Alaska Stock, LLC v. Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Alaska District Court, Case No. 3:09-cv-00061
District Judge H Russel Holland, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 7, 2016 at 11:31 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alaska Stock, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig F. Wallace +1 970 241 2969

Toggle Switch Represented by David H. Bundy, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent R. Cole +1 907 277 8001 +1 907 277 8002 cole@pobox.alaska.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Harmon & Seidman LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maurice James Harmon +1 610 262 9288 +1 610 262 9288 maurice@mauriceharmon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Seidman +1 970 245 9075 +1 970 245 8086 chris@harmonseidman.com
v.
No Logo Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Birch, Horton, Bittner & Cherot

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel C. Kent +1 907 276 1550 +1 907 276 2822 dckesq@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/15/2009, PRO HAC VICE Jason R. Braswell +1 312 407 0700 +1 312 407 0411 jason.braswell@skadden.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Russell Jackson +1 212 735 3000 +1 212 735 2000 russell.jackson@skadden.com
No Logo R.r. Donnelley And Sons Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Birch, Horton, Bittner & Cherot

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel C. Kent +1 907 276 1550 +1 907 276 2822 dckesq@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/15/2009 Jason R. Braswell +1 312 407 0700 +1 312 407 0411 jason.braswell@skadden.com
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 501
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (93) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: 6/28/2012 USCA Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: 6/7/2012 USCA Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: 12/7/2010 Certificate of Record
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: 12/6/2010 Transcript
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: 11/15/2010 Designation of Record on Appeal
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 USCA Scheduling Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 USCA Case Number
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Notice of Appeal
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 85 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: 10/21/2010 Judgment*
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010 Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: 10/1/2010 Order
                        AMENDED ORDER that defs to file response to 80 MOTION for Reconsideration re 79 Judgment, 78 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Defs' response to comply w/D.Ak. LR 59.2(b). Responses due by 10/15/2010. (PRR, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: 9/27/2010 Order
                          ORDER that defs to file response to 80 MOTION for Reconsideration re 79 Judgment, 78 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Defs' response to comply w/D.Ak. LR 59.1(d). (PRR, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: 9/24/2010 Motion for Reconsideration
                            MOTION for Reconsideration re 79 Judgment, 78 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Alaska Stock, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Seidman, Christopher) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 79 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: 9/22/2010 Judgment*Court Filing
                              JUDGMENT that plf's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 9/22/10. (PRR, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                LREF
                                Blank 78 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: 9/21/2010 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting 57 Motion to Dismiss; clk to enter judg. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 9/21/10. (PRR, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: 9/10/2010 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge H. Russel Holland: Motion Hearing held on 9/10/2010 re 57 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company, Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company, This matter is UNDER ADVISEMENT, written ruling to issue. (Court Recorder CME.)Plaintiff Counsel-Christopher Seidman, Telephonic; Craig F. Wallace; Maurice J. Harmon; Defense Counsel-Daniel C. Kent and J. Russell Jackson; (CME, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: 8/16/2010 Order
                                    ORDER setting oral argument on 57 MOTION to Dismiss on 9/10/2010, at 1:30 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before H. Russel Holland. Out-of-state cnsl may appear telephonic. (PRR, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: 8/12/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                      NOTICE of Order From Companion Case by Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company, R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kent, Daniel) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: 7/16/2010 Order on Motion for Hearing
                                        ORDER granting 71 Motion for Oral Argument; o/a to be set when crt completes preliminary rvw of defs' mot to dismiss. (PRR, COURT STAFF) Modified on 7/16/2010 Create relationship to document #57 (PRR, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: 6/24/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 57 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company, R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Kent, Daniel) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                            ORDER granting 70 Motion for Leave to File Defendants' Late Filed Reply; defs to file reply. (PRR, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/22/2010 Motion for Hearing
                                              MOTION for Hearing Plaintiff's Motion For Oral Argument On Defendants' Motion To Dismiss (Doc. No. 57) by Alaska Stock, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corbis Corporation Amicus Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Wallace, Craig) Modified on 6/23/2010 to create relationship to document #57(PRR, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/22/2010 Motion for Leave to File
                                                MOTION for Leave to File Late Filed Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Unopposed) by Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company, R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Kent, Daniel) Modified on 6/23/2010 to create relationship to document #57 (PRR, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Order
                                                  ORDER directing clk to strike dkt 68 from the record due to non-compliance w/D.Ak.LR 10.1. (PRR, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 57 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company, R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Kent, Daniel) Modified on 6/21/2010 to strike and remove original PDF (PRR, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: 6/11/2010 Clerks Notice
