McGuire v. Dendreon Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:07-cv-00800
District Judge Marsha J. Pechman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hailan Hu, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lynn Lincoln Sarko +1 202 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384

Toggle Switch Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Juli E. Farris +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 jfarris@kellerrohrback.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jordan Connors +1 206 516 3814 +1 206 516 3883 jconnors@susmangodfrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Drew Derrick Hansen +1 206 516 3880 +1 206 516 3883 dhansen@susmangodfrey.com
No Logo Hal Schonfield, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clifford Allen Cantor +1 425 868 7813 +1 425 868 7870 cliff.cantor@outlook.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Federman & Sherwood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Bernard Federman +1 405 235 1560 +1 405 239 2112 wbf@federmanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jordan Connors +1 206 516 3814 +1 206 516 3883 jconnors@susmangodfrey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Drew Derrick Hansen +1 206 516 3880 +1 206 516 3883 dhansen@susmangodfrey.com
General Electric Company General Electric Company, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "John McDevitt"
Unknown Role, Genpact Ltd.
Unknown Role, Gei, Inc.
Unknown Role, Sportstech, Inc.
Unknown Role, Superior Essex Inc.
Unknown Role, Genicom Corp
Unknown Role, Imatron Inc.
Unknown Role, Regal Beloit Corp
Unknown Role, Lockheed Martin Corp
Unknown Role, Lunar Corp
Unknown Role, Mecon Inc
Unknown Role, Positron Corp
Unknown Role, GE India Ventures LLC
Unknown Role, Townsquare Media, LLC
Unknown Role, Antares Capital Corp
Unknown Role, Bear Newco, Inc.
Unknown Role, Gopivotal, Inc.
Unknown Role, GRAND UNION CO /DE/
Unknown Role, Xoom, Inc.
Unknown Role, Plug Power, Inc.
Unknown Role, Hpsc, Inc.
Unknown Role, Ionics, Inc.
Unknown Role, Idx Systems Corp
Unknown Role, iVillage, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jordan Connors +1 206 516 3814 +1 206 516 3883 jconnors@susmangodfrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Drew Derrick Hansen +1 206 516 3880 +1 206 516 3883 dhansen@susmangodfrey.com
No Logo Kenneth McGuire, Plaintiff

Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

No Logo Leslie Frederick, Plaintiff

Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

No Logo Michael Janus, Plaintiff

Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

No Logo Regina Odian, Plaintiff

Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

No Logo Robert Kirk Odian, Plaintiff

Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

No Logo Ronald Cotton, Plaintiff

Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

No Logo George Group,, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Juli E. Farris +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 jfarris@kellerrohrback.com
No Logo Parviz Valandani, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/28/2010 Daniel B Scotti

Toggle Switch Represented by Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dan Drachler +1 206 223 2053 +1 206 343 9636 ddrachler@zsz.com
No Logo Thomas M. Levett, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Juli E. Farris +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 jfarris@kellerrohrback.com
v.
No Logo Bogdan Dziurzynski, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas W. Greene +1 206 883 2500 +1 206 883 2699 dgreene@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry M. Kaplan +1 206 883 2500 +1 206 883 2699 bkaplan@wsgr.com
No Logo David Urdal, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Inessa Baram-Blackwell +1 206 883 2505 ibaramblackwell@wsgr.com
TERMINATED: 08/09/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Loebs Davis +1 206 883 2540 cldavis@wsgr.com
TERMINATED: 08/09/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas W. Greene +1 206 883 2500 +1 206 883 2699 dgreene@wsgr.com
TERMINATED: 08/09/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry M. Kaplan +1 206 883 2500 +1 206 883 2699 bkaplan@wsgr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarmuth Wilsdon PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard C. Yarmuth +1 206 516 3800 +1 206 516 3888
No Logo Dendreon Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Britton F Davis +1 206 883 2553 britton.davis@hoganlovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Inessa Baram-Blackwell +1 206 883 2505 ibaramblackwell@wsgr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Loebs Davis +1 206 883 2540 cldavis@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas W. Greene +1 206 883 2500 +1 206 883 2699 dgreene@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry M. Kaplan +1 206 883 2500 +1 206 883 2699 bkaplan@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Wagner Turbow +1 650 493 9300 dturbow@wsgr.com
No Logo Gregory Shiffman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas W. Greene +1 206 883 2500 +1 206 883 2699 dgreene@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry M. Kaplan +1 206 883 2500 +1 206 883 2699 bkaplan@wsgr.com
No Logo Mitchell H Gold, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/06/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Britton F Davis +1 206 883 2553 britton.davis@hoganlovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MCNAUL, EBEL, NAWROT, HELGREN & VANCE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Malaika M Eaton +1 206 467 1816 meaton@mcnaul.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M Sulkin +1 206 467 1816 +1624512 +16 624 5128 rsulkin@mcnaul.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/06/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Loebs Davis +1 206 883 2540 cldavis@wsgr.com
TERMINATED: 07/06/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas W. Greene +1 206 883 2500 +1 206 883 2699 dgreene@wsgr.com
TERMINATED: 07/06/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry M. Kaplan +1 206 883 2500 +1 206 883 2699 bkaplan@wsgr.com
No Logo Richard Hamm, Jr, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas W. Greene +1 206 883 2500 +1 206 883 2699 dgreene@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry M. Kaplan +1 206 883 2500 +1 206 883 2699 bkaplan@wsgr.com
No Logo Ruth Kunath, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas W. Greene +1 206 883 2500 +1 206 883 2699 dgreene@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry M. Kaplan +1 206 883 2500 +1 206 883 2699 bkaplan@wsgr.com
No Logo James Rye, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Federman & Sherwood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Bernard Federman +1 405 235 1560 +1 405 239 2112 wbf@federmanlaw.com
No Logo McGuire Group, Movant
No Logo Peter Mountanos, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Federman & Sherwood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Bernard Federman +1 405 235 1560 +1 405 239 2112 wbf@federmanlaw.com
No Logo William Mountanos, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clifford Allen Cantor +1 425 868 7813 +1 425 868 7870 cliff.cantor@outlook.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Federman & Sherwood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Bernard Federman +1 405 235 1560 +1 405 239 2112 wbf@federmanlaw.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (223) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 246 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 243 Motion for Disbursement of Funds, signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(SC)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
    DECLARATION of David Wilczynski filed by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire re 220 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses and Class Representative Costs (Shih, Daniel) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
      DECLARATION of Kenneth McGuire filed by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire re 220 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses and Class Representative Costs (Shih, Daniel) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
