Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC v. Best Western Arrowhead Lodge & Suites et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Wisconsin Western District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-00643
District Judge William M. Conley, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 21, 2016 at 4:05 PM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Niro, Scavone, Haller & Niro, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew G. McAndrews +1 312 236 0733 +2363 236 236 3137 mmcandrews@nshn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond Pardo Niro, Jr. +1 312 236 0733 +1 312 236 3137 rnirojr@nshn.com
v.
No Logo Best Western Ambassador Inn & Suites, Defendant
No Logo Best Western American Heritage, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Michael Wejnert +1 312 862 2000 +1 312 862 2200 jwejnert@kirkland.com
No Logo Best Western Arrowhead Lodge & Suites, Defendant
No Logo Best Western Bay Walk Inn, Defendant
No Logo Best Western Bluffview Inn & Suites, Defendant
No Logo Best Western Bridgeview Motor Inn, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Michael Wejnert +1 312 862 2000 +1 312 862 2200 jwejnert@kirkland.com
No Logo Best Western Claridge Motor Inn, Defendant
No Logo Best Western Countryside Inn (Lodi), Defendant
No Logo Best Western Hudson House Inn, Defendant
No Logo Best Western Inn (Rice Lake), Defendant
No Logo Best Western Lake-Aire Motel & Resort, Defendant
No Logo Best Western Midway Hotel (Wausau), Defendant
No Logo Best Western Northwoods Lodge, Defendant
No Logo Best Western Park Oasis Inn, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Michael Wejnert +1 312 862 2000 +1 312 862 2200 jwejnert@kirkland.com
No Logo Best Western Plus East Towne Suites, Defendant
No Logo Best Western Plus Inntowner Hotel and the Highland Club, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Michael Wejnert +1 312 862 2000 +1 312 862 2200 jwejnert@kirkland.com
No Logo Best Western Plus La Crosse, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Michael Wejnert +1 312 862 2000 +1 312 862 2200 jwejnert@kirkland.com
No Logo Best Western Plus Trail Lodge Hotel & Suites, Defendant
No Logo Best Western Quiet House & Suites (Dodgeville), Defendant
No Logo Best Western Resort Hotel & Conference Center Portage, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Michael Wejnert +1 312 862 2000 +1 312 862 2200 jwejnert@kirkland.com
No Logo Best Western Sparta Trail Lodge, Defendant
No Logo Best Western West Towne Suites, Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: None
Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order. Case closed. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi on 1/25/2012. (voc) (Entered: 01/26/2012)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** In light of plaintiff's January 5, 2012 filing in response to the court's order to show cause in case no. 11-cv-466 dkt. 6, the court will not be dismissing this case for failure to prosecute. In light of the MDL Panel's conditional transfer order, see dkt. 6-2 (11-cv-644), the court will take no further action in this lawsuit or in Case No. 11-cv-644 pending further action by the transferee court, the Northern District of Illinois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/6/2012. (voc) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 4 Motion to Admit Jason Wejnert Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/27/2011. (voc) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
        Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order. Case closed. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi on 1/25/2012. (voc)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
          Motion to Admit Jason Wejnert Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 50 receipt number 0758-901325.) by Defendants Best Western American Heritage, Best Western Bridgeview Motor Inn, Best Western Park Oasis Inn, Best Western Plus Inntowner Hotel and the Highland Club, Best Western Plus La Crosse, Best Western Resort Hotel & Conference Center Portage. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Wejnert, Jason) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: 9/19/2011 Summons Issued