                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE that the Application of Maurice Harmon to Appear Pro Hac Vice, at dkt 65 , is authorized under D.Ak.LR 83.1(d). (PRR, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: 6/11/2010 Receipt
                                                        Receipt of 150.00 non-resident attorney payment for Maurice Harmon as to Plaintiff Alaska Stock, LLC.. (PRR, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: 6/10/2010 Motion for Limited Admission
                                                          MOTION for Limited Admission of Maurice Harmon by Alaska Stock, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Cole, Brent) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: 6/8/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company. (Jackson, J.) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: 6/3/2010 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                              ORDER granting 61 Motion to conventionally file Exhibit 2 to plaintiff's response to defendants' motion to dismiss. (CLW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/2/2010 Notice Re: Chamber Copy
                                                                Notice to Counsel re 60 Declaration filed by Alaska Stock, LLC. A review of the document submitted at dkt 60 confirms that it is over 25 pages in length. If a COURTESY paper copy of the pleading has not been forwarded to the Court, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to D.Ak.LR 10.1(b) and the Administrative Policies and Procedures, you are required to provide the court with a COURTESY paper copy of your filing at dkt 60. The COURTESY paper copy must be attached to a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing and must be printed with the ECF pdf header on each page. (CLW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                  MOTION To Conventionally File Exhibit 2 To Plaintiff's Response To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss re 60 Declaration of Craig Wallace by Alaska Stock, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wallace, Craig) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 Declaration
                                                                    DECLARATION of Craig Wallace re 59 Response in Opposition to Motion by Alaska Stock, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, Part 1, # 6 Exhibit 5, Part 2)(Wallace, Craig) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 57 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Alaska Stock, LLC. (Wallace, Craig) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Declaration
                                                                        DECLARATION of J. Russell Jackson re 57 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company, R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Index of Exhibits)(Kent, Daniel) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company, R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kent, Daniel) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: 4/21/2010 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of JurisdictionCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER denying 24 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying as moot 53 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 4/21/10. (PRR, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: 4/19/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 53 MOTION to Strike Portions of, or for Leave to File a Reply to, Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss filed by Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company, R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Kent, Daniel) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: 4/7/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 53 MOTION to Strike Portions of, or for Leave to File a Reply to, Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss filed by Alaska Stock, LLC. (Wallace, Craig) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: 3/29/2010 Motion to Strike
                                                                                  MOTION to Strike Portions of, or for Leave to File a Reply to, Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss by Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company, R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Strike, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion For Leave to File Reply)(Kent, Daniel) Modified on 3/30/2010 to create relationship to document #24 (PRR, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: 3/22/2010 Supplement
                                                                                    SUPPLEMENT Plaintiff's Response To Defendants' Supplemental Brief In Support Of Their Motion To Dismiss by Alaska Stock, LLC 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) filed by R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company, Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company. (Wallace, Craig) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 3/19/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alaska Stock, LLC. (Wallace, Craig) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: 3/16/2010 Supplement
                                                                                        SUPPLEMENT to Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company, R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company 47 Order,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,. (Kent, Daniel) Modified on 3/17/2010 to create relationship to document #24 (PRR, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: 3/2/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company. (Kent, Daniel) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: 3/2/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Kent, Daniel) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: 3/2/2010 Order
                                                                                              ORDER re 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) filed by R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company, Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company; The Court is inclined to find this motion moot, Supplemental brief due by 3/16/2010, responses due within 7 days of defendant's filing. (CLW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: 3/2/2010 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge H. Russel Holland for all further proceedings. Judge Timothy M. Burgess no longer assigned to case (CLW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: 2/8/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                  NOTICE Of Filing Plaintiff's Reply To Defendant's Notice Of Filing Response To Statement Of Interest by Alaska Stock, LLC (Wallace, Craig) Modified on 2/9/2010 to create relationship to document #24 and #44 (PRR, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Response to Statement of Interest by Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company, R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company re 42 Notice (Other) (Kent, Daniel) Modified on 2/5/2010 to create relationship to document #24 (PRR, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: 1/27/2010 Notice Re: Chamber Copy