        DECLARATION of Marc M. Seltzer filed by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire re 220 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses and Class Representative Costs (Shih, Daniel) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
          MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses and Class Representative Costs by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B) Noting Date 12/17/2010, (Shih, Daniel) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document - EXHIBITS A-1, A-2, A-3 ADDED TO DKT NO. re 218 Order on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement (Service of corrected image is attached). (MD) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 213 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement: Settlement Hearing set for 12/17/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(SC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2010: # 1 Exhibit A-1, A-2, A-3) (MD). (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER granting 216 Motion to Unseal Document ; clerk directed to unseal Pltfs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 185 by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RS) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
                  Agreed MOTION to Unseal Document 185 Sealed Document, filed by Kenneth McGuire (Stipulation to Unseal Document) by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/26/2010, (Shih, Daniel) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
                    DECLARATION of Michael Joaquin filed by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire re 213 Agreed MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Approval of Notice (Shih, Daniel) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
                      DECLARATION of Marc M. Seltzer filed by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire re 213 Agreed MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Approval of Notice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Stipulation of Settlement), # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Shih, Daniel) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
                        Agreed MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Approval of Notice by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/25/2010, (Shih, Daniel) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER RE: DEADLINE FOR SUBMISSION OF SETTLEMENT DOCUMENTS granting 211 Stipulated Motion by Judge Marsha J. Pechman; Deadline for filing settlement documents is extended to 10/25/10. (TF) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
                            Stipulated MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR SUBMISSION OF SETTLEMENT PAPERS by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold, David Urdal, Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/20/2010, (Connors, Jordan) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                              MINUTE ORDER striking trial date and giving the parties until 10/20/2010 to file settlement documents. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                MINUTE ORDER vacating order of dismissal entered 9/17/2010 (Dkt. No. 207). The trial date of 10/18/2010 is reinstated and will remain until the parties make a formal motion for dismissal of case. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re 185 Sealed Document, ; filed by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Authority)(Shih, Daniel) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting 203 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for deft Dr. David Urdal. Attorney Barry M Kaplan; Claire Loebs Davis and Douglas W Greene terminated; by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Richard C Yarmuth on behalf of Defendant David Urdal. (Yarmuth, Richard) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                          MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Unopposed) and Proposed Order by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal. Noting Date 8/6/2010, (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting 184 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal documents pursuant to Protective Order and Local Civil Rule 5(g), by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER re: Notice and summary notice of pendency of class action by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER re: briefing schedule and noting date on Defendants' motion to seal; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SC) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 7/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                  EXHIBIT 75-76 re 195 Declaration by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold, David Urdal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 77A, # 2 Exhibit 77B, # 3 Exhibit 78)(Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 07/31/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 7/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                    EXHIBIT 74A re 195 Declaration by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold, David Urdal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 74B)(Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 07/31/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                      EXHIBIT 56 re 195 Declaration by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold, David Urdal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 57-59, # 2 Exhibit 60-65, # 3 Exhibit 66-73)(Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 07/31/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 7/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                        EXHIBIT 34-54 re 195 Declaration by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold, David Urdal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 55)(Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 07/31/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                          Supplemental DECLARATION of Claire L. Davis filed by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold, David Urdal re 164 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 07/31/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                            REPLY, filed by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold, David Urdal, TO RESPONSE to 164 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Sealed Legal Document 193 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit D70 to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 164 by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire re 184 MOTION to Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Shih, Daniel) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER RE: Joint Request for Continuation of Settlement Conference per 39.1 (C)(2) Granting 190 Stipulated Motion; Date for completion of a settlement conference is continued to 8/20/2010 by Judge James L. Robart.(TF) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding the Parties' Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Seal by parties. (Nefouse, Louis) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    Stipulated MOTION FOR CONTINUATION OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PER CR 39.1(C)(2) by Plaintiffs Ronald Cotton, Leslie Frederick, Hailan Hu, Michael Janus, John McDevitt, Kenneth McGuire, Regina Odian, Robert Kirk Odian, Hal Schonfield, Defendants Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold, David Urdal. