Pragmatus Telecom LLC v. Scottrade Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00094-RGA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 17, 2016 at 7:39 PM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Pragmatus Telecom, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
Space Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
Space Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
Space Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Farnan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian E. Farnan +1 302 777 0300 +1 302 777 0301 bfarnan@farnanlaw.com
v.
No Logo Scottrade Financial Services Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Balick +1 302 654 1888 +1 302 654 2067 sbalick@ashby-geddes.com
Space Andrew Colin Mayo +1 302 654 1888 amayo@ashby-geddes.com
No Logo Scottrade, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Coburn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas E. Douglass +1 314 552 6029 +1 314 552 7029 tdouglass@thompsoncoburn.com
Space Jason M. Schwent +1 314 552 6291 +1 314 552 7291 jschwent@thomascoburn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melanie K. Sharp +1 302 571 6681 +1 302 571 1253 msharp@ycst.com
Space Monte Terrell Squire +1 302 571 6713 +1 302 576 3515 msquire@ycst.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of the following sealed documents, signed on behalf of Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor : D.I. # 39 (cla, ) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
    ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING RETURN OF SEALED DOCUMENTS: Pursuant to the attached STANDING ORDER dated January 8, 2013, sealed documents identified on the highlighted docket sheet will be claimed by the FILING party/attorney no later than 3/14/14. Filing attorney or their designee shall CLAIM their sealed documents by sending an E-MAIL, Subject: Return of Sealed Documents, to returnsealeddocs@ded.uscourts.gov, listing the case number and a contact's name, phone number and address. Parties not registered in CM/ECF may call our Help Desk at 302-573-6170 to claim their sealed documents. Once sealed documents are claimed, THE CLERK SHALL prepare receipts and contact filers WHEN THEIR DOCUMENTS ARE READY FOR PICK-UP at the Clerk's Office, 844 N. King Street, Intake Help Desk, Room 4209. Documents not claimed shall be unsealed and handled pursuant to the standing order. (Attachments: # 1 Highlighted Docket Sheet) (cla, ) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
      Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,311,231 B1; US 6,668,286 B2; US 7,159,043 B2. (Attachments: # 1 Order)(nms) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 51 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        SO ORDERED Granting 50 Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by Scottrade Inc. (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/7/2014. (nms) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
          LREF
          Blank 50 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
          Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, by Scottrade Inc.. (Squire, Monte) Modified on 2/7/2014 (nms). (Entered: 02/07/2014)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None
            PROPOSED ORDER regarding Pragmatus Telecom, LLC Fact Deposition of Scottrade, Inc. and Stay Pending Outcome of Declaratory Judgment Action (C.A. 12-147 (RGA)) by Pragmatus Telecom LLC, Scottrade Inc.. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 36 MOTION to Stay in Favor of Co-Pending Supplier Declaratory Judgment Action, filed by Scottrade Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/9/2012. (nms) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Monte T. Squire, Esquire regarding advising the Court that briefing on 36 Motion to Stay in Favor of Co-Pending Supplier Declaratory Judgment Action is complete. (Squire, Monte) Modified on 9/5/2012 (nms). (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections of Defendant Scottrade, Inc. to the First Set of Common Requests for Production and Responses and Objections of Defendant Scottrade, Inc. to the First Set of Common Interrogatories of Plaintiff Pragmatus Telecom, LLC by Scottrade Inc..(Squire, Monte) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None
                    REPLY BRIEF re 36 MOTION to Stay in Favor of Co-Pending Supplier Declaratory Judgment Action filed by Scottrade Inc.. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                      ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 36 MOTION to Stay in Favor of Co-Pending Supplier Declaratory Judgment Action filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/7/2012. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                        REDACTED VERSION of 39 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Monte T. Squire, Esquire regarding discovery disputes for consideration during the August 22, 2012 conference, by Liveperson Inc., Scottrade Inc.. (Squire, Monte) Modified on 8/28/2012 (nms). (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None
                          Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Brian E. Farnan regarding Response to Defendant's August 22, 2012 Letter - re 41 Letter. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None
                            Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Melanie K. Sharp, Esquire regarding Correction of two missstatements of fact in Pragmatus Telecom, LLC's August 21, 2012 submission - re (37 in 1:12-cv-00147-RGA) Letter. (Sharp, Melanie) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None
                              Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Brian E. Farnan regarding Response to Defendant's August 20, 2012 Letter - re 39 Letter. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Sealed Legal Document 39 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
                                SEALED Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Monte T. Squire, Esquire regarding discovery disputes for consideration during the August 22, 2012 conference. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
                                  DECLARATION of Kimberly A. Mottley re 37 Opening Brief, by Scottrade Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Sharp, Melanie) Modified on 8/9/2012 (nms). (Entered: 08/09/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
                                    OPENING BRIEF in Support re 36 MOTION to Stay in Favor of Co-Pending Supplier Declaratory Judgment Action filed by Scottrade Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/27/2012. (Sharp, Melanie) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
                                      MOTION to Stay in Favor of Co-Pending Supplier Declaratory Judgment Action - filed by Scottrade Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 D. Del. LR 7.1.1 Certification)(Sharp, Melanie) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