                                                                                                      Notice to Counsel re 42 Notice (Other) filed by Alaska Stock, LLC. A review of the document submitted at dkt 42 confirms that it is over 25 pages in length. If a COURTESY paper copy of the pleading has not been forwarded to the Court, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to D.Ak.LR 10.1(b) and the Administrative Policies and Procedures, you are required to provide the court with a COURTESY paper copy of your filing at dkt 42. The COURTESY paper copy must be attached to a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing and must be printed with the ECF pdf header on each page. (PRR, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: 1/21/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                        NOTICE Of Pertinent Filing By United States Of America In Related Case by Alaska Stock, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Statement of Interest)(Wallace, Craig) Modified on 1/27/2010 to create relationship to document #24 (PRR, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: 12/21/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Order from Companion Case by Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company, R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company re 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kent, Daniel) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Order
                                                                                                            TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING 39 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jason R. Braswell. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Jason R. Braswell is withdrawn as counsel for defendants Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company and R.R. Donnelly & Sons Company. (SRL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: 8/7/2009 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jason R. Braswell by Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company, R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company.(Braswell, Jason) (Entered: 08/07/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING 34 Motion for Leave to File CD Conventionally. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Plaintiff is permitted to conventionally file a compact disc as Exhibit 5 to its response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Docket24). (SRL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/14/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) filed by Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company, R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Kent, Daniel) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: 6/30/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING 35 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Defendants' Reply due by 7/14/2009. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 06/30/09. (SRL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: 6/29/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) (Unopposed) by Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company, R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kent, Daniel) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: 6/25/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit 5 (a CD) conventionally by Alaska Stock, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Seidman, Christopher) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: 6/25/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                          NOTICE Affidavit of C. Seidman by Alaska Stock, LLC re 30 Response in Opposition to Motion,, (Seidman, Christopher) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: 6/25/2009 Notice Re: Chamber Copy
                                                                                                                            Notice to Counsel re 30 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Alaska Stock, LLC. A review of the document submitted at dkt 30 confirms that it is over 25 pages in length. If a COURTESY paper copy of the pleading has not been forwarded to the Court, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to D.Ak.LR 10.1(b) and the Administrative Policies and Procedures, you are required to provide the court with a COURTESY paper copy of your filing at dkt 30. The COURTESY paper copy must be attached to a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing and must be printed with the ECF pdf header on each page. (PRR, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: 6/24/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) Declaration of C. Seidman filed by Alaska Stock, LLC. (Seidman, Christopher) Modified on 6/25/2009 to remove relationship to document #24 and reflect error: see 6/25/09 Docket Annotation below. (PRR, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: 6/24/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) filed by Alaska Stock, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Table of Contents, # 2 Exhibit 1, Part 1, # 3 Exhibit 1, Part 2, # 4 Exhibit 1, Part 3, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, Part 1, # 10 Exhibit 6, Part 2, # 11 Exhibit 6, Part 3, # 12 Exhibit 6, Part 4, # 13 Exhibit 6, Part 5, # 14 Exhibit 7, # 15 Exhibit 8)(Seidman, Christopher) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: 6/16/2009 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Jason R. Braswell (Braswell, Jason) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: 6/10/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-Reply
                                                                                                                                    TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING 27 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Response is due by 6/24/2009. (SRL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: 6/8/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed by Alaska Stock, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wallace, Craig) Modified on 6/9/2009 to create relationship to document #24 (PRR, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: 6/1/2009 Notice Re: Chamber Copy