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/22/2010, (Hansen, Drew) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 189 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit E1 to E6 to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 164 by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire re 184 MOTION to Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F1 to F3)(Shih, Daniel) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 188 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit D64 to D70 to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 164 by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire re 184 MOTION to Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D79 to D91, # 2 Exhibit D103, # 3 Exhibit D104 to D129, # 4 Exhibit D136 to D141, # 5 Exhibit D161 to D213, # 6 Exhibit D218 to D365, # 7 Exhibit D630)(Shih, Daniel) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 187 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit B1 to B11 to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 164 by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire re 184 MOTION to Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C1 to C6, # 2 Exhibit C7, # 3 Exhibit C8 to C10, # 4 Exhibit C11, # 5 Exhibit C12)(Shih, Daniel) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            EXHIBIT A1 to A8 re 185 Sealed Document, by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James T. O'Reilly, # 2 Declaration of Richard A. Shupack)(Shih, Daniel) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 185 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 164 by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire re 184 MOTION to Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel J. Shih)(Shih, Daniel) Modified on 10/28/2010 to unseal document per MJP Order (RS). (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION to Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/30/2010, (Shih, Daniel) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER Granting 181 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Withdraw as attys of record for deft Dr Mitchell Gold by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(TF) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER re: NOTICE AND SUMMARY NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF CLASS ACTION by parties. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Carole K. Sylvester)(Shih, Daniel) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Unopposed) and Proposed Order by Defendant Mitchell H Gold. Noting Date 7/13/2010, (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Malaika M Eaton on behalf of Defendant Mitchell H Gold. (Eaton, Malaika) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert M Sulkin on behalf of Defendant Mitchell H Gold. (Sulkin, Robert) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTE: Document 177 was filed incorrectly. The status of attorneys in this case remains the same until such time as the filer complies with the General Rule 2(g)(2)(B) which states that -Where there has simply been a change or addition of counsel within the same law firm, an order of substitution is not required; the new attorney will file a Notice of Appearance and the withdrawing attorney will file a Notice of Withdrawal. However, where there is a change in counsel that effects a termination of one law office and the appearance of a new law office, the substitution must be effected in accordance with subsection (4)(A), which requires leave of court. (HBR) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Douglas W Greene; Barry M Kaplan; Britton F Davis and Claire Loebs Davis for Defendant Mitchell H Gold. (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                EXHIBIT 46 through 53 re 169 Declaration by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold. (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  EXHIBIT 37 through 45 re 169 Declaration by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold. (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    EXHIBIT 34 through 36 re 169 Declaration by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold. (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      EXHIBIT 12 through 33 re 169 Declaration by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold. (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                        EXHIBIT 9 through 11 re 169 Declaration by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold. (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          EXHIBIT 5 through 8 re 169 Declaration by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold. (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            EXHIBIT 1 through 4 re 169 Declaration by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold. (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 169 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Claire L. Davis filed by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold re 164 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 168 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                DECLARATION of David Urdal filed by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold re 164 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 167 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Elizabeth Smith filed by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold re 164 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 166 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Mary Coon filed by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold re 164 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 165 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Ernest Bognar filed by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold re 164 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 164 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/30/2010, (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER re: Briefing Schedule and Page Limitations on the Parties' Motion for Summary Judgment; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SC) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER re Motion for Summary Judgment briefing schedule and page limitations by parties re 125 Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates,,,. (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER: The parties are permitted to submit rebuttal expert reports on or before 6/4/10 at 5 p.m. PDT and will be permitted to conduct expert depositions by not later 6/21/10; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SC) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting (137) Motion to Certify Class in case 2:07-cv-00800-MJP; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(SC) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Rebuttal Expert Reports and Expert Depositions by parties. (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jordan Connors on behalf of Plaintiffs Kenneth McGuire, Leslie Frederick, Robert Kirk Odian, Regina Odian, Ronald Cotton, Michael Janus, Hailan Hu, John McDevitt, Hal Schonfield. (Connors, Jordan) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 157 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of DANIEL J. SHIH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire re 137 MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C)(Kirkpatrick, Ryan) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 156 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire, TO RESPONSE to 137 MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (Kirkpatrick, Ryan) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 150 Defendants' Motion to Seal pleadings and other documents pursuant to protective order and Local Civil Rule 5(g) by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (Unsealed Dkt No. 151 & 152) (MD) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting (153) Stipulated Motion re: Extension of Deadline for Expert Disclosures; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(SC) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Stipulated MOTION Regarding Extension of Deadline for Expert Disclosures by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Shih, Daniel) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                UNSEALED DOCUMENT PER ORDER DATED 3/16/10 SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of L. David Nefouse in Support of Opposition to Motion for Class Certification by Defendants David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold