USA v. Oliver
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cr-10016

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 3, 2017 at 9:29 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (168) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: 1/19/2011 USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: 12/10/2010 US Treasury Process Receipt and Return
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: 11/24/2010 USCA Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: 10/19/2010 Supplemental Record Sent USCA
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 10/19/2010 Plea Agreement
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: 9/21/2010 Letter (non-motion)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: 9/8/2010 Supplemental Record Sent USCA
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: 8/13/2010 Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: 7/16/2010 Full Record on Appeal Sent to USCA
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: 7/14/2010 Order for Forfeiture of Property
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: 7/12/2010 Notice of Appeal
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: 7/2/2010 Letter (non-motion)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: 7/2/2010 Remark
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: 6/25/2010 Remark
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: 6/25/2010 Order on Motion to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/27/2010 Letter (non-motion)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: 5/14/2010 Letter (non-motion)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: 4/27/2010 Letter (non-motion)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: 4/19/2010 Letter (non-motion)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: 4/2/2010 Letter (non-motion)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: 3/31/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: 3/31/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 3/30/2010 Motion for Forfeiture of Property
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: 3/12/2010 Letter (non-motion)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: 2/12/2010 Letter (non-motion)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: 2/12/2010 Letter (non-motion)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010 Letter (non-motion)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: 1/14/2010 Letter (non-motion)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: 1/7/2010 Order for Forfeiture of Property
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: 1/7/2010 Order for Forfeiture of Property
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: 12/29/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: 12/22/2009 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: 12/3/2009 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: 10/13/2009 Amended Judgment
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: 10/6/2009 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: 9/24/2009 Reply to Response
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: 8/28/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: 7/22/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: 7/10/2009 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: 6/26/2009 Response Unrelated to a Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/23/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/23/2009 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: 6/12/2009 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: 6/11/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: 5/14/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: 5/14/2009 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: 5/14/2009 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: 5/13/2009 Motion to Correct
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: 4/17/2009 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: 3/27/2009 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: 3/4/2009 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: 3/4/2009 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: 1/27/2009 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: 12/23/2008 Response Unrelated to a Motion
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: 12/9/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: 11/24/2008 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: 11/24/2008 Transcript
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: 11/24/2008 Transcript
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: 11/10/2008 Exhibit
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: 11/10/2008 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: 11/5/2008 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: 11/5/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: 10/31/2008 Service Order - 2255 Motion
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: 10/27/2008 Motion for Forfeiture of Property
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: 10/22/2008 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: 10/22/2008 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: 10/22/2008 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: 10/10/2008 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 10/2/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 10/2/2008 Motion to Vacate(2255)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 10/2/2008 Motion to Vacate(2255)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Motion for Forfeiture of Property
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Response Unrelated to a Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Motion to Withdraw Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/12/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 Judgment*
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Order for Forfeiture of Property
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Sentencing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Government Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007 Motion for Forfeiture of Property
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007 Sentencing Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Psychiatric Report +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007 Sentencing Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Order for Forfeiture of Property
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: 8/16/2007 Motion for Forfeiture of Property
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Procedural Order re sentencing hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Rule 11 Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007 Report and Order on Initial Status Conference by Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Joint submission - Status Report for Final Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007 Seizure Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007 Seizure Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007 Seizure Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007 Seizure Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007 Seizure Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007 Seizure Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007 Seizure Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Seizure Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Seizure Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Seizure Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Seizure Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Seizure Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Seizure Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Seizure Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Application and Affidavit for Seizure Warrant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Application and Affidavit for Seizure Warrant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Application and Affidavit for Seizure Warrant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007 Application and Affidavit for Seizure Warrant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007 Application and Affidavit for Seizure Warrant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007 Application and Affidavit for Seizure Warrant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007 Application and Affidavit for Seizure Warrant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: 3/14/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: 3/14/2007 Report and Order on Initial Status Conference by Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: 3/14/2007 Order on Excludable Delay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007 Memorandum (not related to a motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007 Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: 2/8/2007 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/21/2007, Entered: 1/21/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Order Appointing Federal Defender Program.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Order Setting Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: 1/17/2007 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: 1/17/2007 Indictment -Sealed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: 1/17/2007 Motion to Seal Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 10 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?