Little v. A. O. Smith Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit West Virginia Southern District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-01800

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2019 at 5:14 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kenneth P. Little, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan & Morgan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel D. Elswick +1 407 420 1414 +1 407 841 9520 selswick@forthepeople.com
No Logo Patricia D. Little, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan & Morgan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel D. Elswick +1 407 420 1414 +1 407 841 9520 selswick@forthepeople.com
v.
3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Innovative Properties Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "3M Company"
No Logo A.O. Smith Corporation, Defendant
No Logo A. O. Smith Water Products, Defendant
No Logo A.w. Chesterton, Company, Defendant
No Logo Adience Company, LP, Defendant
No Logo Alfa-laval, Inc., Defendant
No Logo ALLEGHENY TECHNOLOGY Inc., Defendant
No Logo Allen-bradley Company, Defendant
No Logo Allied Rubber & Gasket, Defendant
No Logo Alltite Gasket Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo American Insulated Wire Co., Defendant
No Logo American Standard, Inc., Defendant
No Logo American Steel & Wire Company, Defendant
No Logo American Wire and Cable Co., Defendant
No Logo Aurora Pump Company, Defendant
No Logo Baldor Electric Company, Defendant
Bayer Cropscience, LP Bayer Cropscience, LP, Defendant
No Logo Belden Wire & Cable Co., Defendant
No Logo Bendix Corporation, Defendant
No Logo BMI Inc., Defendant
Borg-Warner Corporation Borg-Warner Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Brand Insulations, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Buffalo Pumps, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Burns International Services, Defendant
No Logo Bw/ip, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Carol Cable Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Carrier Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Flaherty Sensabaugh & Bonasso PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. TYLER DINSMORE +1 304 347 4234 +3450 345 345 0260 tylerd@fsblaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MICHELLE B. HOOSIER +1 304 347 3788 mhoosier@fsblaw.com
No Logo Carrier, Inc., Defendant
CBS Corporation CBS Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Certain-teed Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Chempump, Defendant
No Logo Chicago Gasket Company, Defendant
No Logo Chicago Pumps Company, Defendant
No Logo Circuit Breaker Company, Defendant
No Logo Cleaver-Brooks Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Columbus Mc Kinnon Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Copes-vulcan, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Crane Co, Defendant
No Logo Crane Pumps & Systems, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Crown Cork & Seal USA, Defendant
No Logo CUTLER-HAMMER Inc., Defendant
No Logo Davis Pickering and Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Dezurik Co., Defendant
No Logo Dow Chemical Company, Defendant
No Logo Dravo Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Durez Corporation, Defendant
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Inc. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "E.I. DuPont de Nemours & Co."
Eaton Corporation Eaton Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Elliott Turbomachinery Company, Inc., Defendant
ExxonMobil Corporation ExxonMobil Corporation, Defendant
Unknown Role, MOBIL CORP
No Logo F.B. Wright Company, Defendant
No Logo Fairmont Supply Company, Defendant
No Logo Fisher Controls International, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Flowserve Us Inc., Defendant
No Logo FMC Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Foseco, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Gardner Denver, Inc., Defendant
No Logo General Cable Corporation, Defendant
General Electric Company General Electric Company, Defendant
Unknown Role, Genpact Ltd.
Unknown Role, Gei, Inc.
Unknown Role, Sportstech, Inc.
Unknown Role, Superior Essex Inc.
Unknown Role, Genicom Corp
Unknown Role, Imatron Inc.
Unknown Role, Regal Beloit Corp
Unknown Role, Lockheed Martin Corp
Unknown Role, Lunar Corp
Unknown Role, Mecon Inc
Unknown Role, Positron Corp
Unknown Role, GE India Ventures LLC
Unknown Role, Townsquare Media, LLC
Unknown Role, Antares Capital Corp
Unknown Role, Bear Newco, Inc.
Unknown Role, Gopivotal, Inc.
Unknown Role, GRAND UNION CO /DE/
Unknown Role, Xoom, Inc.
Unknown Role, Plug Power, Inc.
Unknown Role, Hpsc, Inc.
Unknown Role, Ionics, Inc.
Unknown Role, Idx Systems Corp
Unknown Role, iVillage, Inc.