re 150 MOTION to Seal Opposition to Motion for Class Certification (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Kaplan, Barry) Modified text on 3/16/2010 (MD). (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  UNSEALED PER ORDER DATED 3/16/10SEALED DOCUMENT Opposition to Motion for Class Certification by Defendants David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold re 150 MOTION to Seal Opposition to Motion for Class Certification (Kaplan, Barry) Modified text on 3/16/2010 (MD). (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Opposition to Motion for Class Certification by Defendants David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/12/2010, (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 147 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Louis David Nefouse for Dendreon Corporation,et al by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re 146 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Bahram Seyedin-Noor for Dendreon Corporation,et al by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Louis David Nefouse FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 09810000000001976570. (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Registration Form)(Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Bahram Seyedin-Noor FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 09810000000001976532. (Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SC) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER re Protective Order by parties. (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying (133) Motion for Relief from Scheduling Order; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(SC) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Daniel W. Turbow ISO Motion for Partial Relief from Scheduling Order filed by Defendants David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold re 133 MOTION for Relief (Partial) from Scheduling Orders and Continuing Trial and Certain Pre-Trial Dates and Request for Expedited Status Conference MOTION for Relief (Partial) from Scheduling Orders and Continuing Trial and Certain Pre-Trial Dates and Request for Expedited Status Conference (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY, filed by Defendants David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold, TO RESPONSE to 133 MOTION for Relief (Partial) from Scheduling Orders and Continuing Trial and Certain Pre-Trial Dates and Request for Expedited Status Conference MOTION for Relief (Partial) from Scheduling Orders and Continuing Trial and Certain Pre-Trial Dates and Request for Expedited Status Conference (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of DAVID WILCZYNSKI IN SUPPORT OF THE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire re 137 MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (Seltzer, Marc) (Entered: 01/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of KENNETH MCGUIRE IN SUPPORT OF THE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire re 137 MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (Seltzer, Marc) (Entered: 01/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 138 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of MARC M. SELTZER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire re 137 MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Expert Report of Bjorn I. Steinholt, CFA, # 2 Exhibit B - Firm Biography of Marc M. Seltzer)(Seltzer, Marc) (Entered: 01/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 137 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification) Noting Date 3/17/2010, (Seltzer, Marc) (Entered: 01/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Ryan C. Kirkpatrick filed by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire re (133 in 2:07-cv-00800-MJP) MOTION for Relief (Partial) from Scheduling Orders and Continuing Trial and Certain Pre-Trial Dates and Request for Expedited Status Conference MOTION for Relief (Partial) from Scheduling Orders and Continuing Trial and Certain Pre-Trial Dates and Request for Expedited Status Conference (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Shih, Daniel) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire, to (133 in 2:07-cv-00800-MJP) MOTION for Relief (Partial) from Scheduling Orders and Continuing Trial and Certain Pre-Trial Dates and Request for Expedited Status Conference MOTION for Relief (Partial) from Scheduling Orders and Continuing Trial and Certain Pre-Trial Dates and Request for Expedited Status Conference. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Shih, Daniel) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Elizabeth C. Smith filed by Defendants David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold re 133 MOTION for Relief (Partial) from Scheduling Orders and Continuing Trial and Certain Pre-Trial Dates and Request for Expedited Status Conference MOTION for Relief (Partial) from Scheduling Orders and Continuing Trial and Certain Pre-Trial Dates and Request for Expedited Status Conference (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 01/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Relief (Partial) from Scheduling Orders and Continuing Trial and Certain Pre-Trial Dates and Request for Expedited Status Conference by Defendants David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/15/2010, (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 01/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re 131 in 2:07-cv-00800-MJP: Stipulation re revised briefing schedule for class certification motion. Pltfs' motion shall be filed on 1/14/10, Defs' opposition is due on 2/19/10 and Pltfs' reply shall be filed on 3/17/10; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SC) (Entered: 12/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RENEWED STIPULATED MOTION REGARDING EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE THEREON by parties. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Extension of Deadline to File Motion for Class Certification and Setting Briefing Schedule Thereon)(Seltzer, Marc) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re Stipulation Regarding Extension of Deadline to File Motion for Class Certification (Dkt No. 129 in 2:07-cv-00800-MJP): the request is DENIED without prejudice to bring a renewed motion which cures defects noted in the order; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SC) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE THEREON by parties. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Extension of Deadline to File Motion for Class Certification and Setting Briefing Schedule Thereon)(Seltzer, Marc) (Entered: 12/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel J Shih on behalf of Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire. (Shih, Daniel) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re 126 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Daniel W Turbow for Dendreon Corporation, by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Daniel W. Turbow FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 09810000000001893925. (Attachments: # 1 ECF Attachment)(Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *10 day* Jury Trial is set for 10/18/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Joinder of Parties due by 9/2/2009, Amended Pleadings due by 9/14/2009, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/22/2010, Motions due by 4/21/2010, Discovery completed by 5/21/2010, Dispositive motions due by 6/21/2010, Settlement conference to be held by 8/19/2010, 39.1 Settlement Report due by 9/20/2010, Motions in Limine due by 9/20/2010, Pretrial Order due by 10/6/2010, Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Trial briefs to be submitted by 10/13/2010, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 10/13/2010, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 10.. (Seltzer, Marc) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 118 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold.(Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 07/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER: Defendants' answer to the Third Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than July 6, 2009; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SC) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RE: EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by parties re 118 Amended Complaint. (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 06/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney John McMakin Neukom for Plaintiffs Kenneth McGuire, Leslie Frederick, Robert Kirk Odian, Regina Odian, Ronald Cotton, Michael Janus. (Hansen, Drew) (Entered: 06/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 7/29/2009, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/15/2009, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/22/2009, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM) (Entered: 06/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Third AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS against defendant(s) Dendreon Corporation(a Delaware Corporation), David Urdal, Mitchell H Gold with JURY DEMAND, filed by Kenneth McGuire.(Seltzer, Marc) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 116 Order on Motion to Dismiss The Second Amended Complaint. (Service of corrected image is attached). (MD) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part (105) Motion to Dismiss 2nd Amended Complaint; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(SC) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by Movant William Mountanos re 114 Notice of Related Case. (Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Related Case(s) 09-426-RAJ, by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 04/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Rebecca A Mitchells for Defendants Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold. (Mitchells, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting (106) Defendant's Motion for Relief from JSR/Initial Discovery requirements; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(SC) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY, filed by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold, TO RESPONSE to 105 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY, filed by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold, TO RESPONSE to 106 MOTION for Relief from Order re Initial Disclosures, Joint Status Report, and Early Settlement (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire, to 106 MOTION for Relief from Order re Initial Disclosures, Joint Status Report, and Early Settlement. (Seltzer, Marc) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of RYAN C. KIRKPATRICK IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire re 105 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Seltzer, Marc) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire, to 105 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint. (Seltzer, Marc) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Relief from Order re Initial Disclosures, Joint Status Report, and Early Settlement by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/17/2009, (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 02/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/20/2009, (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEADLINE FOR RESPONDING TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; Dfts' response to the Second Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than 2/3/09, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (VP) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DEADLINE FOR RESPONDING TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by parties. (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 2/17/2009, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/2/2009, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/10/2009; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SC) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Second AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS against defendant(s) all defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Kenneth McGuire. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Seltzer, Marc) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part (86) Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint in case 2:07-cv-00800MJP; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SC) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman- Dep Clerk: Rhonda Miller; Pla Counsel: Marc Seltzer, Ryan Kirkpatrick; Def Counsel: Barry Kaplan, Douglas Greene, Claire Davis; CR: Barry Fanning; Motion Hearing held on 11/25/2008 86 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Gregory Shiffman, Richard Hamm, Jr, Ruth Kunath, David Urdal, Mitchell H Gold, Dendreon Corporation, Bogdan Dziurzynski. Court hears oral argument. Written decision to be issued on or before 12/6/2008.(RM) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire re 96 Request LEAD PLAINTIFF KENNETH McGUIRE'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF THEIR REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. (Seltzer, Marc) (Entered: 08/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supplemental DECLARATION of Douglas W. Greene filed by Defendants David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold re 86 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit R, # 2 Exhibit S, # 3 Exhibit T, # 4 Exhibit U)(Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST by Defendants David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold for Judicial Notice re 94 Reply to Response to Motion. (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by Defendants David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold to 92 Response (non motion), Response (non motion) to Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Dismiss. (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY, filed by Defendants David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold, TO RESPONSE to 86 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Errata to Lead Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire's Opposition to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice re 92 Response (non motion), Response (non motion) ; filed by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire. (Kirkpatrick, Ryan) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire re 87 Request Lead Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire's Opposition to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (Seltzer, Marc) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire, to 86 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint. Oral Argument Requested. (Seltzer, Marc) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER re: Scheduling and Administrative matters. The Order entered June 25, 2008 is vacated. All discovery, including FRCP 26 initial disclosures, is stayed until the Court issues an order deciding defendants' pending motion to dismiss the First Amended Complaint and has determined the legal sufficiency of plaintiffs' claims re (89 in 2:07-cv-00800-MJP) Stipulation filed by David Urdal, Mitchell H Gold, Dendreon Corporation by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD) (Entered: 07/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Re Scheduling and Administrative Matters by parties. (Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Douglas W. Greene filed by Defendants David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold re 86 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q)(Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST by Defendants David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold for Judicial Notice re 86 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint. (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint by Defendants David Urdal, Richard Hamm, Jr, Gregory Shiffman, Bogdan Dziurzynski, Ruth Kunath, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/22/2008; (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER re: 83 in 2:07-cv-00800-MJP -- Stipulation filed by Gregory Shiffman, Richard Hamm, Jr, Ruth Kunath, David Urdal, Mitchell H Gold, Dendreon Corporation, Bogdan Dziurzynski. Request for extension of briefing schedule for Amended Complaint is DENIED. Signed by Docket Clerk M Duett at the direction of Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SC) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 8/6/2008; FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/23/2008; Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/30/2008; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SC) Modified on 6/26/2008 -mailed copy of order to ATTORNEYS Lionel Glancy;Michael Goldberg;Howard Smith along with registration form for Electrtonic Filing (MD). (Entered: 06/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR AMENDED COMPLAINT by parties. (Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 06/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS against defendant(s) David Urdal, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold with JURY DEMAND, filed by Kenneth McGuire.