Lodsys Group LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
              AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against LivePerson, Inc., filed by Lodsys Group LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Roth, Kit) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                Joint MOTION to Extend Certain Case Deadlines by Lodsys Group LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Kit) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                  NOTICE by Lodsys Group LLC Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Roth, Kit) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Lodsys Group LLC re Initial Disclosures (Roth, Kit) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by LivePerson, Inc. regarding Compliance with Initial Disclosures (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 89 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                        PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/13/2012. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                          Joint MOTION for Protective Order by LivePerson, Inc., Lodsys Group LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER granting 85 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Protective Order. ORDERED that the parties shall have until and including Tuesday, June 12, 2012, in which to submit a Proposed Protective Order to the Court. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/5/2012. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/05/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Kit W Roth (Roth, Kit) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Submit Protective Order by LivePerson, Inc., Lodsys Group LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/22/12. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                                    Joint MOTION to Enter Agreed Discovery Order by LivePerson, Inc., Lodsys Group LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Discovery Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kit W Roth for Lodsys Group LLC (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1097) (bsw, ) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER - the parties are ORDERED to obtain an updated model discovery order from the undersigneds chambers website, meet-and-confer, and submit a revised proposed discovery order within 7 days. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/16/12. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 12/4/2012., Joinder of Parties due by 5/18/2012., Claim Construction Hearing set for 2/19/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Motions in limine due by 7/2/2013., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/15/2013., Jury Selection set for 8/5/2013 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Mediation deadline 3/19/2013. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/15/2012. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting 72 Motion to Amend/Correct. ORDERED that the parties shall have until and including Friday, June 1, 2012, in which to submit a Proposed Protective Order to the Court. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/15/2012. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None
                                              Joint MOTION to Enter Agreed Docket Control Order by LivePerson, Inc., Lodsys Group LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Docket Control Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kimberly A Mottley for LivePerson, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-8517) (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                  Joint MOTION for Entry of Discovery and Docket Control Order by Lodsys Group LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Discovery Order, # 2 Docket Control Order)(Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                    ***FILED IN ERROR. WRONG CASE. PLEASE IGNORE THIS DOCUMENT.***Joint MOTION for Entry of Discovery and Docket Control Orders by Lodsys Group LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Docket Control Order, # 2 Discovery Order)(Huck, Christopher) Modified on 5/4/2012 (ch, ). (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Honorable Robert Faulkner, filed by Lodsys Group LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                        ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE THIS DOCUMENT.***Joint MOTION Entry of Discovery and Docket Control Orders by Lodsys Group LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Huck, Christopher) Modified on 5/4/2012 (ch, ). (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                          Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 69 Order, Set Hearings Modify the Docket Control Order by LivePerson, Inc., Lodsys Group LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE by LivePerson, Inc. re 61 MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of First-Filed Action, 62 Additional Attachments to Main Document, of Request for Oral Argument on Motion to Dismiss (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of LivePerson, Inc. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER, ( Status Conference set for 4/20/2012 09:30 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap.). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/9/12. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lodsys Group LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lodsys Holdings Group, LLC for Lodsys Group LLC. (Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 61 MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of First-Filed Action filed by LivePerson, Inc.. (Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 61 MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of First-Filed Action filed by Lodsys Group LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting 64 Motion to Substitute Party. Lodsys Group, LLC is substituted for Lodsys, LLC for all purposes in this action, including as plaintiff and counterclaim defendant. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/1/12. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION to Substitute Party by Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 52 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Lodsys, LLC as to deft ForeSee Results, Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/27/12. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              Additional Attachments to Main Document: 61 MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of First-Filed Action.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B to Motion to Dismiss in Favor of First-Filed Action, # 2 Exhibit C to Motion to Dismiss in Favor of First-Filed Action)(Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of First-Filed Action by LivePerson, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bauer, Steven) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2012: # 2 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ). (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LivePerson, Inc. (Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 58 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline extended to January 23, 2012 for LivePerson to serve a response to PlaintiffsOriginal Complaint. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/9/12. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer up to and including January 23, 2012. by LivePerson, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 57 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER - granting 55 Notice of Dismissal. All claims between Plaintiff Lodsys, LLC and Defendant ESET, LLC, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that all attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/12/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 57
