AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:12-cv-00437
District Judge Nancy B. Firestone, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 7, 2021 at 6:26 PM EDT (1.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

American International Group, Inc. American International Group, Inc., Plaintiff
Officer/Director, Ipcs, Inc.
Officer/Director, Perini Corp
Officer/Director, World Airways Inc /de/
Officer/Director, Ipc Holdings Ltd
Officer/Director, Selmer Industries Inc
Officer/Director, Vision Acquisition I, Inc
Officer/Director, Blackstone Group Lp
Officer/Director, AIG BG Holdings LLC
Officer/Director, Tidewater Inc.
Officer/Director, American Home Assurance Co
Officer/Director, SQZ Biotechnologies Co
Officer/Director, On Minerals Co Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Caplin & Drysdale, Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Michael Ruchelman +1 202 862 7834 +1 202 429 3301 cmr@capdale.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason Bergmann +1 202 616 3425 +1 202 514 9440 jason.bergmann@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491
Nature of Suit 202 - Tax - Declaratory Judgment 28:1507
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/7/2021, Entered: None Status Report Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/7/2021, Entered: None Status Report (JOINT)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: None Status Report Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: None Status Report (JOINT)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None Status Report Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None Status Report (JOINT)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: None Status Report (JOINT)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None Status Report (JOINT)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 27 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                      NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Susan G. Braden for all further proceedings. (hw1) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
                        LREF
                        Blank 26 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Nancy B. Firestone recused. Case returned to the clerk for reassignment. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk) Copy to parties. (Entered: 04/11/2016)
                          LREF
                          Blank 25 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                          STATUS REPORT ORDER: Case remains STAYED. Joint Status Report due by 7/6/2016. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk) Copy to parties. (Entered: 01/07/2016)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None
                            JOINT STATUS REPORT , filed by AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC.. (Ruchelman, Charles) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                              STATUS REPORT ORDER: Case remains STAYED. Joint Status Report due by 1/6/2016. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk) Copy to parties. (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                                JOINT STATUS REPORT , filed by AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC.. (Ruchelman, Charles) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 7/7/2015. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk) Copy to parties. (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT , filed by AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC.. (Ruchelman, Charles) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      STATUS REPORT ORDER: Case remains STAYED. Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2015. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk) Copy to parties. (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT , filed by AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC.. (Ruchelman, Charles) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          STATUS REPORT ORDER: Case remains STAYED. Joint Status Report due by 7/3/2014. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk) Copy to parties. (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT , filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ruchelman, Charles) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              STATUS REPORT ORDER: Case remains STAYED. Joint Status Report due by 1/6/2014. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk) Copy to parties. (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT , filed by All Parties. (Ruchelman, Charles) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  STATUS REPORT ORDER: Case remains STAYED. Joint Status Report due by 7/8/2013. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk) Copy to parties. (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by All Parties. (Ruchelman, Charles) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER STAYING CASE: Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2013. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (rh) Copy to parties. (Entered: 09/24/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                        Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings, filed by All Parties.Response due by 10/9/2012.(Ruchelman, Charles) Modified on 1/8/2013 (jb). (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to file answer or otherwise respond to complaint. Defendant's answer or response due by 11/2/2012. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk) Copy to parties. (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until November 2, 2012 to File Response as to 1 Complaint,, filed by USA.Response due by 9/17/2012.(Bergmann, Jason) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Bergmann for USA. (Bergmann, Jason) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 3 Motion to Seal Document Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk) Copy to parties. (jb). Modified on 7/16/2012 to correct PDF. (jb). (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (ac7) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (ac7) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION to Seal Document Exhibit (1), filed by AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC..Response due by 7/23/2012.(ac7) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC. (ac7) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) (Filing fee $350, Receipt number 073914) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC..Answer due by 9/4/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1 SEALED, # 3 Exhibit 1 REDACTED, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6)(ac7) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 169 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?