(Seltzer, Marc) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of held on 3/27/2008 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman.Parties have ten (10) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript contact court reporter Laurene Kelly by telephone at 206-370-8506. . Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/26/2008; (SA, ) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR AMENDED COMPLAINT- re 79 Stipulation filed by Gregory Shiffman, Richard Hamm, Jr, Ruth Kunath, David Urdal, Mitchell H Gold, Dendreon Corporation, Bogdan Dziurzynski by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD, ) (Entered: 05/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR AMENDED COMPLAINT by parties. (Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 55 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs are granted leave to amend their Complaint within 30 days of this order. by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(DMN) (Entered: 04/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman - Dep Clerk: Eileen Scollard; Pla Counsel: Marc Seltzer/Ryan Kirkpatrick; Def Counsel: Barry Kaplan/Doug Greene/Claire Davis; CR: Laurene Kelly; Time of Hearing: 4:00 p.m.; Motion Hearing held on 3/28/2008 re 55 MOTION to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint filed by Gregory Shiffman, Richard Hamm, Jr, Ruth Kunath, David Urdal, Mitchell H Gold, Dendreon Corporation, Bogdan Dziurzynski. Counsel present argument to the court. The court will issue a written decision in about 10 business days. (ES) (Entered: 03/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY, filed by Defendants David Urdal, Richard Hamm, Jr, Gregory Shiffman, Bogdan Dziurzynski, Ruth Kunath, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold, TO RESPONSE to 55 MOTION to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint (Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 02/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER re 55 MOTION to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint filed by Gregory Shiffman, Richard Hamm, Jr, Ruth Kunath, David Urdal, Mitchell H Gold, Dendreon Corporation, Bogdan Dziurzynski. In-court Hearing set for 3/27/2008 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 14206 before Hon. Marsha J. Pechman. (ADO) (Entered: 02/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 71 Order on Motion to Disqualify. (Service of corrected image is attached). (MD, ) (Entered: 02/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire re 69 Request for Judicial Notice by Defendants in Support of their Reply Brief (CORRECTED FILING). (Kirkpatrick, Ryan) (Entered: 02/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire re 69 Request for Judicial Notice ISO Defendants' Reply. (Kirkpatrick, Ryan) (Entered: 02/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 51 Motion to Disqualify Lead Plaintiff by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MJPExtern, ) (Entered: 02/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal, Richard Hamm, Jr, Gregory Shiffman, Bogdan Dziurzynski, Ruth Kunath, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold to 62 Response to Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss. (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal, Richard Hamm, Jr, Gregory Shiffman, Bogdan Dziurzynski, Ruth Kunath, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold for Judicial Notice re 67 Reply to Response to Motion,. (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental DECLARATION of Douglas W. Greene filed by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal, Richard Hamm, Jr, Gregory Shiffman, Bogdan Dziurzynski, Ruth Kunath, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold re 55 MOTION to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Q# 2 Exhibit R# 3 Exhibit S# 4 Exhibit T# 5 Exhibit U)(Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY, filed by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal, Richard Hamm, Jr, Gregory Shiffman, Bogdan Dziurzynski, Ruth Kunath, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold, TO RESPONSE to 55 MOTION to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney William P Brewer for Defendants Dendreon Corporation, Dendreon Corporation. (Brewer, William) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman - Dep Clerk: Eileen Scollard; Pla Counsel: Mark Seltzer, et al; Def Counsel: Doug Green; CR: Susan Zielie; Time of Hearing: 45 mins; Motion Hearing held on 2/7/08 re 51 MOTION to Disqualify filed by William Mountanos, Peter Mountanos. Court hears argument and denies motion. (ES) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 51 MOTION to Disqualify : Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Hon. Marsha J. Pechman. Signed by Docket Clerk M. Duett at the direction of Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MJPExtern, ) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire re 61 Response to Motion, 62 Response to Request for Judicial Notice. (Kirkpatrick, Ryan) (Entered: 01/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire re 56 Request, for Judicial Notice. (Kirkpatrick, Ryan) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire, to 55 MOTION to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint. Oral Argument Requested. (Kirkpatrick, Ryan) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY, filed by Movants William Mountanos, Peter Mountanos, TO RESPONSE to 51 MOTION to Disqualify (Federman, William) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Kenneth McGuire in Opposition to the Mountanos Group's 51 MOTION to Disqualify (Seltzer, Marc) Modified on 1/2/2008 (ECS, ). (Entered: 12/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire, to 51 MOTION to Disqualify. (Seltzer, Marc) (Entered: 12/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Douglas W. Greene filed by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal, Richard Hamm, Jr, Gregory Shiffman, Bogdan Dziurzynski, Ruth Kunath, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold re 55 MOTION to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O# 16 Exhibit P)(Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal, Richard Hamm, Jr, Gregory Shiffman, Bogdan Dziurzynski, Ruth Kunath, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold for Judicial Notice re 55 MOTION to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint. (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal, Richard Hamm, Jr, Gregory Shiffman, Bogdan Dziurzynski, Ruth Kunath, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order re Motion to Dismiss)Noting Date 2/8/2008.(Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to FRCP 7.1. (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman - Dep Clerk: Steven Crozier; Pla Counsel: Marc Seltzer, Ryan Kirkpatrick; Def Counsel: Barry Kaplan, Doug Greene; CR: Joe Roth; Time of Hearing: 2:30 p.m.; Telephone Conference held on 12/19/2007 to discuss stay on pending motion to dismiss. The Court determined that the motion to dismiss should go forward as presently scheduled. (SC, ) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Chambers of Motion Relating to December 19, 2007 Status Conference re 51 MOTION to Disqualify ; filed by Movants William Mountanos, Peter Mountanos. (Federman, William) (Entered: 12/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Disqualify by Movants William Mountanos, Peter Mountanos. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Proposed Order)Noting Date 1/4/2008.(Federman, William) (Entered: 12/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER Telephone Conference set for 12/19/2007 at 02:30 PM before Hon. Marsha J. Pechman re: 48 MOTION Re Status Conference and/or Adjustment of Motion to Dismiss Schedule filed by Gregory Shiffman, Richard Hamm, Jr, Ruth Kunath, David Urdal, Mitchell H Gold, Dendreon Corporation, Bogdan Dziurzynski & 49 Response to Motion. Signed by Docket Clerk M Duett at the direction of Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SC, ) (Entered: 12/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Kenneth McGuire, to 48 MOTION for Relief Re Status Conference and/or Adjustment of Motion to Dismiss Schedule. (Seltzer, Marc) (Entered: 12/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Relief Re Status Conference and/or Adjustment of Motion to Dismiss Schedule by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal, Richard Hamm, Jr, Gregory Shiffman, Bogdan Dziurzynski, Ruth Kunath, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold. Noting Date 12/20/2007.(Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 12/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COURT'S ORDER RE: DISCOVERY, INITIAL CONFERENCE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE re VACATING COURT'S ORDER OF OCTOBER 5, 2007 - 41 Minute Order, Set Deadlines AND SETTING NEW DEADLINES by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD, ) (Entered: 12/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Re Discovery, Initial Conference, and Briefing Schedule by parties. (Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 11/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RE DISCOVERY AND INITIAL CONFERENCE by parties. (Greene, Douglas) Modified text on 11/5/2007 (MD, ). (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Rebecca A. Mitchells FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal, Richard Hamm, Jr, Gregory Shiffman, Bogdan Dziurzynski, Ruth Kunath, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold by Rebecca A Mitchells. (Receipt No. 1280221). (MD, mailed attorney Mitchells registration form for Electronic filing and copy of order) (Entered: 11/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Rebecca A. Mitchells FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Dendreon Corporation, David Urdal, Richard Hamm, Jr, Gregory Shiffman, Bogdan Dziurzynski, Ruth Kunath, Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 1280221. (Brewer, William) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 37 Motion to Compel by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(ADO) (Entered: 10/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/22/2007.,Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/29/2007.,Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 11/5/2007by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD, ) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER to Consolidate with member cases C07-869MJP; C07-870MJP and C07-898MJP and Designate Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. Counsel are directed to file documents in LEAD CASE C07-800MJP. RE: 17 MOTION to Appoint William Mountanos, Peter Mountanos and James Rye Lead Plaintiff, To Consolidate Related Actions, and to Approve Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Lead Plaintiff and Liaison Counsel filed by William Mountanos, James Rye, Peter Mountanos, 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Movants' Selection of Lead Cousnel filed by Hal Schonfield, 8 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff, Consolidate Actions and Appoint Lead Counsel filed by Parviz Valandani, 20 MOTION to Appoint the George Group as Lead Plaintiff and for Appointment of Lead Counsel filed by George Group, 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by George Group, 13 MOTION to Appoint Thomas M. Levett as Lead Plaintiff and for Appointment of Lead Counsel filed by Thomas M. Levett, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD, ) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE, by Petitioner Thomas M. Levett, to 37 MOTION to Compel discovery of proposed lead plaintiff Kenneth McGuire. (Willey, Stephen) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE, by Movant McGuire Group, to 37 MOTION to Compel discovery of proposed lead plaintiff Kenneth McGuire. (Hansen, Drew) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *10 day* Jury Trial is set for 10/18/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Joinder of Parties due by 9/2/2009, Amended Pleadings due by 9/14/2009, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/22/2010, Motions due by 4/21/2010, Discovery completed by 5/21/2010, Dispositive motions due by 6/21/2010, Settlement conference to be held by 8/19/2010, 39.1 Settlement Report due by 9/20/2010, Motions in Limine due by 9/20/2010, Pretrial Order due by 10/6/2010, Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Trial briefs to be submitted by 10/13/2010, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 10/13/2010, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 35 Minute Order, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,. (Service of corrected image is attached). (MD, ) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER - Court Strikes 7 Joint Status Report Order and the Court will reissue an order regarding initial discovery and the submission of a Joint Status Report 30 days following the ruling on motions to appoint a lead plaintiff, consolidated all related cases, and Defendants' motion to dismiss the complaint,by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2007 (MD, ). (Entered: 09/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY, filed by Movant William Mountanos, TO RESPONSE to 17 MOTION to Appoint William Mountanos, Peter Mountanos and James Rye Lead Plaintiff, To Consolidate Related Actions, and to Approve Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Lead Plaintiff and Liaison Counsel (Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Kenneth McGuire filed by Movant McGuire Group re 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Movants' Selection of Lead Cousnel (Hansen, Drew) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY, filed by Movant McGuire Group, TO RESPONSE to 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Movants' Selection of Lead Cousnel (Hansen, Drew) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT of Position Regarding The Court's July 16, 2007 Discovery Deadlines by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold. (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE, by Petitioner Thomas M. Levett, to 13 MOTION to Appoint Thomas M. Levett as Lead Plaintiff and for Appointment of Lead Counsel. (Willey, Stephen) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Stephen C. Willey filed by Petitioner Thomas M. Levett re 17 MOTION to Appoint William Mountanos, Peter Mountanos and James Rye Lead Plaintiff, To Consolidate Related Actions, and to Approve Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Lead Plaintiff and Liaison Counsel, 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Movants' Selection of Lead Cousnel, 8 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff, Consolidate Actions and Appoint Lead Counsel, 20 MOTION to Appoint the George Group as Lead Plaintiff and for Appointment of Lead Counsel (Willey, Stephen) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE, by Petitioner Thomas M. Levett, to 17 MOTION to Appoint William Mountanos, Peter Mountanos and James Rye Lead Plaintiff, To Consolidate Related Actions, and to Approve Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Lead Plaintiff and Liaison Counsel, 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Movants' Selection of Lead Cousnel, 8 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff, Consolidate Actions and