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 53 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. LivePerson, Inc.s deadline is 1/9/2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/7/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE by Lodsys, LLC of Dismissal of Defendant ESET, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER - granting 51 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. All claims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff Lodsys, LLC and Defendant DriveTime Automotive Group, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that all attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/6/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 54
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by LivePerson, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lodsys, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lodsys, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER - granting 39 Notice of Dismissal. All claims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff Lodsys, LLC and Defendant OpinionLab, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that all attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/15/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER - granting 38 Notice of Dismissal. All claims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff Lodsys, LLC and Defendant The New York Times Company are hereby dismissed without prejudice. It is further ORDERED that all attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/15/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 47 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant DRIVETIME AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC.s deadline is 12/12/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/14/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer UNOPPOSED FOURTH MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by DriveTime Automotive Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornelius, William) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer UNOPPOSED FOURTH MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by DriveTime Automotive Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornelius, William) Modified on 11/8/2011 (ch, ). Modified on 11/8/2011 (ch, ). (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 44 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant LivePerson, Inc.s deadline is 12/7/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/4/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer ~ LivePerson's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by LivePerson, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant ForeSee Results, Inc.s deadline is 12/2/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/2/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by ForeSee Results, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed Fourth Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ESET, LLC.( Pisano, Nicola) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brent A Hawkins for ForeSee Results, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-759. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Lodsys, LLC of Dismissal of Defendant Opinion Lab (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Lodsys, LLC of Dismissal of Defendant The New York Times Company (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. DriveTime extended time to answer November 10, 2011.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/13/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, (Unopposed) by DriveTime Automotive Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornelius, William) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ForeSee Results, LLCs deadline is 11/2/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/6/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. OpinionLabs deadline is 11/2/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/6/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The New York Times Companys 11/2/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/6/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. LivePerson Inc deadline is extended to 11/7/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/6/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        MISC. ORDER 11-1 REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Judge T. John Ward no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10-3-11. (jml, ) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by LivePerson, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by ForeSee Results, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Low, John) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by OpinionLab, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by The New York Times Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ESET, LLC.( Pisano, Nicola) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. ForeSee Results, Inc. served on 7/14/2011 by CM RRR through Registered Agent, answer due 10/3/2011. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of ForeSee Results, Inc. (Montgomery, M.) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of ForeSee Results, Inc. (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Drive Time 10/10/2011, ESET LLC 10/3/2011, ForeSee Results Inc 10/3/2011, Live Person Inc 10/6/2011, OpinionLab Inc 10/3/2011, The New York Times Company 10/3/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/12/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by OpinionLab, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brian W LaCorte for DriveTime Automotive Group, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 6-4449. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The New York Times Company.( Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re DriveTime Automotive Group, Inc..( Cornelius, William) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to DriveTime Automotive Group, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re OpinionLab, Inc..( Kennerly, Christopher) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Shanahan on behalf of ForeSee Results, Inc. (Shanahan, Michael) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re LivePerson, Inc..( Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ForeSee Results, Inc.(Low, John) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. DriveTime Automotive Group, Inc. served on 7/14/2011 by CM RRR, answer due 8/4/2011. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. LivePerson, Inc. served on 7/14/2011 by CM RRR through Registered Agent The Corporation Trust Ctr, answer due 8/4/2011. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael A Goldfarb for Lodsys, LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-630) (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher M Huck for Lodsys, LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-630) (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. ESET, LLC served on 7/13/2011, answer due 9/2/2011; OpinionLab, Inc. served on 7/13/2011, answer due 8/3/2011; The New York Times Company served on 7/13/2011, answer due 8/3/2011. Parties served by CM RRR through Registered Agent (Attachments: # 1 OpinionLab, # 2 ESET)(ehs, ) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ESET, LLC.( Pisano, Nicola) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicola Anthony Pisano on behalf of ESET, LLC (Pisano, Nicola) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to DriveTime Automotive Group, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to ESET, LLC, (Attachments: # 1 ForeSee Results LLC, # 2 LivePerson Inc, # 3 OpinionLab Inc, # 4 The New York Times Company)(ch, ) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lodsys, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lodsys Holdings, LLC for Lodsys, LLC. (Davis, William) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Davis, William) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against DriveTime Automotive Group, Inc., ESET, LLC, ForeSee Results, Inc., LivePerson, Inc., OpinionLab, Inc., The New York Times Company ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3108043.), filed by Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,620,565, # 2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,222,078, # 3 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 5,999,908, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, William) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 303 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?