Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC v. Madison Marriott West et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Wisconsin Western District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-00644
District Judge William M. Conley, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 21, 2016 at 5:36 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Niro, Scavone, Haller & Niro, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew G. McAndrews +1 312 236 0733 +2363 236 236 3137 mmcandrews@nshn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond Pardo Niro, Jr. +1 312 236 0733 +1 312 236 3137 rnirojr@nshn.com
v.
No Logo Courtyard La Crosse Downtown/Mississippi Riverfront, Defendant
No Logo Courtyard Madison East, Defendant
No Logo Courtyard Madison West/Middleton, Defendant
No Logo Courtyard Wausau, Defendant
No Logo Fairfield Inn & Suites Beloit, Defendant
No Logo Fairfield Inn & Suites Madison East, Defendant
No Logo Fairfield Inn & Suites Madison West/Middleton, Defendant
No Logo Fairfield Inn & Suites Stevens Point, Defendant
No Logo Fairfield Inn & Suites Wausau, Defendant
No Logo Fairfield Inn Hudson, Defendant
No Logo Madison Marriott West, Defendant
No Logo Residence Inn Madison East, Defendant
No Logo Residence Inn Madison West/Middleton, Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
Conditional Transfer Order (Copy). Signed by Jeffery N.Luthi, Clerk of MDL Panel on 1/25/12. (krj) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** In light of plaintiff's January 5, 2012 filing in response to the court's order to show cause [dkt. 6], the court will not be dismissing this case for failure to prosecute. In light of the MDL Panel's conditional transfer order, see dkt. 6-2, the court will take no further action in this lawsuit or in Case No. 11-cv-643 pending further action by the transferee court, the Northern District of Illinois. Plaintiff's request for a hearing is denied as unnecessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/6/2012. (voc) Modified on 1/6/2012 (voc). (Entered: 01/06/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      Motion to Set Teleconference with Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC. Response due 1/12/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B- Schedule CTO) (McAndrews, Matthew) Advised counsel to refile exhibit A using the appropriate event. Modified on 1/6/2012 (voc). (Entered: 01/05/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 8 Filed: 1/28/2012, Entered: None
        Conditional Transfer Order (Copy). Signed by Jeffery N.Luthi, Clerk of MDL Panel on 1/25/12. (krj)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** On September 19, 2011, Plaintiff filed this 17-patent lawsuit against 13 defendants. On November 22, 2011, this court set a telephonic status conference for January 4, 2012 because it was concerned about the lack of progress in this case: the court directed plaintiff to file proof of service promptly so that the parties could hold their Rule 16 meeting and could submit a Rule 26(f) report, which would allow the court to hold the preliminary pretrial conference on January 4. Plaintiff did not file any proofs of service, there is no indication that the parties held a Rule 16 conference, no Rule 26(f) report was filed, and plaintiff did not call in for the January 4, 2012 telephonic conference. By virtue of Rule 4(m), this case will be dismissed on January 17, 2012 in any event; nonetheless, in light of the plaintiff's flouting of the court's directions and failure to participate in the January 4, 2012 conference, plaintiff has until January 11, 2012 to show cause why this lawsuit should not be dismissed with prejudice for failure to prosecute it. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/4/2012. (voc) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
            Summons Issued as to Courtyard La Crosse Downtown/Mississippi Riverfront, Courtyard Madison East, Courtyard Madison West/Middleton, Courtyard Wausau, Fairfield Inn & Suites Beloit, Fairfield Inn & Suites Madison East, Fairfield Inn & Suites Madison West/Middleton, Fairfield Inn & Suites Stevens Point, Fairfield Inn & Suites Wausau, Fairfield Inn Hudson, Madison Marriott West, Residence Inn Madison East, and Residence Inn Madison West/Middleton. (Attachments: # 1 Summons - Courtyard Madison East, # 2 Summons - Courtyard Madison West, # 3 Summons - Courtyard Wausau, # 4 Summons - Fairfield Beloit, # 5 Summons - Fairfield Madison East, # 6 Summons - Fairfield Madison West, # 7 Summons - Fairfield Stevens Point, # 8 Summons - Fairfield Wausau, # 9 Summons - Fairfield Hudson, # 10 Summons - Madison Marriott West, # 11 Summons - Residence Inn Madison East, # 12 Summons - Residence Inn Madison West) (krj) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
              Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (krj) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
                Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
                  COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Courtyard La Crosse Downtown/Mississippi Riverfront, Courtyard Madison East, Courtyard Madison West/Middleton, Courtyard Wausau, Fairfield Inn & Suites Beloit, Fairfield Inn & Suites Madison East, Fairfield Inn & Suites Madison West/Middleton, Fairfield Inn & Suites Stevens Point, Fairfield Inn & Suites Wausau, Fairfield Inn Hudson, Madison Marriott West, Residence Inn Madison East, Residence Inn Madison West/Middleton. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0758-838806.), filed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US6714559, # 2 Exhibit B - US7386002, # 3 Exhibit C - US7535921, # 4 Exhibit D - US7548553, # 5 Exhibit E - US5740366, # 6 Exhibit F - US5940771, # 7 Exhibit G - US6374311, # 8 Exhibit H - US7457646, # 9 Exhibit I - US5546397, # 10 Exhibit J - US5844893, # 11 Exhibit K - US6665536, # 12 Exhibit L - US6697415, # 13 Exhibit M - US7013138, # 14 Exhibit N - US7710907, # 15 Exhibit O - US7916747, # 16 Exhibit P - US7873343, # 17 Exhibit Q Part 1 - US7536167, # 18 Exhibit Q Part 2 - US7536167, # 19 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 20 Summons Madison Marriott West, # 21 Summons Fairfield Inn & Suites Beloit, # 22 Summons Fairfield Inn Hudson, # 23 Summons Courtyard La Crosse Downtown/Mississippi Riverfront, # 24 Summons Courtyard Madison East, # 25 Summons Residence Inn Madison East, # 26 Summons Fairfield Inn & Suites Madison East, # 27 Summons Courtyard Madison West/Middleton, # 28 Summons Residence Inn Madison West/Middleton, # 29 Summons Fairfield Inn & Suites Madison West/Middleton, # 30 Summons Fairfield Inn & Suites Stevens Point, # 31 Summons Courtyard Wausau, # 32 Summons Fairfield Inn & Suites Wausau, # 33 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (McAndrews, Matthew) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 247 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?