                                                                                                                                        Notice to Counsel re 25 Affidavit filed by R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company, Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company. A review of the document submitted at dkt 25 confirms that it is over 25 pages in length. If a COURTESY paper copy of the pleading has not been forwarded to the Court, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to D.Ak.LR 10.1(b) and the Administrative Policies and Procedures, you are required to provide the court with a COURTESY paper copy of your filing at dkt 25. The COURTESY paper copy must be attached to a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing and must be printed with the ECF pdf header on each page. (LSC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: 5/26/2009 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Jason Braswell re 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) by Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company, R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits to Braswell Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Errata K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit X, # 26 Exhibit Y, # 27 Exhibit Z, # 28 Exhibit AA)(Kent, Daniel) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: 5/26/2009, Terminated: 6/30/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) by Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company, R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kent, Daniel) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: 5/14/2009 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE the Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice at dkt # 21, is hereby authorized under D.Ak.LR 83.1(d).(CLW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: 5/13/2009 Receipt
                                                                                                                                                Receipt of $150.00 non-resident attorney payment for Jason R. Braswell as to Defendant Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company. (NXL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: 5/11/2009 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear and Application of Non-Resident Attorney for Permission to Participate in the United States District Court for the District of Alaska by Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company, R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company.(Kent, Daniel) (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: 5/8/2009 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE that the Application of Non-Resident Attorney, J. Russell Jackson, to Appear Pro Hac Vice, at docket 17 , is authorized under D.Ak.LR 83.1(d). (PRR, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: 5/4/2009 Receipt
                                                                                                                                                      Receipt of $150.00 non-resident attorney payment for J. Russell Jackson as to Defendant Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company. (NXL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: 4/30/2009 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE re 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear and Application of Non-Resident Attorney for Permission to Participate in the United States District Court for the District of Alaska; A $150.00 fee is required to participate as a non-resident counsel and should be submitted to the court within 15 days of receipt of this notice with a copy of this notice. cc: Finance (LSC, COURT STAFF) Modified on 4/30/2009 to add distribution (LSC, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: 4/27/2009 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear and Application of Non-Resident Attorney for Permission to Participate in the United States District Court for the District of Alaska by Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company, R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company.(Kent, Daniel) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: 4/24/2009 Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                            TMB ORDER GRANTING 15 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer. Pursuant to stipulation of the parties, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Answer is Due 05/25/09. (SRL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: 4/23/2009 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION By Consent for Extension of Time To File Answer by Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company, R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kent, Daniel) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: 4/23/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C. Kent on behalf of Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company, R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company (Kent, Daniel) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: 4/15/2009 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Houghton Mifflin on April 6, 2009, filed by Alaska Stock, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Cole, Brent) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: 4/10/2009 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE advising parties that the MOTION for Limited Admission of Craig Wallace at docket 6 is authorized under D.Ak.LR 83.1(d). (PRR, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: 4/10/2009 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE advising parties that the MOTION for Limited Admission of Christopher Seidman at docket 5 is authorized under D.Ak.LR 83.1(d). (PRR, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: 4/9/2009 Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                        Receipt of $150.00 non-resident attorney payment for Craig Wallace as to Plaintiff Alaska Stock, LLC. (BJC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: 4/9/2009 Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                          Receipt of $150.00 non-resident attorney payment for Christopher Seidman as to Plaintiff Alaska Stock, LLC. (BJC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: 4/9/2009 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Lynn Basile re 7 Certificate of Service by Alaska Stock, LLC. (Cole, Brent) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: 4/9/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alaska Stock, LLC on R.R. Donnelley & Sons Co. (Cole, Brent) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: 4/9/2009 Motion for Limited Admission
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Limited Admission of Craig Wallace by Alaska Stock, LLC.(Cole, Brent) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: 4/9/2009 Motion for Limited Admission
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Limited Admission of Christopher Seidman by Alaska Stock, LLC.(Cole, Brent) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: 3/27/2009 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                    Report on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. (NXL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: 3/27/2009 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                      Unissued summons re Houghton. (Attachments: # 1 Unissued summons re R.R. Donnelley) (NXL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: 3/27/2009 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                        Civil cover sheet. (NXL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: 3/27/2009 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company, R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company (Filing fee $ 350.Receipt #134866), filed by Alaska Stock, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(NXL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 310 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?