            Summons Issued as to Best Western Ambassador Inn & Suites, Best Western American Heritage, Best Western Arrowhead Lodge & Suites, Best Western Bay Walk Inn, Best Western Bluffview Inn & Suites, Best Western Bridgeview Motor Inn, Best Western Claridge Motor Inn, Best Western Countryside Inn (Lodi), Best Western Hudson House Inn, Best Western Inn (Rice Lake), Best Western Lake-Aire Motel & Resort, Best Western Midway Hotel (Wausau), Best Western Northwoods Lodge, Best Western Park Oasis Inn, Best Western Plus East Towne Suites, Best Western Plus Inntowner Hotel and the Highland Club, Best Western Plus La Crosse, Best Western Plus Trail Lodge Hotel & Suites, Best Western Quiet House & Suites (Dodgeville), Best Western Resort Hotel & Conference Center Portage, Best Western Sparta Trail Lodge, Best Western West Towne Suites. (Attachments: # 1 Summons American Heritage, # 2 Summons Bay Walk Inn, # 3 Summons Western Arrowhead, # 4 Summons Quiet House, # 5 Summons Bluffview Inn, # 6 Summons Bridgeview Motor, # 7 Summons Claridge Motor, # 8 Summons Countyside Inn, # 9 Summons Hudson House Inn, # 10 Summons Inn Rice Lake, # 11 Summons Lake-Aire Motel, # 12 Summons Midway Hotel, # 13 Summons Northwoods Lodge, # 14 Summons Park Oasis, # 15 Summons Plus East Town, # 16 Summons Plus Inntowner, # 17 Summons Plus La Cross, # 18 Summons Plus Trail Lodge, # 19 Summons Resort Hotel, # 20 Summons Sparta Trail, # 21 Summons West Town) (voc) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: 9/19/2011 Corporate Disclosure Statement
              Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: 9/19/2011 Complaint
                COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Best Western Ambassador Inn & Suites, Best Western American Heritage, Best Western Arrowhead Lodge & Suites, Best Western Bay Walk Inn, Best Western Bluffview Inn & Suites, Best Western Bridgeview Motor Inn, Best Western Claridge Motor Inn, Best Western Countryside Inn (Lodi), Best Western Hudson House Inn, Best Western Inn (Rice Lake), Best Western Lake-Aire Motel & Resort, Best Western Midway Hotel (Wausau), Best Western Northwoods Lodge, Best Western Park Oasis Inn, Best Western Plus East Towne Suites, Best Western Plus Inntowner Hotel and the Highland Club, Best Western Plus La Crosse, Best Western Plus Trail Lodge Hotel & Suites, Best Western Quiet House & Suites (Dodgeville), Best Western Resort Hotel & Conference Center Portage, Best Western Sparta Trail Lodge, Best Western West Towne Suites. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0758-839127.), filed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US6714559, # 2 Exhibit B - US7386002, # 3 Exhibit C - US7535921, # 4 Exhibit D - US7548553, # 5 Exhibit E - US5740366, # 6 Exhibit F - US5940771, # 7 Exhibit G - US6374311, # 8 Exhibit H - US7457646, # 9 Exhibit I - US5546397, # 10 Exhibit J - US5844893, # 11 Exhibit K - US6665536, # 12 Exhibit L - US6697415, # 13 Exhibit M - US7013138, # 14 Exhibit N - US7710907, # 15 Exhibit O - US7916747, # 16 Exhibit P - US7873343, # 17 Exhibit Q Part 1 - US7536167, # 18 Exhibit Q Part 2 - US7536167, # 19 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, # 20 Summons Best Western Arrowhead Lodge & Suites, # 21 Summons Best Western Quiet House & Suites (Dodgeville), # 22 Summons Best Western Plus Trail Lodge Hotel & Suites, # 23 Summons Best Western Hudson House Inn, # 24 Summons Best Western Plus La Crosse, # 25 Summons Best Western Countryside Inn (Lodi), # 26 Summons Best Western Plus Inntowner Hotel and The Highland Club, # 27 Summons Best Western Plus East Towne Suites, # 28 Summons Best Western West Towne Suites, # 29 Summons Best Western Park Oasis Inn, # 30 Summons Best Western Resort Hotel & Conference Center Portage, # 31 Summons Best Western Bluffview Inn & Suites, # 32 Summons Best Western Claridge Motor Inn, # 33 Summons Best Western Inn (Rice Lake), # 34 Summons Best Western Northwoods Lodge, # 35 Summons Best Western Sparta Trail Lodge, # 36 Summons Best Western American Heritage, # 37 Summons Best Western Bay Walk Inn, # 38 Summons Best Western Bridgeview Motor Inn, # 39 Summons Best Western Lake-Aire Motel & Resort, # 40 Summons Best Western Midway Hotel (Wausau), # 41 Summons Best Western Ambassador Inn & Suites, # 42 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 228 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?