Ben Hang Lee et al v. Human Biostar Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-05668
District Judge Michael W Fitzgerald, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ben Hang Lee, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sang I Lee +1 323 653 6817 +1 323 653 6715 sileelaw@hotmail.com
No Logo Brad Lee, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sang I Lee +1 323 653 6817 +1 323 653 6715 sileelaw@hotmail.com
No Logo Eunjoo Lee, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sang I Lee +1 323 653 6817 +1 323 653 6715 sileelaw@hotmail.com
No Logo Helen Ju Lee, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sang I Lee +1 323 653 6817 +1 323 653 6715 sileelaw@hotmail.com
No Logo Jung Hui Lee, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sang I Lee +1 323 653 6817 +1 323 653 6715 sileelaw@hotmail.com
No Logo William Lee, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sang I Lee +1 323 653 6817 +1 323 653 6715 sileelaw@hotmail.com
v.
No Logo Does, Defendant
No Logo Human Biostar Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karis Ann-Yu Chi +1 310 201 2100 kac@birdmarella.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
No Logo Jeong-chan Ra, Defendant
No Logo Jin Han Hong, Defendant
No Logo RNL Bio Co Ltd, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Human Biostar Inc answer now due 8/6/2012, filed by Defendant Human Biostar Inc.(Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
    DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiffs Ben Hang Lee, Brad Lee, Eun Joo Lee, Helen Ju Lee, Jung Hui Lee, William Lee.. (Lee, Sang) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None
      PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Human Biostar Inc, of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal of Action to Federal Court served on 7/3/12. (Chi, Karis) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
        NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed.(ghap) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
          CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Human Biostar Inc. (ghap) (mg). (Entered: 07/03/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles, case number BC485103 with CONFORMED FILED copy of summons and complaint.Case assigned to Judge Michael W Fitzgerald, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Michael R Wilner. (Filing fee $ 350:PAID), filed by defendant Human Biostar Inc.(ghap) (mg). (Entered: 07/03/2012)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 160 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?