Project Paperless, LLC v. Veris Consulting, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00334
District Judge Anthony J Trenga, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 5, 2017 at 11:02 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Project Paperless, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaufman & Canoles, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Noona +1 757 624 3239 +1 757 624 3169 senoona@kaufcan.com
v.
No Logo Veris Consulting, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Briody +1 202 383 0759 +1 202 637 3593 jim.briody@sutherland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sutherland Asbill & Brennan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Briody +1 202 383 0759 +1 202 637 3593 jim.briody@sutherland.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE in re 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Project Paperless, LLC. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 07/02/2012. (jlan) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Project Paperless, LLC (Noona, Stephen) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to File. ORDERED that Veris Consulting, Inc. is granted leave to file its responsive pleadings through and including 6/29/2012. This Order is entered nunc pro tunc to 5/25/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 6/4/2012. (rban, ) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
        Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Veris Consulting, Inc.. (Briody, James) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
          Memorandum in Support re 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings filed by Veris Consulting, Inc.. (Briody, James) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Veris Consulting, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Joint Consent Order)(Briody, James) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER denying without prejudice 5 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 5/29/2012. (rban, ) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Veris Consulting, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Consent Order)(Briody, James) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
                  SUMMONS Returned Executed Veris Consulting, Inc. served on 5/4/2012, answer due 5/25/2012. (jlan) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                    Summons Issued for service by SPS as to Veris Consulting, Inc. (jlan) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                      Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Project Paperless, LLC. (jlan) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                        COMPLAINT against Veris Consulting, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 24683015188), filed by Project Paperless, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Letter, # 5 Receipt)(jlan) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 511 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?