No Logo Geo. V. Hamilton, Inc., Defendant
Georgia-Pacific Corporation Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Gordon Gasket & Packing Company, Defendant
No Logo Goulds Pumps, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Goulds Pumps"
No Logo GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Grinnell LLC, Defendant
No Logo Hayes Pump, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Honeywell International, Defendant
No Logo Howden North America Inc., Defendant
No Logo I.T.E., Defendant
No Logo I.U. North America, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Imo Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Industrial Holdings Corporations, Defendant
No Logo Industrial Supply Solutions, Defendant
Ingersoll-Rand Company Ingersoll-Rand Company, Defendant
No Logo Insul Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo ITT Corporation, Defendant
No Logo J&l Specialty Steel, LLC, Defendant
No Logo J.H. France Refractories, Defendant
No Logo Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Kentile Floors Inc., Defendant
No Logo Kewanee Boilers, Defendant
Lockheed Martin Corporation Lockheed Martin Corporation, Defendant
Mallinckrodt Group Inc. Mallinckrodt Group Inc., Defendant
No Logo Master Electric, Defendant
No Logo Mcjunkin Corporation, Defendant
Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Defendant
No Logo Metsch Refractories, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Milton Roy Inc., Defendant
No Logo Mine Safety Appliances, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Nagle Pumps, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Napa Auto Parts, Defendant
No Logo National Service Industries Ventures, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Nitro Industrial Coverings, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Oakfabco, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Oglebay Norton Company, Defendant
No Logo Ohio Valley Insulating Company, Inc., Defendant
Owens-Illinois, Inc. Owens-Illinois, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Payne Controls Company, Defendant
No Logo Peerless Pumps, Defendant
No Logo Philip Carey Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Pneumo Abex Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Premiere Refractories, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rapid American Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Reliance Electric Company, Defendant
No Logo Reliance Electrical Company, Defendant
No Logo Riley Power Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rockwell Automation, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rockwell International Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Roper Pump Company, Defendant
No Logo Rostone Corporation, Defendant
No Logo R. T. VANDERBILT COMPANY, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rust International Inc., Defendant
No Logo Schneider Electric Usa, Inc., Defendant
Siemens Energy & Automation, Inc. Siemens Energy & Automation, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Sloane Valve Co., Defendant
No Logo Smith Valve, Defendant
No Logo State Electric Supply Company, Defendant
No Logo Sterling Fluid Systems (usa) LLC, Defendant
No Logo Stockham Valves & Fittings, Defendant
No Logo Sundyne Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Taco, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Tasco Insulation, Defendant
No Logo The Badger Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo The Ferro Engineering Division, Defendant
No Logo The Garp Company, Defendant
No Logo The Homer Laughlin China Company, Defendant
No Logo The Newdell Company, Defendant
No Logo The Okonite Company, Defendant
No Logo The Trane Company, Defendant
No Logo Thiem Corp., Defendant
No Logo UB West Virginia, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Flaherty Sensabaugh & Bonasso PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MICHELLE B. HOOSIER +1 304 347 3788 mhoosier@fsblaw.com
No Logo Union Carbide and Plastics Company, Inc., Defendant
Union Carbide Corporation Union Carbide Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Uniroyal Holding, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Uniroyal, Inc., Defendant
No Logo United Engineers & Constructors & Washington Group International, Defendant
No Logo United States Rubber Company, Defendant
No Logo United States Steel Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Universal Refractories, Defendant
No Logo USX Corporation, Defendant
Viacom, Inc. Viacom, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Blockbuster, Inc.
Unknown Role, New Viacom Corp.
Unknown Role, Redstone Sumner M
No Logo Vimasco Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Warren Pumps LLC, Defendant
No Logo Weil-McLain Company, Defendant
No Logo West Virginia Electric, Defendant
No Logo Western Auto Parts, Defendant
No Logo Yarway Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Zurn Industries, LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT by Clerk, Circuit Court of Kanawha County, West Virginia, of receipt of case file on 7/6/2012. (taq)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
    LETTER to Clerk, Circuit Court of Kanawha County, from Clerk SDWV/USDC dated 7/5/2012, re: transmitting case file pursuant to the Court's Order entered 7/5/2012 remanding this case. (tmh)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
      LETTER-FORM NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Samuel D. Elswick on behalf of Kenneth P. Little, Patricia D. Little. (klc)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
        RESPONSE by Carrier Corporation in support of 3 UNOPPOSED MOTION by Kenneth P. Little, Patricia D. Little to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County. (Hoosier, Michelle)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
          PROPOSED ORDER Voluntary Dismissal Order by Carrier Corporation, Kenneth P. Little, Patricia D. Little (Hoosier, Michelle) (Modified on 6/13/2012 to add additional filers) (skh).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
            PROPOSED ORDER Voluntary Dismissal Order by UB West Virginia, Inc., Kenneth P. Little, Patricia D. Little (Hoosier, Michelle) (Modified on 6/13/2012 to add additional filers) (skh).
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Kenneth P. Little, Patricia D. Little for Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Remand. (Elswick, Samuel) (Modified on 6/13/2012 to conform to filed document and to remove duplicate text) (taq).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                UNOPPOSED MOTION by Kenneth P. Little, Patricia D. Little to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County (Attachment: # 1 Exhibits A-G)(Elswick, Samuel)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                  STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED SEPTEMBER 2, 2010. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Stanley for discovery. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (mjp)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 9 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER granting the 3 UNOPPOSED MOTION by Corley E. Thompson, Ellen Thompson to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County, and directing that this case is remanded to the Circuit Court for Kanawha County, West Virginia. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 7/5/2012. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party; Clerk of Kanawha County Circuit Court) (tmh)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Carrier Corporation with complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $350.00. Receipt #0425-1860169. (Attachments: # 1 Kanawha County Circuit Court's docket sheet, # 2 Exhibit(s) A-Complaint filed in Kanawha County Circuit Court, # 3 Exhibit(s) B-Complaint filed in Kanawha County Circuit Court with Civil Case Information Sheet attached, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet) (mjp) (Modified text to remove reference to summons on 6/11/2012) (taq). (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 142 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?