Pragmatus Telecom LLC v. Estee Lauder Companies Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00096-RGA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 29, 2016 at 4:02 PM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pragmatus Telecom, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
Space Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
Space Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
Space Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Farnan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian E. Farnan +1 302 777 0300 +1 302 777 0301 bfarnan@farnanlaw.com
v.
No Logo Estee Lauder Companies, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
Space Kimberly Ann Mottley +1 617 526 9616 +1 617 526 9899 kmottley@proskauer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melanie K. Sharp +1 302 571 6681 +1 302 571 1253 msharp@ycst.com
Space Monte Terrell Squire +1 302 571 6713 +1 302 576 3515 msquire@ycst.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,311,231 B1; US 6,668,286 B2; US 7,159,043 B2. (Attachments: # 1 Order)(nms) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    SO ORDERED Granting 42 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by Estee Lauder Companies Inc. (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/7/2014. (nms) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 42 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
      Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal, by Estee Lauder Companies Inc.. (Squire, Monte) Modified on 2/7/2014 (nms). (Entered: 02/06/2014)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER Administratively Closing Case. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/26/2012. (nms) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
          Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Estee Lauder Companies Inc.- filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER Granting 16 MOTION to Stay in Favor of Co-Pending Supplier Declaratory Judgment Action (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/10/2012. (nms) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 38 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 14 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon [Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Pragmatus Telecom, LLC's Indirect Infringement Claims]. The Claims of indirect infringement are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff is granted LEAVE TO AMEND its complaint no later than July 20, 2012 (see order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/5/2012. (ksr, ) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiff Pragmatus Telecom, LLC's First Set of Common Interrogatories; and (ii) Plaintiff Pragmatus Telecom, LLC's First Set of Common Requests for Production by Pragmatus Telecom LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                  Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Monte T. Squire regarding effect the Federal Circuit's recent decision in In Re Bill of Lading Transmission and Processing System Patent Litigation should have on the pending Motion to Dismiss. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
                    Joint Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Monte T. Squire, Esquire regarding Pending Motions to Stay. (Squire, Monte) Modified on 7/9/2012 (nms). (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER Granting Proposed Protective Order, filed by ETrade Financial Corporation, Liveperson Inc., Pragmatus Telecom LLC, Scottrade Inc., Advance Stores Company Incorporated, North Face Apparel Corp., E*Trade Financial Corporation, Ford Motor Company, Estee Lauder Companies Inc., E-Advance LLC, United Parcel Service Inc., Overstock.com Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/12/2012. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00088-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                        Joint PROPOSED Protective Order, by Overstock.com Inc., Pragmatus Telecom LLC, Estee Lauder Companies Inc., Ford Motor Company, Liveperson Inc., ETrade Financial Corporation, Advance Stores Company Incorporated, E-Advance LLC, United Parcel Service Inc., North Face Apparel Corp., Scottrade Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 letter to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Monte T. Squire)(Squire, Monte) Modified on 6/12/2012 (nms). (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosure by Pragmatus Telecom LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Estee Lauder Companies Inc..(Squire, Monte) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to serve Initial Disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) to June 11, 2012 - filed by Overstock.com Inc., Pragmatus Telecom LLC, Estee Lauder Companies Inc., Ford Motor Company, Liveperson Inc., ETrade Financial Corporation, North Face Apparel Corp., Advance Stores Company Incorporated, E-Advance LLC, United Parcel Service Inc., Scottrade Inc.. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER Setting Teleconference and Status Teleconference (Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call ): A Telephone Conference to discuss ADR and a Status Teleconference is set for 6/20/2012 at 12:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/6/2012. (lih) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 10/31/2012. Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2012. All Fact Discovery due by 9/13/2013. A Status Conference is set for 5/2/2014, at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Dispositive Motions due by 3/1/2014. Answering Brief due 3/29/2014. Reply Brief due 4/12/2014. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 4/3/2013. A Markman Hearing is set for 5/1/2013, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A Pretrial Conference is set for 8/22/2014, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A 5 day Jury Trial is set to commence on 9/8/2014, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/1/2012. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00088-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                    PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
