AL-GHRISSI et al v. OBAMA et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-02412
District Judge Reggie B. Walton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LEHBIB AL-GHRISSI, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sylvia Royce +1 202 362 3445 +1 202 686 4271 sylvia_royce@hotmail.com
No Logo LOTFI AL-GHRISSI, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sylvia Royce +1 202 362 3445 +1 202 686 4271 sylvia_royce@hotmail.com
v.
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Respondent
Officially listed as "BARACK OBAMA"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo JOHN AND/OR JANE DOES NOS. 1-5, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Respondent
Officially listed as "ROBERT M. GATES"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
Consent MOTION to Stay by LOTFI AL-GHRISSI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Court of Appeals Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Royce, Sylvia) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER. In light of the recent decision issued by the United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit in Fadi Al Maqaleh, et al. v. Robert M. Gates, et al., Civil Action No. 09-5265, ___ F.3d ___, 2010 WL 2010783 (D.C. Cir. May 21, 2010), it is hereby ORDERED that the petitioner shall show cause within 10 days of this Order why his habeas petition should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 05/24/10. (TH, ) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 9 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
      STIPULATION Regarding Bagram Theater Internment Facility by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER. (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER. This Order is in accordance with the Hearing on January 11, 2010. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 02/05/10. (TH, ) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None
          REPLY to opposition to motion re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or for 30 day notice of proposed transfer to Tunisia filed by LOTFI AL-GHRISSI. (Royce, Sylvia) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
            NOTICE to the Court by BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Major General Curtis M. Scaparrotti)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None
              Memorandum in opposition to re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ROBERT M. GATES, JOHN AND/OR JANE DOES NOS. 1-5, BARACK OBAMA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 12/29/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Appearance (Tyler, John) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Lin on behalf of ROBERT M. GATES, JOHN AND/OR JANE DOES NOS. 1-5, BARACK OBAMA (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by LEHBIB AL-GHRISSI, LOTFI AL-GHRISSI (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Counsel, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(dr) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
                      PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 4616026334.) filed by LOTFI AL-GHRISSI, LEHBIB AL-GHRISSI. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Next Friend, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dr) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 133 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?