                                        ANSWER to 34 Third Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, by Scottrade Inc..(Sharp, Melanie) Modified on 8/7/2012 (nms). (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                          Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against Scottrade Inc.- filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 33 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 17 Renewed MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Infringement Claims]. The claims of indirect infringement are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff is granted LEAVE TO AMEND its complaint no later than July 20, 2012 (see order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/5/2012. (ksr, ) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiff Pragmatus Telecom, LLC's First Set of Common Interrogatories; and (ii) Plaintiff Pragmatus Telecom, LLC's First Set of Common Requests for Production by Pragmatus Telecom LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Monte T. Squire regarding effect the Federal Circuit's recent decision in In Re Bill of Lading Transmission and Processing System Patent Litigation should have on the pending Motion to Dismiss. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER Granting Proposed Protective Order, filed by ETrade Financial Corporation, Liveperson Inc., Pragmatus Telecom LLC, Scottrade Inc., Advance Stores Company Incorporated, North Face Apparel Corp., E*Trade Financial Corporation, Ford Motor Company, Estee Lauder Companies Inc., E-Advance LLC, United Parcel Service Inc., Overstock.com Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/12/2012. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00088-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                    Joint PROPOSED Protective Order, by Overstock.com Inc., Pragmatus Telecom LLC, Estee Lauder Companies Inc., Ford Motor Company, Liveperson Inc., ETrade Financial Corporation, Advance Stores Company Incorporated, E-Advance LLC, United Parcel Service Inc., North Face Apparel Corp., Scottrade Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 letter to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Monte T. Squire)(Squire, Monte) Modified on 6/12/2012 (nms). (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosure by Pragmatus Telecom LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Scottrade Inc..(Squire, Monte) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                          STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to serve Initial Disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) to June 11, 2012 - filed by Overstock.com Inc., Pragmatus Telecom LLC, Estee Lauder Companies Inc., Ford Motor Company, Liveperson Inc., ETrade Financial Corporation, North Face Apparel Corp., Advance Stores Company Incorporated, E-Advance LLC, United Parcel Service Inc., Scottrade Inc.. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER Setting Teleconference and Status Teleconference (Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call ): A Telephone Conference to discuss ADR and a Status Teleconference is set for 6/20/2012 at 12:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/6/2012. (lih) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 10/31/2012. Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2012. All Fact Discovery due by 9/13/2013. A Status Conference is set for 5/2/2014, at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Dispositive Motions due by 3/1/2014. Answering Brief due 3/29/2014. Reply Brief due 4/12/2014. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 4/3/2013. A Markman Hearing is set for 5/1/2013, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A Pretrial Conference is set for 8/22/2014, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A 5 day Jury Trial is set to commence on 9/8/2014, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/1/2012. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00088-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                REPLY BRIEF re 17 Renewed MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Infringement Claims] filed by Scottrade Inc.. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    Joint PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Overstock.com Inc., Pragmatus Telecom LLC, Estee Lauder Companies Inc., Ford Motor Company, ETrade Financial Corporation, Advance Stores Company Incorporated, E-Advance LLC, United Parcel Service Inc., North Face Apparel Corp., Scottrade Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Monte T. Squire)(Squire, Monte) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 17 Renewed MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Infringement Claims] filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/1/2012. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 5/29/2012, at 4:15 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/8/2012. (nms) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          OPENING BRIEF in Support re 17 Renewed MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Infringement Claims, filed by Scottrade Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/21/2012. (Squire, Monte) Modified on 5/8/2012 (nms). (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            Renewed MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Infringement Claims - filed by Scottrade Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Squire, Monte) Modified on 5/8/2012 (nms). (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas E. Douglass and Jason M. Schwent - filed by Scottrade Inc.. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven M. Bauer and Kimberly A. Mottley - filed by Scottrade Inc.. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Monte Terrell Squire on behalf of Scottrade Inc. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Scottrade Inc.- filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Scottrade, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Scottrade Financial Services, Inc. for Scottrade, Inc... (Sharp, Melanie) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        OPENING BRIEF in Support re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Willful and Indirect Infringement Claims and for a More Definite Statement of Direct Infringement Claims, filed by Scottrade, Inc.. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/19/2012. (Sharp, Melanie) Modified on 4/3/2012 (nms). (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Willful and Indirect Infringement Claims and for a More Definite Statement of Direct Infringement Claims] - filed by Scottrade, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1Proposed Order)(Sharp, Melanie) Modified on 4/3/2012 (nms). (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against Scottrade, Inc.- filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas E. Douglass and Jason M. Schwent - filed by Scottrade Financial Services Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to ANSWER or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 3/30/2012 - filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew G. DiNovo, Adam G. Price, Chester J. Shiu, and James W. Coutu of DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP - filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the complaint to March 23, 2012 - filed by Scottrade Financial Services Inc.. (Balick, Steven) (Entered: 02/20/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. Scottrade Financial Services Inc. served on 2/1/2012, answer due 2/22/2012. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,311,231 B1; US 6,668,286 B2; US 7,159,043 B2. (lih) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (lih) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 17 Renewed MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Infringement Claims]. The claims of indirect infringement are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff is granted LEAVE TO AMEND its complaint no later than July 20, 2012 (see order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/5/2012. (ksr, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Scottrade Financial Services Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1013563.) - filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(lih) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 72 times.

                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                Need Password Help?