                                      REPLY BRIEF re 14 Renewed MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Infringement Claims, filed by Estee Lauder Companies Inc.. (Squire, Monte) Modified on 5/29/2012 (nms). (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                                        Joint PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Overstock.com Inc., Pragmatus Telecom LLC, Estee Lauder Companies Inc., Ford Motor Company, ETrade Financial Corporation, Advance Stores Company Incorporated, E-Advance LLC, United Parcel Service Inc., North Face Apparel Corp., Scottrade Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Monte T. Squire)(Squire, Monte) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                          REQUEST for Oral Argument by Estee Lauder Companies Inc. re 16 MOTION to Stay in Favor of Co-Pending Supplier Declaratory Judgment Action. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                            REPLY BRIEF re 16 MOTION to Stay in Favor of Co-Pending Supplier Declaratory Judgment Action filed by Estee Lauder Companies Inc.. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Reply (D.I. 20) by Estee Lauder Companies Inc. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 14 Renewed MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Infringement Claims, filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/25/2012. (Farnan, Brian) Modified on 5/16/2012 (nms). (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                  REPLY BRIEF re 14 Renewed MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Estee Lauder Companies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Squire, Monte) Modified on 5/15/2012 (nms). (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                    ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 16 MOTION to Stay in Favor of Co-Pending Supplier Declaratory Judgment Action filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/24/2012. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 5/29/2012, at 4:15 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/8/2012. (nms) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                        OPENING BRIEF in Support re 16 MOTION to Stay in Favor of Co-Pending Supplier Declaratory Judgment Action filed by Estee Lauder Companies Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/14/2012. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION to Stay in Favor of Co-Pending Supplier Declaratory Judgment Action - filed by Estee Lauder Companies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Local Rule 7.1.1 Certification)(Squire, Monte) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                            OPENING BRIEF in Support re 14 Renewed MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Infringement Claims, filed by Estee Lauder Companies Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/14/2012. (Squire, Monte) Modified on 4/26/2012 (nms). (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                              Renewed MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Infringement Claims - filed by Estee Lauder Companies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Squire, Monte) Modified on 4/26/2012 (nms). (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against Estee Lauder Companies Inc.- filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Estee Lauder Companies Inc.. (Sharp, Melanie) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    OPENING BRIEF in Support re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Willful and Indirect Infringement Claims and for a More Definite Statement of Direct Infringement Claims, filed by Estee Lauder Companies Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/16/2012. (Sharp, Melanie) Modified on 4/3/2012 (nms). (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Willful and Indirect Infringement Claims and for a More Definite Statement of Direct Infringement Claims - filed by Estee Lauder Companies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sharp, Melanie) Modified on 4/3/2012 (nms). (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        PROPOSED Stipulated ORDER Amending the Case Caption, by Estee Lauder Companies Inc.. (Sharp, Melanie) Modified on 4/3/2012 (nms). (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to ANSWER or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 3/30/2012 - filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven M. Bauer and Kimberly A. Mottley - filed by Estee Lauder Companies Inc.. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew G. DiNovo, Adam G. Price, Chester J. Shiu, and James W. Coutu of DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP - filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to March 23, 2012 - filed by Estee Lauder Companies Inc.. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. Estee Lauder Companies Inc. served on 2/1/2012, answer due 2/22/2012. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,311,231 B1; US 6,668,286 B2; US 7,159,043 B2. (lih) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (lih) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 14 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon [Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Pragmatus Telecom, LLC's Indirect Infringement Claims]. The Claims of indirect infringement are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff is granted LEAVE TO AMEND its complaint no later than July 20, 2012 (see order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/5/2012. (ksr, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Estee Lauder Companies Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1013586.) - filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(lih) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 60 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?