Appoint Lead Counsel, 20 MOTION to Appoint the George Group as Lead Plaintiff and for Appointment of Lead Counsel. (Willey, Stephen) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE, by Defendants Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold, to 17 MOTION to Appoint William Mountanos, Peter Mountanos and James Rye Lead Plaintiff, To Consolidate Related Actions, and to Approve Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Lead Plaintiff and Liaison Counsel, 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Movants' Selection of Lead Cousnel, 8 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff, Consolidate Actions and Appoint Lead Counsel, 20 MOTION to Appoint the George Group as Lead Plaintiff and for Appointment of Lead Counsel, 18 MOTION to Appoint the Kahsay Group as Lead Plaintiff, 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 13 MOTION to Appoint Thomas M. Levett as Lead Plaintiff and for Appointment of Lead Counsel. (Attachments: # 1)(Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE, by Movant William Mountanos, to 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Movants' Selection of Lead Cousnel, 8 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff, Consolidate Actions and Appoint Lead Counsel, 20 MOTION to Appoint the George Group as Lead Plaintiff and for Appointment of Lead Counsel, 18 MOTION to Appoint the Kahsay Group as Lead Plaintiff, 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 13 MOTION to Appoint Thomas M. Levett as Lead Plaintiff and for Appointment of Lead Counsel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I)(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE, to 17 MOTION to Appoint William Mountanos, Peter Mountanos and James Rye Lead Plaintiff, To Consolidate Related Actions, and to Approve Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Lead Plaintiff and Liaison Counsel, 8 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff, Consolidate Actions and Appoint Lead Counsel, 20 MOTION to Appoint the George Group as Lead Plaintiff and for Appointment of Lead Counsel, 13 MOTION to Appoint Thomas M. Levett as Lead Plaintiff and for Appointment of Lead Counsel. (Hansen, Drew) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re 9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Daniel B Scotti as pro hac vice atty for Petitioner Parviz Valandani, by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.) (CL, ) (Entered: 07/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: submission of documents; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SC, ) (Entered: 07/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Petitioner George Group. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Noting Date 8/10/2007.(Farris, Juli) (Entered: 07/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Juli E. Farris in Support of the 20 MOTION to Appoint the George Group as Lead Plaintiff and for Appointment of Lead Counsel (Farris, Juli) Modified on 7/25/2007 (ECS, ). (Entered: 07/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appoint the George Group as Lead Plaintiff and for Appointment of Lead Counsel (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Noting Date 8/10/2007.(Farris, Juli) (Entered: 07/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DOCUMENT FILED IN WRONG CASE. COUNSEL WILL RE-FILE IN CORRECT CASE DECLARATION of Michael Goldberg filed by Plaintiff Hal Schonfield re 18 MOTION to Appoint the Kahsay Group as Lead Plaintiff (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Barth, Karl) Modified on 7/26/2007 (VB, ). (Entered: 07/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DOCUMENT FILED IN WRONG CASE. COUNSEL WILL RE-FILE IN CORRECT CASE MOTION to Appoint the Kahsay Group as Lead Plaintiff by Plaintiff Hal Schonfield. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Noting Date 8/17/2007.(Barth, Karl) Modified on 7/26/2007 (VB, ). (Entered: 07/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appoint William Mountanos, Peter Mountanos and James Rye Lead Plaintiff, To Consolidate Related Actions, and to Approve Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Lead Plaintiff and Liaison Counsel Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration William B. Federman# 2 Exhibit 2 - [Proposed] Order)Noting Date 8/10/2007.(Federman, William) (Entered: 07/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Marc M. Seltzer in Support of 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Movants' Selection of Lead Cousnel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(Hansen, Drew) Modified on 7/25/2007 (ECS, ). (Entered: 07/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Movants' Selection of Lead Cousnel by Plaintiff Hal Schonfield. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Noting Date 8/10/2007.(Hansen, Drew) (Entered: 07/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Juli E. Farris in Support of 13 MOTION to Appoint Thomas M. Levett as Lead Plaintiff and for Appointment of Lead Counsel (Farris, Juli) Modified on 7/25/2007 (ECS, ). (Entered: 07/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appoint Thomas M. Levett as Lead Plaintiff and for Appointment of Lead Counsel (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Noting Date 8/10/2007.(Farris, Juli) (Entered: 07/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Petitioner Parviz Valandani re 8 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff, Consolidate Actions and Appoint Lead Counsel, 10 Declaration, 11 Declaration. (Drachler, Dan) (Entered: 07/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint DECLARATION of Valandani Group filed by Petitioner Parviz Valandani re 8 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff, Consolidate Actions and Appoint Lead Counsel (Drachler, Dan) (Entered: 07/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Daniel B. Scotti filed by Petitioner Parviz Valandani re 8 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff, Consolidate Actions and Appoint Lead Counsel (Drachler, Dan) (Entered: 07/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Daniel B. Scotti FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Petitioner Parviz Valandani (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 1197479. (Attachments: # 1 ECF Registration)(Drachler, Dan) (Entered: 07/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff, Consolidate Actions and Appoint Lead Counsel Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Noting Date 8/10/2007.(Drachler, Dan) (Entered: 07/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENTJoint Status Report due by 8/27/2007,FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/13/2007,Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/20/2007. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SC, ) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Allison B Waters as pro hac vice atty for Plaintiff Hal Schonfield, by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(MD, ) (Entered: 07/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Allison B. Waters FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Plaintiff Hal Schonfield. (Attachments: # 1)(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 07/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Barry M Kaplan on behalf of Defendants Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold. (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 06/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION by Plaintiff Hal Schonfield AND ORDER admitting William B Federman for Hal Schonfield pro hac vice. Receipt # SEA 9810. (MD, ) (Entered: 06/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Dendreon Corporation on 5/31/2007 (TS, ) (Entered: 06/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT and JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against defendant(s) Dendreon Corporation, Mitchell H Gold (Summons(es) issued)(Receipt # SEA 9626), filed by Hal Schonfield. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Email request to file new case)(PM, ) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 241 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?